Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 307 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4944 Week
» 16237 Month
» 280870 Year
» 1502435 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
NBR J82 0-6-0T 284   11/1875 12/1924
NBR J82 0-6-0T 259   11/1875 01/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 165   11/1875 10/1923
NBR J82 0-6-0T 166   11/1875 11/1922
NBR J82 0-6-0T 297   01/1876 02/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 241   01/1876 01/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 161   04/1877 06/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 123   04/1877 11/1926
NBR J82 0-6-0T 295   05/1877 12/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 274   05/1877 06/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 162   05/1877 02/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 158   05/1877 07/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 151   05/1877 01/1926
NBR G8 0-4-4T 314   06/1877 05/1925
NBR G8 0-4-4T 167   06/1877 05/1925
NBR G8 0-4-4T 480   06/1877 10/1924
NBR G8 0-4-4T 157   06/1877 09/1925
NBR G8 0-4-4T 89   07/1877 05/1925
NBR G8 0-4-4T 88   07/1877 01/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 20   11/1877 01/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 485   01/1878 11/1924
NBR J82 0-6-0T 313   01/1878 08/1926
NBR J82 0-6-0T 240   01/1878 12/1924
NBR J82 0-6-0T 29   03/1878 02/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 22   03/1878 11/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 49   05/1878 08/1924
NBR J82 0-6-0T 108   06/1878 02/1925
NBR J82 0-6-0T 96   06/1878 09/1926
NBR J82 0-6-0T 107   07/1878 12/1924
NBR J82 0-6-0T 106   07/1878 10/1924
NBR J82 0-6-0T 97   07/1878 07/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 279   1879 03/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 277   1879 10/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 271   1879 06/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 87   1879 07/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 402   1879 06/1922
NBR J34 0-6-0 401   1879 02/1922
NBR J34 0-6-0 303   1879 09/1921
NBR J34 0-6-0 300   1879 04/1921
NBR J34 0-6-0 296   1879 07/1921
NBR J34 0-6-0 34   1879 11/1922
NBR J34 0-6-0 403   1879 08/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 306   1879 06/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 302   1879 05/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 301   1879 10/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 35   1879 10/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 289   1879 05/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 288   1879 01/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 290   05/1879 01/1926
NBR J34 0-6-0 517   1880 02/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 516   1880 11/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 515   1880 03/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 514   1880 06/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 513   1880 01/1926
NBR J34 0-6-0 512   1880 08/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 511   1880 02/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 510   1880 09/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 509   1880 03/1926
NBR J34 0-6-0 508   1880 06/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 507   1880 10/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 506   1880 06/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 273   1880 10/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 171   1880 07/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 46   1880 08/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 175   1880 02/1922
NBR J34 0-6-0 84   1880 08/1922
NBR J34 0-6-0 272   07/1880 03/1926
NBR D51 4-4-0T 299   08/1880 10/1930
NBR D51 4-4-0T 110   08/1880 12/1923
NBR D51 4-4-0T 73   08/1880 09/1925
NBR D51 4-4-0T 72   08/1880 10/1924
NBR D51 4-4-0T 111   09/1880 04/1933
NBR D51 4-4-0T 109   09/1880 10/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 529   1881 07/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 528   1881 07/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 527   1881 02/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 526   1881 03/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 525   1881 09/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 524   1881 12/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 523   1881 12/1926
