Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 118 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 3486 Week
» 24388 Month
» 24388 Year
» 1245953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
SR D1M 0-4-2T     12/1881 05/1949
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 527   05/1887 07/1930
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 529   10/1887 11/1928
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 528   10/1887 10/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 533   12/1887 10/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 532   12/1887 10/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 531   12/1887 10/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 530   12/1887 04/1931
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 536   12/1887 10/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 535   12/1887 04/1928
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 534   12/1887 12/1931
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 538   03/1888 01/1931
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 537   03/1888 10/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 540   04/1888 06/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 539   04/1888 09/1930
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 541   05/1888 01/1931
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 546   06/1888 03/1930
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 545   06/1888 11/1931
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 544   06/1888 10/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 543   06/1888 06/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 542   06/1888 10/1928
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 61   06/1888 12/1932
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 67   12/1888 10/1931
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 66   12/1888 03/1932
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 65   12/1888 09/1934
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 64   12/1888 04/1932
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 63   12/1888 02/1933
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 62   12/1888 03/1933
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 69   03/1889 10/1931
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 68   03/1889 10/1931
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 70   04/1889 08/1934
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 549   06/1889 12/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 548   06/1889 04/1928
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 547   06/1889 04/1929
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 72   06/1889 06/1933
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 71   06/1889 01/1936
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 551   10/1889 01/1932
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 550   10/1889 12/1929
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 74   10/1889 04/1934
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 73   10/1889 01/1936
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 552   11/1889 04/1928
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 556   12/1889 04/1929
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 555   12/1889 03/1943
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 554   12/1889 11/1931
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 553   12/1889 11/1928
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 75   12/1889 02/1935
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 178   12/1889 12/1966
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 177   12/1889 10/1959
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 179   03/1890 12/1959
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 76   04/1890 08/1933
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 180   04/1890 03/1967
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 181   05/1890 10/1966
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 183   05/1890 09/1961
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 182   05/1890 01/1960
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 77   06/1890 05/1932
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 185   06/1890 05/1940
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 184   06/1890 12/1966
LSWR X2 4-4-0 577   06/1890 02/1933
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 186   07/1890 12/1966
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 78   08/1890 11/1933
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 79   09/1890 12/1933
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 80   09/1890 01/1936
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 189   10/1890 07/1933
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 188   10/1890 08/1955
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 187   10/1890 08/1945
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 193   11/1890 04/1962
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 192   11/1890 08/1961
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 191   11/1890 03/1933
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 190   11/1890 30/12/1962
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 195   12/1890 05/1956
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 194   12/1890 08/1933
LSWR X2 4-4-0 581   12/1890 01/1932
LSWR X2 4-4-0 580   12/1890 02/1933
LSWR X2 4-4-0 579   12/1890 05/1932
LSWR X2 4-4-0 578   12/1890 02/1933
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 196   03/1891 11/1937
LSWR X2 4-4-0 582   03/1891 03/1931
LSWR X2 4-4-0 584   04/1891 09/1933
LSWR X2 4-4-0 583   04/1891 01/1931
LSWR X2 4-4-0 585   05/1891 09/1931
LSWR X2 4-4-0 586   05/1891 11/1942
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 197   06/1891 02/1953
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 200   06/1891 08/1962
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 199   06/1891 23/12/1962
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 198   06/1891 06/1964
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 202   07/1891 05/1966
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 201   07/1891 08/1955
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 204   08/1891 01/1953
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 203   08/1891 12/1955
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 206   09/1891 11/1955
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 205   09/1891 05/1966
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 85   10/1891 02/1949
LSWR X2 4-4-0 587   10/1891 08/1937
LSWR X2 4-4-0 589   11/1891 05/1931
LSWR X2 4-4-0 588   11/1891 03/1932
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 86   12/1891 02/1959
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 87   12/1891 12/1958
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 210   12/1891 05/1966
