Miscellaneous Reports
Number | Date To Service | Date of fire | Depot | Allocation at time of fire | Severity | Source | Material involved | Location | Damage | Details |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D5302 | 02/10/1958 | 08/01/1961 | 64B | Haymarket | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D5010 | 21/03/1959 | 13/01/1961 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5316 | 20/03/1959 | 25/01/1961 | 64B | Haymarket | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D6125 | 29/09/1959 | 25/01/1961 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D17 | 23/12/1960 | 27/01/1961 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D6138 | 02/02/1960 | 02/02/1961 | 61A | Kittybrewster | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6125 | 29/09/1959 | 08/02/1961 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6317 | 01/03/1960 | 08/02/1961 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5528 | 30/04/1959 | 20/02/1961 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5576 | 31/12/1959 | 23/02/1961 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5345 | 23/10/1959 | 28/02/1961 | 60A | Inverness | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8209 | 07/10/1958 | 22/03/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D6330 | 26/07/1960 | 23/03/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8401 | 11/06/1958 | 28/03/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5505 | 20/02/1958 | 13/04/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5003 | 12/12/1958 | 22/04/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5011 | 28/03/1959 | 22/04/1961 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6118 | 24/06/1959 | 03/05/1961 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D834 | 26/07/1960 | 25/05/1961 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5624 | 16/06/1960 | 29/05/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6119 | 30/06/1959 | 31/05/1961 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6317 | 01/03/1960 | 03/06/1961 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5006 | 03/01/1959 | 08/06/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5506 | 13/03/1958 | 10/06/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D13 | 05/11/1960 | 13/06/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6104 | 26/02/1959 | 20/06/1961 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5582 | 21/01/1960 | 27/06/1961 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8201 | 17/02/1958 | 02/07/1961 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5501 | 25/11/1957 | 07/07/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5521 | 05/03/1959 | 20/07/1961 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5309 | 19/12/1958 | 04/08/1961 | 64B | Haymarket | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6333 | 03/08/1960 | 13/09/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5555 | 01/10/1959 | 15/09/1961 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D8402 | 16/07/1958 | 18/09/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D88 | 02/03/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D1 | 14/08/1959 | 29/09/1961 | 9A | Longsight | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5117 | 14/05/1960 | 29/09/1961 | 60A | Inverness | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5046 | 29/10/1959 | 07/10/1961 | 32B | Ipswich | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D17 | 23/12/1960 | 18/10/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5560 | 29/10/1959 | 23/10/1961 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D8402 | 16/07/1958 | 02/11/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8401 | 11/06/1958 | 06/11/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5006 | 03/01/1959 | 08/11/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D26 | 22/04/1961 | 09/11/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D5506 | 13/03/1958 | 12/11/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8212 | 27/11/1959 | 13/11/1961 | 31B | March | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D841 | 14/12/1960 | 16/11/1961 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5554 | 01/10/1959 | 16/11/1961 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5561 | 29/10/1959 | 24/11/1961 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5107 | 08/10/1960 | 25/11/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D839 | 12/11/1960 | 26/11/1961 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8408 | 25/09/1958 | 09/12/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8402 | 16/07/1958 | 10/12/1961 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5047 | 21/11/1959 | 14/12/1961 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D846 | 12/04/1961 | 18/12/1961 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D13 | 05/11/1960 | 20/12/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5566 | 19/11/1959 | 20/12/1961 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D814 | 01/01/1960 | 03/01/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6104 | 26/02/1959 | 05/01/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6322 | 07/04/1960 | 08/01/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6310 | 05/01/1960 | 16/01/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6312 | 14/01/1960 | 23/01/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5109 | 05/11/1960 | 28/01/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D847 | 22/04/1961 | 06/02/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5581 | 14/01/1960 | 10/02/1962 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5065 | 02/02/1960 | 13/02/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Cinders from steam locomotives | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5062 | 18/01/1960 | 14/02/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D8401 | 11/06/1958 | 19/02/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5332 | 02/07/1959 | 23/02/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D9015 | 13/10/1961 | 20/03/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6113 | 27/05/1959 | 22/03/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D803 | 16/03/1959 | 24/03/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D5117 | 14/05/1960 | 25/03/1962 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6128 | 13/10/1959 | 26/03/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6127 | 06/10/1959 | 29/03/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Greenloaning | Severe body work and engine damage. | Fuel leak onto hot exhaust manifold. |
D6109 | 07/04/1959 | 03/04/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6128 | 13/10/1959 | 04/04/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5008 | 28/02/1959 | 13/04/1962 | 1B | Camden | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6128 | 13/10/1959 | 14/04/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5330 | 19/06/1959 | 19/04/1962 | 64A | St Margarets | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D838 | 03/10/1960 | 21/04/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D9012 | 04/09/1961 | 21/04/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D5042 | 12/10/1959 | 27/04/1962 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5334 | 17/07/1959 | 09/05/1962 | 64A | St Margarets | Unknown | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D95 | 15/04/1961 | 11/05/1962 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5072 | 17/02/1960 | 11/05/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D809 | 19/08/1959 | 14/05/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8403 | 18/07/1958 | 17/05/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6110 | 20/05/1959 | 23/05/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5685 | 02/02/1961 | 28/05/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5637 | 28/07/1960 | 02/06/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D852 | 24/07/1961 | 05/06/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5620 | 02/06/1960 | 06/06/1962 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8400 | 30/05/1958 | 07/06/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8236 | 07/10/1960 | 08/06/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D24 | 15/04/1961 | 25/06/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5045 | 12/11/1959 | 27/06/1962 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5039 | 24/10/1959 | 07/07/1962 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Westerfield | Electrical fault | Yarmouth-Liverpool street service. Electrical fault. |
D6330 | 26/07/1960 | 07/07/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5315 | 13/03/1959 | 09/07/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D143 | 01/12/1961 | 11/07/1962 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D32 | 12/06/1961 | 13/07/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6136 | 17/12/1959 | 14/07/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Forteviot | Traction motor cabling, flexible air bellows damaged. Also, fairings and other parts of body distorted by heat. | Air brake had been left applied at Perth, causing overheating of brake blocks and sparking which ignited oily deposits near traction motor cabling. Had been working in conjunction with D6130 on 11:00 Relief Aberdeen to Balloch |
D5548 | 03/09/1959 | 16/07/1962 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6335 | 22/02/1961 | 16/07/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D19 | 31/12/1960 | 17/07/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D27 | 29/04/1961 | 17/07/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D815 | 20/01/1960 | 17/07/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6346 | 08/06/1962 | 17/07/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D69 | 18/10/1960 | 20/07/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D9013 | 14/09/1961 | 20/07/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D5055 | 18/12/1959 | 22/07/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D8203 | 24/02/1958 | 26/07/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D70 | 12/11/1960 | 28/07/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5316 | 20/03/1959 | 29/07/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | Works attention required | Not known | Not known | |||
