Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 346 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 346 Week
» 30636 Month
» 333826 Year
» 1555391 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
GNR J4 0-6-0 171 113 12/1873 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 193 116 12/1873 02/1927
GNR J4 0-6-0 372 121 04/1874 04/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 373 122 05/1874 01/1926
LNER J54 0-6-0T 494 130 06/1874 08/1929
GNR J4 0-6-0 354 132 07/1874 08/1926
LNER J54 0-6-0T 495 134 07/1874 04/1910
GNR J4 0-6-0 198 133 08/1874 05/1927
LNER J54 0-6-0T 496 135 08/1874 06/1927
LNER J54 0-6-0T 497 143 08/1874 07/1910
LNER J54 0-6-0T 498 145 09/1874 09/1919
LNER J54 0-6-0T 499 151 09/1874 12/1916
GNR J4 0-6-0 196 155 12/1874 02/1927
LNER J54 0-6-0T 500 177 1875 06/1919
LNER J54 0-6-0T 601 180 1875 12/1919
LNER J54 0-6-0T 602 183 1875 10/1910
LNER J54 0-6-0T 603 190 1875 08/1919
GNR J4 0-6-0 173 156 03/1875 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 340 159 03/1875 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 365 161 04/1875 08/1925
GNR J4 0-6-0 141 163 05/1875 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 163 167 05/1875 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 339 169 06/1875 06/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 187 171 08/1875 01/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 328 181 09/1875 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 194 182 09/1875 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 312 199 03/1876 04/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 314 200 04/1876 01/1926
LNER J56 0-6-0T 606 213 01/1877 12/1919
LNER J56 0-6-0T 607 214 01/1877 06/1911
LNER J56 0-6-0T 608 217 02/1877 12/1932
LNER J56 0-6-0T 609 221 03/1877 06/1914
LNER J56 0-6-0T 610 222 03/1877 11/1929
LNER J56 0-6-0T 611 223 05/1877 01/1928
LNER J56 0-6-0T 612 226 07/1877 10/1928
LNER J56 0-6-0T 613 228 09/1877 11/1925
LNER J56 0-6-0T 614 227 10/1877 06/1902
LNER J56 0-6-0T 615 229 11/1877 02/1927
GNR J4 0-6-0 310 237 06/1878 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 393 239 06/1878 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 641 242 08/1878 04/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 642 249 10/1878 10/1927
GNR J4 0-6-0 643 252 12/1878 11/1929
LNER J54 0-6-0T 616 254 12/1878 10/1919
LNER J54 0-6-0T 617 255 12/1878 09/1925
GNR J4 0-6-0 644 258 02/1879 02/1924
LNER J54 0-6-0T 618 260 02/1879 06/1919
LNER J54 0-6-0T 619 262 03/1879 04/1929
GNR J4 0-6-0 645 264 04/1879 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 160 267 05/1879 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 620 268 05/1879 11/1925
GNR J4 0-6-0 646 269 07/1879 03/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 133 270 08/1879 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 168 273 09/1879 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 633 276 09/1879 04/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 154 278 10/1879 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 634 280 01/1880 11/1929
LNER J54 0-6-0T 635 282 02/1880 11/1929
LNER J54 0-6-0T 636 286 04/1880 11/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 640 287 06/1880 08/1929
LNER J54 0-6-0T 637 288 06/1880 03/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 638 293 08/1880 08/1929
GNR J4 0-6-0 647 292 09/1880 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 648 295 10/1880 04/1926
LNER J54 0-6-0T 153 296 10/1880 01/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 649 301 11/1880 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 472 299 11/1880 10/1918
LNER J54 0-6-0T 639 302 11/1880 09/1919
GNR J4 0-6-0 650 304 12/1880 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 473 305 12/1880 09/1929
LNER J54 0-6-0T 672 315 06/1881 07/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 673 316 07/1881 05/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 674 319 09/1881 11/1925
GNR G2 0-4-4T 658 318 10/1881 1911
LNER J54 0-6-0T 675 325 10/1881 11/1925
GNR G2 0-4-4T 659 327 11/1881 01/1924
GNR J4 0-6-0 651 308 12/1881 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 102 329 12/1881 10/1931
GNR J4 0-6-0 101 330 12/1881 06/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 676 326 12/1881 04/1928
GNR G2 0-4-4T 660 328 01/1882
GNR G2 0-4-4T 661 331 02/1882
LNER J54 0-6-0T 677 332 02/1882 01/1933
LNER J54 0-6-0T 678 333 03/1882 08/1929
LNER J54 0-6-0T 679 334 03/1882 01/1930
GNR G2 0-4-4T 682 336 05/1882 08/1924
LNER J54 0-6-0T 680 335 05/1882 05/1930
GNR G2 0-4-4T 683 337 06/1882
GNR G2 0-4-4T 697 372 07/1882 1911
GNR G2 0-4-4T 698 375 09/1882
LNER J54 0-6-0T 681 340 09/1882 06/1925
GNR G2 0-4-4T 761 376 10/1882
GNR J57 0-6-0ST 684 347 12/1882 09/1930
GNR J57 0-6-0ST 685 348 12/1882 06/1938
GNR G2 0-4-4T 762 381 01/1883
GNR G2 0-4-4T 763 384 02/1883
GNR G2 0-4-4T 764 385 03/1883
LNER J54 0-6-0T 688 353 05/1883 11/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 689 354 06/1883 03/1934
LNER J54 0-6-0T 690 355 07/1883 03/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 691 358 10/1883 04/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 692 359 11/1883 02/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 693 360 12/1883 05/1928
GNR G2 0-4-4T 694 363 02/1884 10/1924
GNR G2 0-4-4T 695 365 03/1884 04/1925
GNR J57 0-6-0ST 686 364 03/1884 08/1929
GNR J57 0-6-0ST 687 366 03/1884 11/1930
GNR G2 0-4-4T 696 369 05/1884 04/1926
LNER J54 0-6-0T 781 387 04/1885 04/1926
GNR G2 0-4-4T 765 386 05/1885 08/1924
LNER J54 0-6-0T 782 388 05/1885 10/1931
LNER J54 0-6-0T 783 399 11/1885 03/1934
LNER J54 0-6-0T 784 400 12/1885 10/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 785 401 12/1885 10/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 786 402 01/1886 03/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 787 403 02/1886 11/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 791 411 03/1886 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 788 404 03/1886 04/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 792 412 04/1886 04/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 793 413 05/1886 07/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 794 414 06/1886 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 795 415 06/1886 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 796 416 07/1886 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 797 417 08/1886 11/1927
GNR J4 0-6-0 798 418 09/1886 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 799 419 10/1886 09/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 800 420 11/1886 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 789 429 12/1886 04/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 790 430 01/1887 09/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 322 431 02/1887 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 307 432 03/1887 10/1927
LNER J54 0-6-0T 779 439 06/1887 04/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 780 440 06/1887 06/1929
GNR J4 0-6-0 199 443 08/1887 01/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 320 444 09/1887 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 176 449 09/1887 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 183 450 10/1887 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 389 451 11/1887 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 147 452 12/1887 08/1925
LNER J54 0-6-0T 801 453 02/1888 10/1932
LNER J54 0-6-0T 802 454 03/1888 07/1934
LNER J54 0-6-0T 803 459 04/1888 08/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 178 460 07/1888 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 309 461 07/1888 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 150 462 08/1888 05/1929
GNR J4 0-6-0 324 463 08/1888 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 181 464 08/1888 08/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 321 465 08/1888 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 804 468 08/1888 09/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 323 475 12/1888 01/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 382 476 12/1888 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 300 479 04/1889 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 301 480 04/1889 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 805 481 04/1889 04/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 806 482 05/1889 06/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 330 487 06/1889 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 135 488 06/1889 04/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 191 493 08/1889 08/1925
GNR J4 0-6-0 195 494 09/1889 05/1927
GNR J4 0-6-0 170 495 10/1889 09/1925
GNR G1 0-4-4T 766 499 12/1889 02/1927
GNR J4 0-6-0 383 496 12/1889 08/1925
GNR G1 0-4-4T 767 500 02/1890 01/1924
GNR J4 0-6-0 342 501 02/1890 03/1929
GNR J4 0-6-0 347 502 02/1890 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 175 503 02/1890 04/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 391 505 03/1890 1923
GNR G1 0-4-4T 768 504 04/1890
GNR G1 0-4-4T 769 506 05/1890 06/1924
LNER J54 0-6-0T 397 509 05/1890 01/1930
GNR G1 0-4-4T 770 507 06/1890 06/1925
GNR G1 0-4-4T 821 512 07/1890
LNER J54 0-6-0T 139 511 07/1890 01/1930
GNR G1 0-4-4T 822 513 08/1890
GNR J4 0-6-0 378 514 08/1890 09/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 370 515 08/1890 1923
GNR G1 0-4-4T 823 518 09/1890
GNR G1 0-4-4T 824 519 10/1890 06/1924
GNR J57 0-6-0ST 140 517 10/1890 10/1932
GNR G1 0-4-4T 825 520 11/1890
LNER J54 0-6-0T 807 521 11/1890 10/1933
GNR J57 0-6-0ST 134 516 11/1890 03/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 831 522 12/1890 02/1927
GNR G1 0-4-4T 826 525 01/1891
LNER J54 0-6-0T 808 523 01/1891 08/1928
GNR G1 0-4-4T 827 526 02/1891 04/1925
GNR J4 0-6-0 832 524 02/1891 08/1926
GNR G1 0-4-4T 828 528 03/1891 11/1925
LNER J54 0-6-0T 809 527 03/1891 03/1929
GNR G1 0-4-4T 829 531 04/1891
GNR J4 0-6-0 833 529 04/1891 06/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 834 533 04/1891 04/1926
LNER J54 0-6-0T 810 530 04/1891 08/1928
GNR G1 0-4-4T 830 535 05/1891 06/06/1924
GNR J4 0-6-0 835 537 05/1891 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 851 536 05/1891 09/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 385 539 06/1891 01/1929
GNR J4 0-6-0 836 541 06/1891 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 852 538 06/1891 03/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 379 543 07/1891 05/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 837 545 08/1891 12/1929
GNR J4 0-6-0 839 547 08/1891 12/1929
LNER J54 0-6-0T 853 544 08/1891 08/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 838 550 09/1891 11/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 854 548 09/1891 11/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 840 552 10/1891 06/1925
GNR J4 0-6-0 841 554 10/1891 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 855 551 10/1891 02/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 845 556 11/1891 12/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 842 558 11/1891 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 856 555 11/1891 03/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 846 560 12/1891 03/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 843 561 12/1891 07/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 857 559 12/1891 10/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 847 563 02/1892 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 844 565 02/1892 10/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 848 567 02/1892 12/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 858 564 02/1892 07/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 849 569 03/1892 12/1931
LNER J54 0-6-0T 859 568 03/1892 12/1948
GNR G1 0-4-4T 938 610 04/1892
GNR J4 0-6-0 850 572 04/1892 01/1940
GNR J4 0-6-0 317 574 04/1892 07/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 341 575 04/1892 1923
LNER J54 0-6-0T 860 570 04/1892 08/1931
GNR G1 0-4-4T 939 614 05/1892 06/1924
GNR J57 0-6-0ST 144 577 05/1892 10/1933
GNR J57 0-6-0ST 149 580 06/1892 08/1931
GNR J4 0-6-0 143 586 08/1892 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 346 587 08/1892 1923
GNR G1 0-4-4T 931 582 09/1892
GNR G1 0-4-4T 932 583 10/1892 08/1924
GNR G1 0-4-4T 933 589 11/1892
GNR G1 0-4-4T 934 594 12/1892
GNR J4 0-6-0 182 595 12/1892 03/1928
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 921 591 12/1892 07/1939
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 922 597 12/1892 29/11/1954
GNR G1 0-4-4T 935 598 01/1893
GNR G1 0-4-4T 936 601 02/1893
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 923 599 02/1893 25/11/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 924 600 02/1893 03/1936
GNR G1 0-4-4T 937 607 03/1893
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 925 603 03/1893 19/07/1956
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 926 605 03/1893 09/11/1954
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 927 608 04/1893 27/05/1957
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 928 612 05/1893 11/1935
GNR G1 0-4-4T 940 617 06/1893 08/1924
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 929 613 06/1893 06/08/1951
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 930 615 06/1893 10/1950
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 961 618 07/1893 01/11/1954
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 962 619 08/1893 09/12/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 963 623 08/1893 23/01/1952
GNR J4 0-6-0 319 634 10/1893 1923
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 964 627 10/1893 08/1939
GNR J4 0-6-0 327 637 11/1893 1923
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 965 629 11/1893 04/12/1950
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 966 630 12/1893 25/10/1957
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 967 636 12/1893 23/09/1955
GNR J4 0-6-0 1011 641 01/1894 01/1940
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 968 640 01/1894 05/08/1953
GNR J4 0-6-0 1012 645 02/1894 06/1930
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 969 643 02/1894 10/10/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 970 647 03/1894 06/09/1954
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 971 657 08/1894 13/04/1953
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 972 658 09/1894 20/07/1953
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 973 659 10/1894 14/07/1952
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 974 660 11/1894 26/10/1953
