Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 388 | 9thGoods | 79 | 11/1866 | 03/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 389 | 9thGoods | 80 | 11/1866 | 02/1909 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 390 | 9thGoods | 81 | 11/1866 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 391 | 9thGoods | 82 | 11/1866 | 06/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 392 | 9thGoods | 83 | 12/1866 | 10/1928 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 393 | 9thGoods | 84 | 12/1866 | 08/1915 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 394 | 9thGoods | 85 | 12/1866 | 08/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 395 | 9thGoods | 86 | 12/1866 | 11/1923 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 396 | 9thGoods | 87 | 12/1866 | 08/1928 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 397 | 9thGoods | 88 | 12/1866 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 398 | 9thGoods | 89 | 12/1866 | 11/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 399 | 9thGoods | 90 | 12/1866 | 10/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 400 | 9thGoods | 91 | 01/1867 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 401 | 9thGoods | 92 | 01/1867 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 402 | 9thGoods | 93 | 02/1867 | 08/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 403 | 9thGoods | 94 | 02/1867 | 09/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 404 | 9thGoods | 95 | 02/1867 | 11/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 405 | 9thGoods | 96 | 02/1867 | 01/1926 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 407 | 10thGoods | 98 | 02/1867 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 408 | 10thGoods | 99 | 03/1867 | 08/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 409 | 10thGoods | 100 | 03/1867 | 10/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 410 | 10thGoods | 101 | 04/1867 | 04/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 411 | 10thGoods | 102 | 04/1867 | 03/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 412 | 10thGoods | 103 | 05/1867 | 05/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 419 | 10thGoods | 104 | 05/1867 | 01/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 420 | 10thGoods | 105 | 06/1867 | 01/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 421 | 10thGoods | 106 | 06/1867 | 12/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 422 | 10thGoods | 107 | 07/1867 | 01/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 424 | 10thGoods | 109 | 07/1867 | 09/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 423 | 10thGoods | 108 | 08/1867 | 02/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 425 | 10thGoods | 110 | 08/1867 | 06/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 406 | 9thGoods | 97 | 09/1867 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1012 | 1stRenewals | 114 | 10/1867 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1013 | 1stRenewals | 115 | 11/1867 | 08/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1014 | 1stRenewals | 116 | 11/1867 | 08/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 426 | 10thGoods | 111 | 12/1867 | 04/1923 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1065 | 1stRenewals | 118 | 12/1867 | 03/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 428 | 10thGoods | 113 | 12/1867 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 427 | 10thGoods | 112 | 12/1867 | 06/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1064 | 1stRenewals | 117 | 01/1868 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 429 | 11thGoods | 119 | 01/1868 | 05/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 430 | 11thGoods | 120 | 01/1868 | 10/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 431 | 11thGoods | 121 | 02/1868 | 05/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 432 | 11thGoods | 122 | 02/1868 | 07/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 433 | 11thGoods | 123 | 02/1868 | 12/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 434 | 11thGoods | 124 | 03/1868 | 07/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 435 | 11thGoods | 125 | 03/1868 | 06/1907 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 436 | 11thGoods | 126 | 03/1868 | 02/1930 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 437 | 11thGoods | 127 | 03/1868 | 05/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 438 | 11thGoods | 128 | 04/1868 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 445 | 15 | 135 | 07/1868 | 08/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 446 | 15 | 136 | 07/1868 | 04/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 447 | 15 | 137 | 07/1868 | 08/1916 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 448 | 15 | 138 | 07/1868 | 12/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 449 | 15 | 139 | 08/1868 | 10/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 450 | 15 | 140 | 08/1868 | 12/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 451 | 15 | 141 | 08/1868 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 452 | 15 | 142 | 09/1868 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 453 | 15 | 143 | 09/1868 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 454 | 15 | 144 | 09/1868 | 03/1906 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 370 | 16 | 145 | 10/1868 | 07/1915 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 371 | 16 | 146 | 10/1868 | 09/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 426 | 16 | 147 | 10/1868 | 09/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 427 | 16 | 148 | 10/1868 | 09/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 428 | 16 | 149 | 11/1868 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1091 | 17 | 150 | 12/1868 | 10/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1092 | 17 | 151 | 12/1868 | 09/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1094 | 17 | 153 | 12/1868 | 07/1915 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 455 | 01/1869 | 08/1906 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 456 | 01/1869 | 01/1931 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 457 | 01/1869 | 03/11/1934 | ||
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1093 | 17 | 152 | 01/1869 | 08/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1095 | 17 | 154 | 01/1869 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 458 | 02/1869 | 26/04/1933 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 459 | 02/1869 | 09/10/1933 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 460 | 02/1869 | 05/1932 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 461 | 02/1869 | 12/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 462 | 02/1869 | 03/1907 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 463 | 03/1869 | 06/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 464 | 03/1869 | 07/12/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 465 | 03/1869 | 02/1931 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 466 | 03/1869 | 04/1907 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 467 | 04/1869 | 12/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 468 | 04/1869 | 02/1932 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 469 | 04/1869 | 09/1928 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 470 | 04/1869 | 21/02/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1096 | 04/1869 | 09/1906 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1097 | 04/1869 | 03/1913 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1098 | 05/1869 | 10/1932 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1099 | 05/1869 | 10/1928 | ||
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 492 | 21 | 216 | 02/1870 | 12/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 491 | 21 | 215 | 03/1870 | 06/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 493 | 21 | 217 | 03/1870 | 12/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 494 | 21 | 218 | 03/1870 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 495 | 21 | 219 | 03/1870 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 496 | 21 | 220 | 03/1870 | 12/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 498 | 21 | 222 | 03/1870 | 05/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1168 | 21 | 221 | 03/1870 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 499 | 21 | 223 | 04/1870 | 12/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 500 | 21 | 224 | 04/1870 | 12/1921 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1172 | 22 | 245 | 05/1870 | 07/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1173 | 22 | 246 | 05/1870 | 07/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1174 | 22 | 247 | 05/1870 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1175 | 22 | 248 | 06/1870 | 10/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1176 | 22 | 249 | 06/1870 | 09/05/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1177 | 22 | 250 | 06/1870 | 02/1931 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1169 | 21 | 225 | 06/1870 | 09/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 497 | 21 | 228 | 07/1870 | 11/1925 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 501 | 21 | 229 | 07/1870 | 06/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 502 | 21 | 230 | 07/1870 | 05/1915 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1170 | 21 | 226 | 07/1870 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1171 | 21 | 227 | 07/1870 | 04/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 503 | 21 | 231 | 08/1870 | 02/1907 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 504 | 21 | 232 | 08/1870 | 07/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 505 | 21 | 233 | 08/1870 | 10/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 506 | 21 | 234 | 08/1870 | 04/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 507 | 21 | 235 | 08/1870 | 08/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 508 | 21 | 236 | 08/1870 | 08/1916 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 509 | 21 | 237 | 09/1870 | 05/1930 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 510 | 21 | 238 | 09/1870 | 10/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 511 | 21 | 239 | 09/1870 | 06/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 512 | 21 | 240 | 09/1870 | 03/1931 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 513 | 21 | 241 | 09/1870 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 514 | 21 | 242 | 09/1870 | 08/1924 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 515 | 21 | 243 | 10/1870 | 11/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 516 | 21 | 244 | 10/1870 | 06/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1086 | 23 | 251 | 10/1870 | 04/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1087 | 23 | 252 | 10/1870 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1088 | 23 | 253 | 10/1870 | 06/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1089 | 23 | 254 | 10/1870 | 10/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1090 | 23 | 255 | 11/1870 | 09/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1091 | 23 | 256 | 11/1870 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1092 | 23 | 257 | 11/1870 | 07/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1093 | 23 | 258 | 11/1870 | 02/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1094 | 23 | 259 | 11/1870 | 28/03/1934 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1095 | 23 | 260 | 11/1870 | 12/1930 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1096 | 23 | 261 | 12/1870 | 07/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1097 | 23 | 262 | 12/1870 | 08/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1098 | 23 | 263 | 12/1870 | 06/1923 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1099 | 23 | 264 | 12/1870 | 03/1928 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1100 | 23 | 265 | 01/1871 | 08/1916 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1101 | 23 | 266 | 01/1871 | 04/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1102 | 23 | 267 | 01/1871 | 09/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1103 | 23 | 268 | 01/1871 | 03/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 593 | 23 | 271 | 02/1871 | 06/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 594 | 23 | 272 | 02/1871 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 595 | 23 | 273 | 02/1871 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 596 | 23 | 274 | 02/1871 | 02/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1104 | 23 | 269 | 02/1871 | 06/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1105 | 23 | 270 | 02/1871 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 597 | 23 | 275 | 03/1871 