Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Kitson


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
MR 1142 0-6-0 1142 2002 02/1875 14/07/1957
MR 1142 0-6-0 1143 2003 03/1875 24/03/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1144 2004 03/1875 28/01/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1145 2005 03/1875 21/04/1929
MR 1142 0-6-0 1146 2006 03/1875 24/03/1956
MR 1142 0-6-0 1147 2007 03/1875 19/05/1930
MR 1142 0-6-0 1148 2008 04/1875 03/11/1927
MR 1142 0-6-0 1149 2009 04/1875 28/01/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1150 2010 04/1875 31/12/1933
MR 1142 0-6-0 1151 2011 04/1875 30/11/1933
MR 1142 0-6-0 1152 2012 06/1875 14/07/1928
MR 1142 0-6-0 1153 2013 06/1875 19/05/1959
MR 1142 0-6-0 1154 2014 06/1875 17/11/1962
MR 1142 0-6-0 1155 2015 06/1875 19/05/1957
MR 1142 0-6-0 1156 2016 07/1875 25/02/1931
MR 1142 0-6-0 1157 2017 08/1875 08/09/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1158 2018 08/1875 31/12/1946
MR 1142 0-6-0 1159 2019 08/1875 25/02/1930
MR 1142 0-6-0 1160 2020 09/1875 07/07/1962
MR 1142 0-6-0 1161 2021 09/1875 11/08/1935
MR 1142 0-6-0 381 2049 12/1875 07/07/1962
MR 1142 0-6-0 382 2050 01/1876 30/11/1955
MR 1142 0-6-0 383 2051 01/1876 14/07/1940
MR 1142 0-6-0 384 2052 01/1876 30/11/1933
MR 1142 0-6-0 385 2053 01/1876 16/06/1956
MR 1142 0-6-0 400 2054 02/1876 30/11/1933
MR 1142 0-6-0 401 2055 02/1876 30/11/1955
MR 1142 0-6-0 402 2056 02/1876 06/10/1946
MR 1142 0-6-0 403 2057 02/1876 14/07/1946
MR 1142 0-6-0 404 2058 02/1876 13/10/1962
LYR 25 0-6-0 528 2107 08/1876 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 529 2108 08/1876 06/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 530 2111 02/1877 12/1932
LYR 25 0-6-0 531 2112 03/1877 01/1959
LYR 25 0-6-0 532 2113 03/1877 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 533 2114 03/1877 03/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 534 2115 03/1877 11/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 535 2119 04/1877 02/1949
LYR 25 0-6-0 536 2120 04/1877 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 537 2121 07/1877 02/1958
LYR 25 0-6-0 538 2122 07/1877 27/10/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 539 2123 07/1877 12/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 540 2124 08/1877 10/1926
LYR 25 0-6-0 541 2125 08/1877 05/1936
LYR 25 0-6-0 542 2126 08/1877 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 543 2127 08/1877 12/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 544 2129 02/1878 01/1960
LYR 25 0-6-0 545 2130 02/1878 04/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 546 2131 02/1878 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 547 2132 02/1878 27/10/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 548 2133 02/1878 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 549 2134 02/1878 10/1959
LYR 25 0-6-0 122 2226 10/1878 07/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 128 2227 10/1878 04/1938
LYR 25 0-6-0 164 2228 10/1878 03/1961
LYR 25 0-6-0 165 2239 10/1878 09/1953
LYR 25 0-6-0 168 2230 11/1878 10/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 172 2231 11/1878 06/1927
LYR 25 0-6-0 174 2232 11/1878 10/1926
LYR 25 0-6-0 178 2233 11/1878 10/1926
LYR 25 0-6-0 180 2234 11/1878 03/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 182 2235 12/1878 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 126 2272 12/1879 12/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 132 2273 12/1879 11/1933
LYR 25 0-6-0 133 2274 12/1879 12/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 136 2275 12/1879 04/1955
LYR 25 0-6-0 137 2276 01/1880 09/1954
LYR 25 0-6-0 138 2277 01/1880 11/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 140 2278 01/1880 12/1932
LYR 25 0-6-0 148 2279 02/1880 17/02/1962
LYR 25 0-6-0 149 2280 02/1880 09/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 163 2281 03/1880 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 166 2282 05/1880 09/1961
LYR 25 0-6-0 167 2283 05/1880 12/1932
LYR 25 0-6-0 170 2284 06/1880 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 171 2285 06/1880 04/1937
LYR 25 0-6-0 173 2286 06/1880 05/1960
LYR 25 0-6-0 176 2287 06/1880 12/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 177 2288 06/1880 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 179 2289 08/1880 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 181 2290 09/1880 04/1955
