Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 110 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7564 Week
» 10146 Month
» 274779 Year
» 1496344 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
NER G6 0-4-4T 1340 1644 05/1875 04/06/1956
NER G6 0-4-4T 1341 1645 05/1875 04/1950
NER G6 0-4-4T 1342 1646 05/1875 27/01/1958
NER G6 0-4-4T 1343 1647 05/1875 04/1934
NER G6 0-4-4T 1344 1648 06/1875 19/01/1953
NER G6 0-4-4T 1345 1649 06/1875 31/12/1921
NER G6 0-4-4T 1346 1650 06/1875 07/04/1958
NER G6 0-4-4T 1347 1651 06/1875 10/1948
NER G6 0-4-4T 1348 1652 06/1875 12/07/1954
NER G6 0-4-4T 1349 1653 06/1875 12/05/1958
NER G6 0-4-4T 1430 1677 09/1875 03/1944
NER G6 0-4-4T 1431 1678 09/1875 04/1951
NER G6 0-4-4T 1432 1679 09/1875 04/12/1958
NER G6 0-4-4T 1433 1680 09/1875 18/11/1959
NER G6 0-4-4T 1434 1681 10/1875 31/12/1921
NER G6 0-4-4T 1435 1682 10/1875 06/02/1956
NER G6 0-4-4T 1436 1683 10/1875 11/1929
NER G6 0-4-4T 1437 1684 11/1875 31/12/1921
NER G6 0-4-4T 1438 1685 11/1875 27/02/1961
NER G6 0-4-4T 1439 1686 11/1875 04/1939
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/1880 04/08/1951
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/1880 04/1950
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/1880 25/01/1958
LMS 2F 0-6-0     03/1880 16/05/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     03/1880 19/06/1948
LMS 2F 0-6-0     04/1880 08/1957
LMS 2F 0-6-0     04/1880 30/09/1955
LMS 2F 0-6-0     05/1880 08/1949
LMS 2F 0-6-0 3071   06/1881 09/1960
LMS 2F 0-6-0     07/1881 12/06/1948
LMS 2F 0-6-0     07/1881 05/1953
LMS 2F 0-6-0     08/1881 24/03/1956
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 427 2501 03/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 428 2502 03/1883 07/1925
LSWR 445 4-4-0 445 2535 04/1883 12/1925
LSWR 445 4-4-0 446 2536 04/1883 05/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 429 2503 04/1883 11/1925
LSWR 445 4-4-0 447 2537 05/1883 12/1925
LSWR 445 4-4-0 448 2538 05/1883 12/1924
LSWR 445 4-4-0 449 2539 06/1883 05/1925
LSWR 445 4-4-0 450 2540 06/1883 04/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 430 2504 06/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 431 2505 06/1883 12/1925
LSWR 445 4-4-0 451 2541 07/1883 12/1924
LSWR 445 4-4-0 452 2542 07/1883 12/1925
LSWR 445 4-4-0 453 2543 07/1883 12/1924
LSWR 445 4-4-0 454 2544 08/1883 12/1924
LSWR 445 4-4-0 455 2545 08/1883 07/1925
LSWR 445 4-4-0 456 2546 08/1883 12/1924
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 432 2506 10/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 45 2507 10/1883 12/1924
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 47 2508 10/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 48 2509 10/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 49 2510 10/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 50 2511 11/1883 12/1927
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 51 2512 11/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 52 2513 11/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 53 2514 11/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 54 2515 12/1883 07/1927
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 55 2516 12/1883 09/1924
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 56 2517 12/1883 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 57 2518 12/1883 11/1921
LSWR 460 4-4-0 147 2561 06/1884 01/1927
LSWR 460 4-4-0 470 2562 06/1884 12/1928
LSWR 460 4-4-0 471 2563 06/1884 03/1928
LSWR 460 4-4-0 472 2564 06/1884 11/1927
LSWR 460 4-4-0 473 2565 06/1884 10/1928
LSWR 460 4-4-0 474 2566 08/1884 10/1928
LSWR 460 4-4-0 475 2567 08/1884 04/1926
LSWR 460 4-4-0 476 2568 08/1884 02/1926
LSWR 460 4-4-0 477 2569 08/1884 10/1927
LSWR 460 4-4-0 478 2570 08/1884 11/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 1480 2581 10/1884 03/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 1481 2582 10/1884 04/1925
NER J22 0-6-0 1482 2583 10/1884 10/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 1483 2584 10/1884 09/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 1484 2585 11/1884 11/1924
NER J22 0-6-0 1485 2586 12/1884 11/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 1486 2587 12/1884 01/1930
NER J22 0-6-0 1487 2588 12/1884 12/1926
NER J22 0-6-0 1488 2589 02/1885 05/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 1489 2590 02/1885 02/1926
NER J22 0-6-0 1490 2591 02/1885 01/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 1491 2592 03/1885 01/1926
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 68 2601 06/1885 04/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 77 2602 07/1885 12/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 78 2603 07/1885 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 82 2604 07/1885 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 104 2605 07/1885 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 106 2606 08/1885 03/1923
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 107 2607 09/1885 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 125 2608 09/1885 29/07/1961
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 126 2609 09/1885 12/1924