NBR J34 0-6-0 522   1881 03/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 521   1881 08/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 519   1881 09/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 518   1881 01/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 128   1881 10/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 143   03/1881 09/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 520   04/1881 06/1923
NBR D51 4-4-0T 105   05/1881 08/1931
NBR D51 4-4-0T 104   05/1881 08/1931
NBR D51 4-4-0T 101   05/1881 10/1929
NBR D51 4-4-0T 98   05/1881 10/1931
NBR D51 4-4-0T 33   05/1881 10/1923
NBR D51 4-4-0T 103   06/1881 03/1928
NBR J34 0-6-0 532   11/1881 10/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 531   11/1881 01/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 530   11/1881 05/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 533   12/1881 10/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 543   1882 09/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 541   1882 02/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 551   1882 06/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 539   01/1882 10/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 538   01/1882 05/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 537   01/1882 11/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 536   01/1882 11/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 535   01/1882 07/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 534   01/1882 10/1927
NBR J34 0-6-0 540   03/1882 11/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 545   04/1882 08/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 544   04/1882 04/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 542   04/1882 04/1926
NBR D51 4-4-0T 74   05/1882 09/1931
NBR D51 4-4-0T 60   06/1882 10/1924
NBR D51 4-4-0T 19   06/1882 12/1923
NBR D51 4-4-0T 294   06/1882 10/1932
NBR D51 4-4-0T 225   06/1882 03/1926
NBR D51 4-4-0T 147   06/1882 04/1929
NBR D51 4-4-0T 99   06/1882 05/1933
NBR D51 4-4-0T 75   06/1882 09/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 28   07/1882 10/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 27   07/1882 01/1926
NBR J34 0-6-0 184   07/1882 09/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 163   07/1882 04/1926
NBR J34 0-6-0 125   07/1882 05/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 30   07/1882 03/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 550   10/1882 11/01/1928
NBR J34 0-6-0 549   10/1882 07/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 548   10/1882 04/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 553   11/1882 11/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 552   11/1882 11/1924
NBR D51 4-4-0T 67   01/1883 10/1923
NBR D51 4-4-0T 268   01/1883 07/1928
NBR D51 4-4-0T 52   01/1883 08/1933
NBR D51 4-4-0T 174   02/1883 05/1929
NBR J34 0-6-0 554   02/1883 07/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 556   03/1883 12/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 555   03/1883 10/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 558   04/1883 10/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 557   04/1883 10/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 560   05/1883 07/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 559   05/1883 08/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 565   06/1883 06/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 564   06/1883 01/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 563   06/1883 04/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 562   06/1883 04/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 561   06/1883 12/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 311   07/1883 11/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 286   07/1883 10/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 138   07/1883 11/01/1928
NBR J34 0-6-0 18   07/1883 12/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 482   07/1883 11/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 481   07/1883 09/1923
