Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1039 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 6260 Week
» 21374 Month
» 324564 Year
» 1546129 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
GSWR 141 0-4-2 141 1226 09/1866 1900
GSWR 141 0-4-2 142 1227 09/1866 1904
GSWR 141 0-4-2 143 1228 09/1866 1904
GSWR 141 0-4-2 144 1229 09/1866 1913
GSWR 141 0-4-2 145 1230 09/1866 1903
GSWR 141 0-4-2 146 1231 09/1866 1905
GSWR 141 0-4-2 147 1232 10/1866 1909
GSWR 141 0-4-2 148 1233 10/1866 1902
GSWR 141 0-4-2 149 1234 10/1866 12/1923
GSWR 141 0-4-2 150 1235 10/1866 06/1924
GSWR 58 0-6-0 160 1317 04/1867 1920
GSWR 58 0-6-0 161 1318 04/1867 1922
GSWR 58 0-6-0 162 1319 04/1867 1917
GSWR 58 0-6-0 163 1320 04/1867 1896
GSWR 58 0-6-0 164 1321 05/1867 1923
GSWR 58 0-6-0 165 1322 05/1867 1910
GSWR 58 0-6-0 166 1323 05/1867 05/1922
GSWR 58 0-6-0 167 1324 05/1867 04/1922
GSWR 58 0-6-0 168 1325 05/1867 1909
GSWR 58 0-6-0 169 1326 05/1867 1920
GSWR 58 0-6-0 172 1443 1869 06/1917
GSWR 58 0-6-0 173 1444 1869 03/1915
GSWR 58 0-6-0 174 1445 1869 04/1922
GSWR 58 0-6-0 175 1446 1869 1910
GSWR 58 0-6-0 176 1447 1869 1920
GSWR 58 0-6-0 177 1448 1869 06/1917
GSWR 58 0-6-0 178 1449 1869 1910
GSWR 58 0-6-0 179 1450 1869 07/1917
GSWR 58 0-6-0 180 1451 1869 03/1915
GSWR 58 0-6-0 181 1452 1869 06/1917
GSWR 187 0-4-2 187 1564 12/1870 1917
GSWR 187 0-4-2 188 1565 12/1870 1930
GSWR 187 0-4-2 189 1566 12/1870 1930
GSWR 187 0-4-2 190 1567 12/1870 1917
GSWR 187 0-4-2 191 1568 12/1870 06/1926
GSWR 187 0-4-2 197 1616 1871 1908
GSWR 187 0-4-2 198 1617 1871 1913
GSWR 187 0-4-2 199 1618 1871 07/1897
GSWR 187 0-4-2 200 1619 1871 1907
GSWR 187 0-4-2 201 1620 1871 1907
GSWR 187 0-4-2 202 1621 1871 1906
GSWR 187 0-4-2 203 1622 1871 01/1899
GSWR 187 0-4-2 204 1623 1871 1927
GSWR 187 0-4-2 205 1624 1871 1930
GSWR 187 0-4-2 206 1625 1871 1908
GSWR 187 0-4-2 192 1569 01/1871 1927
GSWR 187 0-4-2 193 1570 01/1871 1913
GSWR 187 0-4-2 194 1571 02/1871 01/1926
GSWR 187 0-4-2 195 1572 02/1871 1912
GSWR 187 0-4-2 196 1573 02/1871 1912
GSWR 221 0-4-2 221 1886 1874 1930
GSWR 221 0-4-2 222 1887 1874 1930
GSWR 221 0-4-2 223 1888 1874 11/1927
GSWR 221 0-4-2 224 1889 1874 11/1927
GSWR 221 0-4-2 225 1890 1874 07/1925
GSWR 221 0-4-2 226 1891 1874 05/1927
GSWR 221 0-4-2 227 1892 1874 1930
GSWR 221 0-4-2 228 1893 1874 03/1928
GSWR 221 0-4-2 229 1894 1874 07/1925
GSWR 221 0-4-2 230 1895 1874 11/1926
NER G6 0-4-4T 947 1829 04/1874 01/1924
NER G6 0-4-4T 948 1830 04/1874 09/1948
NER G6 0-4-4T 949 1831 05/1874 11/1928
NER G6 0-4-4T 950 1832 05/1874 02/1923
NER G6 0-4-4T 951 1833 05/1874 09/1926
NER G6 0-4-4T 952 1834 05/1874 01/1924
GER Y5 0-4-0ST 209 1940 05/1874 12/11/1926
NER G6 0-4-4T 953 1835 08/1874 08/07/1957
NER G6 0-4-4T 954 1836 08/1874 30/05/1960
NER G6 0-4-4T 955 1837 08/1874 05/1926
NER G6 0-4-4T 956 1838 08/1874 04/07/1955
NER G6 0-4-4T 957 1839 08/1874 04/1937
NER G6 0-4-4T 958 1840 08/1874 09/1944
GSWR 221 0-4-2 231 1956 1875 05/1927
GSWR 221 0-4-2 232 1957 1875 06/1926
GSWR 221 0-4-2 233 1958 1875 09/1928
GSWR 221 0-4-2 234 1959 1875 06/1926
GSWR 221 0-4-2 235 1960 1875 06/1925
GSWR 221 0-4-2 236 1961 1875 06/1928
GSWR 221 0-4-2 237 1962 1875 11/1929
GSWR 221 0-4-2 238 1963 03/1875 01/1926
GSWR 221 0-4-2 239 1964 03/1875 10/1923
GER Y5 0-4-0ST 210 1942 03/1875 09/1914
GSWR 221 0-4-2 240 1965 04/1875 08/1929
GSWR 221 0-4-2 241 1970 04/1875 1919
GSWR 221 0-4-2 242 1971 04/1875 01/1925
GSWR 221 0-4-2 243 1972 04/1875 08/1925
GSWR 221 0-4-2 244 1973 04/1875 1915
GSWR 221 0-4-2 245 1974 05/1875 09/1927
GSWR 221 0-4-2 246 1975 05/1875 1922
GSWR 221 0-4-2 247 1976 05/1875 09/1925
GSWR 221 0-4-2 248 1977 05/1875 02/1928
GSWR 221 0-4-2 249 1978 05/1875 1914
GSWR 221 0-4-2 250 1979 05/1875 1914
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1262 2038 11/1875 01/12/1934
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1263 2039 11/1875 29/11/1930
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1264 2040 11/1875 02/11/1935
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1265 2041 11/1875 21/05/1949
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1266 2042 11/1875 24/03/1945
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1267 2043 11/1875 03/12/1932
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1268 2044 12/1875 29/11/1930
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1269 2045 12/1875 06/11/1927
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1270 2046 12/1875 01/1929
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1271 2047 12/1875 09/1920
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1272 2048 12/1875 18/06/1949
CR 502 0-4-0ST 502 2122 1876 1921
CR 502 0-4-0ST 503 2123 1876 09/1939
CR 502 0-4-0ST 504 2124 1876 1919
CR 502 0-4-0ST 505 2202 1876 01/1939
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1273 2049 01/1876 31/12/1949
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1274 2050 01/1876 14/06/1925
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1275 2063 01/1876 09/09/1950
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1276 2064 02/1876 26/03/1932
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1280 2051 03/1876 31/01/1926
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1281 2052 03/1876 15/07/1950
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1277 2065 03/1876 07/10/1950
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1278 2066 03/1876 28/01/1950
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1279 2067 03/1876 07/09/1946
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1252 2053 04/1876 01/12/1928
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1253 2054 04/1876 26/12/1931
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1254 2055 04/1876 27/02/1937
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1255 2056 04/1876 08/09/1934
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1256 2057 04/1876 15/05/1948
GER Y5 0-4-0ST 228 2118 04/1876 30/06/1927
GER Y5 0-4-0ST 229 2119 04/1876 02/1917
MR 1142 0-6-0 1222 2082 05/1876 21/04/1955
MR 1142 0-6-0 1223 2083 05/1876 30/11/1933
MR 1142 0-6-0 1224 2084 05/1876 08/09/1960
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1257 2058 05/1876 19/06/1954
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1258 2059 05/1876 29/11/1930
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1259 2060 05/1876 18/04/1936
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1260 2061 05/1876 04/12/1927
MR 1262 0-4-4T 1261 2062 05/1876 18/05/1929
MR 1142 0-6-0 1225 2085 06/1876 24/03/1962
MR 1142 0-6-0 1226 2086 06/1876 11/08/1959
