Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Dübs & Co


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
MR 780 0-4-4T 780 357 1870 07/1928
MR 780 0-4-4T 781 358 1870 07/1928
MR 780 0-4-4T 782 359 1870 07/1930
MR 780 0-4-4T 783 360 1870 12/1933
MR 780 0-4-4T 784 361 1870 09/1930
MR 780 0-4-4T 785 362 1870 05/1935
MR 780 0-4-4T 786 363 1870 10/1921
MR 780 0-4-4T 787 364 1870 06/1927
MR 780 0-4-4T 788 365 1870 05/1931
MR 780 0-4-4T 789 366 1870 10/1932
MR 780 0-4-4T 790 367 1870 11/1931
MR 780 0-4-4T 791 368 1870 04/1925
MR 780 0-4-4T 792 369 1870 09/1931
MR 780 0-4-4T 793 370 1870 11/1935
MR 780 0-4-4T 794 371 1870 11/1933
MR 780 0-4-4T 795 372 1870 05/1925
MR 780 0-4-4T 796 373 1870 11/1934
MR 780 0-4-4T 797 374 1870 11/1924
MR 780 0-4-4T 798 375 1870 03/1928
MR 780 0-4-4T 799 376 1870 11/1931
LMS 2F 0-6-0     02/1870 10/11/1951
CR 446 0-4-0T 446 630 1873 08/1926
CR 446 0-4-0T 447 631 1873 08/1926
GSWR 208 0-4-2 208 615 05/1873 1923
GSWR 208 0-4-2 209 616 05/1873 1913
GSWR 208 0-4-2 210 617 05/1873 1913
GSWR 208 0-4-2 211 618 05/1873 1923
GSWR 208 0-4-2 212 619 06/1873 1923
GSWR 208 0-4-2 213 620 06/1873 1913
GSWR 208 0-4-2 214 621 06/1873 1923
GSWR 208 0-4-2 215 622 06/1873 1904
GSWR 208 0-4-2 216 623 06/1873 1913
GSWR 208 0-4-2 217 624 06/1873 1923
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1874 01/1949
MR 1142 0-6-0 1162 805 04/1875 31/12/1946
MR 1142 0-6-0 1163 806 04/1875 25/02/1955
MR 1142 0-6-0 1164 807 04/1875 19/05/1959
MR 1142 0-6-0 1165 808 04/1875 25/02/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1166 809 04/1875 19/05/1959
MR 1142 0-6-0 1167 810 04/1875 31/12/1955
MR 1142 0-6-0 1168 811 05/1875 30/11/1928
MR 1142 0-6-0 1169 812 05/1875 30/11/1933
MR 1142 0-6-0 1170 813 05/1875 08/09/1927
MR 1142 0-6-0 1171 814 05/1875 06/10/1934
MR 1142 0-6-0 1172 815 05/1875 25/02/1950
MR 1142 0-6-0 1173 816 05/1875 06/10/1946
MR 1142 0-6-0 1174 817 05/1875 11/08/1927
MR 1142 0-6-0 1175 818 05/1875 31/12/1946
MR 1142 0-6-0 1176 819 05/1875 06/10/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1177 820 05/1875 06/10/1957
MR 1142 0-6-0 1178 821 06/1875 06/10/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1179 822 06/1875 22/12/1962
MR 1142 0-6-0 1180 823 06/1875 24/03/1930
MR 1142 0-6-0 1181 824 06/1875 19/05/1931
MR 1142 0-6-0 1182 825 06/1875 30/11/1956
MR 1142 0-6-0 1183 826 06/1875 14/07/1957
MR 1142 0-6-0 1184 827 06/1875 08/09/1925
MR 1142 0-6-0 1185 828 06/1875 08/09/1948
MR 1142 0-6-0 1186 829 06/1875 28/01/1957
MR 1142 0-6-0 1187 830 06/1875 30/11/1963
MR 1142 0-6-0 1188 831 07/1875 19/05/1928
MR 1142 0-6-0 1189 832 07/1875 14/07/1934
MR 1142 0-6-0 1190 833 07/1875 19/05/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1191 834 07/1875 08/09/1953
GSWR 221 0-4-2 251 970 11/1876 1913
GSWR 221 0-4-2 252 971 11/1876 07/1917
GSWR 221 0-4-2 253 972 11/1876 10/1923
GSWR 221 0-4-2 254 973 11/1876 07/1925
GSWR 221 0-4-2 255 974 11/1876 08/1929
GSWR 221 0-4-2 256 975 11/1876 11/1928
GSWR 221 0-4-2 257 976 12/1876 1930
GSWR 221 0-4-2 258 977 12/1876 1931
GSWR 221 0-4-2 259 978 12/1876 07/1914
GSWR 221 0-4-2 260 979 12/1876 04/1928
CR 670 0-4-2 670 1138 1878 1922
CR 670 0-4-2 671 1139 1878 1922
CR 670 0-4-2 672 1140 1878 1925
CR 670 0-4-2 673 1141 1878 1925
CR 670 0-4-2 674 1142 1878 1930
CR 670 0-4-2 675 1143 1878 1929
CR 670 0-4-2 676 1144 1878 1930
CR 670 0-4-2 677 1145 1878 1927
CR 670 0-4-2 678 1146 1878 1922
CR 670 0-4-2 679 1147 1878 1927
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1878 04/1957
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1878 09/1957
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1878 11/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1878 10/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0 3037   01/01/1878 12/1958
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1878 04/1956
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1878 02/1956
NBR J34 0-6-0 497 1217 1879 06/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 498 1218 1879 11/1925
NBR J34 0-6-0 499 1219 1879 08/1924
NBR J34 0-6-0 500 1220 1879 01/1923
NBR J34 0-6-0 501 1221 1879 08/1924
CR 670 0-4-2 700 1485 1881 1923
