Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 597 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3242 Week
» 5824 Month
» 270457 Year
» 1492022 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
GSWR 381 4-6-0 381 15734 05/1903 02/1931
GSWR 381 4-6-0 382 15735 05/1903 1928
GSWR 381 4-6-0 383 15736 05/1903 1930
GSWR 381 4-6-0 384 15737 05/1903 1933
LMS 2P 4-4-2T 2104   06/1903 21/03/1953
LMS 2P 4-4-2T 2106   06/1903 03/12/1949
LMS 2P 4-4-2T 2107   06/1903 12/1949
LMS 2P 4-4-2T 2108   06/1903 05/1952
LMS 2P 4-4-2T 2109   06/1903 03/1951
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1980   06/1903 02/05/1958
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1981   06/1903 18/06/1962
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1982   06/1903 19/02/1959
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1983   06/1903 19/02/1959
GSWR 381 4-6-0 385 15738 06/1903 09/1927
GSWR 381 4-6-0 386 15739 06/1903 04/1928
GSWR 381 4-6-0 387 15740 06/1903 1930
GSWR 381 4-6-0 388 15741 06/1903 10/1932
GSWR 381 4-6-0 389 15742 06/1903 06/1931
GSWR 381 4-6-0 390 15743 06/1903 1930
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1984   07/1903 19/02/1959
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1985   07/1903 19/02/1959
FR   0-6-2T 103 16113 1904 05/1934
FR   0-6-2T 104 16114 1904 08/1930
FR   0-6-2T 105 16115 1904 05/1933
FR   0-6-2T 106 16116 1904 03/1931
FR   0-6-2T 107 16117 1904 12/1929
GCR C4 4-4-2 1083 16933 10/1905 12/1947
GCR C4 4-4-2 1084 16934 10/1905 22/11/1950
GCR C4 4-4-2 1085 16935 10/1905 17/11/1950
GCR C4 4-4-2 1086 16936 10/1905 12/02/1949
GCR C4 4-4-2 1087 16937 10/1905 11/1944
GCR C4 4-4-2 1088 16938 10/1905 07/08/1949
GCR C4 4-4-2 1089 16939 11/1905 04/1947
GCR C4 4-4-2 1090 16940 11/1905 11/1939
GCR C4 4-4-2 1091 16941 11/1905 20/03/1948
GCR C4 4-4-2 1092 16942 11/1905 08/06/1949
GCR C4 4-4-2 1093 16943 11/1905 13/11/1948
GCR C4 4-4-2 1094 16944 11/1905 12/05/1949
FR   0-6-0 3 17840 1906 05/1930
FR   0-6-0 4 17841 1906 07/1930
FR   0-6-0 5 17842 1906 12/1934
FR   0-6-0 6 17843 1906 05/1930
HR C 4-4-0 38 17398 04/1906 12/1933
NBR J35 0-6-0 848 17322 06/1906 04/09/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 849 17323 06/1906 02/10/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 850 17324 06/1906 01/12/1960
NBR J35 0-6-0 851 17325 06/1906 16/09/1960
NBR J35 0-6-0 852 17326 06/1906 30/05/1958
NBR J35 0-6-0 853 17327 06/1906 12/1947
NBR J35 0-6-0 854 17328 06/1906 09/07/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 855 17329 06/1906 11/1947
NBR J35 0-6-0 856 17330 06/1906 27/05/1960
NBR J35 0-6-0 857 17331 06/1906 12/1946
LMS Ben 4-4-0 41   07/1906 08/05/1948
LMS Ben 4-4-0 47   07/1906 21/08/1948
HR C 4-4-0 41 17399 07/1906 05/1948
HR C 4-4-0 47 17400 07/1906 09/1948
FR   0-6-2T 96 17808 1907 08/1938
FR   0-6-2T 97 17809 1907 1941
FR   0-6-2T 108 17810 1907 08/1935
FR   0-6-2T 109 17811 1907 01/1933
FR   0-6-2T 110 17812 1907 11/1931
FR   0-6-2T 111 17813 1907 07/1933
GSWR 361 0-6-0 391 17884 04/1907 12/1937
GSWR 361 0-6-0 392 17885 04/1907 07/1932
GSWR 361 0-6-0 393 17886 04/1907 10/1928
GSWR 361 0-6-0 394 17887 04/1907 09/1932
GSWR 361 0-6-0 395 17888 04/1907 1931
GSWR 361 0-6-0 396 17889 04/1907 08/1936
GSWR 361 0-6-0 397 17890 04/1907 02/1935
GSWR 361 0-6-0 398 17891 04/1907 1930
GSWR 361 0-6-0 399 17892 04/1907 11/1932
GSWR 361 0-6-0 400 17893 04/1907 08/1931
GSWR 361 0-6-0 401 17894 04/1907 11/1936
GSWR 361 0-6-0 402 17895 04/1907 09/1935
HR K 0-6-0 36 17896 07/1907 07/1947
HR K 0-6-0 55 17897 07/1907 12/1946
MCR 18 0-6-0 18 18285 1908 12/1925
HR U 4-4-0 61 18269 05/1908 05/1936
HR U 4-4-0 63 18270 05/1908 12/1932
HR U 4-4-0 66 18271 05/1908 10/1935
HR U 4-4-0 68 18272 05/1908 04/1934
NER J27 0-6-0 1014 18355 05/1908 23/12/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 1015 18356 05/1908 09/09/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1017 18357 05/1908 05/06/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1022 18358 05/1908 24/05/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1023 18359 05/1908 29/06/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1024 18360 05/1908 21/11/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1025 18361 05/1908 14/10/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1027 18362 05/1908 01/05/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1028 18363 05/1908 30/07/1962
NER J27 0-6-0 1029 18364 05/1908 09/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1030 18365 06/1908 06/05/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 1034 18366 06/1908 27/02/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1035 18367 06/1908 01/03/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1036 18368 06/1908 20/03/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1039 18369 06/1908 11/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1040 18370 06/1908 07/06/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1044 18371 06/1908 26/08/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1046 18372 06/1908 03/07/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1047 18373 06/1908 05/1964
NER J27 0-6-0 1048 18374 06/1908 30/03/1959
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1986   08/1908 19/02/1959
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1987   08/1908 19/02/1959
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1988   08/1908 09/04/1958
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1989   09/1908 09/04/1958
HR X 0-6-4T 39 18805 1909 12/1936
HR X 0-6-4T 64 18806 1909 10/1934
HR X 0-6-4T 65 18807 1909 08/1933
HR X 0-6-4T 69 18808 1909 10/1932
HR U 4-4-0 60 18803 05/1909 10/1932
HR U 4-4-0 62 18804 05/1909 03/1937
NBR D29 4-4-0     07/1909 20/04/1948
NBR D29 4-4-0     07/1909 11/1949
NBR D29 4-4-0     08/1909 06/1949
NBR D29 4-4-0     08/1909 02/03/1948
NBR D29 4-4-0     08/1909 08/1949
NBR J35 0-6-0 197 18880 08/1909 30/09/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 198 18881 08/1909 02/03/1959
NBR D29 4-4-0     09/1909 22/02/1951
NBR G9 0-4-4T 239 18868 09/1909 07/1936
NBR G9 0-4-4T 334 18869 09/1909 02/1939
NBR G9 0-4-4T 349 18870 09/1909 07/1936
NBR J35 0-6-0 199 18882 09/1909 17/09/1958
NBR J35 0-6-0 200 18883 09/1909 22/04/1960
NBR J35 0-6-0 201 18884 09/1909 02/10/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 202 18885 09/1909 20/06/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 203 18886 09/1909 11/12/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 204 18887 09/1909 29/12/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 205 18888 09/1909 13/02/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 206 18889 09/1909 10/11/1960
NBR N14 0-6-2T 858 18862 09/1909 25/03/1954
NBR N14 0-6-2T 859 18863 09/1909 09/1947
NBR N14 0-6-2T 860 18864 09/1909 11/1947
NBR N14 0-6-2T 861 18865 09/1909 12/1947
NBR N14 0-6-2T 862 18866 09/1909 03/11/1950
NBR N14 0-6-2T 863 18867 09/1909 25/03/1954
NBR G9 0-4-4T 350 18871 10/1909 01/1939
NBR G9 0-4-4T 351 18872 10/1909 11/1939
NBR G9 0-4-4T 352 18873 10/1909 06/1937
NBR G9 0-4-4T 353 18874 10/1909 10/1937
NBR G9 0-4-4T 354 18875 10/1909 09/1936
NBR G9 0-4-4T 355 18876 10/1909 09/1939
NBR G9 0-4-4T 356 18877 10/1909 05/1939
NBR G9 0-4-4T 475 18879 10/1909 11/1940
NBR G9 0-4-4T 474 18878 11/1909 01/1939
NBR J35 0-6-0 364 18955 11/1909 06/06/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 365 18956 11/1909 20/06/1958
NBR J35 0-6-0 366 18957 11/1909 06/10/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 367 18958 11/1909 09/04/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 368 18959 11/1909 21/09/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 369 18960 12/1909 27/10/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 370 18961 12/1909 09/06/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 371 18962 12/1909 06/08/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 372 18963 12/1909 21/09/1960
NBR J35 0-6-0 373 18964 12/1909 09/1947
HR Castle 4-6-0 30 19011 03/1910 01/1945
NBR J35 0-6-0 374 19085 03/1910 23/09/1960
NBR J35 0-6-0 375 19086 03/1910 25/10/1961
NBR J35 0-6-0 376 19087 03/1910 03/12/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 377 19088 03/1910 11/01/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 378 19089 03/1910 10/1946
NBR J35 0-6-0 379 19090 03/1910 02/10/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 207 19093 03/1910 16/09/1960
NBR J35 0-6-0 208 19094 03/1910 23/09/1959
NBR J35 0-6-0 380 19091 04/1910 29/11/1962
NBR J35 0-6-0 381 19092 04/1910 12/10/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 7 19159 06/1910 12/02/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 154 19160 06/1910 16/06/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 209 19161 06/1910 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 210 19162 06/1910 02/12/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 251 19163 06/1910 27/12/1957
NBR N15 0-6-2T 386 19165 06/1910 18/11/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 387 19166 06/1910 03/08/1960
GSWR 17 0-6-0 17 19244 07/1910 10/1931
GSWR 17 0-6-0 41 19245 07/1910 02/1934
GSWR 17 0-6-0 43 19246 07/1910 05/1935
GSWR 17 0-6-0 46 19247 07/1910 1930
GSWR 17 0-6-0 47 19248 07/1910 04/1931
NBR N15 0-6-2T 282 19164 07/1910 12/02/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 388 19167 07/1910 02/03/1961
NBR N15 0-6-2T 389 19168 07/1910 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 390 19169 07/1910 11/05/1961
NBR N15 0-6-2T 391 19170 07/1910 21/05/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 392 19171 07/1910 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 393 19172 07/1910 26/04/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 396 19173 08/1910 13/06/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 397 19174 08/1910 02/09/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 398 19175 08/1910 24/01/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 399 19176 08/1910 16/09/1960
GSWR 17 0-6-0 48 19249 09/1910 1930
GSWR 17 0-6-0 49 19250 09/1910 09/1936
GSWR 17 0-6-0 50 19251 09/1910 1930
GSWR 17 0-6-0 51 19252 09/1910 01/1937
GSWR 17 0-6-0 118 19253 09/1910 10/1931
GSWR 17 0-6-0 22 19254 10/1910 06/1934
GSWR 17 0-6-0 23 19255 10/1910 1930
GSWR 17 0-6-0 24 19256 10/1910 10/1931
GSWR 17 0-6-0 35 19257 10/1910 05/1936
GSWR 17 0-6-0 37 19258 11/1910 12/1931
HR X 0-6-4T 29 19013 1911 10/1932
HR X 0-6-4T 31 19014 1911 11/1934
HR X 0-6-4T 42 19015 1911 11/1935
HR X 0-6-4T 44 19016 1911 11/1934
HR Castle 4-6-0 35 19012 02/1911 07/1946
GSWR 381 4-6-0 128 19504 07/1911 12/1933
GSWR 381 4-6-0 129 19505 07/1911 11/1934
NER C7 4-4-2 706 19446 07/1911 12/1946
NER C7 4-4-2 709 19447 07/1911 03/1946
NER C7 4-4-2 710 19448 07/1911 02/1944
NER C7 4-4-2 714 19449 07/1911 01/1944
NER C7 4-4-2 716 19450 07/1911 26/06/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 717 19451 08/1911 04/1944
NER C7 4-4-2 718 19452 08/1911 06/1946
NER C7 4-4-2 719 19453 08/1911 04/1944
NER C7 4-4-2 720 19454 08/1911 08/11/1947
NER C7 4-4-2 722 19456 08/1911 03/1947
NER C7 4-4-2 721 19455 09/1911 02/1944
NER C7 4-4-2 727 19457 09/1911 01/1943
NER C7 4-4-2 728 19458 09/1911 11/1945
NER C7 4-4-2 729 19459 09/1911 11/1945
NER C7 4-4-2 732 19460 10/1911 12/1946
NER C7 4-4-2 733 19461 10/1911 08/1945
NER C7 4-4-2 734 19462 10/1911 09/1944
NER C7 4-4-2 735 19463 10/1911 06/1945
NER C7 4-4-2 736 19464 11/1911 04/1946
NER C7 4-4-2 737 19465 12/1911 12/1945
NBR N15 0-6-2T 907 19828 07/1912 25/02/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 908 19829 07/1912 11/03/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 909 19830 07/1912 07/07/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 910 19831 08/1912 06/06/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 911 19832 08/1912 06/06/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 912 19833 08/1912 22/03/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 913 19834 08/1912 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 914 19835 08/1912 23/02/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 915 19836 08/1912 30/12/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 916 19837 08/1912 22/09/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 917 19838 08/1912 18/11/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 918 19839 08/1912 08/09/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 919 19840 08/1912 12/02/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 920 19841 08/1912 09/04/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 921 19842 08/1912 18/05/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 922 19843 08/1912 30/10/1961
NBR N15 0-6-2T 923 19844 08/1912 14/08/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 924 19845 08/1912 16/08/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 925 19846 08/1912 02/03/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 926 19847 08/1912 12/02/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1203 19859 08/1912 29/08/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1204 19860 08/1912 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1205 19861 08/1912 09/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1206 19862 08/1912 09/06/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1207 19863 08/1912 16/04/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1208 19864 08/1912 24/11/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1209 19865 08/1912 18/06/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1210 19866 08/1912 16/03/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1211 19867 08/1912 03/03/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1212 19868 08/1912 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1213 19869 08/1912 18/10/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1214 19870 09/1912 27/10/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1215 19871 09/1912 22/02/1952
GCR O4 2-8-0 1216 19872 09/1912 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1217 19873 09/1912 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1218 19874 09/1912 27/02/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1219 19875 10/1912 24/11/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1220 19876 10/1912 17/03/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1221 19877 10/1912 03/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1222 19878 10/1912 22/02/1952
GCR O4 2-8-0 1223 19879 10/1912 22/12/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1224 19880 10/1912 13/12/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1225 19881 11/1912 14/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1226 19882 11/1912 27/04/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1227 19883 11/1912 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1228 19884 11/1912 03/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1229 19885 11/1912 29/11/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1230 19886 11/1912 18/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1231 19887 11/1912 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1232 19888 11/1912 24/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1233 19889 11/1912 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1234 19890 11/1912 10/02/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1235 19891 11/1912 04/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1236 19892 11/1912 30/06/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1237 19893 11/1912 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1238 19894 12/1912 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1239 19895 12/1912 21/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1240 19896 12/1912 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1241 19897 12/1912 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1242 19898 12/1912 11/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1243 19899 12/1912 11/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1244 19900 12/1912 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1245 19901 12/1912 23/07/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1246 19902 12/1912 03/10/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1247 19903 12/1912 04/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1248 19904 12/1912 21/04/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1249 19905 12/1912 29/08/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1250 19906 12/1912 18/05/1961
FR D5 0-6-0 1 20073 1913 04/1956
FR D5 0-6-0 2 20074 1913 12/1932
FR D5 0-6-0 25 20075 1913 07/1932
FR D5 0-6-0 26 20076 1913 08/1935
FR   4-4-0 130 20071 1913 08/1932
FR   4-4-0 131 20072 1913 11/1932
GCR O4 2-8-0 1251 19907 01/1913 04/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1252 19908 01/1913 09/02/1962
GSWR 279 0-6-0 279 20113 04/1913 09/1931
GSWR 279 0-6-0 292 20114 04/1913 1930
GSWR 279 0-6-0 293 20115 04/1913 11/1931
GSWR 279 0-6-0 294 20116 04/1913 12/1932
GSWR 279 0-6-0 295 20117 04/1913 08/1931
HR Castle 4-6-0 26 20160 04/1913 05/1935
HR Castle 4-6-0 29 20163 04/1913 04/1947
GSWR 279 0-6-0 296 20118 05/1913 1930
GSWR 279 0-6-0 297 20119 05/1913 11/1932
GSWR 279 0-6-0 298 20120 05/1913 1930
GSWR 279 0-6-0 299 20121 05/1913 09/1933
GSWR 279 0-6-0 300 20122 05/1913 04/1933
NBR N15 0-6-2T 219 20164 05/1913 27/07/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 223 20165 05/1913 15/04/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 224 20166 05/1913 19/05/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 229 20167 05/1913 07/12/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 230 20168 05/1913 20/12/1957
NBR N15 0-6-2T 246 20169 05/1913 05/02/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 252 20170 05/1913 09/02/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 257 20171 05/1913 06/01/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 264 20172 05/1913 16/06/1960
GSWR 279 0-6-0 301 20123 06/1913 1930
GSWR 279 0-6-0 302 20124 06/1913 1930
GSWR 279 0-6-0 303 20125 06/1913 10/1931
GSWR 279 0-6-0 304 20126 06/1913 10/1931
GSWR 279 0-6-0 305 20127 06/1913 1930
GSWR 131 4-4-0 131 20128 06/1913 09/1936
GSWR 131 4-4-0 132 20129 06/1913 10/1934
GSWR 131 4-4-0 133 20130 06/1913 10/1934
GSWR 131 4-4-0 134 20131 06/1913 12/1937
GSWR 131 4-4-0 135 20132 06/1913 07/1936
GSWR 131 4-4-0 136 20133 06/1913 06/1937
HR Castle 4-6-0 27 20161 07/1913 02/1935
HR Castle 4-6-0 28 20162 07/1913 08/1944
FR D5 0-6-0 27 20077 1914 08/1932
FR D5 0-6-0 28 20078 1914 02/1957
FR   4-4-0 132 20867 1914 09/1932
FR   4-4-0 133 20868 1914 04/1932
TVR A 0-6-2T 45   08/1915 05/10/1953
TVR A 0-6-2T 122   08/1915 14/03/1955
TVR A 0-6-2T 123   08/1915 03/01/1955
TVR A 0-6-2T 124   08/1915 02/01/1956
TVR A 0-6-2T 42   08/1915 11/06/1956
TVR A 0-6-2T 52   08/1915 23/07/1956
GSWR 403 2-6-0 403 21172 09/1915 09/1946
