Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78568 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
90374 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/05/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78568 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25329 |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90374 |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
28/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90374 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |
|
|