MR 1142 0-6-0 1227 2087 06/1876 14/07/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1228 2088 06/1876 25/02/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1229 2089 06/1876 06/10/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1230 2090 06/1876 08/09/1959
MR 1142 0-6-0 1231 2091 06/1876 19/05/1954
GSWR 221 0-4-2 263 2207 06/1876 1917
GSWR 221 0-4-2 264 2208 06/1876 1915
MR 1142 0-6-0 1232 2092 07/1876 16/06/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1233 2093 07/1876 09/12/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1234 2094 07/1876 16/12/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1235 2095 07/1876 14/07/1956
GSWR 221 0-4-2 265 2209 07/1876 07/1917
GSWR 221 0-4-2 266 2210 07/1876 03/1915
GSWR 221 0-4-2 267 2211 07/1876 1919
GSWR 221 0-4-2 268 2212 07/1876 10/1923
GSWR 221 0-4-2 269 2213 07/1876 10/1923
GSWR 221 0-4-2 270 2214 07/1876 05/1924
MR 1142 0-6-0 1236 2096 10/1876 14/07/1935
MR 1142 0-6-0 1237 2097 10/1876 29/09/1962
MR 1142 0-6-0 1238 2098 10/1876 19/05/1959
MR 1142 0-6-0 1239 2099 10/1876 21/04/1956
MR 1142 0-6-0 1240 2100 10/1876 03/11/1953
MR 1142 0-6-0 1241 2101 11/1876 14/07/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1242 2102 11/1876 28/01/1964
MR 1142 0-6-0 1243 2103 11/1876 28/01/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1244 2104 12/1876 30/11/1956
MR 1142 0-6-0 1245 2105 12/1876 07/07/1962
MR 1142 0-6-0 1246 2106 12/1876 25/02/1961
MR 1142 0-6-0 1247 2107 12/1876 31/12/1927
MR 1142 0-6-0 1248 2108 12/1876 24/03/1948
MR 1142 0-6-0 1249 2109 12/1876 08/09/1929
MR 1142 0-6-0 1250 2110 12/1876 14/07/1957
MR 1142 0-6-0 1251 2111 12/1876 16/06/1926
GSWR 221 0-4-2 261 2205 05/1877 1931
GSWR 221 0-4-2 262 2206 05/1877 1919
CR 502 0-4-0ST 528 2347 1878 1920
CR 502 0-4-0ST 529 2348 1878 1940
CR 502 0-4-0ST 530 2349 1878 1917
CR 502 0-4-0ST 531 2350 1878 1918
GSWR 221 0-4-2 271 2337 05/1878 03/1915
GSWR 221 0-4-2 272 2338 05/1878 11/1923
GSWR 221 0-4-2 273 2339 05/1878 1913
GSWR 221 0-4-2 274 2340 05/1878 05/1924
GSWR 221 0-4-2 275 2341 05/1878 01/1925
GSWR 221 0-4-2 276 2342 06/1878 1930
GSWR 221 0-4-2 277 2343 06/1878 02/1911
GSWR 221 0-4-2 278 2344 06/1878 1919
GSWR 221 0-4-2 279 2345 06/1878 07/1917
GSWR 221 0-4-2 280 2346 06/1878 1930
NBR D50 4-4-0T 494 2420 04/1879 03/1926
NBR D50 4-4-0T 495 2421 04/1879 02/1926
NBR D50 4-4-0T 496 2422 05/1879 05/1924
MCR 15 0-4-0T 15 2640 1880 08/1924
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1880 06/10/1951
MCR 15 0-4-0T 26 2737 1881 04/1924
CR 502 0-4-0ST 532 2741 1881 1926
CR 502 0-4-0ST 533 2742 1881 1921
CR 502 0-4-0ST 534 2743 1881 1929
CR 502 0-4-0ST 535 2744 1881 1921
CR 502 0-4-0ST 536 2745 1881 1922
CR 502 0-4-0ST 537 2746 1881 1922
CR 486 0-6-0ST 486 2697 1881 1913
CR 486 0-6-0ST 1 2697 1881 1913
CR 486 0-6-0ST 487 2698 1881 1913
CR 486 0-6-0ST 2 2698 1881 1913
CR 486 0-6-0ST 488 2699 1881 07/1919
CR 486 0-6-0ST 4 2699 1881 07/1919
CR 486 0-6-0ST 489 2700 1881 1928
CR 486 0-6-0ST 5 2700 1881 1928
CR 486 0-6-0ST 490 2701 1881 1921
CR 486 0-6-0ST 6 2701 1881 1921
CR 486 0-6-0ST 491 2702 1881 1921
CR 486 0-6-0ST 7 2702 1881 1921
SR 1302 0-4-0CT 1302   04/1881 07/1949
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2234   10/1881 02/1950
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2235   11/1881 05/1949
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3397   12/1881 07/1953
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3400   01/1882 26/01/1957
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2239   01/1882 03/1948
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2252   01/1882 09/1950
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2253   03/1882 09/1949
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2259   03/1882 03/1948
GSWR 22 0-6-0 281 2968 1883 1930
GSWR 22 0-6-0 282 2969 1883 11/1927
GSWR 22 0-6-0 285 2970 1883 1930
GSWR 22 0-6-0 283 2972 1883 1930
GSWR 22 0-6-0 286 2973 1883 1930
GSWR 22 0-6-0 287 2974 1883 1930
GSWR 22 0-6-0 288 2975 1883 1930
GSWR 22 0-6-0 289 2976 1883 1930
GSWR 22 0-6-0 290 2977 1883 1928
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3154   03/1883 09/1959
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3155   03/1883 12/04/1958
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3433   04/1883 24/11/1956
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3436   04/1883 05/01/1957
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3163   05/1883 06/1956
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3167   05/1883 29/12/1956
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3439   05/1883 13/12/1958
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3440   05/1883 30/12/1950
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3441   05/1883 04/02/1956
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3442   05/1883 10/08/1957
GSWR 22 0-6-0 284 2971 09/1883 05/1927
CR 294 0-6-0 294 3043 11/1883 16/07/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 295 3044 11/1883 15/05/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 296 3045 11/1883 02/10/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 297 3046 11/1883 03/1957
CR 294 0-6-0 298 3047 11/1883 02/10/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 299 3048 11/1883 25/07/1956
CR 294 0-6-0 300 3049 11/1883 04/1949
CR 294 0-6-0 301 3050 12/1883 28/10/1955
CR 294 0-6-0 302 3051 12/1883 12/09/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 303 3052 12/1883 29/05/1959
CR 294 0-6-0 304 3053 12/1883 16/07/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 305 3054 12/1883 17/06/1959
CR 294 0-6-0 306 3055 12/1883 13/09/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 307 3056 12/1883 02/10/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 308 3057 01/1884 29/07/1959
CR 66 4-4-0 66 3058 02/1884 01/1930
CR 66 4-4-0 67 3059 02/1884 1927
CR 66 4-4-0 68 3060 03/1884 1924
CR 66 4-4-0 69 3061 03/1884 1925
CR 66 4-4-0 70 3062 03/1884 1927
CR 66 4-4-0 71 3063 03/1884 1927
CR 66 4-4-0 72 3064 03/1884 1924
CR 66 4-4-0 73 3065 04/1884 1928
CR 66 4-4-0 74 3066 04/1884 1923
CR 66 4-4-0 75 3067 04/1884 10/1929
CR 294 0-6-0 517 3252 07/1884 23/08/1963
CR 294 0-6-0 518 3253 07/1884 22/11/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 519 3254 07/1884 08/10/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 520 3255 08/1884 30/07/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 521 3256 08/1884 24/03/1952
CR 294 0-6-0 522 3257 08/1884 02/10/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 523 3258 08/1884 02/10/1961
LSWR 460 4-4-0 460 3190 09/1884 12/1928
LSWR 460 4-4-0 461 3191 09/1884 10/1926
LSWR 460 4-4-0 462 3192 09/1884 04/1926
