Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 299 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 4427 Week
» 28388 Month
» 191442 Year
» 268029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Pilot Scheme Locomotives

The British Transport Commission (BTC) published their modernisation plan 'A Blueprint for the Modernisation of British Railways' in 1955. Part of this document outlined the requirement to replace steam locomotives with diesel and electric's, over a period of 10 years. The BTC identified a range of power requirements and, wishing to stimulate British industry, placed orders with a variety of companies for the production of pilot scheme locomotives for evaluation.

174 locos falling into 4 power output bands were ordered, from North British, Metropolitan Vickers, BRCW, English Electric, BTH, Brush Bagnall and their own workshops at Derby and Swindon. The following list highlights the fate of those 174 locomotives.

Class Pre Tops Tops To Service Withdrawn Builder PU Builder Power Unit BHP Disposal Date
44 D1 44001 15/08/1959 30/10/1976 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp 02/1977
44 D2 44002 03/10/1959 01/02/1979 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp 10/1979
44 D3 44003 19/09/1959 17/07/1976 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp 08/1976
44 D4 44004 26/09/1959 30/11/1980 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp Preserved
44 D5 44005 17/10/1959 30/04/1978 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp 11/1978
44 D6 44006 14/11/1959 25/01/1977 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp 02/1977
44 D7 44007 28/11/1959 30/11/1980 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp 11/1981
44 D8 44008 15/12/1959 30/11/1980 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp Preserved
44 D9 44009 02/01/1960 01/03/1979 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp 07/1980
44 D10 44010 20/02/1960 12/05/1977 Derby Works Sulzer 12LDA28A 2,300hp 07/1978
40 D200 40122 14/03/1958 18/04/1988 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp Preserved
40 D201 40001 03/04/1958 23/07/1984 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp 01/02/1987
40 D202 40002 30/04/1958 24/05/1984 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp 01/03/1985
40 D203 40003 16/05/1958 12/09/1982 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp 01/01/1984
40 D204 40004 30/05/1958 02/09/1984 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp 01/09/1986
40 D205 40005 25/06/1958 24/01/1976 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp 01/02/1977
40 D206 40006 09/07/1958 13/03/1983 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp 01/08/1984
40 D207 40007 23/07/1958 27/02/1983 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp 01/01/1984
40 D208 40008 27/08/1958 14/11/1982 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp 01/06/1988
40 D209 40009 15/09/1958 07/11/1984 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 16SVT Mk 11 2,000hp 01/03/1985
D20/2 D600   24/01/1958 31/12/1967 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 01/03/1970
D20/2 D601   28/03/1958 31/12/1967 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 01/06/1980
D20/2 D602   03/11/1958 31/12/1967 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 01/08/1968
D20/2 D603   21/11/1958 31/12/1967 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 01/08/1968
D20/2 D604   20/01/1959 31/12/1967 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 01/08/1968
42 D800   11/08/1958 05/10/1968 Swindon Works Maybach MD650 1,000hp 31/07/1969
42 D801   07/11/1958 03/08/1968 Swindon Works Maybach MD650 1,000hp 24/10/1970
42 D802   16/12/1958 05/10/1968 Swindon Works Maybach MD650 1,000hp 30/11/1970
24 D5000 24005 05/09/1958 31/01/1976 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 30/04/1977
24 D5001 24001 29/10/1958 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 30/11/1977
24 D5002 24002 03/12/1958 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 31/07/1977
24 D5003 24003 12/12/1958 16/08/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 31/07/1976
24 D5004 24004 22/12/1958 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 30/04/1977
24 D5005   03/01/1959 25/01/1969 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 12/1969
24 D5006 24006 03/01/1959 16/08/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 31/12/1980
24 D5007 24007 07/02/1959 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 31/01/1978
24 D5008 24008 28/02/1959 16/08/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 31/05/1976
24 D5009 24009 14/03/1959 18/07/1976 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 30/11/1977
24 D5010 24010 21/03/1959 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 28/02/1977
24 D5011 24011 28/03/1959 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 30/04/1977
24 D5012 24012 11/04/1959 16/08/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 29/02/1976
24 D5013 24013 18/04/1959 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 28/02/1978
24 D5014 24014 09/05/1959 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 31/03/1978
24 D5015 24015 30/05/1959 16/08/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/01/1977
24 D5016 24016 30/05/1959 16/08/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/03/1977
24 D5017 24017 06/06/1959 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/03/1977
24 D5018 24018 27/06/1959 16/08/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/06/1976
24 D5019 24019 11/07/1959 05/10/1975 Derby Works Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/05/1978
26 D5300 26007 30/07/1958 04/10/1993 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A Preserved
26 D5301 26001 12/09/1958 04/10/1993 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A Preserved
