Miscellaneous Reports
LNWR 0-8-0/2-8-0 rebuilds
The history of the London North Western 0-8-0 and 2-8-0 classes designed by Beames, Bowen Cooke, Whale and Webb is somewhat complex. The original class was the A Compound designed by Webb in 1893, of which 111 appeared. Webb experimented with compound locomotives and the A class had two 'normal' high pressure cylinders on the outside and a much larger low pressure cylinder between the frames. In August 1901, Webb introduced the B class which was a four cylinder compound - this time there were two low pressure cylinders between the frames. 170 of these were built.
Webb was succeeded by George Whale and he was no proponent of the compound locomotive - in November 1904 he started rebuilding the A class 3 cylinder compounds by replacing all cylinders with two inside high pressure ones, thereby creating class C of which 15 conversions were done before March 1906. These weren't particularly successful as they did not produce enough steam for the new cylinders, so further conversions of class A received bigger boilers and became class D (again with the replacement cylinder configuration). 62 locomotives were treated, plus the prototype LNWR 0-8-0 number 2524 of 1892, making 63 in total.
By March 1909, just 34 class A compounds were still running in their original form and Bowen Cooke, who had taken over as CME from Whale, recognised that the A->C conversions were short on steam due to the larger cylinders and smallish boiler. So, for the remaining conversions he supplied smaller 18½" cylinders and these 34 engines became class C1.
As for the Webb 4 cylinder compounds (class B), George Whale considered them to have too big an overhang at the front and so he embarked on a conversion of 26 of them, adding a pony truck to convert them into class E. During the period 5/06 to 8/08, 10 larger boilers (of the "Experiment" passenger engine type) were fitted during conversion resulting in class F 2-8-0's. These were augmented by a pair of reboilerings of the class E 2-8-0's.
With the larger boiler available, Whale found that enough steam was available to work the existing inside cylinders of the class B 4 cylinder compounds and so he removed the outside cylinders, resulting in class G 0-8-0's. 32 conversions were done and then, just before he retired, Whale ordered a further batch of new class G's - 60 in all, resulting in 92 class G. The conversions and new builds differed in their outward appearance as the conversions retained the 'piano' front low pressure cylinder covers of the original Webb locomotives.
When Bowen Cooke became CME he looked at superheating the remaining B->G class conversions and these became class G1. 91 class B compounds were converted to superheated class G1's. These were almost the pinnacle of the development of the LNWR 0-8-0's and when Beames allowed an order for some slightly modified Bowen Cooke class G1's to be delivered with a higher pressure and improved motion in 1921/2 (known as class G2), the peak was reached. In LMS days, after 1935, a programme of improving the motion and increasing the boiler pressure of the G1's was undertaken, resulting in the G2a class, which were almost the same as the G2's which were a new build.
The following table demonstrates the complexity of the rebuilding of these fine locos, some of which lasted 60 years or more.
Built | LNWR Number | LMS Number | BR Number | Webb 3 Cyl Compound Class A | Webb 4 Cyl Compound Class B | Whale Simple Class C | Whale Simple Class C1 | Whale Simple Class D | Whale 2-8-0 Class E | Whale 2-8-0 Class F | Class G | Class G1 | Class G2 | Class G2a | Condemned |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/1902 | 2570 | 9367 | 49367 | 10/1902 | 08/1906 | 10/1921 | 02/1946 | 02/11/1957 | |||||||
09/1893 | 50 | 9008 | 49008 | 09/1893 | 07/1906 | 03/1924 | 08/1943 | 08/12/1962 | |||||||
11/1894 | 2526 | 9043 | 49043 | 11/1894 | 03/1908 | 02/1928 | 09/1949 | ||||||||
11/1894 | 2527 | 9051 | 49051 | 11/1894 | 07/1908 | 05/1930 | 08/1939 | 15/02/1957 | |||||||
11/1894 | 2528 | 9027 | 49027 | 11/1894 | 07/1907 | 12/1926 | 12/1940 | 21/11/1959 | |||||||
11/1894 | 2529 | 8954 | 48954 | 11/1894 | 03/1905 | 01/1925 | 12/1940 | 16/07/1949 | |||||||
02/1895 | 2530 | 9049 | 49049 | 02/1895 | 05/1908 | 03/1930 | 09/1946 | 01/12/1962 | |||||||
02/1895 | 2531 | 8978 | 02/1895 | 12/1909 | 11/1932 | ||||||||||
02/1895 | 2532 | 9029 | 49029 | 02/1895 | 08/1907 | 02/1926 | 12/1939 | 13/05/1950 | |||||||
02/1895 | 2533 | 8979 | 02/1895 | 01/1910 | 10/1929 | ||||||||||
02/1895 | 2534 | 9000 | 02/1895 | 08/1912 | 11/1927 | ||||||||||
02/1895 | 2535 | 8986 | 02/1895 | 05/1910 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
08/1896 | 2536 | 9033 | 49033 | 08/1896 | 10/1907 | 01/1928 | 02/1940 | 10/12/1957 | |||||||
08/1896 | 2537 | 9019 | 49019 | 08/1896 | 04/1907 | 06/1925 | 05/1940 | 06/1949 | |||||||
08/1896 | 2538 | 8962 | 48962 | 08/1896 | 09/1905 | 06/1927 | 12/1948 | ||||||||
08/1896 | 2539 | 9031 | 49031 | 08/1896 | 09/1907 | 12/1927 | 03/1943 | 05/1951 | |||||||
08/1896 | 2540 | 9020 | 49020 | 08/1896 | 04/1907 | 02/1928 | 08/1938 | 07/10/1961 | |||||||
08/1896 | 2541 | 8953 | 48953 | 08/1896 | 11/1904 | 12/1926 | 12/1939 | 07/10/1961 | |||||||
08/1896 | 2542 | 8990 | 08/1896 | 08/1910 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
08/1896 | 2543 | 8981 | 08/1896 | 02/1910 | 06/1930 | ||||||||||
08/1896 | 2544 | 9040 | 49040 | 08/1896 | 02/1908 | 06/1937 | 04/1949 | ||||||||
08/1896 | 2545 | 8980 | 08/1896 | 01/1910 | 03/1930 | ||||||||||
09/1896 | 2546 | 8969 | 09/1896 | 04/1909 | 12/1932 | ||||||||||
09/1896 | 2547 | 9012 | 49012 | 09/1896 | 12/1906 | 02/1928 | 11/12/1948 | ||||||||
09/1896 | 2548 | 9004 | 49004 | 09/1896 | 05/1906 | 02/1928 | 03/1941 | 06/1949 | |||||||
12/1896 | 2549 | 8963 | 12/1896 | 09/1905 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
12/1896 | 2550 | 8976 | 12/1896 | 11/1909 | 12/1932 | ||||||||||
12/1896 | 2551 | 9034 | 49034 | 12/1896 | 10/1907 | 05/1925 | 08/1940 | 22/09/1962 | |||||||
12/1896 | 2552 | 9052 | 49052 | 12/1896 | 07/1908 | 03/1930 | 04/1949 | ||||||||
12/1896 | 2553 | 8958 | 12/1896 | 07/1905 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
12/1896 | 2554 | 8997 | 12/1896 | 06/1911 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
12/1896 | 2555 | 8998 | 12/1896 | 07/1911 | 05/1932 | ||||||||||