LYR 25 0-6-0 194 2291 09/1880 06/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 196 2292 09/1880 04/1949
LYR 25 0-6-0 197 2293 09/1880 11/12/1948
LYR 25 0-6-0 204 2294 09/1880 03/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 207 2295 09/1880 10/1926
LYR 25 0-6-0 222 2296 10/1880 12/1930
TVR H 0-6-0T 141   12/1884 02/1952
TVR H 0-6-0T 142   12/1884 11/1953
TVR H 0-6-0T 143   12/1884 11/1951
LYR 25 0-6-0 843 2800 03/1885 10/1949
LYR 25 0-6-0 844 2801 03/1885 09/1954
LYR 25 0-6-0 845 2802 03/1885 03/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 846 2803 03/1885 03/1961
LYR 25 0-6-0 847 2804 03/1885 08/1955
LYR 25 0-6-0 848 2805 04/1885 05/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 849 2806 04/1885 12/1932
LYR 25 0-6-0 850 2807 04/1885 12/1933
LYR 25 0-6-0 851 2808 04/1885 26/11/1960
LYR 25 0-6-0 852 2809 04/1885 03/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 853 2810 04/1885 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 854 2811 04/1885 09/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 855 2812 04/1885 10/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 856 2813 04/1885 08/1938
LYR 25 0-6-0 857 2814 05/1885 03/1936
LYR 25 0-6-0 858 2815 05/1885 11/1938
LYR 25 0-6-0 859 2816 05/1885 08/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 860 2817 05/1885 20/10/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 861 2818 05/1885 01/1936
LYR 25 0-6-0 862 2819 05/1885 05/1938
MSLR D7 4-4-0 561 3010 11/1887 09/1928
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1891 04/09/1948
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3300   10/1891 13/12/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3301   10/1891 25/10/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3305   12/1891 02/04/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3306   12/1891 11/03/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3307   12/1891 30/07/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3308   01/1892 17/10/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3309   01/1892 01/04/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3310   01/1892 10/12/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3312   01/1892 18/01/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3313   01/1892 14/04/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3314   28/02/1892 02/04/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3315   28/02/1892 22/08/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3317   28/02/1892 15/10/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3318   28/02/1892 22/08/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3319   28/02/1892 09/12/1950
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3321   03/1892 18/02/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3323   03/1892 06/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3324   03/1892 04/04/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3325   03/1892 18/02/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3326   03/1892 30/07/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3327   03/1892 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3329   04/1892 04/06/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3330   04/1892 26/08/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3331   05/1892 03/12/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3332   05/1892 10/05/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3333   05/1892 21/01/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3334   05/1892 10/03/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3335   05/1892 22/08/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3336   05/1892 23/08/1952
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3337   06/1892 20/02/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3338   06/1892 27/03/1948
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3339   06/1892 22/08/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 670 3452 07/1892 08/1938
MLSR J10 0-6-0 671 3453 07/1892 09/1933
MLSR J10 0-6-0 672 3454 07/1892 07/1933
MLSR J10 0-6-0 673 3455 08/1892 10/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 674 3456 08/1892 07/1933
MLSR J10 0-6-0 675 3457 08/1892 10/1950
MLSR J10 0-6-0 676 3458 09/1892 09/1933
MLSR J10 0-6-0 677 3459 09/1892 11/1935
