Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1143 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14549 Week
» 67565 Month
» 187092 Year
» 3213945 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78559 |
m/e |
03/1945 |
British Railways |
90421 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78559 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25414 |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90421 |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
01/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90421 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|