Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 3 Today
» 944 Yesterday
» 3235 Week
» 27196 Month
» 190250 Year
» 266837 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Preserved Diesel Locomotives


Type Class Number Name Company To Service Withdrawn Date Preserved Status Last Updated Link
Diesel Peak 44004 GREAT GABLE   26/09/1959 30/11/1980   Unknown  
Diesel Peak 44008 PENYGHENT   15/12/1959 30/11/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45015     24/11/1960 03/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45132     30/03/1961 11/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45133     26/07/1961 10/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45041 ROYAL TANK REGIMENT   25/06/1962 08/06/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45112 ROYAL ARMY ORDNANCE CORPS   08/03/1962 07/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45118 ROYAL ARTILLERYMAN   03/05/1962 08/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45105     09/03/1961 10/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45135 3RD CARABINIER   03/05/1961 09/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45060 SHERWOOD FORESTER   08/05/1961 08/12/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45108     30/09/1961 04/08/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45125     28/10/1961 07/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45149     30/12/1961 14/09/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 46 46010     16/12/1961 04/11/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 46 46035     02/07/1962 01/11/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 46 46045     27/09/1962 01/11/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 40 40122     14/03/1958 18/04/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 40 97407 AUREOL   25/05/1959 04/04/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 40 40013 ANDANIA   01/06/1959 18/10/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 40 40106     13/10/1960 21/04/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 40 97408     20/02/1961 26/02/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 40 97406     10/03/1961 16/12/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 40 40145     17/05/1961 10/06/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50050 Fearless   07/10/1967 01/03/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50002 Superb   23/12/1967 09/09/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50007 SIR EDWARD ELGAR   12/03/1968 31/03/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50008 Thunderer   22/03/1968 05/06/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50015 Valiant   02/04/1968 05/06/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50017 Royal Oak   06/04/1968 01/09/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50019 Ramillies   23/04/1968 19/09/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50021 Rodney   01/05/1968 17/04/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50026 Indomitable   12/06/1968 11/12/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50027 Lion   10/06/1968 23/07/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50029 Renown   21/06/1968 25/03/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50030 Repulse   25/06/1968 08/04/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50031 Hood   01/07/1968 01/08/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50033 Glorious   19/07/1968 25/03/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50035 Ark Royal   30/09/1968 01/08/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50040 Centurion   25/09/1968 03/08/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50042 Triumph   30/09/1968 01/10/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50044 Exeter   11/10/1968 01/01/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50049 Defiance   11/12/1968 01/08/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 42 D821 GREYHOUND   25/05/1960 03/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 42 D832 ONSLAUGHT   08/02/1961 16/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1010 WESTERN CAMPAIGNER   15/10/1962 28/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1013 WESTERN RANGER   13/12/1962 28/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1015 WESTERN CHAMPION   21/01/1963 13/12/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1023 WESTERN FUSILIER   23/09/1963 28/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1041 WESTERN PRINCE   10/10/1962 23/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1048 WESTERN LADY   15/12/1962 28/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1062 WESTERN COURIER   06/05/1963 22/08/1974   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47401     28/09/1962 05/06/1992 1994-12-00 Operational 12/04/2012 www.47401project.co.uk/
Diesel 47/0 47402     13/11/1962 01/06/1992 1993-12-00 Operational 11/04/2012 www.elrdiesel.info/
Diesel 47/0 47417     10/04/1963 24/02/1992 1994-12-00 Unserviceable 11/04/2012 www.47401project.co.uk/
Diesel 47/0 47004     14/06/1963 31/08/2006 2006-06-00 Operational 11/04/2012 www.pogo.org.uk/railway/
Diesel 47/0 47449     23/03/1964 14/05/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47029     29/07/1964 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47564     12/09/1964 01/11/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47059     19/12/1964 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47609     01/02/1965 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47613 NORTH STAR   13/02/1965 01/05/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47484 ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL   20/02/1965 01/06/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47105     06/12/1963 13/12/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47117     04/11/1965 17/07/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47540     17/03/1964 01/05/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47490     24/03/1964 01/07/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47605     19/08/1964 01/12/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47541     14/08/1964 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47492     08/09/1964 01/02/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47580     01/09/1964 01/04/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47579     23/10/1964 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/3 47306     26/11/1964 31/05/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47192     14/05/1965 18/05/1988   Operational 15/09/2011 www.preserved-diesels.co.uk/engines/47192_index.htm
Diesel 47/0 47205     24/08/1965 30/09/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/3 47367     26/08/1965 31/12/2002   Unknown  
Diesel 47/3 47376     01/09/1965 31/12/2002   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47232     19/10/1965 01/09/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47701     24/02/1966 01/12/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47596     02/03/1966 01/04/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47715     30/06/1966 01/03/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47503     06/07/1966 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47269     22/10/1965 01/04/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47270     30/10/1965 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47292     16/04/1966 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47295     03/06/1966 31/01/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03018     14/04/1958 09/11/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03020     06/05/1958 03/12/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03022     27/05/1958 07/11/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2023     12/08/1958 04/07/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2024     19/08/1958 04/07/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03027     16/09/1958 31/01/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03037     09/02/1959 29/09/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2041     13/04/1959 01/02/1970   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2046     13/12/1958 03/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2051     27/01/1959 14/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03059     29/05/1959 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03062     03/07/1959 12/10/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03063     14/07/1959 26/11/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03066     17/08/1959 08/01/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03069     19/09/1959 27/11/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2070     02/10/1959 28/11/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03072     31/10/1959 08/03/1981   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03073     05/11/1959 23/05/1989 1991-01-18 Operational 15/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=3&loco=03073