NBR 574 4-4-0 575   06/1884 02/1937
NBR 574 4-4-0 574   06/1884 06/1934
NBR 574 4-4-0 579   07/1884 08/1933
NBR 574 4-4-0 578   07/1884 07/1933
NBR 574 4-4-0 577   07/1884 05/1934
NBR 574 4-4-0 576   07/1884 06/1933
NBR D51 4-4-0T 78   09/1884 09/1924
NBR D51 4-4-0T 77   09/1884 08/1929
NBR D51 4-4-0T 76   09/1884 11/1924
NBR D51 4-4-0T 483   10/1884 08/1927
NBR D51 4-4-0T 316   10/1884 06/1925
NBR D51 4-4-0T 79   10/1884 01/1927
NBR D25 4-4-0 592   04/1886 09/1932
LNER G7 0-4-4T 586   04/1886 11/1926
LNER G7 0-4-4T 587   05/1886 08/1926
LNER G7 0-4-4T 588   07/1886 04/1931
LNER G7 0-4-4T 589   08/1886 07/1930
LNER G7 0-4-4T 590   08/1886 06/1930
NBR D25 4-4-0 593   09/1886 10/1926
LNER G7 0-4-4T 591   09/1886 02/1927
NBR D25 4-4-0 594   10/1886 11/1926
NBR D25 4-4-0 597   03/1887 10/1926
NBR D25 4-4-0 595   04/1887 03/1932
NBR D25 4-4-0 596   04/1887 07/1933
NBR D25 4-4-0 600   02/1888 09/1928
NBR D25 4-4-0 599   02/1888 02/1930
NBR D25 4-4-0 598   02/1888 10/1930
NBR D25 4-4-0 603   03/1888 03/1928
NBR D25 4-4-0 602   03/1888 04/1926
NBR D25 4-4-0 601   03/1888 04/1926
NBR J36 0-6-0 607   08/1888 08/1934
NBR J36 0-6-0 606   08/1888 06/1933
NBR J36 0-6-0 605   08/1888 06/1934
NBR J36 0-6-0 604   08/1888 08/10/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 609   08/1888 05/1934
NBR J36 0-6-0 608   08/1888 06/1937
LNER G7 0-4-4T 93   01/1889 01/1927
LNER G7 0-4-4T 92   01/1889 09/1930
LNER G7 0-4-4T 91   01/1889 05/1932
LNER G7 0-4-4T 90   01/1889 09/1926
LNER G7 0-4-4T 95   02/1889 04/1931
LNER G7 0-4-4T 94   02/1889 02/1927
NBR J36 0-6-0 615   07/1889 04/1935
NBR J36 0-6-0 614   07/1889 12/1937
NBR J36 0-6-0 613   07/1889 02/1936
NBR J36 0-6-0 618   09/1889 02/1936
NBR J36 0-6-0 617   09/1889 16/07/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 616   09/1889 09/1937
NBR J36 0-6-0 621   10/1889 04/1937
NBR J36 0-6-0 620   10/1889 06/1937
NBR J36 0-6-0 619   10/1889 10/1935
NBR J36 0-6-0 172   11/1889 07/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 145   11/1889 08/1935
NBR J36 0-6-0 622   11/1889 15/04/1957
NBR J36 0-6-0 628   01/1890 30/04/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 627   01/1890 04/1936
NBR J36 0-6-0 626   01/1890 12/1935
NBR J36 0-6-0 625   01/1890 13/04/1950
NBR J36 0-6-0 624   01/1890 08/1937
NBR J36 0-6-0 623   01/1890 14/11/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 631   03/1890 03/1939
NBR J36 0-6-0 630   03/1890 03/1936
NBR J36 0-6-0 629   03/1890 08/1937
NBR J36 0-6-0 176   04/1890 08/10/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 173   04/1890 04/1936
NBR J36 0-6-0 632   04/1890 08/10/1962
NBR 633 4-4-0 635   05/1890 11/12/1952
NBR 633 4-4-0 634   05/1890 11/1935
NBR 633 4-4-0 633   05/1890 01/1939
NBR 633 4-4-0 638   06/1890 05/1937
NBR 633 4-4-0 637   06/1890 04/1936
NBR 633 4-4-0 636   06/1890 11/1937
NBR 633 4-4-0 641   08/1890 05/1937
NBR 633 4-4-0 640   08/1890 10/1936
NBR 633 4-4-0 639   08/1890 10/1935
NBR 633 4-4-0 37   09/1890 05/1935
NBR 633 4-4-0 36   09/1890 06/1935
NBR 633 4-4-0 642   09/1890 28/02/1950
NBR J36 0-6-0 648   02/1891 16/05/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 647   02/1891 09/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 646   02/1891 29/11/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 645   02/1891 23/07/1959
NBR J36 0-6-0 644   02/1891 23/03/1948
NBR J36 0-6-0 643   02/1891 07/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 650   04/1891 04/1951
NBR J36 0-6-0 649   04/1891 14/10/1957
NBR J36 0-6-0 654   05/1891 08/10/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 653   05/1891 06/05/1960
NBR J36 0-6-0 652   05/1891 29/12/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 651   05/1891 11/08/1961
NBR J36 0-6-0 658   07/1891 22/04/1967
NBR J36 0-6-0 657   07/1891 02/12/1960
NBR J36 0-6-0 656   07/1891 02/10/1961
NBR J36 0-6-0 655   07/1891 04/1952
NBR J36 0-6-0 660   08/1891 06/04/1956
NBR J36 0-6-0 659   08/1891 25/10/1961
NBR J36 0-6-0 179   11/1891 12/1937
NBR J36 0-6-0 662   11/1891 04/1937
NBR J36 0-6-0 661   11/1891 01/1939
NBR J36 0-6-0 183   12/1891 18/05/1956
NBR J36 0-6-0 68   12/1891 17/07/1959
NBR J36 0-6-0 45   12/1891 11/01/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 358   07/1892 19/11/1966