MLSR J10 0-6-0 678 3460 09/1892 05/1944
MLSR J10 0-6-0 679 3461 09/1892 09/1935
MLSR J10 0-6-0 680 3462 09/1892 08/1952
MSLR D7 4-4-0 700 3440 10/1892 05/1936
MSLR D7 4-4-0 701 3441 10/1892 11/1935
MSLR D7 4-4-0 702 3442 10/1892 09/1933
MSLR D7 4-4-0 703 3443 10/1892 05/1935
MLSR J10 0-6-0 681 3463 10/1892 09/1935
MSLR D7 4-4-0 704 3444 11/1892 12/1939
MSLR D7 4-4-0 705 3445 11/1892 08/1933
MSLR D7 4-4-0 706 3446 11/1892 08/1935
MSLR D7 4-4-0 707 3447 11/1892 05/1933
MSLR D7 4-4-0 708 3448 11/1892 05/1937
MSLR D7 4-4-0 709 3449 11/1892 03/1932
MSLR D7 4-4-0 710 3450 12/1892 01/1930
MSLR D7 4-4-0 711 3451 12/1892 06/1933
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 1 3605 09/1895 10/1938
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 2 3606 09/1895 02/1934
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 4 3608 10/1895 08/1934
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 3 3607 11/1895 06/1936
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 5 3609 11/1895 03/1936
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 6 3610 11/1895 09/1934
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 7 3611 12/1895 08/1935
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 8 3612 12/1895 11/1935
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 01/1961
LDECR J60 0-6-0T 9 3654 02/1897 17/03/1948
LDECR J60 0-6-0T 10 3655 02/1897 09/1947
LDECR J60 0-6-0T 11 3656 02/1897 03/08/1948
LDECR J60 0-6-0T 12 3657 03/1897 02/1947
GCR G3 0-4-4T 13 3658 11/1897 07/1931
GCR G3 0-4-4T 14 3659 11/1897 02/1935
GCR G3 0-4-4T 15 3660 11/1897 07/1931
GCR G3 0-4-4T 16 3661 02/1898 08/1931
CarR Unclassified 0-4-0ST 5 3799 05/1898 09/1963
GCR G3 0-4-4T 17 3867 12/1898 03/1933
GCR G3 0-4-4T 18 3868 12/1898 11/1935
MGNR J40 0-6-0 66 3873 03/1899 10/1937
MGNR J40 0-6-0 67 3874 03/1899 01/1937
MGNR J40 0-6-0 68 3875 04/1899 11/1936
MGNR J40 0-6-0 69 3876 04/1899 07/1942
MGNR J40 0-6-0 70 3877 04/1899 03/1944
MGNR J40 0-6-0 71 3878 04/1899 07/1943
MGNR J40 0-6-0 72 3879 04/1899 10/1937
MGNR J40 0-6-0 73 3880 04/1899 05/1941
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 19 3903 07/1899 09/1935
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3570   08/1899 04/06/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3572   08/1899 26/11/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3573   08/1899 01/1948
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3574   08/1899 19/11/1960
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 20 3904 08/1899 08/1935
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 21 3909 08/1899 05/1935
LMS 2F 0-6-0     09/1899 02/1949
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3575   09/1899 05/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3578   09/1899 07/02/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3579   09/1899 03/12/1960
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 22 3910 09/1899 10/1935
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 23 3911 09/1899 09/1933
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3580   10/1899 15/04/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3581   10/1899 09/07/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3582   10/1899 05/05/1951
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3583   10/1899 04/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3584   10/1899 06/06/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3585   10/1899 22/09/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3586   10/1899 02/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3587   11/1899 17/10/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3593   01/1900 17/11/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3594   01/1900 29/10/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3595   01/1900 09/03/1957
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3596   01/1900 11/05/1957
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3598   01/1900 08/09/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3599   02/1900 29/12/1962
GNR J4 0-6-0 1136 3924 04/1900 09/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1138 3926 05/1900 06/1939
GNR J4 0-6-0 1139 3927 05/1900 06/11/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 1140 3928 05/1900 05/1928
GNR J4 0-6-0 1141 3929 05/1900 08/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1142 3930 05/1900 09/1940
