Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 535 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18338 Week
» 71354 Month
» 190881 Year
» 3217734 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78570 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3091 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63091 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90091 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
07/09/1963 |
ALLOC |
50D |
Goole |
4w/e |
07/12/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/06/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78570 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25331 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3091 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63091 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90091 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90091 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|