D20/2 |
D600 |
24/01/1958 |
Swindon |
31/12/1967 |
|
9.94 |
|
Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) |
|
12.15 |
ACTIVE |
D20/2 |
D601 |
28/03/1958 |
Swindon |
31/12/1967 |
Laira |
9.77 |
|
Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) |
|
22.23 |
ARK ROYAL |
D20/2 |
D602 |
03/11/1958 |
Laira |
31/12/1967 |
Laira |
9.16 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.79 |
BULLDOG |
D20/2 |
D603 |
21/11/1958 |
Laira |
31/12/1967 |
|
9.12 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.74 |
CONQUEST |
D20/2 |
D604 |
20/01/1959 |
Laira |
31/12/1967 |
Laira |
8.95 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.58 |
COSSACK |
42 |
D800 |
11/08/1958 |
Swindon |
05/10/1968 |
|
10.16 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
10.93 |
SIR BRIAN ROBERTSON |
42 |
D801 |
07/11/1958 |
Laira |
03/08/1968 |
|
9.75 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.97 |
VANGUARD |
42 |
D802 |
16/12/1958 |
Laira |
05/10/1968 |
|
9.81 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.96 |
FORMIDABLE |
42 |
D803 |
16/03/1959 |
Laira |
01/01/1972 |
Newton Abbot |
12.81 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.57 |
ALBION |
42 |
D804 |
23/04/1959 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
12.45 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.93 |
AVENGER |
42 |
D805 |
13/05/1959 |
Laira |
24/10/1972 |
Laira |
13.46 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.02 |
BENBOW |
42 |
D806 |
03/06/1959 |
Laira |
02/11/1972 |
Laira |
13.43 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.96 |
CAMBRIAN |
42 |
D807 |
24/06/1959 |
Laira |
26/09/1972 |
Laira |
13.27 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.37 |
CARADOC |
42 |
D808 |
08/07/1959 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
12.25 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.64 |
CENTAUR |
42 |
D809 |
19/08/1959 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
12.13 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.14 |
CHAMPION |
42 |
D810 |
16/09/1959 |
Laira |
03/12/1972 |
Laira |
13.22 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.04 |
COCKADE |
42 |
D811 |
14/10/1959 |
Laira |
01/01/1972 |
Newton Abbot |
12.22 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.01 |
DARING |
42 |
D812 |
12/11/1959 |
Laira |
03/11/1972 |
Laira |
12.99 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.65 |
THE ROYAL NAVAL RESERVE 1859-1959 |
42 |
D813 |
09/12/1959 |
Laira |
01/01/1972 |
Newton Abbot |
12.07 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.82 |
DIADEM |
42 |
D814 |
01/01/1960 |
Laira |
07/11/1972 |
Laira |
12.86 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.15 |
DRAGON |
42 |
D815 |
20/01/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
11.71 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.74 |
DRUID |
42 |
D816 |
17/02/1960 |
Laira |
01/01/1972 |
Newton Abbot |
11.88 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.61 |
ECLIPSE |
42 |
D817 |
09/03/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
11.58 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.01 |
FOXHOUND |
42 |
D818 |
30/03/1960 |
Laira |
01/11/1972 |
Laira |
12.60 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
25.69 |
GLORY |
42 |
D819 |
25/04/1960 |
Laira |
01/10/1971 |
|
11.44 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.86 |
GOLIATH |
42 |
D820 |
04/05/1960 |
Laira |
02/11/1972 |
Laira |
12.51 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.29 |
GRENVILLE |
42 |
D821 |
25/05/1960 |
Laira |
03/12/1972 |
Laira |
12.53 |
|
|
|
63.89 |
GREYHOUND |
42 |
D822 |
15/06/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
11.31 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.68 |
HERCULES |
42 |
D823 |
06/07/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
11.25 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.88 |
HERMES |
42 |
D824 |
27/07/1960 |
Laira |
03/12/1972 |
Laira |
12.36 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.90 |
HIGHFLYER |
42 |
D825 |
24/08/1960 |
Laira |
23/08/1972 |
Laira |
12.01 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.18 |
INTREPID |
42 |
D826 |
07/09/1960 |
Laira |
18/10/1971 |
|
11.12 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.38 |
JUPITER |
42 |
D827 |
04/10/1960 |
Laira |
01/01/1972 |
Newton Abbot |
11.25 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.03 |
KELLY |
42 |
D828 |
19/10/1960 |
Laira |
28/05/1971 |
|
10.61 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.47 |
MAGNIFICENT |
42 |
D829 |
23/11/1960 |
Laira |
26/08/1972 |
Laira |
11.76 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.19 |
MAGPIE |
42 |
D830 |
19/01/1961 |
Newton Abbot |
26/03/1969 |
|
8.19 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.76 |
MAJESTIC |
42 |
D831 |
11/01/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.73 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.40 |
MONARCH |
42 |
D832 |
08/02/1961 |
Laira |
16/12/1972 |
Laira |
11.86 |
|
|
|
63.18 |
ONSLAUGHT |
43 |
D833 |
06/07/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
11.25 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.59 |
PANTHER |
43 |
D834 |
26/07/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
11.19 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.57 |
PATHFINDER |
43 |
D835 |
05/08/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
11.17 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.36 |
PEGASUS |
43 |
D836 |
13/09/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
|
10.69 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.50 |
POWERFUL |
43 |
D837 |
08/11/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
|
10.54 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.63 |
RAMILLIES |
43 |
D838 |
03/10/1960 |
Laira |
27/03/1971 |
|
10.48 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.83 |
RAPID |
43 |
D839 |
12/11/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.90 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.73 |
RELENTLESS |
43 |
D840 |
03/02/1961 |
Laira |
26/04/1969 |
|
8.23 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.31 |
RESISTANCE |
43 |
D841 |
14/12/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.81 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.21 |
ROEBUCK |
43 |
D842 |
20/12/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.79 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.25 |
ROYAL OAK |
43 |
D843 |
02/01/1961 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
|
10.39 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.31 |
SHARPSHOOTER |
43 |
D844 |
16/03/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.56 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.20 |
SPARTAN |
43 |
D845 |
07/04/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.50 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.12 |
SPRIGHTLY |
43 |
D846 |
12/04/1961 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
|
10.12 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.71 |
STEADFAST |
43 |
D847 |
22/04/1961 |
Laira |
27/03/1971 |
|
9.93 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.91 |
STRONGBOW |
43 |
D848 |
27/04/1961 |
Laira |
26/03/1969 |
|
7.92 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.08 |
SULTAN |
43 |
D849 |
29/05/1961 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
|
9.99 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.12 |
SUPERB |
43 |
D850 |
08/06/1961 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
|
9.96 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.74 |
SWIFT |
43 |
D851 |
10/07/1961 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
|
9.87 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.92 |
TEMERAIRE |
43 |
D852 |
24/07/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.20 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.87 |
TENACIOUS |
43 |
D853 |
30/08/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.10 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.80 |
THRUSTER |
43 |
D854 |
26/09/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.02 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.61 |
TIGER |
43 |
D855 |
25/10/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
9.95 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.52 |
TRIUMPH |
43 |
D856 |
16/11/1961 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
|
9.52 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.15 |
TROJAN |
43 |
D857 |
11/12/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
9.82 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.39 |
UNDAUNTED |
43 |
D858 |
15/12/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
9.81 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.49 |
VALOROUS |
43 |
D859 |
09/01/1962 |
Laira |
27/03/1971 |
|
9.22 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.48 |
VANQUISHER |
43 |
D860 |
22/01/1962 |
Laira |
27/03/1971 |
|
9.18 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.87 |
VICTORIOUS |
43 |
D861 |
14/02/1962 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
9.64 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.46 |
VIGILANT |
43 |
D862 |
13/03/1962 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
9.56 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.17 |
VIKING |
43 |
D863 |
07/04/1962 |
Laira |
26/03/1969 |
|
6.97 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
7.28 |
WARRIOR |
43 |
D864 |
10/05/1962 |
Laira |
27/03/1971 |
|
8.88 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.53 |
ZAMBESI |
43 |
D865 |
28/06/1962 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
|
8.90 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.96 |
ZEALOUS |
42 |
D866 |
24/03/1961 |
Laira |
01/01/1972 |
Newton Abbot |
10.78 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.56 |
ZEBRA |
42 |
D867 |
26/04/1961 |
Laira |
18/10/1971 |
|
10.48 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.44 |
ZENITH |
42 |
D868 |
18/05/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.38 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.90 |
ZEPHYR |
42 |
D869 |
12/07/1961 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.23 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.96 |
ZEST |
42 |
D870 |
25/10/1961 |
Laira |
28/08/1971 |
|
9.85 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.55 |
ZULU |
52 |
D1000 |
29/12/1961 |
Laira |
11/02/1974 |
Laira |
12.13 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.55 |
WESTERN ENTERPRISE |
52 |
D1001 |
12/02/1962 |
Laira |
04/10/1976 |
Laira |
14.65 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.52 |
WESTERN PATHFINDER |
52 |
D1002 |
19/03/1962 |
Laira |
29/01/1974 |
Laira |
11.87 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.24 |
WESTERN EXPLORER |
52 |
D1003 |
14/04/1962 |
Laira |
05/01/1975 |
Laira |
12.74 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.33 |
WESTERN PIONEER |
52 |
D1004 |
12/05/1962 |
Laira |
01/08/1973 |
Laira |
11.23 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.36 |
WESTERN CRUSADER |
52 |
D1005 |
18/06/1962 |
Laira |
16/11/1976 |
Laira |
14.42 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.01 |
WESTERN VENTURER |
52 |
D1006 |
06/07/1962 |
Laira |
06/04/1975 |
Laira |
12.76 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.73 |
WESTERN STALWART |
52 |
D1007 |
01/08/1962 |
Laira |
29/01/1974 |
Laira |
11.50 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.58 |
WESTERN TALISMAN |
52 |
D1008 |
04/09/1962 |
Laira |
21/10/1974 |
Laira |
12.14 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.11 |
WESTERN HARRIER |
52 |
D1009 |
24/09/1962 |
Old Oak Common |
10/11/1976 |
Laira |
14.14 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
16.19 |
WESTERN INVADER |
52 |
D1010 |
15/10/1962 |
Old Oak Common |
28/02/1977 |
Laira |
14.38 |
|
|
|
61.50 |
WESTERN CAMPAIGNER |
52 |
D1011 |
27/10/1962 |
Old Oak Common |
06/10/1975 |
Laira |
12.95 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
16.15 |
WESTERN THUNDERER |
52 |
D1012 |
17/11/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
02/11/1975 |
Laira |
12.97 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
16.46 |
WESTERN FIREBRAND |
52 |
D1013 |
13/12/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
28/02/1977 |
Laira |
14.22 |
|
|
|
61.33 |
WESTERN RANGER |
52 |
D1014 |
24/12/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/08/1974 |
Laira |
11.62 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.15 |
WESTERN LEVIATHAN |
52 |
D1015 |
21/01/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
13/12/1976 |
Laira |
13.90 |
|
|
|
61.23 |
WESTERN CHAMPION |
52 |
D1016 |
16/02/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
29/12/1975 |
Laira |
12.87 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.50 |
WESTERN GLADIATOR |
52 |
D1017 |
15/03/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/08/1973 |
Laira |
10.39 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.00 |
WESTERN WARRIOR |
52 |
D1018 |
02/04/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
04/06/1973 |
Laira |
10.18 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.97 |
WESTERN BUCCANEER |
52 |
D1019 |
02/05/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
06/05/1973 |
Laira |
10.02 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.43 |
WESTERN CHALLENGER |
52 |
D1020 |
21/05/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
04/06/1973 |
Laira |
10.05 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.92 |
WESTERN HERO |
52 |
D1021 |
17/06/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
10/08/1976 |
Laira |
13.16 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.71 |
WESTERN CAVALIER |
52 |
D1022 |
16/07/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
18/01/1977 |
Laira |
13.52 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.43 |
WESTERN SENTINEL |
52 |
D1023 |
23/09/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
28/02/1977 |
Laira |
13.44 |
|
|
|
60.56 |
WESTERN FUSILIER |
52 |
D1024 |
01/10/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
18/11/1973 |
Laira |
10.14 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.88 |
WESTERN HUNTSMAN |
52 |
D1025 |
01/11/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/10/1975 |
Laira |
11.94 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.22 |
WESTERN GUARDSMAN |
52 |
D1026 |
24/12/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
06/10/1975 |
Laira |
11.79 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.63 |
WESTERN CENTURION |
52 |
D1027 |
28/01/1964 |
Laira |
02/11/1975 |
Laira |
11.77 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.38 |
WESTERN LANCER |
52 |
D1028 |
25/02/1964 |
Swindon |
06/10/1976 |
Laira |
12.62 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.35 |
WESTERN HUSSAR |
52 |
D1029 |
20/04/1964 |
Bristol Bath Road |
18/11/1974 |
Laira |
10.59 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.11 |
WESTERN LEGIONAIRE |
52 |
D1029 |
20/04/1964 |
Bristol Bath Road |
18/11/1974 |
Laira |
10.59 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.11 |
WESTERN LEGIONNAIRE |
52 |
D1030 |
05/12/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
19/04/1976 |
Laira |
12.38 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.81 |
WESTERN MUSKETEER |
52 |
D1031 |
20/12/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
01/02/1975 |
Laira |
11.13 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.81 |
WESTERN RIFLEMAN |
52 |
D1032 |
31/12/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
06/05/1973 |
Laira |
9.35 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.94 |
WESTERN MARKSMAN |
52 |
D1033 |
17/01/1964 |
Old Oak Common |
17/09/1976 |
Laira |
12.68 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.29 |
WESTERN TROOPER |
52 |
D1034 |
15/04/1964 |
Old Oak Common |
06/10/1975 |
Laira |
11.48 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.10 |
WESTERN DRAGOON |
52 |
D1035 |
27/07/1962 |
Laira |
05/01/1975 |
Laira |
12.45 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.19 |
WESTERN YEOMAN |
52 |
D1036 |
29/08/1962 |
Laira |
01/11/1976 |
Laira |
14.19 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.50 |
WESTERN EMPEROR |
52 |
D1037 |
31/08/1962 |
Laira |
24/05/1976 |
Laira |
13.74 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.47 |
WESTERN EMPRESS |
52 |
D1038 |
07/09/1962 |
Laira |
08/10/1973 |
Laira |
11.09 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.21 |
WESTERN SOVEREIGN |
52 |
D1039 |
07/09/1962 |
Laira |
21/07/1973 |
Laira |
10.88 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.00 |
WESTERN KING |
52 |
D1040 |
20/09/1962 |
Old Oak Common |
29/02/1976 |
Laira |
13.45 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.90 |
WESTERN QUEEN |
52 |
D1041 |
10/10/1962 |
Old Oak Common |
23/02/1977 |
Laira |
14.38 |
|
|
|
61.51 |
WESTERN PRINCE |
52 |
D1042 |
19/10/1962 |
Old Oak Common |
21/07/1973 |
Laira |
10.76 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.59 |
WESTERN PRINCESS |
52 |
D1043 |
26/10/1962 |
Old Oak Common |
04/04/1976 |
Laira |
13.45 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.30 |
WESTERN DUKE |
52 |
D1044 |
12/11/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/02/1975 |
Laira |
12.23 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.84 |
WESTERN DUCHESS |
52 |
D1045 |
16/11/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
16/12/1974 |
Laira |
12.09 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.77 |
WESTERN VISCOUNT |
52 |
D1046 |
24/12/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
11/12/1975 |
Laira |
12.97 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.89 |
WESTERN MARQUIS |
52 |
D1047 |
04/02/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
29/02/1976 |
Laira |
13.08 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.61 |
WESTERN LORD |
52 |
D1048 |
15/12/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
28/02/1977 |
Laira |
14.22 |
|
|
|
61.33 |
WESTERN LADY |
52 |
D1049 |
14/12/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
26/04/1976 |
Laira |
13.38 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.15 |
WESTERN MONARCH |
52 |
D1050 |
01/01/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/04/1975 |
Laira |
12.27 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.28 |
WESTERN RULER |
52 |
D1051 |
21/01/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
02/09/1976 |
Laira |
13.62 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.58 |
WESTERN AMBASSADOR |
52 |
D1052 |
04/02/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/10/1975 |
Laira |
12.68 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.22 |
WESTERN VICEROY |
52 |
D1053 |
11/02/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
15/11/1976 |
Laira |
13.77 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.52 |
WESTERN PATRIARCH |
52 |
D1054 |
02/03/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
25/11/1976 |
Laira |
13.75 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.21 |
WESTERN GOVERNOR |
52 |
D1055 |
02/03/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
05/01/1976 |
Laira |
12.85 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.30 |
WESTERN ADVOCATE |
52 |
D1056 |
08/03/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
15/12/1976 |
Laira |
13.78 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
16.20 |
WESTERN SULTAN |
52 |
D1057 |
06/04/1963 |
Newton Abbot |
02/05/1976 |
Laira |
13.08 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.24 |
WESTERN CHIEFTAIN |
52 |
D1058 |
25/03/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
24/01/1977 |
Laira |
13.85 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
16.28 |
WESTERN NOBLEMAN |
52 |
D1059 |
06/04/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/10/1975 |
Laira |
12.51 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.30 |
WESTERN EMPIRE |
52 |
D1060 |
11/04/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
18/11/1973 |
Laira |
10.61 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.24 |
WESTERN DOMINION |
52 |
D1061 |
19/04/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
21/10/1974 |
Laira |
11.52 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.31 |
WESTERN ENVOY |
52 |
D1062 |
06/05/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
22/08/1974 |
Laira |
11.30 |
|
|
|
60.94 |
WESTERN COURIER |
52 |
D1063 |
17/05/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
04/04/1976 |
Laira |
12.89 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.26 |
WESTERN MONITOR |
52 |
D1064 |
24/05/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
11/12/1975 |
Laira |
12.56 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.11 |
WESTERN REGENT |
52 |
D1065 |
18/06/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
04/11/1976 |
Laira |
13.39 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.17 |
WESTERN CONSORT |
52 |
D1066 |
14/06/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
12/11/1974 |
Laira |
11.42 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.94 |
WESTERN PREFECT |
52 |
D1067 |
18/07/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
24/01/1976 |
Laira |
12.53 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.18 |
WESTERN DRUID |
52 |
D1068 |
12/07/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
12/10/1976 |
Laira |
13.26 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.10 |
WESTERN RELIANCE |
52 |
D1069 |
21/10/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/10/1975 |
Laira |
11.97 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.30 |
WESTERN VANGUARD |
52 |
D1070 |
28/10/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
30/12/1976 |
Laira |
13.18 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.56 |
WESTERN GAUNTLET |
52 |
D1071 |
07/11/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
07/12/1976 |
Laira |
13.09 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
15.07 |
WESTERN RENOWN |
52 |
D1072 |
07/11/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
02/11/1976 |
Laira |
13.00 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.42 |
WESTERN GLORY |
52 |
D1073 |
03/12/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
29/08/1974 |
Laira |
10.75 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.71 |
WESTERN BULWARK |
22 |
D6300 |
12/01/1959 |
Swindon |
26/05/1968 |
Exmouth Junction |
9.38 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.93 |
|
22 |
D6301 |
19/02/1959 |
Laira |
30/12/1967 |
Laira |
8.87 |
|
Cohens (Morriston) |
|
9.49 |
|
22 |
D6302 |
19/02/1959 |
Laira |
26/05/1968 |
Exmouth Junction |
9.27 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.75 |
|
22 |
D6303 |
22/05/1959 |
Laira |
26/05/1968 |
Exmouth Junction |
9.02 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.58 |
|
22 |
D6304 |
23/06/1959 |
Laira |
26/05/1968 |
Exmouth Junction |
8.93 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.41 |
|
22 |
D6305 |
11/01/1960 |
Laira |
26/05/1968 |
Exmouth Junction |
8.38 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
8.85 |
|
22 |
D6306 |
12/10/1959 |
Laira |
21/12/1968 |
Exmouth Junction |
9.20 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.60 |
|
22 |
D6307 |
12/10/1959 |
Laira |
27/03/1971 |
Exmouth Junction |
11.46 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.18 |
|
22 |
D6308 |
07/01/1960 |
Laira |
11/09/1971 |
Laira |
11.68 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.36 |
|
22 |
D6309 |
12/01/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
Exmouth Junction |
11.36 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.93 |
|
22 |
D6310 |
05/01/1960 |
Laira |
27/03/1971 |
Bristol Bath Road |
11.23 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.37 |
|
22 |
D6311 |
07/01/1960 |
Laira |
23/09/1968 |
Laira |
8.72 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.36 |
|
22 |
D6312 |
14/01/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
Bristol Bath Road |
11.36 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.01 |
|
22 |
D6313 |
12/01/1960 |
Laira |
03/08/1968 |
Laira |
8.56 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
8.85 |
|
22 |
D6314 |
25/01/1960 |
Laira |
03/05/1969 |
Laira |
9.28 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.31 |
|
22 |
D6315 |
25/01/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
Laira |
11.33 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.98 |
|
22 |
D6316 |
01/03/1960 |
Laira |
31/03/1968 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.09 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
8.80 |
|
22 |
D6317 |
01/03/1960 |
Laira |
23/09/1968 |
Laira |
8.57 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.30 |
|
22 |
D6318 |
14/03/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
Laira |
11.19 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.04 |
|
22 |
D6319 |
11/04/1960 |
Laira |
11/09/1971 |
Laira |
11.42 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.61 |
|
22 |
D6320 |
23/03/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
Bristol Bath Road |
11.17 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.24 |
LISTER |
22 |
D6321 |
07/04/1960 |
Laira |
03/08/1968 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.33 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
9.19 |
|
22 |
D6322 |
07/04/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
Laira |
11.50 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.11 |
|
22 |
D6323 |
25/04/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
Laira |
11.08 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.32 |
|
22 |
D6324 |
01/06/1960 |
Laira |
14/09/1968 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.29 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
8.96 |
|
22 |
D6325 |
14/06/1960 |
Laira |
05/10/1968 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.32 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
8.92 |
|
22 |
D6326 |
16/05/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
Laira |
11.39 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.84 |
|
22 |
D6327 |
30/06/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.90 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.05 |
|
22 |
D6328 |
18/06/1960 |
Laira |
17/07/1971 |
Laira |
11.08 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.92 |
|
22 |
D6329 |
18/06/1960 |
Laira |
30/11/1968 |
Newton Abbot |
8.46 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
8.91 |
|
22 |
D6330 |
26/07/1960 |
Laira |
23/09/1971 |
Laira |
11.17 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.90 |
|
22 |
D6331 |
26/07/1960 |
Laira |