GNR J4 0-6-0 1143 3931 05/1900 26/10/1946
GNR J4 0-6-0 1144 3932 05/1900 05/1937
GNR J4 0-6-0 1145 3933 05/1900 08/1938
GNR J4 0-6-0 1147 3935 06/1900 10/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1148 3936 06/1900 1923
GNR J4 0-6-0 1149 3937 06/1900 02/1939
GNR J4 0-6-0 1150 3938 06/1900 03/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1151 3939 06/1900 28/11/1947
GNR J4 0-6-0 1152 3940 06/1900 11/1936
GNR J4 0-6-0 1154 3942 06/1900 11/1942
GNR J4 0-6-0 1155 3943 06/1900 06/1938
GNR J4 0-6-0 1156 3944 07/1900 03/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1157 3945 07/1900 07/1937
GNR J4 0-6-0 1158 3946 07/1900 11/1933
GNR J4 0-6-0 1159 3947 07/1900 01/1936
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 24 3919 11/1900 09/1935
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 25 3920 11/1900 02/1936
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 26 3921 11/1900 01/1938
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 27 3922 11/1900 01/1937
LDECR N6 0-6-2T 28 3923 11/1900 11/1934
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3673   04/1901 26/08/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3674   04/1901 22/08/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3675   04/1901 26/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3676   04/1901 15/10/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3678   05/1901 05/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3679   05/1901 27/01/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3680   05/1901 04/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3681   05/1901 10/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3682   05/1901 25/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3683   05/1901 06/11/1954
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3684   05/1901 25/05/1957
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3686   05/1901 03/12/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3687   06/1901 04/08/1962
GCR Q4 0-8-0 56 4202 09/1903 25/09/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 57 4203 09/1903 06/11/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 58 4204 10/1903 13/08/1954
GCR Q4 0-8-0 59 4205 10/1903 25/06/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 64 4206 10/1903 26/12/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 65 4207 10/1903 26/02/1949
GCR Q4 0-8-0 67 4208 10/1903 07/08/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 68 4209 11/1903 20/08/1959
GCR Q4 0-8-0 70 4210 11/1903 28/08/1959
GCR Q4 0-8-0 71 4211 11/1903 07/06/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 85 4212 11/1903 10/10/1949
GCR Q4 0-8-0 86 4213 11/1903 10/04/1937
GCR Q4 0-8-0 87 4214 11/1903 11/12/1958
GCR Q4 0-8-0 91 4215 11/1903 17/11/1937
GCR Q4 0-8-0 92 4216 11/1903 23/05/1949
TVR O3 0-6-2T 410   01/1904 03/1948
GCR Q4 0-8-0 135 4217 01/1904 10/06/1937
GCR Q4 0-8-0 136 4218 01/1904 19/06/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 137 4219 01/1904 16/05/1949
TVR O3 0-6-2T 411   02/1904 02/1948
GCR Q4 0-8-0 138 4220 02/1904 05/11/1956
GCR Q4 0-8-0 139 4221 02/1904 18/08/1934
GCR Q4 0-8-0 140 4222 02/1904 27/11/1937
GCR Q4 0-8-0 142 4223 03/1904 05/09/1949
GCR Q4 0-8-0 143 4224 03/1904 17/11/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 144 4225 03/1904 14/05/1938
GCR Q4 0-8-0 145 4226 03/1904 21/09/1936
GCR Q4 0-8-0 146 4227 03/1904 14/03/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 147 4228 03/1904 03/09/1959
GCR Q4 0-8-0 148 4229 04/1904 29/10/1938
GCR Q4 0-8-0 149 4230 04/1904 09/12/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 150 4231 04/1904 06/03/1939
LDECR M1 0-6-4T 29 4246 05/1904 04/03/1946
GCR Q4 0-8-0 151 4232 05/1904 16/05/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 152 4233 05/1904 26/12/1949
GCR Q4 0-8-0 153 4234 05/1904 14/03/1951
LDECR M1 0-6-4T 30 4247 06/1904 09/12/1939
LDECR M1 0-6-4T 31 4248 06/1904 10/08/1946
LDECR M1 0-6-4T 32 4249 06/1904 04/07/1947
LDECR M1 0-6-4T 33 4250 06/1904 22/02/1939
LDECR M1 0-6-4T 34 4251 06/1904 18/06/1946
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1073 4335 07/1905 10/12/1935
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1074 4336 07/1905 20/01/1936
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1075 4337 08/1905 06/01/1940
