Manufacturer: Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GSWR | 291 | 0-4-0T | 291 | 258 | 1883 | 07/1925 | |
CR | 781 | 0-4-0ST | 781 | 772 | 1897 | 1924 | |
GWR | 1308 | 2-4-0T | 1308 | 11/1902 | 17/05/1948 | ||
SHT | Unclassified | 0-4-0ST | 5 | 04/1905 | 26/05/1958 | ||
ANDR | Unclassified | 0-6-2ST | 190 | 09/1908 | 24/04/1948 | ||
PM | P&M ST | 0-4-0ST | 14 | 1273 | 03/1912 | 03/1927 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4357 | 01/1927 | 28/11/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4358 | 01/1927 | 30/01/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4359 | 01/1927 | 27/07/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4360 | 02/1927 | 12/03/1960 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4361 | 02/1927 | 28/11/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4362 | 04/1927 | 09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4363 | 04/1927 | 10/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4364 | 04/1927 | 04/01/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4365 | 05/1927 | 28/11/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4366 | 05/1927 | 12/03/1960 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4367 | 06/1927 | 12/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4368 | 07/1927 | 09/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4369 | 07/1927 | 12/12/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4370 | 07/1927 | 09/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4371 | 08/1927 | 06/1961 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4372 | 09/1927 | 28/11/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4373 | 10/1927 | 26/12/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4374 | 10/1927 | 02/03/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4375 | 11/1927 | 15/10/1960 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4376 | 11/1927 | 19/12/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4377 | 12/1927 | 08/10/1966 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4379 | 12/1927 | 26/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4378 | 12/1927 | 04/05/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4380 | 01/1928 | 01/08/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4381 | 01/1928 | 19/09/1964 | ||
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71532 | 2186 | 06/1945 | 07/08/1963 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71533 | 2187 | 07/1945 | 07/09/1960 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71534 | 2188 | 10/1945 | 28/08/1961 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71535 | 2189 | 12/1945 | 17/10/1962 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71536 | 2190 | 03/1946 | 29/12/1962 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71462 | 2211 | 04/1946 | 02/09/1960 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71463 | 2212 | 07/1946 | 10/03/1963 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8078 | 2212 | 07/1946 | 10/03/1963 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71464 | 2213 | 09/1946 | 29/10/1966 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8079 | 2213 | 09/1946 | 29/10/1966 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71465 | 2214 | 11/1946 | 14/04/1961 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8080 | 2214 | 11/1946 | 14/04/1961 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71466 | 2215 | 01/1947 | 29/12/1962 | |
01 | 0-4-0 | 11503 | 24/01/1956 | 19/06/1966 | |||
01 | 0-4-0 | 11504 | 19/02/1956 | 14/09/1979 | |||
01 | 0-4-0 | 11505 | 19/02/1956 | 15/03/1981 | |||
01 | 0-4-0 | 11506 | 30/03/1956 | 29/05/1966 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11177 | 23/07/1956 | 29/10/1967 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11178 | 25/07/1956 | 28/12/1968 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11179 | 29/09/1956 | 10/09/1967 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11180 | 12/10/1956 | 01/02/1969 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11181 | 06/11/1956 | 01/02/1969 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11182 | 06/12/1956 | 28/12/1968 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11183 | 24/12/1956 | 07/05/1967 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11184 | 14/01/1957 | 01/02/1969 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11185 | 11/02/1957 | 07/05/1967 | |||
D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11186 | 04/03/1957 | 28/12/1968 | |||
01 | 0-4-0 | 81 | 01/01/1958 | 01/11/1967 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2410 | 19/06/1958 | 02/1969 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2411 | 31/07/1958 | 15/06/1968 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2412 | 18/09/1958 | 15/06/1968 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2413 | 08/10/1958 | 06/09/1976 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2414 | 24/10/1958 | 11/09/1981 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2415 | 06/11/1958 | 15/06/1968 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2416 | 29/11/1958 | 19/11/1972 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2417 | 11/12/1958 | 15/06/1968 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2418 | 09/01/1959 | 15/12/1968 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2419 | 26/01/1959 | 25/01/1969 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2420 | 14/02/1959 | 01/02/1981 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2421 | 24/02/1959 | 19/03/1979 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2422 | 20/03/1959 | 06/10/1980 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2423 | 09/04/1959 | 09/06/1980 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2424 | 29/04/1959 | 19/11/1972 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2425 | 11/11/1959 | 08/06/1968 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2426 | 25/11/1959 | 26/09/1977 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2427 | 07/12/1959 | 30/09/1969 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2428 | 21/12/1959 | 15/06/1968 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2429 | 13/01/1960 | 26/04/1969 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2430 | 25/01/1960 | 15/06/1968 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2431 | 09/02/1960 | 26/11/1971 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2432 | 22/02/1960 | 15/12/1968 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2433 | 07/03/1960 | 18/06/1972 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2434 | 28/03/1960 | 07/1969 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2435 | 06/04/1960 | 26/11/1971 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2436 | 20/04/1960 | 26/11/1971 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2437 | 11/05/1960 | 06/10/1980 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2438 | 30/05/1960 | 19/11/1972 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2439 | 21/06/1960 | 26/11/1971 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2440 | 11/07/1960 | 30/08/1975 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2441 | 17/08/1960 | 01/03/1967 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2442 | 05/09/1960 | 01/11/1972 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2443 | 28/09/1960 | 18/06/1972 | |||
06 | 0-4-0 | D2444 | 31/10/1960 | 14/06/1975 |