27/03/1971 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.67 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.64 |
|
22 |
D6332 |
28/07/1960 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
Old Oak Common |
10.82 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.39 |
|
22 |
D6333 |
03/08/1960 |
Laira |
01/01/1972 |
Laira |
11.42 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.04 |
|
22 |
D6334 |
01/12/1960 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
Laira |
10.84 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.38 |
|
22 |
D6335 |
22/02/1961 |
Laira |
14/09/1968 |
Old Oak Common |
7.56 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
8.23 |
|
22 |
D6336 |
03/07/1961 |
Newton Abbot |
01/01/1972 |
Laira |
10.50 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.96 |
|
22 |
D6337 |
13/03/1962 |
Newton Abbot |
21/10/1971 |
Laira |
9.61 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.18 |
|
22 |
D6338 |
29/03/1962 |
Laira |
01/01/1972 |
Laira |
9.77 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.89 |
|
22 |
D6339 |
02/04/1962 |
Laira |
01/01/1972 |
Laira |
9.76 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.21 |
|
22 |
D6340 |
03/04/1962 |
Laira |
22/05/1971 |
Laira |
9.14 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.04 |
|
22 |
D6341 |
12/05/1962 |
Laira |
30/11/1968 |
Old Oak Common |
6.56 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
7.01 |
|
22 |
D6342 |
11/05/1962 |
Laira |
21/12/1968 |
Bristol Bath Road |
6.62 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
7.02 |
|
22 |
D6343 |
10/05/1962 |
Laira |
03/10/1971 |
Laira |
9.41 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.69 |
|
22 |
D6344 |
18/05/1962 |
Laira |
14/09/1968 |
Old Oak Common |
6.33 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
7.00 |
|
22 |
D6345 |
19/05/1962 |
Laira |
14/09/1968 |
Old Oak Common |
6.33 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
7.16 |
|
22 |
D6346 |
08/06/1962 |
Laira |
03/05/1969 |
Old Oak Common |
6.91 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
7.19 |
|
22 |
D6347 |
02/06/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
31/03/1968 |
Old Oak Common |
5.83 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
6.46 |
|
22 |
D6348 |
14/06/1962 |
Laira |
24/07/1971 |
Laira |
9.12 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.93 |
|
22 |
D6349 |
14/06/1962 |
Laira |
14/09/1968 |
Bristol Bath Road |
6.26 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.34 |
|
22 |
D6350 |
27/06/1962 |
Laira |
14/09/1968 |
Old Oak Common |
6.22 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
6.89 |
|
22 |
D6351 |
27/06/1962 |
Laira |
30/11/1969 |
Old Oak Common |
7.43 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
6.89 |
|
22 |
D6352 |
12/07/1962 |
Laira |
02/05/1971 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.81 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.35 |
|
22 |
D6353 |
12/07/1962 |
Laira |
23/09/1968 |
Old Oak Common |
6.21 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
7.01 |
|
22 |
D6354 |
02/08/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
22/05/1971 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.81 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.55 |
|
22 |
D6355 |
24/08/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
14/09/1968 |
Old Oak Common |
6.06 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
6.73 |
|
22 |
D6356 |
27/09/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
03/10/1971 |
Laira |
9.02 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.31 |
|
22 |
D6357 |
13/11/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
21/12/1968 |
Old Oak Common |
6.11 |
|
Cashmore's (Newport) |
|
6.51 |
|
35 |
D7000 |
16/05/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
30/07/1973 |
|
12.21 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
14.40 |
|
35 |
D7001 |
03/07/1961 |
St Philips Marsh |
16/03/1974 |
Old Oak Common |
12.71 |
|
Cohens (Kettering) |
|
14.04 |
|
35 |
D7002 |
19/07/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
03/10/1971 |
|
10.21 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.94 |
|
35 |
D7003 |
03/08/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.42 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.01 |
|
35 |
D7004 |
15/08/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
16/06/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.84 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.04 |
|
35 |
D7005 |
25/09/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
02/07/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.78 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.06 |
|
35 |
D7006 |
06/10/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
11/09/1971 |
|
9.94 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.95 |
|
35 |
D7007 |
18/10/1961 |
Westbury |
19/04/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.51 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.67 |
|
35 |
D7008 |
24/10/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.19 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.90 |
|
35 |
D7009 |
07/11/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
06/05/1973 |
Bristol Bath Road |
11.50 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.95 |
|
35 |
D7010 |
20/11/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.12 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.99 |
|
35 |
D7011 |
04/12/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
02/03/1975 |
|
13.25 |
|
Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) |
|
15.13 |
|
35 |
D7012 |
01/12/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.09 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.55 |
|
35 |
D7013 |
14/12/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.05 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.84 |
|
35 |
D7014 |
18/12/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.04 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.67 |
|
35 |
D7015 |
22/12/1961 |
Bristol Bath Road |
07/06/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
10.47 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.74 |
|
35 |
D7016 |
03/01/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
06/07/1974 |
Old Oak Common |
12.51 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.45 |
|
35 |
D7017 |
08/01/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
13/03/1975 |
|
13.18 |
|
|
|
62.26 |
|
35 |
D7018 |
18/01/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
16/03/1975 |
|
13.16 |
|
|
|
62.24 |
|
35 |
D7019 |
14/02/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