CR 670 0-4-2 701 1486 1881 1922
CR 670 0-4-2 702 1487 1881 1923
CR 670 0-4-2 703 1488 1881 1928
CR 670 0-4-2 704 1489 1881 1922
CR 670 0-4-2 705 1490 1881 1932
CR 670 0-4-2 706 1491 1881 1920
CR 670 0-4-2 707 1492 1881 1927
CR 670 0-4-2 708 1493 1881 1930
CR 670 0-4-2 709 1494 1881 1922
CR 670 0-4-2 710 1495 1881 1928
CR 670 0-4-2 711 1496 1881 1928
CR 670 0-4-2 712 1497 1881 1926
CR 670 0-4-2 713 1498 1882 1922
CR 670 0-4-2 714 1499 1882 1930
CR 670 0-4-2 715 1500 1882 1922
CR 670 0-4-2 716 1501 1882 1926
CR 670 0-4-2 717 1502 1882 1932
CR 670 0-4-2 718 1503 1882 1926
CR 670 0-4-2 719 1504 1882 1928
CR 179 4-4-0 179 1672 1882 1930
CR 179 4-4-0 180 1673 1882 1925
CR 179 4-4-0 181 1674 1882 1923
CR 179 4-4-0 182 1675 1882 1930
CR 179 4-4-0 183 1676 1882 1927
CR 179 4-4-0 184 1677 1882 1922
CR 179 4-4-0 185 1678 1882 1922
CR 179 4-4-0 186 1679 1882 1930
CR 179 4-4-0 187 1680 1882 1924
CR 179 4-4-0 188 1681 1882 1925
GNR J4 0-6-0 731 1607 06/1882 05/1934
GNR J4 0-6-0 732 1608 06/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 733 1609 06/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 734 1610 07/1882 01/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 735 1611 07/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 736 1612 07/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 737 1613 07/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 738 1614 08/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 739 1615 08/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 740 1616 08/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 741 1617 09/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 742 1618 09/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 743 1619 09/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 744 1620 10/1882 06/1925
GNR J4 0-6-0 745 1621 10/1882 10/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 746 1622 11/1882 01/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 747 1623 11/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 748 1624 11/1882 09/1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 749 1625 11/1882 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 750 1626 11/1882 06/1925
LMS 1P 2-4-0     02/1884 14/08/1948
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 169 2000 11/1884 06/1926
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 170 2001 11/1884 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 171 2002 11/1884 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 173 2003 11/1884 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 490 2004 12/1884 08/1926
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 491 2005 12/1884 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 492 2006 12/1884 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 493 2007 12/1884 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 494 2008 12/1884 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 495 2009 12/1884 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 516 2105 11/1885 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 517 2106 11/1885 12/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 518 2107 11/1885 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 519 2108 12/1885 07/1926
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 520 2109 12/1885 01/1961
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 521 2110 12/1885 04/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 522 2111 12/1885 10/1928
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 523 2112 12/1885 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 524 2113 12/1885 11/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 525 2114 12/1885 11/1921
CR 124 4-4-0 124 2245 1886 1925
GSWR 22 0-6-0 292 2452 02/1889 07/1927
GSWR 22 0-6-0 293 2453 02/1889 10/1934
GSWR 22 0-6-0 294 2454 02/1889 03/1927
GSWR 22 0-6-0 295 2455 02/1889 1928
GSWR 22 0-6-0 296 2456 02/1889 06/1932
GSWR 22 0-6-0 297 2457 02/1889 1930
GSWR 22 0-6-0 298 2458 03/1889 11/1925
GSWR 22 0-6-0 299 2459 03/1889 1932
GSWR 22 0-6-0 300 2460 03/1889 10/1926
GSWR 22 0-6-0 301 2461 03/1889 1932
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1891 01/1949