NBR J36 0-6-0 357   07/1892 21/05/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 248   07/1892 13/12/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 247   07/1892 07/07/1952
NBR J36 0-6-0 612   08/1892 07/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 611   08/1892 01/11/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 180   01/1893 29/12/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 177   01/1893 08/12/1950
NBR J36 0-6-0 280   03/1893 07/11/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 250   03/1893 08/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 182   03/1893 26/08/1952
NBR J36 0-6-0 181   03/1893 14/02/1958
NBR 633 4-4-0 262   11/1894 08/1937
NBR 633 4-4-0 293   12/1894 01/1938
NBR 633 4-4-0 212   01/1895 04/1937
NBR 633 4-4-0 211   01/1895 09/1937
NBR 633 4-4-0 404   01/1895 05/03/1948
NBR 633 4-4-0 312   01/1895 12/1938
NBR 633 4-4-0 216   06/1895 11/1937
NBR 633 4-4-0 215   06/1895 09/1946
NBR 633 4-4-0 214   06/1895 05/1939
NBR 633 4-4-0 213   06/1895 03/1939
NBR 633 4-4-0 218   07/1895 07/1937
NBR 633 4-4-0 217   07/1895 10/1939
NBR J36 0-6-0 706   06/1896 06/06/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 705   06/1896 08/03/1961
NBR J36 0-6-0 707   06/1896 21/01/1952
NBR J36 0-6-0 710   06/1896 13/07/1961
NBR J36 0-6-0 709   06/1896 21/05/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 708   06/1896 19/03/1951
NBR J36 0-6-0 714   11/1896 29/11/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 713   11/1896 07/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 712   11/1896 08/12/1952
NBR J36 0-6-0 711   11/1896 03/01/1966
NBR J36 0-6-0 716   12/1896 27/06/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 715   12/1896 09/02/1952
NBR J36 0-6-0 719   04/1897 01/08/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 718   04/1897 03/1948
NBR J36 0-6-0 717   04/1897 05/06/1967
NBR J36 0-6-0 721   05/1897 16/02/1951
NBR J36 0-6-0 720   05/1897 29/11/1950
NBR J36 0-6-0 722   06/1897 10/11/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 728   07/1897 10/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 727   07/1897 16/03/1951
NBR J36 0-6-0 726   07/1897 03/01/1966
NBR J36 0-6-0 725   07/1897 26/02/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 724   07/1897 05/04/1961
NBR J36 0-6-0 723   07/1897 03/1950
NBR 729 4-4-0 729   03/1898 03/1946
NBR 729 4-4-0 731   04/1898 06/08/1948
NBR 729 4-4-0 730   04/1898 12/1937
NBR 729 4-4-0 734   05/1898 10/1946
NBR 729 4-4-0 733   05/1898 10/05/1948
NBR 729 4-4-0 732   05/1898 20/04/1949
NBR 729 4-4-0 740   07/1898 11/1947
NBR 729 4-4-0 739   07/1898 07/1947
NBR 729 4-4-0 738   07/1898 06/1939
NBR 729 4-4-0 737   07/1898 05/1939
NBR 729 4-4-0 736   07/1898 07/1931
NBR 729 4-4-0 735   07/1898 03/1939
NBR J36 0-6-0 746   10/1898 08/10/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 745   10/1898 29/12/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 744   10/1898 07/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 743   10/1898 02/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 742   10/1898 16/07/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 741   10/1898 05/1943
NBR J36 0-6-0 747   12/1898 26/02/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 750   01/1899 18/06/1951
NBR J36 0-6-0 749   01/1899 28/12/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 748   01/1899 16/07/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 752   01/1899 16/07/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 751   01/1899 29/06/1964
NBR J36 0-6-0 755   03/1899 30/07/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 754   03/1899 10/11/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 753   03/1899 29/11/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 758   04/1899 29/12/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 757   04/1899 30/04/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 756   04/1899 26/08/1955
NBR J36 0-6-0 763   05/1899 10/11/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 762   05/1899 30/04/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 761   05/1899 26/09/1966
NBR J36 0-6-0 760   05/1899 31/05/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 759   05/1899 29/07/1960
NBR J36 0-6-0 764   06/1899 24/07/1951
NBR 729 4-4-0 767   09/1899 10/1946
