Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 113 Today
» 1208 Yesterday
» 1321 Week
» 25282 Month
» 188336 Year
» 264923 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Preserved Steam Locomotives


Type Class Number Name Company To Service Withdrawn Date Preserved Status Last Updated Link
Steam 1361 1363     06/1910 20/11/1962   Unknown  
Steam 1366 1369     16/02/1934 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam 2800 2807     10/1905 03/1963   Unknown  
Steam 2800 2818     12/1905 10/1963   Unknown  
Steam 2800 2857     05/1918 04/1963   Unknown  
Steam 2800 2859     05/1918 12/1964   Unknown  
Steam 2800 2873     11/1918 12/1964   Unknown  
Steam 2800 2874     11/1918 05/1963   Unknown  
Steam 2251 3205     18/10/1946 05/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5700 3650     12/1939 09/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5700 3738     09/1937 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3802     29/12/1938 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3803     07/01/1939 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3814     11/03/1940 12/1964   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3822     25/04/1940 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3845     25/04/1942 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3850     11/06/1942 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3855     01/10/1942 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3862     04/11/1942 02/1965   Unknown  
Steam Star 4003 LODE STAR   02/1907 07/1951   Unknown  
Steam Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE   11/08/1923 10/05/1960   Unknown  
Steam Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE   04/03/1924 05/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4110     10/1936 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4121     12/1937 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4141     28/08/1946 03/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4144     10/09/1946 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4150     05/06/1947 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4160     06/09/1948 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4247     03/1916 04/1964   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4248     04/1916 05/1963   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4253     03/1917 04/1963   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4270     12/1919 09/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4277     04/1920 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 4500 4555     09/1924 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam 4500 4561     10/1924 05/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4500 4566     10/1924 04/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4575 4588     03/1937 07/1962   Unknown  
Steam 5700 4612     02/1942 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam 1400 1420     11/1933 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam 1400 1442     04/1935 05/1964   Unknown  
Steam 1400 1450     07/1935 05/1965   Unknown  
Steam 1400 1466     28/02/1936 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4920 DUMBLETON HALL   03/1929 03/12/1965   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4930 HAGLEY HALL   05/1929 12/1963 1972-00-00 Static Exhibit 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam Hall 4936 KINLET HALL   06/1929 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4942 MAINDY HALL   07/1929 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4953 PITCHFORD HALL   08/1929 05/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4979 WOOTON HALL   02/1930 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4983 ALBERT HALL   01/1931 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE   28/05/1934 28/12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE   13/03/1936 16/12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST   24/05/1936 24/05/1963   Unknown  
Steam Castle 5080 DEFIANT   25/05/1939 11/04/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5101 5164     11/1930 04/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5101 5193     10/1934 06/1962   Unknown  
Steam 5101 5199     11/1934 03/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5205 5224     05/1924 04/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5205 5239     08/1924 04/1963   Unknown  
Steam 7200 7229     03/1926 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam 7200 5264     03/1926 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam 7200 7200     07/1926 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam 7200 5275     07/1926 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam 7200 7202     08/1926 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 7200 5277     08/1926 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 4300 5322     08/1917 04/1964   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5521     12/1927 04/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5526     05/1928 06/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5532     06/1928 07/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5539     07/1928 04/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5541     08/1928 07/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5542     07/1928 12/1961   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5552     11/1928 10/1960   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5553     11/1928 11/1961   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5572     02/1929 04/1962   Unknown  