10/1897 | 1801 | 8977 | 10/1897 | 12/1909 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
10/1897 | 1802 | 9016 | 49016 | 10/1897 | 03/1907 | 01/1928 | 10/1939 | 03/1949 | |||||||
10/1897 | 1803 | 8967 | 10/1897 | 03/1906 | 10/1927 | ||||||||||
10/1897 | 1804 | 9017 | 49017 | 10/1897 | 03/1907 | 11/1934 | 06/1952 | ||||||||
10/1897 | 1805 | 8959 | 10/1897 | 08/1905 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
10/1897 | 1806 | 8984 | 10/1897 | 05/1910 | 03/1928 | ||||||||||
10/1897 | 1807 | 8961 | 10/1897 | 09/1905 | 04/1932 | ||||||||||
10/1897 | 1808 | 9047 | 49047 | 10/1897 | 05/1908 | 06/1933 | 07/1929 | 04/01/1958 | |||||||
10/1897 | 1809 | 8971 | 10/1897 | 07/1909 | 10/1927 | ||||||||||
10/1897 | 1810 | 8955 | 10/1897 | 04/1905 | 10/1927 | ||||||||||
10/1897 | 1811 | 8991 | 10/1897 | 01/1911 | 12/1932 | ||||||||||
10/1897 | 1812 | 9014 | 49014 | 10/1897 | 02/1907 | 05/1931 | 09/1938 | 05/1951 | |||||||
11/1897 | 1813 | 9060 | 49060 | 11/1897 | 11/1908 | 06/1927 | 05/1949 | ||||||||
11/1897 | 1814 | 8960 | 11/1897 | 08/1905 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
11/1897 | 1815 | 9044 | 49044 | 11/1897 | 04/1908 | 01/1927 | 10/1939 | 24/10/1959 | |||||||
11/1897 | 1816 | 9045 | 49045 | 11/1897 | 04/1908 | 10/1930 | 05/1939 | 22/12/1962 | |||||||
12/1897 | 1817 | 8999 | 12/1897 | 07/1912 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
12/1897 | 1818 | 9013 | 49013 | 12/1897 | 01/1907 | 04/1930 | 04/1948 | ||||||||
12/1897 | 1819 | 9058 | 49058 | 12/1897 | 10/1908 | 02/1928 | 03/1950 | ||||||||
01/1898 | 1820 | 9050 | 49050 | 01/1898 | 07/1908 | 10/1932 | 10/1950 | ||||||||
04/1898 | 1821 | 9064 | 49064 | 04/1898 | 03/1909 | 08/1926 | 01/1939 | 04/06/1960 | |||||||
04/1898 | 1822 | 9005 | 49005 | 04/1898 | 06/1906 | 01/1928 | 04/1941 | 10/08/1957 | |||||||
04/1898 | 1823 | 8965 | 04/1898 | 12/1905 | 11/1927 | ||||||||||
04/1898 | 1824 | 9035 | 49035 | 04/1898 | 11/1907 | 10/1930 | 11/1940 | 24/01/1957 | |||||||
04/1898 | 1825 | 9053 | 49053 | 04/1898 | 08/1908 | 05/1929 | 06/1947 | 05/1950 | |||||||
04/1898 | 1826 | 8995 | 04/1898 | 04/1911 | 11/1930 | ||||||||||
05/1898 | 1827 | 9018 | 49018 | 05/1898 | 03/1907 | 01/1928 | 02/1941 | 05/09/1959 | |||||||
05/1898 | 1828 | 8957 | 05/1898 | 07/1905 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
05/1898 | 1829 | 8988 | 05/1898 | 08/1910 | 10/1930 | ||||||||||
05/1898 | 1830 | 9041 | 49041 | 05/1898 | 03/1908 | 09/1929 | 12/1944 | 08/1950 | |||||||
07/1898 | 1831 | 9039 | 49039 | 07/1898 | 02/1908 | 12/1934 | 03/1940 | 14/01/1950 | |||||||
07/1898 | 1832 | 9038 | 49038 | 07/1898 | 01/1908 | 09/1934 | 04/1948 | ||||||||
07/1898 | 1833 | 9009 | 49009 | 07/1898 | 10/1906 | 07/1937 | 06/1940 | 28/11/1959 | |||||||
07/1898 | 1834 | 9028 | 49028 | 07/1898 | 08/1907 | 08/1930 | 12/1939 | 03/03/1956 | |||||||
07/1898 | 1835 | 9001 | 07/1898 | 08/1912 | 07/1928 | ||||||||||
07/1898 | 1836 | 9061 | 49061 | 07/1898 | 02/1909 | 08/1930 | 05/1940 | 07/10/1961 | |||||||
07/1898 | 1837 | 9055 | 49055 | 07/1898 | 09/1908 | 04/1930 | 08/1940 | 03/1949 | |||||||
08/1898 | 1838 | 9032 | 49032 | 08/1898 | 10/1907 | 09/1928 | 03/06/1950 | ||||||||
08/1898 | 1839 | 9010 | 49010 | 08/1898 | 10/1906 | 11/1931 | 11/1939 | 06/06/1959 | |||||||
08/1898 | 1840 | 8975 | 08/1898 | 11/1909 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
10/1898 | 1841 | 8983 | 10/1898 | 04/1910 | 12/1930 | ||||||||||
10/1898 | 1842 | 8966 | 48966 | 10/1898 | 01/1906 | 08/1926 | 12/1944 | 18/02/1950 | |||||||
10/1898 | 1843 | 9048 | 49048 | 10/1898 | 05/1908 | 09/1933 | 12/1939 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||
10/1898 | 1844 | 8985 | 10/1898 | 05/1910 | 11/1930 | ||||||||||
10/1898 | 1845 | 9003 | 49003 | 10/1898 | 04/1906 | 10/1932 | 02/1940 | 03/1949 | |||||||
10/1898 | 1846 | 9059 | 49059 | 10/1898 | 10/1908 | 01/1928 | 11/02/1950 | ||||||||
10/1898 | 1847 | 8982 | 10/1898 | 03/1910 | 03/1930 | ||||||||||
10/1898 | 1848 | 9022 | 49022 | 10/1898 | 06/1907 | 07/1926 | 06/1939 | 05/1951 | |||||||
10/1898 | 1849 | 8987 | 10/1898 | 06/1910 | 02/1928 | ||||||||||
11/1898 | 1850 | 8970 | 11/1898 | 06/1909 | 11/1927 | ||||||||||
02/1899 | 1851 | 8992 | 02/1899 | 01/1911 | 11/1932 | ||||||||||
02/1899 | 1852 | 8993 | 02/1899 | 02/1911 | 11/1932 | ||||||||||
02/1899 | 1853 | 9036 | 49036 | 02/1899 | 11/1907 | 02/1928 | 06/1940 | 12/1949 | |||||||
02/1899 | 1854 | 9023 | 49023 | 02/1899 | 06/1907 | 02/1928 | 02/1942 | 07/10/1961 | |||||||
02/1899 | 1855 | 8964 | 48964 | 02/1899 | 10/1905 | 06/1926 | 07/1940 | 21/04/1962 | |||||||
02/1899 | 1856 | 9026 | 49026 | 02/1899 | 07/1907 | 04/1925 | 09/1938 | 09/1949 | |||||||
02/1899 | 1857 | 9042 | 49042 | 02/1899 | 03/1908 | 05/1929 | 04/1940 | 04/1949 | |||||||
02/1899 | 1858 | 8996 | 02/1899 | 05/1911 | 11/1927 | ||||||||||
02/1899 | 1859 | 8994 | 02/1899 | 03/1911 | 08/1930 | ||||||||||
02/1899 | 1860 | 8956 | 02/1899 | 06/1905 | 11/1927 | ||||||||||
05/1899 | 1861 | 8972 | 05/1899 | 08/1909 | 02/1930 | ||||||||||
05/1899 | 1862 | 8968 | 05/1899 | 03/1909 | 11/1927 | ||||||||||
05/1899 | 1863 | 9006 | 49006 | 05/1899 | 07/1906 | 11/1927 | 05/1944 | 26/05/1951 | |||||||
05/1899 | 1864 | 9063 | 49063 | 05/1899 | 06/1909 | 03/1930 | 09/1946 | 29/08/1959 | |||||||
05/1899 | 1865 | 9062 | 49062 | 05/1899 | 02/1909 | 10/1934 | 08/1942 | 26/05/1951 | |||||||
05/1899 | 1866 | 9002 | 49002 | 05/1899 | 03/1906 | 12/1932 | 12/1939 | 15/09/1962 | |||||||
05/1899 | 1867 | 8973 | 05/1899 | 08/1909 | 05/1933 | ||||||||||
05/1899 | 1868 | 9056 | 49056 | 05/1899 | 09/1908 | 12/1933 | 08/1948 | ||||||||
05/1899 | 1869 | 8989 | 05/1899 | 08/1910 | 11/1928 | ||||||||||
05/1899 | 1870 | 9057 | 49057 | 05/1899 | 09/1908 | 07/1923 | 05/1940 | 18/05/1957 | |||||||
04/1900 | 1871 | 9030 | 49030 | 04/1900 | 09/1907 | 06/1926 | 23/06/1951 | ||||||||
05/1900 | 1872 | 9015 | 49015 | 05/1900 | 02/1907 | 08/1930 | 05/1949 | ||||||||
05/1900 | 1873 | 9007 | 49007 | 05/1900 | 07/1906 | 03/1926 | 02/1940 | 07/10/1961 | |||||||
05/1900 | 1874 | 9054 | 49054 | 05/1900 | 08/1908 | 02/1928 | 04/1949 | ||||||||
05/1900 | 1875 | 8974 | 05/1900 | 09/1909 | 01/1930 | ||||||||||
05/1900 | 1876 | 9021 | 49021 | 05/1900 | 05/1907 | 11/1927 | 07/1939 | 07/10/1961 | |||||||
05/1900 | 1877 | 9046 | 49046 | 05/1900 | 04/1908 | 12/1927 | 06/1940 | 08/03/1957 | |||||||
