Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 126 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4941 Week
» 11075 Month
» 238959 Year
» 1460524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8666 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 78666 m/e 01/1945
BR 90641 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5067
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/08/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1944
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 11/08/1951
26C Bolton 4w/e 18/04/1953
8L Aintree w/e 03/10/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 07/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN AFD Ashford 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC RED Redhill 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 8L Aintree 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 07/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
20/03/1950 Brighton Works Locomotives in shops for repair on 20/3 included: Nos. 15203, 31744, 32030/89, 32519/45, 32659, 34081, 36001, ex-W.D. 77098, 77321/79, 77460, 78531, 78666. Under construction Nos. 34106 Lydford (almost ready), 34107-09, and two 2-6-4 tanks. SLS/195004
06/05/1950 Brighton Works Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. SLS/195006
06/05/1950 Brighton Works Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. SLS/195006
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8666
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5067
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78666    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90641    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
07/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90641    

prev prev