Steam 5600 5619     03/1925 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5600 5637     09/1925 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5600 5643     10/1925 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5600 5668     06/1926 09/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5700 5764     06/1929 05/1960   Unknown  
Steam 5700 5775     09/1929 09/02/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5700 5786     01/1930 04/1958   Unknown  
Steam Hall 5900 HINDERTON HALL   03/1931 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 5952 COGAN HALL   12/1935 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Hall 5967 BICKMARSH HALL   03/1937 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Hall 5972 OLTON HALL   04/1937 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam King 6000 KING GEORGE V   06/1927 04/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam King 6023 KING EDWARD II   06/1930 06/1962   Unknown  
Steam King 6024 KING EDWARD I   06/1930 06/1962   Unknown  
Steam 6100 6106     05/1931 12/1965   Unknown  
Steam 6400 6412     11/1934 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam 6400 6430     03/1937 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam 6400 6435     04/1937 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5600 6619     01/1928 03/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5600 6634     08/1928 04/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5600 6695     10/1928 07/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5600 6697     10/1928 05/1966   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6960 RAVENINGHAM HALL   06/03/1944 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6984 OWSDEN HALL   25/02/1948 03/12/1965   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6989 WIGHWICK HALL   25/03/1948 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6990 WITHERSLACK HALL   08/04/1948 03/12/1965   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6998 BURTON AGNES HALL   28/01/1949 12/1965   Unknown  
Steam Castle 7027 THORNBURY CASTLE   02/09/1949 28/12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Castle 7029 CLUN CASTLE   05/1950 12/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5700 7714     05/1930 01/1959 1973-00-00 Unserviceable 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam 5700 7715     05/1930 05/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5700 7752     11/1930 11/1959   Unknown  
Steam 5700 7754     12/1930 01/1959   Unknown  
Steam 5700 7760     12/1930 12/1961   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7802 BRADLEY MANOR   01/1938 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7808 COOKHAM MANOR   03/1938 12/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7819 HINTON MANOR   02/1939 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7820 DINMORE MANOR   30/11/1950 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7821 DITCHEAT MANOR   30/11/1950 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7822 FOXCOTE MANOR   31/12/1950 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7827 LYDHAM MANOR   31/12/1950 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7828 ODNEY MANOR   31/12/1950 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 7903 FOREMARKE HALL   08/04/1949 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 9000 9017     03/1938 10/1960   Unknown  
Steam 4300 7325     02/1932 04/1964   Static Exhibit 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam 9400 9400     02/1947 12/1959   Unknown  
Steam 9400 9466     29/02/1952 07/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9600     28/02/1945 09/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9629     13/12/1945 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9642     03/04/1946 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9681     03/05/1949 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9682     09/05/1949 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam BRIT 70000 BRITANNIA   05/01/1951 28/05/1966   Unknown  
Steam BRIT 70013 OLIVER CROMWELL   30/05/1951 17/08/1968   Operational 06/09/2011  
Steam DUKE 71000 DUKE OF GLOUCESTER   22/05/1954 24/11/1962   Unknown  
Steam BR5 73050     04/1954 06/1968   Unknown  
Steam BR5 73082 CAMELOT   07/1955 19/06/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR5 73096     11/1955 11/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR5 73129     08/1956 12/1967   Operational 22/03/2013 http://www.midlandrailway-butterley.co.uk/home/
Steam BR5 73156     12/1956 11/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75014     11/1951 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75027     05/1954 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75029     05/1954 08/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75069     09/1955 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75078     01/1956 07/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75079     01/1956 11/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/2 76017     06/1953 07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/2 76077     12/1956 12/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/2 76079     02/1957 12/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/2 76084     04/1957 12/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR2/1 78018     03/1954 11/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR2/1 78019     03/1954 11/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR2/1 