Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see.Content is comming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Visitors:

Advertising



Reliable $1 Web Hosting by HostBig

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Chief Mechanical Engineers
Name Date of Birth Date of Death Role Comp From To Loco Classes Bio
Adams, William 15/10/1823 07/08/1904 CME LSWR     LSWR 380 4-4-0 (1879)
LSWR 46 (1879)
LSWR 135 4-4-0 (1880)
LSWR 395 0-6-0 'Jumbos' (1881)
LSWR 415 4-4-2T 'Radial Tanks' (1882)
LSWR 445 4-4-0 (1883)
LSWR 460 4-4-0 (1884)
LSWR A12 0-4-2 'Jubilee' (1887)
LSWR T1 0-4-4T (1888)
LSWR O2 0-4-4T (1889)
LSWR X2 4-4-0 (1890)
LSWR B4 0-4-0T (1891)
LSWR T3 4-4-0 (1892)
LSWR G6 0-6-0T (1894)
LSWR T6 4-4-0 (1895)
LSWR X6 4-4-0 (1895)
Link
Beames, Hewitt Pearson Montague 09/05/1875 05/03/1948 CME LNWR     LNWR G2 0-8-0 (1921)
LNWR 7F-A 0-8-4T '7F' (1923)
Link
Bulleid, Oliver Vaughan Snell 19/09/1882 25/04/1970 CME SR     SR MN 4-6-2 'Merchant Navy' (1941)
SR Q1 0-6-0 (1942)
SR WCBB 4-6-2 'West Country/Battle of Britain' (1945)
SR LEAD 0-6-6-0T 'Leader' (1949)
Link
Churchward, George Jackson 31/01/1857 19/12/1933 CME GWR     GWR 3440 4-4-0 'City'
GWR 2900 4-6-0 'Saint' (1902)
GWR 2800 2-8-0 '28xx' (1903)
GWR 4400 2-6-2T '44xx' (1904)
GWR 3150 2-6-2T (1906)
GWR 4500 2-6-2T '45xx' (1906)
GWR 4000 4-6-0 'Star' (1907)
GWR Great Bear 4-6-2 (1908)
GWR 1361 0-6-0ST (1910)
GWR 4200 2-8-0T '42xx' (1910)
GWR 4300 2-6-0 '43xx' (1911)
GWR 4700 2-8-0 '47xx' (1919)
GWR 5205 2-8-0T (1923)
 