15/09/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
10.59 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.67 |
|
35 |
D7020 |
08/02/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.90 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.61 |
|
35 |
D7021 |
14/02/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.88 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.34 |
|
35 |
D7022 |
26/02/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
02/03/1975 |
|
13.02 |
|
Cohens (Kettering) |
|
14.90 |
|
35 |
D7023 |
21/02/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
06/05/1973 |
Old Oak Common |
11.21 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.24 |
|
35 |
D7024 |
16/03/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.80 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.68 |
|
35 |
D7025 |
15/03/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.81 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.26 |
|
35 |
D7026 |
26/03/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
06/10/1974 |
Old Oak Common |
12.54 |
|
Cohens (Kettering) |
|
14.90 |
|
35 |
D7027 |
07/04/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
29/11/1971 |
Old Oak Common |
9.65 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.36 |
|
35 |
D7028 |
05/04/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1975 |
|
12.75 |
|
Cohens (Kettering) |
|
14.88 |
|
35 |
D7029 |
17/04/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
28/02/1975 |
|
12.88 |
|
|
|
61.99 |
|
35 |
D7030 |
19/04/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/05/1973 |
Old Oak Common |
11.05 |
|
Birds (Long Marston) |
|
11.84 |
|
35 |
D7031 |
25/04/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
11/05/1973 |
Old Oak Common |
11.05 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.40 |
|
35 |
D7032 |
05/05/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/05/1973 |
Old Oak Common |
11.01 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.20 |
|
35 |
D7033 |
24/05/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.61 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.49 |
|
35 |
D7034 |
23/05/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.62 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.32 |
|
35 |
D7035 |
04/06/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.58 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.21 |
|
35 |
D7036 |
05/06/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
09/06/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
10.02 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.37 |
|
35 |
D7037 |
18/06/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
15/09/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
10.25 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.42 |
|
35 |
D7038 |
18/06/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
02/07/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.05 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.00 |
|
35 |
D7039 |
22/06/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/06/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.96 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.16 |
|
35 |
D7040 |
13/07/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.48 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.10 |
|
35 |
D7041 |
13/07/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.48 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.18 |
|
35 |
D7042 |
23/07/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.45 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.99 |
|
35 |
D7043 |
24/07/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
|
9.45 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.07 |
|
35 |
D7044 |
18/08/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
06/05/1973 |
Old Oak Common |
10.72 |
|
Birds (Long Marston) |
|
11.50 |
|
35 |
D7045 |
10/08/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
11/11/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.26 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.02 |
|
35 |
D7046 |
15/08/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.39 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.92 |
|
35 |
D7047 |
15/08/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.39 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.01 |
|
35 |
D7048 |
26/09/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.27 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.89 |
|
35 |
D7049 |
05/10/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.25 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.78 |
|
35 |
D7050 |
05/10/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/11/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.08 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.70 |
|
35 |
D7051 |
06/10/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.24 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.70 |
|
35 |
D7052 |
24/10/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
30/11/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
10.11 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.56 |
|
35 |
D7053 |
24/10/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.19 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.82 |
|
35 |
D7054 |
16/11/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
30/12/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.13 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.42 |
|
35 |
D7055 |
02/11/1962 |
Bristol Bath Road |
09/06/1973 |
|
10.61 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
13.04 |
|
35 |
D7056 |
13/11/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.14 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.68 |
|
35 |
D7057 |
22/11/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.12 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.90 |
|
35 |
D7058 |
28/11/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.85 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.55 |
|
35 |
D7059 |
28/11/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.85 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.64 |
|
35 |
D7060 |
19/12/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.79 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.83 |
|
35 |
D7061 |
29/12/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.01 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.64 |
|
35 |
D7062 |
31/01/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.68 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.55 |
|
35 |
D7063 |
28/12/1962 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.77 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.89 |