D96 | 18/04/1961 | 01/08/1962 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5044 | 23/10/1959 | 03/08/1962 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D6315 | 25/01/1960 | 14/08/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D864 | 10/05/1962 | 16/08/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5539 | 09/07/1959 | 17/08/1962 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D86 | 09/03/1961 | 24/08/1962 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8213 | 09/12/1959 | 29/08/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5309 | 19/12/1958 | 30/08/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D838 | 03/10/1960 | 31/08/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6138 | 02/02/1960 | 31/08/1962 | 61A | Kittybrewster | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6119 | 30/06/1959 | 03/09/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5802 | 15/06/1961 | 08/09/1962 | 31B | March | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D812 | 12/11/1959 | 10/09/1962 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D45 | 08/09/1961 | 11/09/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5530 | 14/05/1959 | 12/09/1962 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D73 | 25/11/1960 | 14/09/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Works attention required | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D9001 | 23/02/1961 | 14/09/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D36 | 06/07/1961 | 15/09/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5313 | 23/01/1959 | 15/09/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5300 | 30/07/1958 | 16/09/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5668 | 17/11/1960 | 20/09/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8403 | 18/07/1958 | 21/09/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5304 | 31/10/1958 | 22/09/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D24 | 15/04/1961 | 24/09/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5314 | 30/01/1959 | 25/09/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5127 | 30/07/1960 | 28/09/1962 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5047 | 21/11/1959 | 30/09/1962 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8405 | 04/09/1958 | 02/10/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5661 | 27/10/1960 | 03/10/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5643 | 25/08/1960 | 05/10/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5095 | 23/03/1960 | 07/10/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D30 | 20/05/1961 | 08/10/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5067 | 24/12/1959 | 09/10/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6107 | 24/03/1959 | 09/10/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8216 | 31/12/1959 | 10/10/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D76 | 30/11/1960 | 15/10/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D162 | 09/04/1962 | 15/10/1962 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5509 | 01/05/1958 | 15/10/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5100 | 25/06/1960 | 17/10/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6124 | 29/09/1959 | 18/10/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D77 | 10/12/1960 | 19/10/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5088 | 13/06/1960 | 19/10/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D121 | 06/10/1961 | 20/10/1962 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5626 | 23/06/1960 | 22/10/1962 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D34 | 29/06/1961 | 24/10/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D8217 | 19/01/1960 | 24/10/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D99 | 03/05/1961 | 25/10/1962 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5522 | 12/03/1959 | 26/10/1962 | 32B | Ipswich | Works attention required | Not known | Not known | |||
D6131 | 03/11/1959 | 26/10/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D146 | 15/12/1961 | 02/11/1962 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D86 | 09/03/1961 | 03/11/1962 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6128 | 13/10/1959 | 06/11/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D24 | 15/04/1961 | 08/11/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8409 | 26/09/1958 | 12/11/1962 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D12 | 15/10/1960 | 13/11/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D26 | 22/04/1961 | 15/11/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5682 | 12/01/1961 | 16/11/1962 | 31B | March | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D9009 | 21/07/1961 | 16/11/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D5337 | 20/08/1959 | 17/11/1962 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5107 | 08/10/1960 | 20/11/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D74 | 05/12/1960 | 24/11/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5070 | 23/01/1960 | 26/11/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D89 | 22/03/1961 | 01/12/1962 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D5600 | 24/03/1960 | 01/12/1962 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Not known | |||
D30 | 20/05/1961 | 10/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Not known | |||
D104 | 01/06/1961 | 11/12/1962 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5578 | 07/01/1960 | 11/12/1962 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5331 | 26/06/1959 | 13/12/1962 | 64A | St Margarets | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5027 | 31/10/1959 | 14/12/1962 | 1A | Willesden | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D49 | 07/10/1961 | 17/12/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5335 | 24/07/1959 | 18/12/1962 | 60A | Inverness | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D9020 | 12/02/1962 | 26/12/1962 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5023 | 25/09/1959 | 28/12/1962 | 1A | Willesden | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D52 | 07/06/1962 | 01/01/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Hendon | St.Pancras- Manchester. Piston failure. | |
D8233 | 31/08/1960 | 01/01/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D102 | 18/05/1961 | 03/01/1963 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Kettering | St.Pancras-Manchester. Piston failure. | |
D5539 | 09/07/1959 | 05/01/1963 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Not known | |||
D5094 | 18/02/1960 | 06/01/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D73 | 25/11/1960 | 07/01/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5071 | 06/02/1960 | 08/01/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5065 | 02/02/1960 | 10/01/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5052 | 04/12/1959 | 12/01/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D6107 | 24/03/1959 | 16/01/1963 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D27 | 29/04/1961 | 24/01/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D6100 | 02/12/1958 | 25/01/1963 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Train heating boiler burners | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D15 | 09/12/1960 | 26/01/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D99 | 03/05/1961 | 29/01/1963 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5341 | 18/09/1959 | 01/02/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D61 | 08/03/1962 | 05/02/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6102 | 23/12/1958 | 08/02/1963 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6311 | 07/01/1960 | 12/02/1963 | 83D | Laira | Works attention required | Not known | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6111 | 12/05/1959 | 15/02/1963 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5048 | 05/11/1959 | 18/02/1963 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5854 | 23/08/1962 | 23/02/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D9010 | 21/07/1961 | 03/03/1963 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D9007 | 22/06/1961 | 05/03/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D5535 | 18/06/1959 | 09/03/1963 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D837 | 08/11/1960 | 10/03/1963 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5053 | 03/12/1959 | 10/03/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Unknown | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D5650 | 15/09/1960 | 12/03/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D123 | 28/10/1961 | 19/03/1963 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5641 | 18/08/1960 | 21/03/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5302 | 02/10/1958 | 23/03/1963 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D149 | 30/12/1961 | 07/04/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5055 | 18/12/1959 | 14/04/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D103 | 30/05/1961 | 18/04/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5050 | 27/11/1959 | 20/04/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D5112 | 30/12/1960 | 20/04/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D48 | 02/10/1961 | 22/04/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5054 | 18/12/1959 | 30/04/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5507 | 19/04/1958 | 02/05/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Works attention required | Not known | Not known | |||
D6133 | 24/11/1959 | 03/05/1963 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5042 | 12/10/1959 | 05/05/1963 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D49 | 07/10/1961 | 09/05/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5051 | 05/12/1959 | 10/05/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5317 | 27/02/1959 | 10/05/1963 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5525 | 09/04/1959 | 13/05/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5008 | 28/02/1959 | 16/05/1963 | 5A | Crewe North | Unknown | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D143 | 01/12/1961 | 18/05/1963 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Mechanical seizures or failures | Electrical insulation | |||