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     01/1892 06/1951
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     01/1892 02/1950
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1833 2847 01/1892 25/02/1933
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1834 2848 01/1892 26/12/1931
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1892 11/1960
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1892 01/1960
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1892 01/1951
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     02/1892 07/1952
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     02/1892 02/1956
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     02/1892 11/1959
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     02/1892 10/1958
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     02/1892 02/1953
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1835 2849 02/1892 07/10/1950
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1836 2850 02/1892 13/07/1935
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1837 2851 02/1892 22/02/1936
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1838 2852 02/1892 02/11/1935
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1839 2853 02/1892 12/07/1952
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1840 2854 02/1892 02/12/1950
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1841 2855 02/1892 29/12/1928
MR 1532 0-4-4T 1842 2856 02/1892 24/03/1956
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     03/1892 11/1950
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2013 2857 04/1892 21/02/1948
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2014 2858 04/1892 06/09/1930
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     05/1892 09/1950
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2015 2859 05/1892 22/05/1937
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2016 2860 05/1892 18/06/1938
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2017 2861 05/1892 16/06/1951
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2018 2862 05/1892 25/02/1950
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2019 2863 05/1892 31/10/1959
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2020 2864 05/1892 04/10/1958
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2021 2865 05/1892 18/04/1936
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2022 2866 05/1892 21/02/1953
HR P 4-4-0T 101 2778 09/1892 07/1934
HR P 4-4-0T 102 2779 09/1892 12/1934
GSWR 306 0-6-0 306 2998 11/1892 06/1926
GSWR 306 0-6-0 307 2999 11/1892 1930
GSWR 306 0-6-0 308 3000 11/1892 11/1932
GSWR 306 0-6-0 309 3001 12/1892 1927
GSWR 306 0-6-0 310 3002 12/1892 1930
GSWR 306 0-6-0 311 3003 12/1892 12/1931
GSWR 306 0-6-0 312 3004 12/1892 1928
GSWR 306 0-6-0 313 3005 12/1892 08/1929
GSWR 306 0-6-0 314 3006 12/1892 11/1932
GSWR 306 0-6-0 315 3007 12/1892 08/1929
GSWR 306 0-6-0 316 3008 12/1892 04/1928
GSWR 306 0-6-0 317 3009 12/1892 11/1932
GSWR 306 0-6-0 318 3010 01/1893 1930
GSWR 306 0-6-0 319 3011 01/1893 11/1925
GSWR 306 0-6-0 320 3012 01/1893 11/1927
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1893 17/04/1948
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1893 02/1954
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1893 01/1954
GSWR 306 0-6-0 321 3013 02/1893 06/1926
GSWR 306 0-6-0 322 3014 02/1893 05/1927
GSWR 306 0-6-0 323 3015 03/1893 07/1925
GSWR 306 0-6-0 324 3016 03/1893 10/1932
GSWR 306 0-6-0 325 3017 03/1893 07/1925
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     05/1893 01/1956
HR P 4-4-0T 11 3077 11/1893 1924
HR P 4-4-0T 14 3078 11/1893 1924
HR P 4-4-0T 15 3079 11/1893 1927
MSWJR Unclassified 2-4-0 1334   01/01/1894 09/1952
MSWJR Unclassified 2-4-0 1335   01/01/1894 09/1952
MSWJR Unclassified 2-4-0 1336   01/01/1894 03/1954
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2255 3200 02/1895 26/12/1931
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2234 3201 02/1895 29/01/1938
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2235 3202 02/1895 03/11/1934
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2236 3203 02/1895 02/10/1948