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 975 661 12/1894 29/11/1954
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 976 662 12/1894 03/07/1957
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 977 681 05/1895 27/04/1953
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 978 682 06/1895 25/01/1954
GNR G1 0-4-4T 941 688 08/1895
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 979 683 08/1895 13/12/1954
GNR G1 0-4-4T 942 689 09/1895 1921
GNR G1 0-4-4T 943 690 10/1895 06/1924
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 980 684 10/1895 11/1936
GNR G1 0-4-4T 944 691 11/1895 1912
GNR J4 0-6-0 1081 702 09/1896 02/1939
GNR J4 0-6-0 1082 703 10/1896 04/1935
GNR J4 0-6-0 1083 704 10/1896 01/1938
GNR J4 0-6-0 1084 705 10/1896 03/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1085 706 10/1896 01/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 1086 707 11/1896 08/1935
GNR J4 0-6-0 1087 708 11/1896 10/1931
GNR J4 0-6-0 1088 709 11/1896 08/1947
GNR D4 4-4-0 400 712 12/1896 09/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 1089 710 12/1896 12/1920
GNR D4 4-4-0 1071 723 05/1897 10/1948
GNR D4 4-4-0 1072 724 05/1897 12/1935
GNR D4 4-4-0 1073 725 06/1897 02/1946
GNR D4 4-4-0 1074 726 06/1897 11/1946
GNR D4 4-4-0 1075 727 06/1897 18/10/1951
GNR D4 4-4-0 1076 728 06/1897 06/1936
GNR D4 4-4-0 1077 729 06/1897 10/1937
GNR D4 4-4-0 1078 730 06/1897 12/1935
GNR D4 4-4-0 1079 731 06/1897 10/1937
GNR D4 4-4-0 1080 732 06/1897 08/1947
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1201 735 08/1897 20/10/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1202 736 08/1897 31/12/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 111 733 08/1897 05/08/1953
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 155 734 08/1897 17/10/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1203 737 09/1897 23/09/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1204 738 09/1897 12/04/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1205 739 09/1897 11/09/1956
GNR D4 4-4-0 1301 745 10/1897 08/1947
GNR D4 4-4-0 1302 746 10/1897 02/1948
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1206 740 10/1897 12/11/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1207 741 10/1897 27/05/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1208 742 10/1897 16/09/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1209 743 10/1897 15/10/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1210 744 10/1897 24/11/1955
GNR D4 4-4-0 1305 749 11/1897 05/1949
GNR D4 4-4-0 1303 747 11/1897 12/1949
GNR D4 4-4-0 1304 748 11/1897 11/1942
GNR D4 4-4-0 1306 750 11/1897 11/1948
GNR D4 4-4-0 1307 751 11/1897 08/1949
GNR D4 4-4-0 1308 752 12/1897 10/1935
GNR D4 4-4-0 1309 753 12/1897 08/1948
GNR D4 4-4-0 1310 754 12/1897 05/1947
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1009 755 02/1898 13/04/1955
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1010 756 02/1898 12/1948
GNR D4 4-4-0 1311 759 03/1898 12/1949
GNR D4 4-4-0 1312 760 03/1898 02/1946
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1014 758 03/1898 12/04/1955
GNR D4 4-4-0 1313 761 04/1898 12/1935
GNR D4 4-4-0 1315 763 04/1898 04/1947
GNR D4 4-4-0 1316 764 04/1898 31/10/1949
GNR D4 4-4-0 1314 762 05/1898 06/1937
GNR D4 4-4-0 1317 765 05/1898 12/1950
GNR D4 4-4-0 1318 766 05/1898 08/1949
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1013 757 05/1898 19/11/1958
GNR D4 4-4-0 1320 768 06/1898 04/1949
GNR D4 4-4-0 1319 767 06/1898 12/1946
GNR D2 4-4-0 1321 770 06/1898 01/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1322 771 06/1898 07/1939
GNR D2 4-4-0 1323 772 06/1898 04/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1324 773 06/1898 25/11/1950
GNR D2 4-4-0 1325 774 07/1898 12/1937
GNR J4 0-6-0 315 775 08/1898 11/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 316 776 08/1898 10/1931
GNR J4 0-6-0 318 777 08/1898 07/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 334 781 08/1898 05/1929
GNR J4 0-6-0 336 782 09/1898 08/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 337 783 09/1898 12/1935
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1015 788 10/1898 22/06/1953
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1016 789 10/1898 03/1948
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1017 790 10/1898 04/1937
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1019 796 10/1898 22/05/1958
GNR D2 4-4-0 1326 785 10/1898 26/02/1948
GNR D2 4-4-0 1327 786 10/1898 01/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1328 792 10/1898 10/1937
GNR J4 0-6-0 338 784 10/1898 05/1933
GNR D4 4-4-0 1342 803 11/1898 11/1936
GNR D2 4-4-0 1329 793 11/1898 08/04/1948
GNR D2 4-4-0 1330 794 11/1898 03/1946
GNR D2 4-4-0 1331 795 11/1898 07/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1332 798 11/1898 16/10/1948
GNR D2 4-4-0 1333 799 11/1898 07/1950
GNR D2 4-4-0 1334 800 11/1898 09/1936
GNR D2 4-4-0 1335 801 11/1898 07/1947
GNR D4 4-4-0 1341 802 12/1898 07/1937
GNR D4 4-4-0 1343 804 12/1898 06/02/1950
GNR D4 4-4-0 1344 805 12/1898 11/1947
GNR D4 4-4-0 1345 806 12/1898 01/1949
GNR D4 4-4-0 1346 807 12/1898 08/1947
GNR D4 4-4-0 1347 808 12/1898 06/1949
GNR D4 4-4-0 1348 809 12/1898 06/1950
GNR D4 4-4-0 1349 810 12/1898 11/1946
GNR D4 4-4-0 1350 811 12/1898 04/1947
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1018 791 12/1898 01/10/1951
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1020 797 02/1899 01/01/1948
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1501 812 02/1899 08/1949
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1502 813 03/1899 24/01/1955
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1503 814 03/1899 15/04/1955
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1504 815 03/1899 11/01/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1505 816 04/1899 20/11/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1506 817 04/1899 25/05/1956
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1507 818 04/1899 22/05/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1508 819 05/1899 03/04/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1509 820 05/1899 06/08/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1510 821 05/1899 26/10/1955
GNR J4 0-6-0 348 825 06/1899 12/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 349 826 06/1899 07/1934
GNR J4 0-6-0 353 830 06/1899 07/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 343 822 07/1899 04/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 344 823 07/1899 04/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 351 828 07/1899 02/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 352 829 07/1899 09/1934
GNR J4 0-6-0 359 831 07/1899 02/1932
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1511 832 08/1899 19/07/1954
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1512 833 08/1899 04/1937
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1513 834 08/1899 01/01/1948
GNR J4 0-6-0 360 842 08/1899 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 361 843 08/1899 05/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 362 844 08/1899 07/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 363 845 08/1899 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 371 849 08/1899 10/1935
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1514 835 09/1899 04/04/1955
GNR D2 4-4-0 1336 852 09/1899 05/1937
GNR J4 0-6-0 364 846 09/1899 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 367 847 09/1899 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 368 848 09/1899 11/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 381 851 09/1899 10/1932
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1515 836 10/1899 06/1937
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1516 837 10/1899 11/1937
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1517 838 10/1899 18/05/1953
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1518 839 10/1899 05/03/1951
GNR D2 4-4-0 1337 853 10/1899 16/10/1948
GNR D2 4-4-0 1338 854 10/1899 02/1946
GNR D2 4-4-0 1339 855 10/1899 03/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1340 856 10/1899 07/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1362 858 10/1899 06/1937
GNR D2 4-4-0 1363 859 10/1899 06/1939
GNR D4 4-4-0 1351 862 11/1899 03/1948
GNR D4 4-4-0 1352 863 11/1899 08/1948
GNR D4 4-4-0 1353 864 11/1899 04/1936
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1519 840 11/1899 02/04/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1520 841 11/1899 05/04/1955
GNR D2 4-4-0 1361 857 11/1899 02/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1364 860 11/1899 12/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1365 861 11/1899 02/07/1948
GNR D4 4-4-0 1354 865 12/1899 10/1937
GNR D4 4-4-0 1355 866 12/1899 01/1949
GNR D4 4-4-0 1356 867 12/1899 06/1946
GNR D4 4-4-0 1357 868 12/1899 06/1947
GNR D4 4-4-0 1358 869 12/1899 08/1937
GNR D4 4-4-0 1359 870 12/1899 11/1950
GNR D4 4-4-0 1360 871 12/1899 10/1935
GNR J4 0-6-0 165 882 04/1900 08/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 177 883 05/1900 04/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 180 885 05/1900 02/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 192 886 05/1900 10/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 302 887 05/1900 08/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 303 888 05/1900 04/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 179 884 06/1900 08/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 304 889 06/1900 10/1935
GNR J4 0-6-0 396 899 06/1900 05/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 308 891 07/1900 09/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 386 893 07/1900 05/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 390 896 07/1900 07/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 394 898 07/1900 02/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 398 900 07/1900 09/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 384 892 08/1900 01/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 392 897 08/1900 02/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 399 901 08/1900 08/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1366 903 10/1900 08/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1367 904 10/1900 06/1939
GNR D2 4-4-0 1368 905 10/1900 04/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1369 906 10/1900 19/06/1951
GNR D2 4-4-0 1370 907 11/1900 05/1950
GNR D2 4-4-0 1371 908 11/1900 09/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1372 909 11/1900 12/1938
GNR D2 4-4-0 1373 910 11/1900 25/11/1948
GNR D2 4-4-0 1380 911 11/1900 03/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1382 913 11/1900 05/1937
GNR D2 4-4-0 1374 912 12/1900 01/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1383 914 12/1900 25/11/1950
GNR D2 4-4-0 1384 915 12/1900 03/1946
GNR D2 4-4-0 1375 916 12/1900 12/1939
GNR D2 4-4-0 1376 917 12/1900 11/1937
GNR D2 4-4-0 1385 922 12/1900 07/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1377 918 01/1901 10/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1378 919 01/1901 06/1937
GNR D2 4-4-0 1379 920 01/1901 07/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1381 921 01/1901 05/1950
GNR Q1 0-8-0 401 923 02/1901 20/06/1929
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1521 924 06/1901 22/05/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1522 925 06/1901 06/1937
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1523 926 06/1901 07/1949
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1527 930 06/1901 30/05/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1525 928 08/1901 10/06/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1526 929 09/1901 04/1937
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1524 927 10/1901 01/01/1948
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1529 932 10/1901 06/04/1955
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1528 931 11/1901 21/01/1952
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1530 933 11/1901 01/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1251 944 12/1901 25/10/1954
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1252 945 12/1901 06/05/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1253 946 12/1901 31/12/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1254 947 12/1901 12/07/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1255 948 12/1901 19/07/1954
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1256 949 12/1901 14/11/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1257 950 12/1901 23/11/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1258 951 12/1901 14/04/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1259 952 12/1901 16/12/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1261 954 01/1902 23/12/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1260 953 02/1902 02/08/1954
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1262 955 02/1902 10/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1263 956 02/1902 13/10/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1264 957 03/1902 08/05/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1265 958 03/1902 19/10/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1266 959 03/1902 27/10/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1267 960 03/1902 02/09/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1269 962 03/1902 28/10/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1270 963 03/1902 20/03/1961
GNR Q1 0-8-0 402 964 03/1902 13/09/1927
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1268 961 04/1902 10/02/1958
GNR Q1 0-8-0 405 965 04/1902 26/06/1935
GNR Q1 0-8-0 406 966 04/1902 03/02/1934
GNR Q1 0-8-0 407 967 04/1902 16/06/1934
GNR Q1 0-8-0 403 968 04/1902 10/06/1929
GNR Q1 0-8-0 404 972 05/1902 26/04/1929
GNR Q1 0-8-0 409 970 06/1902 05/08/1931
GNR Q1 0-8-0 408 969 07/1902 02/09/1927
GNR Q1 0-8-0 410 971 07/1902 18/10/1935
GNR Q1 0-8-0 411 973 07/1902 08/12/1930
GNR Q1 0-8-0 412 976 08/1902 23/07/1928
GNR Q1 0-8-0 414 978 09/1902 31/12/1929
GNR Q1 0-8-0 413 982 09/1902 16/05/1927
GNR Q1 0-8-0 415 983 10/1902 18/05/1929
GNR C1 4-4-2 251 991 12/1902 28/07/1947
GNR Q1 0-8-0 416 985 12/1902 17/12/1935
GNR D2 4-4-0 1386 975 01/1903 03/1939
GNR Q1 0-8-0 417 984 01/1903 17/12/1935
GNR Q1 0-8-0 418 986 01/1903 30/11/1929
GNR Q1 0-8-0 419 987 01/1903 13/09/1928
GNR Q1 0-8-0 420 988 01/1903 10/02/1937
GNR Q1 0-8-0 421 989 01/1903 19/05/1934
GNR D2 4-4-0 1388 977 02/1903 07/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1389 980 02/1903 04/1937