D5059 | 29/12/1959 | 28/05/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5100 | 25/06/1960 | 28/05/1963 | 50A | York (North) | Not severe | Cinders from steam locomotives | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D809 | 19/08/1959 | 30/05/1963 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6114 | 27/05/1959 | 31/05/1963 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D9018 | 24/11/1961 | 04/06/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D801 | 07/11/1958 | 05/06/1963 | 83D | Laira | Works attention required | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D72 | 19/11/1960 | 06/06/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5544 | 20/08/1959 | 14/06/1963 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6135 | 08/12/1959 | 15/06/1963 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6141 | 15/03/1960 | 17/06/1963 | 61A | Kittybrewster | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5096 | 09/04/1960 | 19/06/1963 | 50A | York (North) | Not severe | Cinders from steam locomotives | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D11 | 01/10/1960 | 20/06/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D861 | 14/02/1962 | 23/06/1963 | 83D | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6140 | 24/02/1960 | 24/06/1963 | 61A | Kittybrewster | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5128 | 13/08/1960 | 29/06/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D820 | 04/05/1960 | 30/06/1963 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5578 | 07/01/1960 | 01/07/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5332 | 02/07/1959 | 06/07/1963 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D71 | 25/11/1960 | 11/07/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D71 | 25/11/1960 | 11/07/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5070 | 23/01/1960 | 15/07/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5125 | 14/07/1960 | 16/07/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5548 | 03/09/1959 | 16/07/1963 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D822 | 15/06/1960 | 19/07/1963 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5649 | 08/09/1960 | 19/07/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5072 | 17/02/1960 | 20/07/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5052 | 04/12/1959 | 22/07/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5102 | 16/07/1960 | 26/07/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5345 | 23/10/1959 | 26/07/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D176 | 14/08/1962 | 27/07/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D4 | 26/09/1959 | 30/07/1963 | 18A | Toton | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D159 | 23/03/1962 | 30/07/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D58 | 30/01/1962 | 31/07/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5500 | 10/10/1957 | 01/08/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5044 | 23/10/1959 | 03/08/1963 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5053 | 03/12/1959 | 07/08/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5053 | 03/12/1959 | 08/08/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D96 | 18/04/1961 | 09/08/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D45 | 08/09/1961 | 10/08/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5054 | 18/12/1959 | 10/08/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6135 | 08/12/1959 | 12/08/1963 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5025 | 16/10/1959 | 13/08/1963 | 1A | Willesden | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5063 | 26/01/1960 | 13/08/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D48 | 02/10/1961 | 14/08/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5653 | 22/09/1960 | 14/08/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5663 | 03/11/1960 | 15/08/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5067 | 24/12/1959 | 22/08/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D13 | 05/11/1960 | 24/08/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D20 | 24/02/1961 | 24/08/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D76 | 30/11/1960 | 30/08/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6350 | 27/06/1962 | 30/08/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5303 | 17/10/1958 | 04/09/1963 | 64B | Haymarket | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5604 | 07/04/1960 | 05/09/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D168 | 31/05/1962 | 09/09/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5095 | 23/03/1960 | 09/09/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5334 | 17/07/1959 | 10/09/1963 | 64A | St Margarets | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Culloden Moor | None | Brake block sparks set off oily deposits on bogie. |
D85 | 06/02/1961 | 11/09/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D190 | 26/01/1963 | 11/09/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D94 | 06/04/1961 | 12/09/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Not known | |||
D95 | 15/04/1961 | 13/09/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5104 | 27/08/1960 | 13/09/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5056 | 11/12/1959 | 16/09/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1511 | 28/02/1963 | 17/09/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Electrical insulation | |||
D15 | 09/12/1960 | 19/09/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5542 | 30/07/1959 | 20/09/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | Not severe | Not known | Electrical insulation | |||
D139 | 03/11/1961 | 21/09/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Not known | |||
D848 | 27/04/1961 | 21/09/1963 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1518 | 10/05/1963 | 26/09/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D87 | 24/02/1961 | 27/09/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5072 | 17/02/1960 | 29/09/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5120 | 04/06/1960 | 30/09/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Clachnaharry | None | Evidence points to sparks ignited oily deposits on fuel tank. |
D817 | 09/03/1960 | 03/10/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5522 | 12/03/1959 | 03/10/1963 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1542 | 20/09/1963 | 04/10/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5050 | 27/11/1959 | 04/10/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D13 | 05/11/1960 | 07/10/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1508 | 23/01/1963 | 10/10/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5637 | 28/07/1960 | 10/10/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D5691 | 16/03/1961 | 10/10/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D81 | 21/12/1960 | 12/10/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D2741 | 16/01/1959 | 12/10/1963 | 65F | Grangemouth | Not severe | Cinders from steam locomotives | Not known | Grangemouth | None | Radiator assembly set on fire by sparks from external source. |
D8208 | 07/07/1958 | 12/10/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8406 | 16/09/1958 | 14/10/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D1020 | 21/05/1963 | 17/10/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5122 | 18/06/1960 | 17/10/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Struan | Slight supericial | Oily deposits in vicinity of No. 2 bogie ignited by brake block sparks. |
D5132 | 23/09/1960 | 17/10/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Pitlochry | Slight | It is thought that sparks from a main generator flashover ignited oily deposit on top of fuel tank. |
D5336 | 14/08/1959 | 17/10/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Dunphail | All cables to Nos. 3 & 4 motors and cables in cubicle burnt | Handbrake had been left in the "ON" position in trailing cab. Subsequent sparking from the blocks ignited oily deposits on bogie. |
D5339 | 04/09/1959 | 17/10/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Killiecrankie | None | Oily deposit on No. 2 motor casing ignited by brake block spark. |
D6128 | 13/10/1959 | 17/10/1963 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D5121 | 11/06/1960 | 18/10/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Dalwhinnie | Slight | Sparks from turbocharger drain ignited oily deposits in main generator fan duct. |
D5624 | 16/06/1960 | 18/10/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5620 | 02/06/1960 | 19/10/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1504 | 03/01/1963 | 20/10/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D104 | 01/06/1961 | 21/10/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5319 | 13/03/1959 | 21/10/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Kildonan | Not known. | Under investigation. |
D95 | 15/04/1961 | 22/10/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5072 | 17/02/1960 | 22/10/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8206 | 19/05/1958 | 23/10/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5340 | 11/09/1959 | 25/10/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D45 | 08/09/1961 | 26/10/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5023 | 25/09/1959 | 01/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5593 | 25/02/1960 | 03/11/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D19 | 31/12/1960 | 04/11/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D95 | 15/04/1961 | 04/11/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1002 | 19/03/1962 | 05/11/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5059 | 29/12/1959 | 07/11/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5573 | 17/12/1959 | 07/11/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5653 | 22/09/1960 | 07/11/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D820 | 04/05/1960 | 09/11/1963 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5573 | 17/12/1959 | 09/11/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D17 | 23/12/1960 | 10/11/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5061 | 15/01/1960 | 11/11/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5331 | 26/06/1959 | 12/11/1963 | 64A | St Margarets | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8212 | 27/11/1959 | 15/11/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D814 | 01/01/1960 | 16/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1513 | 15/03/1963 | 16/11/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5845 | 14/06/1962 | 16/11/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D53 | 25/06/1962 | 18/11/1963 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5561 | 29/10/1959 | 19/11/1963 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5061 | 15/01/1960 | 21/11/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5333 | 10/07/1959 | 22/11/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5556 | 08/10/1959 | 22/11/1963 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5596 | 10/03/1960 | 25/11/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D81 | 21/12/1960 | 26/11/1963 | 17A | Derby | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5531 | 21/05/1959 | 29/11/1963 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D40 | 26/07/1961 | 05/12/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D191 | 26/01/1963 | 05/12/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5095 | 23/03/1960 | 09/12/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Electrical insulation | |||