Diesel 03 03078     24/12/1959 08/01/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 03 97805     07/01/1960 03/06/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03081     05/02/1960 12/10/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03084     19/03/1959 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03089     05/05/1960 06/11/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03090     05/05/1960 18/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03094     28/06/1960 08/01/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03099     15/07/1960 10/02/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03112     09/12/1960 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03113     23/12/1960 03/08/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2117     04/09/1959 09/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2118     17/09/1959 18/06/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03119     25/09/1959 23/02/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03120     08/10/1959 23/02/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03128     07/01/1960 04/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2133     23/02/1960 07/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03134     29/02/1960 04/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2138     05/04/1960 24/06/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2139     11/04/1960 11/05/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03141     04/05/1960 07/07/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03144     19/01/1961 23/02/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03145     12/02/1961 07/07/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2148     24/05/1960 19/11/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03152     22/06/1960 02/10/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03158     22/08/1960 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03162     21/09/1960 23/05/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03170     21/11/1960 03/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2178     09/01/1962 30/09/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03180     01/02/1962 31/03/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2182     05/03/1962 11/05/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2184     09/04/1962 28/12/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03189     31/03/1961 16/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2192     05/05/1961 25/01/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03196     08/06/1961 12/06/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03197     15/06/1961 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2199     29/06/1961 18/06/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 3" engines D2203     19/07/1952 16/12/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 3" engines D2205     14/03/1953 07/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 3" engines D2207     14/02/1953 16/12/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2229     28/11/1955 31/12/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2245     12/11/1956 28/12/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2246     06/12/1956 08/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2267     20/01/1958 31/12/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2271     14/03/1958 31/12/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2272     28/03/1958 24/10/1970   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2279     15/02/1960 23/05/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2280     25/02/1960 14/03/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2284     25/03/1960 11/04/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2298     11/10/1960 28/12/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2302     31/10/1960 07/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2310     22/12/1960 01/02/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2324     26/04/1961 08/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2325     29/04/1961 08/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2334     25/07/1961 08/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2337     30/08/1961 15/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03371     31/12/1958 26/11/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2381     27/10/1961 18/06/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03399     21/10/1961 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 06 06003     14/02/1959 01/02/1981   Unknown  
Diesel D2/12 D2511     28/08/1961 30/12/1967   Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Diesel 3' 4" engines 05001     13/05/1956 01/01/1981   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 9" engines D2578     18/11/1958 07/07/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 9" engines D2587     10/11/1959 30/12/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 9" engines D2595     30/01/1960 08/06/1968   Unknown  
Diesel D2/10 D2767     17/08/1960 24/06/1967   Operational 11/01/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=101&loco=D2767
Diesel D2/10 D2774     11/10/1960 24/06/1967   Operational 11/01/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=101&loco=D2774
Diesel 02 02003     25/10/1960 01/06/1975 1997-00-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=02003
Diesel 02 D2854     04/11/1960 28/02/1970 1988-05-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2854
Diesel 02 D2858     21/12/1960 28/02/1970 2002-06-00 Unserviceable 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2858
Diesel 02 D2860     13/09/1961 13/12/1970 1973-00-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2860
Diesel 02 D2866     10/11/1961 28/02/1970 1987-10-00 Under Restoration/Overhaul 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2866
Diesel 02 D2867     17/11/1961 12/09/1970 1995-03-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2867
Diesel 02 D2868     27/11/1961 31/12/1969 2001-00-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2868
Diesel 01 D2953     24/01/1956 19/06/1966   Unknown  
Diesel 01 D2956     30/03/1956 29/05/1966   Unknown  
Diesel 07 D2988     16/06/1962 06/05/1973   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07006     13/07/1962 02/07/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07007     21/07/1962 06/05/1973   Operational 03/07/2012  