GSWR 403 2-6-0 404 21173 09/1915 04/1944
GSWR 403 2-6-0 405 21174 09/1915 09/1935
GSWR 403 2-6-0 406 21175 09/1915 11/1936
GSWR 403 2-6-0 407 21176 09/1915 11/1945
GSWR 403 2-6-0 408 21177 09/1915 04/1938
GSWR 403 2-6-0 410 21179 10/1915 12/1936
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 136 21256 10/1915 01/1935
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 173 21257 10/1915 02/1935
GSWR 403 2-6-0 409 21178 11/1915 01/1938
GSWR 403 2-6-0 116 21180 11/1915 12/1935
GSWR 403 2-6-0 117 21181 11/1915 03/1947
GSWR 403 2-6-0 121 21182 11/1915 11/1938
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 257 21258 11/1915 09/1934
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 446 21259 11/1915 08/1935
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 1749 21260 11/1915 01/1935
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 2063 21261 11/1915 05/1935
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 2175 21262 11/1915 06/1937
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 2203 21263 11/1915 06/1935
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 45 21242 12/1915 12/1945
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 84 21243 12/1915 01/1938
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 90 21244 12/1915 05/1936
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 91 21245 12/1915 03/1936
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 2300 21264 12/1915 09/1934
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 2392 21265 12/1915 09/1936
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 90 21266 12/1915 08/1936
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 401 21267 12/1915 11/1934
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 525 21268 12/1915 04/1937
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 610 21269 12/1915 10/1935
NBR C16 4-4-2T 438 21203 12/1915 09/10/1959
NBR C16 4-4-2T 439 21204 12/1915 20/04/1956
NBR C16 4-4-2T 440 21205 12/1915 22/04/1960
NBR C16 4-4-2T 441 21206 12/1915 03/04/1961
NBR C16 4-4-2T 442 21207 12/1915 22/04/1960
HR Loch 4-4-0 70 21456 1916 09/1936
HR Loch 4-4-0 71 21457 1916 11/1935
HR Loch 4-4-0 72 21458 1916 10/1934
CR 113 4-4-0 928 21442 1916 20/10/1959
CR 113 4-4-0 929 21443 1916 12/10/1959
CR 113 4-4-0 930 21444 1916 05/11/1959
CR 113 4-4-0 931 21445 1916 17/12/1959
CR 113 4-4-0 932 21446 1916 06/10/1959
CR 113 4-4-0 933 21447 1916 20/10/1959
CR 113 4-4-0 934 21448 1916 21/10/1959
CR 113 4-4-0 935 21449 1916 06/10/1959
CR 113 4-4-0 936 21450 1916 06/06/1961
CR 113 4-4-0 937 21451 1916 15/03/1960
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 122 21246 01/1916 11/1936
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 284 21247 01/1916 12/1945
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 867 21270 01/1916 12/1936
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 1132 21271 01/1916 02/1946
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 1466 21272 01/1916 08/1936
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 1734 21273 01/1916 04/1935
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 2055 21274 01/1916 04/1935
LNWR Prince of Wales 4-6-0 2329 21275 01/1916 04/1935
NBR C16 4-4-2T 443 21208 01/1916 22/10/1959
NBR C16 4-4-2T 444 21209 02/1916 09/10/1959
NBR C16 4-4-2T 445 21210 02/1916 15/02/1961
NBR C16 4-4-2T 446 21211 02/1916 22/04/1960
NBR C16 4-4-2T 447 21212 03/1916 02/03/1960
NBR C16 4-4-2T 448 21213 04/1916 02/03/1960
NBR C16 4-4-2T 449 21214 04/1916 13/04/1956
NBR C16 4-4-2T 450 21215 04/1916 15/02/1961
NBR C16 4-4-2T 451 21216 04/1916 08/05/1956
NBR C16 4-4-2T 452 21217 05/1916 02/03/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 47 21218 08/1916 13/11/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 54 21219 08/1916 12/01/1961
NBR N15 0-6-2T 61 21220 09/1916 15/11/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 65 21221 09/1916 07/10/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 69 21222 10/1916 12/08/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 70 21223 12/1916 09/08/1960
CR 944 4-6-2T 946 21482 01/1917 03/1952
CR 944 4-6-2T 947 21483 01/1917 30/06/1951
CR 944 4-6-2T 948 21484 01/1917 09/1949
CR 944 4-6-2T 949 21485 01/1917 12/1948
CR 944 4-6-2T 950 21486 01/1917 07/1950
CR 944 4-6-2T 951 21487 01/1917 07/1946
NBR N15 0-6-2T 276 21224 01/1917 29/09/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 453 21225 01/1917 20/03/1961
NBR N15 0-6-2T 142 21226 02/1917 12/02/1962
CR 944 4-6-2T 944 21480 03/1917 31/03/1952
CR 944 4-6-2T 945 21481 03/1917 18/12/1948
HR Castle 4-6-0 50 21459 03/1917 09/1938
HR Castle 4-6-0 58 21460 03/1917 03/1946
NBR N15 0-6-2T 165 21227 03/1917 02/09/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 166 21228 03/1917 13/11/1961
NBR N15 0-6-2T 259 21229 03/1917 23/11/1960
CR 944 4-6-2T 952 21488 04/1917 05/1946
CR 944 4-6-2T 953 21489 04/1917 07/10/1953
HR Castle 4-6-0 59 21461 04/1917 04/1935
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 101 21507 05/1917 12/1945
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 102 21508 05/1917 02/1938
CR 944 4-6-2T 954 21490 05/1917 19/02/1952
CR 944 4-6-2T 955 21491 05/1917 06/06/1952
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 141 21509 06/1917 03/1946
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 142 21510 06/1917 06/1938
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 143 21511 06/1917 01/1938
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 144 21512 06/1917 06/1937
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 145 21513 06/1917 03/1938
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 146 21514 06/1917 02/1936
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 147 21515 06/1917 08/1940
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 148 21516 06/1917 05/1936
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 149 21517 06/1917 11/1937
GSWR 45 0-6-2T 150 21518 06/1917 11/1947
GCR O4 2-8-0 1805 21772 09/1917 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1806 21773 09/1917 18/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1807 21774 09/1917 09/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1809 21776 09/1917 09/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1811 21778 10/1917 03/10/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1812 21779 10/1917 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1815 21782 10/1917 04/04/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1816 21783 10/1917 10/02/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1817 21784 10/1917 21/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1819 21786 10/1917 19/07/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1820 21787 10/1917 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1821 21788 10/1917 27/02/1964
GSWR 5 0-6-0T 5 21519 11/1917 04/1934
GSWR 5 0-6-0T 7 21520 11/1917 04/1934
GSWR 5 0-6-0T 9 21521 11/1917 04/1934
GCR O4 2-8-0 1824 21791 11/1917 18/05/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1827 21794 11/1917 19/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1829 21796 11/1917 31/10/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1831 21798 11/1917 09/03/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1833 21800 12/1917 12/03/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1834 21801 12/1917 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1836 21803 12/1917 02/12/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1839 21806 12/1917 07/02/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1840 21807 12/1917 26/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1847 21824 12/1917 24/05/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1848 21825 12/1917 23/09/1962
FR D5 0-6-0 23 21993 1918 11/1932
FR D5 0-6-0 24 21994 1918 04/1930
FR D5 0-6-0 29 21995 1918 11/1930
FR D5 0-6-0 30 21996 1918 06/1935
GCR O4 2-8-0 1841 21808 01/1918 18/06/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1845 21822 01/1918 13/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1849 21826 02/1918 26/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1892 21869 02/1918 12/03/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1894 21871 02/1918 05/09/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1895 21872 02/1918 27/10/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1896 21873 02/1918 09/05/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1898 21875 02/1918 03/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1899 21876 02/1918 30/10/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1854 21831 03/1918 20/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1855 21832 03/1918 11/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1856 21833 03/1918 08/02/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1857 21834 03/1918 27/02/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1858 21835 03/1918 11/10/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1859 21836 03/1918 26/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1860 21837 03/1918 03/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1861 21838 03/1918 11/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1902 21879 03/1918 27/10/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1903 21880 03/1918 13/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1904 21881 03/1918 24/05/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1905 21882 03/1918 05/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1907 21884 03/1918 16/05/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1908 21885 03/1918 16/07/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1862 21839 04/1918 06/03/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1863 21840 04/1918 19/12/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1864 21841 04/1918 25/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1866 21843 04/1918 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1867 21844 04/1918 20/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1868 21845 04/1918 10/03/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1869 21846 04/1918 24/03/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1870 21847 04/1918 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1910 21887 04/1918 23/06/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1911 21888 04/1918 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1913 21890 04/1918 11/12/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1873 21850 05/1918 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1874 21851 05/1918 14/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1875 21852 05/1918 13/04/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1876 21853 05/1918 07/07/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1878 21855 05/1918 17/04/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1879 21856 05/1918 25/05/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1880 21857 05/1918 09/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1881 21858 05/1918 29/08/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1882 21859 05/1918 27/03/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1914 21891 05/1918 14/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1915 21892 05/1918 24/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1916 21893 05/1918 25/09/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1917 21894 05/1918 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1920 21897 05/1918 04/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1921 21898 05/1918 18/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1922 21899 05/1918 09/09/1941
NBR J37 0-6-0 88 21925 06/1918 17/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 89 21926 06/1918 28/10/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 123 21927 06/1918 03/09/1965
NBR J37 0-6-0 139 21928 06/1918 29/11/1963
GNR K2 2-6-0 1660 21971 06/1918 22/06/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1661 21972 06/1918 22/06/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1662 21973 06/1918 11/12/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1670 21981 06/1918 13/12/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1671 21982 06/1918 19/01/1961
GNR K2 2-6-0 1672 21983 06/1918 22/06/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1673 21984 06/1918 06/02/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1884 21861 06/1918 27/09/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1885 21862 06/1918 08/06/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1886 21863 06/1918 02/01/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1923 21900 06/1918 08/05/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1925 21902 06/1918 07/03/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1927 21904 06/1918 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1928 21905 06/1918 04/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1929 21906 06/1918 15/01/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 151 21929 07/1918 08/03/1961
NBR J37 0-6-0 157 21930 07/1918 11/05/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 158 21931 07/1918 14/11/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 161 21932 07/1918 19/10/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 162 21933 07/1918 08/06/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 167 21934 07/1918 02/10/1961
GNR K2 2-6-0 1663 21974 07/1918 28/09/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1664 21975 07/1918 30/12/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1665 21976 07/1918 18/11/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1666 21977 07/1918 22/06/1962
GNR K2 2-6-0 1674 21985 07/1918 07/09/1961
GNR K2 2-6-0 1675 21986 07/1918 01/05/1958
GCR O4 2-8-0 1887 21864 07/1918 13/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1933 21910 07/1918 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1936 21913 07/1918 17/04/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1937 21914 07/1918 07/11/1965
NBR J37 0-6-0 274 21935 08/1918 09/04/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 295 21936 08/1918 05/08/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 305 21937 08/1918 23/10/1965
NBR J37 0-6-0 314 21938 08/1918 14/09/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 315 21939 08/1918 12/10/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 456 21940 08/1918 04/04/1967
GNR K2 2-6-0 1667 21978 08/1918 24/02/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1668 21979 08/1918 01/06/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1669 21980 08/1918 01/01/1960
GNR K2 2-6-0 1676 21987 08/1918 23/01/1961
GNR K2 2-6-0 1677 21988 08/1918 06/01/1961
GNR K2 2-6-0 1678 21989 08/1918 26/01/1959
GNR K2 2-6-0 1679 21990 08/1918 02/09/1960
GCR O4 2-8-0 1939 21916 08/1918 20/09/1941
NBR J37 0-6-0 457 21941 09/1918 17/08/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 458 21942 09/1918 21/05/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 459 21943 09/1918 28/12/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 460 21944 09/1918 15/10/1965
NBR J37 0-6-0 461 21945 10/1918 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 462 21946 10/1918 25/11/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 463 21947 10/1918 23/12/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 464 21948 10/1918 15/07/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1943 22001 10/1918 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1948 22006 10/1918 20/03/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1949 22007 10/1918 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1975 22033 10/1918 13/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1976 22034 10/1918 23/02/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1978 22036 10/1918 29/04/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 465 21949 11/1918 30/12/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 466 21950 11/1918 29/06/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 467 21951 11/1918 08/06/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 468 21952 11/1918 23/06/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 469 21953 11/1918 31/05/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1952 22010 11/1918 16/06/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1953 22011 11/1918 05/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1954 22012 11/1918 13/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1956 22014 11/1918 12/01/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1979 22037 11/1918 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1981 22039 11/1918 27/10/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 476 21954 12/1918 14/05/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1957 22015 12/1918 29/08/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1959 22017 12/1918 12/03/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1991 22049 12/1918 03/04/1959
NBR J37 0-6-0 477 21955 01/1919 12/10/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 478 21956 01/1919 31/07/1965
NBR J37 0-6-0 479 21957 01/1919 29/11/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 480 21958 01/1919 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1962 22020 01/1919 20/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1963 22021 01/1919 20/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1993 22051 01/1919 18/09/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1969 22027 02/1919 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1971 22029 02/1919 19/01/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1995 22053 02/1919 01/03/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1998 22056 02/1919 04/04/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2000 22058 02/1919 07/11/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2001 22059 02/1919 19/09/1941
GNR O3 2-8-0 462 22060 04/1919 26/03/1951
GNR O3 2-8-0 463 22061 04/1919 02/04/1951
GCR O4 2-8-0 1800 22093 04/1919 29/12/1962
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 1 22070 05/1919 12/1939
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 2 22071 05/1919 02/1944
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 3 22072 05/1919 12/1938
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 4 22073 05/1919 11/1936
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 5 22074 05/1919 02/1937
GNR O3 2-8-0 464 22062 05/1919 21/01/1952
GNR O3 2-8-0 465 22063 05/1919 02/04/1951
GNR O3 2-8-0 466 22064 05/1919 16/12/1952
GCR O4 2-8-0 2043 22137 05/1919 22/06/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 2044 22138 05/1919 02/06/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 2046 22139 05/1919 04/05/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 2047 22140 05/1919 03/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2094 22184 05/1919 30/01/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 2095 22185 05/1919 15/01/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 2144 22234 05/1919 17/03/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 2145 22235 05/1919 13/09/1961
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 6 22075 06/1919 17/04/1948
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 7 22076 06/1919 06/1938
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 8 22077 06/1919 11/1945
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 9 22078 06/1919 06/1937
GSWR 1 0-6-2T 10 22079 06/1919 06/1936
GNR O3 2-8-0 467 22065 06/1919 26/09/1951
GNR O3 2-8-0 468 22066 06/1919 05/02/1951
GNR O3 2-8-0 469 22067 06/1919 04/07/1947
GNR O3 2-8-0 470 22068 06/1919 22/02/1952
GNR O3 2-8-0 471 22069 06/1919 22/07/1948
GCR O4 2-8-0 2048 22141 06/1919 22/02/1952
GCR O4 2-8-0 2052 22143 06/1919 20/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2053 22144 06/1919 16/04/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 2054 22145 06/1919 30/01/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 2055 22146 06/1919 26/11/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 2056 22147 06/1919 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2059 22150 06/1919 31/03/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 2062 22153 06/1919 26/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2096 22186 06/1919 26/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2098 22188 06/1919 18/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 2099 22189 06/1919 10/03/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 2101 22191 06/1919 21/03/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2104 22194 06/1919 14/03/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2147 22237 06/1919 18/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 2148 22238 06/1919 20/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2149 22239 06/1919 11/07/1960
GCR O4 2-8-0 2150 22240 06/1919 21/07/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2152 22242 06/1919 13/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 2153 22243 06/1919 22/05/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 2157 22247 06/1919 02/05/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 2063 22154 07/1919 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2064 22155 07/1919 17/04/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 2065 22156 07/1919 18/10/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 2066 22157 07/1919 05/10/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 2068 22159 07/1919 21/02/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2110 22200 07/1919 11/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2112 22202 07/1919 17/03/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 2116 22206 07/1919 09/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2073 22164 08/1919 03/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2074 22165 08/1919 20/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2075 22166 08/1919 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2076 22167 08/1919 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2078 22169 08/1919 13/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 2079 22170 08/1919 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2081 22172 08/1919 11/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2082 22173 08/1919 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2121 22211 08/1919 23/05/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 2126 22216 08/1919 09/06/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 2084 22175 09/1919 26/01/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2132 22222 09/1919 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2133 22223 09/1919 27/10/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 2134 22224 09/1919 02/03/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 2135 22225 09/1919 01/04/1960
GCR O4 2-8-0 2136 22226 09/1919 02/12/1959
GNR O3 2-8-0 472 22099 10/1919 19/06/1947
GNR O3 2-8-0 473 22100 10/1919 18/12/1950
GNR O3 2-8-0 474 22101 10/1919 10/05/1947
GNR O3 2-8-0 475 22102 10/1919 19/02/1951
GNR O3 2-8-0 476 22103 10/1919 05/03/1948
GCR O4 2-8-0 2087 22177 10/1919 18/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 2160 22250 10/1919 25/05/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 470 22268 11/1919 05/04/1961
NBR J37 0-6-0 471 22269 11/1919 22/08/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 472 22270 11/1919 06/09/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 473 22271 11/1919 02/10/1965
NBR J37 0-6-0 313 22272 11/1919 03/03/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 485 22273 11/1919 09/07/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 486 22274 11/1919 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 487 22275 11/1919 22/04/1967
NBR J37 0-6-0 488 22276 11/1919 16/12/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 2162 22252 11/1919 23/09/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 489 22277 12/1919 27/08/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 296 22490 12/1919 08/06/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 300 22491 12/1919 14/07/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 301 22492 12/1919 13/08/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 302 22493 12/1919 24/08/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 2165 22255 12/1919 17/11/1962
FR D5 0-6-0 31 22572 1920 09/1950
FR D5 0-6-0 32 22573 1920 12/1956
FR D5 0-6-0 33 22574 1920 08/1957
FR D5 0-6-0 34 22575 1920 11/1932
FR D5 0-6-0 35 22576 1920 11/1932
NBR J37 0-6-0 303 22494 01/1920 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 306 22495 01/1920 01/02/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 401 22496 01/1920 22/04/1967
NBR J37 0-6-0 402 22497 01/1920 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 403 22498 01/1920 23/01/1964
NBR J37 0-6-0 491 22499 01/1920 17/12/1964
NBR N15 0-6-2T 20 22278 02/1920 31/07/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 22 22279 02/1920 08/12/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 29 22280 02/1920 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 49 22281 02/1920 18/04/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 96 22282 02/1920 16/08/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 97 22283 02/1920 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 106 22284 02/1920 02/03/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 107 22285 03/1920 07/08/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 108 22286 03/1920 22/10/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 240 22287 03/1920 14/03/1958
GNSR D40 4-4-0 47 22561 09/1920 23/12/1955
GNSR D40 4-4-0 48 22562 10/1920 09/1966
GNSR D40 4-4-0 49 22563 10/1920 23/06/1958
GNSR D40 4-4-0 50 22564 10/1920 08/1955
GNSR D40 4-4-0 52 22565 10/1920 19/05/1955
GNSR D40 4-4-0 54 22566 10/1920 01/1947
NBR J37 0-6-0 46 22668 12/1920 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 72 22669 12/1920 28/12/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 73 22670 12/1920 11/02/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 84 22671 12/1920 19/11/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 109 22672 12/1920 09/12/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 110 22673 12/1920 22/04/1967
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1721 22577 12/1920 01/08/1957
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1722 22578 12/1920 20/11/1957
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1723 22579 12/1920 12/05/1958
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1724 22580 12/1920 03/01/1957
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1725 22581 12/1920 23/09/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1726 22582 12/1920 10/11/1960
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1727 22583 12/1920 31/05/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1728 22584 12/1920 22/04/1960
NBR J37 0-6-0 111 22674 01/1921 29/05/1965
NBR J37 0-6-0 171 22675 01/1921 29/12/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 175 22676 01/1921 19/11/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 272 22677 01/1921 17/01/1966
NBR J37 0-6-0 273 22678 01/1921 04/09/1965
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1729 22585 01/1921 03/12/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1730 22586 01/1921 22/10/1960
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1731 22587 01/1921 04/11/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1732 22588 01/1921 15/12/1960
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1733 22589 01/1921 24/07/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1734 22590 01/1921 29/05/1961
NBR C16 4-4-2T 511 22683 02/1921 09/10/1959
NBR C16 4-4-2T 512 22684 02/1921 01/08/1955
NBR C16 4-4-2T 513 22685 02/1921 02/11/1955
NBR J37 0-6-0 299 22679 02/1921 29/11/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 506 22680 02/1921 14/10/1963
NBR J37 0-6-0 507 22681 02/1921 29/03/1962
NBR J37 0-6-0 508 22682 02/1921 28/10/1963
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1735 22591 02/1921 22/09/1955
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1736 22592 02/1921 22/07/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1737 22593 02/1921 26/01/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1738 22594 02/1921 08/08/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1739 22595 02/1921 16/01/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1740 22596 02/1921 10/1957
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1741 22597 02/1921 23/09/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1742 22598 02/1921 01/06/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1743 22599 02/1921 23/11/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1744 22600 02/1921 16/09/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1745 22601 02/1921 02/11/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1746 22602 02/1921 04/03/1959
NBR C16 4-4-2T 514 22686 03/1921 22/10/1959
NBR C16 4-4-2T 515 22687 03/1921 22/04/1960
NBR C16 4-4-2T 516 22688 03/1921 22/04/1960
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1747 22603 03/1921 10/08/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1748 22604 03/1921 11/06/1958
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1749 22605 03/1921 25/11/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1750 22606 03/1921 23/09/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1751 22607 03/1921 12/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1752 22608 03/1921 07/07/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1753 22609 03/1921 02/06/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1754 22610 03/1921 26/09/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1755 22611 03/1921 09/02/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1756 22612 03/1921 16/09/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1757 22613 03/1921 02/06/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1758 22614 03/1921 27/04/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1759 22615 04/1921 16/09/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1760 22616 04/1921 06/07/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1761 22617 04/1921 21/07/1960
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1762 22618 04/1921 06/08/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1763 22619 04/1921 06/04/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1764 22620 04/1921 11/09/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1765 22621 04/1921 08/12/1958
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1766 22622 04/1921 20/07/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1767 22623 04/1921 23/09/1962
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1768 22624 04/1921 10/06/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1769 22625 04/1921 24/07/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 1770 22626 04/1921 12/09/1961
GNR O2 2-8-0 477 22691 04/1921 05/11/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 478 22692 04/1921 29/12/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 479 22693 06/1921 03/11/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 480 22694 06/1921 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 481 22695 06/1921 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 482 22696 06/1921 22/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 483 22697 07/1921 08/09/1963
GNR O2 2-8-0 484 22698 07/1921 09/07/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 485 22699 07/1921 29/12/1962
GNR O2 2-8-0 486 22700 07/1921 22/09/1963
GSWR 540 4-6-4T 540 22886 03/1922 01/1935
GSWR 540 4-6-4T 541 22887 03/1922 04/1935
GSWR 540 4-6-4T 542 22888 03/1922 03/1935
GSWR 540 4-6-4T 543 22889 04/1922 12/1935
GSWR 540 4-6-4T 544 22890 04/1922 09/1936
GSWR 540 4-6-4T 545 22891 04/1922 08/1936
CR 72 4-4-0 66 22943 11/1922 20/10/1959
CR 72 4-4-0 67 22944 11/1922 27/05/1960
CR 72 4-4-0 68 22945 11/1922 13/05/1960
CR 72 4-4-0 69 22946 12/1922 12/03/1962
CR 72 4-4-0 70 22947 12/1922 11/12/1961
CR 72 4-4-0 71 22948 12/1922 01/10/1962
CR 72 4-4-0 92 22949 12/1922 14/10/1959
CR 72 4-4-0 93 22950 12/1922 20/10/1959
CR 72 4-4-0 94 22951 12/1922 05/04/1961
CR 72 4-4-0 95 22952 12/1922 27/11/1961
CR 72 4-4-0 96 22953 12/1922 27/11/1961
CR 72 4-4-0 97 22954 12/1922 07/12/1959
CR 191 4-6-0 191 22955 12/1922 11/1940
CR 191 4-6-0 192 22956 12/1922 12/1939
CR 191 4-6-0 193 22957 12/1922 12/1945
CR 191 4-6-0 194 22958 12/1922 11/1943
CR 191 4-6-0 195 22959 12/1922 12/1939
CR 191 4-6-0 196 22960 12/1922 02/1940
CR 191 4-6-0 197 22961 12/1922 02/1939
CR 191 4-6-0 198 22962 12/1922 04/1943
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7280   08/1924 02/04/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7281   08/1924 16/03/1963
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7282   09/1924 04/12/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7283   09/1924 13/04/1963
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7284   09/1924 19/09/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7285   09/1924 21/08/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7286   09/1924 21/08/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7287   10/1924 26/10/1963
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7288   10/1924 21/11/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7289   10/1924 07/10/1967
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7290   10/1924 23/06/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7291   10/1924 12/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7292   10/1924 29/12/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7293   10/1924 31/12/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7294   10/1924 12/10/1963
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 763   05/1925 09/1960
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 764   05/1925 22/07/1961
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 765   05/1925 29/09/1962
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 766   05/1925 27/12/1958
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1135   06/1925 25/08/1955
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1136   06/1925 08/10/1955
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 767   06/1925 27/06/1959
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 768   06/1925 10/1961
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 769   06/1925 27/02/1960
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 770   06/1925 24/11/1962
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 771   06/1925 03/1961
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 772   06/1925 30/09/1961
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 773   06/1925 10/02/1962
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 774   06/1925 09/01/1960
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 775   06/1925 27/02/1960
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 776   06/1925 24/01/1959
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 777   06/1925 21/10/1961
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 778   06/1925 23/05/1959
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1137   07/1925 07/04/1956
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1138   07/1925 01/12/1954
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1139   07/1925 14/09/1954
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1140   07/1925 18/05/1957
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1141   07/1925 08/09/1954
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1142   07/1925 07/1956
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1143   07/1925 03/1959
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1144   07/1925 01/03/1958
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1145   07/1925 30/09/1953
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1146   07/1925 26/10/1954
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 779   07/1925 11/07/1959
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 780   07/1925 11/07/1959
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 781   07/1925 12/05/1962
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 782   07/1925 15/09/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4057   08/1925 13/11/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4058   08/1925 28/11/1959
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1147   08/1925 14/03/1956
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1148   08/1925 17/03/1953
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1149   08/1925 10/08/1955
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1150   08/1925 21/09/1957
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1151   08/1925 19/01/1957
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 783   08/1925 02/1961
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 784   08/1925 17/10/1959
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 785   08/1925 17/10/1959
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 786   08/1925 29/08/1959
MR 4F 0-6-0 4059   09/1925 08/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4060   09/1925 21/03/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4061   09/1925 12/06/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4062   09/1925 09/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4063   09/1925 12/06/1965
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1152   09/1925 22/03/1958
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1153   09/1925 02/11/1957