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 129 2610 10/1885 05/1924
LSWR 460 4-4-0 526 2650 12/1887 08/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 901 2751 10/1891 09/1934
LNER J54 0-6-0T 902 2752 10/1891 11/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 903 2753 11/1891 04/1933
LNER J54 0-6-0T 904 2754 11/1891 05/1930
LNER J54 0-6-0T 905 2755 12/1891 12/1932
LNER J54 0-6-0T 906 2756 12/1891 10/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 907 2757 12/1891 12/1931
LNER J54 0-6-0T 908 2758 12/1891 05/1947
LNER J54 0-6-0T 909 2759 12/1891 06/1928
LNER J54 0-6-0T 910 2760 12/1891 08/1931
HBR J80 0-6-0T 69 2783 03/1892 08/1931
HBR J80 0-6-0T 67 2781 08/1892 09/1930
HBR J80 0-6-0T 68 2782 08/1892 07/1931
CWR 6 0-6-0ST 6 2813 1894 12/1926
CWR 6 0-6-0ST 7 2846 1896 12/1927
PTR Unclassified 0-6-2T 184   09/1898 10/1948
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1216 2921 12/1898 15/05/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1217 2922 01/1899 03/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1218 2923 02/1899 04/04/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1219 2924 02/1899 16/11/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1220 2925 02/1899 18/06/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1221 2926 03/1899 16/12/1955
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1222 2927 03/1899 14/03/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1223 2928 04/1899 11/10/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1224 2929 04/1899 24/06/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1225 2930 04/1899 27/05/1959
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1860   05/1899 31/03/1957
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1865   06/1899 18/06/1955
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1869   07/1899 10/01/1953
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1870   07/1899 10/04/1948
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1873   08/1899 28/01/1950
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1874   08/1899 02/1949
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1875   08/1899 31/07/1963
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1878   09/1899 05/1959
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1879   09/1899 09/03/1960
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1885   10/1899 20/10/1956
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1889   11/1899 23/04/1955
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1890   11/1899 22/03/1952
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1893   12/1899 04/09/1948
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1895   12/1899 03/1950
SR D1 4-4-0 1741   03/1903 09/1959
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1744   03/1903 05/1953
CambR 15 0-6-0 887   30/03/1903 11/1952
SR D1 4-4-0 1743   04/1903 02/1960
SR D1 4-4-0 1745   06/1903 03/1951
CambR 15 0-6-0 892   06/1903 04/1953
RR M 0-6-2T 47   06/1904 04/1949
RR M 0-6-2T 110   08/1904 18/10/1948
RR M 0-6-2T 33   30/08/1904 02/1951
RR R 0-6-2T 30   12/1907 05/1949
RR R 0-6-2T 31   12/1907 03/1951
RR R 0-6-2T 32   12/1907 02/1950
NER J27 0-6-0 1049 3352 04/1909 18/03/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 1050 3353 04/1909 13/02/1966
LTSR Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2147   05/1909 12/02/1951
LTSR Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2148   05/1909 06/1956
NER J27 0-6-0 1053 3354 05/1909 27/03/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1056 3355 05/1909 01/05/1967
LTSR Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2149   06/1909 22/11/1952
NER J27 0-6-0 1060 3356 06/1909 24/05/1967
LTSR Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2150   07/1909 17/02/1951
RR P 0-6-2T 76   07/1909 11/1950
RR P 0-6-2T 82   07/1909 05/1954
NER J27 0-6-0 1061 3357 07/1909 23/01/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1064 3358 07/1909 13/04/1959
RR P 0-6-2T 83   08/1909 05/1955
RR R 0-6-2T 34   09/1909 11/1949
NER J27 0-6-0 1065 3359 09/1909 30/10/1962
NER J27 0-6-0 1066 3360 09/1909 23/01/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1067 3361 09/1909 22/01/1962
RR R 0-6-2T 46   10/1909 07/1950
BMJR Unclassified 0-6-2T 36   12/1909 01/1949
BMJR Unclassified 0-6-2T 37   12/1909 06/1950
BMJR Unclassified 0-6-2T 38   12/1909 12/1949
BMJR Unclassified 0-6-2T 39   01/1910 01/1948
RR A 0-6-2T 52   05/1910 11/1949
RR A 0-6-2T 53   05/1910 06/1949
RR A 0-6-2T 54   05/1910 04/1948
RR A 0-6-2T 55   05/1910 02/1953
RR A 0-6-2T 56   05/1910 09/1953
RR A 0-6-2T 71   06/1910 12/1948
RR A 0-6-2T 72   07/1910 02/1952
RR A 0-6-2T 73   07/1910 07/1952
RR A 0-6-2T 74   07/1910 01/1951
RR A 0-6-2T 75   07/1910 10/1953
BMJR Unclassified 0-6-2T 40   03/1914 01/1951
BMJR Unclassified 0-6-2T 41   03/1914 03/1950
BMJR Unclassified 0-6-2T 42 3579 04/1914 11/1947
BMJR Unclassified 0-6-2T 43   04/1914 08/1950
BMJR 45 0-6-2T 45   08/1915 10/1953
BMJR 45 0-6-2T 46   09/1915 05/1953
BMJR 45 0-6-2T 47   09/1915 02/1951