CR 294 0-6-0 524 3259 09/1884 08/10/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 525 3260 09/1884 08/10/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 526 3261 09/1884 07/10/1955
CR 294 0-6-0 680 3262 09/1884 07/11/1963
LSWR 460 4-4-0 463 3193 10/1884 06/1926
LSWR 460 4-4-0 464 3194 10/1884 11/1927
LSWR 460 4-4-0 465 3195 10/1884 12/1924
LSWR 460 4-4-0 466 3196 10/1884 07/1928
LSWR 460 4-4-0 467 3197 10/1884 12/1928
LSWR 460 4-4-0 468 3198 10/1884 05/1928
LSWR 460 4-4-0 469 3199 10/1884 04/1927
CR 294 0-6-0 681 3263 10/1884 29/11/1963
CR 294 0-6-0 682 3264 10/1884 02/10/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 683 3265 10/1884 02/10/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 684 3266 10/1884 25/10/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 685 3267 11/1884 02/10/1961
CR 294 0-6-0 686 3268 11/1884 16/07/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 687 3269 11/1884 13/12/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 688 3270 11/1884 02/04/1962
CR 294 0-6-0 689 3271 12/1884 02/10/1961
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 479 3200 02/1885 03/1918
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 480 3201 02/1885 11/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 481 3202 02/1885 12/1924
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 482 3203 02/1885 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 483 3204 03/1885 11/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 484 3205 03/1885 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 485 3206 03/1885 06/1924
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 486 3207 03/1885 01/1928
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 487 3208 03/1885 09/1924
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 488 3209 03/1885 22/07/1961
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 489 3210 03/1885 03/1918
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3496   10/1885 14/01/1956
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3029   11/1885 12/04/1958
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3083   11/1885 14/02/1953
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3101   12/1885 07/02/1959
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3506   12/1885 06/1957
LSWR Jumbos 0-6-0 3509   12/1885 14/03/1953
CR 123 4-2-2 123 3553 1886 04/1935
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3200   1890 29/04/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3203   1890 01/10/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3205   1890 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3207   1890 05/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3208   1890 09/08/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3210   1890 08/08/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3212   1890 09/07/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3213   1890 19/05/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3214   1890 17/06/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3219   1890 28/11/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3222   1890 27/06/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3223   1890 13/06/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3224   1890 30/11/1957
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3225   1890 29/04/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3226   1890 15/09/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3231   1890 11/10/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3232   1890 03/09/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3233   1890 11/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3234   1890 04/02/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3235   1890 20/08/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3237   1890 30/05/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3239   1890 28/12/1957
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3240   1890 29/09/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3241   1890 20/06/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3242   1890 04/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3243   1890 30/07/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3244   1890 10/01/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3245   1890 01/04/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3246   1890 27/10/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3247   1890 21/11/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3249   1890 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3250   1890 13/05/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3251   1890 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3252   1890 18/06/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3253   1890 02/05/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3254   1890 18/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3256   1890 27/02/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3257   1890 29/09/1962
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/1890 12/1949
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1890 12/1951
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1890 29/12/1951
LMS 3F 0-6-0 74   05/1890 12/1952
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 604 4091 07/1890 08/1939
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 605 4092 07/1890 09/11/1953
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 606 4093 07/1890 31/12/1954
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 607 4094 07/1890 04/1937
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 608 4095 07/1890 04/1937
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 609 4096 07/1890 09/1936
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 610 4097 07/1890 11/1938
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 611 4098 08/1890 23/06/1952
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 612 4099 08/1890 08/1933
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 613 4100 08/1890 04/1933
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 586 4126 09/1890 06/1943
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 587 4127 09/1890 06/1932
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 588 4128 09/1890 07/1931
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 589 4129 09/1890 06/1943
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 590 4130 10/1890 02/1932
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 591 4131 10/1890 03/1934
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 592 4132 10/1890 05/1932