NBR 729 4-4-0 766   09/1899 06/1937
NBR 729 4-4-0 765   09/1899 11/1946
NBR 729 4-4-0 770   11/1899 03/1946
NBR 729 4-4-0 769   11/1899 12/1947
NBR 729 4-4-0 768   11/1899 28/02/1951
NBR J36 0-6-0 776   01/1900 03/1948
NBR J36 0-6-0 775   01/1900 13/11/1965
NBR J36 0-6-0 774   01/1900 10/1946
NBR J36 0-6-0 773   01/1900 29/11/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 772   01/1900 25/02/1957
NBR J36 0-6-0 771   01/1900 28/12/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 780   03/1900 08/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 779   03/1900 07/08/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 778   03/1900 18/06/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 777   03/1900 28/12/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 782   05/1900 08/10/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 781   05/1900 29/09/1959
NBR J36 0-6-0 788   07/1900 21/01/1952
NBR J36 0-6-0 787   07/1900 08/03/1961
NBR J36 0-6-0 786   07/1900 24/12/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 785   07/1900 04/1948
NBR J36 0-6-0 784   07/1900 10/1947
NBR J36 0-6-0 783   07/1900 29/11/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 794   12/1900 29/06/1964
NBR J36 0-6-0 793   12/1900 05/06/1967
NBR J36 0-6-0 792   12/1900 25/10/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 791   12/1900 18/02/1960
NBR J36 0-6-0 790   12/1900 02/02/1960
NBR J36 0-6-0 789   12/1900 29/07/1963
NBR D26 4-4-0 317   05/1903 08/1924
NBR D26 4-4-0 320   06/1903 01/1925
NBR D26 4-4-0 319   06/1903 09/1922
NBR D26 4-4-0 318   06/1903 07/1925
NBR D26 4-4-0 322   07/1903 02/1925
NBR D26 4-4-0 321   07/1903 11/1922
NBR D26 4-4-0 324   09/1903 12/1924
NBR D26 4-4-0 323   09/1903 02/1923
NBR D26 4-4-0 327   10/1903 11/1925
NBR D26 4-4-0 326   10/1903 08/1925
NBR D26 4-4-0 325   10/1903 07/1926
NBR D26 4-4-0 328   11/1903 07/1922
NBR J88 0-6-0T 839   12/1904 05/10/1956
NBR J88 0-6-0T 838   12/1904 18/12/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 837   12/1904 20/06/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 836   12/1904 06/06/1960
NBR J88 0-6-0T 841   01/1905 20/03/1961
NBR J88 0-6-0T 840   01/1905 03/07/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 844   09/1905 03/03/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 843   09/1905 08/07/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 842   09/1905 16/10/1959
NBR J88 0-6-0T 847   10/1905 02/03/1959
NBR J88 0-6-0T 846   10/1905 15/08/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 845   10/1905 17/02/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 330   07/1906 09/06/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 329   07/1906 26/02/1962
NBR D32 4-4-0     10/1906 02/03/1948
NBR D32 4-4-0     11/1906 02/09/1948
NBR D32 4-4-0     11/1906 12/1949
NBR D32 4-4-0     12/1906 09/1948
NBR D32 4-4-0     12/1906 02/09/1948
NBR D32 4-4-0     12/1906 13/11/1948
NBR D32 4-4-0     12/1906 26/02/1948
NBR D32 4-4-0     01/1907 29/03/1951
NBR D32 4-4-0     01/1907 29/05/1948
NBR D32 4-4-0     01/1907 09/1948
NBR J35 0-6-0 188   07/1908 16/04/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 187   07/1908 02/10/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 186   07/1908 09/12/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 185   07/1908 26/03/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 190   08/1908 23/11/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 189   08/1908 11/05/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 195   12/1908 06/06/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 194   12/1908 02/1947
NBR J35 0-6-0 193   12/1908 03/09/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 192   12/1908 14/12/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 191   12/1908 20/08/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 196   01/1909 06/06/1960
NBR J88 0-6-0T 236   03/1909 08/10/1962
NBR J88 0-6-0T 235   03/1909 03/06/1959
NBR J88 0-6-0T 234   03/1909 21/03/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 233   03/1909 16/08/1960
NBR J88 0-6-0T 238   04/1909 08/11/1955
NBR J88 0-6-0T 237   04/1909 28/05/1962
NBR D33 4-4-0     10/1909 22/12/1949
NBR D33 4-4-0     10/1909 24/08/1951
NBR D33 4-4-0     11/1909 06/06/1952
NBR D33 4-4-0     11/1909 09/1949