GCR O4 2-8-0 1651 3695 09/1917 04/06/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1652 3696 09/1917 09/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1653 3697 10/1917 05/12/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1654 3698 10/1917 08/05/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1655 3699 10/1917 15/01/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1656 3700 10/1917 15/01/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1657 3701 11/1917 24/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1658 3702 11/1917 05/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1659 3703 11/1917 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1661 3705 12/1917 23/05/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1662 3706 12/1917 27/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1663 3707 12/1917 24/02/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1664 3708 12/1917 06/03/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1665 3709 01/1918 20/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1666 3710 01/1918 14/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1667 3711 01/1918 31/03/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1668 3712 02/1918 15/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1669 3713 02/1918 16/10/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1670 3714 02/1918 26/09/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1671 3715 03/1918 17/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1672 3716 03/1918 20/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1673 3717 04/1918 20/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1674 3718 04/1918 14/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1675 3719 04/1918 30/10/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1676 3720 05/1918 05/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1677 3721 05/1918 09/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1678 3722 05/1918 24/04/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1679 3723 06/1918 29/08/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1680 3724 06/1918 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1682 3726 06/1918 08/06/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1683 3727 07/1918 13/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1684 3728 07/1918 01/08/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1685 3729 07/1918 19/09/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1686 3730 08/1918 31/01/1965
RR A1 0-6-2T 68   09/1918 06/1954
RR A1 0-6-2T 69   09/1918 07/1955
RR A1 0-6-2T 70   09/1918 07/1955
GCR O4 2-8-0 1647 3731 10/1918 17/03/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1649 3733 10/1918 14/04/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1650 3734 10/1918 26/09/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1687 3735 11/1918 13/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1688 3736 11/1918 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1689 3737 12/1918 23/02/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 1690 3738 12/1918 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1691 3739 01/1919 18/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1692 3740 01/1919 26/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1693 3741 01/1919 10/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1694 3742 01/1919 20/03/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1695 3743 02/1919 28/01/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1696 3744 02/1919 06/07/1960
GCR O4 2-8-0 1697 3745 03/1919 04/04/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1699 3747 03/1919 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1700 3748 04/1919 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1643 3751 05/1919 05/03/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1645 3753 06/1919 03/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1636 3756 07/1919 11/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1638 3757 07/1919 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1640 3758 08/1919 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 1641 3759 08/1919 11/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1737 3764 10/1919 23/04/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1738 3765 10/1919 18/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 1739 3766 10/1919 20/12/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 1741 3768 11/1919 31/03/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 1743 3770 11/1919 02/01/1966
GCR O4 2-8-0 1746 3773 12/1919 29/10/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 1747 3774 12/1919 05/09/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 1748 3775 04/1920 14/01/1960
GCR O4 2-8-0 1749 3776 04/1920 08/08/1965
BMJR 45 0-6-2T 49   02/1921 02/1954
BMJR 45 0-6-2T 50   02/1921 02/1954
BMJR 45 0-6-2T 48   02/1921 09/1953
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6370 3802 04/1921 14/01/1963
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6371 3803 05/1921 21/09/1960
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6372 3804 05/1921 28/12/1963