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 593 4133 11/1890 07/1939
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 614 4101 11/1890 31/12/1954
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 615 4102 11/1890 12/1937
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 616 4103 11/1890 04/1933
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 617 4104 11/1890 08/1936
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 618 4105 11/1890 09/1937
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 619 4106 11/1890 10/1933
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 620 4107 11/1890 01/10/1954
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 621 4108 12/1890 10/1937
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 622 4109 12/1890 31/12/1954
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 623 4110 12/1890 03/12/1954
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3261   1891 08/12/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3263   1891 02/06/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3265   1891 29/05/1948
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3266   1891 18/03/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3267   1891 22/04/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3268   1891 17/06/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3269   1891 29/05/1948
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3271   1891 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3273   1891 22/10/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3274   1891 10/01/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3275   1891 14/01/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3277   1891 15/07/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3278   1891 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3281   1891 22/12/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3282   1891 13/10/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3283   1891 29/08/1953
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3284   1891 03/06/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3286   1891 14/09/1957
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3287   1891 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3290   1891 28/12/1957
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3292   1891 03/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3293   1891 05/12/1953
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3294   1891 14/11/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3295   1891 28/10/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3296   1891 13/03/1954
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3297   1891 10/06/1950
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3298   1891 26/11/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3299   1891 14/08/1954
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 624 4111 01/1891 07/1938
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 625 4112 01/1891 12/01/1953
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 626 4113 01/1891 01/1932
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 627 4114 01/1891 04/1932
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 628 4115 01/1891 08/1954
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1891 15/03/1952
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 594 4134 03/1891 06/1943
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 595 4135 03/1891 07/1930
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 596 4136 03/1891 07/1938
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 597 4137 03/1891 12/1931
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 598 4138 03/1891 01/1949
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 599 4139 04/1891 11/1937
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 600 4140 04/1891 08/1932
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 629 4116 04/1891 08/11/1954
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 630 4117 04/1891 03/1933
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 631 4118 04/1891 06/1932
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 632 4119 04/1891 03/07/1950
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 633 4120 04/1891 07/1947
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 634 4121 05/1891 03/1940
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 635 4122 05/1891 24/03/1954
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 636 4123 05/1891 10/11/1952
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 637 4124 05/1891 09/1949
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 638 4125 05/1891 01/1932
NBR J36 0-6-0 663 4382 10/1891 10/11/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 664 4383 10/1891 10/07/1951
NBR J36 0-6-0 665 4384 10/1891 04/1931
NBR J36 0-6-0 666 4385 10/1891 11/1935
NBR J36 0-6-0 667 4386 10/1891 04/01/1961
LNER J54 0-6-0T 911 4398 10/1891 03/1934
LNER J54 0-6-0T 912 4399 10/1891 12/1930
NBR J36 0-6-0 668 4387 11/1891 06/05/1952
NBR J36 0-6-0 669 4388 11/1891 08/10/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 670 4389 11/1891 26/08/1957
NBR J36 0-6-0 671 4390 11/1891 07/1937
LNER J54 0-6-0T 913 4400 11/1891 11/1931
LNER J54 0-6-0T 914 4401 11/1891 08/1931
LNER J54 0-6-0T 915 4402 11/1891 02/1933
LNER J54 0-6-0T 916 4403 11/1891 08/1931
LNER J54 0-6-0T 917 4404 11/1891 06/1930
NBR J36 0-6-0 672 4391 12/1891 01/1931
NBR J36 0-6-0 673 4392 12/1891 14/07/1966
NBR J36 0-6-0 674 4393 12/1891 04/1943
NBR J36 0-6-0 675 4394 12/1891 12/08/1957
NBR J36 0-6-0 676 4395 12/1891 10/1926
NBR J36 0-6-0 677 4396 12/1891 25/05/1951
LNER J54 0-6-0T 918 4405 12/1891 03/1937
LNER J54 0-6-0T 919 4406 12/1891 10/1936
LNER J54 0-6-0T 920 4407 12/1891 11/1928
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     02/1892 17/10/1953
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     02/1892 10/05/1952
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 712 4356 02/1892 10/1933
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 713 4357 02/1892 14/01/1952
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 714 4358 02/1892 07/1933
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 715 4359 02/1892 05/1937
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 716 4360 02/1892 10/1949
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 717 4361 02/1892 02/1934
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 718 4362 02/1892 25/02/1952
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 719 4363 03/1892 09/1936
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 720 4364 03/1892 30/10/1950