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 598 | 23 | 276 | 03/1871 | 03/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 599 | 23 | 277 | 03/1871 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 600 | 23 | 278 | 03/1871 | 12/1918 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 601 | 23 | 279 | 03/1871 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 602 | 23 | 280 | 03/1871 | 07/1906 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1106 | 24 | 281 | 03/1871 | 08/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1107 | 24 | 282 | 04/1871 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1108 | 24 | 283 | 04/1871 | 12/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1109 | 24 | 284 | 04/1871 | 06/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1110 | 24 | 285 | 04/1871 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1111 | 24 | 286 | 04/1871 | 10/1928 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 603 | 24 | 291 | 05/1871 | 06/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1112 | 24 | 287 | 05/1871 | 05/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1113 | 24 | 288 | 05/1871 | 09/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1114 | 24 | 289 | 05/1871 | 01/1915 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1115 | 24 | 290 | 05/1871 | 05/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 604 | 24 | 292 | 06/1871 | 12/1906 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 605 | 24 | 293 | 06/1871 | 10/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 606 | 24 | 294 | 06/1871 | 08/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 607 | 24 | 295 | 06/1871 | 09/1928 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 608 | 24 | 296 | 06/1871 | 07/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 609 | 24 | 297 | 06/1871 | 03/1920 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 613 | 07/1871 | 02/1931 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 614 | 07/1871 | 07/1906 | ||
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 610 | 24 | 298 | 07/1871 | 05/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 611 | 24 | 299 | 07/1871 | 11/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 612 | 24 | 300 | 07/1871 | 08/1915 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 615 | 08/1871 | 02/1931 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 616 | 08/1871 | 02/1931 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 617 | 08/1871 | 08/05/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 618 | 08/1871 | 03/1907 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 619 | 08/1871 | 01/1906 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 620 | 08/1871 | 11/1928 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 621 | 09/1871 | 04/1931 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 622 | 09/1871 | 04/1898 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 623 | 09/1871 | 10/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 624 | 09/1871 | 07/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 625 | 09/1871 | 06/1903 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 626 | 09/1871 | 12/1932 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 627 | 10/1871 | 10/1928 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 628 | 10/1871 | 03/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 629 | 10/1871 | 12/1912 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 630 | 10/1871 | 01/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 631 | 10/1871 | 03/1898 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 632 | 10/1871 | 11/1929 | ||
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 657 | 26 | 321 | 11/1871 | 12/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 658 | 26 | 322 | 11/1871 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 659 | 26 | 323 | 11/1871 | 06/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 660 | 26 | 324 | 11/1871 | 04/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 661 | 26 | 325 | 11/1871 | 08/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 662 | 26 | 326 | 11/1871 | 09/1906 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 663 | 26 | 327 | 11/1871 | 04/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 664 | 26 | 328 | 12/1871 | 01/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 665 | 26 | 329 | 12/1871 | 09/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 666 | 26 | 330 | 12/1871 | 01/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 667 | 26 | 331 | 12/1871 | 04/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 668 | 26 | 332 | 12/1871 | 02/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 669 | 26 | 333 | 12/1871 | 05/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 670 | 26 | 334 | 12/1871 | 06/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 671 | 26 | 335 | 01/1872 | 05/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 672 | 26 | 336 | 01/1872 | 09/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 673 | 26 | 337 | 01/1872 | 02/1924 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 674 | 26 | 338 | 01/1872 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 675 | 26 | 339 | 01/1872 | 02/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 676 | 26 | 340 | 01/1872 | 05/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 24 | 26 | 341 | 02/1872 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 31 | 26 | 342 | 02/1872 | 02/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 48 | 26 | 343 | 02/1872 | 12/1918 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 51 | 26 | 344 | 02/1872 | 10/1918 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 52 | 26 | 345 | 02/1872 | 06/1906 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 116 | 26 | 346 | 02/1872 | 11/1927 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 298 | 26 | 347 | 03/1872 | 12/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 300 | 26 | 348 | 03/1872 | 10/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 415 | 26 | 349 | 03/1872 | 06/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 416 | 26 | 350 | 03/1872 | 05/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 677 | 28 | 352 | 03/1872 | 03/1909 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 678 | 28 | 353 | 03/1872 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 679 | 28 | 354 | 03/1872 | 05/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 680 | 28 | 355 | 03/1872 | 10/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 681 | 28 | 356 | 03/1872 | 10/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 682 | 28 | 357 | 03/1872 | 03/1915 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 683 | 28 | 358 | 04/1872 | 08/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 684 | 28 | 359 | 04/1872 | 05/1915 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 685 | 28 | 360 | 04/1872 | 04/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 686 | 28 | 361 | 04/1872 | 02/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 687 | 28 | 362 | 04/1872 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 688 | 28 | 363 | 04/1872 | 06/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 689 | 28 | 364 | 05/1872 | 29/03/1933 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 690 | 28 | 365 | 05/1872 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 692 | 28 | 367 | 05/1872 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 693 | 28 | 368 | 05/1872 | 11/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 694 | 28 | 369 | 05/1872 | 02/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 695 | 28 | 370 | 05/1872 | 12/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 691 | 28 | 366 | 06/1872 | 10/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 696 | 28 | 371 | 06/1872 | 06/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 697 | 28 | 372 | 06/1872 | 12/1906 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 698 | 28 | 373 | 06/1872 | 08/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 699 | 28 | 374 | 06/1872 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 700 | 28 | 375 | 06/1872 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 701 | 28 | 376 | 06/1872 | 04/1923 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 702 | 28 | 377 | 08/1872 | 05/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 703 | 28 | 378 | 08/1872 | 03/1908 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 704 | 28 | 379 | 08/1872 | 03/1923 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 705 | 28 | 380 | 08/1872 | 11/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 706 | 28 | 381 | 08/1872 | 06/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 707 | 28 | 382 | 09/1872 | 09/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 708 | 28 | 383 | 09/1872 | 12/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 709 | 28 | 384 | 09/1872 | 12/1928 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 710 | 28 | 385 | 10/1872 | 05/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 711 | 28 | 386 | 10/1872 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 712 | 28 | 387 | 10/1872 | 08/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 713 | 28 | 388 | 10/1872 | 09/1911 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 727 | 30 | 402 | 10/1872 | 12/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 728 | 30 | 403 | 10/1872 | 06/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 714 | 28 | 389 | 11/1872 | 06/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 715 | 28 | 390 | 11/1872 | 01/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 716 | 28 | 391 | 11/1872 | 02/1917 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 729 | 30 | 404 | 11/1872 | 11/1910 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 730 | 30 | 405 | 11/1872 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 731 | 30 | 406 | 11/1872 | 09/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 732 | 30 | 407 | 12/1872 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 733 | 30 | 408 | 12/1872 | 20/10/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 734 | 30 | 409 | 12/1872 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 735 | 30 | 410 | 01/1873 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 736 | 30 | 411 | 01/1873 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 737 | 30 | 412 | 01/1873 | 07/1882 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 738 | 30 | 413 | 01/1873 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 739 | 30 | 414 | 01/1873 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 740 | 30 | 415 | 01/1873 | 09/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 741 | 30 | 416 | 02/1873 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 742 | 30 | 417 | 02/1873 | 03/1919 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 743 | 30 | 418 | 02/1873 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 744 | 30 | 419 | 02/1873 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 745 | 30 | 420 | 02/1873 | 21/04/1933 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 746 | 30 | 421 | 02/1873 | 09/1927 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 747 | 30 | 422 | 03/1873 | 03/1911 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 748 | 30 | 423 | 03/1873 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 749 | 30 | 424 | 03/1873 | 06/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 750 | 30 | 425 | 03/1873 | 10/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 751 | 30 | 426 | 03/1873 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 752 | 30 | 427 | 04/1873 | 04/08/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 753 | 30 | 428 | 04/1873 | 02/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 754 | 30 | 429 | 04/1873 | 07/1911 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 755 | 30 | 430 | 04/1873 | 05/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 756 | 30 | 431 | 04/1873 | 12/1928 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 776 | 31 | 432 | 06/1873 | 01/1906 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 777 | 31 | 433 | 06/1873 | 10/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 778 | 31 | 434 | 06/1873 | 11/1906 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 779 | 31 | 435 | 07/1873 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 781 | 31 | 437 | 07/1873 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 782 | 31 | 438 | 07/1873 | 05/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 783 | 31 | 439 | 07/1873 | 09/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 784 | 31 | 440 | 08/1873 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 785 | 31 | 441 | 08/1873 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 786 | 31 | 442 | 09/1873 | 03/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 787 | 31 | 443 | 09/1873 | 05/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 788 | 31 | 444 | 10/1873 | 06/1908 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 789 | 31 | 445 | 10/1873 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 790 | 31 | 446 | 10/1873 | 12/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 791 | 31 | 447 | 10/1873 | 04/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 792 | 31 | 448 | 10/1873 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 793 | 31 | 449 | 10/1873 | 08/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 794 | 31 | 450 | 11/1873 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 795 | 31 | 451 | 11/1873 | 04/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 796 | 31 | 452 | 11/1873 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 797 | 31 | 453 | 11/1873 | 05/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 798 | 31 | 454 | 11/1873 | 08/1906 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 799 | 31 | 455 | 11/1873 | 07/1918 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 800 | 31 | 456 | 11/1873 | 12/1926 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 801 | 31 | 457 | 11/1873 | 10/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 802 | 31 | 458 | 12/1873 | 07/1912 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 803 | 31 | 459 | 12/1873 | 03/1923 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 804 | 31 | 460 | 12/1873 | 12/1924 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 874 | 35 | 483 | 12/1873 | 07/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 875 | 35 | 484 | 12/1873 | 06/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 876 | 35 | 485 | 12/1873 | 11/1911 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 805 | 31 | 461 | 01/1874 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 877 | 35 | 486 | 01/1874 | 03/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 878 | 35 | 487 | 01/1874 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 879 | 35 | 488 | 01/1874 | 10/1914 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 880 | 35 | 489 | 01/1874 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 881 | 35 | 490 | 01/1874 | 03/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 882 | 35 | 491 | 01/1874 | 08/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 883 | 35 | 492 | 01/1874 | 05/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 884 | 35 | 493 | 01/1874 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 885 | 35 | 494 | 01/1874 | 09/1904 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 886 | 35 | 495 | 01/1874 | 04/1923 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 887 | 35 | 496 | 02/1874 | 03/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 888 | 35 | 497 | 02/1874 | 10/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 889 | 35 | 498 | 02/1874 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 890 | 35 | 499 | 02/1874 | 12/1925 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 891 | 35 | 500 | 02/1874 | 08/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 892 | 35 | 501 | 02/1874 | 03/1905 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 893 | 35 | 502 | 02/1874 | 03/1922 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 947 | 37 | 523 | 05/1874 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 948 | 37 | 524 | 05/1874 | 03/1915 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 949 | 37 | 525 | 05/1874 | 20/10/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 950 | 37 | 526 | 06/1874 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 951 | 37 | 527 | 06/1874 | 10/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 952 | 37 | 528 | 06/1874 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 953 | 37 | 529 | 06/1874 | 09/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 954 | 37 | 530 | 06/1874 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 955 | 37 | 531 | 06/1874 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 956 | 37 | 532 | 06/1874 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 957 | 37 | 533 | 07/1874 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 958 | 37 | 534 | 07/1874 | 24/11/1933 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 959 | 37 | 535 | 07/1874 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 960 | 37 | 536 | 07/1874 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 961 | 37 | 537 | 07/1874 | 07/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 962 | 37 | 538 | 07/1874 | 03/1931 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 967 | 08/1874 | 04/04/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 968 | 08/1874 | 10/1906 | ||
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 963 | 37 | 539 | 08/1874 | 06/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 964 | 37 | 540 | 08/1874 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 965 | 37 | 541 | 08/1874 | 01/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 966 | 37 | 542 | 08/1874 | 01/1929 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 969 | 09/1874 | 08/1907 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 970 | 09/1874 | 05/1904 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 971 | 09/1874 | 17/11/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 972 | 09/1874 | 02/1932 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 973 | 09/1874 | 05/1932 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 974 | 09/1874 | 11/1904 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 975 | 09/1874 | 07/04/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 976 | 10/1874 | 11/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 977 | 10/1874 | 03/1931 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 978 | 10/1874 | 08/1907 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 979 | 10/1874 | 02/09/1933 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 980 | 10/1874 | 23/08/1933 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 981 | 10/1874 | 07/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 982 | 10/1874 | 02/12/1933 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 983 | 11/1874 | 20/03/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 984 | 11/1874 | 09/1906 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 985 | 11/1874 | 12/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 986 | 11/1874 | 17/03/1934 | ||
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1134 | 39 | 563 | 11/1874 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1135 | 39 | 564 | 11/1874 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1136 | 39 | 565 | 11/1874 | 02/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1137 | 39 | 566 | 12/1874 | 11/10/1933 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1138 | 39 | 567 | 12/1874 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1139 | 39 | 568 | 12/1874 | 06/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1140 | 39 | 569 | 12/1874 | 26/05/1958 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1141 | 39 | 570 | 12/1874 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1142 | 39 | 571 | 12/1874 | 12/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1143 | 39 | 572 | 12/1874 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1144 | 39 | 573 | 01/1875 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1145 | 39 | 574 | 01/1875 | 03/05/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1146 | 39 | 575 | 01/1875 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1147 | 39 | 576 | 01/1875 | 01/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1148 | 39 | 577 | 01/1875 | 28/07/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1149 | 39 | 578 | 02/1875 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1150 | 39 | 579 | 02/1875 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1151 | 39 | 580 | 02/1875 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1152 | 39 | 581 | 02/1875 | 05/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1153 | 39 | 582 | 02/1875 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1166 | 40 | 603 | 08/1875 | 11/06/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1167 | 40 | 604 | 08/1875 | 12/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1168 | 40 | 605 | 08/1875 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1169 | 40 | 606 | 08/1875 | 01/11/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1170 | 40 | 607 | 08/1875 | 06/1927 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1171 | 40 | 608 | 08/1875 | 20/01/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1172 | 40 | 609 | 09/1875 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1173 | 40 | 610 | 09/1875 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1174 | 40 | 611 | 09/1875 | 28/07/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1175 | 40 | 612 | 09/1875 | 24/11/1933 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1176 | 40 | 613 | 10/1875 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1177 | 40 | 614 | 10/1875 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1178 | 40 | 615 | 10/1875 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1179 | 40 | 616 | 11/1875 | 08/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1180 | 40 | 617 | 11/1875 | 01/11/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1181 | 40 | 618 | 11/1875 | 12/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1182 | 40 | 619 | 11/1875 | 09/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1183 | 40 | 620 | 11/1875 | 04/1930 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 21 | 41 | 623 | 12/1875 | 06/1919 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1184 | 40 | 621 | 12/1875 | 10/1903 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1185 | 40 | 622 | 12/1875 | 01/1931 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 22 | 41 | 624 | 01/1876 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 23 | 41 | 625 | 01/1876 | 05/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 25 | 41 | 626 | 01/1876 | 04/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 27 | 41 | 627 | 01/1876 | 06/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 29 | 41 | 628 | 02/1876 | 06/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 32 | 41 | 629 | 02/1876 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 39 | 41 | 630 | 02/1876 | 12/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 53 | 41 | 631 | 02/1876 | 08/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 117 | 41 | 632 | 02/1876 | 04/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1186 | 41 | 633 | 03/1876 | 05/1923 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1187 | 41 | 634 | 03/1876 | 01/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1188 | 41 | 635 | 03/1876 | 11/1927 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1189 | 41 | 636 | 03/1876 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1190 | 41 | 637 | 03/1876 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1191 | 41 | 638 | 03/1876 | 02/1917 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1192 | 41 | 639 | 04/1876 | 04/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1193 | 41 | 640 | 04/1876 | 01/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1194 | 41 | 641 | 04/1876 | 06/1925 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1195 | 41 | 642 | 04/1876 | 09/10/1934 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1196 | 42 | 643 | 05/1876 | 05/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1197 | 42 | 644 | 05/1876 | 11/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1198 | 42 | 645 | 05/1876 | 08/1916 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1199 | 42 | 646 | 05/1876 | 07/1913 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1200 | 42 | 647 | 05/1876 | 10/1928 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1201 | 42 | 648 | 05/1876 | 01/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1202 | 42 | 649 | 06/1876 | 11/1927 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1203 | 42 | 650 | 06/1876 | 08/1925 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1204 | 42 | 651 | 06/1876 | 04/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1205 | 42 | 652 | 06/1876 | 01/1921 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1206 | 42 | 653 | 08/1876 | 07/1918 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1207 | 42 | 654 | 08/1876 | 03/1922 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1208 | 42 | 655 | 08/1876 | 12/1919 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1209 | 42 | 656 | 09/1876 | 06/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1210 | 42 | 657 | 09/1876 | 12/1926 