78022     05/1954 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR2/1 78059     09/1956 11/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80002     17/10/1952 01/03/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80064     09/06/1953 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80072     03/11/1953 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80078     02/02/1954 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80079     05/03/1954 24/07/1965   Operational 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam BR4/3 80080     18/03/1954 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80097     09/12/1954 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80098     22/12/1954 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80100     31/01/1955 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80104     31/03/1955 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80105     19/04/1955 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80135     30/04/1956 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80136     11/05/1956 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80151     18/01/1957 07/05/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92134     30/06/1957 12/1966 1980-12-09 Under Restoration/Overhaul 23/06/2011 www.cvr-extra.wanadoo.co.uk/92134.htm
Steam BR9F 92203     30/04/1959 11/1967 1967-11-00 Operational 23/06/2011 www.eastsomersetrailway.com/stock.php?num=92203
Steam BR9F 92207     30/06/1959 12/1964   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92212     30/09/1959 30/01/1968   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92214     31/10/1959 09/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92219     31/01/1960 09/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92220 EVENING STAR   31/03/1960 03/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92240     31/10/1958 09/1965   Unknown  
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 46100 ROYAL SCOT   19/06/1930 13/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 46115 SCOTS GUARDSMAN   09/10/1927 01/01/1966   Unknown  
Steam Coronation (Semi) 46229 DUCHESS OF HAMILTON   09/1938 02/1964   Unknown  
Steam Coronation (Semi) 46233 DUCHESS OF SUTHERLAND   07/1938 02/1964   Operational 30/06/2011  
Steam Coronation (Semi) 46235 CITY OF BIRMINGHAM   07/1939 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam Crab 42700     19/06/1926 19/03/1966   Unknown  
Steam Crab 42765     12/08/1927 10/12/1966   Unknown  
Steam Crab 42859     21/03/1930 31/12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 4P-F 42500     28/03/1934 18/06/1962   Unknown  
Steam Jubilee 45593 KOLHAPUR   12/1934 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam Jubilee 45596 BAHAMAS   12/01/1935 23/07/1966   Unknown  
Steam Jubilee 45690 LEANDER   09/03/1936 03/1964   Unknown  
Steam Jubilee 45699 GALATEA   15/04/1936 21/11/1964   Unknown  
Steam Glen 256 GLEN DOUGLAS   09/1913 17/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam D40 62277 GORDON HIGHLANDER   10/1920 23/06/1958   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47279     08/1924 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47298     10/1924 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47324     06/1926 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47327     07/1926 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47357     07/1926 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47383     10/1926 10/1967   Static Exhibit 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam 3F-F 47406     12/1926 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47445     05/1927 04/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47493     02/1928 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47564     04/1928 03/1965   Unknown  
Steam 4F-B 43924     10/1920 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam 4F-C 44027     11/1924 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam 4F-C 44123     07/1925 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam 4F-C 44422     10/1927 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam SDJ7F 53808     07/1925 03/1964   Unknown  
Steam SDJ7F 53809     07/1925 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Compound 41000     01/1902 09/1951   Static Exhibit 19/03/2011 www.nrm.org.uk/
Steam 1F-A 41708     06/1880 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2F-M 58850     12/1899 10/09/1960   Unknown  
Steam Coal Tank 58926     09/1888 10/1958 1958-00-00 Under Restoration/Overhaul 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk/
Steam Standard Passenger 55189     01/1908 29/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam 2MT-A 41241     09/1949 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT-A 41298     10/1951 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam 2MT-A 41312     05/1952 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam 2MT-A 41313     05/1952 24/10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Motor Tanks 30053     12/1905 05/1964   Unknown  
Steam USA 30064     1943 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam USA 30065     1943 06/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam USA 30070     1943 06/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam USA 30072     1943 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam B4 30096     11/1893 10/1963   Unknown  
Steam B4 30102     12/1893 09/1963   Unknown  