D5656 | 06/10/1960 | 09/12/1963 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5326 | 22/05/1959 | 12/12/1963 | 60A | Inverness | Works attention required | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5639 | 11/08/1960 | 13/12/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D146 | 15/12/1961 | 14/12/1963 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8400 | 30/05/1958 | 14/12/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5026 | 22/10/1959 | 16/12/1963 | 1B | Camden | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5102 | 16/07/1960 | 18/12/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8206 | 19/05/1958 | 18/12/1963 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5044 | 23/10/1959 | 24/12/1963 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5675 | 08/12/1960 | 25/12/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5607 | 14/04/1960 | 27/12/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5854 | 23/08/1962 | 28/12/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5607 | 14/04/1960 | 30/12/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D5849 | 12/07/1962 | 31/12/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D8401 | 11/06/1958 | 01/01/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5672 | 24/11/1960 | 02/01/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Electrical insulation | |||
D9008 | 07/07/1961 | 02/01/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D47 | 30/09/1961 | 05/01/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Electrical insulation | |||
D5671 | 13/10/1960 | 05/01/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D124 | 21/10/1961 | 06/01/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5122 | 18/06/1960 | 06/01/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5128 | 13/08/1960 | 06/01/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D859 | 09/01/1962 | 09/01/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D91 | 17/03/1961 | 10/01/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1532 | 26/07/1963 | 11/01/1964 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8242 | 10/02/1961 | 13/01/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6154 | 14/07/1960 | 14/01/1964 | 61A | Kittybrewster | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D602 | 03/11/1958 | 16/01/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D56 | 23/11/1962 | 19/01/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5710 | 14/02/1959 | 21/01/1964 | 12E | Tebay | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6304 | 23/06/1959 | 21/01/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Cinders from steam locomotives | Not known | |||
D5701 | 01/09/1958 | 23/01/1964 | 12E | Tebay | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D137 | 30/12/1961 | 24/01/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Electrical insulation | |||
D5037 | 07/09/1959 | 25/01/1964 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Electrical insulation | |||
D4 | 26/09/1959 | 26/01/1964 | 18A | Toton | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5061 | 15/01/1960 | 28/01/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D55 | 10/09/1962 | 31/01/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D9003 | 27/03/1961 | 31/01/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D204 | 30/05/1958 | 06/02/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Electrical insulation | |||
D98 | 26/04/1961 | 07/02/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5026 | 22/10/1959 | 11/02/1964 | 1B | Camden | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5613 | 05/05/1960 | 11/02/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5652 | 22/09/1960 | 11/02/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5144 | 03/12/1960 | 12/02/1964 | 1A | Willesden | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D5588 | 11/02/1960 | 12/02/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Not known | Electrical insulation | |||
D6113 | 27/05/1959 | 12/02/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D83 | 31/12/1960 | 15/02/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D144 | 09/12/1961 | 15/02/1964 | 16C | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5605 | 07/04/1960 | 15/02/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D67 | 03/05/1962 | 18/02/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D5078 | 18/02/1960 | 18/02/1964 | 1A | Willesden | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6706 | 20/01/1961 | 18/02/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D9008 | 07/07/1961 | 18/02/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D5070 | 23/01/1960 | 19/02/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D328 | 11/01/1961 | 20/02/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D61 | 08/03/1962 | 21/02/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D79 | 15/12/1960 | 22/02/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6582 | 23/12/1961 | 23/02/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D13 | 05/11/1960 | 24/02/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Electrical insulation | |||
D270 | 11/04/1960 | 24/02/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5701 | 01/09/1958 | 26/02/1964 | 12E | Tebay | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6560 | 15/07/1961 | 28/02/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D62 | 15/03/1962 | 29/02/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D116 | 01/09/1961 | 02/03/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5047 | 21/11/1959 | 02/03/1964 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D5613 | 05/05/1960 | 03/03/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D227 | 24/08/1959 | 04/03/1964 | 9A | Longsight | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D802 | 16/12/1958 | 05/03/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5055 | 18/12/1959 | 06/03/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D59 | 06/02/1962 | 08/03/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Not known | Electrical insulation | |||
D69 | 18/10/1960 | 08/03/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5615 | 12/05/1960 | 09/03/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5672 | 24/11/1960 | 09/03/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D390 | 09/05/1962 | 10/03/1964 | 50A | York (North) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5341 | 18/09/1959 | 10/03/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5603 | 31/03/1960 | 11/03/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D89 | 22/03/1961 | 12/03/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D93 | 28/03/1961 | 12/03/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D78 | 12/12/1960 | 14/03/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1508 | 23/01/1963 | 14/03/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5072 | 17/02/1960 | 18/03/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Electrical insulation | |||
D6503 | 19/03/1960 | 19/03/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D1528 | 05/07/1963 | 20/03/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6558 | 10/06/1961 | 21/03/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D74 | 05/12/1960 | 22/03/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5595 | 03/03/1960 | 23/03/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D220 | 13/07/1959 | 26/03/1964 | 9A | Longsight | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5534 | 11/06/1959 | 26/03/1964 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Electrical insulation | |||
D123 | 28/10/1961 | 31/03/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Not known | Not known | |||
D77 | 10/12/1960 | 01/04/1964 | 18A | Toton | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D831 | 11/01/1961 | 01/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Unknown | Cinders from steam locomotives | Not known | |||
D126 | 09/11/1961 | 03/04/1964 | 16A | Toton | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6573 | 04/11/1961 | 03/04/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D852 | 24/07/1961 | 05/04/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D12 | 15/10/1960 | 06/04/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D88 | 02/03/1961 | 06/04/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5059 | 29/12/1959 | 06/04/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Electrical insulation | |||
D5010 | 21/03/1959 | 07/04/1964 | 2A | Tyseley | Works attention required | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D43 | 28/08/1961 | 08/04/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D158 | 15/03/1962 | 08/04/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D846 | 12/04/1961 | 09/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Works attention required | Train heating boiler burners | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5679 | 22/12/1960 | 09/04/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D100 | 08/05/1961 | 10/04/1964 | 16A | Toton | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D60 | 15/02/1962 | 11/04/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5052 | 04/12/1959 | 11/04/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Not known | Electrical insulation | |||
D6510 | 04/06/1960 | 11/04/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5652 | 22/09/1960 | 13/04/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D6516 | 15/07/1960 | 14/04/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D144 | 09/12/1961 | 18/04/1964 | 16C | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D241 | 26/10/1959 | 18/04/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5573 | 17/12/1959 | 19/04/1964 | 31B | March | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D1007 | 01/08/1962 | 20/04/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5132 | 23/09/1960 | 20/04/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D3 | 18/09/1959 | 21/04/1964 | 18A | Toton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D87 | 24/02/1961 | 22/04/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Not known | Not known | |||