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1211 | 42 | 658 | 09/1876 | 12/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1212 | 42 | 659 | 09/1876 | 04/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1213 | 42 | 660 | 09/1876 | 04/1920 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1214 | 42 | 661 | 10/1876 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 1215 | 42 | 662 | 10/1876 | 10/1926 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1228 | 43 | 663 | 10/1876 | 09/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1229 | 43 | 664 | 10/1876 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1230 | 43 | 665 | 11/1876 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1231 | 43 | 666 | 11/1876 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1232 | 43 | 667 | 11/1876 | 08/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1233 | 43 | 668 | 11/1876 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1234 | 43 | 669 | 11/1876 | 12/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1235 | 43 | 670 | 12/1876 | 10/1937 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1236 | 43 | 671 | 12/1876 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1237 | 43 | 672 | 12/1876 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1238 | 43 | 673 | 12/1876 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1239 | 43 | 674 | 12/1876 | 10/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1240 | 43 | 675 | 01/1877 | 10/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1241 | 43 | 676 | 01/1877 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1242 | 43 | 677 | 01/1877 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1243 | 43 | 678 | 01/1877 | 06/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1244 | 43 | 679 | 02/1877 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1245 | 43 | 680 | 02/1877 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1246 | 43 | 681 | 02/1877 | 06/12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1247 | 43 | 682 | 02/1877 | 05/1939 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1248 | 44 | 683 | 03/1877 | 05/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1249 | 44 | 684 | 03/1877 | 10/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1250 | 44 | 685 | 03/1877 | 03/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1251 | 44 | 686 | 03/1877 | 12/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1252 | 44 | 687 | 03/1877 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1253 | 44 | 688 | 04/1877 | 06/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1254 | 44 | 689 | 04/1877 | 02/1937 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1255 | 44 | 690 | 04/1877 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1256 | 44 | 691 | 05/1877 | 01/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1257 | 44 | 692 | 05/1877 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1258 | 44 | 693 | 05/1877 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1260 | 44 | 695 | 05/1877 | 04/08/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1261 | 44 | 696 | 05/1877 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1262 | 44 | 697 | 05/1877 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1259 | 44 | 694 | 06/1877 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1263 | 44 | 698 | 06/1877 | 02/01/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1264 | 44 | 699 | 06/1877 | 04/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1265 | 44 | 700 | 06/1877 | 09/1937 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1266 | 44 | 701 | 06/1877 | 0000 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1267 | 44 | 702 | 07/1877 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1268 | 45 | 703 | 08/1877 | 01/11/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1269 | 45 | 704 | 08/1877 | 04/1938 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1270 | 45 | 705 | 08/1877 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1271 | 45 | 706 | 09/1877 | 04/1937 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1272 | 45 | 707 | 09/1877 | 04/08/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1273 | 45 | 708 | 09/1877 | 27/11/1933 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1274 | 45 | 709 | 09/1877 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1275 | 45 | 710 | 10/1877 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1276 | 45 | 711 | 10/1877 | 14/09/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1277 | 45 | 712 | 10/1877 | 06/1911 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1278 | 45 | 713 | 11/1877 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1279 | 45 | 714 | 11/1877 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1280 | 45 | 715 | 11/1877 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1281 | 45 | 716 | 11/1877 | 05/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1282 | 45 | 717 | 12/1877 | 12/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1283 | 45 | 718 | 12/1877 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1284 | 45 | 719 | 01/1878 | 05/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1285 | 45 | 720 | 01/1878 | 06/12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1286 | 45 | 721 | 01/1878 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1287 | 45 | 722 | 01/1878 | 04/1946 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1288 | 45 | 723 | 02/1878 | 07/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1289 | 45 | 724 | 02/1878 | 07/07/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1290 | 45 | 725 | 02/1878 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1291 | 45 | 726 | 02/1878 | 05/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1292 | 45 | 727 | 03/1878 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1293 | 45 | 728 | 03/1878 | 06/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1294 | 45 | 729 | 03/1878 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1295 | 45 | 730 | 04/1878 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1296 | 45 | 731 | 04/1878 | 09/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1297 | 45 | 732 | 04/1878 | 07/1932 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1401 | 05/1878 | 01/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1402 | 05/1878 | 09/1906 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1403 | 05/1878 | 11/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1404 | 06/1878 | 21/02/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1405 | 06/1878 | 06/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1406 | 06/1878 | 06/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1407 | 06/1878 | 04/1931 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1408 | 07/1878 | 07/12/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1409 | 07/1878 | 07/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1410 | 07/1878 | 01/11/1934 | ||
GWR | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 780 | 31 | 436 | 07/1878 | 06/1905 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1411 | 08/1878 | 07/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1412 | 08/1878 | 11/1906 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1413 | 08/1878 | 03/1931 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1414 | 09/1878 | 01/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1415 | 09/1878 | 04/1938 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1416 | 09/1878 | 11/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1417 | 09/1878 | 04/1928 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1418 | 10/1878 | 04/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1419 | 10/1878 | 07/1932 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1420 | 10/1878 | 04/1936 | ||
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1561 | 48 | 754 | 11/1878 | 28/07/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1562 | 48 | 755 | 11/1878 | 03/1938 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1563 | 48 | 756 | 11/1878 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1564 | 48 | 757 | 12/1878 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1565 | 48 | 758 | 12/1878 | 12/1938 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1566 | 48 | 759 | 12/1878 | 05/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1567 | 48 | 760 | 12/1878 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1568 | 48 | 761 | 12/1878 | 04/1938 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1569 | 48 | 762 | 01/1879 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1570 | 48 | 763 | 01/1879 | 10/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1571 | 48 | 764 | 01/1879 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1572 | 48 | 765 | 01/1879 | 27/01/1933 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1573 | 48 | 766 | 02/1879 | 06/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1574 | 48 | 767 | 02/1879 | 12/1937 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1575 | 48 | 768 | 02/1879 | 06/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1576 | 48 | 769 | 02/1879 | 03/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1577 | 48 | 770 | 03/1879 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1578 | 48 | 771 | 03/1879 | 30/09/1933 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1579 | 48 | 772 | 03/1879 | 06/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1580 | 48 | 773 | 03/1879 | 08/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1581 | 49 | 774 | 04/1879 | 07/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1582 | 49 | 775 | 05/1879 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1583 | 49 | 776 | 05/1879 | 11/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1584 | 49 | 777 | 05/1879 | 27/09/1933 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1585 | 49 | 778 | 05/1879 | 04/1946 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1586 | 49 | 779 | 06/1879 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1587 | 49 | 780 | 06/1879 | 27/01/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1588 | 49 | 781 | 06/1879 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1589 | 49 | 782 | 06/1879 | 01/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1590 | 49 | 783 | 07/1879 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1591 | 49 | 784 | 07/1879 | 08/1922 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1592 | 49 | 785 | 07/1879 | 02/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1593 | 49 | 786 | 08/1879 | 28/07/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1594 | 49 | 787 | 08/1879 | 06/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1595 | 49 | 788 | 08/1879 | 12/1927 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1596 | 49 | 789 | 09/1879 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1597 | 49 | 790 | 09/1879 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1598 | 49 | 791 | 10/1879 | 05/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1599 | 49 | 792 | 10/1879 | 12/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1600 | 49 | 793 | 11/1879 | 12/1937 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1601 | 50 | 794 | 11/1879 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1602 | 50 | 795 | 12/1879 | 01/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1603 | 50 | 796 | 12/1879 | 01/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1604 | 50 | 797 | 12/1879 | 09/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1605 | 50 | 798 | 12/1879 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1606 | 50 | 799 | 12/1879 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1607 | 50 | 800 | 01/1880 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1608 | 50 | 801 | 01/1880 | 05/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1609 | 50 | 802 | 01/1880 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1610 | 50 | 803 | 02/1880 | 10/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1611 | 50 | 804 | 02/1880 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1612 | 50 | 805 | 02/1880 | 12/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1613 | 50 | 806 | 02/1880 | 12/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1614 | 50 | 807 | 03/1880 | 03/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1615 | 50 | 808 | 03/1880 | 04/1939 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1616 | 50 | 809 | 03/1880 | 01/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1617 | 50 | 810 | 03/1880 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1618 | 50 | 811 | 04/1880 | 05/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1619 | 50 | 812 | 04/1880 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1620 | 50 | 813 | 04/1880 | 11/1937 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1621 | 52 | 824 | 05/1880 | 01/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1622 | 52 | 825 | 05/1880 | 06/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1623 | 52 | 826 | 05/1880 | 12/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1624 | 52 | 827 | 05/1880 | 04/1946 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1625 | 52 | 828 | 06/1880 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1626 | 52 | 829 | 06/1880 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1627 | 52 | 830 | 06/1880 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1628 | 52 | 831 | 06/1880 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1629 | 52 | 832 | 07/1880 | 09/1937 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1630 | 52 | 833 | 07/1880 | 03/11/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1631 | 52 | 834 | 07/1880 | 06/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1632 | 52 | 835 | 08/1880 | 04/1939 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1633 | 52 | 836 | 08/1880 | 01/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1634 | 52 | 837 | 08/1880 | 07/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1635 | 52 | 838 | 09/1880 | 04/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1636 | 52 | 839 | 09/1880 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1637 | 52 | 840 | 10/1880 | 10/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1638 | 52 | 841 | 10/1880 | 07/1938 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1639 | 52 | 842 | 10/1880 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1640 | 52 | 843 | 11/1880 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1641 | 55 | 846 | 11/1880 | 11/1938 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1642 | 55 | 847 | 11/1880 | 10/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1643 | 55 | 848 | 12/1880 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1644 | 55 | 849 | 12/1880 | 06/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1645 | 55 | 850 | 12/1880 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1646 | 55 | 851 | 12/1880 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1647 | 55 | 852 | 01/1881 | 11/1936 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1648 | 55 | 853 | 01/1881 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1649 | 55 | 854 | 02/1881 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1650 | 55 | 855 | 02/1881 | 03/1938 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1651 | 55 | 856 | 03/1881 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1652 | 55 | 857 | 03/1881 | 06/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1653 | 55 | 858 | 03/1881 | 12/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1654 | 55 | 859 | 04/1881 | 01/1932 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1655 | 55 | 860 | 04/1881 | 07/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1656 | 55 | 861 | 04/1881 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1657 | 55 | 862 | 05/1881 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1658 | 55 | 863 | 05/1881 | 07/07/1934 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1659 | 55 | 864 | 05/1881 | 10/1930 |
GWR | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1660 | 55 | 865 | 06/1881 | 06/1938 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1445 | 09/1881 | 12/1937 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1446 | 10/1881 | 02/1936 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1447 | 10/1881 | 11/1928 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1448 | 11/1881 | 07/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1449 | 11/1881 | 09/1928 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1450 | 12/1881 | 04/1928 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1451 | 12/1881 | 09/1928 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1452 | 12/1881 | 09/1906 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1453 | 01/1882 | 13/07/1933 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1454 | 02/1882 | 17/11/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1455 | 02/1882 | 06/1935 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1456 | 02/1882 | 10/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1457 | 03/1882 | 02/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1458 | 03/1882 | 04/1919 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1459 | 03/1882 | 03/1936 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1460 | 04/1882 | 04/1913 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1461 | 04/1882 | 08/1930 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1462 | 04/1882 | 03/1929 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1463 | 05/1882 | 07/12/1934 | ||
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1464 | 05/1882 | 01/1936 | ||
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1813 | 59 | 906 | 09/1882 | 07/1928 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1814 | 59 | 907 | 09/1882 | 09/1937 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1815 | 59 | 908 | 09/1882 | 12/1936 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1816 | 59 | 909 | 10/1882 | 11/1935 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1817 | 59 | 910 | 10/1882 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1818 | 59 | 911 | 10/1882 | 04/08/1934 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1819 | 59 | 912 | 11/1882 | 01/1938 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1820 | 59 | 913 | 11/1882 | 04/1937 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1821 | 59 | 914 | 11/1882 | 02/05/1933 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1822 | 59 | 915 | 11/1882 | 03/1930 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1823 | 59 | 916 | 11/1882 | 25/08/1944 |
GWR | 1833 | 0-6-0T | 1833 | 58 | 845 | 11/1882 | 03/1906 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1824 | 59 | 917 | 12/1882 | 06/1938 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1825 | 59 | 918 | 12/1882 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1826 | 59 | 919 | 12/1882 | 10/1936 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1827 | 59 | 920 | 12/1882 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1828 | 59 | 921 | 01/1883 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1830 | 59 | 923 | 01/1883 | 21/10/1933 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1831 | 59 | 924 | 02/1883 | 14/05/1945 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1832 | 59 | 925 | 02/1883 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1834 | 60 | 926 | 03/1883 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1835 | 60 | 927 | 03/1883 | 31/01/1949 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1836 | 60 | 928 | 03/1883 | 03/1939 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1837 | 60 | 929 | 03/1883 | 18/08/1934 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1838 | 60 | 930 | 04/1883 | 28/05/1947 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1839 | 60 | 931 | 04/1883 | 09/1938 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1840 | 60 | 932 | 04/1883 | 03/1937 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1841 | 60 | 933 | 04/1883 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1842 | 60 | 934 | 05/1883 | 05/1928 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1843 | 60 | 935 | 05/1883 | 07/1929 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1844 | 60 | 936 | 05/1883 | 12/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2301 | 61 | 946 | 05/1883 | 05/01/1934 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1845 | 60 | 937 | 06/1883 | 08/1930 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2302 | 61 | 947 | 06/1883 | 03/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2303 | 61 | 948 | 06/1883 | 02/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2304 | 61 | 949 | 06/1883 | 01/1929 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2305 | 61 | 950 | 07/1883 | 06/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2306 | 61 | 951 | 07/1883 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2307 | 61 | 952 | 07/1883 | 04/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2308 | 61 | 953 | 08/1883 | 21/04/1921 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2309 | 61 | 954 | 08/1883 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2310 | 61 | 955 | 08/1883 | 17/11/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2311 | 61 | 956 | 08/1883 | 16/11/1934 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1846 | 60 | 938 | 09/1883 | 29/07/1946 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2312 | 61 | 957 | 09/1883 | 02/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2313 | 61 | 958 | 09/1883 | 12/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2314 | 61 | 959 | 09/1883 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1847 | 60 | 939 | 10/1883 | 13/05/1947 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1848 | 60 | 940 | 10/1883 | 06/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2315 | 61 | 960 | 10/1883 | 14/11/1945 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2316 | 61 | 961 | 10/1883 | 16/11/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2317 | 61 | 962 | 10/1883 | 17/11/1934 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1829 | 59 | 922 | 11/1883 | 12/1928 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1849 | 60 | 941 | 11/1883 | 24/08/1934 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1850 | 60 | 942 | 11/1883 | 09/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2318 | 61 | 963 | 11/1883 | 08/1929 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2319 | 61 | 964 | 11/1883 | 02/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2320 | 61 | 965 | 11/1883 | 24/11/1944 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1851 | 60 | 943 | 12/1883 | 09/1931 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1852 | 60 | 944 | 12/1883 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 1853 | 60 | 945 | 01/1884 | 12/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2321 | 62 | 966 | 01/1884 | 10/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2322 | 62 | 967 | 01/1884 | 11/06/1951 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2323 | 62 | 968 | 01/1884 | 30/06/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2324 | 62 | 969 | 02/1884 | 02/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2325 | 62 | 970 | 02/1884 | 30/11/1945 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2326 | 62 | 971 | 02/1884 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2327 | 62 | 972 | 02/1884 | 20/04/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2328 | 62 | 973 | 03/1884 | 09/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2329 | 62 | 974 | 03/1884 | 11/12/1933 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2330 | 62 | 975 | 03/1884 | 07/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2331 | 62 | 976 | 03/1884 | 03/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2332 | 62 | 977 | 04/1884 | 07/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2333 | 62 | 978 | 04/1884 | 11/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2334 | 62 | 979 | 05/1884 | 21/04/1921 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2335 | 62 | 980 | 05/1884 | 30/09/1933 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2336 | 62 | 981 | 05/1884 | 16/11/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2337 | 62 | 982 | 05/1884 | 11/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2338 | 62 | 983 | 06/1884 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2339 | 62 | 984 | 06/1884 | 17/03/1952 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2340 | 62 | 985 | 06/1884 | 04/06/1954 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2341 | 63 | 986 | 07/1884 | 03/11/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2342 | 63 | 987 | 08/1884 | 08/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2343 | 63 | 988 | 08/1884 | 24/02/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2344 | 63 | 989 | 08/1884 | 02/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2345 | 63 | 990 | 09/1884 | 03/05/1947 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2346 | 63 | 991 | 09/1884 | 09/1936 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2347 | 63 | 992 | 10/1884 | 04/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2348 | 63 | 993 | 10/1884 | 28/07/1945 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2349 | 63 | 994 | 11/1884 | 26/03/1952 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2350 | 63 | 995 | 11/1884 | 29/01/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2351 | 63 | 996 | 11/1884 | 20/02/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2352 | 63 | 997 | 11/1884 | 05/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2353 | 63 | 998 | 11/1884 | 12/1936 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2354 | 63 | 999 | 11/1884 | 27/04/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2355 | 63 | 1000 | 12/1884 | 03/1930 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2356 | 63 | 1001 | 12/1884 | 26/07/1948 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2357 | 63 | 1002 | 12/1884 | 07/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2358 | 63 | 1003 | 12/1884 | 16/11/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2359 | 63 | 1004 | 12/1884 | 12/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2360 | 63 | 1005 | 12/1884 | 22/02/1945 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3201 | 65 | 1026 | 12/1884 | 12/10/1933 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3501 | 64 | 1006 | 03/1885 | 05/1930 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3502 | 64 | 1007 | 03/1885 | 06/1925 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3503 | 64 | 1008 | 03/1885 | 07/1929 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3504 | 64 | 1009 | 03/1885 | 12/1925 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3505 | 64 | 1010 | 04/1885 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3506 | 64 | 1011 | 04/1885 | 09/1926 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3507 | 64 | 1012 | 04/1885 | 10/1929 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3508 | 64 | 1013 | 04/1885 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3509 | 64 | 1014 | 05/1885 | 05/1919 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3510 | 64 | 1015 | 05/1885 | 09/1928 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3511 | 64 | 1016 | 05/1885 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3512 | 64 | 1017 | 05/1885 | 03/1929 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3202 | 65 | 1027 | 06/1885 | 02/1929 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3203 | 65 | 1028 | 06/1885 | 08/1925 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3513 | 64 | 1018 | 06/1885 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3514 | 64 | 1019 | 06/1885 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3515 | 64 | 1020 | 07/1885 | 12/1930 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3516 | 64 | 1021 | 07/1885 | 12/1930 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3517 | 64 | 1022 | 07/1885 | 05/1919 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3204 | 65 | 1029 | 08/1885 | 05/1929 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3205 | 65 | 1030 | 08/1885 | 05/1919 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3518 | 64 | 1023 | 08/1885 | 09/1932 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3519 | 64 | 1024 | 08/1885 | 03/1925 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2361 | 67 | 1032 | 09/1885 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Stella | 2-4-0 | 3520 | 64 | 1025 | 09/1885 | 05/1919 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2362 | 67 | 1033 | 10/1885 | 07/11/1946 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2363 | 67 | 1034 | 11/1885 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2364 | 67 | 1035 | 11/1885 | 04/08/1934 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2365 | 67 | 1036 | 11/1885 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2366 | 67 | 1037 | 12/1885 | 01/02/1933 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2367 | 67 | 1038 | 12/1885 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2368 | 67 | 1039 | 12/1885 | 03/1938 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2369 | 67 | 1040 | 12/1885 | 11/1937 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2370 | 67 | 1041 | 12/1885 | 03/1935 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2371 | 67 | 1042 | 01/1886 | 03/1930 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2372 | 67 | 1043 | 01/1886 | 02/1938 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2373 | 67 | 1044 | 02/1886 | 03/11/1934 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2374 | 67 | 1045 | 03/1886 | 11/1930 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2375 | 67 | 1046 | 03/1886 | 05/1938 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2376 | 67 | 1047 | 03/1886 | 12/1938 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2377 | 67 | 1048 | 04/1886 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2378 | 67 | 1049 | 04/1886 | 17/03/1945 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2379 | 67 | 1050 | 04/1886 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2380 | 67 | 1051 | 05/1886 | 23/09/1943 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1661 | 69 | 1053 | 06/1886 | 02/1930 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1662 | 69 | 1054 | 06/1886 | 02/1930 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1663 | 69 | 1055 | 06/1886 | 10/1930 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1664 | 69 | 1056 | 06/1886 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1665 | 69 | 1057 | 07/1886 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1666 | 69 | 1058 | 07/1886 | 10/1927 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1667 | 69 | 1059 | 07/1886 | 08/1931 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1668 | 69 | 1060 | 07/1886 | 03/1911 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1669 | 69 | 1061 | 07/1886 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1670 | 69 | 1062 | 08/1886 | 01/1911 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1671 | 69 | 1063 | 08/1886 | 10/1927 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1672 | 69 | 1064 | 08/1886 | 05/1928 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1673 | 69 | 1065 | 09/1886 | 11/1928 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1674 | 69 | 1066 | 09/1886 | 01/1911 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1675 | 69 | 1067 | 09/1886 | 01/1929 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1676 | 69 | 1068 | 10/1886 | 10/1926 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1677 | 69 | 1069 | 10/1886 | 03/1915 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1678 | 69 | 1070 | 10/1886 | 10/1926 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1679 | 69 | 1071 | 11/1886 | 10/1926 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1680 | 69 | 1072 | 11/1886 | 10/1926 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1681 | 71 | 1074 | 11/1886 | 07/1927 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1682 | 71 | 1075 | 11/1886 | 12/1926 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1683 | 71 | 1076 | 12/1886 | 09/1926 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1684 | 71 | 1077 | 12/1886 | 05/1929 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1685 | 71 | 1078 | 12/1886 | 20/10/1934 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1686 | 71 | 1079 | 12/1886 | 01/1930 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1687 | 71 | 1080 | 01/1887 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1688 | 71 | 1081 | 01/1887 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1689 | 71 | 1082 | 01/1887 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1690 | 71 | 1083 | 02/1887 | 03/1928 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1691 | 71 | 1084 | 02/1887 | 11/1927 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1692 | 71 | 1085 | 02/1887 | 03/1911 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1693 | 71 | 1086 | 03/1887 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1694 | 71 | 1087 | 04/1887 | 12/1926 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1695 | 71 | 1088 | 04/1887 | 10/1927 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1696 | 71 | 1089 | 05/1887 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1697 | 71 | 1090 | 06/1887 | 05/1929 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1698 | 71 | 1091 | 06/1887 | 11/1927 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1699 | 71 | 1092 | 06/1887 | 09/1926 |
GWR | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1700 | 71 | 1093 | 06/1887 | 03/1930 |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3521 | 1095 | 08/1887 | 10/1931 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3522 | 1096 | 08/1887 | 01/1925 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3523 | 1097 | 08/1887 | 05/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3524 | 1098 | 09/1887 | 10/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3525 | 1099 | 09/1887 | 05/1929 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3526 | 1100 | 10/1887 | 10/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3527 | 1101 | 10/1887 | 04/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3528 | 1102 | 11/1887 | 07/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3529 | 1103 | 11/1887 | 04/1931 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3530 | 1104 | 11/1887 | 03/1922 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3531 | 1105 | 11/1887 | 11/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3532 | 1106 | 12/1887 | 03/1923 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3533 | 1107 | 12/1887 | 02/1929 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3534 | 1108 | 12/1887 | 10/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3535 | 1109 | 01/1888 | 12/1928 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3536 | 1110 | 01/1888 | 11/1926 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3537 | 1111 | 02/1888 | 09/1928 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3538 | 1112 | 02/1888 | 07/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3539 | 1113 | 03/1888 | 10/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3540 | 1114 | 03/1888 | 11/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3541 | 1117 | 09/1888 | 10/1913 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3542 | 1118 | 09/1888 | 03/1926 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3543 | 1119 | 09/1888 | 09/1928 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3544 | 1120 | 10/1888 | 02/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3545 | 1121 | 10/1888 | 04/1931 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3546 | 1122 | 10/1888 | 03/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3547 | 1123 | 10/1888 | 10/1927 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3548 | 1124 | 11/1888 | 08/1929 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3549 | 1125 | 11/1888 | 09/1928 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3550 | 1126 | 11/1888 | 10/1929 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3551 | 1127 | 11/1888 | 06/1929 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3552 | 1128 | 12/1888 | 01/1929 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3553 | 1129 | 12/1888 | 11/1928 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3554 | 1130 | 01/1889 | 06/1930 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3555 | 1131 | 01/1889 | 09/1929 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3556 | 1132 | 02/1889 | 10/1927 | |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3206 | 75 | 1137 | 02/1889 | 22/06/1934 |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3557 | 1133 | 03/1889 | 03/05/1934 | |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3207 | 75 | 1138 | 03/1889 | 20/06/1933 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3208 | 75 | 1139 | 04/1889 | 09/1926 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3209 | 75 | 1140 | 05/1889 | 03/1929 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3210 | 75 | 1141 | 05/1889 | 03/1937 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3211 | 75 | 1142 | 05/1889 | 03/11/1934 |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3558 | 1134 | 06/1889 | 09/1923 | |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3212 | 75 | 1143 | 06/1889 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 3559 | 1135 | 07/1889 | 11/1931 | |
GWR | 3521 0-4-4T | 0-4-4T | 3560 | 1136 | 07/1889 | 10/1923 | |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3213 | 75 | 1144 | 07/1889 | 06/1936 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3214 | 75 | 1145 | 07/1889 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3215 | 75 | 1146 | 07/1889 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3216 | 75 | 1147 | 08/1889 | 05/1936 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3217 | 75 | 1148 | 09/1889 | 10/1935 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3218 | 75 | 1149 | 10/1889 | 11/1930 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3219 | 75 | 1150 | 10/1889 | 01/1935 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3220 | 75 | 1151 | 11/1889 | 10/1927 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3221 | 75 | 1152 | 11/1889 | 29/08/1933 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3222 | 75 | 1153 | 11/1889 | 03/1937 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3223 | 75 | 1154 | 12/1889 | 05/1936 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3224 | 75 | 1155 | 12/1889 | 02/1926 |