GNR D2 4-4-0 1387 981 02/1903 12/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1393 995 02/1903 10/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1395 993 03/1903 09/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1392 994 04/1903 01/10/1948
GNR D2 4-4-0 1390 990 05/1903 05/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1394 992 05/1903 25/11/1948
GNR D2 4-4-0 1391 979 06/1903 08/1938
GNR Q1 0-8-0 424 1010 06/1903 10/10/1927
GNR Q1 0-8-0 423 1007 07/1903 27/06/1928
GNR Q1 0-8-0 422 1008 08/1903 01/08/1928
GNR Q1 0-8-0 425 1009 09/1903 27/06/1928
GNR Q1 0-8-0 426 1011 09/1903 09/09/1931
GNR Q1 0-8-0 427 1012 09/1903 11/04/1929
GNR Q1 0-8-0 429 1013 09/1903 06/12/1930
GNR Q1 0-8-0 430 1014 09/1903 03/10/1931
GNR Q1 0-8-0 428 1015 09/1903 10/04/1926
GNR Q1 0-8-0 431 1016 10/1903 28/11/1931
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1531 1017 12/1903 07/05/1956
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1532 1018 12/1903 04/1937
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1533 1019 12/1903 12/1937
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1534 1020 12/1903 01/04/1955
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1535 1021 12/1903 01/1939
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1536 1022 12/1903 03/04/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1537 1023 12/1903 07/02/1955
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1538 1024 12/1903 07/1948
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1540 1026 12/1903 15/06/1953
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1539 1025 01/1904 15/04/1955
GNR Q1 0-8-0 432 1027 01/1904 27/10/1931
GNR Q1 0-8-0 433 1028 03/1904 08/02/1930
GNR Q1 0-8-0 434 1029 03/1904 27/06/1928
GNR Q1 0-8-0 435 1050 03/1904 17/05/1929
GNR Q1 0-8-0 436 1051 03/1904 08/02/1930
GNR C1 4-4-2 272 1030 04/1904 08/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 273 1031 04/1904 30/01/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 274 1032 04/1904 02/05/1946
GNR Q1 0-8-0 437 1052 04/1904 01/03/1928
GNR C1 4-4-2 275 1033 05/1904 05/05/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 276 1034 05/1904 05/01/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 277 1035 05/1904 31/01/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 278 1036 05/1904 26/07/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 279 1037 06/1904 14/02/1948
GNR C1 4-4-2 280 1038 06/1904 26/10/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 281 1039 06/1904 27/05/1949
GNR C1 4-4-2 283 1040 06/1904 21/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 285 1041 06/1904 02/05/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 282 1042 06/1904 30/01/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 286 1043 06/1904 17/10/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 284 1044 07/1904 26/01/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 287 1045 07/1904 06/10/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 289 1046 07/1904 20/12/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 288 1047 08/1904 08/05/1950
GNR C1 4-4-2 290 1048 08/1904 09/11/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 291 1049 08/1904 21/04/1945
GNR Q1 0-8-0 438 1053 08/1904 17/05/1929
GNR Q1 0-8-0 439 1054 08/1904 09/02/1927
GNR Q1 0-8-0 440 1055 09/1904 28/11/1931
GNR C1 4-4-2 292 1066 03/1905 05/01/1927
GNR C1 4-4-2 293 1067 05/1905 02/07/1948
GNR C1 4-4-2 297 1068 05/1905 05/02/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 296 1069 05/1905 07/12/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 294 1070 05/1905 27/11/1950
GNR C1 4-4-2 295 1071 05/1905 08/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 298 1072 05/1905 04/04/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 299 1073 06/1905 25/05/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 301 1074 06/1905 22/07/1948
GNR C1 4-4-2 300 1075 06/1905 29/08/1949
GNR C1 4-4-2 1400 1076 06/1905 06/12/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1401 1077 06/1905 16/11/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1402 1078 06/1905 05/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1403 1079 06/1905 04/07/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1405 1080 06/1905 14/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1404 1081 06/1905 08/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1406 1082 06/1905 16/02/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1407 1083 07/1905 06/06/1944
GNR C1 4-4-2 1408 1084 07/1905 26/07/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1409 1085 07/1905 23/01/1950
GNR C1 4-4-2 1410 1086 08/1905 29/04/1947
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1271 1087 10/1905 22/03/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1272 1088 10/1905 10/02/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1273 1089 10/1905 21/08/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1274 1090 10/1905 30/09/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1275 1091 11/1905 16/10/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1276 1092 11/1905 20/03/1961
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1277 1093 11/1905 05/03/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1278 1094 11/1905 20/11/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1279 1095 11/1905 25/05/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1280 1096 12/1905 20/09/1955
GNR C1 4-4-2 1411 1109 03/1906 08/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1412 1110 03/1906 20/05/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1413 1111 03/1906 04/01/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1414 1112 03/1906 28/10/1944
GNR C1 4-4-2 1415 1113 04/1906 29/04/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1416 1114 04/1906 20/10/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1417 1115 04/1906 21/04/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1418 1116 05/1906 20/02/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1419 1117 05/1906 19/07/1948
GNR C1 4-4-2 1420 1118 05/1906 05/08/1947
GNR Q1 0-8-0 441 1139 12/1906 11/06/1930
GNR Q1 0-8-0 443 1141, 12/1906 02/01/1929
GNR Q1 0-8-0 444 1142 12/1906 12/07/1932
GNR Q1 0-8-0 445 1143 12/1906 27/06/1928
GNR Q1 0-8-0 442 1140 01/1907 27/09/1930
GNR C1 4-4-2 1422 1144 03/1907 28/09/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1423 1146 04/1907 27/05/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1424 1147 04/1907 03/04/1950
GNR C1 4-4-2 1425 1148 04/1907 01/01/1947
GNR N1 0-6-2T 190 1145 04/1907 10/12/1956
GNR C1 4-4-2 1427 1149 05/1907 20/02/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1428 1150 05/1907 15/06/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1426 1151 05/1907 29/02/1944
GNR C1 4-4-2 1429 1152 05/1907 08/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1430 1153 06/1907 03/02/1944
GNR C1 4-4-2 1431 1154 06/1907 21/10/1944
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1541 1155 07/1907 10/01/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1542 1156 07/1907 19/10/1956
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1543 1157 07/1907 20/04/1953
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1544 1158 07/1907 16/06/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1545 1159 07/1907 16/03/1957
GNR C1 4-4-2 1421 1166 08/1907 05/08/1947
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1546 1160 08/1907 06/1947
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1547 1161 08/1907 06/12/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1548 1162 08/1907 04/11/1958
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1549 1163 08/1907 11/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 1396 1165 08/1907 08/1938
GNR C12 4-4-2T 1550 1164 09/1907 12/1938
GNR D2 4-4-0 1397 1167 09/1907 11/1938
GNR D2 4-4-0 1398 1168 10/1907 06/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 1399 1169 10/1907 05/1946
GNR D2 4-4-0 1180 1170 10/1907 06/1949
GNR C1 4-4-2 1432 1171 11/1907 26/07/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1433 1172 11/1907 02/05/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1434 1173 11/1907 26/04/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1435 1174 11/1907 20/12/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1436 1175 11/1907 05/08/1947
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1551 1176 12/1907 07/03/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1552 1177 12/1907 08/11/1954
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1553 1178 12/1907 27/12/1954
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1554 1179 12/1907 10/03/1959
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1555 1180 12/1907 21/03/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1556 1181 12/1907 11/07/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1557 1182 12/1907 19/07/1954
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1558 1183 12/1907 02/1947
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1559 1184 12/1907 11/11/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1560 1185 02/1908 18/03/1957
GNR C1 4-4-2 1437 1186 03/1908 11/03/1944
GNR C1 4-4-2 1438 1187 03/1908 08/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1439 1188 03/1908 02/01/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1440 1189 03/1908 14/02/1948
GNR C1 4-4-2 1441 1190 03/1908 21/05/1948
GNR C1 4-4-2 1443 1191 04/1908 02/05/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1444 1192 04/1908 02/10/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1442 1193 05/1908 23/01/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1445 1194 05/1908 22/01/1949
GNR C1 4-4-2 1446 1195 05/1908 03/01/1948
GNR C1 4-4-2 1447 1196 06/1908 07/11/1949
GNR C1 4-4-2 1448 1197 07/1908 15/06/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1450 1199 07/1908 15/06/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1449 1200 07/1908 04/07/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1451 1201 07/1908 29/04/1949
GNR J1 0-6-0 1 1198 08/1908 08/1947
GNR J1 0-6-0 2 1202 09/1908 08/1947
GNR J1 0-6-0 3 1203 09/1908 21/08/1954
GNR J1 0-6-0 4 1204 09/1908 12/01/1953
GNR J1 0-6-0 5 1205 09/1908 17/11/1952
GNR J1 0-6-0 6 1206 09/1908 19/05/1952
GNR J1 0-6-0 7 1207 10/1908 07/1951
GNR J1 0-6-0 8 1208 10/1908 04/02/1952
GNR J1 0-6-0 9 1209 10/1908 24/03/1952
GNR J1 0-6-0 10 1210 10/1908 31/03/1952
GNR J1 0-6-0 11 1211 10/1908 19/01/1953
GNR J1 0-6-0 12 1212 11/1908 08/1947
GNR J1 0-6-0 13 1213 11/1908 08/1947
GNR J1 0-6-0 14 1214 11/1908 22/11/1954
GNR J1 0-6-0 15 1215 11/1908 05/08/1953
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1281 1216 12/1908 17/08/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1282 1217 12/1908 09/12/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1283 1218 12/1908 27/01/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1284 1219 12/1908 26/09/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1285 1220 01/1909 14/09/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1286 1221 02/1909 18/09/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1287 1222 02/1909 25/11/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1288 1223 02/1909 26/08/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1289 1224 02/1909 21/10/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1290 1225 03/1909 30/05/1955
GNR D2 4-4-0 41 1226 04/1909 06/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 42 1227 04/1909 26/02/1948
GNR D2 4-4-0 43 1228 04/1909 06/1938
GNR D2 4-4-0 44 1229 05/1909 05/1947
GNR D2 4-4-0 45 1230 05/1909 01/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 46 1231 06/1909 11/1938
GNR D2 4-4-0 47 1232 06/1909 27/08/1948
GNR D2 4-4-0 48 1233 06/1909 07/1949
GNR D2 4-4-0 49 1234 06/1909 07/1946
GNR D2 4-4-0 50 1235 06/1909 07/1947
GNR Q1 0-8-0 446 1236 07/1909 27/02/1932
GNR Q1 0-8-0 447 1237 07/1909 18/10/1935
GNR Q1 0-8-0 448 1238 07/1909 12/02/1932
GNR Q1 0-8-0 449 1239 08/1909 27/08/1930
GNR Q1 0-8-0 450 1240 08/1909 15/06/1933
GNR Q2 0-8-0 451 1241 10/1909 09/1933
GNR Q2 0-8-0 452 1244 11/1909 02/1934
GNR Q2 0-8-0 453 1245 11/1909 05/1933
GNR Q2 0-8-0 454 1248 12/1909 02/1934
GNR Q2 0-8-0 455 1250 12/1909 08/1933
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1561 1256 03/1910 30/05/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1562 1257 03/1910 06/09/1953
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1563 1258 03/1910 11/03/1959
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1564 1259 03/1910 22/10/1956
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1565 1260 04/1910 17/01/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1566 1261 04/1910 15/06/1953
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1567 1262 04/1910 26/10/1956
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1568 1263 05/1910 12/01/1953
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1569 1264 05/1910 19/04/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1570 1265 05/1910 10/03/1959
GNR C1 4-4-2 1452 1276 08/1910 27/02/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1453 1277 08/1910 27/07/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1454 1278 08/1910 07/09/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1455 1279 08/1910 23/01/1950
GNR C1 4-4-2 1456 1280 09/1910 05/08/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1457 1281 09/1910 30/03/1946
GNR C1 4-4-2 1458 1282 10/1910 29/04/1947
GNR C1 4-4-2 1459 1283 10/1910 16/07/1943
GNR C1 4-4-2 1460 1284 10/1910 27/10/1945
GNR C1 4-4-2 1461 1285 11/1910 31/08/1945
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1571 1286 12/1910 12/10/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1572 1287 12/1910 13/03/1959
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1573 1288 12/1910 29/04/1958
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1574 1289 12/1910 07/02/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1575 1290 12/1910 16/05/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1576 1291 12/1910 15/11/1954
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1577 1292 01/1911 23/04/1957
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1578 1293 02/1911 04/11/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1579 1294 02/1911 28/03/1955
GNR D1 4-4-0 51 1296 03/1911 02/1946
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1580 1295 03/1911 22/08/1955
GNR D1 4-4-0 52 1297 04/1911 31/08/1950
GNR D1 4-4-0 53 1298 04/1911 03/1946