Collett, Charles Benjamin 10/09/1871 05/04/1952 CME GWR     GWR 5100 2-6-2T (1903)
GWR 3100 2-6-2T '31xx' (1906)
GWR 4073 4-6-0 'Castle' (1923)
GWR 5600 0-6-2T '56xx' (1924)
GWR 1101 0-4-0T (1926)
GWR 4575 2-6-2T (1927)
GWR 6000 4-6-0 'King' (1927)
GWR 4900 4-6-0 'Hall' (1928)
GWR 5101 2-6-2T (1929)
GWR 5700 0-6-0PT '57xx' (1929)
GWR 2251 0-6-0 (1930)
GWR 5400 0-6-0PT '54xx' (1930)
GWR 6100 2-6-2T '61xx' (1931)
GWR 1400 0-4-2T '14xx' (1932)
GWR 6400 0-6-0PT '64xx' (1932)
GWR 5800 0-4-2T '58xx' (1933)
GWR 1366 0-6-0PT (1934)
GWR 7200 2-8-2T '72xx' (1934)
GWR 6800 4-6-0 'Grange' (1936)
GWR 7400 0-6-0PT '74xx' (1936)
GWR 9000 4-4-0 'Dukedog' (1936)
GWR 7800 4-6-0 'Manor' (1938)
GWR 8100 2-6-2T '81xx' (1938)
Link
Cooke, Charles John Bowen 11/01/1859 18/10/1920 CME LNWR     LNWR CLAUT 4-6-0 'Claughton'
LNWR C1 0-8-0 '2 Cylinder Rebuilds' (1909)
LNWR 2665 4-6-2T (1910)
LNWR 2665 4-6-2T (1910)
LNWR GEO5 4-4-0 'George V' (1910)
LNWR QM 4-4-0 'Queen Mary' (1910)
LNWR 6F-A 0-8-2T '1185' (1911)
LNWR POFW 4-6-0 'Prince of Wales' (1911)
Link
Cowan, W CME GNSR     GNSR D39 4-4-0 (1878)  
Cumming, Christopher CME HR     HR 4P-I 4-6-0 'Highland Clan' (1919)  
Drummond, Peter 1850 1918 CME HR
GSWR
1911 1918 HR HR Castle 4-6-0 (1900)
HR 0P-A 0-4-4T 'Passenger Tank' (1905)
Link
Drummond, Dugald 01/01/1840 08/11/1912 CME NBR
CR
LSWR
1895 08/11/1912 NBR J82 0-6-0T (1875)
NBR D27 4-4-0 (1877)
NBR D28 4-4-0 (1877)
NBR D50 4-4-0T (1879)
NBR J34 0-6-0 (1879)
NBR D51 4-4-0T (1880)
LSWR 700 0-6-0 'Black Motors' (1897)
LSWR M7 0-4-4T 'Motor Tanks' (1897)
LSWR T9 4-4-0 'Greyhounds' (1899)
LSWR K10 4-4-0 'Small Hoppers' (1901)
LSWR L11 4-4-0 'Large Hoppers' (1903)
LSWR S11 4-4-0 (1903)
LSWR L12 4-4-0 'Bulldogs' (1904)
LSWR T14 4-6-0 (1911)
Link
Fairburn, Charles Edward 05/09/1887 12/10/1945 CME LMS     LMS 4P 2-6-4T (1945)  
Fowler, Sir Henry 29/07/1870 16/10/1938 CME LMS     LMS 2F-C 0-6-0T '2F'
LMS 2P-B 4-4-0 '2P'
LMS 3F-F 0-6-0T '3F'
LMS 3P-A 2-6-2T '3P'
LMS 4F-B 0-6-0 '4F'
LMS 4P-A 4-4-0 'Compound'
LMS 4P-D 2-6-4T '4P'
LMS BIGB 0-10-0 'Big Bertha'
LMS PAT 4-6-0 'Patriot'
LMS 7F 0-8-0 (1929)
Link
Gresley, Sir Nigel 19/06/1876 05/04/1941 CME GNR
LNER
01/01/1923 05/04/1941 GNR K1 2-6-0 (1912)
GNR J51 0-6-0T (1913)
GNR J51 0-6-0T (1913)
GNR K2 2-6-0 (1913)
GNR O3 2-8-0 (1913)
GNR O2 2-8-0 (1918)
GNR K3 2-6-0 (1920)
GNR N2 0-6-2T (1920)
GNR A1 4-6-2 (1922)
GNR A3 4-6-2 (1922)
GNR J50 0-6-0T (1922)
LNER P1 2-8-2 (1925)
LNER J38 0-6-0 (1926)
LNER J39 0-6-0 (1926)
LNER D49 4-4-0 'Shire/Hunt' (1927)
LNER B17 4-6-0 (1928)
LNER B2 4-6-0 (1928)
LNER W1 4-6-4 (1929)
LNER V1 2-6-2T (1930)
LNER P2 2-8-2 (1934)
LNER A4 4-6-2 (1935)
LNER V2 2-6-2 (1936)
LNER K4 2-6-0 (1937)
LNER V3 2-6-2T (1939)
LNER V4 2-6-2 (1941)
LNER A1/1 4-6-2 (1945)
LNER K1/1 2-6-0 (1945)
LNER K5 2-6-0 (1945)
Link
Hawksworth, Frederick William 10/01/1882 13/07/1976 CME GWR     GWR 6959 4-6-0 'Modified Hall' (1944)
GWR 1000 4-6-0 'County' (1945)
GWR 9400 0-6-0PT '94xx' (1947)
GWR 1500 0-6-0PT '15xx' (1949)
GWR 1600 0-6-0PT '16xx' (1949)
Link
Hill, Alfred John 1862 14/03/1927 CME GER     GER J68 0-6-0T (1912)
GER Y4 0-4-0T (1913)
GER N7 0-6-2T (1915)
GER J19 0-6-0 (1916)
GER J20 0-6-0 (1920)
Link
Holden, James 26/07/1837 26/05/1925 CME GER     GER F5 2-4-2T
GER J15 0-6-0 (1883)
GER F4 2-4-2T (1884)
GER D13 4-4-0 (1886)
GER J66 0-6-0T (1886)
GER J65 0-6-0T (1889)
GER J67 0-6-0T (1890)
GER J69 0-6-0T (1890)
GER E4 2-4-0 (1891)
GER F3 2-4-2T (1893)
GER D14 4-4-0 (1900)
GER D15 4-4-0 (1900)
GER J16 0-6-0 (1900)
GER J17 0-6-0 (1900)
GER J70 0-6-0T (1903)
Link
Holden, Stephen Dewar 23/08/1870 07/02/1918 CME GER     GER F6 2-4-2T (1904)
GER F7 2-4-2T (1909)
GER B12 4-6-0 (1911)
Link
Holmes, Matthew 1844 03/07/1903 CME NBR     NBR 574 4-4-0 '574' (1884)
NBR D31 4-4-0 (1884)
NBR D25 4-4-0 (1886)
NBR J36 0-6-0 (1888)
NBR 633 4-4-0 '633' (1890)
NBR D35 4-4-0 (1894)
NBR D36 4-4-0 (1894)
NBR 729 4-4-0 '729' (1898)
NBR J83 0-6-0T (1900)
NBR D26 4-4-0 (1903)
Link
Hughes, George 09/10/1865 27/10/1945 CME LYR
LMS
01/01/1923 10/1925 LYR LYR28 0-6-0 '28'
LYR LYR31 0-8-0 '31'
LYR 5P-A 4-6-0 '5P' (1908)
LYR LYR6 2-4-2T '6' (1911)
LMS CRAB 2-6-0 'Crab' (1926)
 