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 209   12/1891 03/1967
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 208   12/1891 12/1966
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 207   12/1891 06/1957
LSWR X2 4-4-0 591   12/1891 05/1931
LSWR X2 4-4-0 590   12/1891 04/1937
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 211   03/1892 12/1966
LSWR X2 4-4-0 594   03/1892 05/1931
LSWR X2 4-4-0 593   03/1892 07/1931
LSWR X2 4-4-0 592   03/1892 12/1936
LSWR X2 4-4-0 595   04/1892 12/1930
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 213   05/1892 02/1953
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 212   05/1892 12/1959
LSWR X2 4-4-0 596   05/1892 05/1931
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 217   06/1892 12/1966
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 216   06/1892 11/1957
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 215   06/1892 12/1966
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 214   06/1892 07/1940
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 218   08/1892 12/1966
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 222   09/1892 02/1933
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 221   09/1892 08/1953
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 220   09/1892 12/1965
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 219   09/1892 09/1965
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 88   10/1892 07/1959
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 224   10/1892 02/1958
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 223   10/1892 10/1961
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 89   11/1892 10/03/1963
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 90   11/1892 05/1948
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 91   11/1892 08/1948
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 226   11/1892 10/1964
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 225   11/1892 23/12/1962
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 92   12/1892 04/1949
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 93   12/1892 04/1960
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 94   12/1892 03/1957
LSWR T3 4-4-0 559   12/1892 05/1931
LSWR T3 4-4-0 558   12/1892 10/1931
LSWR T3 4-4-0 557   12/1892 04/1936
LSWR T3 4-4-0 561   02/1893 10/1930
LSWR T3 4-4-0 560   02/1893 05/1932
LSWR T3 4-4-0 563   03/1893 08/1945
LSWR T3 4-4-0 562   03/1893 04/1931
LSWR T3 4-4-0 565   04/1893 05/1933
LSWR T3 4-4-0 564   04/1893 09/1931
LSWR T3 4-4-0 567   05/1893 02/1933
LSWR T3 4-4-0 566   05/1893 08/1931
LSWR T3 4-4-0 570   06/1893 07/1931
LSWR T3 4-4-0 569   06/1893 01/1932
LSWR T3 4-4-0 568   06/1893 05/1932
LSWR T3 4-4-0 571   08/1893 02/1943
LSWR T3 4-4-0 573   09/1893 09/1931
LSWR T3 4-4-0 572   09/1893 10/1931
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 176   10/1893 06/1948
LSWR T3 4-4-0 575   10/1893 01/1932
LSWR T3 4-4-0 574   10/1893 07/1933
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 81   11/1893 02/1949
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 95   11/1893 04/1949
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 96   11/1893 10/1963
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 97   11/1893 03/1949
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 98   11/1893 02/1949
LSWR T3 4-4-0 576   11/1893 08/1933
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 99   12/1893 02/1949
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 100   12/1893 02/1949
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 102   12/1893 09/1963
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 103   12/1893 04/1949
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 600   12/1893 08/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 599   12/1893 03/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 598   12/1893 03/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 597   12/1893 05/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 601   02/1894 12/1934
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 605   03/1894 04/1936
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 604   03/1894 05/1933
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 603   03/1894 08/1935
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 602   03/1894 07/1933
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 606   04/1894 03/1946
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 1   04/1894 07/1949
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 3   05/1894 09/1948
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 2   05/1894 02/1949
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 5   06/1894 01/1950
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 4   06/1894 08/1946
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 6   06/1894 11/1947
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 7   07/1894 05/1951
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 257   08/1894 02/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 258   08/1894 07/1961
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 10   08/1894 09/1948
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 9   08/1894 07/1948
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 8   08/1894 05/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 259   09/1894 12/1950
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 260   09/1894 11/1958
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 261   09/1894 11/1948
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 262   09/1894 11/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 263   10/1894 09/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 264   10/1894 02/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 265   10/1894 08/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 266   10/1894 08/1960
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 649   11/1894 03/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 648   11/1894 07/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 647   11/1894 02/1933
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 227   11/1894 06/1933
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 229   12/1894 03/1961
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 228   12/1894 08/1943
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 231   12/1894 02/1953
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 230   12/1894 07/1956
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 650   01/1895 04/1938
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 233   01/1895 02/1958
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 232   01/1895 09/1959
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 234   02/1895 03/1937
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 652   03/1895 01/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 651   03/1895 02/1933
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 236   03/1895 01/1960
LSWR O2 0-4-4T 235   03/1895 02/1933