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1154   09/1925 07/1955
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1155   09/1925 25/02/1957
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1156   09/1925 09/1958
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1157   09/1925 21/05/1960
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1158   09/1925 22/08/1959
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 787   09/1925 28/02/1959
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 788   09/1925 10/02/1962
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 789   09/1925 26/12/1959
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 790   09/1925 10/1961
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 791   09/1925 21/05/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4064   10/1925 28/11/1959
MR 4F 0-6-0 4065   10/1925 30/01/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4066   10/1925 10/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4067   10/1925 08/04/1961
MR 4F 0-6-0 4068   10/1925 10/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4069   10/1925 12/10/1963
LMS Compound 4-4-0 1159   10/1925 01/04/1958
LSWR King Arthur 4-6-0 792   10/1925 14/02/1959
MR 4F 0-6-0 4070   11/1925 26/06/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4071   11/1925 22/04/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4072   11/1925 28/11/1959
MR 4F 0-6-0 4073   11/1925 28/11/1959
MR 4F 0-6-0 4074   11/1925 09/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4075   11/1925 27/11/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4076   11/1925 10/07/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4077   11/1925 12/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4078   11/1925 18/04/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4079   11/1925 07/11/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4080   11/1925 11/07/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4081   11/1925 25/09/1965
SR L1 4-4-0 1753   03/1926 14/10/1961
SR L1 4-4-0 1754   03/1926 18/11/1961
SR L1 4-4-0 1755   03/1926 08/08/1959
SR L1 4-4-0 1756   03/1926 07/10/1961
SR L1 4-4-0 1757   03/1926 09/12/1961
SR L1 4-4-0 1758   03/1926 24/10/1959
SR L1 4-4-0 1759   04/1926 11/11/1961
SR L1 4-4-0 1782   04/1926 25/02/1961
SR L1 4-4-0 1783   04/1926 02/12/1961
SR L1 4-4-0 1784   04/1926 06/02/1960
SR L1 4-4-0 1785   04/1926 30/01/1960
SR L1 4-4-0 1786   04/1926 10/02/1962
SR L1 4-4-0 1787   04/1926 28/01/1961
SR L1 4-4-0 1788   04/1926 30/01/1960
SR L1 4-4-0 1789   04/1926 02/12/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7317   06/1926 16/04/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7318   06/1926 15/10/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7319   06/1926 09/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7320   06/1926 09/05/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7321   06/1926 11/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7322   06/1926 20/07/1963
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7323   06/1926 12/03/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7324   06/1926 31/12/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7325   06/1926 11/09/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7326   07/1926 24/12/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7327   07/1926 24/12/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7328   07/1926 18/06/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7329   07/1926 05/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7330   07/1926 07/08/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7331   07/1926 23/04/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7332   07/1926 05/05/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7333   07/1926 28/11/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7334   07/1926 26/09/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7335   07/1926 09/12/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7336   07/1926 06/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7347   07/1926 05/11/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7348   07/1926 08/09/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7349   07/1926 08/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7350   07/1926 18/12/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7351   07/1926 18/06/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7352   07/1926 12/03/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7353   07/1926 17/02/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7354   07/1926 17/10/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7355   07/1926 09/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7356   07/1926 01/09/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7357   07/1926 24/12/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7358   07/1926 08/12/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7359   07/1926 17/07/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7360   07/1926 20/07/1963
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7361   07/1926 01/05/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7364   07/1926 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7365   07/1926 19/12/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7366   07/1926 28/04/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7337   08/1926 12/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7338   08/1926 09/10/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7339   08/1926 12/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7340   08/1926 24/03/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7341   08/1926 16/07/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7342   08/1926 12/05/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7343   08/1926 05/09/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7344   08/1926 05/09/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7362   08/1926 06/11/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7363   08/1926 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7367   08/1926 12/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7368   08/1926 28/02/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7345   09/1926 09/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7346   09/1926 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7369   09/1926 11/02/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7370   09/1926 10/10/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7371   09/1926 09/1965
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7372   09/1926 05/09/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7373   09/1926 24/12/1966
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7374   09/1926 12/03/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7375   09/1926 08/08/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0T 7376   09/1926 29/12/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4382   09/1926 28/11/1959
MR 4F 0-6-0 4383   09/1926 28/11/1959
MR 4F 0-6-0 4384   09/1926 24/10/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4385   10/1926 01/08/1959
MR 4F 0-6-0 4386   10/1926 22/05/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4387   10/1926 19/10/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4388   10/1926 29/12/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4389   10/1926 10/07/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4390   10/1926 06/11/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4391   10/1926 12/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4392   10/1926 20/06/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4393   10/1926 05/11/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4394   10/1926 02/07/1966
MR 4F 0-6-0 4395   10/1926 12/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4396   10/1926 06/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4397   12/1926 31/03/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4398   12/1926 27/07/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4399   12/1926 08/02/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4400   01/1927 11/10/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4401   01/1927 19/06/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4402   01/1927 09/01/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4403   01/1927 13/06/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4404   01/1927 02/12/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4405   01/1927 11/06/1966
MR 4F 0-6-0 4406   01/1927 05/03/1960
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6152   14/08/1927 17/04/1965
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6128   11/09/1927 01/05/1965
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6127   11/09/1927 08/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6126   11/09/1927 05/10/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6125   11/09/1927 03/10/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6110   11/09/1927 22/02/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6109   11/09/1927 27/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6108   11/09/1927 26/01/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6107   11/09/1927 29/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6106   11/09/1927 08/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6105   11/09/1927 29/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6104   11/09/1927 29/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6103   11/09/1927 19/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6102   11/09/1927 29/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6101   11/09/1927 09/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6132   11/09/1927 01/02/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6131   11/09/1927 03/11/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4492   10/1927 05/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6145   10/1927 03/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6116   09/10/1927 17/08/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6115   09/10/1927 01/01/1966
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6114   09/10/1927 28/09/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6113   09/10/1927 17/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6112   09/10/1927 09/05/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6111   09/10/1927 28/09/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6140   09/10/1927 30/10/1965
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6139   09/10/1927 13/10/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6138   09/10/1927 09/02/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6137   09/10/1927 03/11/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6136   09/10/1927 28/03/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6135   09/10/1927 24/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6134   09/10/1927 01/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6133   09/10/1927 23/02/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4480   11/1927 05/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4493   11/1927 26/10/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4494   11/1927 07/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4495   11/1927 12/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4496   11/1927 12/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4497   11/1927 14/11/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4498   11/1927 12/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4499   11/1927 26/09/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4500   11/1927 09/07/1966
MR 4F 0-6-0 4501   11/1927 12/12/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4502   11/1927 12/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4503   11/1927 12/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4504   11/1927 10/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4505   11/1927 11/09/1965
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6124   06/11/1927 29/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6123   06/11/1927 03/11/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6122   06/11/1927 17/10/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6121   06/11/1927 29/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6119   06/11/1927 16/11/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6118   06/11/1927 13/06/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6117   06/11/1927 26/11/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6147   06/11/1927 01/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6146   06/11/1927 01/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6144   06/11/1927 11/01/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6143   06/11/1927 21/12/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6142   06/11/1927 11/01/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6141   06/11/1927 18/04/1964
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6130   06/11/1927 17/12/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6129   06/11/1927 06/06/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4477   12/1927 07/07/1961
MR 4F 0-6-0 4478   12/1927 14/11/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4479   12/1927 02/05/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4481   12/1927 28/11/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4482   12/1927 02/05/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4483   12/1927 12/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4484   12/1927 28/11/1964
MR 4F 0-6-0 4485   12/1927 19/04/1963
MR 4F 0-6-0 4486   12/1927 23/01/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4487   12/1927 07/04/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4488   12/1927 12/03/1960
MR 4F 0-6-0 4489   12/1927 28/08/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4490   12/1927 28/08/1965
MR 4F 0-6-0 4491   12/1927 08/10/1962
MR 4F 0-6-0 4506   12/1927 12/03/1960
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6120   04/12/1927 06/07/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6149   04/12/1927 09/1963
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6148   04/12/1927 14/11/1964
LNER B17 4-6-0 2802 23805 11/1928 13/01/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2801 23804 05/12/1928 13/01/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2800 23803 07/12/1928 28/07/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2803 23806 13/12/1928 08/09/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2804 23807 13/12/1928 24/08/1953
LNER B17 4-6-0 2805 23808 17/12/1928 15/05/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2806 23809 19/12/1928 01/09/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2807 23810 21/12/1928 14/01/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2808 23811 26/12/1928 14/03/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2809 23812 27/12/1928 23/06/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5700 23818 01/1929 03/1956
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5701 23819 01/1929 01/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5702 23820 01/1929 19/05/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5703 23821 01/1929 09/02/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5704 23822 01/1929 23/05/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5705 23823 01/1929 24/08/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5725 23843 01/1929 09/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5726 23844 01/1929 02/10/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5706 23824 02/1929 09/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5707 23825 02/1929 10/03/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5708 23826 02/1929 07/04/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5709 23827 02/1929 28/03/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5710 23828 02/1929 08/1957
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5711 23829 02/1929 01/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5712 23830 02/1929 10/1957
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5713 23831 02/1929 04/01/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5727 23845 02/1929 30/05/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5728 23846 02/1929 05/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5729 23847 02/1929 10/1957
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5730 23848 02/1929 03/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5731 23849 02/1929 30/05/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5732 23850 02/1929 01/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5733 23851 02/1929 08/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5714 23832 03/1929 01/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5715 23833 03/1929 08/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5716 23834 03/1929 03/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5717 23835 03/1929 02/05/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5718 23836 03/1929 07/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5719 23837 03/1929 11/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5720 23838 03/1929 01/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5721 23839 03/1929 10/08/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5722 23840 03/1929 09/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5723 23841 03/1929 11/1957
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5724 23842 03/1929 08/1957
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5734 23852 03/1929 25/05/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5735 23853 03/1929 11/1957
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5736 23854 03/1929 01/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5737 23855 03/1929 05/10/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5738 23856 03/1929 28/09/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5739 23857 03/1929 09/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5740 23858 03/1929 22/06/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5741 23859 03/1929 06/1957
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5742 23860 03/1929 09/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5743 23861 03/1929 19/01/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5744 23862 04/1929 04/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5745 23863 04/1929 23/11/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5746 23864 04/1929 09/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5747 23865 04/1929 28/09/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5748 23866 04/1929 09/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 5749 23867 04/1929 07/1963