GNR D1 4-4-0 54 1299 04/1911 08/11/1948
GNR D1 4-4-0 55 1300 05/1911 06/1946
GNR D1 4-4-0 56 1301 05/1911 08/11/1948
GNR D1 4-4-0 57 1302 05/1911 13/07/1950
GNR D1 4-4-0 58 1303 05/1911 11/11/1950
GNR D1 4-4-0 59 1304 06/1911 12/1947
GNR D1 4-4-0 60 1305 06/1911 12/1946
GNR D1 4-4-0 61 1306 06/1911 07/1947
GNR D1 4-4-0 62 1307 06/1911 06/1946
GNR D1 4-4-0 63 1308 06/1911 10/1949
GNR D1 4-4-0 64 1309 07/1911 10/02/1950
GNR D1 4-4-0 65 1310 08/1911 09/1947
GNR J6 0-6-0 521 1311 08/1911 03/07/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 522 1312 09/1911 20/09/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 523 1313 09/1911 07/03/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 524 1314 10/1911 11/01/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 525 1315 10/1911 20/09/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 526 1316 10/1911 01/06/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 527 1317 11/1911 24/03/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 528 1318 11/1911 21/02/1962
GNR J6 0-6-0 529 1319 11/1911 27/04/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 530 1320 11/1911 05/05/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 531 1321 11/1911 03/03/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 532 1322 11/1911 01/08/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 533 1323 12/1911 29/11/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 534 1324 12/1911 08/11/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 535 1325 12/1911 20/11/1959
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1581 1326 12/1911 07/06/1954
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1582 1327 12/1911 03/04/1959
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1583 1328 12/1911 28/10/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1584 1329 02/1912 08/08/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1585 1330 02/1912 10/12/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1586 1331 02/1912 04/07/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1587 1332 03/1912 02/07/1956
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1588 1333 03/1912 08/03/1954
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1589 1334 03/1912 15/04/1957
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1590 1335 04/1912 06/08/1956
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1591 1336 04/1912 16/01/1956
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1592 1337 04/1912 01/09/1952
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1593 1338 04/1912 21/08/1958
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1594 1339 04/1912 13/03/1959
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1595 1340 05/1912 11/04/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1596 1341 05/1912 14/03/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1597 1342 06/1912 02/04/1959
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1598 1343 06/1912 12/12/1956
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1599 1344 06/1912 27/10/1952
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1600 1345 06/1912 06/1951
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1601 1346 06/1912 28/05/1956
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1602 1347 06/1912 30/08/1954
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1603 1348 06/1912 07/03/1955
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1604 1349 06/1912 30/09/1957
GNR N1 0-6-2T 1605 1350 06/1912 01/11/1954
GNR J2 0-6-0 71 1351 08/1912 14/12/1953
GNR J2 0-6-0 72 1352 08/1912 19/10/1953
GNR J2 0-6-0 73 1353 08/1912 01/1954
GNR K1 2-6-0 1630 1354 08/1912 12/06/1956
GNR J2 0-6-0 74 1355 09/1912 16/11/1953
GNR J2 0-6-0 75 1356 09/1912 02/03/1953
GNR J2 0-6-0 76 1357 09/1912 12/07/1954
GNR J2 0-6-0 77 1358 09/1912 11/1950
GNR J2 0-6-0 78 1359 10/1912 14/12/1953
GNR J2 0-6-0 79 1360 10/1912 09/11/1953
GNR J2 0-6-0 80 1361 10/1912 07/1946
GNR J6 0-6-0 536 1362 11/1912 05/04/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 537 1363 11/1912 03/01/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 538 1364 11/1912 02/01/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 539 1365 11/1912 05/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 540 1366 11/1912 22/10/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 541 1367 11/1912 14/09/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 542 1368 11/1912 21/02/1962
GNR J6 0-6-0 543 1369 12/1912 12/04/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 544 1370 12/1912 24/12/1957
GNR J6 0-6-0 545 1371 12/1912 25/11/1955
GNR K1 2-6-0 1631 1372 02/1913 30/12/1959
GNR K1 2-6-0 1632 1373 02/1913 22/09/1955
GNR K1 2-6-0 1633 1374 02/1913 04/11/1959
GNR K1 2-6-0 1634 1375 02/1913 03/01/1958
GNR K1 2-6-0 1635 1376 03/1913 26/01/1958
GNR K1 2-6-0 1636 1377 03/1913 07/05/1957
GNR K1 2-6-0 1637 1378 03/1913 06/06/1956
GNR K1 2-6-0 1638 1379 04/1913 06/12/1960
GNR K1 2-6-0 1639 1380 04/1913 25/06/1957
GNR J6 0-6-0 546 1381 05/1913 29/01/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 547 1382 05/1913 12/09/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 548 1383 05/1913 13/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 549 1384 05/1913 18/03/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 550 1385 05/1913 21/04/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 551 1386 06/1913 10/02/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 552 1387 06/1913 03/11/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 553 1388 06/1913 25/09/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 554 1389 06/1913 19/06/1962
GNR J6 0-6-0 555 1390 06/1913 23/12/1957
GNR J6 0-6-0 556 1391 06/1913 31/10/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 557 1392 06/1913 27/09/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 558 1393 07/1913 10/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 559 1394 07/1913 24/04/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 560 1395 07/1913 12/09/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 561 1396 07/1913 15/05/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 562 1397 08/1913 19/03/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 563 1398 08/1913 14/12/1955
GNR J6 0-6-0 564 1399 08/1913 18/02/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 565 1400 08/1913 19/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 566 1401 08/1913 24/03/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 567 1402 09/1913 12/12/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 568 1403 09/1913 01/01/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 569 1404 09/1913 18/09/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 570 1405 09/1913 13/11/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 571 1406 09/1913 09/06/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 572 1407 09/1913 01/01/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 573 1408 10/1913 26/11/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 574 1409 10/1913 12/04/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 575 1410 10/1913 14/05/1959
GNR J51 0-6-0T 157 1414 12/1913 20/03/1961
GNR O3 2-8-0 456 1411 12/1913 24/07/1951
GNR O3 2-8-0 457 1412 12/1913 17/03/1952
GNR O3 2-8-0 458 1413 01/1914 08/10/1951
GNR O3 2-8-0 459 1415 01/1914 15/10/1951
GNR J51 0-6-0T 158 1416 02/1914 27/07/1961
GNR J51 0-6-0T 159 1417 02/1914 23/09/1963
GNR J51 0-6-0T 161 1419 02/1914 22/09/1961
GNR J51 0-6-0T 160 1420 02/1914 05/10/1959
GNR J51 0-6-0T 162 1421 02/1914 28/03/1960
GNR O3 2-8-0 460 1418 02/1914 16/05/1951
GNR J51 0-6-0T 163 1422 03/1914 23/08/1961
GNR J51 0-6-0T 166 1423 03/1914 04/01/1960
GNR J51 0-6-0T 164 1424 03/1914 05/11/1960
GNR J51 0-6-0T 167 1427 04/1914 04/12/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1640 1425 04/1914 20/08/1957
GNR K2 2-6-0 1641 1426 04/1914 22/06/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1642 1428 04/1914 10/04/1957
GNR K2 2-6-0 1643 1429 04/1914 17/10/1957
GNR K2 2-6-0 1644 1430 04/1914 25/07/1956
GNR K2 2-6-0 1645 1431 05/1914 21/01/1957
GNR K2 2-6-0 1646 1432 05/1914 07/05/1957
GNR K2 2-6-0 1647 1433 05/1914 22/11/1956
GNR K2 2-6-0 1648 1434 06/1914 03/07/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1649 1435 06/1914 27/02/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 576 1436 07/1914 08/07/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 577 1437 07/1914 20/06/1962
GNR J6 0-6-0 578 1438 07/1914 28/07/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 579 1439 07/1914 15/08/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 580 1440 07/1914 09/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 581 1441 07/1914 27/01/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 582 1442 07/1914 14/02/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 583 1443 08/1914 24/01/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 584 1444 08/1914 07/07/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 585 1445 08/1914 19/12/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 586 1446 09/1914 03/12/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 587 1447 09/1914 13/04/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 588 1448 10/1914 30/11/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 589 1449 10/1914 01/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 590 1450 10/1914 31/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 591 1451 10/1914 01/08/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 592 1452 11/1914 26/11/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 593 1453 11/1914 29/08/1955
GNR J6 0-6-0 594 1454 11/1914 02/06/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 595 1455 11/1914 21/05/1958
GNR J51 0-6-0T 168 1456 12/1914 22/01/1962
GNR J51 0-6-0T 169 1457 12/1914 08/10/1960
GNR J51 0-6-0T 170 1458 12/1914 30/09/1960
GNR J51 0-6-0T 171 1459 02/1915 14/04/1961
GNR J51 0-6-0T 172 1460 02/1915 23/09/1963
GNR J51 0-6-0T 173 1461 03/1915 04/12/1960
GNR J51 0-6-0T 174 1462 04/1915 06/05/1959
GNR J51 0-6-0T 175 1463 04/1915 26/04/1961
GNR J51 0-6-0T 176 1464 06/1915 23/09/1963
GNR J51 0-6-0T 178 1465 06/1915 04/04/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1650 1466 01/1916 03/01/1961
GNR K2 2-6-0 1651 1467 02/1916 11/03/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1652 1469 05/1916 15/05/1962
GNR K2 2-6-0 1653 1468 06/1916 22/06/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1654 1470 07/1916 07/01/1957
GNR K2 2-6-0 1655 1471 10/1916 25/11/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1656 1472 11/1916 27/02/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1657 1473 11/1916 05/12/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1658 1474 12/1916 22/06/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1659 1475 12/1916 27/01/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 596 1476 10/1917 20/02/1962
GNR J6 0-6-0 597 1477 10/1917 06/06/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 598 1478 10/1917 09/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 599 1479 01/1918 04/03/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 600 1480 01/1918 27/10/1958
GNR O2 2-8-0 461 1481 05/1918 21/05/1948
GNR J6 0-6-0 601 1482 10/1918 08/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 602 1483 11/1918 04/10/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 603 1484 11/1918 08/07/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 604 1485 02/1919 14/05/1962
GNR J6 0-6-0 605 1486 02/1919 21/10/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 606 1487 03/1919 18/08/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 607 1488 04/1919 29/04/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 608 1489 04/1919 06/06/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 609 1490 04/1919 13/05/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 610 1491 05/1919 31/08/1959
GNR J51 0-6-0T 211 1492 06/1919 26/11/1962
GNR J51 0-6-0T 212 1493 06/1919 22/11/1960
GNR J51 0-6-0T 213 1494 07/1919 14/09/1959
GNR J51 0-6-0T 214 1495 07/1919 29/08/1960
GNR J51 0-6-0T 215 1496 07/1919 12/11/1960
GNR J51 0-6-0T 216 1497 07/1919 04/10/1960
GNR J51 0-6-0T 217 1498 07/1919 10/04/1961
GNR J51 0-6-0T 218 1499 08/1919 05/1965
GNR J51 0-6-0T 219 1500 08/1919 20/07/1961
GNR J51 0-6-0T 220 1501 08/1919 21/09/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 621 1502 12/1919 01/03/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 622 1503 12/1919 26/03/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 623 1504 12/1919 16/02/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 624 1505 12/1919 08/07/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 625 1506 01/1920 28/01/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 626 1507 02/1920 07/07/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 627 1508 02/1920 29/04/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 628 1510 03/1920 28/07/1958
GNR K3 2-6-0 1000 1509 03/1920 13/07/1962
GNR J6 0-6-0 629 1511 05/1920 18/01/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 630 1512 05/1920 31/10/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 1001 1513 06/1920 17/04/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1002 1514 09/1920 07/03/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 1003 1515 10/1920 13/07/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 1004 1516 12/1920 31/03/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1005 1517 12/1920 16/09/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1606 1518 12/1920 06/07/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 1006 1520 04/1921 07/03/1960
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1607 1519 04/1921 26/01/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 1007 1522 05/1921 04/11/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1608 1521 05/1921 26/11/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1609 1523 06/1921 09/12/1958
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1610 1524 06/1921 13/01/1958
GNR K3 2-6-0 1008 1526 07/1921 25/09/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1611 1525 07/1921 25/09/1958
GNR K3 2-6-0 1009 1529 08/1921 03/03/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1612 1527 08/1921 14/04/1958
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1613 1528 08/1921 17/03/1958
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1614 1530 08/1921 11/09/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1615 1531 08/1921 15/09/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 631 1532 12/1921 11/04/1960