Diesel 07 07009     21/08/1962 04/10/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07010     05/09/1962 04/10/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07011     22/09/1962 02/07/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07012     06/10/1962 02/07/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07013     20/10/1962 02/07/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3000     01/11/1952 19/11/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3002     01/11/1952 17/07/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3003     14/11/1952 17/07/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3014     31/12/1952 01/10/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08011     21/03/1953 13/12/1991 1992-04-25 Operational 19/03/2011 www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 08 08012     21/03/1953 01/06/1973   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08015     16/05/1953 21/09/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08016     13/06/1953 18/05/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08021     03/10/1953 07/12/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08022     03/10/1953 17/03/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3035     28/11/1953 17/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08026     28/11/1953 04/07/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08032     27/03/1954 25/08/1974   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08041     17/07/1954 08/08/1978   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08046     11/09/1954 18/05/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08048     22/08/1953 12/12/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08054     21/11/1953 16/02/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08060     19/12/1953 24/06/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08064     23/01/1958 23/12/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3101     05/02/1955 31/05/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D3137     02/03/1955 02/07/1970   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08102     24/08/1955 14/03/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08108     23/09/1955 08/07/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08114     18/10/1955 06/11/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08123     15/11/1955 20/03/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08124     15/11/1955 01/03/1981   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3193     22/11/1955 16/09/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08131     08/12/1955 15/03/1981   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08133     16/12/1955 21/09/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08164     12/01/1956 23/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08168     07/02/1956 14/03/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3255     08/06/1955 30/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3261     05/07/1956 30/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08195     23/08/1956 25/09/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08202     06/10/1956 23/05/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08220     14/12/1956 30/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08238     20/05/1956 18/03/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08266     20/02/1957 17/03/1985   Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Diesel 08 08288     28/06/1957 21/01/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08296     31/05/1957 30/10/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08350     07/12/1957 17/01/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08359     28/03/1958 22/01/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D3452     22/11/1957 22/06/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08377     27/06/1957 26/06/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D3476     24/12/1957 01/06/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D3489     03/04/1958 06/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08388     14/04/1958 20/07/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08423     15/08/1958 24/11/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08436     03/10/1958 10/01/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08443     07/11/1958 07/07/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08444     07/11/1958 02/11/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08445     14/11/1958 20/07/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08447     28/11/1958 11/11/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08471     13/11/1958 09/09/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08473     28/11/1958 17/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08476     17/12/1958 09/09/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08479     01/09/1958 08/11/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08481     19/09/1958 31/08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08490     14/11/1958 18/12/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08499     29/03/1958 01/06/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 09 09002     03/02/1959 25/09/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 09 09004     17/02/1959 31/07/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08556     30/10/1959 03/07/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08576     20/06/1959 30/04/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08590     05/10/1959 27/09/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08594     13/11/1959 20/07/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08598     02/05/1959 10/11/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08600     16/05/1959 30/07/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08602     30/05/1959 30/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08604     13/06/1959 16/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08613     22/08/1959 01/12/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08628     21/11/1959 31/08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08631     05/12/1959 11/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08635     26/12/1959 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08643     30/01/1959 2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08650     18/03/1959 01/08/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08652     26/03/1959 20/06/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08669     02/01/1960 23/05/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08678     01/08/1959 30/10/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08694     21/11/1959 30/09/2008   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08700     20/01/1960 29/06/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08704     29/02/1960 05/11/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08764     17/03/1961 06/05/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08767     06/04/1961 31/01/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08769     04/03/1960 23/05/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08772     16/03/1960 14/01/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08773     19/03/1960 20/07/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08774     26/03/1960 20/09/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08780     18/04/1960 01/03/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08809     09/07/1960 01/12/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08846     16/05/1961 13/10/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08850     01/06/1961 11/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08871     17/11/1960 27/10/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08873     25/11/1960 01/12/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D4067     02/05/1961 13/12/1970   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D4092     02/05/1962 01/09/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08881     23/08/1961 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 09 09025     04/01/1962 31/08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 09 09026     21/01/1962 01/10/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08885     18/01/1962 07/05/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08896     12/04/1962 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08911     08/08/1962 01/05/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08913     23/08/1962 01/11/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08915     11/09/1962 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08927     28/12/1962 01/06/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08933     05/05/1962 30/09/2008   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08936     17/05/1962 11/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08937     24/05/1962 23/12/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08943     19/06/1962 20/07/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08947     28/08/1962 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 24 24032     29/07/1959 17/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 24 24054     18/12/1959 