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7725 23921 12/1929 08/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7726 23922 12/1929 08/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7727 23923 12/1929 04/01/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7728 23924 12/1929 10/05/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7729 23925 12/1929 07/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7730 23926 12/1929 23/03/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7731 23927 12/1929 06/04/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7732 23928 12/1929 22/10/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7733 23929 12/1929 28/05/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7734 23930 12/1929 14/04/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7735 23931 12/1929 11/05/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7736 23932 12/1929 05/1962
LMS Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6170   12/1929 01/12/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7737 23933 01/1930 28/03/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7738 23934 01/1930 16/02/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7739 23935 01/1930 04/11/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7740 23936 01/1930 12/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7741 23937 02/1930 12/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7742 23938 02/1930 13/07/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7743 23939 02/1930 10/08/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7744 23940 02/1930 09/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7745 23941 02/1930 03/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7746 23942 02/1930 19/10/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7747 23943 02/1930 02/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7748 23944 02/1930 04/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7749 23945 02/1930 09/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7750 24038 11/1930 05/01/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7752 24040 11/1930 01/11/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7751 24039 12/1930 19/10/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7753 24041 12/1930 04/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7754 24042 12/1930 27/01/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7755 24043 12/1930 05/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7756 24044 12/1930 06/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7757 24045 12/1930 09/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7758 24046 12/1930 06/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7759 24047 12/1930 14/03/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7760 24048 12/1930 12/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7761 24049 12/1930 01/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7762 24050 01/1931 05/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7763 24051 01/1931 16/11/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7764 24052 01/1931 05/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7765 24053 01/1931 07/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7766 24054 02/1931 09/11/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7767 24055 02/1931 14/03/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7768 24056 02/1931 30/11/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7769 24057 02/1931 24/08/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7770 24058 02/1931 21/04/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7771 24059 03/1931 11/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7772 24060 03/1931 11/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7773 24061 03/1931 14/12/1959
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 7774 24062 03/1931 02/11/1959
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5557 24115 29/06/1934 19/09/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5556 24116 06/07/1934 15/08/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5559 24117 09/07/1934 20/10/1962
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5560 24118 11/07/1934 30/11/1963
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5561 24119 13/07/1934 19/09/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5562 24120 08/08/1934 04/11/1967
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5563 24121 09/08/1934 27/11/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5564 24122 18/08/1934 18/07/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5565 24123 18/08/1934 06/01/1967
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5567 24125 18/08/1934 30/01/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5566 24124 25/08/1934 12/11/1962
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5568 24126 25/08/1934 25/04/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5569 24127 25/08/1934 25/04/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5570 24128 25/08/1934 29/12/1962
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5571 24129 01/09/1934 16/05/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5572 24130 01/09/1934 04/01/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5573 24131 29/09/1934 01/09/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5574 24132 29/09/1934 20/03/1966
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5575 24133 29/09/1934 15/06/1963
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5576 24134 29/09/1934 29/12/1962
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5577 24135 29/09/1934 05/09/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5578 24136 29/09/1934 30/05/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5579 24137 29/09/1934 15/08/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5580 24138 06/10/1934 12/12/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5581 24139 06/10/1934 07/08/1966
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5582 24140 24/11/1934 08/12/1962
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5583 24141 24/11/1934 24/10/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5593 24151 12/1934 15/10/1967
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5584 24142 01/12/1934 03/10/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5585 24143 01/12/1934 09/05/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5587 24145 08/12/1934 15/12/1962
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5586 24144 15/12/1934 23/01/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5588 24146 15/12/1934 01/05/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5589 24147 15/12/1934 22/03/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5590 24148 22/12/1934 11/12/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5591 24149 22/12/1934 26/10/1963
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5592 24150 29/12/1934 26/09/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5595 24153 05/01/1935 30/01/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5594 24152 12/01/1935 29/12/1962
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5596 24154 12/01/1935 23/07/1966
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5597 24155 12/01/1935 11/01/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5599 24157 26/01/1935 15/08/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5598 24156 02/02/1935 24/10/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5600 24158 02/02/1935 18/12/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5604 24162 02/03/1935 17/07/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5602 24160 06/04/1935 18/03/1965
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5605 24163 06/04/1935 03/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5601 24159 13/04/1935 26/09/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5606 24164 13/04/1935 27/06/1964
LMS Jubilee 4-6-0 5603 24161 17/05/1935 08/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2425 24225 08/1935 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2426 24226 08/1935 04/05/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2427 24227 08/1935 31/07/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 2428 24228 08/1935 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2438 24229 08/1935 09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2439 24230 09/1935 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2440 24231 09/1935 26/02/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2442 24232 09/1935 14/06/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2443 24233 09/1935 01/08/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2447 24234 09/1935 28/03/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2448 24235 09/1935 10/04/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2449 24236 09/1935 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2450 24237 10/1935 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2451 24238 10/1935 06/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2459 24239 10/1935 14/03/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2461 24240 10/1935 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2463 24241 10/1935 27/05/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 2466 24242 10/1935 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2467 24243 11/1935 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2468 24244 11/1935 31/05/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2545 24301 27/06/1936 14/10/1961
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2546 24302 27/06/1936 01/04/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2547 24303 07/1936 04/05/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2548 24304 01/07/1936 04/02/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2549 24305 07/07/1936 18/11/1961
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2550 24306 09/07/1936 04/04/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2551 24307 09/07/1936 12/12/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2552 24308 14/07/1936 07/10/1961
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2553 24309 15/07/1936 12/11/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2554 24310 16/07/1936 03/04/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2555 24311 21/07/1936 08/05/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2556 24312 21/07/1936 27/07/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2560 24316 07/08/1936 18/04/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2557 24313 11/08/1936 19/10/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2561 24317 11/08/1936 09/11/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2558 24314 12/08/1936 17/04/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2559 24315 12/08/1936 19/09/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2562 24318 13/08/1936 04/01/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2563 24319 15/08/1936 16/11/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2564 24320 18/08/1936 08/05/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2565 24321 21/08/1936 28/11/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2566 24322 26/08/1936 22/05/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2567 24323 26/08/1936 13/03/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2568 24324 02/09/1936 15/12/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2569 24325 02/09/1936 25/01/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2570 24326 02/09/1936 07/10/1961
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2571 24327 11/09/1936 09/11/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2572 24328 11/09/1936 11/01/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2573 24329 11/09/1936 21/11/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2574 24330 17/09/1936 10/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2575 24331 17/09/1936 13/10/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2576 24332 17/09/1936 18/06/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2577 24333 24/09/1936 14/01/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2578 24334 24/09/1936 13/10/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2579 24335 24/09/1936 18/06/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2580 24336 28/09/1936 17/11/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2581 24337 28/09/1936 19/03/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2582 24338 28/09/1936 25/05/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2583 24339 08/10/1936 29/10/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2584 24340 08/10/1936 18/07/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2585 24341 08/10/1936 01/12/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2586 24342 14/10/1936 14/11/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2587 24343 14/10/1936 12/06/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2589 24345 19/10/1936 12/09/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2590 24346 19/10/1936 27/02/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2588 24344 20/10/1936 24/10/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2591 24347 26/10/1936 29/09/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2592 24348 26/10/1936 04/05/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2593 24349 26/10/1936 18/06/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2594 24350 02/11/1936 25/04/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2595 24351 02/11/1936 21/09/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2596 24352 09/11/1936 11/08/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2597 24353 09/11/1936 23/10/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2598 24354 09/11/1936 30/11/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2599 24355 17/11/1936 29/09/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2600 24356 17/11/1936 17/11/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2601 24357 24/11/1936 03/04/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2602 24358 24/11/1936 26/12/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2603 24359 07/12/1936 25/05/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2604 24360 07/12/1936 08/05/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2605 24361 07/12/1936 19/12/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2606 24362 16/12/1936 15/10/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2607 24363 16/12/1936 01/02/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2608 24364 22/12/1936 22/08/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2609 24365 22/12/1936 13/02/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2610 24366 01/01/1937 23/04/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2611 24367 01/01/1937 15/03/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2613 24369 08/01/1937 22/04/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2614 24370 08/01/1937 16/05/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2612 24368 11/01/1937 25/01/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2615 24371 01/02/1937 29/09/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2616 24372 01/02/1937 10/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 2617 24373 01/02/1937 09/11/1963
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70300 24600 05/1940 15/01/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70301   06/1940 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70500 24607 06/1940 10/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70311   07/1940 01/01/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70314   07/1940 10/12/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70318   08/1940 16/04/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70501   08/1940 24/07/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70332   09/1940 10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70576 615 06/1941 20/11/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70376 615 07/1941 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70378   07/1941 09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70384 678 08/1941 03/12/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70395   08/1941 20/07/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70394 24702 09/1941 29/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70398   10/1941 26/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70504   10/1941 26/06/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70584   10/1941 09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70518   11/1941 20/11/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70363 554 12/1941 04/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70544   02/1942 19/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8176 24744 03/1942 05/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8177 24745 03/1942 11/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8178 24747 03/1942 12/11/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8179 24748 03/1942 19/01/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8180 24750 03/1942 11/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8181 24751 04/1942 19/02/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8182 24753 04/1942 04/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8183 24754 04/1942 31/07/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8184 24756 04/1942 17/07/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8185 24757 04/1942 11/02/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8186 24759 04/1942 08/10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8187 24760 04/1942 07/01/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8188 24762 04/1942 14/05/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8189 24763 05/1942 24/07/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8190 24765 05/1942 23/12/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8191 24766 05/1942 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8192 24768 05/1942 30/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8193 24769 05/1942 06/01/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8264 24742 05/1942 16/07/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8265   05/1942 08/06/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8266   05/1942 17/06/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8267   05/1942 25/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8268   05/1942 28/10/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8269   