|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
13/08/1967 | Sunderland MPD | On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 78578 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25339 |
||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90378 | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
24/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
21/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
19/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
08/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
10/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
06/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
15/07/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90378 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |