Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3349 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16755 Week
» 69771 Month
» 189298 Year
» 3216151 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78575 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
90377 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78575 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25336 |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90377 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
13/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90377 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|