05/1942 08/07/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8194 24771 06/1942 19/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8195 24772 06/1942 16/04/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8196 24774 06/1942 08/10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8197 24775 06/1942 20/04/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8198 24777 06/1942 18/09/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8199 24778 06/1942 18/02/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8200 24780 06/1942 13/01/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8201 24781 06/1942 09/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8270   06/1942 17/12/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8271   06/1942 12/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8272   06/1942 02/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8273   06/1942 14/08/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8274   06/1942 04/09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8275   06/1942 24/06/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8202 24783 07/1942 24/06/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8203 24784 07/1942 23/04/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8204 24786 07/1942 19/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8205 24787 07/1942 23/12/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8206 24789 07/1942 04/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8207 24790 07/1942 15/01/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8276   07/1942 04/11/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8277   07/1942 16/04/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8278   07/1942 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8208 24792 08/1942 02/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8209 24793 08/1942 19/04/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8210 24795 08/1942 19/04/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8211 24796 08/1942 18/11/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8212 24798 08/1942 22/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8213 24799 08/1942 10/09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8214 24801 08/1942 25/11/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8215 24802 08/1942 09/07/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8216 24804 08/1942 19/01/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8279   08/1942 14/10/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8280   08/1942 07/05/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8281   08/1942 06/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8282   08/1942 08/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8283   08/1942 09/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8284   08/1942 30/07/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8217 24805 09/1942 06/02/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8218 24807 09/1942 30/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8219 24808 09/1942 24/12/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8220 24810 09/1942 02/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8221 24811 09/1942 04/02/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8222 24812 09/1942 04/11/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8223 24813 09/1942 12/11/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8224 24814 09/1942 16/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8225 24815 09/1942 29/10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8285   09/1942 18/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7000 24971 01/1943 16/05/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25112 01/1943 07/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25113 01/1943 27/04/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25114 01/1943 27/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25118 01/1943 22/05/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25119 01/1943 01/01/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25120 01/1943 06/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25121 01/1943 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25122 01/1943 04/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25123 01/1943 01/07/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25124 01/1943 18/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25125 01/1943 17/04/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25126 01/1943 15/08/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25127 01/1943 13/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25128 01/1943 07/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25129 01/1943 04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25257 01/1943 18/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25258 01/1943 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25233 01/1943 18/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25260 01/1943 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25261 01/1943 27/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25262 01/1943 25/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25263 01/1943 02/01/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25264 01/1943 04/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25265 01/1943 28/02/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25267 01/1943 25/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25268 01/1943 31/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25269 01/1943 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7001 24972 02/1943 12/10/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7002 24973 02/1943 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7003 24974 02/1943 21/11/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7004 24975 02/1943 12/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7005 24976 02/1943 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7006 24977 02/1943 16/09/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7007 24978 02/1943 16/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7008 24979 02/1943 01/08/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7009 24980 02/1943 06/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25130 02/1943 07/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25131 02/1943 21/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25132 02/1943 25/04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7401 25271 02/1943 27/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25272 02/1943 05/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7403 25273 02/1943 02/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25274 02/1943 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25276 02/1943 10/01/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25277 02/1943 03/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25279 02/1943 06/03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25281 02/1943 05/09/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25282 02/1943 13/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25283 02/1943 27/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25284 02/1943 15/08/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25285 02/1943 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25286 02/1943 16/09/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25287 02/1943 21/11/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7012 24983 03/1943 07/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7013 24984 03/1943 06/04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7014 24985 03/1943 10/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7015 24986 03/1943 04/09/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7016 24987 03/1943 07/07/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7017 24988 03/1943 09/05/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7018 24989 03/1943 27/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7019 03/1943 20/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7020 24991 03/1943 25/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7021 24992 03/1943 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7022 24993 03/1943 17/01/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7023 24994 03/1943 04/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7024 24995 03/1943 20/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7300 24990 03/1943 25/06/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7010 24981 04/1943 04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7025 24996 04/1943 27/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7026 24997 04/1943 27/03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7027 24998 04/1943 21/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7028 24999 04/1943 17/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7029 25000 04/1943 03/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7030 25001 04/1943 26/10/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7031 25002 04/1943 05/11/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7032 25003 04/1943 06/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7033 25004 04/1943 28/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7034 25005 04/1943 17/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7035 25006 04/1943 21/03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7036 25007 04/1943 10/04/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7037 25008 04/1943 17/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7038 25009 04/1943 06/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7301 25171 04/1943 12/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7302 25172 04/1943 16/05/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7303 25173 04/1943 14/11/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7304 25174 04/1943 07/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7305 25175 04/1943 31/01/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7306 25186 04/1943 07/08/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7307 25187 04/1943 03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7308 25188 04/1943 12/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7011 24982 05/1943 10/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7039 25010 05/1943 30/07/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7040 25011 05/1943 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7041 25012 05/1943 11/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7042 25013 05/1943 22/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7043 25014 05/1943 12/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7044 25015 05/1943 28/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7045 25016 05/1943 09/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7046 25017 05/1943 25/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7047 25018 05/1943 02/05/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7048 25019 05/1943 19/09/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7049 25020 05/1943 22/02/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7150 25021 05/1943 12/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7151 25022 05/1943 30/05/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7152 25023 05/1943 12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7153 25024 05/1943 03/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7154 25025 05/1943 12/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7309 25189 05/1943 24/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7310 25190 05/1943 11/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7311 25176 05/1943 21/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7312 25177 05/1943 26/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7313 25178 05/1943 02/09/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7314 25179 05/1943 02/09/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7315 25180 05/1943 24/05/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7316 25181 05/1943 02/09/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7317 25182 05/1943 17/08/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7318 25183 05/1943 11/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7319 25184 05/1943 02/01/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7155 25026 06/1943 23/06/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7156 25027 06/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7157 25028 06/1943 13/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7158 25029 06/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7159 25030 06/1943 09/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7160 25031 06/1943 04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7161 25032 06/1943 27/03/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7162 25033 06/1943 23/01/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7163 25034 06/1943 16/09/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7164 25035 06/1943 18/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7165 25036 06/1943 22/05/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7166 25037 06/1943 10/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7167 25038 06/1943 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7168 25039 06/1943 09/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7169 25040 06/1943 09/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7170 25041 06/1943 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7171 25042 06/1943 04/07/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7172 25043 06/1943 04/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7320 25185 06/1943 24/05/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7321 25191 06/1943 29/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7322 25192 06/1943 10/04/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7323 25193 06/1943 03/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7324 25194 06/1943 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7325 25195 06/1943 25/01/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7326 25196 06/1943 16/03/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7327 25197 06/1943 25/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7328 25198 06/1943 09/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7329 25199 06/1943 09/01/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7330 25208 06/1943 19/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7331 25209 06/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7173 25044 07/1943 19/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7174 25045 07/1943 16/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7175 25046 07/1943 08/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7176 25047 07/1943 07/02/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7177 25048 07/1943 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7178 25049 07/1943 24/02/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7179 25050 07/1943 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7180 25051 07/1943 11/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7181 25052 07/1943 25/04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7182 25053 07/1943 09/05/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7183 25054 07/1943 01/1947
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7184 25055 07/1943 31/03/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7332 25200 07/1943 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7333 25201 07/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7334 25202 07/1943 09/08/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7335 25203 07/1943 04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7336 25204 07/1943 01/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7337 25205 07/1943 1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7338 25206 07/1943 04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7339 25207 07/1943 06/02/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7185 25056 08/1943 22/08/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7186 25057 08/1943 22/08/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7187 25058 08/1943 07/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7188 25059 08/1943 09/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7189 25060 08/1943 09/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7190 25061 08/1943 03/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7191 25062 08/1943 06/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7192 25063 08/1943 03/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7193 25064 08/1943 10/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7194 25065 08/1943 05/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7196 25067 08/1943 11/07/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7197 25068 08/1943 05/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7198 25069 08/1943 12/11/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7200 25071 08/1943 16/02/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7201 25072 08/1943 06/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7202 25073 08/1943 27/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7203 25074 08/1943 25/04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7204 25075 08/1943 14/03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7340 25210 08/1943 12/11/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7341 25211 08/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7342 25212 08/1943 07/11/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7343 25213 08/1943 05/06/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7344 25214 08/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7345 25215 08/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7346 25216 08/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7347 25217 08/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7348 25218 08/1943 23/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7349 25219 08/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7350 25220 08/1943 24/03/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7351 25221 08/1943 11/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7195 25066 09/1943 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7199 25070 09/1943 04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7205 25076 09/1943 08/05/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7206 25077 09/1943 28/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7207 25078 09/1943 29/08/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7208 25079 09/1943 05/10/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7209 25080 09/1943 14/03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7210 25081 09/1943 22/08/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7211 25082 09/1943 24/02/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7212 25083 09/1943 27/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7213 25084 09/1943 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7214 25085 09/1943 11/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7215 25086 09/1943 14/11/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7216 25087 09/1943 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7217 25088 09/1943 04/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7218 25089 09/1943 10/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7219 25090 09/1943 12/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7220 25091 09/1943 24/04/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7221 25092 09/1943 05/02/1960