GNR J6 0-6-0 632 1533 12/1921 03/10/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 633 1534 12/1921 02/09/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 634 1535 03/1922 19/12/1959
GNR J6 0-6-0 635 1537 06/1922 02/12/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 636 1538 06/1922 04/08/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 637 1540 07/1922 24/10/1958
GNR J6 0-6-0 638 1541 08/1922 20/06/1962
GNR J6 0-6-0 639 1542 08/1922 02/03/1961
GNR J6 0-6-0 640 1543 09/1922 31/08/1959
GNR J50 0-6-0T 221 1544 10/1922 20/07/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 222 1545 11/1922 26/04/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 223 1546 11/1922 23/09/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 224 1547 11/1922 13/12/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 225 1548 11/1922 14/02/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 226 1549 12/1922 18/03/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 227 1550 12/1922 13/02/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 228 1551 12/1922 17/04/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 229 1552 12/1922 09/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 230 1553 12/1922 02/05/1961
GNR O2 2-8-0 487 1574 01/11/1923 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 488 1575 03/11/1923 29/12/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 489 1576 14/11/1923 16/07/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 490 1577 30/11/1923 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 491 1578 05/12/1923 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 492 1579 15/12/1923 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 493 1580 22/12/1923 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 494 1581 29/12/1923 22/09/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3231 1583 02/1924 06/02/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3232 1586 02/1924 25/08/1961
GNR O2 2-8-0 495 1582 06/02/1924 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3496 1584 23/02/1924 03/09/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3233 1585 03/1924 12/12/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3234 1588 03/1924 12/12/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3235 1590 03/1924 23/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3497 1587 22/03/1924 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3498 1589 29/03/1924 22/09/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3236 1591 04/1924 23/09/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3237 1593 04/1924 26/04/1961
GNR O2 2-8-0 3499 1592 26/04/1924 03/04/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3238 1596 05/1924 23/09/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3239 1597 05/1924 05/10/1959
GNR O2 2-8-0 500 1594 22/05/1924 22/09/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 3240 1599 06/1924 29/10/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 3501 1595 07/06/1924 07/04/1963
LNER P1 2-8-2 2393 1619 27/06/1925 24/07/1945
NER J72 0-6-0T 500 1621 11/1925 04/09/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 512 1624 11/1925 15/12/1958
NER J72 0-6-0T 516 1626 11/1925 23/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 524 1627 11/1925 01/01/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 892 1622 11/1925 12/01/1956
GNR N2 0-6-2T 893 1623 11/1925 22/04/1960
GNR N2 0-6-2T 894 1625 11/1925 24/06/1961
LNER P1 2-8-2 2394 1620 14/11/1925 05/07/1945
NER J72 0-6-0T 542 1630 12/1925 16/08/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 566 1631 12/1925 17/12/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 571 1633 12/1925 18/05/1959
NER J72 0-6-0T 574 1634 12/1925 01/02/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 576 1635 12/1925 15/08/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 581 1636 12/1925 02/04/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 895 1628 12/1925 17/04/1958
GNR N2 0-6-2T 896 1629 12/1925 17/06/1957
GNR N2 0-6-2T 897 1632 12/1925 28/04/1959
GNR J50 0-6-0T 583 1637 03/1926 15/09/1958
GNR J50 0-6-0T 586 1638 03/1926 13/12/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 588 1639 04/1926 19/09/1958
GNR J50 0-6-0T 589 1640 04/1926 20/02/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 591 1641 04/1926 17/09/1960
GNR J50 0-6-0T 593 1642 04/1926 21/04/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 594 1643 04/1926 23/02/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 596 1644 05/1926 20/02/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 601 1645 05/1926 15/11/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 603 1646 06/1926 14/04/1959
GNR J50 0-6-0T 609 1647 08/1926 23/09/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 610 1648 08/1926 03/07/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 616 1649 08/1926 17/08/1960
GNR J50 0-6-0T 617 1650 08/1926 24/07/1959
GNR J50 0-6-0T 618 1651 08/1926 18/08/1960
GNR J50 0-6-0T 621 1652 09/1926 08/12/1959
GNR J50 0-6-0T 622 1653 09/1926 17/08/1960
GNR J50 0-6-0T 635 1654 09/1926 24/08/1960
GNR J50 0-6-0T 636 1655 10/1926 21/03/1960
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1037 1656 11/1926 31/08/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1041 1657 11/1926 25/07/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1045 1658 11/1926 09/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1058 1659 12/1926 16/06/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1063 1660 12/1926 13/02/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1068 1661 12/1926 01/10/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1069 1662 12/1926 23/09/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1070 1663 12/1926 01/08/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1074 1664 01/1927 16/06/1959
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1079 1665 01/1927 26/04/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1081 1666 03/1927 22/02/1960
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1082 1667 04/1927 19/04/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 1086 1668 05/1927 09/1962
GER N7 0-6-2T 2600 1669 11/1927 17/03/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2601 1670 11/1927 01/01/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 2602 1671 11/1927 18/10/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2603 1672 11/1927 22/06/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 2604 1673 11/1927 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2605 1674 11/1927 27/04/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2606 1675 12/1927 13/01/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2607 1676 12/1927 01/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2608 1677 12/1927 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2609 1678 12/1927 23/11/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 2610 1679 12/1927 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2611 1680 01/1928 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2612 1681 01/1928 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2613 1682 01/1928 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2614 1683 02/1928 12/02/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 2615 1684 02/1928 01/01/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 2616 1685 02/1928 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2617 1686 03/1928 24/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2618 1687 04/1928 01/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2619 1688 06/1928 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2620 1689 06/1928 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2621 1690 07/1928 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2622 1691 07/1928 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2623 1692 07/1928 16/09/1962
GNR A3 4-6-2 2743 1693 22/08/1928 14/10/1963
GNR A3 4-6-2 2744 1694 23/08/1928 28/10/1963
GER N7 0-6-2T 2624 1696 09/1928 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2625 1697 09/1928 24/11/1960
GNR A3 4-6-2 2745 1695 08/09/1928 12/10/1964
GER N7 0-6-2T 2626 1698 10/1928 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2627 1699 10/1928 04/12/1960
GNR A3 4-6-2 2746 1700 26/10/1928 12/10/1964
GER N7 0-6-2T 2628 1701 11/1928 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2629 1702 11/1928 03/02/1959
GNR A3 4-6-2 2747 1703 24/11/1928 28/04/1962
GER N7 0-6-2T 2630 1704 12/1928 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2631 1706 12/1928 17/10/1960
GNR A3 4-6-2 2748 1705 20/12/1928 24/02/1964
GNR A3 4-6-2 2749 1707 26/01/1929 10/04/1961
GNR A3 4-6-2 2750 l708 23/02/1929 09/09/1963
GNR A3 4-6-2 2751 1709 07/03/1929 24/08/1963
GNR K3 2-6-0 1300 1711 04/1929 12/07/1962
GNR A3 4-6-2 2752 l7l0 20/04/1929 28/10/1963
GNR K3 2-6-0 1312 1712 05/1929 03/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1318 1713 06/1929 03/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1331 1714 06/1929 08/05/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1345 1715 07/1929 22/05/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 1364 1716 07/1929 10/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1365 1717 07/1929 17/09/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 1367 1718 08/1929 24/07/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1368 1719 08/1929 06/08/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 1386 1720 09/1929 16/06/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 1387 1721 10/1929 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1388 1722 10/1929 21/04/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 1389 1723 10/1929 28/05/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 1391 1724 10/1929 03/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1392 1725 11/1929 23/07/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1394 1726 11/1929 03/11/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 1395 1727 11/1929 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1396 1728 11/1929 02/03/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1397 1729 12/1929 25/09/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 1398 1730 12/1929 04/11/1962
GNR A3 4-6-2 2595 1731 22/02/1930 23/11/1964
GNR A3 4-6-2 2596 1733 22/02/1930 12/10/1964
GNR J50 0-6-0T 2789 1732 03/1930 16/09/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 2790 1734 03/1930 21/07/1959
GNR J50 0-6-0T 2791 1735 03/1930 03/08/1959
GNR J50 0-6-0T 2792 1737 04/1930 29/07/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 2793 1739 04/1930 09/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 2794 1740 04/1930 23/09/1963
GNR A3 4-6-2 2597 1736 07/04/1930 18/11/1963
GNR A3 4-6-2 2795 1738 19/04/1930 28/10/1963
GNR A3 4-6-2 2796 1741 17/05/1930 19/06/1965
GNR A3 4-6-2 2797 1742 04/06/1930 11/04/1963
GNR A3 4-6-2 2598 1743 14/06/1930 28/10/1963
LNER W1 4-6-4     21/06/1930 01/06/1959
GNR A3 4-6-2 2599 1744 12/07/1930 14/10/1963
LNER V1 2-6-2T 2922 1767 10/1931 05/03/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 2954 1773 23/04/1932 28/04/1961
GNR O2 2-8-0 2955 1774 19/05/1932 16/10/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 2956 1775 28/05/1932 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 2957 1776 23/06/1932 08/11/1960
GNR O2 2-8-0 2958 1777 07/07/1932 25/06/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 2959 1778 11/07/1932 27/04/1961
GNR O2 2-8-0 2960 1779 29/07/1932 08/11/1960
GNR O2 2-8-0 2961 1780 17/08/1932 14/03/1961
GNR O2 2-8-0 2430 1781 29/11/1933 07/05/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 2431 1782 08/12/1933 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 2432 1783 15/12/1933 04/07/1961
GNR O2 2-8-0 2433 1784 28/12/1933 04/05/1961
GNR O2 2-8-0 2434 1785 20/01/1934 19/10/1960
GNR O2 2-8-0 2435 1786 27/01/1934 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 2436 1787 20/02/1934 29/12/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 2437 1788 15/03/1934 22/09/1963
LNER P2 2-8-2 2001 1789 22/05/1934 08/02/1960
GNR A3 4-6-2 2501 1791 09/07/1934 23/11/1964
GNR A3 4-6-2 2500 1790 10/07/1934 04/09/1961
GNR A3 4-6-2 2502 1792 25/07/1934 12/12/1963
GNR A3 4-6-2 2503 1793 11/08/1934 18/11/1963
GNR A3 4-6-2 2504 1794 09/09/1934 14/03/1963
LNER P2 2-8-2 2002 1796 06/10/1934 03/07/1961
GNR A3 4-6-2 2505 1795 27/10/1934 06/07/1964
GNR A3 4-6-2 2507 1798 01/12/1934 13/07/1964
GNR A3 4-6-2 2506 1797 19/12/1934 04/12/1965
GNR A3 4-6-2 2508 1500 09/02/1935 14/05/1964
LNER A4 4-6-2 2509 1818 07/09/1935 29/12/1962
LNER A4 4-6-2 2510 1819 21/09/1935 25/04/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 2511 1821 05/11/1935 19/03/1965
LNER A4 4-6-2 2512 1823 18/12/1935 20/10/1963
LNER P2 2-8-2 2003 1836 13/06/1936 27/11/1959
LNER V2 2-6-2 4771 1837 13/06/1936 21/08/1962
LNER P2 2-8-2 2004 1839 11/07/1936 23/01/1961
LNER P2 2-8-2 2005 1840 08/08/1936 10/11/1959
LNER V2 2-6-2 4772 1841 08/08/1936 01/10/1962
LNER P2 2-8-2 2006 1842 05/09/1936 04/04/1961
LNER V2 2-6-2 4773 1843 03/10/1936 05/03/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4774 1845 30/10/1936 16/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4775 1846 28/11/1936 05/12/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 4482 1847 22/12/1936 30/10/1964
LNER A4 4-6-2 4483 1848 26/12/1936 05/09/1966
LNER A4 4-6-2 4484 1849 23/01/1937 20/10/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 4485 1850 20/02/1937 21/12/1965
LNER A4 4-6-2 4486 1851 13/03/1937 03/09/1965
LNER A4 4-6-2 4487 1852 20/03/1937 29/12/1962
LNER A4 4-6-2 4489 1854 04/05/1937 29/05/1965
LNER A4 4-6-2 4491 1856 22/06/1937 20/08/1964
LNER A4 4-6-2 4490 1855 25/06/1937 11/05/1964
LNER A4 4-6-2 4492 1857 27/06/1937 18/04/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 4488 1853 29/06/1937 01/06/1966
LNER A4 4-6-2 4493 1858 26/07/1937 20/10/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 4494 1859 12/08/1937 29/12/1962
LNER A4 4-6-2 4495 1860 30/08/1937 29/12/1962
LNER A4 4-6-2 4496 1861 04/09/1937 20/07/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 4497 1862 02/10/1937 29/10/1965
LNER A4 4-6-2 4498 1863 30/10/1937 01/02/1966
LNER A4 4-6-2 4463 1865 27/11/1937 19/06/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 4462 1864 10/12/1937 17/07/1966
LNER A4 4-6-2 4464 1866 18/12/1937 05/09/1966
LNER A4 4-6-2 4465 1867 08/01/1938 20/03/1964
LNER A4 4-6-2 4466 1868 26/01/1938 03/09/1965