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 721 4365 03/1892 28/04/1952
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 722 4366 03/1892 05/1932
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 723 4367 03/1892 08/1939
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 724 4368 03/1892 05/1950
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     04/1892 21/02/1953
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 726 4370 04/1892 05/1933
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 727 4371 04/1892 10/1939
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 728 4372 04/1892 06/1933
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 729 4373 04/1892 06/1943
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 730 4374 04/1892 11/1944
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 731 4375 04/1892 05/1937
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 725 4369 04/1892 02/1946
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     05/1892 07/1956
HR Strath 4-4-0 89 4428 05/1892 08/1930
HR Strath 4-4-0 90 4429 05/1892 1923
HR Strath 4-4-0 91 4430 06/1892 1923
HR Strath 4-4-0 92 4431 06/1892 06/1930
HR Strath 4-4-0 93 4432 06/1892 1923
HR Strath 4-4-0 94 4433 06/1892 1924
HR Strath 4-4-0 95 4434 06/1892 1930
HR Strath 4-4-0 96 4435 06/1892 1923
HR Strath 4-4-0 97 4436 06/1892 1923
HR Strath 4-4-0 98 4437 06/1892 1930
HR Strath 4-4-0 99 4438 06/1892 1923
HR Strath 4-4-0 100 4439 06/1892 1930
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 732 4376 06/1892 04/1945
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 733 4377 06/1892 05/1937
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 734 4378 06/1892 09/1931
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 735 4379 07/1892 07/1933
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 736 4380 07/1892 05/1937
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 737 4381 07/1892 03/1933
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 607 4506 11/1892 04/1932
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 608 4507 11/1892 05/1942
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 609 4508 11/1892 04/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 610 4509 11/1892 03/1932
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 611 4510 11/1892 11/1937
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 612 4511 12/1892 06/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 613 4512 12/1892 08/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 614 4513 12/1892 01/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 615 4514 12/1892 06/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 616 4515 12/1892 05/1936
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 617 4516 12/1892 10/1938
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 618 4517 12/1892 01/1948
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 619 4518 12/1892 05/1937
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 620 4519 12/1892 11/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 621 4520 12/1892 05/1935
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 623 4522 12/1892 03/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 622 4521 01/1893 01/1936
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 624 4523 01/1893 01/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 625 4524 01/1893 01/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 627 4526 01/1893 12/1948
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 628 4527 01/1893 12/1938
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 629 4528 01/1893 12/1948
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 632 4531 01/1893 08/1937
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 626 4525 02/1893 05/1933
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 630 4529 02/1893 01/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 631 4530 02/1893 05/1933
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 633 4532 02/1893 08/1933
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 634 4533 02/1893 03/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 635 4534 02/1893 04/1935
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 636 4535 02/1893 10/1948
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 637 4536 03/1893 03/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 638 4537 03/1893 03/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 639 4538 03/1893 05/1933
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 640 4539 03/1893 11/1937
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 641 4540 03/1893 06/1945
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 642 4541 03/1893 06/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 643 4542 03/1893 07/1947
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 644 4543 03/1893 03/1946
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 645 4544 04/1893 09/1933
LSWR Jubilee 0-4-2 646 4545 04/1893 05/1939
LMS 1P 0-4-4T     05/1893 27/10/1956
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2218 4607 08/1893 31/10/1953
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2219 4608 08/1893 25/01/1930
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2220 4609 08/1893 17/05/1952
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2221 4610 09/1893 02/11/1946
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2222 4611 09/1893 21/02/1953
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2223 4612 09/1893 05/09/1936
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2224 4613 09/1893 14/07/1956
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2225 4614 09/1893 03/11/1945
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2226 4615 09/1893 03/11/1956
MR 1532 0-4-4T 2227 4616 09/1893 05/10/1946
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 326 4646 10/1893 1930
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 327 4647 10/1893 09/1931
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 328 4648 10/1893 1931
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 329 4649 10/1893 1932
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 330 4650 10/1893 1930
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 331 4651 10/1893 06/1931
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 332 4652 10/1893 1930
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 333 4653 10/1893 1930
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 334 4654 11/1893 1932
GSWR 326 0-4-4T 335 4655 11/1893 12/1931
GNSR G10 0-4-4T 84 4631 11/1893 11/1937
GNSR G10 0-4-4T 85 4632 11/1893 10/1937