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 655   04/1895 04/1936
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 654   04/1895 05/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 653   04/1895 04/1932
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 656   05/1895 04/1932
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 14   06/1895 07/1933
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 13   06/1895 02/1949
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 12   06/1895 01/1933
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 11   06/1895 07/1944
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 15   07/1895 07/1944
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 16   08/1895 01/1946
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 18   09/1895 05/1935
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 17   09/1895 01/1945
LSWR T6 4-4-0 677   09/1895 02/1933
LSWR T6 4-4-0 678   10/1895 01/1936
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 20   11/1895 05/1951
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 19   11/1895 11/1937
LSWR T6 4-4-0 679   11/1895 04/1937
LSWR T6 4-4-0 682   12/1895 06/1936
LSWR T6 4-4-0 681   12/1895 04/1943
LSWR T6 4-4-0 680   12/1895 06/1937
LSWR X6 4-4-0 659   12/1895 07/1943
LSWR X6 4-4-0 658   12/1895 12/1946
LSWR X6 4-4-0 657   12/1895 09/1940
LSWR X6 4-4-0 662   12/1895 03/1933
LSWR X6 4-4-0 661   12/1895 12/1936
LSWR X6 4-4-0 660   12/1895 10/1936
LSWR T6 4-4-0 684   03/1896 04/1940
LSWR T6 4-4-0 683   03/1896 08/1933
LSWR T6 4-4-0 685   04/1896 02/1936
LSWR X6 4-4-0 663   04/1896 10/1936
LSWR T6 4-4-0 686   05/1896 05/1936
LSWR X6 4-4-0 664   05/1896 12/1942
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 361   06/1896 02/1949
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 360   06/1896 07/1944
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 359   06/1896 10/1943
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 358   06/1896 07/1944
LSWR X6 4-4-0 666   06/1896 04/1943
LSWR X6 4-4-0 665   06/1896 06/1933
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 367   07/1896 05/1951
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 366   07/1896 10/1948
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 365   07/1896 03/1938
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 364   07/1896 10/1944
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 363   07/1896 06/1948
LSWR T1 0-4-4T 362   07/1896 02/1939
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 267   10/1896 02/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 268   10/1896 12/1950
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 269   10/1896 10/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 270   11/1896 01/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 242   03/1897 08/1958
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 243   03/1897 09/1958
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 244   03/1897 10/1957
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 245   04/1897 17/11/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 246   04/1897 10/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 247   04/1897 10/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 248   05/1897 07/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 249   05/1897 07/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 250   05/1897 08/1957
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 251   06/1897 07/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 252   08/1897 02/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 253   08/1897 10/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 254   08/1897 05/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 255   08/1897 09/1960
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 256   08/1897 05/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 667   09/1897 02/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 668   09/1897 09/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 669   09/1897 07/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 670   10/1897 09/02/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 671   10/1897 07/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 672   10/1897 05/1948
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 673   11/1897 08/1960
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 674   11/1897 08/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 675   11/1897 03/1958
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 676   11/1897 07/1961
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 271   12/1897 09/1948
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 272   02/1898 08/1950
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 273   02/1898 03/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 274   02/1898 08/10/1960
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 275   02/1898 12/1949
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 31   03/1898 01/1960
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 32   03/1898 07/1963
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 276   03/1898 10/1949
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 33   04/1898 22/12/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 34   04/1898 17/02/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 35   04/1898 17/02/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 36   05/1898 01/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 37   05/1898 05/1958
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 38   05/1898 02/1958
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 39   05/1898 09/02/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 40   06/1898 06/1961
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 237   09/1898 03/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 238   09/1898 11/1960
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 239   09/1898 10/1948
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 240   10/1898 03/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 279   11/1898 12/1948
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 22   01/1899 05/1958
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 23   01/1899 07/10/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 24   01/1899 03/03/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 25   02/1899 05/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 26   02/1899 04/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 41   03/1899 08/1957
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 42   03/1899 06/1957
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 43   03/1899 05/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 44   03/1899 09/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 241   05/1899 07/1963