|
35 |
D7064 |
29/01/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.68 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.64 |
|
35 |
D7065 |
28/01/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.93 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.64 |
|
35 |
D7066 |
31/01/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
29/11/1971 |
Old Oak Common |
8.83 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.55 |
|
35 |
D7067 |
06/02/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.66 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.53 |
|
35 |
D7068 |
13/02/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
30/12/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.88 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.18 |
|
35 |
D7069 |
22/02/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.62 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.48 |
|
35 |
D7070 |
08/03/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
08/09/1972 |
|
9.51 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.61 |
|
35 |
D7071 |
11/03/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
8.82 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.52 |
|
35 |
D7072 |
22/03/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.54 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.49 |
|
35 |
D7073 |
11/03/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10/12/1971 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.76 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.61 |
|
35 |
D7074 |
26/03/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
30/12/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.77 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
12.40 |
|
35 |
D7075 |
29/03/1963 |
Newton Abbot |
06/05/1973 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.11 |
|
Birds (Long Marston) |
|
10.81 |
|
35 |
D7076 |
03/05/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
06/05/1973 |
Bristol Bath Road |
10.02 |
|
|
|
60.95 |
|
35 |
D7077 |
13/12/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
02/07/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.56 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
8.85 |
|
35 |
D7078 |
03/05/1963 |
Old Oak Common |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.42 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.04 |
|
35 |
D7079 |
16/12/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
03/10/1971 |
|
7.80 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
8.67 |
|
35 |
D7080 |
14/12/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
07/11/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.91 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.42 |
|
35 |
D7081 |
12/12/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
11/09/1971 |
|
7.75 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
8.68 |
|
35 |
D7082 |
05/06/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
19/04/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.88 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.37 |
|
35 |
D7083 |
05/06/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/10/1971 |
|
8.33 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.29 |
|
35 |
D7084 |
26/06/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
11/10/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
9.30 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.40 |
|
35 |
D7085 |
24/06/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
11/10/1972 |
Old Oak Common |
9.31 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.40 |
|
35 |
D7086 |
20/07/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/01/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.46 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.16 |
|
35 |
D7087 |
20/07/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
07/10/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.22 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.16 |
|
35 |
D7088 |
29/10/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/01/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.18 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
8.97 |
|
35 |
D7089 |
23/07/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
06/05/1973 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.79 |
|
T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) |
|
12.58 |
|
35 |
D7090 |
24/09/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
12/06/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.72 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
8.98 |
|
35 |
D7091 |
24/09/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
10/08/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.88 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.07 |
|
35 |
D7092 |
16/12/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
20/06/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.52 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
8.76 |
|
35 |
D7093 |
14/12/1963 |
Bristol Bath Road |
26/11/1974 |
|
10.96 |
|
Cohens (Kettering) |
|
13.18 |
|
35 |
D7094 |
14/12/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/11/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.89 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
9.59 |
|
35 |
D7095 |
24/12/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
16/10/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.82 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
8.90 |
|
35 |
D7096 |
16/12/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
30/12/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.05 |
|
Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) |
|
22.18 |
|
35 |
D7097 |
16/12/1963 |
Cardiff Canton |
30/12/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
9.05 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.25 |
|
35 |
D7098 |
01/01/1964 |
Newton Abbot |
30/12/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
9.00 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
11.21 |
|
35 |
D7099 |
22/01/1964 |
Newton Abbot |
05/10/1972 |
Cardiff Canton |
8.71 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
8.74 |
|
35 |
D7100 |
05/02/1964 |
Newton Abbot |
01/11/1972 |
Bristol Bath Road |
8.75 |
|
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
10.87 |
|
14 |
D9500 |
24/07/1964 |
Bristol Bath Road |
03/05/1969 |
|
4.78 |
|
|
|
59.72 |
|
14 |
D9501 |
27/07/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
31/03/1968 |
Worcester |
3.68 |
|
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
|
3.89 |
|
14 |
D9502 |
27/07/1964 |
Bristol Bath Road |
03/05/1969 |
