Manufacturer: Clayton Equipment Co. Ltd., Hatton, Derby
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Bo-Bo | D8500 | 10/09/1962 | 27/03/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8502 | 06/10/1962 | 05/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8501 | 10/10/1962 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8503 | 10/10/1962 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8504 | 17/10/1962 | 07/11/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8505 | 17/10/1962 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8506 | 24/10/1962 | 21/09/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8507 | 30/10/1962 | 31/12/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8508 | 30/10/1962 | 31/12/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8509 | 13/11/1962 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8510 | 13/11/1962 | 27/03/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8511 | 22/11/1962 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8512 | 07/12/1962 | 28/12/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8513 | 07/12/1962 | 21/09/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8516 | 19/04/1963 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8518 | 19/04/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8530 | 26/04/1963 | 03/03/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8531 | 08/05/1963 | 21/09/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8520 | 17/05/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8529 | 17/05/1963 | 31/12/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8534 | 12/06/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8537 | 12/06/1963 | 21/07/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8539 | 12/06/1963 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8538 | 21/06/1963 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8517 | 29/06/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8541 | 29/06/1963 | 05/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8522 | 03/07/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8514 | 09/07/1963 | 02/11/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8523 | 09/07/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8524 | 16/07/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8519 | 18/07/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8535 | 18/07/1963 | 27/03/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8521 | 23/07/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8528 | 23/07/1963 | 05/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8532 | 29/07/1963 | 28/12/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8515 | 03/08/1963 | 05/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8533 | 03/08/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8525 | 14/08/1963 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8526 | 20/08/1963 | 12/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8540 | 4365U/39 | 20/08/1963 | 05/10/1971 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8527 | 29/08/1963 | 28/12/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8536 | 29/08/1963 | 31/12/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8542 | 06/09/1963 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8543 | 10/09/1963 | 21/09/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8544 | 10/09/1963 | 28/06/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8545 | 17/09/1963 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8546 | 17/09/1963 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8547 | 27/09/1963 | 02/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8548 | 4365U/49 | 27/09/1963 | 31/12/1971 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8549 | 08/10/1963 | 21/09/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8551 | 08/10/1963 | 05/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8552 | 17/10/1963 | 31/12/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8553 | 17/10/1963 | 27/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8554 | 24/10/1963 | 28/06/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8555 | 29/10/1963 | 21/09/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8556 | 29/10/1963 | 02/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8550 | 08/11/1963 | 05/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8557 | 08/11/1963 | 21/09/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8558 | 08/11/1963 | 31/12/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8559 | 12/11/1963 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8560 | 12/11/1963 | 02/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8561 | 22/11/1963 | 07/11/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8562 | 22/11/1963 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8563 | 20/12/1963 | 31/12/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8564 | 20/12/1963 | 16/02/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8565 | 21/12/1963 | 07/11/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8566 | 21/12/1963 | 04/12/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8567 | 06/01/1964 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8568 | 06/01/1964 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8569 | 10/01/1964 | 04/12/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8570 | 10/01/1964 | 24/11/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8571 | 20/01/1964 | 28/06/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8572 | 20/01/1964 | 28/06/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8573 | 30/01/1964 | 06/10/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8574 | 30/01/1964 | 31/12/1971 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8575 | 12/02/1964 | 27/10/1968 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8576 | 12/02/1964 | 28/02/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8577 | 18/02/1964 | 02/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8578 | 03/03/1964 | 28/06/1969 | |||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8579 | 4365U/80 | 03/03/1964 | 04/10/1971 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8580 | 4365U/81 | 11/03/1964 | 06/10/1971 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8581 | 4365U/82 | 24/03/1964 | 06/10/1971 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8582 | 4365U/83 | 31/03/1964 | 25/01/1969 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8583 | 4365U/84 | 17/04/1964 | 21/09/1971 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8585 | 4365U/86 | 14/05/1964 | 29/10/1968 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8584 | 4365U/85 | 28/05/1964 | 29/10/1968 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8586 | 4365U/87 | 11/12/1964 | 21/09/1971 | ||
17 | Bo-Bo | D8587 | 4365U/88 | 05/02/1965 | 06/10/1971 |