Manufacturer: Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7135 | 14 | 1460 | 10/1924 | 10/04/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7136 | 14 | 1461 | 10/1924 | 12/12/1959 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7137 | 14 | 1462 | 10/1924 | 06/06/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7138 | 14 | 1463 | 10/1924 | 31/12/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7139 | 14 | 1464 | 11/1924 | 25/11/1959 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7140 | 14 | 1465 | 12/1924 | 10/08/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7141 | 14 | 1466 | 12/1924 | 12/12/1959 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7148 | 14 | 1473 | 1925 | 10/08/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7142 | 14 | 1467 | 01/1925 | 08/09/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7143 | 14 | 1468 | 01/1925 | 09/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7144 | 14 | 1469 | 01/1925 | 23/06/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7145 | 14 | 1470 | 02/1925 | 27/02/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7146 | 14 | 1471 | 02/1925 | 19/12/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7147 | 14 | 1472 | 03/1925 | 09/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7149 | 14 | 1474 | 03/1925 | 07/11/1959 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16510 | 36 | 1511 | 10/1926 | 10/09/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16511 | 36 | 1512 | 10/1926 | 09/10/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16512 | 36 | 1513 | 10/1926 | 04/12/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16513 | 36 | 1514 | 10/1926 | 04/01/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16514 | 36 | 1515 | 10/1926 | 13/10/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16515 | 36 | 1516 | 10/1926 | 21/08/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16516 | 36 | 1517 | 10/1926 | 08/09/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16517 | 36 | 1518 | 11/1926 | 05/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16518 | 36 | 1519 | 11/1926 | 15/10/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16519 | 36 | 1520 | 04/1927 | 20/12/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16520 | 36 | 1521 | 04/1927 | 13/08/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16521 | 36 | 1522 | 04/1927 | 26/09/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16522 | 36 | 1523 | 05/1927 | 09/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16523 | 36 | 1524 | 05/1927 | 19/12/1959 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16524 | 36 | 1525 | 05/1927 | 21/12/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16525 | 36 | 1526 | 05/1927 | 06/03/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16526 | 36 | 1527 | 05/1927 | 09/12/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16527 | 36 | 1528 | 05/1927 | 26/11/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16528 | 36 | 1529 | 05/1927 | 02/04/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16529 | 36 | 1530 | 06/1927 | 20/12/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16530 | 36 | 1531 | 06/1927 | 17/12/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16531 | 36 | 1532 | 06/1927 | 26/09/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16532 | 36 | 1533 | 07/1927 | 30/03/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16533 | 36 | 1534 | 07/1927 | 02/04/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16534 | 36 | 1535 | 07/1927 | 09/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16625 | 52 | 1558 | 11/1927 | 22/05/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16626 | 52 | 1559 | 12/1927 | 11/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16627 | 52 | 1560 | 12/1927 | 03/12/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16628 | 52 | 1561 | 12/1927 | 02/08/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16629 | 52 | 1562 | 12/1927 | 07/07/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16630 | 52 | 1563 | 12/1927 | 07/12/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16631 | 52 | 1564 | 12/1927 | 15/08/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16632 | 52 | 1565 | 12/1927 | 08/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16633 | 52 | 1566 | 01/1928 | 14/03/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16634 | 52 | 1567 | 01/1928 | 23/02/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16635 | 52 | 1568 | 01/1928 | 12/11/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16636 | 52 | 1569 | 01/1928 | 1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16637 | 52 | 1570 | 02/1928 | 09/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16638 | 52 | 1571 | 02/1928 | 18/06/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16639 | 52 | 1572 | 02/1928 | 10/12/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16640 | 52 | 1573 | 03/1928 | 14/02/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16641 | 52 | 1574 | 03/1928 | 21/03/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16642 | 52 | 1575 | 03/1928 | 06/05/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16643 | 52 | 1576 | 03/1928 | 16/07/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16644 | 52 | 1577 | 04/1928 | 20/08/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16645 | 52 | 1578 | 04/1928 | 01/12/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16647 | 52 | 1580 | 04/1928 | 20/03/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16646 | 52 | 1582 | 04/1928 | 19/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16649 | 52 | 1579 | 05/1928 | 10/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16648 | 52 | 1581 | 05/1928 | 02/04/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16650 | 58 | 1591 | 09/1928 | 11/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16651 | 58 | 1592 | 10/1928 | 12/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16652 | 58 | 1593 | 10/1928 | 12/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16653 | 58 | 1594 | 10/1928 | 30/09/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16654 | 58 | 1595 | 10/1928 | 13/05/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16655 | 58 | 1596 | 10/1928 | 14/05/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16656 | 58 | 1597 | 10/1928 | 23/12/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16657 | 58 | 1598 | 10/1928 | 15/12/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16658 | 58 | 1599 | 10/1928 | 19/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16659 | 58 | 1600 | 10/1928 | 24/09/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16660 | 58 | 1601 | 10/1928 | 27/03/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16661 | 58 | 1602 | 10/1928 | 27/03/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16662 | 58 | 1603 | 11/1928 | 04/07/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16663 | 58 | 1604 | 11/1928 | 26/09/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16664 | 58 | 1605 | 11/1928 | 08/02/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16665 | 58 | 1606 | 11/1928 | 08/08/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16666 | 58 | 1607 | 11/1928 | 23/03/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16667 | 58 | 1608 | 12/1928 | 08/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16668 | 58 | 1609 | 12/1928 | 19/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16669 | 58 | 1610 | 12/1928 | 19/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16670 | 58 | 1611 | 01/1929 | 07/11/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16671 | 58 | 1612 | 01/1929 | 13/10/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16672 | 58 | 1613 | 01/1929 | 23/12/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16673 | 58 | 1614 | 02/1929 | 12/11/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16674 | 58 | 1615 | 02/1929 | 19/03/1960 |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75101 | 3151 | 02/1944 | 09/12/1963 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75108 | 3158 | 03/1944 | 04/08/1962 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75117 | 3167 | 05/1944 | 24/05/1965 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75119 | 3169 | 05/1944 | 24/05/1965 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75124 | 3174 | 06/1944 | 07/10/1967 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75125 | 3175 | 06/1944 | 15/08/1964 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75134 | 3184 | 09/1944 | 05/10/1964 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75139 | 3190 | 10/1944 | 22/08/1963 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75148 | 3198 | 12/1944 | 25/05/1964 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 75149 | 3199 | 12/1944 | 26/11/1962 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71440 | 3204 | 02/1945 | 05/12/1960 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71447 | 3211 | 04/1945 | 07/09/1960 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71451 | 3215 | 05/1945 | 23/09/1963 | |
LNER | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 71452 | 3216 | 05/1945 | 07/04/1962 | |
D1/1 | 0-4-0 | 11500 | 25/12/1954 | 30/12/1967 | |||
D1/1 | 0-4-0 | 11501 | 25/12/1954 | 30/12/1967 | |||
D1/1 | 0-4-0 | 11502 | 02/01/1955 | 25/12/1966 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11136 | 07/10/1955 | 23/10/1966 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11137 | 08/10/1955 | 06/01/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11138 | 07/02/1956 | 24/06/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11139 | 08/02/1956 | 06/01/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11140 | 13/05/1956 | 01/01/1981 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11141 | 05/06/1956 | 13/01/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11142 | 25/07/1956 | 01/07/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11143 | 16/08/1956 | 15/04/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11161 | 11/10/1956 | 15/07/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11162 | 11/10/1956 | 01/07/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11163 | 01/02/1957 | 25/11/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11164 | 19/02/1957 | 26/08/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11165 | 17/03/1957 | 20/01/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11166 | 15/06/1957 | 05/08/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11167 | 15/06/1957 | 05/08/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11168 | 15/06/1957 | 25/03/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11169 | 04/08/1957 | 06/01/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11170 | 04/08/1957 | 11/11/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11171 | 20/09/1957 | 26/08/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11172 | 20/09/1957 | 26/08/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11174 | 30/10/1957 | 20/01/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11173 | 09/11/1957 | 22/07/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11175 | 28/12/1957 | 19/02/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | 11176 | 13/01/1958 | 13/01/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2574 | 18/07/1958 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2575 | 30/07/1958 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2576 | 30/07/1958 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2577 | 30/07/1958 | 24/06/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2578 | 18/11/1958 | 07/07/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2579 | 25/11/1958 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2580 | 01/12/1958 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2581 | 09/12/1958 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2582 | 30/01/1959 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2583 | 30/01/1959 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2584 | 28/02/1959 | 07/07/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2585 | 13/04/1959 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2586 | 05/11/1959 | 12/03/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2587 | 10/11/1959 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2588 | 24/11/1959 | 12/03/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2589 | 01/12/1959 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2591 | 08/12/1959 | 12/03/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2590 | 14/12/1959 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2592 | 18/12/1959 | 02/03/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2593 | 30/12/1959 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2594 | 19/01/1960 | 12/03/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2595 | 30/01/1960 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2596 | 15/02/1960 | 08/06/1968 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2597 | 28/06/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2598 | 30/06/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2599 | 08/07/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2600 | 13/07/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2601 | 20/07/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2602 | 28/07/1960 | 06/07/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2603 | 5652 | 16/09/1960 | 12/08/1967 | ||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2605 | 24/09/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2604 | 30/09/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2606 | 08/10/1960 | 11/02/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2607 | 18/10/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2608 | 09/12/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2609 | 13/12/1960 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2610 | 21/12/1960 | 04/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2611 | 16/01/1961 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2612 | 30/01/1961 | 23/09/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2613 | 21/02/1961 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2614 | 27/02/1961 | 12/03/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2615 | 08/03/1961 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2616 | 17/03/1961 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2617 | 28/03/1961 | 30/12/1967 | |||
05 | 0-6-0 | D2618 | 11/04/1961 | 08/06/1968 |