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2237 3204 02/1895 03/10/1953
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2238 3205 02/1895 02/11/1935
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2259 3206 02/1895 31/12/1938
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2240 3207 02/1895 09/09/1944
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2241 3208 02/1895 30/12/1939
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2242 3209 03/1895 20/04/1946
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2243 3210 03/1895 21/02/1953
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2244 3211 03/1895 08/10/1955
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2245 3212 03/1895 01/12/1934
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2246 3213 03/1895 03/10/1931
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2247 3214 03/1895 09/10/1937
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2228 3215 03/1895 02/12/1933
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     04/1895 02/1953
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     04/1895 21/09/1955
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2229 3216 04/1895 28/01/1956
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2230 3217 04/1895 28/11/1931
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2231 3218 04/1895 26/12/1931
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2232 3219 05/1895 24/01/1948
GSWR 336 4-4-0 336 3239 05/1895 03/1927
GSWR 336 4-4-0 337 3240 05/1895 04/1932
GSWR 336 4-4-0 338 3241 05/1895 06/1926
GSWR 336 4-4-0 339 3242 06/1895 1929
GSWR 336 4-4-0 340 3243 06/1895 05/1927
GSWR 336 4-4-0 341 3244 06/1895 1930
GSWR 336 4-4-0 342 3245 06/1895 06/1926
GSWR 336 4-4-0 343 3246 06/1895 11/1926
GSWR 336 4-4-0 344 3247 06/1895 09/1932
GSWR 336 4-4-0 345 3248 06/1895 04/1931
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     09/1895 02/10/1948
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     09/1895 30/09/1953
GNR J4 0-6-0 1031 3370 06/1896 10/1931
GNR J4 0-6-0 1032 3371 06/1896 01/1926
GNR J4 0-6-0 1033 3372 06/1896 07/1938
GNR J4 0-6-0 1034 3373 06/1896 07/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 1037 3376 06/1896 02/1939
LMS Loch 4-4-0 119   07/1896 13/03/1948
HR Loch 4-4-0 119 3392 07/1896 03/1948
HR Loch 4-4-0 120 3393 07/1896 12/1940
HR Loch 4-4-0 126 3399 07/1896 08/1938
HR Loch 4-4-0 127 3400 07/1896 1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 1038 3377 07/1896 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 1039 3378 07/1896 08/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 1042 3381 07/1896 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 1043 3382 07/1896 04/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 1044 3383 07/1896 06/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 1045 3384 07/1896 10/1935
LMS Loch 4-4-0 125   08/1896 04/1950
HR Loch 4-4-0 121 3394 08/1896 03/1940
HR Loch 4-4-0 122 3395 08/1896 12/1940
HR Loch 4-4-0 123 3396 08/1896 02/1934
HR Loch 4-4-0 124 3397 08/1896 09/1938
HR Loch 4-4-0 125 3398 08/1896 04/1950
HR Loch 4-4-0 128 3401 08/1896 1930
HR Loch 4-4-0 129 3402 09/1896 1931
HR Loch 4-4-0 130 3403 09/1896 02/1937
HR Loch 4-4-0 131 3404 09/1896 08/1941
HR Loch 4-4-0 132 3405 09/1896 04/1947
HR Loch 4-4-0 133 3406 09/1896 12/1934
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 687   03/1897 09/1960
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 688   03/1897 09/1957
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 689   03/1897 17/11/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 690   03/1897 23/12/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 691   03/1897 07/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 692   03/1897 03/02/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 693   03/1897 07/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 694   03/1897 06/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 695   03/1897 23/12/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 696   03/1897 08/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 697   04/1897 17/11/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 