D14 | 24/11/1960 | 24/04/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D79 | 15/12/1960 | 25/04/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D245 | 16/11/1959 | 25/04/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6324 | 01/06/1960 | 25/04/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5570 | 10/12/1959 | 27/04/1964 | 31B | March | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6550 | 13/04/1961 | 27/04/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D43 | 28/08/1961 | 28/04/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D189 | 26/01/1963 | 29/04/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5054 | 18/12/1959 | 30/04/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D164 | 19/04/1962 | 02/05/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D288 | 08/08/1960 | 02/05/1964 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6547 | 25/03/1961 | 04/05/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D125 | 31/10/1961 | 05/05/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D82 | 31/12/1960 | 06/05/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D113 | 14/09/1961 | 06/05/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5008 | 28/02/1959 | 07/05/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D4 | 26/09/1959 | 11/05/1964 | 18A | Toton | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D71 | 25/11/1960 | 11/05/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D84 | 31/12/1960 | 11/05/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5063 | 26/01/1960 | 11/05/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Electrical insulation | |||
D5704 | 05/11/1958 | 19/05/1964 | 12E | Tebay | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6 | 12/11/1959 | 20/05/1964 | 18A | Toton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5 | 14/10/1959 | 21/05/1964 | 18A | Toton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D11 | 01/10/1960 | 21/05/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5071 | 06/02/1960 | 22/05/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D200 | 14/03/1958 | 24/05/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D6595 | 13/04/1962 | 26/05/1964 | 73D | St Leonards | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5178 | 08/02/1963 | 27/05/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5686 | 09/02/1961 | 27/05/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5314 | 30/01/1959 | 28/05/1964 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6316 | 01/03/1960 | 28/05/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6541 | 28/01/1961 | 28/05/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5062 | 18/01/1960 | 30/05/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D32 | 12/06/1961 | 03/06/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D106 | 15/06/1961 | 03/06/1964 | 15B | Wellingborough | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5301 | 12/09/1958 | 03/06/1964 | 64B | Haymarket | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5356 | 11/10/1961 | 03/06/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5672 | 24/11/1960 | 03/06/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D83 | 31/12/1960 | 04/06/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D306 | 13/10/1960 | 04/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D850 | 08/06/1961 | 04/06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D252 | 21/12/1959 | 05/06/1964 | 50A | York (North) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D106 | 15/06/1961 | 06/06/1964 | 15B | Wellingborough | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1504 | 03/01/1963 | 08/06/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Unknown | Not known | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D219 | 10/07/1959 | 09/06/1964 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D816 | 17/02/1960 | 09/06/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Unknown | Not known | Not known | |||
D1510 | 26/02/1963 | 09/06/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5077 | 17/02/1960 | 09/06/1964 | 1A | Willesden | Works attention required | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5092 | 15/07/1960 | 09/06/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6348 | 14/06/1962 | 09/06/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D44 | 02/09/1961 | 10/06/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5035 | 31/08/1959 | 10/06/1964 | 1C | Watford | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D180 | 14/09/1962 | 11/06/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D61 | 08/03/1962 | 12/06/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D133 | 21/12/1961 | 12/06/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D27 | 29/04/1961 | 13/06/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D79 | 15/12/1960 | 13/06/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D213 | 01/06/1959 | 13/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D6566 | 26/08/1961 | 13/06/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D230 | 07/09/1959 | 14/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Works attention required | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D60 | 15/02/1962 | 16/06/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5641 | 18/08/1960 | 16/06/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Not known | |||
D6706 | 20/01/1961 | 16/06/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D140 | 25/11/1961 | 17/06/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8409 | 26/09/1958 | 19/06/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5580 | 14/01/1960 | 20/06/1964 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Electrical insulation | |||
D17 | 23/12/1960 | 24/06/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5 | 14/10/1959 | 25/06/1964 | 18A | Toton | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D825 | 24/08/1960 | 25/06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5042 | 12/10/1959 | 25/06/1964 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D311 | 06/12/1960 | 26/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D220 | 13/07/1959 | 29/06/1964 | 9A | Longsight | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5056 | 11/12/1959 | 29/06/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D228 | 28/08/1959 | 01/07/1964 | 9A | Longsight | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5019 | 11/07/1959 | 03/07/1964 | 1B | Camden | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5675 | 08/12/1960 | 04/07/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D200 | 14/03/1958 | 07/07/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Electrical insulation | |||
D5676 | 08/12/1960 | 08/07/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5057 | 22/12/1959 | 10/07/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D869 | 12/07/1961 | 11/07/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5066 | 19/12/1959 | 13/07/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5065 | 02/02/1960 | 15/07/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5121 | 11/06/1960 | 15/07/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5133 | 24/09/1960 | 15/07/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5617 | 19/05/1960 | 15/07/1964 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6117 | 16/06/1959 | 16/07/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6119 | 30/06/1959 | 17/07/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D88 | 02/03/1961 | 18/07/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5605 | 07/04/1960 | 18/07/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Electrical insulation | |||
D8105 | 08/12/1961 | 18/07/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D165 | 04/05/1962 | 19/07/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D38 | 13/07/1961 | 20/07/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D156 | 23/02/1962 | 22/07/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D78 | 12/12/1960 | 23/07/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5066 | 19/12/1959 | 24/07/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5044 | 23/10/1959 | 25/07/1964 | 32B | Ipswich | Unknown | Not known | Electrical insulation | |||
D5094 | 18/02/1960 | 26/07/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5714 | 14/03/1959 | 26/07/1964 | 12E | Tebay | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D262 | 04/03/1960 | 28/07/1964 | 64B | Haymarket | Unknown | Electrical overloads or arcs | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5514 | 24/07/1958 | 28/07/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D72 | 19/11/1960 | 30/07/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D80 | 17/12/1960 | 30/07/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D90 | 11/03/1961 | 30/07/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5563 | 12/11/1959 | 30/07/1964 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6504 | 26/03/1960 | 30/07/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D47 | 30/09/1961 | 02/08/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D42 | 19/08/1961 | 04/08/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D103 | 30/05/1961 | 04/08/1964 | 18A | Toton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5000 | 05/09/1958 | 07/08/1964 | 1A | Willesden | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5649 | 08/09/1960 | 07/08/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5053 | 03/12/1959 | 08/08/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D316 | 20/01/1961 | 09/08/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D135 | 30/12/1961 | 10/08/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D173 | 13/07/1962 | 10/08/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Unknown | Mechanical seizures or failures | Not known | |||
D5054 | 18/12/1959 | 10/08/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D84 | 31/12/1960 | 11/08/1964 | 16A | Toton | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D801 | 07/11/1958 | 11/08/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D6131 | 03/11/1959 | 12/08/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5063 | 26/01/1960 | 13/08/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5127 | 30/07/1960 | 13/08/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1507 | 18/01/1963 | 14/08/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Not known | Electrical insulation | |||
D134 | 30/12/1961 | 15/08/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5230 | 19/10/1963 | 16/08/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D22 | 30/03/1961 | 17/08/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Unknown | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1503 | 31/12/1962 | 17/08/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Not known | Electrical insulation | |||
D78 | 12/12/1960 | 18/08/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D294 | 23/09/1960 | 18/08/1964 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5670 | 05/01/1961 | 20/08/1964 | 31B | March | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D380 | 05/03/1962 | 21/08/1964 | 1B | Camden | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D80 | 17/12/1960 | 22/08/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D92 | 25/03/1961 | 22/08/1964 | 16A | Toton | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5131 | 17/09/1960 | 24/08/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Works attention required | Not known | Not known | |||