01/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 24 24061     15/01/1960 01/08/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 24 24081     19/03/1960 05/10/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25035     22/05/1963 15/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25057     21/06/1963 15/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25059     21/06/1963 20/03/1987   Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Diesel 25 25067     02/08/1963 12/12/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25072     17/09/1963 05/12/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25083     19/12/1963 01/07/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26007     30/07/1958 04/10/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26001     12/09/1958 04/10/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26002     02/10/1958 09/10/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26004     31/10/1958 24/11/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26010     06/01/1959 04/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26011     09/01/1959 24/11/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26014     30/01/1959 09/10/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26024     08/05/1959 09/10/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26025     14/05/1959 04/10/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26035     24/07/1959 10/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26038     28/08/1959 19/10/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26040     11/09/1959 04/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26043     02/10/1959 19/01/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27001     30/06/1961 08/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27005     30/08/1961 10/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27007     13/09/1961 28/01/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27024     17/01/1962 01/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27066     18/05/1962 01/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27050     20/06/1962 01/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27056     10/07/1962 01/02/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27059     30/08/1962 01/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31018     10/10/1957 10/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31101     16/10/1958 11/01/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31418     12/03/1959 06/10/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31108     16/04/1959 27/09/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31113     21/05/1959 30/07/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31115     04/06/1959 01/02/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 13/1 31139     15/10/1959 01/09/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31421     22/10/1959 01/03/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31162     14/01/1960 01/05/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31163     14/01/1960 19/01/1999   Operational www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 14/2 31166     25/01/1960 19/01/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31179     24/03/1960 01/11/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31188     28/04/1960 24/01/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31206     07/07/1960 30/11/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31216     18/08/1960 01/03/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31235     27/10/1960 26/05/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31410     24/11/1960 30/06/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 28 D5705     05/12/1958 07/09/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31270     01/06/1961 26/05/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31271     08/06/1961 01/05/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31414     14/09/1961 01/02/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31289     02/11/1961 01/03/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31297     11/01/1962 01/02/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33002     27/02/1960 01/09/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33008     21/05/1960 01/02/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 33/1 33102     25/06/1960 06/11/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33012     08/07/1960 01/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/1 33110     22/10/1960 01/09/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 33/1 33111     29/10/1960 24/06/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33018     12/11/1960 01/02/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 33/1 33117     17/12/1960 01/05/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33034     24/04/1961 25/01/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33035     06/05/1961 01/10/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33046     29/07/1961 31/03/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33048     26/08/1961 13/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33052     30/09/1961 13/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33053     14/10/1961 01/01/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33057     04/11/1961 31/08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33063     06/01/1962 13/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33065     13/01/1962 13/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/2 33201     02/02/1962 01/10/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 33/2 33202     09/02/1962 01/09/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 33/2 33208     23/03/1962 01/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37407     06/10/1965 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37403     22/10/1965 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37308     09/11/1965 01/01/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37119     02/12/1960 01/12/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37003     28/12/1960 21/01/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37009     17/02/1961 01/03/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37023     20/07/1961 31/12/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37025     31/08/1961 01/02/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37029     03/10/1961 31/12/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37353     09/03/1962 04/03/1994 1994-03-04 Operational 14/08/2013  
Diesel 37 37037     04/05/1962 01/08/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37038     11/05/1962 01/03/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37075     24/09/1962 26/11/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37518     08/10/1962 01/12/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37099     14/12/1962 17/06/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37108     25/01/1963 01/09/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37109     01/02/1963 01/01/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37116     01/03/1963 28/02/2007   Unserviceable www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 37 37679     25/04/1963 01/12/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37905     19/04/1963 01/12/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37142     17/05/1963 01/05/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37146     10/06/1963 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37901     01/07/1963 01/11/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37152     08/07/1963 01/12/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37372     26/06/1963 01/12/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37674     23/08/1963 01/01/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37175     20/09/1963 31/08/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37188     16/01/1964 31/03/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37190     21/01/1964 01/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37906     08/11/1963 01/01/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37215     01/01/1964 16/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37216     02/01/1964 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37219     16/01/1964 31/08/2005   Operational www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 37 37227     19/02/1964 31/01/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37248     30/10/1964 01/02/2009   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37250     10/12/1964 31/12/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37254     05/01/1965 31/01/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37255     06/01/1965 01/12/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37263     27/01/1965 31/01/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37264     29/01/1965 01/12/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37421     11/02/1965 01/04/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37418     18/03/1965 01/04/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37275     09/04/1965 01/01/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37413     15/04/1965 01/12/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37424     03/05/1965 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37294     08/07/1965 30/09/2008   Unknown  