LNER A4 4-6-2 4467 1869 19/02/1938 20/10/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 4468 1870 03/03/1938 25/04/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 4469 1871 30/03/1938 06/06/1942
LNER A4 4-6-2 4499 1872 12/04/1938 04/05/1964
LNER A4 4-6-2 4500 1873 26/04/1938 12/10/1964
LNER A4 4-6-2 4900 1874 17/05/1938 20/10/1963
LNER A4 4-6-2 4901 1875 08/06/1938 12/03/1964
LNER A4 4-6-2 4902 1876 28/06/1938 29/12/1962
LNER A4 4-6-2 4903 1877 01/07/1938 24/08/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4843 1898 22/04/1939 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4844 1899 18/05/1939 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4845 1900 27/06/1939 22/08/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4846 1901 28/07/1939 05/03/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4847 1912 30/05/1940 19/10/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4848 1913 26/06/1940 13/02/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4849 1915 12/07/1940 22/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4850 1916 06/08/1940 03/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4851 1917 04/09/1940 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4852 1918 12/10/1940 16/06/1963
  76 Bo+Bo 6701   19/02/1941 22/03/1970
LNER V4 2-6-2 3401 1919 25/02/1941 14/03/1957
LNER V4 2-6-2 3402 1920 21/03/1941 26/11/1957
LNER V2 2-6-2 3655 1921 24/06/1941 05/03/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3656 1922 25/06/1941 21/06/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 3657 1923 26/07/1941 23/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3658 1924 23/08/1941 03/09/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 3659 1925 22/10/1941 25/05/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3660 1926 23/10/1941 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3661 1927 07/01/1942 22/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3662 1928 17/02/1942 07/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3663 1929 03/03/1942 23/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3664 1930 09/03/1942 29/12/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 3833 1931 22/05/1942 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3834 1932 10/06/1942 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3835 1933 26/06/1942 10/10/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 3836 1934 31/07/1942 29/12/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 3837 1935 21/08/1942 26/11/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 3838 1936 02/09/1942 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3839 1937 12/09/1942 03/11/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3840 1938 21/09/1942 09/05/1960
GNR O2 2-8-0 3841 1939 05/10/1942 29/12/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 3842 1940 10/10/1942 04/05/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3843 1941 23/10/1942 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3844 1942 03/11/1942 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3845 1943 06/11/1942 03/11/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3846 1944 18/11/1942 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3847 1945 21/11/1942 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3848 1946 28/11/1942 07/05/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3849 1947 04/12/1942 10/09/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 3850 1948 11/12/1942 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3851 1949 17/12/1942 03/11/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3852 1950 21/12/1942 09/12/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 3853 1951 26/12/1942 02/07/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3854 1952 31/12/1942 03/11/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3855 1953 02/01/1943 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3856 1954 07/01/1943 07/06/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 3857 1955 21/01/1943 22/09/1963
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8510   06/1943 20/01/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8511   03/1944 25/06/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8512   04/1944 24/09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8513   04/1944 18/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8514   05/1944 29/10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8515   06/1944 08/01/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8516   07/1944 24/12/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8517   07/1944 02/12/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8518 1966 08/1944 24/07/1965
  DES1 0-6-0 8000 1960 12/08/1944 05/08/1967
  DES1 0-6-0 8001 1963 12/08/1944 15/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8519   09/1944 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8520   10/1944 09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8521   10/1944 07/05/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8522   11/1944 19/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8523   11/1944 19/02/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8524   12/1944 08/04/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8525   12/1944 01/10/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8526   12/1944 09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8527   12/1944 29/10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8528   02/1945 05/08/1967
  DES1 0-6-0 8002 1973 22/03/1945 05/08/1967
  DES1 0-6-0 8003 1978 22/03/1945 06/05/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8529   04/1945 29/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8530 1980 04/1945 19/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8531   04/1945 16/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8532   04/1945 16/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8533   05/1945 18/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8534   05/1945 21/10/1967
LNER L1 2-6-4T 9000 1984 05/1945 04/12/1960
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8535   06/1945 12/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8536   06/1945 21/01/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8537   07/1945 30/10/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8538 1990 08/1945 11/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8539 1989 08/1945 08/01/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3148 1554 10/1945 11/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3149 1555 10/1945 27/05/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3150 1556 10/1945 09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3151 1557 11/1945 07/01/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3152 1558 11/1945 16/12/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3153 1559 12/1945 23/12/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3154 1560 12/1945 27/11/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3155 1561 12/1945 12/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3156 1562 01/1946 15/01/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3157 1563 01/1946 26/02/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3158 1991 02/1946 13/04/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3159 1992 02/1946 16/12/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3160 1993 03/1946 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3161 1994 03/1946 25/02/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3162 1995 03/1946 16/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3163 1996 03/1946 19/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3164 1997 04/1946 07/08/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3165 1998 05/1946 08/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3166 1999 05/1946 11/12/1965
LNER A2 4-6-2 500 2000 24/05/1946 16/06/1963
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3167 2001 06/1946 19/01/1964
LNER A2 4-6-2 511 2002 20/07/1946 12/11/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 512 2003 24/08/1946 19/06/1965
LNER A2 4-6-2 513 2004 31/08/1946 27/04/1963
LNER A2 4-6-2 514 2005 28/09/1946 29/12/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 515 2006 19/10/1946 12/11/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 516 2007 02/11/1946 12/11/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 517 2008 28/11/1946 12/11/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 518 2009 28/12/1946 12/11/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 519 2010 01/02/1947 18/12/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 520 2011 29/03/1947 16/06/1963
LNER A2 4-6-2 521 2012 08/05/1947 12/11/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 522 2013 19/06/1947 19/06/1965
LNER A2 4-6-2 523 2014 02/08/1947 16/06/1963
LNER A2 4-6-2 524 2015 26/09/1947 15/02/1965
LNER A2 4-6-2 525 2016 24/12/1947 27/03/1963
LNER A2 4-6-2 526 2017 09/01/1948 12/11/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 527 2018 30/01/1948 24/04/1965
LNER A2 4-6-2 528 2019 21/02/1948 02/06/1966
LNER A2 4-6-2 529 2020 21/02/1948 29/12/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 530 2021 04/03/1948 19/11/1966
LNER A2 4-6-2 531 2022 12/03/1948 10/12/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 60532 2023 25/03/1948 31/12/1966
LNER A2 4-6-2 60533 2024 09/04/1948 15/06/1963
LNER A2 4-6-2 60534 2025 23/04/1948 29/12/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 60535 2026 05/05/1948 19/06/1965
LNER A2 4-6-2 60536 2027 14/05/1948 17/12/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 60537 2028 11/06/1948 29/12/1962
LNER A2 4-6-2 60538 2029 18/06/1948 12/11/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60114 2031 06/08/1948 26/12/1964
LNER A2 4-6-2 60539 2030 27/08/1948 12/11/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60115 2032 03/09/1948 12/11/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60116 2033 08/10/1948 14/06/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60117 2034 22/10/1948 21/06/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60118 2035 12/11/1948 04/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60119 2036 26/11/1948 31/05/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60120 2037 10/12/1948 20/01/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60121 2038 22/12/1948 04/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60122 2039 24/12/1948 17/12/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60123 2040 10/02/1949 01/10/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60124 2041 23/03/1949 27/03/1966
LNER A1 4-6-2 60125 2043 22/04/1949 04/07/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60126 2042 27/04/1949 18/01/1965
  D3/14 0-6-0 15004   30/04/1949 05/10/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60127 2044 13/05/1949 14/06/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60128 2045 19/05/1949 10/01/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60129 2046 15/06/1949 11/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60153 2047 26/08/1949 02/11/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60154 2048 23/09/1949 04/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60155 2049 29/09/1949 04/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60156 2050 19/10/1949 10/05/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60157 2051 03/11/1949 10/01/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60158 2052 17/11/1949 26/12/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60159 2053 24/11/1949 14/10/1963
LNER A1 4-6-2 60160 2054 02/12/1949 12/12/1963
LNER A1 4-6-2 60161 2055 19/12/1949 14/10/1963
LNER A1 4-6-2 60162 2056 23/12/1949 28/10/1963
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43052   10/07/1950 05/11/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43051   31/07/1950 23/01/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43050   31/08/1950 09/09/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43053   31/08/1950 20/04/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43054   31/08/1950 07/12/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43055   31/08/1950 01/07/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43056   31/08/1950 31/12/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43057   31/08/1950 31/12/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43058   29/09/1950 26/12/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43059   11/10/1950 10/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43060   20/10/1950 26/12/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43061   27/10/1950 05/01/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43062   03/11/1950 20/06/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43063   10/11/1950 09/09/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43064   17/11/1950 20/06/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43065   24/11/1950 10/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43066   01/12/1950 07/01/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43067   14/12/1950 11/04/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43068   20/12/1950 05/01/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43069   31/12/1950 04/09/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43107   18/05/1951 28/12/1963
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43108   25/05/1951 14/11/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43109   14/06/1951 14/11/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43110   14/06/1951 28/12/1963
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43111   04/07/1951 20/06/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43137   13/07/1951 09/09/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43138   20/07/1951 04/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43139   27/07/1951 30/09/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43140   08/08/1951 06/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43141   15/08/1951 11/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43142   22/08/1951 28/12/1963