GNSR G10 0-4-4T 86 4633 11/1893 11/1937
GNSR G10 0-4-4T 87 4634 11/1893 08/1947
GNSR G10 0-4-4T 88 4635 11/1893 08/1937
GNSR G10 0-4-4T 89 4636 12/1893 01/1940
GNSR G10 0-4-4T 90 4637 12/1893 08/1937
GNSR G10 0-4-4T 91 4638 12/1893 10/1937
GNSR G10 0-4-4T 92 4639 12/1893 05/1939
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1894 02/1948
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3474   1896 18/03/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3476   1896 18/05/1957
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3482   1896 01/04/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3484   1896 30/07/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3490   1896 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3491   1896 01/02/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3494   1896 26/11/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3496   1896 04/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3497   1896 03/12/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3499   1896 04/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3502   1896 19/12/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1896 03/1950
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1896 21/04/1956
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1896 06/1961
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1896 06/1954
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1896 08/10/1955
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1896 19/05/1951
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1896 06/1950
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1443   07/1896 03/1951
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1046 5017 07/1896 03/10/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1047 5018 07/1896 25/11/1957
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1048 5019 07/1896 06/01/1958
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1049 5020 07/1896 23/11/1953
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1050 5021 07/1896 19/10/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1051 5022 07/1896 27/12/1954
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1052 5023 07/1896 29/04/1952
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1053 5024 07/1896 11/07/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1054 5025 07/1896 08/11/1954
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1055 5026 07/1896 09/06/1952
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1056 5027 07/1896 21/05/1956
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1057 5028 07/1896 14/12/1953
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1058 5029 07/1896 23/11/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1059 5030 07/1896 03/11/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1060 5031 07/1896 03/11/1955
MGNR J40 0-6-0 58 5032 08/1896 09/1938
MGNR J40 0-6-0 59 5033 08/1896 06/1944
MGNR J40 0-6-0 60 5034 08/1896 05/1941
MGNR J40 0-6-0 61 5035 08/1896 12/1942
MGNR J40 0-6-0 62 5036 08/1896 10/1939
MGNR J40 0-6-0 63 5037 09/1896 02/1937
MGNR J40 0-6-0 64 5038 09/1896 03/1944
MGNR J40 0-6-0 65 5039 09/1896 03/1944
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3506   1897 02/05/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3507   1897 23/09/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3509   1897 12/03/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3510   1897 12/05/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3514   1897 13/10/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3515   1897 29/04/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3520   1897 05/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3521   1897 06/07/1963
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3522   1897 27/09/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3523   1897 20/08/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3524   1897 05/11/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3529   1897 26/08/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3531   1897 31/10/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3538   1897 05/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3540   1897 21/02/1953
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3544   1897 03/12/1955
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 16/06/1956
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 12/11/1955
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 06/06/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 01/1953
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 16/05/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 05/1950
LMS 2F 0-6-0 3536   01/01/1897 18/03/1961
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 25/09/1948
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 16/06/1951
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 08/10/1955
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1211 5095 06/1897 08/11/1954
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1212 5096 06/1897 04/10/1954
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1213 5097 06/1897 10/07/1958
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1214 5098 06/1897 12/1950
GNR J53 0-6-0ST 1215 5099 06/1897 27/12/1954
LMS 2F 0-6-0     12/1897 04/09/1954
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1448   06/1898 06/1949
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1451   06/1898 12/1949
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1452   06/1898 22/04/1950
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1453   06/1898 10/1948
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1440   07/1898 11/1948
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1445   07/1898 02/1948
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1446   08/1898 30/07/1949
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1449   08/1898 03/1949
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1450   08/1898 04/1948
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1454   08/1898 11/1948
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1455   09/1898 06/1949
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1457   09/1898 02/1949
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1459   09/1898 02/1948
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3600   1899 07/05/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3604   1899 05/12/1953
