Manufacturer: Metropolitan Vickers
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GT2 | Co-Co | 18100 | 16/12/1951 | 01/01/1958 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5700 | 25/07/1958 | 30/12/1967 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5701 | 01/09/1958 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5702 | 29/09/1958 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5703 | 20/10/1958 | 30/12/1967 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5704 | 05/11/1958 | 30/12/1967 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5705 | 05/12/1958 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5706 | 05/12/1958 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5707 | 19/12/1958 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5708 | 10/01/1959 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5709 | 10/01/1959 | 30/12/1967 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5710 | 14/02/1959 | 30/12/1967 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5711 | 14/02/1959 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5712 | 07/03/1959 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5713 | 07/03/1959 | 30/12/1967 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5714 | 14/03/1959 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5715 | 11/04/1959 | 04/05/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5716 | 16/05/1959 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5717 | 19/06/1959 | 07/09/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5718 | 11/07/1959 | 04/05/1968 | |||
28 | Co-Bo | D5719 | 17/10/1959 | 07/09/1968 |