|
4.77 |
|
|
|
59.71 |
|
14 |
D9503 |
30/07/1964 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.67 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
16.14 |
|
14 |
D9504 |
08/08/1964 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.65 |
|
|
|
4.40 |
|
14 |
D9505 |
12/08/1964 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.64 |
|
Unknown (Belgium) |
|
|
|
14 |
D9506 |
31/08/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
10/03/1968 |
|
3.53 |
|
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
|
3.71 |
|
14 |
D9507 |
28/08/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.59 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
18.06 |
|
14 |
D9508 |
07/09/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
05/10/1968 |
|
4.08 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
19.37 |
|
14 |
D9509 |
08/09/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
05/10/1968 |
|
4.08 |
|
Cohens (Kettering) |
|
6.19 |
|
14 |
D9510 |
18/09/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.54 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
17.92 |
|
14 |
D9511 |
17/09/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.54 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
14.83 |
|
14 |
D9512 |
29/09/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.51 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
17.39 |
|
14 |
D9513 |
06/10/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
10/03/1968 |
|
3.43 |
|
|
|
59.52 |
|
14 |
D9514 |
06/10/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/05/1969 |
|
4.58 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
21.21 |
|
14 |
D9515 |
17/10/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.46 |
|
Unknown (Spain) |
|
|
|
14 |
D9516 |
21/10/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.45 |
|
|
|
59.48 |
|
14 |
D9517 |
12/11/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
05/10/1968 |
|
3.90 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
19.19 |
|
14 |
D9518 |
30/10/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/05/1969 |
|
4.51 |
|
|
|
59.45 |
|
14 |
D9519 |
30/10/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
05/10/1968 |
|
3.93 |
|
Cohens (Kettering) |
|
6.05 |
|
14 |
D9520 |
12/11/1964 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.39 |
|
|
|
59.42 |
|
14 |
D9521 |
20/11/1964 |
Old Oak Common |
03/05/1969 |
|
4.45 |
|
|
|
59.39 |
|
14 |
D9522 |
25/11/1964 |
Old Oak Common |
31/12/1967 |
|
3.10 |
|
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
|
3.47 |
|
14 |
D9523 |
01/12/1964 |
Old Oak Common |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.33 |
|
|
|
59.36 |
|
14 |
D9524 |
11/12/1964 |
Old Oak Common |
03/05/1969 |
|
4.39 |
|
|
|
59.34 |
|
14 |
D9525 |
13/01/1965 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.22 |
|
|
|
3.96 |
|
14 |
D9526 |
06/01/1965 |
Bristol Bath Road |
30/11/1968 |
|
3.90 |
|
|
|
59.27 |
|
14 |
D9527 |
18/01/1965 |
Bristol Bath Road |
03/05/1969 |
|
4.29 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
19.00 |
|
14 |
D9528 |
21/01/1965 |
Bristol Bath Road |
02/03/1969 |
|
4.11 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
16.91 |
|
14 |
D9529 |
26/01/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.18 |
|
|
|
59.21 |
|
14 |
D9530 |
02/02/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
05/10/1968 |
|
3.67 |
|
National Coal Board (Tower Colliery) |
|
17.54 |
|
14 |
D9531 |
02/02/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
30/12/1967 |
|
2.91 |
|
|
|
59.19 |
|
14 |
D9532 |
18/02/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.12 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
17.00 |
|
14 |
D9533 |
19/02/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.12 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
17.58 |
|
14 |
D9534 |
02/03/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.08 |
|
Unknown (Bruges, Belgium) |
|
59.12 |
|
14 |
D9535 |
08/03/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
21/12/1968 |
|
3.79 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
18.87 |
|
14 |
D9536 |
16/03/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/05/1969 |
|
4.13 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
20.76 |
|
14 |
D9537 |
16/03/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
3.05 |
|
|
|
59.08 |
|
14 |
D9538 |
26/03/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
03/05/1969 |
|
4.11 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
17.48 |
|
14 |
D9539 |
09/04/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.98 |
|
|
|
59.01 |
|
14 |
D9540 |
22/04/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.95 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
18.75 |
|
14 |
D9541 |
27/04/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.93 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
17.31 |
|
14 |
D9542 |
06/05/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.91 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
17.29 |
|
14 |
D9543 |
28/06/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.76 |
|
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
|
3.39 |
|
14 |
D9544 |
29/05/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.84 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
15.31 |
|
14 |
D9545 |
08/06/1965 |
Landore |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.82 |
|
National Coal Board (Ashington) |
|
14.11 |
|
14 |
D9546 |
28/06/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.76 |
|
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
|
3.39 |
|
14 |
D9547 |
20/07/1965 |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.70 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
17.08 |
|
14 |
D9548 |
26/07/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.68 |
|
Unknown (Spain) |
|
|
|
14 |
D9549 |
19/08/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.62 |
|
Unknown (Terragona, Spain) |
|
41.60 |
|
14 |
D9550 |
27/08/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.60 |
|
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
|
3.22 |
|
14 |
D9551 |
02/09/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.58 |
|
|
|
58.61 |
|
14 |
D9552 |
06/09/1965 |
Cardiff Canton |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.57 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
15.04 |
|
14 |
D9553 |
16/09/1965 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.54 |
|
|
|
58.57 |
|
14 |
D9554 |
06/10/1965 |
Bristol Bath Road |
01/04/1968 |
Hull Dairycoates |
2.49 |
|
British Steel Corporation (at Corby) |
|
16.87 |
|
14 |
D9555 |
22/10/1965 |
Bristol Bath Road |
03/05/1969 |
|
3.53 |
|
|
|
58.47 |
|