Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17887 Week
» 70903 Month
» 190430 Year
» 3217283 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78553 |
m/e |
03/1945 |
British Railways |
90418 |
m/e |
09/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78553 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25408 |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |
|
|
09/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90418 |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
16/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
16/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90418 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|