05/1900 | 1878 | 9024 | 49024 | 05/1900 | 06/1907 | 02/1928 | 03/1941 | 23/02/1957 | |||||||
05/1900 | 1879 | 9025 | 49025 | 05/1900 | 06/1907 | 05/1928 | 11/1942 | 15/09/1962 | |||||||
05/1900 | 1880 | 9037 | 49037 | 05/1900 | 12/1907 | 01/1928 | 07/1940 | 29/12/1962 | |||||||
08/1901 | 1881 | 8900 | 08/1901 | 07/1928 | |||||||||||
09/1901 | 1882 | 9344 | 49344 | 09/1901 | 02/1920 | 10/1939 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
09/1901 | 1883 | 9319 | 49319 | 09/1901 | 11/1904 | 09/1918 | 03/1942 | 10/1950 | |||||||
09/1901 | 1884 | 9266 | 49266 | 09/1901 | 12/1904 | 08/1917 | 08/1941 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||
09/1901 | 1885 | 9267 | 49267 | 09/1901 | 01/1905 | 08/1917 | 11/1946 | 01/12/1962 | |||||||
09/1901 | 1886 | 9390 | 49390 | 09/1901 | 08/1904 | 01/1923 | 02/1940 | 21/12/1957 | |||||||
09/1901 | 1887 | 9148 | 49148 | 09/1901 | 08/1914 | 01/1936 | 06/1941 | 31/07/1957 | |||||||
09/1901 | 1888 | 9600 | 48892 | 09/1901 | 12/1904 | 01/1924 | 01/1949 | ||||||||
09/1901 | 1889 | 9345 | 49345 | 09/1901 | 08/1906 | 06/1920 | 03/1942 | 31/01/1958 | |||||||
09/1901 | 1890 | 8901 | 48901 | 09/1901 | 03/1924 | 01/1947 | 17/05/1952 | ||||||||
12/1901 | 1891 | 9348 | 49348 | 12/1901 | 11/1907 | 12/1920 | 06/1940 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||
12/1901 | 1892 | 8902 | 48902 | 12/1901 | 05/1925 | 21/02/1953 | |||||||||
12/1901 | 1893 | 9085 | 49085 | 12/1901 | 03/1910 | 01/1943 | 09/1928 | 12/08/1950 | |||||||
12/1901 | 1894 | 9391 | 49391 | 12/1901 | 01/1923 | 11/1945 | 20/01/1962 | ||||||||
12/1901 | 1895 | 9066 | 49066 | 12/1901 | 05/1908 | 01/1924 | 10/1938 | 02/11/1957 | |||||||
12/1901 | 1896 | 9380 | 12/1901 | 05/1922 | 11/1947 | ||||||||||
12/1901 | 1897 | 9370 | 49370 | 12/1901 | 12/1921 | 30/06/1951 | |||||||||
12/1901 | 1898 | 9385 | 49385 | 12/1901 | 10/1922 | 09/1947 | 21/12/1957 | ||||||||
12/1901 | 1899 | 9382 | 49382 | 12/1901 | 06/1922 | 11/1940 | 22/09/1962 | ||||||||
12/1901 | 1900 | 9065 | 49065 | 12/1901 | 11/1906 | 06/1924 | 08/1939 | 03/1950 | |||||||
03/1902 | 813 | 8903 | 48903 | 03/1902 | 02/1923 | 11/1938 | 09/1949 | ||||||||
04/1902 | 815 | 9375 | 49375 | 04/1902 | 02/1922 | 10/1940 | 08/12/1962 | ||||||||
04/1902 | 823 | 8904 | 48904 | 04/1902 | 05/1923 | 10/1949 | |||||||||
04/1902 | 826 | 8905 | 48905 | 04/1902 | 01/1927 | 12/1938 | 06/06/1959 | ||||||||
04/1902 | 843 | 8906 | 48906 | 04/1902 | 10/1923 | 03/1949 | |||||||||
04/1902 | 859 | 9336 | 04/1902 | 05/1919 | 02/1941 | 07/1947 | |||||||||
04/1902 | 898 | 9146 | 49146 | 04/1902 | 06/1911 | 03/1932 | 05/1941 | 28/02/1958 | |||||||
04/1902 | 899 | 9610 | 48896 | 04/1902 | 05/1907 | 06/1923 | 06/1940 | 01/1950 | |||||||
04/1902 | 904 | 9337 | 49337 | 04/1902 | 05/1919 | 01/1948 | 16/07/1949 | ||||||||
04/1902 | 905 | 9601 | 04/1902 | 11/1905 | 07/1928 | ||||||||||
05/1902 | 18 | 9602 | 05/1902 | 11/1905 | 04/1928 | ||||||||||
05/1902 | 352 | 9611 | 05/1902 | 01/1907 | 12/1927 | ||||||||||
05/1902 | 405 | 8907 | 48907 | 05/1902 | 02/1926 | 07/1946 | 28/09/1957 | ||||||||
05/1902 | 2074 | 8908 | 48908 | 05/1902 | 08/1923 | 09/09/1950 | |||||||||
05/1902 | 2114 | 9386 | 49386 | 05/1902 | 07/1908 | 10/1922 | 05/1939 | 28/11/1959 | |||||||
05/1902 | 2342 | 8909 | 48909 | 05/1902 | 03/1923 | 01/1940 | 02/1949 | ||||||||
05/1902 | 2369 | 8910 | 48910 | 05/1902 | 05/1923 | 01/1948 | |||||||||
05/1902 | 2496 | 8911 | 48911 | 05/1902 | 04/1923 | 31/12/1949 | |||||||||
05/1902 | 842 | 9338 | 49338 | 05/1902 | 06/1919 | 04/1949 | |||||||||
05/1902 | 906 | 9612 | 48897 | 05/1902 | 12/1907 | 05/1923 | 08/1944 | 10/1949 | |||||||
07/1902 | 2556 | 8912 | 48912 | 07/1902 | 05/1923 | 08/1948 | |||||||||
08/1902 | 2557 | 8913 | 48913 | 08/1902 | 07/1924 | 28/08/1948 | |||||||||
08/1902 | 2558 | 9603 | 08/1902 | 03/1906 | 12/1928 | ||||||||||
08/1902 | 2559 | 8914 | 48914 | 08/1902 | 01/1924 | 10/1939 | 13/07/1957 | ||||||||
08/1902 | 2560 | 8915 | 48915 | 08/1902 | 04/1923 | 05/1946 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||
08/1902 | 2561 | 8916 | 08/1902 | 11/1928 | |||||||||||
08/1902 | 2562 | 9152 | 49152 | 08/1902 | 06/1917 | 03/1930 | 09/1948 | ||||||||
08/1902 | 2563 | 9604 | 48893 | 08/1902 | 06/1908 | 11/1924 | 12/1941 | 31/10/1954 | |||||||
08/1902 | 2564 | 8917 | 48917 | 08/1902 | 04/1924 | 03/1946 | 09/11/1957 | ||||||||
08/1902 | 2565 | 8919 | 08/1902 | 12/1928 | |||||||||||
09/1902 | 1017 | 9605 | 09/1902 | 01/1906 | 10/1927 | ||||||||||
09/1902 | 2251 | 9067 | 49067 | 09/1902 | 06/1908 | 11/1927 | 12/1949 | ||||||||
09/1902 | 1035 | 9133 | 49133 | 09/1902 | 09/1910 | 09/1923 | 02/1950 | ||||||||
09/1902 | 1036 | 9365 | 49365 | 09/1902 | 04/1907 | 10/1921 | 16/07/1949 | ||||||||
09/1902 | 1038 | 9349 | 49349 | 09/1902 | 12/1905 | 04/1907 | 01/1921 | 12/1949 | |||||||
09/1902 | 1039 | 8918 | 48918 | 09/1902 | 10/1925 | 03/1949 | |||||||||
09/1902 | 1040 | 8920 | 48920 | 09/1902 | 03/1923 | 10/1938 | 05/05/1951 | ||||||||
10/1902 | 1041 | 9355 | 49355 | 10/1902 | 03/1921 | 11/1939 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||
10/1902 | 1042 | 9606 | 10/1902 | 06/1906 | 12/1928 | ||||||||||
10/1902 | 1043 | 9304 | 49304 | 10/1902 | 06/1918 | 09/1938 | 12/12/1959 | ||||||||
10/1902 | 2566 | 9153 | 49153 | 10/1902 | 11/1910 | 03/1925 | 11/1940 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||
10/1902 | 2567 | 8921 | 48921 | 10/1902 | 05/1924 | 03/1940 | 30/04/1958 | ||||||||
10/1902 | 2568 | 9342 | 49342 | 10/1902 | 12/1919 | 10/1935 | 14/10/1961 | ||||||||
10/1902 | 2569 | 9072 | 49072 | 10/1902 | 09/1909 | 03/1932 | 26/02/1949 | ||||||||
11/1902 | 1044 | 9376 | 49376 | 11/1902 | 02/1922 | 05/1940 | 31/03/1958 | ||||||||
11/1902 | 1047 | 9387 | 49387 | 11/1902 | 12/1922 | 01/1940 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||
11/1902 | 1051 | 8922 | 48922 | 11/1902 | 09/1926 | 09/1945 | 09/05/1959 | ||||||||
11/1902 | 1055 | 9377 | 49377 | 11/1902 | 03/1922 | 06/1940 | 27/10/1962 | ||||||||
11/1902 | 1061 | 8923 | 11/1902 | 10/1927 | |||||||||||
11/1902 | 1064 | 9607 | 48894 | 11/1902 | 05/1906 | 02/1923 | 01/1949 | ||||||||
11/1902 | 1065 | 9340 | 49340 | 11/1902 | 10/1906 | 09/1919 | 01/1947 | 01/08/1959 | |||||||
12/1902 | 1066 | 9272 | 49272 | 12/1902 | 12/1917 | 02/1948 | |||||||||
12/1902 | 1070 | 9120 | 49120 | 12/1902 | 08/1910 | 09/1933 | 09/1938 | 05/09/1959 | |||||||