D5608 | 21/04/1960 | 24/08/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D338 | 29/03/1961 | 25/08/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D118 | 16/09/1961 | 26/08/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D18 | 31/12/1960 | 28/08/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Unknown | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D225 | 17/08/1959 | 28/08/1964 | 9A | Longsight | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1535 | 22/08/1963 | 28/08/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5014 | 09/05/1959 | 28/08/1964 | 2A | Tyseley | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6109 | 07/04/1959 | 28/08/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D86 | 09/03/1961 | 31/08/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D107 | 20/07/1961 | 01/09/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5124 | 02/07/1960 | 02/09/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5222 | 17/09/1963 | 02/09/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D68 | 05/10/1960 | 03/09/1964 | 16A | Toton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D338 | 29/03/1961 | 03/09/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5047 | 21/11/1959 | 03/09/1964 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D72 | 19/11/1960 | 06/09/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D98 | 26/04/1961 | 06/09/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D324 | 23/06/1961 | 07/09/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D391 | 16/05/1962 | 07/09/1964 | 50A | York (North) | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5338 | 28/08/1959 | 07/09/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D68 | 05/10/1960 | 08/09/1964 | 16A | Toton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D349 | 14/06/1961 | 08/09/1964 | 50A | York (North) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5030 | 06/06/1959 | 09/09/1964 | 1A | Willesden | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D85 | 06/02/1961 | 10/09/1964 | 16C | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6793 | 20/02/1963 | 10/09/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D109 | 30/06/1961 | 12/09/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D8 | 18/12/1959 | 14/09/1964 | 18A | Toton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D53 | 25/06/1962 | 16/09/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1 | 14/08/1959 | 19/09/1964 | 18A | Toton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5125 | 14/07/1960 | 19/09/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5555 | 01/10/1959 | 20/09/1964 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5007 | 07/02/1959 | 21/09/1964 | 1A | Willesden | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6509 | 21/05/1960 | 21/09/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D836 | 13/09/1960 | 22/09/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D6129 | 27/10/1959 | 22/09/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6572 | 14/10/1961 | 22/09/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D46 | 02/10/1961 | 23/09/1964 | 16A | Toton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5655 | 29/09/1960 | 23/09/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5673 | 01/12/1960 | 23/09/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5053 | 03/12/1959 | 24/09/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6320 | 23/03/1960 | 24/09/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Unknown | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D248 | 27/11/1959 | 25/09/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5189 | 27/03/1963 | 25/09/1964 | 16C | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D127 | 15/11/1961 | 26/09/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D287 | 03/08/1960 | 26/09/1964 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5537 | 25/06/1959 | 26/09/1964 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D399 | 05/09/1962 | 28/09/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5615 | 12/05/1960 | 28/09/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D109 | 30/06/1961 | 29/09/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D132 | 16/12/1961 | 29/09/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D52 | 07/06/1962 | 01/10/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5673 | 01/12/1960 | 01/10/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6518 | 19/08/1960 | 03/10/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D167 | 31/05/1962 | 06/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D824 | 27/07/1960 | 07/10/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5077 | 17/02/1960 | 08/10/1964 | 1A | Willesden | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6912 | 06/01/1964 | 08/10/1964 | 87E | Landore | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D74 | 05/12/1960 | 12/10/1964 | 14A | Cricklewood East | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D87 | 24/02/1961 | 12/10/1964 | 17A | Derby | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D35 | 30/06/1961 | 13/10/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Unknown | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D54 | 08/08/1962 | 13/10/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1027 | 28/01/1964 | 13/10/1964 | 84A | Laira | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D89 | 22/03/1961 | 16/10/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D71 | 25/11/1960 | 20/10/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6540 | 21/01/1961 | 20/10/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D7078 | 03/05/1963 | 20/10/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D171 | 06/07/1962 | 21/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | |||
D5506 | 13/03/1958 | 24/10/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5077 | 17/02/1960 | 26/10/1964 | 1A | Willesden | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5355 | 28/09/1961 | 26/10/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Not known | |||
D80 | 17/12/1960 | 29/10/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1528 | 05/07/1963 | 29/10/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5515 | 31/07/1958 | 30/10/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D15 | 09/12/1960 | 02/11/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D25 | 15/04/1961 | 03/11/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D60 | 15/02/1962 | 03/11/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D129 | 25/11/1961 | 04/11/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5039 | 24/10/1959 | 04/11/1964 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6329 | 18/06/1960 | 04/11/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5107 | 08/10/1960 | 07/11/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D141 | 17/11/1961 | 10/11/1964 | 16D | Nottingham | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5072 | 17/02/1960 | 11/11/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D6582 | 23/12/1961 | 12/11/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5565 | 19/11/1959 | 13/11/1964 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5704 | 05/11/1958 | 13/11/1964 | 12E | Tebay | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Electrical insulation | |||
D1730 | 28/04/1964 | 19/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5541 | 23/07/1959 | 19/11/1964 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D312 | 13/12/1960 | 20/11/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5574 | 23/12/1959 | 20/11/1964 | 31B | March | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6527 | 22/10/1960 | 20/11/1964 | 71A | Eastleigh | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5124 | 02/07/1960 | 21/11/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Not known | Not known | |||
D5320 | 10/04/1959 | 21/11/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D298 | 17/10/1960 | 22/11/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5606 | 14/04/1960 | 23/11/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D96 | 18/04/1961 | 25/11/1964 | 17A | Derby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5077 | 17/02/1960 | 25/11/1964 | 1A | Willesden | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5037 | 07/09/1959 | 26/11/1964 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5614 | 12/05/1960 | 27/11/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D6539 | 14/01/1961 | 27/11/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D9009 | 21/07/1961 | 27/11/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D9012 | 04/09/1961 | 27/11/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5846 | 21/06/1962 | 01/12/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D5146 | 10/12/1960 | 04/12/1964 | 9A | Longsight | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5011 | 28/03/1959 | 05/12/1964 | 2A | Tyseley | Works attention required | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D5114 | 23/04/1960 | 08/12/1964 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D9011 | 24/08/1961 | 08/12/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D866 | 24/03/1961 | 09/12/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | Unknown | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D316 | 20/01/1961 | 14/12/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | Not severe | Not known | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D6716 | 16/06/1961 | 14/12/1964 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D72 | 19/11/1960 | 19/12/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D351 | 28/06/1961 | 22/12/1964 | 50A | York (North) | Works attention required | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D1528 | 05/07/1963 | 22/12/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | |||
D1530 | 15/07/1963 | 23/12/1964 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | |||
D5667 | 17/11/1960 | 29/12/1964 | 32B | Ipswich | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Not known | |||
D5859 | 04/10/1962 | 31/12/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | |||
D1721 | 06/03/1964 | 06/01/1970 | D02 | Birmingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D812 | 12/11/1959 | 08/01/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D6867 | 16/09/1963 | 10/01/1970 | 56B | Healey Mills | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Electrical insulation | Not Known | ||
