Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1671 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19474 Week
» 72490 Month
» 192017 Year
» 3218870 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7428 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
War Dept. |
77428 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90296 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1944 |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
31B |
|
March |
5w/e |
23/06/1951 |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
22/10/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
08/08/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MEX |
Mexborough |
on |
17/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
29/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/08/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7428 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25234 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77428 |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90296 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
08/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90296 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|