Ivatt, Henry George 04/05/1886 04/10/1976 CME LMS     LMS 2MT-A 2-6-2T '2MT'
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 (1946)
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 (1947)
 
Ivatt, Henry Alfred 16/09/1851 25/10/1923 CME GNR     GNR J4 0-6-0 (1873)
GNR J53 0-6-0ST (1892)
GNR J53 0-6-0ST (1892)
GNR D3 4-4-0 (1896)
GNR D4 4-4-0 (1896)
GNR J3 0-6-0 (1896)
GNR C12 4-4-2T (1898)
GNR C2 4-4-2 (1898)
GNR D2 4-4-0 (1898)
GNR D2 4-4-0 (1898)
GNR Q1 0-8-0 (1901)
GNR C1 4-4-2 (1902)
GNR Q2 0-8-0 (1902)
GNR N1 0-6-2T (1907)
GNR J1 0-6-0 (1908)
GNR J5 0-6-0 (1909)
GNR D1 4-4-0 (1911)
GNR J6 0-6-0 (1911)
GNR J2 0-6-0 (1912)
GNR Q3 0-8-0 (1914)
Link
Johnson, Samuel Waite 14/10/1831 14/01/1912 CME MR     MR 1F-A 0-6-0T '1F'
MR 1142 0-6-0 (1875)
MR 1142 0-6-0 (1875)
MR 1142 0-6-0 (1875)
MR 1262 0-4-4T '1262' (1875)
MR 6 0-4-4T (1875)
MR 1357 0-6-0 (1878)
MR 1357 0-6-0 (1878)
MR 1357 0-6-0 (1878)
MR 1532 0-4-4T (1881)
MR 2228 0-4-4T (1895)
Link
Kirtley, William 1840 07/10/1919 CME LCDR        
Kirtley, Matthew 06/02/1813 24/05/1873 CME MR     MR 690 0-4-4T (1869)
MR 780 0-4-4T (1870)
Link
Manson CME GNSR     GNSR D47 4-4-0 (1866)
GNSR D47 4-4-0 (1866)
GNSR D45 4-4-0 (1878)
GNSR D44 4-4-0 (1884)
GNSR J90 0-6-0T (1884)
GNSR D48 4-4-0 (1885)
GNSR J91 0-6-0T (1885)
GNSR D46 4-4-0 (1887)
GNSR D42 4-4-0 (1888)
GNSR D38 4-4-0 (1890)
GNSR D43 4-4-0 (1890)
 