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6374 3806 05/1921 03/08/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6373 3805 06/1921 28/12/1963
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6375 3807 06/1921 17/09/1963
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6376 3808 06/1921 14/05/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6377 3809 06/1921 24/10/1960
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6378 3810 07/1921 15/06/1964
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6379 3811 07/1921 26/08/1963
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6380 3812 07/1921 28/12/1963
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6381 3813 07/1921 20/11/1963
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6382 3814 08/1921 21/11/1960
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6383 3815 08/1921 05/1956
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6384 3816 08/1921 24/06/1963
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6385 3817 08/1921 02/12/1963
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6386 3818 09/1921 05/09/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6387 3819 09/1921 22/06/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6388 3820 10/1921 21/09/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6389 3821 10/1921 21/09/1960
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6390 3822 10/1921 14/05/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6391 3823 11/1921 17/09/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6392 3824 11/1921 19/10/1961
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6393 3825 11/1921 11/01/1960
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6394 3826 11/1921 15/06/1964
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6395 3827 12/1921 21/11/1964
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6396 3828 12/1921 03/1958
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6397 3829 12/1921 14/09/1959
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6398 3830 12/1921 24/10/1960
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 6399 3831 12/1921 16/11/1959
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 7300 3832 12/1921 21/09/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 7301 3833 12/1921 21/09/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 7302 3834 12/1921 24/08/1962
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 7303 3835 01/1922 07/09/1964
GWR 43xx 2-6-0 7304 3836 01/1922 02/12/1963
NBR N15 0-6-2T 519 3851 01/1923 01/10/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 520 3852 01/1923 18/12/1959
NBR N15 0-6-2T 521 3853 02/1923 06/06/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 522 3854 02/1923 18/05/1961
NBR N15 0-6-2T 523 3855 03/1923 13/06/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 524 3856 03/1923 10/01/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 525 3857 03/1923 17/05/1960
NBR N15 0-6-2T 526 3858 03/1923 26/06/1958
NBR N15 0-6-2T 527 3859 03/1923 16/07/1962
NBR N15 0-6-2T 528 3860 03/1923 18/02/1960
SDJR 7F 2-8-0 89   07/1925 01/06/1964
SDJR 7F 2-8-0 88   07/1925 26/02/1964
SDJR 7F 2-8-0 87   07/1925 07/09/1964
SDJR 7F 2-8-0 86   07/1925 22/01/1964
GER N7 0-6-2T 907 3897 10/1925 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 912 3898 10/1925 03/05/1962
GER N7 0-6-2T 913 3899 10/1925 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 916 3900 10/1925 10/08/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 918 3901 10/1925 10/04/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 919 3902 10/1925 08/06/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 935 3903 10/1925 07/04/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 940 3904 11/1925 19/01/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 941 3905 11/1925 18/05/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 947 3906 11/1925 19/10/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 950 3907 11/1925 04/05/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 952 3908 12/1925 01/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 964 3909 12/1925 30/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 966 3910 12/1925 29/02/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 967 3911 12/1925 09/03/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 968 3912 12/1925 03/02/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 970 3913 12/1925 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 971 3914 12/1925 06/04/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 987 3915 01/1926 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 988 3916 01/1926 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1325 4075 08/1934 04/07/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1332 4076 09/1934 17/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1333 4077 09/1934 24/07/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 1339 4078 09/1934 12/02/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1399 4079 09/1934 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1322 4080 01/1935 23/07/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 1307 4081 01/1935 26/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2938 4082 01/1935 25/11/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 2939 4083 01/1935 12/03/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 2940 4084 01/1935 29/12/1961