12/1902 | 1088 | 8924 | 48924 | 12/1902 | 02/1923 | 11/12/1948 | |||||||||
12/1902 | 1091 | 8925 | 48925 | 12/1902 | 05/1924 | 12/1939 | 17/09/1949 | ||||||||
12/1902 | 1094 | 9324 | 49324 | 12/1902 | 10/1918 | 04/03/1950 | |||||||||
12/1902 | 1190 | 9076 | 49076 | 12/1902 | 02/1910 | 01/1925 | 05/1950 | ||||||||
12/1902 | 1222 | 9608 | 12/1902 | 05/1906 | 12/1928 | ||||||||||
12/1902 | 1223 | 9368 | 49368 | 12/1902 | 02/1906 | 11/1921 | 09/1938 | 07/03/1959 | |||||||
01/1903 | 1224 | 9350 | 49350 | 01/1903 | 01/1921 | 03/1946 | 08/12/1962 | ||||||||
01/1903 | 1225 | 8926 | 48926 | 01/1903 | 02/1926 | 09/1945 | 29/08/1959 | ||||||||
01/1903 | 1226 | 8927 | 48927 | 01/1903 | 03/1926 | 09/1947 | 11/11/1961 | ||||||||
01/1903 | 1227 | 9363 | 49363 | 01/1903 | 06/1908 | 08/1921 | 05/1940 | 03/1949 | |||||||
01/1903 | 1228 | 9142 | 49142 | 01/1903 | 10/1910 | 06/1923 | 09/1945 | 22/12/1962 | |||||||
01/1903 | 1229 | 9070 | 49070 | 01/1903 | 05/1909 | 12/1937 | 12/1940 | 17/11/1962 | |||||||
01/1903 | 1230 | 9378 | 49378 | 01/1903 | 03/1922 | 09/1938 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||
01/1903 | 1231 | 9147 | 49147 | 01/1903 | 12/1913 | 03/1936 | 12/1939 | 22/09/1962 | |||||||
01/1903 | 1233 | 8928 | 01/1903 | 12/1927 | |||||||||||
01/1903 | 1236 | 9351 | 49351 | 01/1903 | 02/1906 | 02/1921 | 11/1942 | 12/11/1949 | |||||||
03/1903 | 1237 | 8929 | 48929 | 03/1903 | 08/1923 | 29/07/1950 | |||||||||
04/1903 | 1240 | 9358 | 49358 | 04/1903 | 05/1921 | 02/1940 | 31/03/1958 | ||||||||
04/1903 | 1241 | 9346 | 49346 | 04/1903 | 09/1920 | 10/05/1952 | |||||||||
04/1903 | 1242 | 9388 | 49388 | 04/1903 | 12/1922 | 02/1940 | 03/1951 | ||||||||
04/1903 | 1243 | 9150 | 49150 | 04/1903 | 02/1915 | 08/1934 | 06/1939 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||
04/1903 | 1245 | 9073 | 49073 | 04/1903 | 10/1909 | 03/1927 | 12/1939 | 11/01/1958 | |||||||
04/1903 | 1247 | 9613 | 48898 | 04/1903 | 08/1906 | 05/1923 | 03/1942 | 30/06/1962 | |||||||
04/1903 | 1248 | 8930 | 48930 | 04/1903 | 03/1932 | 03/1943 | 08/12/1962 | ||||||||
04/1903 | 1249 | 8931 | 48931 | 04/1903 | 10/1925 | 06/1949 | |||||||||
04/1903 | 1271 | 9145 | 49145 | 04/1903 | 11/1910 | 12/1931 | 04/1944 | 04/01/1958 | |||||||
05/1903 | 1272 | 8932 | 48932 | 05/1903 | 03/1924 | 11/1940 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||
05/1903 | 1273 | 9614 | 05/1903 | 05/1906 | 12/1928 | ||||||||||
05/1903 | 1404 | 8933 | 48933 | 05/1903 | 11/1923 | 04/1940 | 12/1950 | ||||||||
05/1903 | 2024 | 8934 | 48934 | 05/1903 | 08/1923 | 12/1945 | 03/1950 | ||||||||
05/1903 | 1274 | 9071 | 49071 | 05/1903 | 09/1909 | 12/1927 | 13/01/1951 | ||||||||
05/1903 | 2571 | 8935 | 48935 | 05/1903 | 04/1925 | 02/1949 | |||||||||
05/1903 | 2572 | 8936 | 48936 | 05/1903 | 03/1924 | 01/1940 | 05/1951 | ||||||||
05/1903 | 2573 | 9373 | 49373 | 05/1903 | 08/1908 | 01/1922 | 02/1944 | 08/12/1962 | |||||||
05/1903 | 2574 | 9343 | 49343 | 05/1903 | 10/1906 | 01/1920 | 06/1941 | 14/10/1961 | |||||||
05/1903 | 2575 | 9394 | 49394 | 05/1903 | 01/1923 | 04/1940 | 27/10/1962 | ||||||||
06/1903 | 41 | 9362 | 49362 | 06/1903 | 08/1921 | 08/1948 | |||||||||
06/1903 | 2080 | 8940 | 48940 | 06/1903 | 02/1924 | 01/1940 | 11/05/1957 | ||||||||
06/1903 | 1276 | 9389 | 49389 | 06/1903 | 01/1923 | 02/1941 | 28/08/1954 | ||||||||
06/1903 | 1277 | 9149 | 49149 | 06/1903 | 01/1915 | 11/1927 | 12/1939 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||
06/1903 | 1278 | 9381 | 49381 | 06/1903 | 06/1922 | 09/1938 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
07/1903 | 1279 | 9352 | 49352 | 07/1903 | 02/1921 | 03/1940 | 15/09/1962 | ||||||||
07/1903 | 1280 | 9100 | 49100 | 07/1903 | 05/1910 | 05/1924 | 05/1950 | ||||||||
07/1903 | 1281 | 8937 | 07/1903 | 07/1928 | |||||||||||
07/1903 | 1282 | 8938 | 07/1903 | 12/1928 | |||||||||||
07/1903 | 1283 | 8939 | 48939 | 07/1903 | 03/1924 | 20/11/1948 | |||||||||
09/1903 | 2118 | 9292 | 49292 | 09/1903 | 04/1918 | 06/1941 | 03/1951 | ||||||||
09/1903 | 1284 | 8941 | 48941 | 09/1903 | 10/1923 | 11/1939 | 06/05/1950 | ||||||||
09/1903 | 1285 | 9339 | 49339 | 09/1903 | 08/1919 | 05/1941 | 25/12/1954 | ||||||||
09/1903 | 1286 | 9347 | 49347 | 09/1903 | 11/1908 | 10/1920 | 12/1940 | 01/1951 | |||||||
09/1903 | 1287 | 8942 | 48942 | 09/1903 | 09/1925 | 06/1940 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||
09/1903 | 1288 | 8943 | 48943 | 09/1903 | 04/1923 | 12/1939 | 05/09/1959 | ||||||||
09/1903 | 1289 | 9361 | 49361 | 09/1903 | 06/1921 | 09/1938 | 26/12/1964 | ||||||||
09/1903 | 1308 | 8944 | 48944 | 09/1903 | 02/1924 | 07/1940 | 28/09/1957 | ||||||||
10/1903 | 1310 | 8945 | 48945 | 10/1903 | 11/1924 | 07/1940 | 06/03/1959 | ||||||||
10/1903 | 1318 | 9366 | 49366 | 10/1903 | 10/1921 | 12/1935 | 17/10/1959 | ||||||||
10/1903 | 134 | 10/1903 | 03/1922 | ||||||||||||
10/1903 | 500 | 9265 | 49265 | 10/1903 | 06/1917 | 10/1938 | 04/1952 | ||||||||
10/1903 | 916 | 9354 | 49354 | 10/1903 | 03/1921 | 08/1946 | 03/03/1956 | ||||||||
10/1903 | 1547 | 8946 | 10/1903 | 06/1928 | |||||||||||
10/1903 | 2272 | 9360 | 49360 | 10/1903 | 05/1921 | 04/1940 | 05/1949 | ||||||||
10/1903 | 1299 | 9074 | 49074 | 10/1903 | 10/1909 | 03/1925 | 01/1939 | 16/12/1950 | |||||||
10/1903 | 1401 | 9075 | 49075 | 10/1903 | 11/1909 | 12/1927 | 28/01/1950 | ||||||||
11/1903 | 1448 | 9273 | 49273 | 11/1903 | 12/1941 | 12/1939 | 02/1948 | ||||||||
11/1903 | 2038 | 9356 | 49356 | 11/1903 | 04/1921 | 03/1940 | 04/1950 | ||||||||
11/1903 | 2208 | 9364 | 49364 | 11/1903 | 08/1921 | 12/1950 | |||||||||
01/1904 | 640 | 9383 | 49383 | 01/1904 | 07/1922 | 05/1948 | |||||||||
01/1904 | 1300 | 9379 | 49379 | 01/1904 | 03/1922 | 08/1940 | 08/10/1949 | ||||||||
01/1904 | 1370 | 8947 | 01/1904 | 10/1927 | |||||||||||
01/1904 | 1449 | 9122 | 49122 | 01/1904 | 08/1910 | 11/1927 | 12/1939 | 01/12/1962 | |||||||
01/1904 | 1586 | 9353 | 49353 | 01/1904 | 07/1906 | 02/1921 | 12/1949 | ||||||||
02/1904 | 508 | 9090 | 49090 | 02/1904 | 04/1910 | 03/1936 | 11/1939 | 16/12/1950 | |||||||
02/1904 | 641 | 9151 | 49151 | 02/1904 | 11/1916 | 03/1927 | 09/08/1952 | ||||||||
02/1904 | 918 | 8948 | 48948 | 02/1904 | 05/1927 | 04/1940 | 16/07/1949 | ||||||||
03/1904 | 1555 | 8949 | 03/1904 | 11/1927 | |||||||||||
02/1904 | 2036 | 9341 | 49341 | 02/1904 | 12/1919 | 09/1941 | 23/03/1957 | ||||||||