D1932 | 24/02/1966 | 12/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D114 | 19/09/1961 | 21/01/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1635 | 21/11/1964 | 21/01/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D6894 | 16/03/1964 | 21/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1023 | 23/09/1963 | 24/01/1970 | 84A | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1754 | 19/08/1964 | 25/01/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1834 | 31/03/1965 | 26/01/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1759 | 25/08/1964 | 28/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D149 | 30/12/1961 | 31/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5040 | 12/10/1959 | 31/01/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1842 | 14/05/1965 | 06/02/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Light engine | ||
D1845 | 26/05/1965 | 07/02/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5382 | 18/04/1962 | 11/02/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1774 | 19/10/1964 | 12/02/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | Passenger working | ||
D7652 | 21/05/1966 | 18/02/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Not Known | ||
D286 | 25/07/1960 | 19/02/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D374 | 17/01/1962 | 19/02/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D5146 | 10/12/1960 | 19/02/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D7052 | 24/10/1962 | 19/02/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D7610 | 07/04/1966 | 19/02/1970 | D02 | Birmingham Division | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D5367 | 04/01/1962 | 20/02/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1006 | 06/07/1962 | 24/02/1970 | 84A | Laira | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1548 | 17/10/1963 | 25/02/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D7588 | 10/03/1964 | 25/02/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1618 | 05/09/1964 | 26/02/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Light engine | ||
D5402 | 12/07/1962 | 02/03/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D5080 | 01/03/1960 | 06/03/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D193 | 26/01/1963 | 08/03/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D821 | 25/05/1960 | 13/03/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1071 | 07/11/1963 | 13/03/1970 | 87E | Landore | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D1920 | 30/11/1965 | 16/03/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1050 | 01/01/1963 | 18/03/1970 | 84A | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D372 | 03/01/1962 | 20/03/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1868 | 28/05/1965 | 20/03/1970 | 40B | Immingham | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D5060 | 02/01/1960 | 20/03/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D42 | 19/08/1961 | 23/03/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Cinders from steam locomotives | Not known | Passenger working | ||
D264 | 11/03/1960 | 24/03/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1780 | 30/10/1964 | 24/03/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D856 | 16/11/1961 | 25/03/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D221 | 20/07/1959 | 27/03/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D5345 | 23/10/1959 | 30/03/1970 | 60A | Inverness | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D1778 | 23/10/1964 | 03/04/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Light engine | ||
D9007 | 22/06/1961 | 04/04/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D1015 | 21/01/1963 | 06/04/1970 | 87E | Landore | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D6332 | 28/07/1960 | 07/04/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D278 | 08/06/1960 | 09/04/1970 | 55B | York (North) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D5309 | 19/12/1958 | 09/04/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | Passenger working | ||
D6102 | 23/12/1958 | 09/04/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D6332 | 28/07/1960 | 10/04/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D341 | 26/04/1961 | 13/04/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D203 | 16/05/1958 | 15/04/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D192 | 26/01/1963 | 19/04/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D1772 | 05/10/1964 | 21/04/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D5098 | 26/05/1960 | 21/04/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1601 | 06/07/1964 | 23/04/1970 | 87E | Landore | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D5386 | 18/05/1962 | 23/04/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D25 | 15/04/1961 | 24/04/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D53 | 25/06/1962 | 26/04/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D316 | 20/01/1961 | 28/04/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1699 | 28/12/1963 | 28/04/1970 | D02 | Birmingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D1957 | 28/01/1967 | 28/04/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D6124 | 29/09/1959 | 28/04/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D152 | 01/02/1962 | 30/04/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D5088 | 13/06/1960 | 30/04/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1510 | 26/02/1963 | 02/05/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D47 | 30/09/1961 | 04/05/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D8600 | 06/08/1964 | 04/05/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D203 | 16/05/1958 | 06/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1715 | 08/02/1964 | 07/05/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D277 | 30/05/1960 | 08/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1105 | 09/11/1966 | 08/05/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D7021 | 14/02/1962 | 09/05/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D7025 | 15/03/1962 | 09/05/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D146 | 15/12/1961 | 10/05/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1010 | 15/10/1962 | 10/05/1970 | 84A | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Light engine | ||
D1864 | 11/05/1965 | 12/05/1970 | 40B | Immingham | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D5127 | 30/07/1960 | 12/05/1970 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Not known | Freight working | ||
D1605 | 29/07/1964 | 14/05/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1637 | 07/12/1964 | 15/05/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D107 | 20/07/1961 | 20/05/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D846 | 12/04/1961 | 23/05/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D5412 | 03/09/1962 | 24/05/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Light engine | ||
D5113 | 28/01/1961 | 25/05/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D107 | 20/07/1961 | 28/05/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1540 | 14/09/1963 | 01/06/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D843 | 02/01/1961 | 02/06/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1528 | 05/07/1963 | 02/06/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D859 | 09/01/1962 | 04/06/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1586 | 25/05/1964 | 06/06/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1902 | 06/10/1965 | 06/06/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D37 | 10/07/1961 | 09/06/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D849 | 29/05/1961 | 09/06/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D6334 | 01/12/1960 | 09/06/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Light engine | ||
D152 | 01/02/1962 | 11/06/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5369 | 17/01/1962 | 11/06/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D845 | 07/04/1961 | 12/06/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D31 | 03/06/1961 | 13/06/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5344 | 09/10/1959 | 13/06/1970 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D143 | 01/12/1961 | 14/06/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D222 | 27/07/1959 | 15/06/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D861 | 14/02/1962 | 15/06/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D1580 | 08/05/1964 | 16/06/1970 | 40B | Immingham | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D865 | 28/06/1962 | 17/06/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1833 | 27/04/1965 | 18/06/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1101 | 12/08/1966 | 21/06/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D1615 | 29/08/1964 | 22/06/1970 | 87E | Landore | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D5324 | 08/05/1959 | 23/06/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D179 | 21/09/1962 | 25/06/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5053 | 03/12/1959 | 25/06/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1579 | 01/05/1964 | 28/06/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D6343 | 10/05/1962 | 30/06/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D1527 | 03/07/1963 | 01/07/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1922 | 09/12/1965 | 02/07/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1596 | 22/06/1964 | 06/07/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D9005 | 25/05/1961 | 08/07/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D433 | 19/07/1968 | 09/07/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1998 | 14/06/1966 | 09/07/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D41 | 29/07/1961 | 10/07/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D306 | 13/10/1960 | 10/07/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1856 | 06/08/1965 | 13/07/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D1956 | 22/12/1966 | 13/07/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D5058 | 01/01/1960 | 13/07/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D236 | 05/10/1959 | 16/07/1970 | D10 | Preston Division | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Not Known | ||
D1833 | 27/04/1965 | 16/07/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Not Known | ||