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3605   1899 24/09/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3607   1899 09/06/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3608   1899 04/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3612   1899 10/01/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3615   1899 13/10/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3618   1899 24/03/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3619   1899 29/08/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3620   1899 15/02/1964
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3621   1899 21/04/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3622   1899 19/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3623   1899 22/08/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3624   1899 13/05/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3627   1899 18/06/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3629   1899 11/04/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1899 07/1951
GNSR D40 4-4-0 113 5602 10/1899 19/10/1955
GNSR D40 4-4-0 114 5603 10/1899 03/1946
GNSR D40 4-4-0 115 5604 10/1899 05/03/1957
GNSR D40 4-4-0 25 5605 10/1899 13/08/1953
GNSR D40 4-4-0 26 5606 10/1899 03/1953
CR 812 0-6-0 829 5612 12/1899 11/1947
CR 812 0-6-0 830 5613 12/1899 29/11/1963
CR 812 0-6-0 831 5614 12/1899 12/11/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 832 5615 12/1899 09/1960
CR 812 0-6-0 833 5616 12/1899 30/04/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 834 5617 12/1899 27/06/1963
CR 812 0-6-0 835 5618 12/1899 21/11/1957
CR 812 0-6-0 836 5619 12/1899 19/06/1948
CR 812 0-6-0 837 5620 12/1899 10/1959
CR 812 0-6-0 838 5621 12/1899 02/10/1961
GNSR D41 4-4-0     02/1900 21/11/1952
GNSR D41 4-4-0     02/1900 16/10/1951
GNSR D41 4-4-0     02/1900 18/06/1951
GNSR D41 4-4-0     02/1900 09/11/1951
GNSR D41 4-4-0     02/1900 27/05/1952
GNSR D41 4-4-0     02/1900 02/12/1952
GNSR D41 4-4-0     03/1900 10/11/1949
GNSR D41 4-4-0     03/1900 05/1950
CR 812 0-6-0 839 5622 04/1900 30/07/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 840 5623 04/1900 06/11/1948
CR 812 0-6-0 841 5624 04/1900 27/11/1961
CR 812 0-6-0 842 5625 04/1900 20/11/1961
CR 812 0-6-0 843 5626 04/1900 07/11/1963
CR 812 0-6-0 844 5627 04/1900 27/09/1957
CR 812 0-6-0 845 5628 04/1900 27/11/1961
CR 812 0-6-0 846 5629 04/1900 06/1949
GSWR 361 0-6-0 361 5655 05/1900 1932
GSWR 361 0-6-0 362 5656 05/1900 11/1934
GSWR 361 0-6-0 363 5657 05/1900 10/1931
GSWR 361 0-6-0 364 5658 05/1900 11/1931
GSWR 361 0-6-0 365 5659 05/1900 03/1928
GSWR 361 0-6-0 366 5660 05/1900 10/1932
GSWR 361 0-6-0 367 5661 05/1900 05/1935
GSWR 361 0-6-0 368 5662 05/1900 09/1937
GSWR 361 0-6-0 370 5664 05/1900 07/1934
CR 812 0-6-0 847 5630 05/1900 27/11/1961
CR 812 0-6-0 848 5631 05/1900 27/06/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1681   06/1900 14/02/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1682   06/1900 21/10/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1683   06/1900 13/06/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1684   06/1900 21/10/1961
SR S 0-4-0ST 1685   06/1900 10/1951
GSWR 361 0-6-0 369 5663 06/1900 10/1931
GSWR 361 0-6-0 371 5665 06/1900 01/1934
GSWR 361 0-6-0 372 5666 06/1900 07/1931
GSWR 361 0-6-0 373 5667 06/1900 05/1929
GSWR 361 0-6-0 374 5668 06/1900 05/1935
GSWR 361 0-6-0 375 5669 06/1900 11/1933
GSWR 361 0-6-0 376 5670 06/1900 04/1937
GSWR 361 0-6-0 377 5671 06/1900 02/1935
GSWR 361 0-6-0 378 5672 06/1900 11/1933
GSWR 361 0-6-0 379 5673 06/1900 11/1933
GSWR 361 0-6-0 380 5674 06/1900 11/1936
SR C 0-6-0 1686   07/1900 05/05/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1687   07/1900 02/04/1955
SR C 0-6-0 1688   07/1900 20/02/1960
SR C 0-6-0 1689   07/1900 31/03/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1690   07/1900 23/06/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1691   07/1900 21/10/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1692   07/1900 23/04/1960
SR C 0-6-0 1693   07/1900 10/06/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1694   07/1900 25/03/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1695   07/1900 24/06/1961
NBR J83 0-6-0T 795 5733 08/1900 08/01/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 796 5734 08/1900 24/02/1961
GNSR D41 4-4-0     09/1900 22/08/1951
GNSR D41 4-4-0     09/1900 20/10/1950
GNSR D41 4-4-0     09/1900 13/10/1952
GNSR D41 4-4-0     09/1900 10/10/1950
NBR J83 0-6-0T 797 5735 09/1900 13/01/1960
NBR J83 0-6-0T 798 5736 09/1900 08/10/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 799 5737 09/1900 30/03/1956
NBR J83 0-6-0T 800 5738 09/1900 24/02/1961
NBR J83 0-6-0T 801 5739 09/1900 08/10/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 802 5740 09/1900 17/09/1958
NBR J83 0-6-0T 803 5741 09/1900 05/12/1957
NBR J83 0-6-0T 804 5742 09/1900 21/02/1958
LMS 2F 0-6-0     11/1900 12/11/1960
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 20/02/1953
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 19/03/1951
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 05/02/1952
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 17/12/1951
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 18/03/1952
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 27/08/1948
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 29/10/1949
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 23/02/1953
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 23/02/1953
GNSR D41 4-4-0     12/1900 16/01/1951
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3723   1901 03/09/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3710   1901 15/03/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3711   1901 05/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3712   1901 10/01/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3714   1901 18/01/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3715   1901 15/02/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3717   1901 01/06/1957
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3721   1901 17/03/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3724   1901 13/12/1952
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3727   1901 04/07/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3728   1901 05/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3729   1901 27/04/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3731   1901 03/07/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3734   1901 22/09/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3735   1901 17/09/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3737   1901 18/02/1961
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1901 23/02/1957
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1901 11/1950