GWR | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 3225 | 75 | 1156 | 12/1889 | 04/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2381 | 82 | 1181 | 06/1890 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2382 | 82 | 1182 | 06/1890 | 13/04/1950 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2383 | 82 | 1183 | 06/1890 | 08/08/1946 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2384 | 82 | 1184 | 06/1890 | 12/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2385 | 82 | 1185 | 07/1890 | 29/10/1951 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2386 | 82 | 1186 | 07/1890 | 06/12/1950 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2387 | 82 | 1187 | 07/1890 | 21/04/1921 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2388 | 82 | 1188 | 07/1890 | 06/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2389 | 82 | 1189 | 08/1890 | 29/07/1944 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2390 | 82 | 1190 | 08/1890 | 08/1937 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2391 | 82 | 1191 | 08/1890 | 06/12/1933 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2392 | 82 | 1192 | 08/1890 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2393 | 82 | 1193 | 09/1890 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2394 | 82 | 1194 | 09/1890 | 05/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2395 | 82 | 1195 | 09/1890 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2396 | 82 | 1196 | 09/1890 | 30/06/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2397 | 82 | 1197 | 10/1890 | 04/1935 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2398 | 82 | 1198 | 10/1890 | 12/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2399 | 82 | 1199 | 10/1890 | 12/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2400 | 82 | 1200 | 10/1890 | 10/1940 |
GWR | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1889 | 83 | 1216 | 01/1891 | 24/12/1948 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3021 | 86 | 1261 | 04/1891 | 05/1909 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3022 | 86 | 1262 | 05/1891 | 02/1909 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3023 | 86 | 1263 | 07/1891 | 09/1912 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3024 | 86 | 1264 | 07/1891 | 02/1909 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3025 | 86 | 1265 | 08/1891 | 09/1908 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3026 | 86 | 1266 | 08/1891 | 02/1909 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3027 | 86 | 1267 | 08/1891 | 07/1914 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3028 | 86 | 1268 | 08/1891 | 02/1909 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2401 | 87 | 1271 | 10/1891 | 09/01/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2402 | 87 | 1272 | 10/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2403 | 87 | 1273 | 10/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2404 | 87 | 1274 | 10/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2405 | 87 | 1275 | 11/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2406 | 87 | 1276 | 11/1891 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2407 | 87 | 1277 | 11/1891 | 21/01/1952 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2408 | 87 | 1278 | 11/1891 | 12/01/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2409 | 87 | 1279 | 11/1891 | 22/04/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2410 | 87 | 1280 | 11/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2411 | 87 | 1281 | 11/1891 | 14/04/1954 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2412 | 87 | 1282 | 11/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2413 | 87 | 1283 | 11/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3029 | 86 | 1269 | 11/1891 | 05/1909 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2414 | 87 | 1284 | 12/1891 | 23/03/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2415 | 87 | 1285 | 12/1891 | 12/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2416 | 87 | 1286 | 12/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2417 | 87 | 1287 | 12/1891 | 02/1939 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2418 | 87 | 1288 | 12/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2419 | 87 | 1289 | 12/1891 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2420 | 87 | 1290 | 12/1891 | 21/04/1921 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2421 | 87 | 1291 | 12/1891 | 05/1938 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3030 | 86 | 1270 | 12/1891 | 05/1909 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2422 | 87 | 1292 | 01/1892 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2423 | 87 | 1293 | 01/1892 | 12/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2424 | 87 | 1294 | 01/1892 | 22/07/1946 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2425 | 87 | 1295 | 01/1892 | 12/1940 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3001 | 84 | 1221 | 01/1892 | 06/1908 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3002 | 84 | 1222 | 01/1892 | 09/1908 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2426 | 87 | 1296 | 02/1892 | 14/12/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2427 | 87 | 1297 | 02/1892 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2428 | 87 | 1298 | 02/1892 | 10/1940 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3003 | 84 | 1223 | 02/1892 | 02/1909 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3004 | 84 | 1224 | 02/1892 | 10/1911 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3005 | 84 | 1225 | 02/1892 | 02/1908 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2429 | 87 | 1299 | 03/1892 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2430 | 87 | 1300 | 03/1892 | 10/1940 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3006 | 84 | 1226 | 03/1892 | 02/1914 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3007 | 84 | 1227 | 03/1892 | 03/1912 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3008 | 84 | 1228 | 03/1892 | 08/1912 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3009 | 84 | 1229 | 03/1892 | 02/1914 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3010 | 84 | 1230 | 03/1892 | 09/1908 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3011 | 84 | 1231 | 03/1892 | 09/1911 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3012 | 84 | 1232 | 03/1892 | 05/1909 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3013 | 84 | 1233 | 03/1892 | 02/1914 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3014 | 84 | 1234 | 04/1892 | 06/1908 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3015 | 84 | 1235 | 04/1892 | 06/1908 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3016 | 84 | 1236 | 04/1892 | 03/1911 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3017 | 84 | 1237 | 04/1892 | 09/1908 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3018 | 84 | 1238 | 04/1892 | 06/1913 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3019 | 84 | 1239 | 04/1892 | 09/1908 |
GWR | 3021 | 2-2-2 | 3020 | 84 | 1240 | 04/1892 | 02/1908 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1491 | 91 | 1351 | 06/1892 | 03/1930 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1492 | 91 | 1352 | 06/1892 | 02/1935 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1493 | 91 | 1353 | 07/1892 | 05/1935 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1494 | 91 | 1354 | 07/1892 | 12/1937 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1495 | 91 | 1355 | 08/1892 | 12/1938 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1496 | 91 | 1356 | 08/1892 | 10/1935 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1497 | 91 | 1357 | 08/1892 | 06/1938 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1498 | 91 | 1358 | 08/1892 | 07/09/1944 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1499 | 91 | 1359 | 09/1892 | 24/05/1946 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1500 | 91 | 1360 | 09/1892 | 09/1937 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3232 | 90 | 1341 | 09/1892 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3233 | 90 | 1342 | 09/1892 | 10/1925 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3234 | 90 | 1343 | 09/1892 | 12/1926 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3235 | 90 | 1344 | 10/1892 | 03/1926 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3236 | 90 | 1345 | 10/1892 | 10/1926 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3237 | 90 | 1346 | 10/1892 | 03/1928 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3238 | 90 | 1347 | 11/1892 | 05/1928 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3239 | 90 | 1348 | 11/1892 | 03/1925 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3240 | 90 | 1349 | 11/1892 | 11/1928 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3241 | 90 | 1350 | 11/1892 | 04/1927 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2431 | 92 | 1361 | 02/1893 | 26/11/1951 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2432 | 92 | 1362 | 03/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2433 | 92 | 1363 | 03/1893 | 12/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2434 | 92 | 1364 | 03/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2435 | 92 | 1365 | 03/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2436 | 92 | 1366 | 03/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2437 | 92 | 1367 | 04/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2438 | 92 | 1368 | 04/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2439 | 92 | 1369 | 04/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2440 | 92 | 1370 | 04/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2441 | 92 | 1371 | 04/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2442 | 92 | 1372 | 05/1893 | 12/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2443 | 92 | 1373 | 05/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2444 | 92 | 1374 | 05/1893 | 05/11/1952 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2445 | 92 | 1375 | 05/1893 | 27/03/1953 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3242 | 93 | 1381 | 05/1893 | 10/1926 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3243 | 93 | 1382 | 05/1893 | 08/1918 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2446 | 92 | 1376 | 06/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2447 | 92 | 1377 | 06/1893 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2448 | 92 | 1378 | 06/1893 | 01/1907 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3244 | 93 | 1383 | 06/1893 | 09/1926 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3245 | 93 | 1384 | 06/1893 | 09/1926 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3246 | 93 | 1385 | 06/1893 | 09/1926 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3247 | 93 | 1386 | 06/1893 | 10/1925 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2449 | 92 | 1379 | 07/1893 | 08/01/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2450 | 92 | 1380 | 07/1893 | 05/1938 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3248 | 93 | 1387 | 07/1893 | 09/1923 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3249 | 93 | 1388 | 07/1893 | 02/1925 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3250 | 93 | 1389 | 07/1893 | 02/1925 |