Maunsell, Richard Edward Lloyd 26/05/1868 07/03/1944 CME SECR
SR
01/01/1923 1937 SR D1 4-4-0
SR E1A 4-4-0
SR E1R 0-6-2T 'El Radials'
SR I1X 4-4-2T
SR L1 4-4-0
SR LN 4-6-0 'Lord Nelson'
SR N1 2-6-0
SR N15X 4-6-0 'Rememberance'
SR S 0-4-0ST
SR U1 2-6-0 'U Boats'
SR V 4-4-0 'Schools'
SR Z 0-8-0T
SR N 2-6-0 'Mongolipers' (1917)
SR U 2-6-0 'U Boats' (1928)
SR W 2-6-4T (1931)
SR Q 0-6-0 (1938)
Link
McIntosh, John Farquharson 28/02/1846 06/02/1918 CME CR     CR 2F-D 0-6-0T 'Dock'
CR 2P-G 0-4-4T '2P'
CR 2P-H 0-4-4T 'Standard Passenger'
CR 2P-J 0-4-4T '2P'
CR 3F-H 0-6-0T '3F'
CR 3F-J 0-6-0 '3F'
CR 3P-F 4-4-0 'Dunalastair IV'
CR 900 4-4-0 'Dunalastair III'
CR DUN4A 4-4-0 'Dunalastair IV'
Link
Parker, Thomas 1843 1903 CME MSLR     MSLR D7 4-4-0 (1887)
MSLR D8 4-4-0 (1888)
MSLR F1 2-4-2T (1889)
MSLR F1 2-4-2T (1889)
MSLR J13 0-6-0 (1889)
MSLR N4 0-6-2T (1889)
 
Peppercorn, Arthur Henry 29/01/1889 03/03/1951 CME LNER     LNER A2 4-6-2 (1947)
LNER A1 4-6-2 (1948)
LNER K1 2-6-0 (1949)
 
Pickersgill, William 1861 02/05/1928 CME CR     CR 300 0-6-0
CR 3F-L 0-6-0 '3F'
CR 3P-G 4-4-0 '113'
CR 431 0-4-4T
CR 4P-G 4-6-0 '4P'
CR 60 4-6-0
CR 944 4-6-2T
CR 72 4-4-0 (1920)
 
Raven, Sir Vincent Litchfield 03/12/1859 14/02/1934 CME NER     NER H1 4-4-4T (1910)
NER B15 4-6-0 (1911)
NER C7 4-4-2 (1911)
NER Q6 0-8-0 (1913)
NER B16 4-6-0 (1919)
NER Q7 0-8-0 (1919)
NER A2 4-6-2 (1922)
 
Reid, William Paton 02/09/1854 02/02/1932 CME NBR     NBR J88 0-6-0T (1904)
NBR C10 4-4-2 (1906)
NBR C10 4-4-2 (1906)
NBR C11 4-4-2 (1906)
NBR D32 4-4-0 (1906)
NBR J35 0-6-0 (1906)
NBR D29 4-4-0 (1909)
NBR D33 4-4-0 (1909)
NBR N14 0-6-2T (1909)
NBR N15 0-6-2T (1910)
NBR C15 4-4-2T (1911)
NBR D30 4-4-0 'Scott' (1912)
NBR D34 4-4-0 'Glen' (1913)
NBR J37 0-6-0 (1914)
NBR J37 0-6-0 (1914)
NBR C16 4-4-2T (1915)
 