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43143   30/08/1951 20/06/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43144   05/09/1951 11/04/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43145   20/09/1951 10/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43146   28/09/1951 03/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43147   08/10/1951 26/12/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43148   17/10/1951 11/04/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43149   24/10/1951 14/11/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43150   07/11/1951 03/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43151   09/11/1951 18/12/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43152   23/11/1951 05/01/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43153   04/12/1951 20/06/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43154   14/12/1951 26/12/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43155   28/12/1951 10/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43156   07/01/1952 10/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43157   03/07/1952 10/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43158   16/07/1952 03/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43159   01/08/1952 20/06/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43160   14/08/1952 10/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43161   03/09/1952 20/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76020   12/1952 23/04/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76021   12/1952 19/10/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76022   12/1952 27/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76023   12/1952 09/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76024   01/1953 31/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76025   10/1953 31/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76026   10/1953 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76027   10/1953 03/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76028   10/1953 10/05/1964
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76029   11/1953 04/10/1964
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76030   11/1953 25/04/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76031   11/1953 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76032   12/1953 02/08/1964
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76033   12/1953 01/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76034   12/1953 13/09/1964
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76035   05/1954 07/05/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76036   06/1954 28/01/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76037   06/1954 10/06/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76038   07/1954 10/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76039   07/1954 10/06/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76040   07/1954 08/04/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76041   07/1954 01/04/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76042   08/1954 25/06/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76043   08/1954 10/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76044   08/1954 08/10/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80106   22/10/1954 12/10/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80107   29/10/1954 14/09/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80108   05/11/1954 08/05/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80109   18/11/1954 13/11/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80110   18/11/1954 08/05/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80111   26/11/1954 29/11/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80112   03/12/1954 24/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80113   14/12/1954 02/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80114   29/12/1954 31/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80115   31/12/1954 12/10/1964
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76045   03/1955 10/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76046   03/1955 01/05/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76047   03/1955 03/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76048   03/1955 04/02/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76049   01/04/1955 24/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76053   21/04/1955 29/01/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76054   26/04/1955 18/10/1964
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76055   29/04/1955 17/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76056   05/1955 07/11/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76057   05/1955 02/10/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76058   06/1955 26/03/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76059   06/1955 25/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76060   07/1955 05/12/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76061   07/1955 08/01/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76062   07/1955 03/10/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73100   26/08/1955 20/01/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101   01/09/1955 24/08/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73102   14/09/1955 31/12/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73103   21/09/1955 22/10/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73104   27/09/1955 22/10/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73105   12/1955 23/09/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106   12/1955 19/06/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73107   12/1955 02/09/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73108   12/1955 31/12/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73109   01/1956 29/10/1964
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73120   01/1956 31/12/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73121   01/1956 01/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73122   01/1956 10/09/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73123   02/1956 08/05/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73124   02/1956 06/12/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76063   07/1956 09/04/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76064   07/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76065   07/1956 10/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76066   07/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76050   08/1956 10/09/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76051   08/1956 29/04/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76052   08/1956 10/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76067   08/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76068   08/1956 10/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76069   08/1956 18/06/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76070   09/1956 17/08/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73110   10/1956 29/01/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73111   10/1956 10/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73112   10/1956 20/06/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73113   10/1956 22/01/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76071   10/1956 17/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76072   10/1956 12/10/1964
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76073   10/1956 26/06/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73114   11/1956 05/06/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73115   11/1956 19/03/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73116   11/1956 29/11/1964
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73117   11/1956 19/03/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76074   11/1956 19/10/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73118   12/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73119   12/1956 19/03/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73155   12/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73156   12/1956 25/11/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73157   12/1956 11/05/1968
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73158   12/1956 14/10/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73159   01/1957 28/10/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73160   01/1957 11/11/1967
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73161   02/1957 26/12/1964
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73162   02/1957 21/05/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73163   02/1957 20/11/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73164   02/1957 26/12/1964
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73165   02/1957 09/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73166   03/1957 31/12/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73167   04/1957 07/08/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73168   04/1957 19/12/1965
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73169   04/1957 02/10/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73170   04/1957 19/06/1966
BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73171   05/1957 02/10/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76100   05/1957 17/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76101   06/1957 10/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76102   06/1957 12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76103   06/1957 17/07/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76104   07/1957 01/05/1967
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76105   07/1957 24/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76106   07/1957 18/09/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76107   08/1957 22/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76108   08/1957 14/07/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76109   08/1957 23/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76110   08/1957 10/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76111   08/1957 03/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76112   09/1957 29/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76113   10/1957 31/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76114   10/1957 31/12/1966
  10 0-6-0 D3497   14/12/1957 13/04/1968
  10 0-6-0 D3498   21/12/1957 01/06/1968
  10 0-6-0 D3499   28/12/1957 20/01/1968
  10 0-6-0 D3500   01/01/1958 20/01/1968
  10 0-6-0 D3501   11/01/1958 29/06/1968
  10 0-6-0 D3502   15/01/1958 03/02/1968
  08 0-6-0 D3608   28/02/1958 30/06/2008
  08 0-6-0 D3609   01/03/1958 16/08/1988
  08 0-6-0 D3610   08/03/1958
  08 0-6-0 D3611   12/03/1958 14/06/1990
  08 0-6-0 D3652   19/03/1958 06/10/1985
  08 0-6-0 D3653   22/03/1958 07/01/1994
  08 0-6-0 D3654   29/03/1958 01/06/2004
  08 0-6-0 D3655   18/04/1958
  08 0-6-0 D3656   29/04/1958 15/07/1985
  08 0-6-0 D3657   06/05/1958 30/10/1988
  08 0-6-0 D3658   15/05/1958 20/09/1988
  08 0-6-0 D3659   24/05/1958 30/10/1988
  08 0-6-0 D3660   31/05/1958 22/02/1981
  08 0-6-0 D3661   06/06/1958 28/02/2007
  08 0-6-0 D3662   20/06/1958 13/08/1993
  08 0-6-0 D3663   20/06/1958 01/10/1991
  08 0-6-0 D3664   11/07/1958 30/09/2008
  08 0-6-0 D3680   19/07/1958 22/06/1986
  08 0-6-0 D3681   31/07/1958
  08 0-6-0 D3682   13/08/1958 12/01/1986
  08 0-6-0 D3683   27/08/1958 22/06/1993
  08 0-6-0 D3684   02/09/1958 04/08/1985
  08 0-6-0 D3685   06/09/1958
  08 0-6-0 D3686   18/09/1958 06/01/1986
  03 0-6-0 D2044   29/11/1958 21/01/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2045   06/12/1958 04/02/1979
  03 0-6-0 D2046   13/12/1958 03/10/1971
  03 0-6-0 D2047   19/12/1958 30/07/1979
  03 0-6-0 D2048   23/12/1958 08/10/1972
  03 0-6-0 D2049   24/12/1958 17/08/1971
  71 Bo-Bo E5000   24/12/1958 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E5024   24/12/1958 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E6104   24/12/1958 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 74004   24/12/1958 12/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2050   17/01/1959 07/08/1978
  03 0-6-0 D2051   27/01/1959 14/12/1972
  71 Bo-Bo E5001   31/01/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71001   31/01/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2052   04/02/1959 07/05/1972
  03 0-6-0 D2082   19/02/1959 31/12/1969
  71 Bo-Bo E5002   24/02/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71002   24/02/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2083   06/03/1959 31/05/1969
  03 0-6-0 D2084   19/03/1959 05/07/1987
  71 Bo-Bo E5003   20/03/1959 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E6107   20/03/1959 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 74007   20/03/1959 12/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2085   03/04/1959 31/12/1969
  03 0-6-0 D2053   11/04/1959 07/05/1972
  03 0-6-0 D2054   11/04/1959 19/11/1972
  71 Bo-Bo E5004   16/04/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71004   16/04/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2055   01/05/1959 30/06/1974
  03 0-6-0 D2056   09/05/1959 15/06/1980
  71 Bo-Bo E5005   12/05/1959 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E6108   12/05/1959 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 74008   12/05/1959 12/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2057   15/05/1959 03/10/1971
  03 0-6-0 D2058   23/05/1959 17/06/1975
  03 0-6-0 D2059   29/05/1959 05/07/1987
  71 Bo-Bo E5006   02/06/1959 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E6103   02/06/1959 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 74003   02/06/1959 12/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2060   10/06/1959 19/12/1982
  71 Bo-Bo E5007   19/06/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71007   19/06/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2061   20/06/1959 12/10/1980
  03 0-6-0 D2062   03/07/1959 12/10/1980
  03 0-6-0 D2063   14/07/1959 26/11/1987
  71 Bo-Bo E5008   17/07/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71008   17/07/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2064   23/07/1959 21/06/1981
  71 Bo-Bo E5009   08/08/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71009   08/08/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2065   11/08/1959 31/12/1972
  03 0-6-0 D2066   17/08/1959 08/01/1988
  03 0-6-0 D2067   25/08/1959 09/08/1981
  03 0-6-0 D2068   02/09/1959 05/04/1976
  71 Bo-Bo E5010   04/09/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71010   04/09/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2069   19/09/1959 27/11/1983