698   04/1897 19/05/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 308   05/1897 09/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 315   05/1897 23/12/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 317   05/1897 07/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 699   05/1897 07/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 700   05/1897 17/11/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 701   05/1897 07/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 325   06/1897 23/12/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 326   06/1897 10/02/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 327   06/1897 05/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 339   06/1897 19/05/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 316   08/1897 23/12/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 346   08/1897 17/11/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 350   08/1897 24/03/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 352   08/1897 06/1959
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 355   08/1897 02/1961
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 368   08/1897 23/12/1962
GNR J4 0-6-0 1091 3546 12/1897 11/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 1092 3547 12/1897 08/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 1095 3550 01/1898 04/1934
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     02/1898 04/1950
GNR J4 0-6-0 1096 3551 02/1898 11/1938
GNR J4 0-6-0 1098 3553 02/1898 05/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1099 3554 02/1898 11/1937
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     03/1898 01/1956
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     03/1898 04/09/1948
LMS Ben 4-4-0 1   07/1898 02/1949
LMS Ben 4-4-0 2   07/1898 03/1953
LMS Ben 4-4-0 3   07/1898 05/1952
HR C 4-4-0 1 3686 07/1898 02/1949
HR C 4-4-0 2 3687 07/1898 02/1953
HR C 4-4-0 3 3688 07/1898 05/1952
GNR J4 0-6-0 1101 3695 12/1898 04/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1102 3696 12/1898 11/1932
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 702   01/1899 10/1959
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 703   01/1899 10/1952
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 704   01/1899 10/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 705   01/1899 14/01/1958
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 706   01/1899 05/1959
GNR J4 0-6-0 1104 3698 01/1899 10/1935
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1899 28/08/1948
LMS Ben 4-4-0 5   02/1899 16/10/1948
LMS Ben 4-4-0 7   02/1899 02/1949
LMS Ben 4-4-0 8   02/1899 10/1950
HR C 4-4-0 4 3689 02/1899 10/1946
HR C 4-4-0 5 3690 02/1899 10/1948
HR C 4-4-0 6 3691 02/1899 12/1939
HR C 4-4-0 7 3692 02/1899 02/1949
HR C 4-4-0 8 3693 02/1899 10/1950
GNR J4 0-6-0 1108 3702 02/1899 09/1935
GNR J4 0-6-0 1110 3704 02/1899 08/1938
GSWR 336 4-4-0 346 3731 03/1899 09/1932
GSWR 336 4-4-0 347 3732 03/1899 11/1932
GSWR 336 4-4-0 348 3733 03/1899 03/1931
GSWR 336 4-4-0 349 3734 03/1899 07/1926
GSWR 336 4-4-0 350 3735 03/1899 07/1932
GSWR 336 4-4-0 351 3736 03/1899 1928
GSWR 336 4-4-0 352 3737 03/1899 01/1927
GSWR 336 4-4-0 353 3738 03/1899 12/1931
GSWR 336 4-4-0 354 3739 03/1899 1928
GSWR 336 4-4-0 355 3740 03/1899 02/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 1111 3705 03/1899 06/1937
GNR J4 0-6-0 1112 3706 03/1899 07/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 1115 3709 03/1899 01/1933
GSWR 336 4-4-0 356 3741 04/1899 1930
GSWR 336 4-4-0 357 3742 04/1899 1928
GSWR 336 4-4-0 358 3743 04/1899 10/1927
GSWR 336 4-4-0 359 3744 04/1899 08/1931
GSWR 336 4-4-0 360 3745 04/1899 1930
GNR J4 0-6-0 1116 3710 04/1899 01/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1117 3711 04/1899 04/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1118 3712 04/1899 03/1934
GNR J4 0-6-0 1119 3713 04/1899 07/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 1120 3714 04/1899 11/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 1121 3715 04/1899 02/1935
GNR J4 0-6-0 1122 3716 04/1899 09/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1123 3717 04/1899 03/1934