26 D5302 26002 02/10/1958 09/10/1992 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A Preserved
26 D5303 26003 17/10/1958 04/10/1993 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 25/01/1995
26 D5304 26004 31/10/1958 24/11/1992 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A Preserved
26 D5305 26005 14/11/1958 04/10/1993 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 13/02/1995
26 D5306 26006 28/11/1958 06/09/1993 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 08/06/1995
26 D5307 26020 05/12/1958 04/02/1977 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/03/1978
26 D5308 26008 12/12/1958 12/03/1993 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 13/07/1994
26 D5309 26009 19/12/1958 27/01/1977 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 30/04/1978
26 D5310 26010 06/01/1959 04/12/1992 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A Preserved
26 D5311 26011 09/01/1959 24/11/1992 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A Preserved
26 D5312 26012 16/01/1959 31/01/1982 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/08/1982
26 D5313 26013 23/01/1959 18/03/1985 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 30/06/1987
26 D5314 26014 30/01/1959 09/10/1992 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A Preserved
26 D5315 26015 13/03/1959 23/06/1991 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 02/09/1994
26 D5316 26016 20/03/1959 05/10/1975 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/09/1976
26 D5317 26017 27/02/1959 29/08/1977 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/02/1978
26 D5318 26018 06/03/1959 31/01/1982 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/04/1982
26 D5319 26019 13/03/1959 18/03/1985 BRCW Sulzer 6LDA28A 01/05/1987
30 D5500 31018 10/10/1957 10/07/1976 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp Preserved
30 D5501 31001 25/11/1957 10/07/1976 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 01/1977
30 D5502 31002 16/12/1957 01/01/1980 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 05/1984
30 D5503 31003 09/01/1958 03/02/1980 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 04/1980
30 D5504 31004 30/01/1958 05/10/1980 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 06/1981
30 D5505 31005 20/02/1958 03/02/1980 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 03/1980
30 D5506 31006 13/03/1958 05/01/1980 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 12/1980
30 D5507 31007 19/04/1958 04/11/1976 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 07/1978
30 D5508 31008 17/04/1958 01/10/1980 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 06/1985
30 D5509 31009 01/05/1958 10/07/1976 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 11/1977
30 D5510 31010 16/05/1958 10/07/1976 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 12/1976
30 D5511 31011 05/06/1958 10/07/1976 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 01/1977
30 D5512 31012 19/06/1958 04/11/1976 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 10/1978
30 D5513 31013 13/07/1958 01/03/1979 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 08/1983
30 D5514 31014 24/07/1958 01/11/1976 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 06/1983
30 D5515 31015 31/07/1958 04/05/1980 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 11/1980
30 D5516 31016 04/09/1958 10/07/1976 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 12/1976
30 D5517 31017 25/09/1958 04/05/1980 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 01/1983
30 D5518 31101 16/10/1958 11/01/1993 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp Preserved
30 D5519 31019 12/12/1958 05/10/1980 Brush Traction, Loughborough Mirrlees JVS12T 1,250hp 08/1981
28 D5700   25/07/1958 30/12/1967 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 09/1968
28 D5701   01/09/1958 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 10/1969
28 D5702   29/09/1958 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 10/1969
28 D5703   20/10/1958 30/12/1967 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 06/1968
28 D5704   05/11/1958 30/12/1967 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 08/1968
28 D5705   05/12/1958 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp Preserved
28 D5706   05/12/1958 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 10/1969
28 D5707   19/12/1958 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 10/1969
28 D5708   10/01/1959 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 10/1969
28 D5709   10/01/1959 30/12/1967 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 10/1968
28 D5710   14/02/1959 30/12/1967 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 09/1968
28 D5711   14/02/1959 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 10/1969
28 D5712   07/03/1959 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 12/1969
28 D5713   07/03/1959 30/12/1967 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 10/1968
28 D5714   14/03/1959 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 09/1969
28 D5715   11/04/1959 04/05/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 09/1968
28 D5716   16/05/1959 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 12/1969
28 D5717   19/06/1959 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 10/1969
28 D5718   11/07/1959 04/05/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 09/1968
28 D5719   17/10/1959 07/09/1968 Metropolitan Vickers Crossley HST V8 1,200hp 09/1969
23 D5900   22/05/1959 30/12/1968 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 01/06/1969
23 D5901   22/05/1959 07/12/1969 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 01/02/1977
23 D5902   01/05/1959 23/11/1969 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 01/08/1970
23 D5903   17/04/1959 30/12/1968 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 01/06/1969