D258 | 03/02/1960 | 17/07/1970 | 50A | York (North) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1569 | 31/03/1964 | 18/07/1970 | 40B | Immingham | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D191 | 26/01/1963 | 23/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D282 | 27/06/1960 | 28/07/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D154 | 16/02/1962 | 30/07/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D9003 | 27/03/1961 | 30/07/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D41 | 29/07/1961 | 01/08/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1848 | 05/06/1965 | 02/08/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D9002 | 19/03/1961 | 03/08/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D56 | 23/11/1962 | 04/08/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D75 | 02/12/1960 | 05/08/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D230 | 07/09/1959 | 06/08/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1513 | 15/03/1963 | 06/08/1970 | 55B | York (North) | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D43 | 28/08/1961 | 12/08/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5410 | 30/08/1962 | 12/08/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D1534 | 16/08/1963 | 14/08/1970 | 40B | Immingham | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D851 | 10/07/1961 | 17/08/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Light engine | ||
D6778 | 29/10/1962 | 18/08/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D9015 | 13/10/1961 | 18/08/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5037 | 07/09/1959 | 20/08/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D855 | 25/10/1961 | 21/08/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5007 | 07/02/1959 | 24/08/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1851 | 12/06/1965 | 25/08/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D5339 | 04/09/1959 | 26/08/1970 | 60A | Inverness | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | ECS | ||
D143 | 01/12/1961 | 27/08/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D164 | 19/04/1962 | 27/08/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D7004 | 15/08/1961 | 28/08/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D9012 | 04/09/1961 | 28/08/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D5404 | 19/07/1962 | 01/09/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Not Known | ||
D1519 | 26/04/1963 | 02/09/1970 | 55B | York (North) | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D6957 | 12/01/1965 | 02/09/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Light engine | ||
D5080 | 01/03/1960 | 06/09/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D845 | 07/04/1961 | 08/09/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D202 | 30/04/1958 | 09/09/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D5325 | 14/05/1959 | 10/09/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D5070 | 23/01/1960 | 11/09/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1635 | 21/11/1964 | 12/09/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Not Known | ||
D1847 | 05/06/1965 | 12/09/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5353 | 13/09/1961 | 14/09/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5076 | 10/02/1960 | 17/09/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D5176 | 08/01/1963 | 18/09/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D5148 | 23/12/1960 | 19/09/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D146 | 15/12/1961 | 23/09/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D5390 | 04/06/1962 | 27/09/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Light engine | ||
D98 | 26/04/1961 | 28/09/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D91 | 17/03/1961 | 29/09/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D153 | 25/01/1962 | 04/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D1760 | 08/09/1964 | 08/10/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D823 | 06/07/1960 | 09/10/1970 | 84A | Laira | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D1015 | 21/01/1963 | 09/10/1970 | 87E | Landore | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1833 | 27/04/1965 | 10/10/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D854 | 26/09/1961 | 11/10/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D286 | 25/07/1960 | 13/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D346 | 24/05/1961 | 13/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1558 | 26/02/1964 | 15/10/1970 | 40B | Immingham | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D364 | 25/10/1961 | 17/10/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Light engine | ||
D1025 | 01/11/1963 | 18/10/1970 | 87E | Landore | Not severe | Train heating boiler burners | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1529 | 05/07/1963 | 21/10/1970 | 40B | Immingham | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D70 | 12/11/1960 | 23/10/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1631 | 31/10/1964 | 25/10/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D6318 | 14/03/1960 | 28/10/1970 | 84A | Laira | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D6323 | 25/04/1960 | 28/10/1970 | 84A | Laira | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D146 | 15/12/1961 | 29/10/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Unknown | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Light engine | ||
D836 | 13/09/1960 | 30/10/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D1842 | 14/05/1965 | 30/10/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D21 | 03/03/1961 | 31/10/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D8594 | 03/07/1964 | 02/11/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D430 | 25/06/1968 | 03/11/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D6968 | 17/02/1965 | 05/11/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1637 | 07/12/1964 | 06/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D1797 | 06/01/1965 | 08/11/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D857 | 11/12/1961 | 10/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1071 | 07/11/1963 | 10/11/1970 | 84A | Laira | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D5909 | 19/06/1959 | 10/11/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D6975 | 09/04/1965 | 10/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D6333 | 03/08/1960 | 12/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D291 | 29/08/1960 | 13/11/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D1672 | 27/03/1965 | 14/11/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D27 | 29/04/1961 | 16/11/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D855 | 25/10/1961 | 16/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D1832 | 07/04/1965 | 16/11/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Not Known | ||
D1106 | 25/11/1966 | 18/11/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | ECS | ||
D9013 | 14/09/1961 | 18/11/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D168 | 31/05/1962 | 23/11/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D9016 | 27/10/1961 | 23/11/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D5328 | 12/06/1959 | 24/11/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D5314 | 30/01/1959 | 25/11/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D24 | 15/04/1961 | 29/11/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D1657 | 01/02/1965 | 02/12/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D6806 | 18/01/1963 | 02/12/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D44 | 02/09/1961 | 03/12/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D1003 | 14/04/1962 | 04/12/1970 | 87E | Landore | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D1997 | 03/06/1966 | 08/12/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D5095 | 23/03/1960 | 08/12/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D6963 | 27/01/1965 | 09/12/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D1684 | 11/11/1963 | 10/12/1970 | D02 | Birmingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D1850 | 19/06/1965 | 11/12/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D1837 | 04/05/1965 | 14/12/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D8222 | 30/03/1960 | 15/12/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D9020 | 12/02/1962 | 15/12/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | Works attention required | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D1949 | 25/08/1966 | 16/12/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Works attention required | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D311 | 06/12/1960 | 21/12/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | Works attention required | Electrical overloads or arcs | Electrical insulation | Freight working | ||
D862 | 13/03/1962 | 22/12/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D845 | 07/04/1961 | 27/12/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Passenger working | ||
D101 | 20/05/1961 | 28/12/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Passenger working | ||
D112 | 08/08/1961 | 28/12/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | Works attention required | Mechanical seizures or failures | Electrical insulation | Passenger working | ||
D6320 | 23/03/1960 | 29/12/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D6327 | 30/06/1960 | 29/12/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | Not severe | Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows | Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks | Freight working | ||
D6964 | 29/01/1965 | 31/12/1970 | 30A | Stratford | Not severe | Brake block sparks | Oil impregnated dirt or waste | Freight working | ||
D6107 | 24/03/1959 | 03/06/1971 | 65A | Eastfield | Not severe | Mechanical seizures or failures | Electrical insulation | Dullatur | Bogies | Air brake left partially on causing wheels to bind, overheat and spark, igniting oily deposits. |
D6523 | 24/09/1960 | 21/07/1989 | 71A | Eastleigh | Not known | Not known | Tiverton Junction | Underframe and fuel tank | Caught fire near Tiverton Jct while working the 11:20 Meldon Quarry - Tonbride, piloted by 33101. |
The following reports are available.
- Build dates and withdrawal dates of several classes combined
- Weight/Height/Length/Wheelbase/Wheel Diameter comparisons of locomotive classes
- Maximum speed of locomotive classes
- Diesel locomotive classes by Power Unit
- Western Region Diesel Hydraulics lifespan
- Class 52 'Western' Liveries
- Timelines graph of up to ten classes of locomotive
- Locomotive classes by longevity
- Individual locomotives by longevity
- LNWR 0-8-0/2-8-0 rebuilds
- Snapshot of All Locomotives by Class on a user defined date
- Great Western 4-6-0 identification
- Early Casualties - Diesel and Electric
- Robinson GCR Class 8K/8M 2-8-0 (LNER Class O4/O5/O1) and ROD derivatives
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) re-engine schedule: Mirrlees to English Electric
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) headcode style
- NBL Type 2 (Class 21/29) re-engine schedule: MAN to Paxman
- Incidents of fires on diesel locomotives, 1961-1964
If there are any reports you would like to see, please contact me - see the Contact tab above.