GNR J4 0-6-0 1124 3718 04/1899 04/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1126 3720 05/1899 02/1946
GNR J4 0-6-0 1127 3721 05/1899 03/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1128 3722 05/1899 02/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1130 3724 05/1899 07/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 1132 3726 05/1899 08/1935
GNR J4 0-6-0 1134 3728 05/1899 08/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 1135 3729 05/1899 02/1932
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 707   06/1899 03/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 708   06/1899 12/1957
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 709   06/1899 07/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 710   06/1899 03/1959
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 711   06/1899 08/1959
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 712   06/1899 11/1958
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 713   06/1899 04/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 714   06/1899 04/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 715   06/1899 07/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 716   06/1899 10/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 717   09/1899 07/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 718   09/1899 03/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 719   09/1899 03/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 721   09/1899 14/01/1958
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 722   09/1899 04/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 723   09/1899 06/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 724   09/1899 05/1959
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 725   10/1899 12/1952
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 726   10/1899 08/1959
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 727   10/1899 09/1958
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 728   12/1899 10/1956
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 729   12/1899 03/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 730   12/1899 08/1957
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 731   12/1899 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 732   12/1899 10/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1900 12/11/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 134   02/1900 06/1949
LMS 3F 0-6-0 135   02/1900 02/1950
LMS 3F 0-6-0 136   02/1900 01/1952
LMS 3F 0-6-0 138   02/1900 02/1951
LMS 3F 0-6-0 139   02/1900 12/1951
HR K 0-6-0 134 3842 02/1900 06/1949
HR K 0-6-0 135 3843 02/1900 02/1950
HR K 0-6-0 136 3844 02/1900 01/1952
HR K 0-6-0 137 3845 02/1900 03/1946
HR K 0-6-0 138 3846 02/1900 02/1951
HR K 0-6-0 139 3847 02/1900 12/1951
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     04/1900 09/1957
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     04/1900 02/1955
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     04/1900 04/1959
CR 812 0-6-0 864 3880 04/1900 29/12/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 865 3881 04/1900 26/03/1962
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     05/1900 07/1960
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     05/1900 25/06/1955
CR 812 0-6-0 866 3882 05/1900 10/12/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 867 3883 05/1900 05/1960
CR 812 0-6-0 868 3884 05/1900 11/09/1948
CR 812 0-6-0 869 3885 05/1900 14/03/1963
CR 812 0-6-0 870 3886 05/1900 17/12/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 871 3887 05/1900 07/1960
CR 812 0-6-0 872 3888 05/1900 11/1946
CR 812 0-6-0 873 3889 05/1900 12/11/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 874 3890 05/1900 30/04/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 875 3891 05/1900 10/09/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 876 3892 05/1900 01/10/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 877 3893 05/1900 05/11/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 878 3894 05/1900 22/05/1948
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     06/1900 03/1953