23 D5904   24/04/1959 20/01/1969 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 01/06/1969
23 D5905   08/05/1959 14/02/1971 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 01/08/1973
23 D5906   08/05/1959 30/09/1968 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 07/1971
23 D5907   15/05/1959 20/10/1968 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 01/07/1969
23 D5908   29/05/1959 09/03/1969 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 02/1970
23 D5909   19/06/1959 17/03/1971 English Electric Vulcan Foundry Napier T9-29 Deltic 1,100hp 01/08/1973
21 D6100   02/12/1958 06/10/1971 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 01/11/1972
21 D6101   09/12/1958 03/08/1971 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 01/10/1972
21 D6102   23/12/1958 06/10/1971 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 01/08/1972
21 D6103   05/05/1959 05/10/1971 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 01/11/1972
21 D6104   26/02/1959 30/12/1967 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 01/04/1968
21 D6105   17/03/1959 08/06/1968 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 08/1968
21 D6106   24/03/1959 18/07/1971 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 01/07/1972
21 D6107   24/03/1959 05/10/1971 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 01/10/1972
21 D6108   14/04/1959 31/05/1969 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 06/1971
21 D6109   07/04/1959 06/04/1968 North British MAN L12V18/21S 1,100hp 01/1969
22 D6300   12/01/1959 26/05/1968 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 12/1968
22 D6301   19/02/1959 30/12/1967 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 08/1968
22 D6302   19/02/1959 26/05/1968 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 11/1968
22 D6303   22/05/1959 26/05/1968 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 12/1968
22 D6304   23/06/1959 26/05/1968 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 11/1968
22 D6305   11/01/1960 26/05/1968 North British MAN L12V18/21A 1,000hp 11/1968
20 D8000 20050 18/06/1957 14/12/1980 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp Preserved
20 D8001 20001 08/07/1957 20/04/1988 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp Preserved
20 D8002 20002 25/07/1957 19/02/1988 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 24/09/1990
20 D8003 20003 23/08/1957 16/08/1981 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 04/02/1984
20 D8004 20004 09/08/1957 11/10/1990 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 27/08/1991
20 D8005 20005 09/09/1957 27/07/1989 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 05/12/1990
20 D8006 20006 16/09/1957 02/10/1990 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 26/06/1991
20 D8007 20007 19/09/1957 01/07/1993 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp Preserved
20 D8008 20008 01/10/1957 20/02/1989 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 15/11/1993
20 D8009 20009 08/10/1957 19/07/1989 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 18/11/1993
20 D8010 20010 16/10/1957 09/12/1991 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 19/01/1994
20 D8011 20011 29/10/1957 02/02/1987 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 20/01/1994
20 D8012 20012 11/11/1957 27/03/1976 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 31/01/1977
20 D8013 20013 26/11/1957 13/12/1991 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 29/09/1993
20 D8014 20014 16/12/1957 27/03/1976 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 31/01/1977
20 D8015 20015 20/12/1957 13/07/1987 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 31/10/1988
20 D8016 20016 30/12/1957 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp
20 D8017 20017 10/01/1958 05/12/1982 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 04/02/1984
20 D8018 20018 07/02/1958 04/12/1976 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 31/05/1978
20 D8019 20019 04/03/1958 15/11/1991 English Electric Vulcan Foundry English Electric 8SVT Mk 11 1,000hp 19/01/1994
15 D8200   10/11/1957 27/03/1971 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/03/1972
15 D8201   17/02/1958 27/03/1971 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/02/1972
15 D8202   03/02/1958 30/09/1968 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/04/1969
15 D8203   24/02/1958 20/03/1969 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/10/1981
15 D8204   17/04/1958 27/03/1971 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/04/1972
15 D8205   28/04/1958 30/09/1968 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/04/1969
15 D8206   19/05/1958 30/09/1968 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/02/1970
15 D8207   16/06/1958 27/03/1971 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/04/1972
15 D8208   07/07/1958 30/09/1968 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/04/1969
15 D8209   07/10/1958 27/03/1971 BTH Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 01/03/1972
16 D8400   30/05/1958 07/07/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 11/1969
16 D8401   11/06/1958 30/09/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 09/1969
16 D8402   16/07/1958 07/07/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 11/1969
16 D8403   18/07/1958 07/07/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 04/1969
16 D8404   19/08/1958 18/02/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 07/1968
16 D8405   04/09/1958 30/09/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 12/1969
16 D8406   16/09/1958 30/09/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 07/1969
16 D8407   19/09/1958 30/09/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 12/1969
16 D8408   25/09/1958 30/09/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 04/1969
16 D8409   26/09/1958 30/09/1968 North British Paxman 16YHXL 800hp 04/1969