Manufacturer: Nasmyth Wilson
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FR | D3 | 0-6-0 | 7 | 552 | 1899 | 01/1928 | |
FR | D3 | 0-6-0 | 8 | 553 | 1899 | 07/1930 | |
FR | D3 | 0-6-0 | 9 | 554 | 1899 | 12/1932 | |
FR | D3 | 0-6-0 | 10 | 555 | 1899 | 05/1930 | |
FR | D3 | 0-6-0 | 11 | 556 | 1899 | 08/1930 | |
FR | D3 | 0-6-0 | 12 | 557 | 1899 | 10/1929 | |
NSR | 159 | 0-6-0 | 159 | 588 | 1900 | 10/1936 | |
NSR | 159 | 0-6-0 | 160 | 589 | 1900 | 11/1933 | |
NSR | 159 | 0-6-0 | 161 | 590 | 1900 | 02/1936 | |
NSR | 159 | 0-6-0 | 162 | 591 | 1900 | 08/1929 | |
NSR | 159 | 0-6-0 | 163 | 592 | 1900 | 09/1936 | |
NSR | 159 | 0-6-0 | 164 | 593 | 1900 | 03/1934 | |
FR | L3 | 0-6-2T | 98 | 689 | 1904 | 10/1935 | |
FR | L3 | 0-6-2T | 99 | 690 | 1904 | 02/1930 | |
FR | L3 | 0-6-2T | 100 | 691 | 1904 | 04/1936 | |
FR | L3 | 0-6-2T | 101 | 692 | 1904 | 1945 | |
FR | L3 | 0-6-2T | 102 | 693 | 1904 | 10/1931 | |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1701 | L926 | 1244 | 12/1917 | 10/02/1959 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1712 | L926 | 1255 | 02/1918 | 11/07/1965 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1713 | L926 | 1256 | 06/1918 | 15/09/1962 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1716 | L926 | 1259 | 07/1918 | 13/09/1941 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1717 | L926 | 1260 | 07/1918 | 08/08/1962 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1718 | L926 | 1261 | 08/1918 | 19/09/1941 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1719 | L926 | 1262 | 08/1918 | 19/09/1941 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1721 | L926 | 1264 | 10/1918 | 20/12/1964 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1722 | L926 | 1265 | 10/1918 | 09/12/1962 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1723 | L926 | 1266 | 10/1918 | 12/03/1959 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1724 | L926 | 1267 | 10/1918 | 19/12/1965 |
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 133 | 02/1919 | 23/03/1956 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 135 | 02/1919 | 13/08/1957 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 136 | 03/1919 | 18/01/1955 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 138 | 03/1919 | 23/02/1955 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 139 | 04/1919 | 26/08/1957 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 140 | 04/1919 | 19/09/1955 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 154 | 05/1919 | 14/05/1956 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 156 | 05/1919 | 17/12/1956 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 157 | 05/1919 | 27/02/1956 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 158 | 07/1919 | 22/10/1956 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 159 | 07/1919 | 26/08/1957 | ||
TVR | A | 0-6-2T | 160 | 07/1919 | 26/04/1956 | ||
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1729 | L1550 | 1285 | 07/1919 | 18/11/1959 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1727 | L1550 | 1283 | 09/1919 | 13/09/1941 |
GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1728 | L1550 | 1284 | 09/1919 | 15/09/1962 |
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 05/1925 | 29/12/1962 | |||
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 05/1925 | 29/09/1961 | |||
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 05/1925 | 02/10/1961 | |||
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 05/1925 | 13/11/1961 | |||
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 06/1925 | 10/1961 | |||
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 06/1925 | 02/1962 | |||
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 06/1925 | 27/09/1961 | |||
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 06/1925 | 02/10/1961 | |||
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 06/1925 | 27/09/1961 | |||
CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 06/1925 | 26/03/1962 | |||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2122 | 08/1925 | 14/04/1956 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2120 | 08/1925 | 12/02/1955 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2121 | 08/1925 | 16/02/1959 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2124 | 08/1925 | 19/12/1956 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2123 | 08/1925 | 16/02/1959 |