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 113   06/1899 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 114   06/1899 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 115   07/1899 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 116   07/1899 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 117   07/1899 07/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 118   07/1899 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 119   08/1899 12/1952
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 120   08/1899 07/1963
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 121   08/1899 04/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 122   09/1899 04/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 280   10/1899 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 281   11/1899 12/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 282   11/1899 03/1954
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 283   12/1899 12/1957
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 284   12/1899 04/1958
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 285   01/1900 08/1958
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 286   01/1900 04/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 287   01/1900 09/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 288   02/1900 12/1960
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 289   02/1900 11/1959
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 160   03/1900 04/1959
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 162   04/1900 03/1958
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 277   04/1900 11/11/1961
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 278   05/1900 12/1948
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 348   06/1900 08/1948
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 349   06/1900 07/1961
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 351   06/1900 03/1949
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 353   06/1900 03/1951
LSWR G6 0-6-0T 354   06/1900 11/1949
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 112   07/1900 09/02/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 318   08/1900 12/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 319   08/1900 01/1960
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 320   08/1900 09/02/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 321   08/1900 09/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 322   08/1900 11/1958
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 323   10/1900 12/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 324   10/1900 09/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 356   10/1900 12/1958
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 357   10/1900 04/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 300   12/1900 03/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 301   12/1900 08/1959
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 302   12/1900 10/1952
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 303   12/1900 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 304   12/1900 09/1957
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 305   02/1901 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 307   02/1901 12/1952
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 310   04/1901 05/1959
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 311   04/1901 08/1952
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 312   05/1901 03/1952
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 313   09/1901 07/1961
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 314   09/1901 05/1951
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 336   10/1901 02/1953
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 337   10/1901 11/1958
LSWR Greyhounds 4-4-0 338   10/1901 04/1961
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 329   12/1901 04/1950
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 340   12/1901 06/1948
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 341   12/1901 12/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 343   12/1901 02/1948
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 345   01/1902 09/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 393   02/1902 02/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 394   03/1902 05/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 380   04/1902 06/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 382   04/1902 08/1950
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 383   04/1902 05/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 384   04/1902 06/1951
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 385   05/1902 02/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 386   05/1902 08/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 135   06/1902 03/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 389   06/1902 01/1951
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 390   06/1902 11/1950
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 391   07/1902 10/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 392   07/1902 10/1948
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 137   09/1902 08/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 139   10/1902 09/1948
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 140   10/1902 01/1950
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 141   10/1902 10/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 142   11/1902 01/1950
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 143   11/1902 09/1948
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 144   11/1902 07/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 145   12/1902 10/1948
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 146   12/1902 02/1948
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 150   12/1902 02/1948
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 151   12/1902 02/1950
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 152   12/1902 02/1949
LSWR Small Hoppers 4-4-0 153   12/1902 03/1949
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 123   02/1903 06/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 124   02/1903 05/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 130   02/1903 12/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 132   03/1903 27/10/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 133   03/1903 03/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 374   04/1903 10/1959
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 154   05/1903 04/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 155   05/1903 04/1951
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 375   05/1903 09/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 376   05/1903 01/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 377   05/1903 08/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 378   05/1903 30/12/1962
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 156   06/1903 05/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 157   06/1903 03/1952