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1076 4338 08/1905 26/12/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1077 4339 08/1905 02/10/1958
SR Atlantics 4-4-2 2037   12/1905 07/1951
SR Atlantics 4-4-2 2038   12/1905 07/1951
SR Atlantics 4-4-2 2039   01/1906 03/1951
LDECR M1 0-6-4T A1 4435 12/1906 16/09/1941
LDECR M1 0-6-4T A2 4436 12/1906 12/07/1943
LDECR M1 0-6-4T A3 4437 12/1906 16/02/1944
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1132 4475 02/1907 11/06/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1133 4476 02/1907 26/02/1949
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1134 4477 02/1907 25/09/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1135 4478 03/1907 16/10/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1136 4479 03/1907 26/05/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1137 4480 03/1907 28/02/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1138 4481 03/1907 05/12/1934
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1139 4482 03/1907 18/04/1956
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1140 4483 03/1907 15/08/1949
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1141 4484 03/1907 31/01/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1142 4485 03/1907 22/05/1937
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1143 4486 04/1907 16/05/1936
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1144 4487 04/1907 07/01/1938
HBR J75 0-6-0T 142 4545 01/1908 06/1938
HBR J75 0-6-0T 143 4546 01/1908 05/1937
HBR J75 0-6-0T 144 4547 01/1908 06/1937
HBR J75 0-6-0T 145 4548 02/1908 05/1937
HBR J75 0-6-0T 146 4549 02/1908 09/1937
HBR J75 0-6-0T 147 4550 02/1908 03/1939
HBR J75 0-6-0T 148 4551 02/1908 07/1937
HBR J75 0-6-0T 149 4552 02/1908 05/1937
HBR J75 0-6-0T 150 4553 02/1908 06/1937
HBR J75 0-6-0T 151 4554 03/1908 01/1949
CarR Unclassified 0-6-2T 155   12/1908 09/1953
FR   0-6-2T 94 4855 1912 11/1934
FR   0-6-2T 95 4856 1912 09/1929
GCR O4 2-8-0 1183 4891 07/1912 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1184 4892 07/1912 09/09/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1185 4893 07/1912 14/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1186 4894 07/1912 07/03/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1187 4895 07/1912 12/12/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1188 4896 07/1912 09/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1189 4897 07/1912 14/02/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1190 4898 07/1912 19/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1191 4899 08/1912 09/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1192 4900 08/1912 20/12/1960
GCR O4 2-8-0 1193 4901 08/1912 11/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1194 4902 09/1912 13/07/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1195 4903 09/1912 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1196 4904 09/1912 12/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1197 4905 09/1912 04/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1198 4906 09/1912 01/08/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1199 4907 09/1912 24/09/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1200 4908 10/1912 09/11/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1201 4909 10/1912 01/02/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1202 4910 10/1912 19/09/1941
FR   0-6-2T 92 5042 1914 08/1934
FR   0-6-2T 93 5043 1914 08/1932
FR   0-6-0T 51 5121 1915 11/1934
FR   0-6-0T 52 5122 1915 06/1930
FR   4-4-2T 38 5119 1915 12/1930
FR   4-4-2T 39 5120 1915 12/1932
FR   4-4-2T 42 5172 1915 12/1930
FR   4-4-2T 43 5173 1915 02/1931
FR   0-6-0 19 5195 1918 09/1932
FR   0-6-0 20 5196 1918 06/1957
FR   0-6-0 21 5197 1918 05/1930
FR   0-6-0 22 5198 1918 12/1930
