Manufacturer: Sentinel
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 8400 | 6170 | 09/1925 | 01/1956 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 4801 | 6517 | 10/1926 | 06/1959 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 4802 | 6518 | 10/1926 | 11/1955 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 4803 | 6519 | 10/1926 | 02/1948 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 8401 | 6710 | 12/1926 | 04/1963 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 44 | 7048 | 08/1927 | 11/1956 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 8402 | 7049 | 08/1927 | 08/1948 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 79 | 7138 | 12/1927 | 12/1953 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 9529 | 7139 | 12/1927 | 05/01/1959 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 81 | 7140 | 12/1927 | 10/1953 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 90 | 7141 | 12/1927 | 15/08/1955 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 19 | 6735 | 01/1929 | 09/1951 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 100 | 7837 | 07/1929 | 31/05/1954 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 106 | 7838 | 07/1929 | 04/02/1952 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 108 | 7839 | 07/1929 | 27/05/1957 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 119 | 7840 | 07/1929 | 17/05/1954 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 124 | 7841 | 07/1929 | 22/11/1954 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 142 | 7842 | 07/1929 | 14/01/1957 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 150 | 7843 | 07/1929 | 05/04/1954 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 171 | 7844 | 08/1929 | 02/1952 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 174 | 7845 | 08/1929 | 19/12/1955 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 175 | 7846 | 08/1929 | 13/01/1958 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 183 | 7847 | 08/1929 | 04/05/1959 | |
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 187 | 7848 | 08/1929 | 08/11/1954 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 189 | 7849 | 08/1929 | 03/06/1954 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 192 | 7850 | 08/1929 | 12/1952 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 193 | 7851 | 08/1929 | 26/09/1955 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 196 | 7852 | 08/1929 | 04/03/1957 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 197 | 7853 | 08/1929 | 02/1961 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 198 | 7854 | 08/1929 | 31/08/1953 | |
LMS | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7190 | 09/1929 | 27/02/1961 | ||
LMS | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7191 | 09/1929 | 25/08/1959 | ||
LMS | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7180 | 06/1930 | 22/08/1953 | ||
LMS | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7181 | 06/1930 | 30/11/1956 | ||
LMS | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7182 | 06/1930 | 10/02/1956 | ||
LMS | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7183 | 06/1930 | 09/1955 | ||
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 45 | 8332 | 09/1930 | 03/1959 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 18 | 8314 | 09/1930 | 08/1946 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 21 | 8315 | 09/1930 | 07/1960 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 23 | 8316 | 09/1930 | 21/05/1951 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 35 | 8317 | 09/1930 | 14/09/1957 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 42 | 8318 | 09/1930 | 11/1958 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 49 | 8319 | 09/1930 | 05/1964 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 55 | 8320 | 09/1930 | 12/11/1951 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 60 | 8321 | 09/1930 | 11/1949 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 61 | 8322 | 09/1930 | 02/1959 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 62 | 8323 | 09/1930 | 12/1951 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 63 | 8324 | 10/1930 | 05/1964 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 64 | 8325 | 10/1930 | 06/04/1953 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 65 | 8326 | 10/1930 | 08/1951 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 78 | 8327 | 10/1930 | 10/08/1953 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 87 | 8328 | 10/1930 | 04/07/1955 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 94 | 8329 | 10/1930 | 17/12/1951 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 96 | 8330 | 10/1930 | 03/1963 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 98 | 8331 | 10/1930 | 07/1960 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 117 | 8476 | 04/1931 | 21/05/1956 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 148 | 8477 | 04/1931 | 27/01/1958 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 154 | 8478 | 04/1931 | 11/1959 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 155 | 8479 | 05/1931 | 01/1959 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 172 | 8480 | 05/1931 | 08/11/1954 | |
LNER | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 86 | 8609 | 12/1931 | 19/04/1955 | |
LMS | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7184 | 01/1932 | 10/12/1955 | ||
LNER | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 59 | 8837 | 12/1933 | 06/1961 |