Stanier, Sir William Arthur 27/05/1876 27/09/1965 CME LMS     LMS 2P-C 0-4-4T '2P'
LMS 3P-B 2-6-2T '3P'
LMS 4P-E 2-6-4T '4P'
LMS 4P-F 2-6-4T '4P'
LMS 8F 2-8-0
LMS JUBE 4-6-0 'Jubilee'
LMS LOBST 2-6-0 '6P5F' (1933)
LMS PRIN 4-6-2 'Princess Royal' (1933)
LMS 5MT 4-6-0 'Black Five' (1934)
LMS CORO 4-6-2 'Coronation (Semi)' (1937)
Link
Thompson, Edward 25/06/1881 1954 CME LNER     LNER B1 4-6-0 (1942)
LNER A2 4-6-2 (1944)
LNER L1 2-6-4T (1945)
Link
Webb, Francis William 21/05/1836 04/06/1906 CME LNWR     LNWR 1F-B 0-4-0ST '1F'
LNWR 1P-A 2-4-2T '1P'
LNWR 1P-E 2-4-0T '1P'
LNWR 2F-K 0-6-0 'Coal Engines'
LNWR 2F-O 0-6-2T 'Coal Tank'
LNWR 2F-P 0-6-0ST '2F'
LNWR 2P-F 0-6-2T '18" Passenger Tank'
LNWR 18" Express Goods 0-6-0 'Cauliflowers' (1880)
LNWR A 0-8-0 'A Compound' (1893)
LNWR B 0-8-0 '4 Cylinder Compound' (1901)
LNWR W4CC 4-6-0 '4-Cylinder Compound' (1903)
LNWR E 2-8-0 'Rebuilt Compound' (1904)
LNWR F 2-8-0 'Rebuilt Compound' (1906)
Link
Whale, George 07/12/1842 07/03/1910 CME LNWR     LNWR PREC 4-4-0 'Precursor' (1904)
LNWR EXP 4-6-0 'Experiment' (1905)
LNWR 4F 4-6-0 '19" Goods' (1906)
LNWR 6ft Side Tank 4-4-2T 'Precursor Tank' (1906)
LNWR G 0-8-0 '2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New' (1906)
LNWR D 0-8-0 '2 Cylinder Rebuilds' (1907)
LNWR C 0-8-0 '2 Cylinder Simples' (1911)
Link
Worsdell, Wilson 07/09/1850 14/04/1920 CME NER     NER D22 4-4-0 (1886)
NER D23 4-4-0 (1887)
NER J78 0-6-0T (1888)
NER J73 0-6-0T (1891)
NER D17 4-4-0 (1892)
NER G5 0-4-4T (1894)
NER J24 0-6-0 (1894)
NER D18 4-4-0 (1896)
NER D19 4-4-0 (1897)
NER D19 4-4-0 (1897)
NER J79 0-6-0T (1897)
NER J25 0-6-0 (1898)
NER J72 0-6-0T (1898)
NER B13 4-6-0 (1899)
NER D20 4-4-0 (1899)
NER B14 4-6-0 (1900)
NER Q5 0-8-0 (1901)
NER Q5 0-8-0 (1901)
NER N10 0-6-2T (1902)
NER C6 4-4-2 (1903)
NER C6 4-4-2 (1903)
NER J26 0-6-0 (1904)
NER C8 4-4-2 (1906)
NER J27 0-6-0 (1906)
NER A6 4-6-2T (1907)
NER D21 4-4-0 (1908)
NER T1 4-8-0T (1909)
NER A7 4-6-2T (1910)
Link
Worsdell, Thomas William 14/01/1838 28/06/1916 CME GER
NER
1885 01/10/1890 GER Y6 0-4-0T (1883)
NER F8 2-4-2T (1886)
NER J21 0-6-0 (1886)
NER J21 0-6-0 (1886)
NER J21 0-6-0 (1886)
NER J71 0-6-0T (1886)
NER N8 0-6-2T (1886)
NER Y7 0-4-0T (1888)
NER Y8 0-4-0T (1890)
NER N9 0-6-2T (1893)
Link