LNER B17 4-6-0 2862 4124 13/01/1937 01/12/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2864 4126 15/01/1937 01/06/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2865 4127 26/01/1937 16/04/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2863 4125 04/02/1937 20/02/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2866 4128 15/02/1937 07/03/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2867 4129 15/04/1937 23/06/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2868 4130 28/04/1937 22/08/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2869 4131 06/05/1937 26/09/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2870 4132 13/05/1937 04/04/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2871 4133 11/06/1937 22/09/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2872 4134 19/07/1937 09/03/1960
LNER J94 0-6-0ST 75183 7133 04/1944 14/10/1963
LNER J94 0-6-0ST 75184 7134 04/1944 06/09/1960
LNER J94 0-6-0ST 75190 7140 06/1944 24/05/1965
LNER J94 0-6-0ST 71509 7163 09/1944 16/01/1964
LNER J94 0-6-0ST 75272 7202 02/1945 11/02/1963
LNER J94 0-6-0ST 75281 7211 04/1945 25/05/1964
LNER J94 0-6-0ST 71486 7295 09/1945 19/03/1963
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67766 7500 09/1949 10/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67767 7501 09/1949 29/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67768 7502 10/1949 21/02/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67769 7503 10/1949 09/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67770 7504 11/1949 29/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67771 7505 11/1949 27/10/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67772 7506 11/1949 13/11/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67773 7507 12/1949 29/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67774 7508 12/1949 22/01/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67775 7509 12/1949 20/09/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67776 7510 01/1950 29/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67777 7511 01/1950 21/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67780 7514 02/1950 29/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67778 7512 01/02/1950 04/05/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67779 7513 01/02/1950 29/12/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9410 7547 28/02/1950 13/07/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9411 7548 28/02/1950 03/06/1965
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67781 7515 03/1950 13/10/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67782 7516 03/1950 18/11/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67783 7517 03/1950 19/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67784 7518 03/1950 08/11/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9412 7549 31/03/1950 08/03/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9413 7550 31/03/1950 22/11/1963
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67785 7519 04/1950 29/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67786 7520 04/1950 29/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67787 7521 04/1950 29/12/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9414 7551 30/04/1950 29/08/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67788 7522 05/1950 30/05/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67789 7523 05/1950 13/10/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67790 7524 05/1950 13/02/1961
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9415 7552 31/05/1950 03/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9416 7553 31/05/1950 08/01/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9417 7554 31/05/1950 08/06/1959
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9418 7555 31/05/1950 03/06/1965
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67791 7525 06/1950 27/11/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67792 7526 06/1950 29/12/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67793 7527 06/1950 21/09/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9419 7556 30/06/1950 14/03/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9420 7557 30/06/1950 10/03/1964
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67794 7528 07/1950 23/10/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67795 7529 07/1950 03/05/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9421 7558 31/07/1950 12/02/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9422 7559 31/07/1950 28/12/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9423 7560 31/07/1950 01/03/1963