NBR D33 4-4-0     11/1909 20/09/1951
NBR D33 4-4-0     12/1909 06/06/1951
NBR D33 4-4-0     12/1909 12/11/1952
NBR D33 4-4-0     12/1909 05/03/1948
NBR D33 4-4-0     01/1910 22/09/1953
NBR D33 4-4-0     02/1910 01/10/1951
NBR J35 0-6-0 56   09/1910 27/11/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 38   09/1910 26/02/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 115   10/1910 09/04/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 59   10/1910 20/11/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 58   10/1910 17/10/1958
NBR J35 0-6-0 57   10/1910 10/06/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 120   11/1910 30/09/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 347   12/1910 02/03/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 337   12/1910 24/02/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 336   12/1910 07/01/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 335   12/1910 03/04/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 348   01/1911 16/07/1962
NBR D29 4-4-0     09/1911 10/1949
NBR D29 4-4-0     10/1911 29/10/1948
NBR D29 4-4-0     10/1911 14/01/1952
NBR D29 4-4-0     11/1911 14/11/1952
NBR D29 4-4-0     12/1911 01/09/1950
NBR D29 4-4-0     12/1911 26/08/1950
NBR J88 0-6-0T 114   04/1912 21/10/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 66   04/1912 15/09/1961
NBR J88 0-6-0T 118   05/1912 12/02/1962
NBR J88 0-6-0T 117   05/1912 19/11/1954
NBR J88 0-6-0T 116   05/1912 28/02/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 121   06/1912 18/01/1961
NBR J88 0-6-0T 119   06/1912 06/10/1960
NBR J88 0-6-0T 152   07/1912 25/08/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 132   07/1912 08/10/1962
NBR J88 0-6-0T 130   07/1912 29/12/1962
NBR Scott 4-4-0     10/1912 02/01/1951
NBR J35 0-6-0 220   11/1912 12/09/1958
NBR J35 0-6-0 226   11/1912 22/03/1958
NBR J35 0-6-0 254   12/1912 12/10/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 253   12/1912 21/09/1960
NBR J35 0-6-0 228   12/1912 11/06/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 124   02/1913 20/11/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 86   02/1913 11/07/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 129   03/1913 27/11/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 127   03/1913 11/05/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 126   03/1913 11/01/1962
NBR Glen 4-4-0     09/1913 10/08/1960
NBR Glen 4-4-0     09/1913 03/09/1958
NBR Glen 4-4-0     09/1913 17/12/1962
NBR Glen 4-4-0     09/1913 05/05/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     10/1913 24/03/1960
NBR Glen 4-4-0     12/1913 09/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     12/1913 05/1949
NBR Glen 4-4-0     12/1913 05/1961
NBR Glen 4-4-0     12/1913 29/06/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     12/1913 02/1950
NBR Scott 4-4-0     04/1914 06/08/1959
NBR Scott 4-4-0     04/1914 19/09/1957
NBR Scott 4-4-0     04/1914 06/1957
NBR Scott 4-4-0     04/1914 25/06/1960
NBR Scott 4-4-0     05/1914 29/12/1958
NBR Scott 4-4-0     06/1914 18/12/1957
NBR Scott 4-4-0     06/1914 05/08/1957
NBR Scott 4-4-0     06/1914 08/1958
NBR Scott 4-4-0     07/1914 25/06/1960
NBR Scott 4-4-0     07/1914 20/04/1959
NBR Scott 4-4-0     09/1914 29/12/1958
NBR Scott 4-4-0     10/1914 20/08/1957
NBR Scott 4-4-0     10/1914 07/01/1957
NBR Scott 4-4-0     10/1914 17/10/1958
NBR Scott 4-4-0     10/1914 04/12/1958
NBR J37 0-6-0 44   12/1914 07/12/1959
NBR J37 0-6-0 13   12/1914 08/06/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 8   12/1914 22/05/1959
NBR J37 0-6-0 113   01/1915 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 62   01/1915 08/09/1961
NBR J37 0-6-0 260   04/1915 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 255   04/1915 10/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 222   04/1915 02/10/1961
NBR J37 0-6-0 136   04/1915 07/07/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 261   05/1915 25/06/1962
NBR Scott 4-4-0     07/1915 05/1958
NBR Scott 4-4-0     07/1915 09/12/1957
NBR Scott 4-4-0     08/1915 05/06/1959
NBR Scott 4-4-0     08/1915 07/1958