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7222 25093 09/1943 04/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7352 09/1943 26/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7353 25223 09/1943 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7354 25224 09/1943 18/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7355 25230 09/1943 31/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7356 25232 09/1943 26/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7357 25222 09/1943 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7358 25225 09/1943 27/08/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7359 25226 09/1943 07/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7360 25227 09/1943 16/09/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7361 25228 09/1943 11/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7362 25229 09/1943 23/01/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7363 25231 09/1943 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7364 25235 09/1943 03/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7365 25236 09/1943 02/09/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7366 25237 09/1943 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7367 25238 09/1943 17/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7368 25239 09/1943 10/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7223 25094 10/1943 06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7224 25095 10/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7225 25096 10/1943 19/08/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7226 25097 10/1943 21/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7227 25098 10/1943 03/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7228 25099 10/1943 05/09/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7229 25100 10/1943 04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7230 25101 10/1943 17/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7231 25102 10/1943 24/11/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7232 25103 10/1943 01/07/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7233 25104 10/1943 12/11/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7234 25105 10/1943 11/07/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7235 25106 10/1943 11/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7236 25107 10/1943 31/10/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7237 25108 10/1943 17/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7238 25109 10/1943 08/1945
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7239 25110 10/1943 19/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7240 25111 10/1943 11/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7369 25240 10/1943 05/09/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7370 25241 10/1943 27/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7371 25242 10/1943 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7372 25243 10/1943 05/01/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7373 25244 10/1943 01/08/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7374 25245 10/1943 29/08/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7375 25247 10/1943 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7376 25248 10/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7377 25249 10/1943 09/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7378 25250 10/1943 25/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7379 25251 10/1943 13/03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7380 25252 10/1943 10/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7381 25254 10/1943 18/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7382 25255 10/1943 09/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7383 25253 10/1943 09/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7384 25256 10/1943 07/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7244 25115 11/1943 10/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7245 25116 11/1943 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7246 25117 11/1943 12/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7387 25259 11/1943 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7389   11/1943 06/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7396 25266 11/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7400 25270 11/1943 11/1957
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3650   12/1943 04/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3651   12/1943 0000
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3652   12/1943
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3653   12/1943
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3654   12/1943
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3655   12/1943
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3656   12/1943
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3657   12/1943
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3658   12/1943
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3659   12/1943
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3660   12/1943
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3661   12/1943 04/1950
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7262 25133 12/1943 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7405 25275 12/1943 12/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7409 25280 12/1943 03/1955
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3662   01/1944 09/1949
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3663   01/1944 08/1948
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3664   01/1944 04/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3665   01/1944 09/1949
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3666   01/1944 01/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3667   01/1944 09/1949
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3668   01/1944 09/1949
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3669   01/1944 09/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3670   01/1944 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3671   01/1944 07/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3672   01/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3673   01/1944 02/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3674   01/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3675   01/1944 02/1950
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7417 25278 01/1944 11/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7418 25288 01/1944 02/05/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7419 25289 01/1944 06/02/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7420 25290 01/1944 19/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7421 25291 01/1944 17/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7422 25292 01/1944 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7423 25293 01/1944 01/08/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7424 25152 01/1944 26/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7425 25153 01/1944 11/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7426 25154 01/1944 02/01/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7427 25155 01/1944 02/09/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7428 25234 01/1944 08/08/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7429 25156 01/1944 05/09/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7430 25157 01/1944 31/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7431 25158 01/1944 06/08/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25342 01/1944 20/03/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25343 01/1944 27/08/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25344 01/1944 24/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25345 01/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25346 01/1944 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25348 01/1944 18/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25349 01/1944 27/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25351 01/1944 02/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25352 01/1944 15/06/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25353 01/1944 22/04/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25355 01/1944 02/08/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25356 01/1944 11/07/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25357 01/1944 31/10/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25358 01/1944 19/09/1965
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3676   02/1944 03/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3677   02/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3678   02/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3679   02/1944 07/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3680   02/1944 09/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3681   02/1944 09/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3682   02/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3683   02/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3684   02/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3685   02/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3686   02/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3687   02/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3688   02/1944
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3689   02/1944 04/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3690   02/1944 02/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3691   02/1944 11/1951
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7432 25159 02/1944 25/04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7433 25160 02/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7434 25161 02/1944 26/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7435 25162 02/1944 31/12/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7436 25294 02/1944 18/08/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7437 25295 02/1944 10/01/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7438 25296 02/1944 04/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7439 25297 02/1944 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7440 25298 02/1944 07/09/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7441 25299 02/1944 06/03/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7442 25300 02/1944 27/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7443 25301 02/1944 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7444 25302 02/1944 12/11/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7445 25303 02/1944 01/07/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7446 25304 02/1944 05/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7447 25305 02/1944 19/12/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25359 02/1944 30/08/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25360 02/1944 05/12/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25361 02/1944 22/08/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25362 02/1944 21/04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25363 02/1944 28/10/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25364 02/1944 19/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25365 02/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25366 02/1944 11/05/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25367 02/1944 04/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25368 02/1944 27/03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25369 02/1944 05/08/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25370 02/1944 02/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25371 02/1944 14/11/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25373 02/1944 28/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0   25375 02/1944 04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 800 25308 03/1944 01/12/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 801 25309 03/1944 21/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 802 25310 03/1944 25/04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 803 25311 03/1944 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 804 25312 03/1944 27/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 805 25313 03/1944 08/1959
WD WD/8 2-8-0 806 25314 03/1944 05/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 807 25315 03/1944 24/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 809 25317 03/1944 26/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 810 25318 03/1944 23/03/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 811 25319 03/1944 13/03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 812 25320 03/1944 11/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 813 24891 03/1944 08/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 814 24892 03/1944 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 815 24893 03/1944 06/05/1963
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3692   03/1944 02/1952
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3693   03/1944 07/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3694   03/1944 07/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3695   03/1944 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3696   03/1944 05/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3697   03/1944 08/1948
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3698   03/1944 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3699   03/1944 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3700   03/1944 03/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3701   03/1944 10/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3702   03/1944 05/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3703   03/1944 08/1948
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3704   03/1944 04/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3705   03/1944 01/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3706   03/1944 05/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3707   03/1944 04/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3708   03/1944 10/1951
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7277 25148 03/1944 06/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7283 24954 03/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7284 24955 03/1944 27/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7448 25306 03/1944 12/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7449 25307 03/1944 18/08/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 816 24894 04/1944 16/09/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 817 24895 04/1944 13/06/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 818 24896 04/1944 18/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 819 24897 04/1944 10/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 820 24898 04/1944 08/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 821 25163 04/1944 03/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 822 25164 04/1944 05/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 823 25165 04/1944 04/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 824 25166 04/1944 21/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 825 25167 04/1944 16/07/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3709   04/1944 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3710   04/1944 11/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3711   04/1944 08/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3712   04/1944 02/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3713   04/1944 11/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3714   04/1944 04/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3715   04/1944 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3716   04/1944 06/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3717   04/1944 01/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3718   04/1944 01/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3719   04/1944 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3720   04/1944 09/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3721   04/1944 10/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3722   04/1944 04/1950
WD WD/8 2-8-0 826 25168 05/1944 14/03/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 827 25169 05/1944 03/05/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 828 25170 05/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 829 24899 05/1944 01/07/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 830 24900 05/1944 28/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 831 24901 05/1944 04/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 832 24902 05/1944 11/06/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 833 24903 05/1944 17/08/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 834 24904 05/1944 04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 835 24905 05/1944 12/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 836 24906 05/1944 04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 837 24907 05/1944 27/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 838 24908 05/1944 13/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 839 24909 05/1944 11/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 840 24910 05/1944 07/01/1960
WD WD/8 2-8-0 841 24911 05/1944 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 842 24914 05/1944 15/01/1964