04/1904 | 410 | 9331 | 49331 | 04/1904 | 11/1918 | 09/1942 | 28/10/1950 | ||||||||
05/1904 | 509 | 9069 | 49069 | 05/1904 | 11/1908 | 11/1933 | 08/1939 | 17/06/1950 | |||||||
05/1904 | 647 | 9615 | 48899 | 05/1904 | 02/1907 | 10/1908 | 02/1925 | 05/1941 | 03/03/1956 | ||||||
05/1904 | 1110 | 9369 | 49369 | 05/1904 | 12/1921 | 10/1946 | 04/1950 | ||||||||
05/1904 | 1122 | 9099 | 49099 | 05/1904 | 05/1910 | 10/1927 | 02/1941 | 21/07/1962 | |||||||
05/1904 | 503 | 9068 | 49068 | 05/1904 | 10/1908 | 02/1935 | 02/1943 | 19/01/1957 | |||||||
05/1904 | 818 | 9132 | 49132 | 05/1904 | 09/1910 | 01/1924 | 02/1940 | 18/04/1959 | |||||||
05/1904 | 1585 | 9609 | 48895 | 05/1904 | 10/1906 | 04/1923 | 04/1944 | 05/12/1964 | |||||||
05/1904 | 2056 | 9359 | 49359 | 05/1904 | 01/1907 | 05/1921 | 02/02/1952 | ||||||||
05/1904 | 2387 | 9357 | 49357 | 05/1904 | 04/1921 | 09/1942 | 14/10/1961 | ||||||||
07/1904 | 437 | 9374 | 07/1904 | 08/1906 | 02/1922 | 12/1947 | |||||||||
07/1904 | 644 | 8950 | 48950 | 07/1904 | 01/1924 | 09/1941 | 30/12/1961 | ||||||||
07/1904 | 1353 | 9335 | 49335 | 07/1904 | 12/1918 | 01/1943 | 29/09/1962 | ||||||||
07/1904 | 1369 | 9372 | 49372 | 07/1904 | 12/1907 | 06/1940 | 10/1938 | 04/1949 | |||||||
07/1904 | 1432 | 9384 | 49384 | 07/1904 | 07/1922 | 12/1948 | |||||||||
08/1904 | 1436 | 8951 | 48951 | 08/1904 | 10/1923 | 02/1939 | 31/08/1957 | ||||||||
08/1904 | 1543 | 8952 | 48952 | 08/1904 | 02/1924 | 09/1938 | 18/05/1957 | ||||||||
08/1904 | 2057 | 9371 | 49371 | 08/1904 | 12/1921 | 19/01/1952 | |||||||||
08/1904 | 2060 | 9392 | 49392 | 08/1904 | 01/1923 | 12/1938 | 14/10/1961 | ||||||||
08/1904 | 2169 | 9393 | 49393 | 08/1904 | 09/1906 | 01/1923 | 01/1944 | 22/06/1957 | |||||||
01/1910 | 2653 | 9154 | 49154 | 01/1910 | 01/1912 | 06/1940 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
01/1910 | 2654 | 9077 | 49077 | 01/1910 | 12/1931 | 06/1939 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||
01/1910 | 2655 | 9078 | 49078 | 01/1910 | 12/1932 | 12/1939 | 15/12/1962 | ||||||||
02/1910 | 2656 | 9079 | 49079 | 02/1910 | 02/1926 | 11/1939 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
02/1910 | 2657 | 9080 | 49080 | 02/1910 | 04/1934 | 03/1946 | 02/1950 | ||||||||
02/1910 | 2658 | 9081 | 49081 | 02/1910 | 06/1930 | 12/1939 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
02/1910 | 2659 | 9086 | 49086 | 02/1910 | 07/1930 | 09/1938 | 04/1949 | ||||||||
02/1910 | 2660 | 9087 | 49087 | 02/1910 | 12/1927 | 10/1938 | 22/09/1962 | ||||||||
02/1910 | 2661 | 9088 | 49088 | 02/1910 | 08/1933 | 07/1940 | 16/11/1957 | ||||||||
02/1910 | 2662 | 9089 | 49089 | 02/1910 | 06/1940 | 07/1939 | 14/01/1950 | ||||||||
03/1910 | 1354 | 9082 | 49082 | 03/1910 | 08/1925 | 07/1939 | 15/10/1960 | ||||||||
03/1910 | 1380 | 9083 | 49083 | 03/1910 | 04/1940 | 09/1938 | 01/1950 | ||||||||
03/1910 | 1411 | 9084 | 49084 | 03/1910 | 03/1928 | 09/1949 | |||||||||
03/1910 | 1456 | 9092 | 49092 | 03/1910 | 07/1929 | 27/09/1952 | |||||||||
03/1910 | 1497 | 9093 | 49093 | 03/1910 | 11/1927 | 09/1939 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
03/1910 | 1556 | 9094 | 49094 | 03/1910 | 01/1928 | 07/1939 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
03/1910 | 1582 | 9095 | 49095 | 03/1910 | 12/1929 | 06/1948 | |||||||||
03/1910 | 1591 | 9096 | 49096 | 03/1910 | 11/1931 | 08/1940 | 05/04/1952 | ||||||||
03/1910 | 1619 | 9097 | 49097 | 03/1910 | 06/1933 | 08/1939 | 03/1950 | ||||||||
03/1910 | 1629 | 9098 | 49098 | 03/1910 | 01/1934 | 12/05/1951 | |||||||||
04/1910 | 1322 | 9091 | 49091 | 04/1910 | 05/1928 | 08/1938 | 09/1949 | ||||||||
04/1910 | 1464 | 9101 | 49101 | 04/1910 | 04/1927 | 30/09/1950 | |||||||||
04/1910 | 1511 | 9102 | 49102 | 04/1910 | 01/1934 | 06/1949 | |||||||||
04/1910 | 1570 | 9103 | 49103 | 04/1910 | 04/1927 | 05/1940 | 16/07/1949 | ||||||||
04/1910 | 1578 | 9104 | 49104 | 04/1910 | 05/1924 | 12/1939 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
05/1910 | 1600 | 9105 | 49105 | 05/1910 | 10/1935 | 05/1942 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||
05/1910 | 1647 | 9106 | 49106 | 05/1910 | 01/1930 | 15/12/1962 | |||||||||
05/1910 | 1664 | 9107 | 49107 | 05/1910 | 11/1929 | 11/1947 | 29/04/1950 | ||||||||
05/1910 | 1687 | 9108 | 49108 | 05/1910 | 11/1934 | 12/1939 | 23/11/1957 | ||||||||
05/1910 | 1699 | 9109 | 49109 | 05/1910 | 12/1929 | 11/1939 | 07/03/1959 | ||||||||
05/1910 | 1503 | 9110 | 49110 | 05/1910 | 09/1932 | 11/1939 | 03/1949 | ||||||||
05/1910 | 1540 | 9111 | 49111 | 05/1910 | 01/1928 | 10/1942 | 03/1949 | ||||||||
06/1910 | 1609 | 9112 | 49112 | 06/1910 | 01/1928 | 10/1939 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||
06/1910 | 1634 | 9113 | 49113 | 06/1910 | 04/1933 | 12/1938 | 19/01/1959 | ||||||||
06/1910 | 1637 | 9114 | 49114 | 06/1910 | 09/1928 | 01/1939 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
06/1910 | 1639 | 9115 | 49115 | 06/1910 | 11/1924 | 12/1938 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||
06/1910 | 1660 | 9116 | 49116 | 06/1910 | 12/1927 | 03/1943 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||
06/1910 | 1789 | 9117 | 49117 | 06/1910 | 12/1932 | 06/03/1959 | |||||||||
06/1910 | 2030 | 9118 | 49118 | 06/1910 | 12/1934 | 12/1940 | 12/1947 | ||||||||
06/1910 | 2032 | 9119 | 49119 | 06/1910 | 11/1932 | 11/1939 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||
07/1910 | 1385 | 9121 | 49121 | 07/1910 | 07/1925 | 01/1940 | 30/09/1958 | ||||||||
07/1910 | 1492 | 9123 | 49123 | 07/1910 | 12/1930 | 09/1938 | 06/1949 | ||||||||
07/1910 | 1507 | 9124 | 49124 | 07/1910 | 04/1944 | 08/1944 | 01/1950 | ||||||||
08/1910 | 1539 | 9125 | 49125 | 08/1910 | 06/1927 | 08/1939 | 15/09/1962 | ||||||||
08/1910 | 1577 | 9126 | 49126 | 08/1910 | 12/1929 | 07/1941 | 15/09/1962 | ||||||||
08/1910 | 1606 | 9127 | 49127 | 08/1910 | 09/1936 | 03/1950 | |||||||||
08/1910 | 1648 | 9128 | 49128 | 08/1910 | 03/1931 | 06/1947 | 11/1948 | ||||||||
08/1910 | 1690 | 9129 | 49129 | 08/1910 | 12/1935 | 05/1939 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||
08/1910 | 1774 | 9130 | 49130 | 08/1910 | 03/1931 | 01/12/1962 | |||||||||
08/1910 | 1776 | 9131 | 49131 | 08/1910 | 12/1926 | 07/1941 | 07/1948 | ||||||||
08/1910 | 1403 | 9134 | 49134 | 08/1910 | 12/1937 | 31/03/1962 | |||||||||
08/1910 | 1424 | 9135 | 49135 | 08/1910 | 11/1927 | 11/1949 | |||||||||