NBR J37 0-6-0 431   11/1915 13/07/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 430   11/1915 29/11/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 429   11/1915 31/12/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 263   11/1915 14/05/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 432   12/1915 25/12/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 437   06/1916 12/10/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 436   06/1916 23/01/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 435   06/1916 08/03/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 434   06/1916 12/10/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 433   06/1916 18/09/1963
NBR Glen 4-4-0     05/1917 28/10/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     05/1917 15/12/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     05/1917 05/1961
NBR Glen 4-4-0     06/1917 09/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     07/1917 09/1949
NBR J37 0-6-0 454   08/1918 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 304   08/1918 19/11/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 297   08/1918 10/12/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 292   08/1918 04/03/1960
NBR J37 0-6-0 455   09/1918 28/12/1963
NBR Glen 4-4-0     03/1919 02/03/1960
NBR Glen 4-4-0     03/1919 24/04/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     04/1919 06/11/1961
NBR Glen 4-4-0     04/1919 29/03/1960
NBR J88 0-6-0T 290   09/1919 26/08/1960
NBR J88 0-6-0T 277   09/1919 14/08/1958
NBR J88 0-6-0T 289   10/1919 09/1960
NBR J88 0-6-0T 288   10/1919 16/07/1962
NBR J88 0-6-0T 279   11/1919 06/1960
NBR J88 0-6-0T 271   11/1919 12/02/1962
NBR J88 0-6-0T 87   11/1919 07/1962
NBR Glen 4-4-0     04/1920 31/10/1960
NBR Glen 4-4-0     05/1920 10/09/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     05/1920 18/12/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     05/1920 19/02/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     06/1920 11/06/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     06/1920 25/06/1960
NBR Glen 4-4-0     07/1920 24/04/1959
NBR Glen 4-4-0     07/1920 10/04/1961
NBR Glen 4-4-0     08/1920 20/11/1961
NBR Glen 4-4-0     08/1920 23/02/1960
NBR Glen 4-4-0     09/1920 24/03/1960
NBR Scott 4-4-0     11/1920 12/10/1959
NBR Scott 4-4-0     11/1920 08/1958
NBR Scott 4-4-0     11/1920 09/1958
NBR Scott 4-4-0     12/1920 30/10/1957
NBR Scott 4-4-0     12/1920 07/1958
NBR J37 0-6-0 517   06/1921 06/09/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 103   06/1921 08/06/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 101   06/1921 06/12/1965
NBR J37 0-6-0 98   06/1921 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 33   07/1921 23/01/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 128   08/1921 12/10/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 104   08/1921 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 143   09/1921 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 105   09/1921 27/08/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 518   10/1921 29/12/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 19   10/1923 17/05/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 60   11/1923 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 55   11/1923 29/10/1957
NBR N15 0-6-2T 52   11/1923 22/10/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 31   11/1923 25/11/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 23   11/1923 17/02/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 77   12/1923 12/02/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 76   12/1923 28/11/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 75   12/1923 07/05/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 74   12/1923 19/10/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 67   12/1923 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 71   12/1923 29/12/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 99   02/1924 05/12/1961
NBR N15 0-6-2T 79   02/1924 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 78   02/1924 16/10/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 9225   03/1924 13/08/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 9174   03/1924 22/05/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 9147   03/1924 19/07/1961
NBR N15 0-6-2T 125   03/1924 18/11/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 9227   04/1924 01/10/1962