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3723   05/1944 04/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3724   05/1944 07/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3725   05/1944 10/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3726   05/1944 01/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3727   05/1944 11/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3728   05/1944 07/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3729   05/1944 06/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3730   05/1944 05/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3731   05/1944 05/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3732   05/1944 09/1949
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3733   05/1944 01/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3734   05/1944 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3735   05/1944 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3736   05/1944 09/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 843 24916 06/1944 16/01/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 844 24917 06/1944 28/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 845 24918 06/1944 09/05/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 846 24919 06/1944 25/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 847 24920 06/1944 05/10/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 848 24921 06/1944 10/07/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 849 24923 06/1944 27/09/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 850 24922 06/1944 19/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 851 24912 06/1944 30/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 852 24924 06/1944 22/04/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 853 24913 06/1944 21/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 854 24915 06/1944 30/01/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 855 24925 06/1944 12/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 856 24926 06/1944 09/1953
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3737   06/1944 07/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3738   06/1944 03/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3739   06/1944 07/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3740   06/1944 02/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3741   06/1944 05/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3742   06/1944 08/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3743   06/1944 11/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3744   06/1944 09/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3745   06/1944 09/1949
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3746   06/1944 01/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3747   06/1944 04/1952
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3748   06/1944 06/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 3749   06/1944 02/1950
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7263 25134 06/1944 24/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7265 25136 06/1944 21/02/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 857 24927 07/1944 25/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 858 24928 07/1944 27/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 859 24929 07/1944 18/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 860 24930 07/1944 09/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 861 24931 07/1944 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 862 24932 07/1944 07/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 863 24933 07/1944 02/1958
WD WD/8 2-8-0 864 24934 07/1944 09/01/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7264 25135 07/1944 12/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7266 25137 07/1944 04/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7267 25138 07/1944 11/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7268 25139 07/1944 08/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7269 25140 07/1944 03/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7270 25141 07/1944 24/05/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7271 25142 07/1944 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 808 25316 08/1944 21/11/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 865 24935 08/1944 09/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 866 24936 08/1944 16/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 867 24937 08/1944 01/07/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 868 25411 08/1944 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 869 24938 08/1944 03/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 870 25412 08/1944 27/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 871 24939 08/1944 11/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 872 24940 08/1944 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 873 24941 08/1944 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 874 24942 08/1944 15/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 875 24943 08/1944 07/11/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 876 24944 08/1944 21/12/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 877 24945 08/1944 20/11/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 878 24946 08/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7272 25143 08/1944 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7273 25144 08/1944 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7274 25145 08/1944 13/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7275 25146 08/1944 12/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7276 25147 08/1944 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7278 25149 08/1944 22/08/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7279 25150 08/1944 27/11/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7280 25151 08/1944 22/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7281 24952 08/1944 17/01/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7282 24953 08/1944 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7285 24956 08/1944 22/02/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7286 24957 08/1944 10/10/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7287 24958 08/1944 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7288 24959 08/1944 12/11/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7289 24960 08/1944 12/11/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7290 24961 08/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 879 24947 09/1944 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7291 24962 09/1944 13/09/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7292 24963 09/1944 25/11/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7293 24964 09/1944 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7294 24965 09/1944 19/09/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7295 24966 09/1944 04/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7296 24967 09/1944 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7297 24968 09/1944 24/04/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7298 24969 09/1944 24/07/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 7299 24970 09/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 8510 25412 09/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 8511 24948 09/1944 04/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 8512 24949 09/1944 05/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 8513 24950 09/1944 28/12/1959
WD WD/8 2-8-0 8514 24951 09/1944 20/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 8515 25413 09/1944 06/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 8516 25414 09/1944 16/05/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 8517 25424 09/1944 07/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78518 25415 09/1944 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78519 25416 09/1944 07/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78520 25417 09/1944 12/08/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78521 25418 09/1944 18/01/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78560 25321 09/1944 15/05/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78561 25322 09/1944 25/04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78562 25323 09/1944 25/10/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78563 25324 09/1944 19/12/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78564 25325 09/1944 11/09/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78565 25326 09/1944 25/07/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78522 25419 10/1944 27/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78523 25420 10/1944 05/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78524 25421 10/1944 02/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78525 25422 10/1944 20/06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78526 25423 10/1944 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78527 25425 10/1944 09/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78528 25426 10/1944 30/05/1963
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78529 25427 10/1944 01/1973
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78566 25327 10/1944 04/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78567 25328 10/1944 02/1958
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78568 25329 10/1944 28/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78569 25330 10/1944 04/07/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78570 25331 10/1944 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78571 25332 10/1944 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78572 25333 10/1944 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78573 25334 10/1944 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78574 25335 10/1944 02/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78575 25336 10/1944 13/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78576 25337 10/1944 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78577 25338 10/1944 11/10/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78578 25339 10/1944 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78579 25340 10/1944 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78580 25341 10/1944 21/03/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78530 25428 11/1944 11/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78586 25347 11/1944 12/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78589 25350 11/1944 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78593 25354 11/1944 07/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78611 25372 12/1944 10/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78613 25374 12/1944 12/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78531 25386 01/1945 28/03/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78532 25387 01/1945 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78533 25388 01/1945 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78534 25389 01/1945 10/11/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78615 25376 01/1945 08/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78616 25377 01/1945 30/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78617 25378 01/1945 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78618 25379 01/1945 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78619 25380 01/1945 09/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78620 25381 01/1945 10/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78621 25382 01/1945 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78622 25383 01/1945 01/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78623 25384 01/1945 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78624 25385 01/1945 12/05/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78535 25390 02/1945 09/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78536 25391 02/1945 03/1956
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78537 25392 02/1945 17/04/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78538 25393 02/1945 18/08/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78539 25394 02/1945 12/1954
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78540 25395 02/1945 24/06/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78541 25396 02/1945 26/10/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78542 25397 02/1945 12/02/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78543 25398 02/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78544 25399 02/1945 15/01/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78545 25400 02/1945 03/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78546 25401 02/1945 04/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78547 25402 02/1945 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78548 25403 02/1945 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78549 25404 02/1945 11/1949
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73750   03/1945 04/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73751   03/1945 10/1951
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78550 25405 03/1945 13/01/1964
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78551 25406 03/1945 09/09/1967
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78552 25407 03/1945 07/1957
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78553 25408 03/1945 16/01/1966
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78554 25409 03/1945 11/04/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78555 25410 03/1945 04/1955
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78556 25411 03/1945 06/1965
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78557 25412 03/1945 11/1949
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78558 25413 03/1945 09/1953
WD WD/8 2-8-0 78559 25414 03/1945 01/08/1965
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73752   04/1945 06/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73753   04/1945 11/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73754   04/1945 09/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73755   04/1945 05/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73756   04/1945 08/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73757   04/1945 09/1949
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73758   04/1945 01/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73759   04/1945 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73760   04/1945 02/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73761   05/1945 05/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73762   05/1945 11/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73763   05/1945 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73764   05/1945 04/1952
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73765   05/1945 08/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73766   05/1945 11/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73767   05/1945 03/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73768   05/1945 02/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73769   05/1945 02/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73770   05/1945 02/1952
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73771   05/1945 09/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73772   05/1945 11/1951
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73773   05/1945 01/1950
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73774   06/1945 09/05/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73775   06/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73776   06/1945 19/12/1961
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73777   06/1945 06/07/1961
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73778   06/1945 06/07/1961
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73779   06/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73780   06/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73781   06/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73782   06/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73783   06/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73784   06/1945 09/05/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73785   06/1945 29/11/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73786   06/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73787   06/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73788   07/1945 09/05/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73789   07/1945 17/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73790   07/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73791   07/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73792   07/1945 30/07/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73793   08/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73794   08/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73795   08/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73796   08/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73797   08/1945 1967
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73798   08/1945 29/12/1962
WD WD/10 2-10-0 73799   08/1945 13/12/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1040 25796 16/04/1946 10/07/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1041 25797 26/04/1946 19/04/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 1042 25799 04/05/1946 17/04/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1043 25800 14/05/1946 09/07/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1044 25801 20/05/1946 17/03/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 1045 25802 24/05/1946 16/09/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1046 25798 29/05/1946 24/04/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1047 25803 03/06/1946 16/09/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1048 25804 06/06/1946 16/09/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1049 25805 11/06/1946 07/11/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 1050 25806 17/06/1946 10/02/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1051 25807 20/06/1946 10/02/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1052 25808 24/06/1946 16/09/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1053 25809 27/06/1946 25/02/1963
LNER B1 4-6-0 1054 25810 02/07/1946 16/09/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1055 25811 04/07/1946 27/02/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1056 25812 04/07/1946 19/04/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 1057 25813 08/07/1946 17/04/1950
LNER B1 4-6-0 1058 25814 10/07/1946 10/02/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1059 25815 27/07/1946 25/11/1963
LNER B1 4-6-0 1060 25816 01/08/1946 16/09/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1061 25817 03/08/1946 13/09/1965
LNER B1