09/1910 | 1462 | 9136 | 49136 | 09/1910 | 01/1937 | 08/1948 | |||||||||
09/1910 | 1700 | 9137 | 49137 | 09/1910 | 11/1927 | 01/1946 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||
09/1910 | 1727 | 9138 | 49138 | 09/1910 | 11/1934 | 10/1938 | 02/02/1952 | ||||||||
09/1910 | 1735 | 9139 | 49139 | 09/1910 | 09/1928 | 15/09/1962 | |||||||||
09/1910 | 1775 | 9140 | 49140 | 09/1910 | 10/1928 | 03/1941 | 17/09/1955 | ||||||||
09/1910 | 1794 | 9141 | 49141 | 09/1910 | 02/1930 | 01/1941 | 21/07/1962 | ||||||||
09/1910 | 1788 | 9143 | 49143 | 09/1910 | 10/1931 | 01/1947 | 24/10/1959 | ||||||||
09/1910 | 2014 | 9144 | 49144 | 09/1910 | 03/1926 | 10/1944 | 10/11/1962 | ||||||||
11/1921 | 485 | 9395 | 49395 | 11/1921 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
11/1921 | 742 | 9396 | 49396 | 11/1921 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
11/1921 | 215 | 9397 | 49397 | 11/1921 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
11/1921 | 216 | 9398 | 49398 | 11/1921 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
11/1921 | 220 | 9399 | 49399 | 11/1921 | 14/10/1961 | ||||||||||
11/1921 | 221 | 9400 | 49400 | 11/1921 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
11/1921 | 253 | 9401 | 49401 | 11/1921 | 14/10/1961 | ||||||||||
11/1921 | 434 | 9402 | 49402 | 11/1921 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||||
11/1921 | 1154 | 9403 | 49403 | 11/1921 | 02/06/1962 | ||||||||||
11/1921 | 223 | 9404 | 49404 | 11/1921 | 28/04/1962 | ||||||||||
01/1922 | 367 | 9405 | 49405 | 01/1922 | 14/10/1961 | ||||||||||
01/1922 | 369 | 9406 | 49406 | 01/1922 | 15/06/1963 | ||||||||||
01/1922 | 373 | 9407 | 49407 | 01/1922 | 11/1964 | ||||||||||
02/1922 | 382 | 9408 | 49408 | 02/1922 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||||
02/1922 | 396 | 9409 | 49409 | 02/1922 | 01/06/1959 | ||||||||||
01/1922 | 407 | 9410 | 49410 | 01/1922 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
01/1922 | 411 | 9411 | 49411 | 01/1922 | 14/10/1961 | ||||||||||
01/1922 | 417 | 9412 | 49412 | 01/1922 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||||
01/1922 | 429 | 9413 | 49413 | 01/1922 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||||
01/1922 | 1530 | 9414 | 49414 | 01/1922 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||||
01/1922 | 567 | 9415 | 49415 | 01/1922 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||||
03/1922 | 568 | 9416 | 49416 | 03/1922 | 01/09/1962 | ||||||||||
03/1922 | 569 | 9417 | 49417 | 03/1922 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
03/1922 | 570 | 9418 | 49418 | 03/1922 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
03/1922 | 571 | 9419 | 49419 | 03/1922 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
03/1922 | 572 | 9420 | 49420 | 03/1922 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
03/1922 | 573 | 9421 | 49421 | 03/1922 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||||
03/1922 | 574 | 9422 | 49422 | 03/1922 | 02/09/1961 | ||||||||||
03/1922 | 575 | 9423 | 49423 | 03/1922 | 11/11/1961 | ||||||||||
03/1922 | 576 | 9424 | 49424 | 03/1922 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 134 | 9425 | 49425 | 07/1922 | 15/09/1962 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 869 | 9426 | 49426 | 07/1922 | 22/09/1962 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 2047 | 9427 | 49427 | 07/1922 | 07/11/1959 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 2050 | 9428 | 49428 | 07/1922 | 08/12/1962 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 2171 | 9429 | 49429 | 07/1922 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 2226 | 9430 | 49430 | 07/1922 | 26/12/1964 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 2255 | 9431 | 49431 | 07/1922 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 2367 | 9432 | 49432 | 07/1922 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 2371 | 9433 | 49433 | 07/1922 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||||
08/1922 | 344 | 9434 | 49434 | 08/1922 | 20/10/1962 | ||||||||||
08/1922 | 872 | 9435 | 49435 | 08/1922 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||||
08/1922 | 895 | 9436 | 49436 | 08/1922 | 23/05/1959 | ||||||||||
08/1922 | 2182 | 9437 | 49437 | 08/1922 | 01/09/1962 | ||||||||||
07/1922 | 2372 | 9438 | 49438 | 07/1922 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||||
09/1922 | 36 | 9439 | 49439 | 09/1922 | 08/12/1962 | ||||||||||
08/1922 | 994 | 9440 | 49440 | 08/1922 | 24/03/1962 | ||||||||||
09/1922 | 2381 | 9441 | 49441 | 09/1922 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 758 | 9442 | 49442 | 10/1922 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||||
09/1922 | 2383 | 9443 | 49443 | 09/1922 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||||
09/1922 | 2386 | 9444 | 49444 | 09/1922 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||||
09/1922 | 2399 | 9445 | 49445 | 09/1922 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 1012 | 9446 | 49446 | 10/1922 | 09/04/1964 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 2414 | 9447 | 49447 | 10/1922 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 2429 | 9448 | 49448 | 10/1922 | 15/06/1963 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 2517 | 9449 | 49449 | 10/1922 | 08/12/1962 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 13 | 9450 | 49450 | 10/1922 | 14/11/1959 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 231 | 9451 | 49451 | 10/1922 | 01/12/1962 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 308 | 9452 | 49452 | 10/1922 | 08/12/1962 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 403 | 9453 | 49453 | 10/1922 | 07/10/1961 | ||||||||||
10/1922 | 2178 | 9454 | 49454 | 10/1922 | 15/06/1963 | ||||||||||
02/1912 | 1329 | 9155 | 49155 | 02/1912 | 11/1939 | 26/05/1962 | |||||||||
02/1912 | 1384 | 9156 | 49156 | 02/1912 | 03/02/1951 | ||||||||||
02/1912 | 1426 | 9157 | 49157 | 02/1912 | 08/1939 | 19/01/1959 | |||||||||
02/1912 | 1633 | 9158 | 49158 | 02/1912 | 01/1939 | 10/1962 | |||||||||
02/1912 | 1697 | 9159 | 49159 | 02/1912 | 05/1949 | ||||||||||
03/1912 | 1778 | 9160 | 49160 | 03/1912 | 09/1947 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||||
03/1912 | 1791 | 9161 | 49161 | 03/1912 | 12/1939 | 12/04/1957 | |||||||||
03/1912 | 2001 | 9162 | 49162 | 03/1912 | 16/05/1953 | ||||||||||