Diesel 35 - Stone D7017     08/01/1962 13/03/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 35 - Stone D7018     18/01/1962 16/03/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 35 - Stone D7029     17/04/1962 28/02/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 35 - Stone D7076     03/05/1963 06/05/1973   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25173     12/01/1965 19/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25185     03/03/1965 05/11/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25191     29/03/1965 01/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25235     13/02/1964 01/03/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25244     03/06/1964 21/07/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25262     23/04/1966 01/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25265     12/06/1966 18/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25278     12/08/1965 01/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25279     07/09/1965 18/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25283     30/10/1965 01/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25309     21/07/1966 01/09/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25313     23/11/1966 18/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25321     25/02/1967 29/09/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25322     25/02/1967 01/09/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20050     18/06/1957 14/12/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20001     08/07/1957 20/04/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20007     19/09/1957 01/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20020     03/10/1959 01/10/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20031     20/01/1960 14/09/1990   Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Diesel 20 20035     18/09/1959 01/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20048     31/12/1959 01/11/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20059     12/05/1961 05/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20063     05/06/1961 01/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20069     30/06/1961 20/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20087     26/09/1961 04/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20096     26/10/1961 01/06/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20098     08/11/1961 24/06/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20110     10/01/1962 14/09/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20118     08/03/1962 03/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20228     12/01/1966 01/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20137     12/04/1966 01/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20139     26/04/1966 01/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20154     15/08/1966 01/04/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20168     19/10/1966 01/05/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20169     25/10/1966 07/12/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20177     18/11/1966 23/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20188     21/01/1967 01/01/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20189     21/01/1967 01/09/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 15 D8233     31/08/1960 16/02/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20205     22/04/1967 18/12/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20214     20/05/1967 09/06/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 17/1 D8568     06/01/1964 06/10/1971   Operational www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 55 55022 ROYAL SCOTS GREY   28/02/1961 02/01/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55002 THE KING'S OWN YORKSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY   19/03/1961 02/01/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55009 ALYCIDON   21/07/1961 02/01/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55015 TULYAR   13/10/1961 02/01/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55016 GORDON HIGHLANDER   27/10/1961 30/12/1981   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55019 ROYAL HIGHLAND FUSILIER   11/12/1961 31/12/1981   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9500     24/07/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9502     27/07/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9504     08/08/1964 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9513     06/10/1964 10/03/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9516     21/10/1964 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9518     30/10/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9520     12/11/1964 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9521     20/11/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9523     01/12/1964 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9524     11/12/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9525     13/01/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9526     06/01/1965 30/11/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9529     26/01/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9531     02/02/1965 30/12/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9537     16/03/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9539     09/04/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9551     02/09/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9553     16/09/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9555     22/10/1965 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12049     31/12/1949 03/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12052     31/03/1949 13/06/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12061     30/11/1949 09/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12077     31/10/1950 09/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12082     30/11/1950 03/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12083     30/11/1950 09/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12088     16/06/1951 11/05/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12093     08/09/1951 16/05/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12099     22/03/1952 17/07/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12131     15/11/1952 16/04/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 12 15224     31/10/1949 31/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel DELTIC DP1 DELTIC   24/10/1955 03/1961 1963-05-17 Unknown  
Diesel 56 56040     15/02/1978 08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56301     01/06/1978 04/2009   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56086     07/12/1980 09/2008   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56097     04/10/1981 23/03/2002   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56098     18/10/1981 08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56101     21/12/1981 09/2008   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56302     25/09/1983 04/2009   Unknown