  71 Bo-Bo E5011   30/09/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71011   30/09/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2070   02/10/1959 28/11/1971
  03 0-6-0 D2071   13/10/1959 07/05/1972
  71 Bo-Bo E5012   27/10/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71012   27/10/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2072   31/10/1959 08/03/1981
  03 0-6-0 D2073   05/11/1959 23/05/1989
  03 0-6-0 D2074   11/11/1959 07/05/1972
  03 0-6-0 D2075   24/11/1959 18/07/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2076   04/12/1959 05/04/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2077   07/12/1959 01/10/1972
  71 Bo-Bo E5013   08/12/1959 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71013   08/12/1959 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2078   24/12/1959 08/01/1988
  03 0-6-0 D2079   07/01/1960 03/06/1996
  03 0-6-0 D2080   22/01/1960 09/11/1980
  03 0-6-0 D2081   05/02/1960 12/10/1980
  71 Bo-Bo E5014   20/02/1960 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71014   20/02/1960 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E5015   20/02/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E6101   20/02/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 74001   20/02/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E6109   23/03/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 74009   23/03/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E5017   23/03/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E5016   05/04/1960 06/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E6102   05/04/1960 06/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 74002   05/04/1960 06/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E5018   27/04/1960 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E5003   27/04/1960 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71003   27/04/1960 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2089   05/05/1960 06/11/1987
  03 0-6-0 D2090   05/05/1960 18/07/1976
  71 Bo-Bo E5019   17/05/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E6105   17/05/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 74005   17/05/1960 12/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2091   26/05/1960 21/03/1974
  03 0-6-0 D2092   27/05/1960 31/08/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2093   28/05/1960 03/10/1971
  03 0-6-0 D2095   15/06/1960 03/12/1975
  71 Bo-Bo E5020   15/06/1960 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E5005   15/06/1960 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71005   15/06/1960 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2096   16/06/1960 02/12/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2097   18/06/1960 16/06/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2094   28/06/1960 08/01/1988
  03 0-6-0 D2098   02/07/1960 08/11/1975
  03 0-6-0 D2099   15/07/1960 10/02/1976
  71 Bo-Bo E5021   25/07/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E6110   25/07/1960 12/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 74010   25/07/1960 12/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2100   27/07/1960 22/11/1971
  03 0-6-0 D2101   09/08/1960 21/11/1971
  03 0-6-0 D2102   17/08/1960 10/02/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2103   27/08/1960 04/02/1979
  71 Bo-Bo E5022   31/08/1960 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo E5006   31/08/1960 11/1977
  71 Bo-Bo 71006   31/08/1960 11/1977
  03 0-6-0 D2104   24/09/1960 17/06/1975
  03 0-6-0 D2105   06/10/1960 16/02/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2106   15/10/1960 17/09/1975
  03 0-6-0 D2107   22/10/1960 09/08/1981
  71 Bo-Bo E5023   25/10/1960 06/1976
  71 Bo-Bo E6106   25/10/1960 06/1976
  71 Bo-Bo 74006   25/10/1960 06/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2108   29/10/1960 18/11/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2109   05/11/1960 13/07/1975
  03 0-6-0 D2110   18/11/1960 02/02/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2111   25/11/1960 27/07/1980
  03 0-6-0 D2112   09/12/1960 05/07/1987
  03 0-6-0 D2113   23/12/1960 03/08/1975
  03 0-6-0 D2385   24/03/1961 15/02/1970
  03 0-6-0 D2386   24/03/1961 27/03/1976
  03 0-6-0 D2387   29/03/1961 30/12/1972
  03 0-6-0 D2388   06/04/1961 30/07/1972
  03 0-6-0 D2389   26/04/1961 06/02/1983
  03 0-6-0 D2390   16/05/1961 11/05/1968
  85 Bo-Bo E3057   03/06/1961 17/05/1989
  85 Bo-Bo E3058   03/06/1961 01/11/1991
  03 0-6-0 D2391   15/06/1961 22/11/1970
  03 0-6-0 D2392   16/06/1961 19/06/1971
  03 0-6-0 D2393   03/07/1961 31/12/1969
  85 Bo-Bo E3059   17/07/1961 01/03/1990
  03 0-6-0 D2394   21/07/1961 23/11/1968
  85 Bo-Bo E3060   28/07/1961 25/05/1990
  03 0-6-0 D2395   12/08/1961 11/05/1968
  85 Bo-Bo E3056   15/08/1961 16/10/1985
  03 0-6-0 D2396   23/08/1961 11/05/1968
  03 0-6-0 D2397   15/09/1961 05/07/1987
  03 0-6-0 D2398   30/09/1961 31/10/1971
  03 0-6-0 D2399   21/10/1961 05/07/1987
  85 Bo-Bo E3063   23/10/1961 10/09/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3064   26/11/1961 01/05/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3065   26/11/1961 01/05/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3062   07/12/1961 01/07/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3061   20/12/1961 01/11/1992
  85 Bo-Bo E3067   17/01/1962 01/07/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3086   23/03/1962 21/05/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3066   17/04/1962 01/07/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3068   01/05/1962 17/10/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3069   19/05/1962 16/10/1989
  85 Bo-Bo E3072   06/07/1962 04/08/1987
  85 Bo-Bo E3070   19/07/1962 08/09/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3087   26/10/1962 01/07/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3071   27/10/1962 01/07/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3074   05/12/1962 01/12/1989
  85 Bo-Bo E3075   19/01/1963 17/10/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3073   31/01/1963 15/10/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3088   10/02/1963 29/07/1984
  85 Bo-Bo E3077   02/03/1963 19/02/1989
  85 Bo-Bo E3078   19/03/1963 02/04/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3080   30/03/1963 08/01/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3076   19/04/1963 01/10/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3082   07/06/1963 29/05/1983
  85 Bo-Bo E3089   14/06/1963 17/10/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3083   17/08/1963 10/01/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3081   27/09/1963 04/05/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3091   29/09/1963 01/10/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3079   10/10/1963 01/05/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3090   29/10/1963 01/07/1991
  85 Bo-Bo E3093   01/11/1963 02/01/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3094   22/01/1964 05/03/1987
  85 Bo-Bo E3092   05/02/1964 03/09/1990
  85 Bo-Bo E3084   07/05/1964 17/05/1988
  85 Bo-Bo E3095   21/12/1964 28/10/1991
  86 Bo-Bo E3105   19/06/1965 06/2004
  86 Bo-Bo E3106   19/06/1965 10/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3108   19/06/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3109   19/06/1965 02/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3110   19/06/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3111   19/06/1965
  85 Bo-Bo E3085   11/07/1965 11/09/1990
  86 Bo-Bo E3101   21/08/1965 05/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3102   21/08/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3103   21/08/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3112   24/08/1965 11/2003
  86 Bo-Bo E3113   24/08/1965 07/2005
  86 Bo-Bo E3118   25/09/1965 11/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3119   25/09/1965 30/09/2008
  86 Bo-Bo E3120   25/09/1965 03/1999
  86 Bo-Bo E3121   25/09/1965 01/2000
  86 Bo-Bo E3104   27/09/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3107   27/09/1965 10/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3114   27/09/1965 09/2005
  86 Bo-Bo E3115   27/09/1965 09/1999
  86 Bo-Bo E3116   27/09/1965 10/2004
  86 Bo-Bo E3117   27/09/1965 10/2004
  86 Bo-Bo E3122   27/09/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3124   26/10/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3127   26/10/1965 10/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3123   28/10/1965 04/2005
  86 Bo-Bo E3126   03/11/1965 30/09/2008
  86 Bo-Bo E3128   23/11/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3129   24/11/1965 30/09/2008
  86 Bo-Bo E3125   25/11/1965 10/2004
  86 Bo-Bo E3130   07/12/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3133   13/12/1965 10/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3132   15/12/1965 05/2003
  86 Bo-Bo E3134   15/12/1965 07/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3136   22/12/1965
  86 Bo-Bo E3131   28/12/1965 10/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3137   15/01/1966 10/2003
  86 Bo-Bo E3135   21/01/1966 10/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3138   21/01/1966 30/09/2008
  86 Bo-Bo E3139   26/01/1966 11/2002
  86 Bo-Bo E3140   01/03/1966 07/2002
  56 Co-Co 56031   24/05/1977
  56 Co-Co 56032   19/07/1977
  56 Co-Co 56033   02/08/1977 10/2003
  56 Co-Co 56034   25/08/1977 06/2005
  56 Co-Co 56035   13/10/1977 14/07/2000
  56 Co-Co 56037   20/01/1978
  56 Co-Co 56039   07/02/1978 01/2004
  56 Co-Co 56040   15/02/1978 08/2005
  56 Co-Co 56041   15/02/1978 02/2003
  56 Co-Co 56038   19/02/1978
  56 Co-Co 56043   31/03/1978 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56044   14/05/1978 08/2005
  56 Co-Co 56045   01/06/1978 04/2009
  56 Co-Co 56046   18/07/1978 07/2002
  56 Co-Co 56047   28/07/1978 10/2003
  56 Co-Co 56036   16/08/1978 06/2005
  56 Co-Co 56048   19/09/1978 08/2002
  56 Co-Co 56049   11/10/1978
  56 Co-Co 56050   25/10/1978 04/2004
  56 Co-Co 56051   04/11/1978
  56 Co-Co 56052   06/12/1978 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56053   19/12/1978 07/1999
  56 Co-Co 56054   26/01/1979 12/2003
  56 Co-Co 56055   01/02/1979 03/2003
  56 Co-Co 56056   12/03/1979 02/2004
  56 Co-Co 56057   27/03/1979
  56 Co-Co 56058   29/04/1979
  56 Co-Co 56042   14/05/1979 27/09/1991
  56 Co-Co 56059   16/05/1979 11/2006
  56 Co-Co 56060   09/06/1979
  56 Co-Co 56061   09/08/1979 11/2006
  56 Co-Co 56062   29/08/1979 02/2004
  56 Co-Co 56063   06/09/1979 08/2005
  56 Co-Co 56064   17/09/1979 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56065   17/10/1979
  56 Co-Co 56066   11/12/1979 12/2005
  56 Co-Co 56067   11/12/1979 12/2003
  56 Co-Co 56068   11/12/1979 07/2003
  56 Co-Co 56069   11/12/1979
  56 Co-Co 56070   21/12/1979 02/2004
  56 Co-Co 56071   21/12/1979 11/2006
  56 Co-Co 56072   07/01/1980 02/2004
  56 Co-Co 56073   29/02/1980 06/2002
  56 Co-Co 56074   29/03/1980
  56 Co-Co 56075   06/04/1980 04/2004
  56 Co-Co 56076   20/04/1980 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56077   18/05/1980
  56 Co-Co 56078   25/05/1980
  56 Co-Co 56079   22/06/1980 12/1999
  56 Co-Co 56080   13/07/1980 07/2002
  56 Co-Co 56081   24/08/1980
  56 Co-Co 56082   24/08/1980 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56083   07/09/1980 12/2003
  56 Co-Co 56084   26/10/1980 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56086   07/12/1980 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56087   21/12/1980
  56 Co-Co 56085   21/01/1981 07/2002
  56 Co-Co 56088   25/01/1981 02/2004
  56 Co-Co 56089   25/01/1981 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56090   08/03/1981
  56 Co-Co 56091   21/06/1981
  56 Co-Co 56092   21/06/1981 03/1999
  56 Co-Co 56093   28/06/1981 07/1999
  56 Co-Co 56094   09/08/1981
  56 Co-Co 56095   16/08/1981 10/2006
  56 Co-Co 56096   13/09/1981
  56 Co-Co 56097   04/10/1981 23/03/2002
  56 Co-Co 56098   18/10/1981 08/2005
  56 Co-Co 56099   08/11/1981 11/2003
  56 Co-Co 56100   15/11/1981 12/2003
  56 Co-Co 56102   20/12/1981 09/2003
  56 Co-Co 56101   21/12/1981 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56103   27/12/1981
  56 Co-Co 56104   21/02/1982
  56 Co-Co 56105   28/03/1982
  56 Co-Co 56106   25/04/1982
  56 Co-Co 56107   16/05/1982 01/2004
  56 Co-Co 56108   20/06/1982 06/1999
  56 Co-Co 56109   15/08/1982 12/2003
  56 Co-Co 56110   03/10/1982 07/2002
  56 Co-Co 56111   24/10/1982 04/2003
  56 Co-Co 56112   21/11/1982 01/2003
  56 Co-Co 56113   12/12/1982
  56 Co-Co 56114   23/01/1983 09/2008
  56 Co-Co 56115   30/01/1983
  58 Co-Co 58001   05/1983 08/10/1999
  58 Co-Co 58002   05/1983 09/11/2000
  58 Co-Co 58003   07/1983 29/11/1999
  58 Co-Co 58004   09/1983 09/01/2002
  58 Co-Co 58005   10/1983 13/10/2000
  58 Co-Co 58006   10/1983 11/01/2000
  58 Co-Co 58007   11/1983 19/01/2000
  58 Co-Co 58008   12/1983 29/11/1999
  58 Co-Co 58009   01/1984 16/01/2002
  58 Co-Co 58010   02/1984 08/12/1999
  58 Co-Co 58011   03/1984 07/12/1999
  58 Co-Co 58012   03/1984 05/12/1999
  58 Co-Co 58013   03/1984 26/04/2001
  58 Co-Co 58014   05/04/1984 17/11/2000
  58 Co-Co 58015   09/1984 08/10/1999
  58 Co-Co 58016   10/1984 05/08/2002
  58 Co-Co 58017   10/1984 30/04/1999
  58 Co-Co 58018   10/1984 07/12/1999
  58 Co-Co 58019   11/1984 07/04/2001
  58 Co-Co 58020   11/1984 02/09/2002
  58 Co-Co 58021   12/1984 03/08/2002
  58 Co-Co 58022   12/1984 11/03/2002
  58 Co-Co 58023   12/1984 24/07/1999
  58 Co-Co 58024   12/1984 02/09/2002
  58 Co-Co 58025   01/1985 05/08/2002
  58 Co-Co 58026   03/1985 16/01/2002
  58 Co-Co 58027   03/1985 05/09/1999
  58 Co-Co 58028   03/1985 29/10/1999
  58 Co-Co 58029   03/1985 25/06/2002
  58 Co-Co 58030   06/1985 01/08/2002
  58 Co-Co 58031   09/1985 06/04/2002
  58 Co-Co 58032   09/1985 12/01/2000
  58 Co-Co 58033   09/1985 31/08/2002
  58 Co-Co 58034   11/1985 18/08/1999
  58 Co-Co 58035   01/1986 30/06/1999
  58 Co-Co 58036   02/1986 10/03/2000
  58 Co-Co 58037   02/1986 08/04/2002
  58 Co-Co 58038   02/1986 04/12/1999
  58 Co-Co 58039   03/1986 30/12/1999
  58 Co-Co 58040   03/1986 07/12/1999
  58 Co-Co 58041   03/1986 08/07/2002
  58 Co-Co 58042   05/1986 13/04/2002
  58 Co-Co 58043   07/1986 01/08/2002
  58 Co-Co 58044   08/1986 24/07/1999
  58 Co-Co 58045   09/1986 31/08/2002
  58 Co-Co 58046   10/1986 13/01/2000
  58 Co-Co 58047   10/1986 04/09/2002
  58 Co-Co 58048   11/1986 19/01/2000
  58 Co-Co 58049   12/1986 29/05/2002
  58 Co-Co 58050   03/1987 05/08/2002