Steam Greyhounds 30120     08/1899 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam Motor Tanks 30245     04/1897 17/11/1962   Unknown  
Steam S15 30499     05/1920 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30506     10/1920 05/01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Beattie Tanks 30585     05/1874 29/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam Beattie Tanks 30587     06/1874 29/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam King Arthur 30777 SIR LAMIEL   06/1925 10/1961   Unknown  
Steam S15 30825     04/1927 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30828     07/1927 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30830     08/1927 07/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30841     07/1936 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30847     12/1936 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Lord Nelson 30850 LORD NELSON   08/1926 18/08/1962   Unknown  
Steam Schools 30925 CHELTENHAM   04/1934 30/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam Schools 30926 REPTON   05/1934 30/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam Schools 30928 STOWE   06/1934 17/11/1962   Unknown  
Steam P 31027     02/1910 03/1961   Unknown  
Steam O1 31065     09/1896 06/1961   Unknown  
Steam P 31178     02/1910 06/1958   Unknown  
Steam H 31263     05/1905 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam P 31323     07/1910 07/1960   Unknown  
Steam P 31556     02/1909 06/1961   Unknown  
Steam C 31592     02/1902 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam U Boats 31618     10/1928 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam U Boats 31625     03/1929 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam U Boats 31638     05/1931 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Coppernobs 31737     11/1901 10/1956   Unknown  
Steam U Boats 31806     06/1928 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Mongolipers 31874     09/1925 03/1964   Unknown  
Steam Radials 32473     06/1898 27/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam Charlies 33001     03/1942 05/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35005 CANADIAN PACIFIC   12/1941 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35006 PENINSULAR & ORIENTAL S.N. CO.   12/1941 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35009 SHAW SAVILL   07/1942 09/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35010 BLUE STAR   08/1942 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35011 GENERAL STEAM NAVIGATION   12/1944 02/1966   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35018 BRITISH INDIA LINE   05/1945 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35022     10/1948 05/1966   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35025     11/1948 09/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35027     12/1948 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35028     12/1948 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35029     02/1949 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48151     09/1942 13/01/1968   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48173     06/1943 31/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48305     11/1943 13/01/1968   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48431     11/03/1944 06/05/1964   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48518     08/1944 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48624     12/1943 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48773     06/1940 10/08/1968   Operational 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam 21 51218     10/1901 09/1964 1964-00-00 Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Steam COR1 3     01/01/1878 10/1948   Unknown  
Steam 3F-J 57566     08/1899 08/1963   Unknown  
Steam Tilbury Tanks 41966     05/1909 06/1956   Unknown  
Steam COR2 4     01/01/1921 10/1948   Unknown  
Steam LYR25 52044     08/1887 07/1959   Unknown  
Steam LYR27 52322     01/1896 08/1960   Unknown  
Steam LYR5 50621     02/1899 09/1954   Unknown  
Steam W_L 822     09/1902 08/1961   Unknown  
Steam W_L 823     09/1902 07/1962   Unknown  
Steam J69/1 68633     09/1904 24/11/1960   Static Exhibit 20/03/2011 www.nrm.org.uk/
Steam Duck Eight 49395     11/1921 11/1959   Unknown  
Steam J17 65567     05/1905 06/08/1962   Unknown  
Steam CarR 1338     05/1898 09/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32636     09/1872 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32640     03/1878 09/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32646     01/1877 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32650     12/1876 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32655     12/1875 05/1960   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32662     10/1875 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32670     12/1872 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32678     07/1880 10/1963   Unknown  
Steam Q 30541     23/01/1939 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam T3 563     03/1893 08/1945   Unknown  