03/1912 | 2015 | 9163 | 49163 | 03/1912 | 01/1941 | 08/12/1951 | |||||||||
03/1912 | 2034 | 9164 | 49164 | 03/1912 | 05/1944 | 14/10/1961 | |||||||||
03/1912 | 1568 | 9165 | 49165 | 03/1912 | 18/09/1948 | ||||||||||
04/1912 | 1655 | 9166 | 49166 | 04/1912 | 03/1949 | ||||||||||
04/1912 | 1696 | 9167 | 49167 | 04/1912 | 12/1945 | 28/12/1957 | |||||||||
04/1912 | 1698 | 9168 | 49168 | 04/1912 | 09/1939 | 25/01/1958 | |||||||||
04/1912 | 1783 | 9169 | 49169 | 04/1912 | 12/1939 | 12/1949 | |||||||||
05/1912 | 1162 | 9170 | 49170 | 05/1912 | 03/1941 | 16/07/1949 | |||||||||
05/1912 | 1505 | 9171 | 49171 | 05/1912 | 02/1952 | ||||||||||
04/1912 | 1790 | 9172 | 49172 | 04/1912 | 10/1938 | 10/08/1957 | |||||||||
04/1912 | 2018 | 9173 | 49173 | 04/1912 | 03/1947 | 18/07/1964 | |||||||||
05/1912 | 2104 | 9174 | 49174 | 05/1912 | 12/1939 | 22/02/1958 | |||||||||
05/1912 | 2119 | 9175 | 49175 | 05/1912 | 01/1948 | ||||||||||
05/1912 | 2284 | 9176 | 49176 | 05/1912 | 11/1941 | 14/01/1950 | |||||||||
05/1912 | 2254 | 9177 | 49177 | 05/1912 | 05/1940 | 02/02/1959 | |||||||||
06/1912 | 2337 | 9178 | 49178 | 06/1912 | 12/1946 | 05/1951 | |||||||||
06/1912 | 2345 | 9179 | 49179 | 06/1912 | 18/12/1948 | ||||||||||
06/1912 | 2349 | 9180 | 49180 | 06/1912 | 12/1938 | 07/03/1959 | |||||||||
06/1912 | 2385 | 9181 | 49181 | 06/1912 | 04/1940 | 04/04/1959 | |||||||||
06/1912 | 2393 | 9182 | 49182 | 06/1912 | 12/1947 | ||||||||||
07/1912 | 674 | 9183 | 49183 | 07/1912 | 06/1950 | ||||||||||
07/1912 | 1746 | 9184 | 49184 | 07/1912 | 01/1940 | 01/1949 | |||||||||
10/1912 | 955 | 9185 | 49185 | 10/1912 | 04/1939 | 04/1949 | |||||||||
10/1912 | 1108 | 9186 | 49186 | 10/1912 | 02/1941 | 14/09/1957 | |||||||||
10/1912 | 2162 | 9187 | 49187 | 10/1912 | 16/02/1952 | ||||||||||
10/1912 | 2225 | 9188 | 49188 | 10/1912 | 03/1947 | 10/09/1949 | |||||||||
10/1912 | 2281 | 9189 | 49189 | 10/1912 | 04/1946 | 26/01/1957 | |||||||||
11/1912 | 2289 | 9190 | 49190 | 11/1912 | 02/1950 | ||||||||||
11/1912 | 2301 | 9191 | 49191 | 11/1912 | 11/1945 | 14/10/1961 | |||||||||
11/1912 | 2374 | 9192 | 49192 | 11/1912 | 06/1939 | 11/1949 | |||||||||
12/1912 | 328 | 9193 | 49193 | 12/1912 | 11/1951 | ||||||||||
12/1912 | 631 | 9194 | 49194 | 12/1912 | 10/1949 | ||||||||||
12/1912 | 1529 | 9195 | 49195 | 12/1912 | 03/1949 | ||||||||||
12/1912 | 2091 | 9196 | 49196 | 12/1912 | 08/1947 | 14/10/1961 | |||||||||
12/1912 | 2286 | 9197 | 49197 | 12/1912 | 05/1948 | ||||||||||
11/1912 | 2380 | 9198 | 49198 | 11/1912 | 08/1942 | 29/05/1948 | |||||||||
11/1912 | 2405 | 9199 | 49199 | 11/1912 | 06/1947 | 22/09/1962 | |||||||||
12/1912 | 2421 | 9200 | 49200 | 12/1912 | 02/1947 | 28/03/1959 | |||||||||
01/1913 | 326 | 9201 | 49201 | 01/1913 | 19/06/1948 | ||||||||||
01/1913 | 633 | 9202 | 49202 | 01/1913 | 04/1946 | 05/10/1957 | |||||||||
01/1913 | 1192 | 9203 | 49203 | 01/1913 | 09/1940 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||||
01/1913 | 2245 | 9204 | 49204 | 01/1913 | 07/04/1951 | ||||||||||
06/1913 | 107 | 9205 | 49205 | 06/1913 | 12/1941 | 04/1951 | |||||||||
07/1913 | 93 | 9206 | 49206 | 07/1913 | 12/1947 | ||||||||||
07/1913 | 138 | 9207 | 49207 | 07/1913 | 11/1939 | 16/07/1949 | |||||||||
07/1913 | 670 | 9208 | 49208 | 07/1913 | 02/1951 | ||||||||||
07/1913 | 734 | 9209 | 49209 | 07/1913 | 11/1940 | 14/10/1961 | |||||||||
07/1913 | 787 | 9210 | 49210 | 07/1913 | 12/1946 | 14/10/1961 | |||||||||
07/1913 | 1127 | 9211 | 49211 | 07/1913 | 12/1943 | 09/1949 | |||||||||
08/1913 | 1128 | 9212 | 49212 | 08/1913 | 12/1940 | 21/04/1956 | |||||||||
08/1913 | 2201 | 9213 | 49213 | 08/1913 | 09/1951 | ||||||||||
08/1913 | 2378 | 9214 | 49214 | 08/1913 | 07/1941 | 10/08/1957 | |||||||||
08/1913 | 43 | 9215 | 49215 | 08/1913 | 12/1947 | ||||||||||
08/1913 | 669 | 9216 | 49216 | 08/1913 | 05/1940 | 24/11/1962 | |||||||||
08/1913 | 1314 | 9217 | 49217 | 08/1913 | 08/1939 | 02/1949 | |||||||||
09/1913 | 1343 | 9218 | 49218 | 09/1913 | 01/1947 | 03/1951 | |||||||||
09/1913 | 2117 | 9219 | 49219 | 09/1913 | 10/1944 | 30/09/1950 | |||||||||
09/1913 | 2195 | 9220 | 49220 | 09/1913 | 07/1942 | 04/02/1950 | |||||||||
09/1913 | 2246 | 9221 | 49221 | 09/1913 | 09/1949 | ||||||||||
09/1913 | 2258 | 9222 | 49222 | 09/1913 | 29/09/1951 | ||||||||||
09/1913 | 2390 | 9223 | 49223 | 09/1913 | 10/1940 | 06/04/1957 | |||||||||
10/1913 | 2452 | 9224 | 49224 | 10/1913 | 12/1940 | 01/12/1962 | |||||||||
03/1914 | 20 | 9225 | 49225 | 03/1914 | 20/03/1948 | ||||||||||
03/1914 | 131 | 9226 | 49226 | 03/1914 | 12/1941 | 06/03/1959 | |||||||||
03/1914 | 795 | 9227 | 49227 | 03/1914 | 05/1946 | 02/1949 | |||||||||
04/1914 | 329 | 9228 | 49228 | 04/1914 | 06/1939 | 04/04/1959 | |||||||||
04/1914 | 1181 | 9229 | 49229 | 04/1914 | 10/1947 | 19/11/1960 | |||||||||
04/1914 | 1214 | 9230 | 49230 | 04/1914 | 12/1947 | 30/11/1957 | |||||||||
03/1914 | 1486 | 9231 | 49231 | 03/1914 | 02/1948 | ||||||||||
04/1914 | 1500 | 9232 | 49232 | 04/1914 | 17/06/1950 | ||||||||||
04/1914 | 2033 | 9233 | 49233 | 04/1914 | 22/05/1948 | ||||||||||
04/1914 | 2200 | 9234 | 49234 | 04/1914 | 01/1940 | 25/06/1960 | |||||||||
05/1914 | 108 | 9235 | 49235 | 05/1914 | 11/1939 | 11/02/1950 | |||||||||
05/1914 | 175 | 9236 | 49236 | 05/1914 | 13/03/1948 | ||||||||||
05/1914 | 351 | 9237 | 49237 | 05/1914 | 01/1939 | 31/12/1949 | |||||||||
06/1914 | 965 | 9238 | 49238 | 06/1914 | 07/1939 | 07/1949 | |||||||||
05/1914 | 1142 | 9239 | 49239 | 05/1914 | 03/1942 | 09/1957 | |||||||||
06/1914 | 1485 | 9240 | 49240 | 06/1914 | 11/1940 | 15/09/1962 | |||||||||
05/1914 | 2336 | 9241 | 49241 | 05/1914 | 20/09/1952 | ||||||||||
05/1914 | 2379 | 9242 | 49242 | 05/1914 | 02/1941 | 05/1949 | |||||||||
06/1914 | 2058 | 9243 | 49243 | 06/1914 | 11/1939 | 11/03/1961 | |||||||||
06/1914 | 2156 | 9244 | 49244 | 06/1914 | 09/1941 | 04/1952 | |||||||||
06/1914 | 2237 | 9245 | 49245 | 06/1914 | 10/1940 | 12/12/1959 | |||||||||
07/1914 | 48 | 9246 | 49246 | 07/1914 | 12/1939 | 13/01/1962 | |||||||||
07/1914 | 62 | 9247 | 49247 | 07/1914 | 10/1938 | 16/11/1957 | |||||||||
07/1914 | 72 | 9248 | 49248 | 07/1914 | 05/1949 | ||||||||||
07/1914 | 99 | 9249 | 49249 | 07/1914 | 05/1940 | 12/12/1959 | |||||||||
07/1914 | 176 | 9250 | 49250 | 07/1914 | 10/04/1948 | ||||||||||
07/1914 | 203 | 9251 | 49251 | 07/1914 | 01/1948 | ||||||||||
08/1914 | 931 | 9252 | 49252 | 08/1914 | 10/1940 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||||