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67796 7530 08/1950 06/11/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67797 7531 08/1950 17/10/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67798 7532 08/1950 29/12/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9424 7561 31/08/1950 29/11/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67799 7533 09/1950 29/03/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67800 7534 09/1950 29/12/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9425 7562 30/09/1950 28/11/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9426 7563 30/09/1950 07/05/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9427 7564 30/09/1950 15/06/1959
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9428 7565 30/09/1950 30/06/1960
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9429 7566 31/10/1950 28/12/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9430 7567 31/10/1950 16/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9431 7568 30/11/1950 20/04/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9432 7569 30/11/1950 23/11/1959
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9433 7570 31/12/1950 13/07/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9434 7571 31/01/1951 30/06/1960
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9435 7572 31/01/1951 28/09/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9436 7573 31/01/1951 18/07/1960
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9437 7574 31/01/1951 03/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9438 7575 28/02/1951 15/06/1959
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9439 7576 28/02/1951 15/06/1959
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9440 7577 28/02/1951 23/07/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9441 7578 31/03/1951 20/11/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9442 7579 31/03/1951 06/07/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9443 7580 31/03/1951 15/06/1959
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9444 7581 30/04/1951 22/03/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9445 7582 30/04/1951 11/01/1960
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9446 7583 31/05/1951 07/05/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9447 7584 31/05/1951 12/01/1961
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9448 7585 31/05/1951 13/07/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9449 7586 30/06/1951 30/06/1960
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9450 7587 30/06/1951 25/06/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9451 7588 31/07/1951 13/07/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9452 7589 31/07/1951 07/05/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9453 7590 31/07/1951 06/11/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9454 7591 30/09/1951 08/01/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9455 7592 30/09/1951 11/04/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9456 7593 30/09/1951 08/04/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9457 7594 31/10/1951 06/07/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9458 7595 31/10/1951 12/01/1961
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9459 7596 30/11/1951 28/09/1959
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9460 7611 30/11/1951 09/02/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9461 7612 31/12/1951 07/05/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9462 7613 31/12/1951 09/11/1960
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9463 7614 31/01/1952 03/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9464 7615 31/01/1952 03/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9465 7616 31/01/1952 09/02/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9466 7617 29/02/1952 06/07/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9467 7618 29/02/1952 21/05/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9468 7619 29/02/1952 29/08/1960
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8480 1827 31/03/1952 06/07/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8481 1828 31/03/1952 03/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9469 7620 31/03/1952 05/03/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9470 7621 31/03/1952 28/09/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8482 1829 30/04/1952 12/09/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9471 7622 30/04/1952 07/09/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9472 7623 30/04/1952 07/05/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8483 1830 31/05/1952 13/02/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8484 1831 31/05/1952 03/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9473 7624 31/05/1952 06/07/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9474 7625 31/05/1952 21/11/1961
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8485 1832 30/06/1952 22/06/1959