Steam 415 30583     03/1885 07/1961   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34007 WADEBRIDGE   08/1945 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34010 SIDMOUTH   09/1945 03/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34016 BODMIN   11/1945 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34023 BLACKMORE VALE   02/1946 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34027 TAW VALLEY   04/1946 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34028 EDDYSTONE   04/1946 05/1964   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34039 BOSCASTLE   09/1946 05/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34046 BRAUNTON   11/1946 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34051 WINSTON CHURCHILL   12/1946 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34053 SIR KEITH PARK   01/1947 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34058 SIR FREDERICK PILE   03/1947 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34059 SIR ARCHIBALD SINCLAIR   04/1947 05/1966   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34067 TANGMERE   09/1947 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34070 MANSTON   11/1947 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34072 257 SQUADRON   04/1948 10/1964 1984-11-00 Under Restoration/Overhaul 29/12/2010 www.southern-locomotives.co.uk/34072/34072_Restoration.html
Steam Air Smoothed 34073 249 SQUADRON   05/1948 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34081     09/1948 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34092 CITY OF WELLS   09/1949 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34101     02/1950 07/1966   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34105     03/1950 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam 1008 50621     02/1889 09/1954   Unknown  
Steam Lobster 42968     24/01/1934 31/12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 4F-A 43106     10/04/1951 22/06/1968   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46428     04/12/1948 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46441     02/1950 04/1967   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46443     02/1950 03/1967   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46447     03/1950 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46464     06/1950 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46512     16/12/1952 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46521     19/02/1953 10/1966   Unknown  
Steam 4P-C 42073     17/11/1950 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam 4P-C 42085     27/02/1951 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 44767     12/1947 12/1967   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 44806     07/1944 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 44871     03/1945 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 44932     09/1945 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45000     03/1935 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45025     08/1934 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45110     06/1935 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45163     08/1935 05/1965   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45212     11/1935 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45231     08/1936 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45293     12/1937 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45305     01/1937 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45337     04/1937 02/1965   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45379     07/1937 07/1965   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45407     09/1937 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45428     10/1937 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45491     12/1943 07/1965   Unknown  
Steam Princess Royal 46201 PRINCESS ELIZABETH   03/11/1933 20/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam Princess Royal 46203 PRINCESS MARGARET ROSE   01/07/1935 20/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam A4 60009 UNION OF SOUTH AFRICA   29/06/1937 01/06/1966   Unknown  
Steam A4 60010 DOMINION OF CANADA   04/05/1937 29/05/1965   Unknown  
Steam A4 60008 DWIGHT D EISENHOWER   04/09/1937 20/07/1963   Unknown  
Steam A4 60007 SIR NIGEL GRESLEY   30/10/1937 01/02/1966   Unknown  
Steam A4 60019 BITTERN   18/12/1937 05/09/1966   Unknown  
Steam A4 60022 MALLARD   03/03/1938 25/04/1963   Unknown  
Steam A3 60103 FLYING SCOTSMAN   24/02/1923 15/01/1963   Unknown  
Steam A2 60532 BLUE PETER   25/03/1948 31/12/1966   Unknown  
Steam B1 61264     05/12/1947 21/11/1965 1976-07-00 Unknown 17/12/2012  
Steam B1 61306     05/04/1948 30/09/1967   Unknown  
Steam B12/3 61572     08/1928 20/09/1961   Unknown  
Steam Large Director 62660 BUTLER-HENDERSON   12/1919 11/1960   Unknown  
Steam Shire/Hunt 62712 MORAYSHIRE   20/02/1928 03/07/1961   Unknown  
Steam E4 62785     01/1895 12/1959   Unknown  
Steam E5 1463     05/1885 08/1927   Unknown  
Steam J15 65462     03/1912 16/09/1962   Unknown  
Steam J21 Simple 65033     03/1889 23/04/1962   Unknown  
Steam J27 65894     09/1923 09/1967   Unknown  
Steam J36 65243 MAUDE   12/1891 07/1966   Unknown  
Steam J52/2 68846     05/1899 05/1959   Unknown  
Steam J72 59     04/1951 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam J94 68077     01/1947 29/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam J94 68078     07/1946 10/03/1963   Unknown  
Steam K1 62005     10/06/1949 30/12/1967   Unknown  
Steam K4 61994 THE GREAT MARQUESS   07/1938 18/12/1961   Unknown  
Steam N2 69523     02/1921 16/09/1962   Unknown  
Steam N7/4 69621     03/1924 11/09/1962   Unknown  
Steam O4/1 63601     01/1912 16/06/1963 1963-06-23 Unserviceable 20/03/2011 www.nrm.org.uk/
Steam Q6 63395     12/1918 09/09/1967   Unknown  
Steam Q7 63460     10/1919 03/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam V2 60800 GREEN ARROW   13/06/1936 21/08/1962   Unknown  
Steam Y1/2 54     12/1933 06/1961   Unknown