08/1914 | 2094 | 9253 | 49253 | 08/1914 | 06/1947 | 15/03/1952 | |||||||||
08/1914 | 2234 | 9254 | 49254 | 08/1914 | 10/1947 | 13/04/1957 | |||||||||
05/1916 | 170 | 9255 | 49255 | 05/1916 | 03/1950 | ||||||||||
05/1916 | 545 | 9256 | 49256 | 05/1916 | 11/1938 | 05/1949 | |||||||||
05/1916 | 885 | 9257 | 49257 | 05/1916 | 01/1946 | 04/11/1950 | |||||||||
05/1916 | 942 | 9258 | 49258 | 05/1916 | 06/1941 | 03/1951 | |||||||||
05/1916 | 982 | 9259 | 49259 | 05/1916 | 03/1949 | ||||||||||
05/1916 | 1167 | 9260 | 49260 | 05/1916 | 10/1938 | 30/04/1958 | |||||||||
05/1916 | 1217 | 9261 | 49261 | 05/1916 | 10/03/1951 | ||||||||||
06/1916 | 1528 | 9262 | 49262 | 06/1916 | 02/1939 | 08/12/1962 | |||||||||
06/1916 | 1729 | 9263 | 49263 | 06/1916 | 03/1949 | ||||||||||
06/1916 | 2288 | 9264 | 49264 | 06/1916 | 08/1940 | 13/01/1951 | |||||||||
11/1917 | 94 | 9268 | 49268 | 11/1917 | 07/1940 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||||
10/1917 | 112 | 9269 | 49269 | 10/1917 | 09/1949 | ||||||||||
11/1917 | 360 | 9270 | 49270 | 11/1917 | 10/1935 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||||
11/1917 | 851 | 9271 | 49271 | 11/1917 | 03/1940 | 02/11/1957 | |||||||||
10/1917 | 2088 | 9274 | 49274 | 10/1917 | 10/04/1948 | ||||||||||
10/1917 | 2256 | 9275 | 49275 | 10/1917 | 12/1939 | 14/10/1961 | |||||||||
11/1917 | 2290 | 9276 | 49276 | 11/1917 | 12/1935 | 12/1958 | |||||||||
11/1917 | 2296 | 9277 | 49277 | 11/1917 | 08/1947 | 17/02/1962 | |||||||||
11/1917 | 2274 | 9278 | 49278 | 11/1917 | 09/1940 | 24/10/1959 | |||||||||
12/1917 | 2423 | 9279 | 49279 | 12/1917 | 11/02/1950 | ||||||||||
01/1918 | 83 | 9280 | 49280 | 01/1918 | 03/1940 | 17/09/1949 | |||||||||
01/1918 | 720 | 9281 | 49281 | 01/1918 | 12/1938 | 08/12/1962 | |||||||||
01/1918 | 750 | 9282 | 49282 | 01/1918 | 10/1947 | 01/1957 | |||||||||
01/1918 | 943 | 9283 | 49283 | 01/1918 | 16/07/1949 | ||||||||||
01/1918 | 1121 | 9284 | 49284 | 01/1918 | 10/1940 | 03/1950 | |||||||||
02/1918 | 1313 | 9285 | 49285 | 02/1918 | 07/1949 | ||||||||||
02/1918 | 2082 | 9286 | 49286 | 02/1918 | 24/04/1946 | ||||||||||
02/1918 | 2167 | 9287 | 49287 | 02/1918 | 09/1944 | 01/12/1962 | |||||||||
02/1918 | 2172 | 9288 | 49288 | 02/1918 | 11/1939 | 14/10/1961 | |||||||||
03/1918 | 2412 | 9289 | 49289 | 03/1918 | 08/1939 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||||
03/1918 | 1129 | 9290 | 49290 | 03/1918 | 01/1940 | 03/1949 | |||||||||
03/1918 | 1614 | 9291 | 49291 | 03/1918 | 04/1943 | 20/05/1950 | |||||||||
03/1918 | 2150 | 9293 | 49293 | 03/1918 | 01/1940 | 01/12/1962 | |||||||||
03/1918 | 2250 | 9294 | 49294 | 03/1918 | 02/1940 | 31/12/1949 | |||||||||
04/1918 | 2297 | 9295 | 49295 | 04/1918 | 14/08/1948 | ||||||||||
04/1918 | 2343 | 9296 | 49296 | 04/1918 | 07/1939 | 05/1951 | |||||||||
05/1918 | 230 | 9297 | 49297 | 05/1918 | 04/1949 | ||||||||||
05/1918 | 264 | 9298 | 49298 | 05/1918 | 10/1939 | 31/12/1949 | |||||||||
04/1918 | 2376 | 9299 | 49299 | 04/1918 | 05/1943 | 16/07/1949 | |||||||||
04/1918 | 2410 | 9300 | 49300 | 04/1918 | 04/1942 | 24/11/1951 | |||||||||
04/1918 | 2422 | 9301 | 49301 | 04/1918 | 07/1939 | 14/03/1959 | |||||||||
05/1918 | 2441 | 9302 | 49302 | 05/1918 | 12/1946 | 12/1951 | |||||||||
05/1918 | 880 | 9303 | 49303 | 05/1918 | 27/11/1948 | ||||||||||
05/1918 | 1071 | 9305 | 49305 | 05/1918 | 03/1949 | ||||||||||
06/1918 | 1657 | 9306 | 49306 | 06/1918 | 08/1940 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||||
06/1918 | 1693 | 9307 | 49307 | 06/1918 | 01/1946 | 30/09/1950 | |||||||||
06/1918 | 2066 | 9308 | 49308 | 06/1918 | 01/1943 | 04/04/1959 | |||||||||
06/1918 | 2199 | 9309 | 49309 | 06/1918 | 03/07/1948 | ||||||||||
07/1918 | 2235 | 9310 | 49310 | 07/1918 | 11/1940 | 14/10/1961 | |||||||||
07/1918 | 2253 | 9311 | 49311 | 07/1918 | 01/1941 | 10/10/1959 | |||||||||
07/1918 | 757 | 9312 | 49312 | 07/1918 | 04/1940 | 04/1951 | |||||||||
07/1918 | 829 | 9313 | 49313 | 07/1918 | 12/1939 | 16/12/1961 | |||||||||
07/1918 | 894 | 9314 | 49314 | 07/1918 | 01/1947 | 01/12/1962 | |||||||||
08/1918 | 1107 | 9315 | 49315 | 08/1918 | 08/1939 | 27/06/1959 | |||||||||
08/1918 | 1435 | 9316 | 49316 | 08/1918 | 10/1939 | 24/01/1957 | |||||||||
08/1918 | 1495 | 9317 | 49317 | 08/1918 | 04/1940 | 03/1950 | |||||||||
09/1918 | 1785 | 9318 | 49318 | 09/1918 | 06/1940 | 02/11/1957 | |||||||||
09/1918 | 2054 | 9320 | 49320 | 09/1918 | 12/1949 | ||||||||||
09/1918 | 2160 | 9321 | 49321 | 09/1918 | 11/1935 | 25/06/1960 | |||||||||
09/1918 | 2236 | 9322 | 49322 | 09/1918 | 01/1939 | 10/03/1956 | |||||||||
10/1918 | 172 | 9323 | 49323 | 10/1918 | 04/1941 | 22/09/1962 | |||||||||
11/1918 | 1261 | 9325 | 49325 | 11/1918 | 07/1943 | 12/11/1949 | |||||||||
10/1918 | 1306 | 9326 | 49326 | 10/1918 | 01/08/1953 | ||||||||||
10/1918 | 1487 | 9327 | 49327 | 10/1918 | 03/1940 | 14/11/1959 | |||||||||
10/1918 | 1793 | 9328 | 49328 | 10/1918 | 04/1944 | 01/12/1962 | |||||||||
10/1918 | 2287 | 9329 | 49329 | 10/1918 | 01/1940 | 03/1949 | |||||||||
11/1918 | 279 | 9330 | 49330 | 11/1918 | 01/1940 | 07/03/1959 | |||||||||
11/1918 | 1158 | 9332 | 49332 | 11/1918 | 29/07/1950 | ||||||||||
11/1918 | 1359 | 9333 | 49333 | 11/1918 | 08/1940 | 20/05/1950 | |||||||||
12/1918 | 2497 | 9334 | 49334 | 12/1918 | 09/1950 |
The following reports are available.
- Build dates and withdrawal dates of several classes combined
- Weight/Height/Length/Wheelbase/Wheel Diameter comparisons of locomotive classes
- Maximum speed of locomotive classes
- Diesel locomotive classes by Power Unit
- Western Region Diesel Hydraulics lifespan
- Class 52 'Western' Liveries
- Timelines graph of up to ten classes of locomotive
- Locomotive classes by longevity
- Individual locomotives by longevity
- LNWR 0-8-0/2-8-0 rebuilds
- Snapshot of All Locomotives by Class on a user defined date
- Great Western 4-6-0 identification
- Early Casualties - Diesel and Electric
- Robinson GCR Class 8K/8M 2-8-0 (LNER Class O4/O5/O1) and ROD derivatives
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) re-engine schedule: Mirrlees to English Electric
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) headcode style
- NBL Type 2 (Class 21/29) re-engine schedule: MAN to Paxman
- Incidents of fires on diesel locomotives, 1961-1964
If there are any reports you would like to see, please contact me - see the Contact tab above.