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 158   06/1903 12/1950
LSWR S11 4-4-0 395   06/1903 10/1951
LSWR S11 4-4-0 396   06/1903 11/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 159   07/1903 03/1951
LSWR S11 4-4-0 397   07/1903 12/1951
LSWR S11 4-4-0 398   07/1903 12/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 161   08/1903 02/1950
LSWR S11 4-4-0 399   08/1903 12/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 163   09/1903 27/10/1951
LSWR S11 4-4-0 400   09/1903 11/1954
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 164   10/1903 10/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 165   10/1903 04/1951
LSWR S11 4-4-0 401   11/1903 09/1951
LSWR S11 4-4-0 402   11/1903 03/1951
LSWR S11 4-4-0 403   12/1903 01/10/1951
LSWR S11 4-4-0 404   12/1903 10/1951
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 21   01/1904 03/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 27   01/1904 11/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 28   01/1904 29/09/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 29   02/1904 05/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30   02/1904 10/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 108   03/1904 05/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 109   03/1904 06/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 110   03/1904 05/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 111   03/1904 01/1964
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 134   04/1904 03/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 148   04/1904 03/1952
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 166   04/1904 07/1950
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 167   05/1904 09/1949
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 168   05/1904 02/1950
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 379   06/1904 10/1963
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 415   06/1904 02/1953
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 416   06/1904 06/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 417   06/1904 12/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 418   07/1904 06/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 419   07/1904 12/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 169   08/1904 07/1949
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 170   08/1904 06/1952
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 171   09/1904 09/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 172   09/1904 06/1952
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 173   09/1904 05/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 420   09/1904 09/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 421   09/1904 09/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 422   10/1904 09/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 423   10/1904 07/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 424   11/1904 07/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 425   11/1904 09/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 426   12/1904 11/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 427   12/1904 11/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 428   01/1905 04/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 429   01/1905 10/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 430   02/1905 03/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 431   02/1905 10/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 432   02/1905 10/1951
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 104   03/1905 05/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 105   03/1905 05/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 106   03/1905 19/11/1960
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 433   03/1905 12/1951
LSWR Bulldogs 4-4-0 434   03/1905 03/1955
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 107   04/1905 05/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 45   05/1905 08/12/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 46   05/1905 02/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 47   05/1905 02/1960
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 48   05/1905 01/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 49   05/1905 02/06/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 50   06/1905 27/01/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 51   11/1905 29/09/1962
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 52   12/1905 05/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 53   12/1905 05/1964
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 54   12/1905 01/1959
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 55   12/1905 09/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 56   01/1906 12/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 57   01/1906 06/1963
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 58   03/1906 09/1960
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 59   03/1906 02/1961
LSWR Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 60   03/1906 07/1961
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 174   04/1906 09/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 175   04/1906 12/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 407   05/1906 11/1950
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 408   05/1906 03/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 409   06/1906 06/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 410   06/1906 12/1949
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 411   06/1906 06/1952
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 412   07/1906 12/1950
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 413   07/1906 03/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 414   07/1906 05/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 405   09/1906 02/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 406   09/1906 06/1951
SR Potato Cans 0-4-0T 745   01/09/1906 04/1959
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 435   10/1906 12/1949
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 436   11/1906 07/1951
SR Potato Cans 0-4-0T 3741   11/1906 12/1957
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 437   12/1906 06/1952
SR Potato Cans 0-4-0T 3744   01/1907 06/1957
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 438   03/1907 10/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 439   03/1907 05/1949
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 440   04/1907 05/1949
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 441   05/1907 04/1951
LSWR Large Hoppers 4-4-0 442   05/1907 12/1951
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 101   04/1908 11/1948
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 147   04/1908 02/1949
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 82   06/1908 07/1957
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 83   06/1908 10/1959
LSWR B4 0-4-0T 84   06/1908 08/1959