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     06/1900 27/10/1954
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     06/1900 03/1953
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2611 3898 06/1900 28/01/1956
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2612 3899 06/1900 28/11/1931
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2613 3900 06/1900 04/09/1948
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2614 3901 06/1900 01/12/1934
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2615 3902 06/1900 23/02/1935
HR Castle 4-6-0 140 3848 06/1900 08/1939
HR Castle 4-6-0 141 3849 06/1900 09/1937
HR Castle 4-6-0 142 3850 06/1900 02/1939
HR Castle 4-6-0 143 3851 06/1900 02/1946
HR Castle 4-6-0 144 3852 06/1900 02/1936
HR Castle 4-6-0 145 3853 06/1900 05/1930
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     07/1900 10/1956
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2616 3903 07/1900 22/04/1950
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2617 3904 07/1900 30/12/1939
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2618 3905 07/1900 13/07/1935
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2619 3906 07/1900 29/11/1930
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2620 3907 07/1900 05/10/1957
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2621 3908 08/1900 26/02/1955
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2622 3909 08/1900 18/04/1959
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2623 3910 08/1900 13/08/1960
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2624 3911 08/1900 16/07/1955
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2625 3912 08/1900 21/03/1953
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2626 3913 09/1900 06/11/1954
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2627 3914 09/1900 13/07/1935
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2628 3915 09/1900 28/12/1946
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2629 3916 09/1900 21/03/1953
MR 2228 0-4-4T 2630 3917 09/1900 03/11/1956
GNR J4 0-6-0 81 3933 10/1900 09/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 82 3934 10/1900 08/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 84 3936 10/1900 08/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 86 3938 10/1900 09/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 89 3941 10/1900 08/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 91 3943 10/1900 01/1946
GNR J4 0-6-0 90 3942 11/1900 07/1946
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 306   05/1901 21/04/1962
LSWR Black Motors 0-6-0 309   05/1901 23/12/1962
GNR J4 0-6-0 1161 3945 07/1901 08/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1163 3947 07/1901 06/1938
GNR J4 0-6-0 1164 3948 07/1901 07/1934
GNR J4 0-6-0 1165 3949 07/1901 09/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1167 3951 08/1901 07/1932
GNR J4 0-6-0 1168 3952 08/1901 02/1935
GNR J4 0-6-0 1169 3953 08/1901 08/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1170 3954 08/1901 08/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1171 3955 08/1901 02/11/1946
GNR J4 0-6-0 1172 3956 08/1901 03/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1173 3957 08/1901 06/1947
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 733   11/1901 06/1952
HR Castle 4-6-0 146 4244 07/1902 09/1946
HR Castle 4-6-0 147 4245 07/1902 11/1943
HR Castle 4-6-0 148 4246 07/1902 04/1937
HR Castle 4-6-0 149 4247 07/1902 01/1940
LMS 3F 0-6-0 18   08/1902 02/1949
LMS 3F 0-6-0 21   08/1902 10/1949
HR K 0-6-0 18 4240 08/1902 02/1949
HR K 0-6-0 19 4241 08/1902 12/1946
HR K 0-6-0 20 4242 08/1902 02/1936
HR K 0-6-0 21 4243 08/1902 11/1949
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1075   03/1903 12/1956
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1092   03/1903 06/1951
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1493   03/1903 02/1954
SR D1 4-4-0 1145   04/1903 10/1961
SR D1 4-4-0 1489   04/1903 11/1961
SR D1 4-4-0 1492   04/1903 01/1960
SR D1 4-4-0 1494   04/1903 08/1960
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1501   04/1903 05/1953
SR D1 4-4-0 1502   05/1903 03/1951