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8486 1833 30/06/1952 16/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9475 7626 30/06/1952 07/05/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9476 7627 30/06/1952 06/06/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8487 1834 31/07/1952 22/11/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8488 1835 31/07/1952 07/05/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8489 1836 31/07/1952 09/02/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8490 1837 31/07/1952 05/10/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9477 7628 31/07/1952 03/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9478 7629 31/07/1952 30/07/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9479 7630 31/07/1952 23/07/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8491 1838 31/08/1952 23/07/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8492 1839 31/08/1952 15/06/1959
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9480 7631 31/08/1952 30/04/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9481 7632 31/08/1952 12/01/1961
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8493 1840 30/09/1952 06/11/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8494 1841 30/09/1952 23/01/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9482 7633 30/09/1952 20/11/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8495 1842 31/10/1952 06/11/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8496 1843 31/10/1952 23/07/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9483 7634 31/10/1952 23/07/1963
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9484 7635 31/10/1952 20/04/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9485 7636 31/10/1952 06/07/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8497 1844 30/11/1952 06/07/1964
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8498 1845 30/11/1952 03/06/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 8499 1846 30/11/1952 21/06/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9486 7637 30/11/1952 13/07/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9487 7638 30/11/1952 13/07/1962
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9488 7639 31/12/1952 30/04/1965
GWR 94xx 0-6-0PT 9489 7640 31/01/1953 20/04/1964
  20 Bo-Bo D8020   03/10/1959 01/10/1990
  20 Bo-Bo D8021   20/10/1959 08/03/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8022   29/10/1959 16/08/1988
  20 Bo-Bo D8023   13/11/1959 17/05/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8024   25/11/1959 02/05/1977
  20 Bo-Bo D8025   27/11/1959 19/09/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8026   04/12/1959 10/10/1990
  20 Bo-Bo D8027   11/12/1959 19/12/1982
  20 Bo-Bo D8028   18/12/1959 15/11/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8029   28/12/1959 05/07/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8030   31/12/1959 01/10/1990
  20 Bo-Bo D8031   20/01/1960 14/09/1990
  20 Bo-Bo D8032   18/02/1960 04/1993
  20 Bo-Bo D8033   18/02/1960 23/11/1977
  20 Bo-Bo D8034   12/03/1960 01/10/1990
  40 1Co-Co1 D305   06/10/1960 01/12/1980
  40 1Co-Co1 D306   13/10/1960 21/04/1983
  40 1Co-Co1 D307   27/10/1960 20/12/1981
  40 1Co-Co1 D308   07/11/1960 24/08/1980
  40 1Co-Co1 D309   16/11/1960 01/12/1980
  40 1Co-Co1 D310   29/11/1960 28/12/1980
  40 1Co-Co1 D311   06/12/1960 03/05/1981
  40 1Co-Co1 D312   13/12/1960 28/12/1980
  40 1Co-Co1 D313   20/12/1960 18/10/1981
  40 1Co-Co1 D314   29/12/1960 05/10/1980
  40 1Co-Co1 D315   13/01/1961 14/03/1982
  40 1Co-Co1 D316   20/01/1961 01/02/1981
  40 1Co-Co1 D317   06/02/1961 07/09/1981
  40 1Co-Co1 D318   20/02/1961 26/02/1986
  20 Bo-Bo D8050   02/03/1961
  40 1Co-Co1 D319   09/03/1961 14/12/1980
  20 Bo-Bo D8051   10/03/1961 04/02/1991
  40 1Co-Co1 D320   22/03/1961 31/05/1981
  20 Bo-Bo D8052   24/03/1961 17/11/1990
  20 Bo-Bo D8053   06/04/1961 10/10/1990
  40 1Co-Co1 D321   10/04/1961 13/03/1983
  20 Bo-Bo D8055   14/04/1961 23/07/1993
  40 1Co-Co1 D322   21/04/1961 28/10/1967
  20 Bo-Bo D8056   26/04/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8057   01/05/1961 10/1994
  20 Bo-Bo D8058 2964 08/05/1961 28/02/1992
  20 Bo-Bo D8059 2965 12/05/1961 05/1993
  40 1Co-Co1 D323   19/05/1961 07/07/1980
  20 Bo-Bo D8060 2966 24/05/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8061 2967 24/05/1961 21/01/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8062 2968 29/05/1961 18/09/1976
  20 Bo-Bo D8063 2969 05/06/1961 01/05/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8054   12/06/1961 11/09/1989
  20 Bo-Bo D8064 2970 12/06/1961 14/09/1990
  20 Bo-Bo D8065 2971 19/06/1961 08/01/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8066 2972 19/06/1961
  40 1Co-Co1 D324   23/06/1961 06/01/1984
  20 Bo-Bo D8067 2973 26/06/1961 21/01/1987
  20 Bo-Bo D8068 2974 26/06/1961 16/06/1987
  20 Bo-Bo D8069 2975 30/06/1961 20/05/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8070 2976 30/06/1961 11/04/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8071 2977 10/07/1961 23/07/1993
  20 Bo-Bo D8072 2978 10/07/1961 01/1992
  20 Bo-Bo D8073 2979 19/07/1961 23/12/1993
  20 Bo-Bo D8074 2980 19/07/1961 31/01/1976
  20 Bo-Bo D8075 2981 26/07/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8076 2982 26/07/1961 04/05/1988
