Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4247 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17653 Week
» 70669 Month
» 190196 Year
» 3217049 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7434 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
War Dept. |
77434 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90301 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/03/1962 |
Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. |
SLS/196204 |
18/01/1964 |
Darlington MPD (Stored) |
Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. |
SLS/196402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7434 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25161 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77434 |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90301 |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
26/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90301 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|