Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18095 Week
» 71111 Month
» 190638 Year
» 3217491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78564 |
m/e |
09/1944 |
British Railways |
90373 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Austerities |
It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them. 280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944. |
SLS/194602 |
30/11/1945 |
Austerities |
It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them. 280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944. |
SLS/194602 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78564 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25325 |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90373 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
11/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90373 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|