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1901 18/04/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1901 25/02/1956
NBR J83 0-6-0T 805 5743 03/1901 27/06/1958
NBR J83 0-6-0T 806 5744 03/1901 08/10/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 807 5745 03/1901 12/02/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 808 5746 03/1901 14/05/1956
NBR J83 0-6-0T 809 5747 03/1901 16/01/1961
NBR J83 0-6-0T 810 5748 03/1901 11/03/1960
NBR J83 0-6-0T 811 5749 03/1901 18/01/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 812 5750 03/1901 08/05/1961
LMS 2F 0-6-0     04/1901 30/04/1955
LMS 2F 0-6-0     04/1901 17/04/1948
NBR J83 0-6-0T 813 5751 04/1901 06/11/1958
NBR J83 0-6-0T 814 5752 04/1901 06/06/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 973 6035 09/1901 30/06/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 974 6036 09/1901 29/11/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 975 6037 09/1901 11/04/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 976 6038 09/1901 24/04/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 977 6039 09/1901 25/07/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 978 6040 09/1901 04/08/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 979 6041 09/1901 10/10/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 980 6042 09/1901 08/05/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 981 6043 09/1901 05/11/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 982 6044 09/1901 27/06/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 983 6045 10/1901 26/05/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 984 6046 10/1901 07/11/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 985 6047 12/1901 20/07/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 986 6048 12/1901 23/12/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 987 6049 12/1901 05/09/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 988 6050 12/1901 30/09/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 989 6051 12/1901 07/07/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 990 6052 12/1901 20/06/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 991 6053 12/1901 26/12/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 992 6054 12/1901 10/11/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 993 6055 12/1901 16/09/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 994 6056 12/1901 02/05/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3742   1902 05/08/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3745   1902 11/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3747   1902 10/11/1951
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3748   1902 03/11/1956
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3749   1902 08/03/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3753   1902 05/12/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3754   1902 17/11/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3755   1902 26/11/1955
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3756   1902 22/09/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3757   1902 21/06/1958
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3759   1902 28/11/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3760   1902 31/03/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3762   1902 21/03/1961
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3763   1902 10/03/1962
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1054 6253 1902 22/01/1951
GCR J11 0-6-0 995 6057 01/1902 30/09/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 996 6058 01/1902 25/02/1957
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1902 22/11/1956
GCR J11 0-6-0 997 6059 03/1902 11/04/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0   6060 03/1902 20/07/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 999 6061 04/1902 23/08/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 1000 6062 04/1902 04/07/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 1001 6063 04/1902 08/09/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 1002 6064 04/1902 27/08/1956
GCR J11 0-6-0 1003 6065 04/1902 04/03/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 1004 6066 04/1902 14/01/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 1005 6067 04/1902 02/02/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 1006 6068 04/1902 18/05/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 1007 6069 04/1902 23/09/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 1008 6070 04/1902 19/04/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3751   05/1902 21/08/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 1009 6071 05/1902 29/08/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 1010 6072 05/1902 15/03/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 1011 6073 05/1902 15/08/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 1012 6074 05/1902 17/08/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3216   09/1902 15/08/1962
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3218   09/1902 25/04/1960
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3248   09/1902 28/08/1959
LMS 3F 0-6-0 3260   09/1902 10/1949
GCR J11 0-6-0 1043 6226 10/1902 19/10/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 1044 6227 10/1902 20/07/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 1045 6228 10/1902 07/10/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 1046 6229 10/1902 27/10/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 1047 6230 10/1902 23/09/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 1048 6231 10/1902 08/11/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 1049 6232 10/1902 08/08/1955
GCR B5 4-6-0 1067 6235 11/1902 20/11/1947
GCR B5 4-6-0 1068 6236 11/1902 23/12/1947
GCR B5 4-6-0 1069 6237 11/1902 13/11/1948
GCR B5 4-6-0 1070 6238 11/1902 06/03/1939
GCR B5 4-6-0 1071 6239 11/1902 23/06/1948
GCR B5 4-6-0 1072 6240 11/1902 14/08/1947
GCR J11 0-6-0 1050 6233 11/1902 02/02/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 1051 6234 11/1902 20/03/1959
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1052 6251 11/1902 05/09/1949
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1053 6252 11/1902 28/02/1939
LMS 2P 4-4-0 553   05/1919 11/1958
LMS 2P 4-4-0 554   05/1919 08/1949
LMS 2P 4-4-0 555   05/1919 04/1949
LMS 2P 4-4-0 556   05/1919 21/04/1956
LMS 2P 4-4-0 557   05/1919 04/03/1961
LMS 2P 4-4-0 558   05/1919 08/03/1952
LMS 2P 4-4-0 559   06/1919 21/12/1957
LMS 2P 4-4-0 560   06/1919 27/12/1952
LMS 2P 4-4-0 561   06/1919 03/1950
LMS 2P 4-4-0 562   06/1919 11/1955