  20 Bo-Bo D8077 2983 28/07/1961 16/05/1988
  20 Bo-Bo D8078 2984 28/07/1961 10/01/1992
  20 Bo-Bo D8079 2985 28/08/1961 25/04/1977
  20 Bo-Bo D8080 2986 28/08/1961 10/07/1990
  20 Bo-Bo D8081 2987 31/08/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8082 2988 31/08/1961 23/07/1993
  20 Bo-Bo D8083 2989 12/09/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8084 2990 12/09/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8085 2991 18/09/1961 08/03/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8086 2992 18/09/1961 01/09/1988
  20 Bo-Bo D8087   26/09/1961 04/1995
  20 Bo-Bo D8088   26/09/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8090   29/09/1961 06/07/1993
  20 Bo-Bo D8089   03/10/1961 27/04/1987
  20 Bo-Bo D8091   10/10/1961 04/09/1978
  20 Bo-Bo D8092   10/10/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8093   17/10/1961 20/05/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8094   17/10/1961 09/06/1993
  20 Bo-Bo D8095   26/10/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8096   26/10/1961 01/06/1992
  20 Bo-Bo D8097   08/11/1961 11/09/1989
  20 Bo-Bo D8098   08/11/1961 24/06/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8099   15/11/1961 04/02/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8100   22/11/1961 05/05/1989
  20 Bo-Bo D8101   22/11/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8102   01/12/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8103   01/12/1961 08/03/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8104   08/12/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8105   08/12/1961
  20 Bo-Bo D8106   12/12/1961 13/10/1993
  20 Bo-Bo D8107   20/12/1961 21/01/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8108   20/12/1961 13/09/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8109   29/12/1961 14/02/1982
  20 Bo-Bo D8110   10/01/1962 14/09/1990
  20 Bo-Bo D8111   18/01/1962 22/04/1987
  20 Bo-Bo D8112   26/01/1962 21/01/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8113   01/02/1962 13/09/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8114   08/02/1962 31/01/1990
  20 Bo-Bo D8115   08/02/1962 11/01/1987
  20 Bo-Bo D8116   15/02/1962 16/01/1987
  20 Bo-Bo D8117   23/02/1962
  20 Bo-Bo D8118   08/03/1962 03/03/2000
  20 Bo-Bo D8119   08/03/1962 01/06/1992
  20 Bo-Bo D8120   16/03/1962
  20 Bo-Bo D8121   16/03/1962
  20 Bo-Bo D8122   22/03/1962 05/07/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8123   29/03/1962 30/04/1987
  20 Bo-Bo D8124   13/04/1962 07/06/1991
  20 Bo-Bo D8125   25/04/1962 23/09/1986
  20 Bo-Bo D8126   15/05/1962 18/09/1989
  20 Bo-Bo D8127   16/07/1962
  37 Co-Co D6769   17/07/1962
  37 Co-Co D6770   17/08/1962 19/05/1996
  37 Co-Co D6771   22/08/1962 30/06/2004
  37 Co-Co D6772   04/09/1962 31/01/1999
  37 Co-Co D6773   10/09/1962 31/03/2003
  37 Co-Co D6774   17/09/1962 30/06/2005
  37 Co-Co D6775   24/09/1962 26/11/1999
  37 Co-Co D6776   08/10/1962 01/12/2000
  37 Co-Co D6777   12/10/1962 30/09/2008
  37 Co-Co D6778   29/10/1962 31/01/2004
  37 Co-Co D6779   06/11/1962 30/06/2008
  37 Co-Co D6780   14/11/1962 18/09/1996
  37 Co-Co D6781   22/11/1962 01/02/2003
  37 Co-Co D6782   29/11/1962
  37 Co-Co D6783   05/12/1962 14/07/2000
  37 Co-Co D6784   12/12/1962
  37 Co-Co D6785   19/12/1962 01/12/1999
  37 Co-Co D6786   28/12/1962
  37 Co-Co D6787   31/12/1962
  37 Co-Co D6788   14/01/1963 30/09/2002
  37 Co-Co D6789   18/01/1963 01/10/2002
  37 Co-Co D6790   28/01/1963
  37 Co-Co D6791   31/01/1963 01/03/1997
  37 Co-Co D6792   13/02/1963
  37 Co-Co D6793   20/02/1963 01/12/2001
  37 Co-Co D6794   27/02/1963
  37 Co-Co D6795   08/03/1963 31/01/1999
  37 Co-Co D6819   27/03/1963
  37 Co-Co D6820   29/03/1963 01/10/1999
  37 Co-Co D6821   08/04/1963 01/12/2002
  37 Co-Co D6822   10/04/1963 01/12/2004
  37 Co-Co D6823   25/04/1963 01/12/2000
  37 Co-Co D6824   29/04/1963 01/10/2000
  37 Co-Co D6825   08/05/1963 01/04/1996
  37 Co-Co D6826   14/05/1963
  37 Co-Co D6827   28/05/1963 01/11/2000
  37 Co-Co D6828   07/06/1963 01/02/1997
  37 Co-Co D6859   26/06/1963 01/12/2004
  37 Co-Co D6860   05/07/1963 01/12/1993
  37 Co-Co D6861   19/07/1963 01/04/2002
  37 Co-Co D6862   23/07/1963 30/06/2005
  37 Co-Co D6863   06/08/1963 01/01/2003
  37 Co-Co D6864   22/08/1963
  37 Co-Co D6865   29/08/1963 30/06/2008
  37 Co-Co D6866   09/09/1963
  37 Co-Co D6867   16/09/1963 01/02/1999
  37 Co-Co D6879   02/10/1963
  37 Co-Co D6868   04/10/1963
  37 Co-Co D6881   21/10/1963
  37 Co-Co D6880   24/10/1963
  37 Co-Co D6882   28/10/1963
  37 Co-Co D6883   07/11/1963
  37 Co-Co D6884   14/11/1963 19/05/2000
  37 Co-Co D6886   29/11/1963
  37 Co-Co D6885   28/12/1963 30/06/2005
  37 Co-Co D6889   09/01/1964
  37 Co-Co D6888   16/01/1964 31/03/2006
  37 Co-Co D6890   21/01/1964 01/07/1993
  37 Co-Co D6891   21/01/1964 09/02/2001
  37 Co-Co D6887   31/01/1964
  37 Co-Co D6892   20/02/1964 01/06/2004
  37 Co-Co D6893   20/02/1964 01/01/2004
  37 Co-Co D6894   16/03/1964
  37 Co-Co D6895   17/03/1964
  37 Co-Co D6896   06/04/1964 30/09/2008
  37 Co-Co D6897   15/04/1964
  37 Co-Co D6898   05/05/1964 31/07/2004