GCR O4 2-8-0 1601 5183 01/1918 25/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1603 5185 01/1918 15/01/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1604 5186 02/1918 14/04/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1605 5187 02/1918 11/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1606 5188 02/1918 06/05/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1607 5189 02/1918 26/01/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1608 5190 03/1918 24/03/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1609 5191 03/1918 27/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1610 5192 03/1918 11/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1611 5193 03/1918 11/11/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1612 5194 04/1918 17/04/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1614 5200 05/1918 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1616 5202 06/1918 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1617 5203 06/1918 19/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1618 5204 06/1918 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1619 5205 07/1918 13/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1620 5206 07/1918 09/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1621 5207 07/1918 05/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1622 5208 07/1918 08/08/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1624 5210 08/1918 18/05/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1625 5211 08/1918 01/11/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1626 5212 08/1918 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1627 5213 09/1918 17/12/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1628 5214 09/1918 15/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1629 5215 09/1918 19/01/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1631 5217 10/1918 02/12/1958
GCR O4 2-8-0 1632 5218 10/1918 18/10/1941
FR   4-6-4T 115 5292 1920 05/1935
FR   4-6-4T 116 5293 1920 07/1935
FR   4-6-4T 117 5294 1920 11/1934
FR   4-6-4T 118 5295 1920 1940
FR   4-6-4T 119 5296 1921 05/1935
GNR K2 2-6-0 1680 5330 06/1921 08/07/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1681 5331 06/1921 16/12/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1682 5332 06/1921 25/11/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1683 5333 06/1921 23/12/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1684 5334 06/1921 16/04/1958
GNR K2 2-6-0 1685 5335 06/1921 02/05/1958
GNR K2 2-6-0 1686 5336 06/1921 23/03/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1687 5337 06/1921 11/05/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1688 5338 07/1921 09/10/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1689 5339 07/1921 13/05/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1690 5340 07/1921 21/10/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1691 5341 07/1921 12/12/1958
GNR K2 2-6-0 1692 5342 07/1921 13/06/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1693 5343 07/1921 17/06/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1694 5344 07/1921 24/03/1961
GNR K2 2-6-0 1695 5345 07/1921 23/04/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1696 5346 07/1921 07/12/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1697 5347 08/1921 29/10/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1698 5348 08/1921 26/06/1961
GNR K2 2-6-0 1699 5349 08/1921 30/09/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1700 5350 08/1921 03/11/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1701 5351 08/1921 22/03/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1702 5352 08/1921 02/09/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1703 5353 08/1921 11/02/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1704 5354 09/1921 29/07/1960
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6378 5379 07/1924 05/1961
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6379 5380 08/1924 09/1961
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6380 5381 08/1924 07/1959
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6381 5382 08/1924 07/1961
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6382 5383 08/1924 10/1959
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6383 5384 08/1924 10/1959
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6384 5385 09/1924 08/1959
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6385 5386 09/1924 03/1959
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6386 5387 10/1924 09/1958
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6387 5388 10/1924 09/1961
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6388 5389 10/1924 07/1961
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 6389 5390 10/1924 07/1961
LMS 0F 0-4-0ST 7000 5644 11/1932 10/1966
LMS 0F 0-4-0ST 7001 5655 11/1932 12/1966
LMS 0F 0-4-0ST 7002 5656 11/1932 09/1964
LMS 0F 0-4-0ST 7003 5657 12/1932 04/1964
LMS 0F 0-4-0ST 7004 5658 12/1932 01/1964