GWR | 3232 | 2-4-0 | 3251 | 93 | 1390 | 07/1893 | 04/1930 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3561 | 96 | 1421 | 01/1894 | 21/10/1949 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3562 | 96 | 1422 | 02/1894 | 28/02/1949 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3563 | 96 | 1423 | 02/1894 | 22/12/1944 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3564 | 96 | 1424 | 03/1894 | 14/01/1944 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3565 | 96 | 1425 | 03/1894 | 06/1936 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3566 | 96 | 1426 | 03/1894 | 04/1938 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3031 | 94 | 1391 | 03/1894 | 07/1912 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3567 | 96 | 1427 | 04/1894 | 09/1936 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3568 | 96 | 1428 | 04/1894 | 14/11/1945 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3569 | 96 | 1429 | 04/1894 | 03/1936 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3570 | 96 | 1430 | 04/1894 | 12/1938 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3032 | 94 | 1392 | 07/1894 | 10/1913 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3033 | 94 | 1393 | 07/1894 | 07/1911 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3034 | 94 | 1394 | 07/1894 | 10/1908 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3035 | 94 | 1395 | 07/1894 | 05/1909 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3036 | 94 | 1396 | 09/1894 | 03/1911 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3037 | 94 | 1397 | 09/1894 | 10/1908 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3038 | 94 | 1398 | 09/1894 | 10/1908 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3039 | 94 | 1399 | 09/1894 | 07/1915 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3040 | 94 | 1400 | 09/1894 | 03/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3041 | 95 | 1401 | 10/1894 | 11/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3042 | 95 | 1402 | 10/1894 | 01/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3043 | 95 | 1403 | 01/1895 | 12/1913 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3044 | 95 | 1404 | 01/1895 | 10/1908 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3045 | 95 | 1405 | 01/1895 | 05/1914 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3046 | 95 | 1406 | 01/1895 | 10/1908 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3047 | 95 | 1407 | 02/1895 | 11/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3048 | 95 | 1408 | 02/1895 | 06/1913 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3049 | 95 | 1409 | 02/1895 | 07/1913 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3050 | 95 | 1410 | 02/1895 | 12/1915 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3051 | 95 | 1411 | 02/1895 | 11/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3052 | 95 | 1412 | 03/1895 | 09/1913 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3053 | 95 | 1413 | 03/1895 | 09/1911 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3054 | 95 | 1414 | 03/1895 | 10/1911 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3055 | 95 | 1415 | 03/1895 | 02/1914 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3056 | 95 | 1416 | 03/1895 | 10/1914 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3057 | 95 | 1417 | 04/1895 | 09/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3058 | 95 | 1418 | 04/1895 | 02/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3059 | 95 | 1419 | 04/1895 | 06/1913 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3060 | 95 | 1420 | 04/1895 | 03/1915 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3252 | 97 | 1431 | 05/1895 | 08/1937 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3253 | 97 | 1432 | 05/1895 | 01/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3254 | 101 | 1493 | 07/1895 | 01/1939 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3255 | 101 | 1494 | 07/1895 | 01/06/1950 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3256 | 101 | 1495 | 08/1895 | 06/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3257 | 101 | 1496 | 08/1895 | 08/1939 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3258 | 101 | 1497 | 08/1895 | 05/1937 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3259 | 101 | 1498 | 09/1895 | 02/1938 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3260 | 101 | 1499 | 09/1895 | 10/1938 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3261 | 101 | 1500 | 09/1895 | 04/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2451 | 99 | 1453 | 10/1895 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2452 | 99 | 1454 | 10/1895 | 27/10/1952 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2453 | 99 | 1455 | 11/1895 | 06/08/1921 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2454 | 99 | 1456 | 11/1895 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2455 | 99 | 1457 | 11/1895 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2456 | 99 | 1458 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2457 | 99 | 1459 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2458 | 99 | 1460 | 12/1895 | 11/05/1954 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2459 | 99 | 1461 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2460 | 99 | 1462 | 12/1895 | 14/04/1954 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2461 | 99 | 1463 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2462 | 99 | 1464 | 12/1895 | 16/01/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2463 | 99 | 1465 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2464 | 99 | 1466 | 01/1896 | 19/12/1949 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2465 | 99 | 1467 | 01/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2466 | 99 | 1468 | 01/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2467 | 99 | 1469 | 01/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2468 | 99 | 1470 | 02/1896 | 12/01/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2469 | 99 | 1471 | 02/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2470 | 99 | 1472 | 02/1896 | 12/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2471 | 100 | 1473 | 02/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2472 | 100 | 1474 | 03/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2473 | 100 | 1475 | 03/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2474 | 100 | 1476 | 03/1896 | 27/04/1955 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2475 | 100 | 1477 | 03/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2476 | 100 | 1478 | 04/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2477 | 100 | 1479 | 04/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2478 | 100 | 1480 | 04/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2479 | 100 | 1481 | 04/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3262 | 102 | 1501 | 04/1896 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3263 | 102 | 1502 | 04/1896 | 07/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2480 | 100 | 1482 | 05/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2481 | 100 | 1483 | 05/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2482 | 100 | 1484 | 05/1896 | 22/12/1952 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2483 | 100 | 1485 | 05/1896 | 19/09/1952 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3264 | 102 | 1503 | 05/1896 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3265 | 102 | 1504 | 05/1896 | 04/1937 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3266 | 102 | 1505 | 05/1896 | 09/1937 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2484 | 100 | 1486 | 06/1896 | 13/05/1954 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2485 | 100 | 1487 | 06/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2486 | 100 | 1488 | 06/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3267 | 102 | 1506 | 06/1896 | 03/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3268 | 102 | 1507 | 06/1896 | 17/11/1934 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3269 | 102 | 1508 | 06/1896 | 09/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3270 | 102 | 1509 | 06/1896 | 15/12/1949 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2487 | 100 | 1489 | 07/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2488 | 100 | 1490 | 07/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2489 | 100 | 1491 | 07/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2490 | 100 | 1492 | 07/1896 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3271 | 102 | 1510 | 07/1896 | 23/12/1949 |
GWR | Crocodile | 4-6-0 | 36 | 106 | 1551 | 08/1896 | 12/1905 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2491 | 104 | 1511 | 08/1896 | 14/05/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2492 | 104 | 1512 | 08/1896 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2493 | 104 | 1513 | 08/1896 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2494 | 104 | 1514 | 08/1896 | 16/11/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2495 | 104 | 1515 | 08/1896 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3272 | 105 | 1531 | 08/1896 | 03/1938 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2496 | 104 | 1516 | 09/1896 | 10/03/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2497 | 104 | 1517 | 09/1896 | 09/1930 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2498 | 104 | 1518 | 09/1896 | 08/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2499 | 104 | 1519 | 09/1896 | 08/1930 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2500 | 104 | 1520 | 09/1896 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2501 | 104 | 1521 | 10/1896 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2502 | 104 | 1522 | 10/1896 | 02/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2503 | 104 | 1523 | 10/1896 | 06/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2504 | 104 | 1524 | 10/1896 | 19/10/1933 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2505 | 104 | 1525 | 10/1896 | 10/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2506 | 104 | 1526 | 11/1896 | 06/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2507 | 104 | 1527 | 11/1896 | 10/1930 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2508 | 104 | 1528 | 11/1896 | 14/09/1934 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2509 | 104 | 1529 | 11/1896 | 07/1932 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3273 | 105 | 1532 | 11/1896 | 01/1939 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3274 | 105 | 1533 | 11/1896 | 10/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3275 | 105 | 1534 | 11/1896 | 03/1939 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2510 | 104 | 1530 | 12/1896 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3276 | 105 | 1535 | 12/1896 | 03/1937 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3277 | 105 | 1536 | 01/1897 | 04/1939 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3278 | 105 | 1537 | 01/1897 | 06/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3279 | 105 | 1538 | 01/1897 | 10/02/1934 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3280 | 105 | 1539 | 01/1897 | 08/1938 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3281 | 105 | 1540 | 01/1897 | 17/06/1949 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2511 | 107 | 1552 | 02/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2512 | 107 | 1553 | 02/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2513 | 107 | 1554 | 02/1897 | 01/07/1955 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3282 | 105 | 1541 | 02/1897 | 02/06/1934 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3283 | 105 | 1542 | 02/1897 | 08/12/1949 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3284 | 105 | 1543 | 02/1897 | 11/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3285 | 105 | 1544 | 02/1897 | 05/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3286 | 105 | 1545 | 02/1897 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2514 | 107 | 1555 | 03/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2515 | 107 | 1556 | 03/1897 | 05/02/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2516 | 107 | 1557 | 03/1897 | 28/05/1956 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3287 | 105 | 1546 | 03/1897 | 22/11/1949 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3288 | 105 | 1547 | 03/1897 | 01/1937 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3289 | 105 | 1548 | 03/1897 | 12/1938 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3290 | 105 | 1549 | 03/1897 | 10/1938 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3291 | 105 | 1550 | 03/1897 | 05/1939 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2517 | 107 | 1558 | 04/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2518 | 107 | 1559 | 04/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2519 | 107 | 1560 | 04/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2520 | 107 | 1561 | 04/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2521 | 107 | 1562 | 05/1897 | 12/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2522 | 107 | 1563 | 05/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2523 | 107 | 1564 | 05/1897 | 13/09/1949 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2524 | 107 | 1565 | 05/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2525 | 107 | 1566 | 05/1897 | 22/12/1945 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2526 | 107 | 1567 | 05/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3061 | 110 | 1612 | 05/1897 | 12/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3062 | 110 | 1613 | 05/1897 | 04/1915 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2527 | 107 | 1568 | 06/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2528 | 107 | 1569 | 06/1897 | 12/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2529 | 107 | 1570 | 06/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2530 | 107 | 1571 | 06/1897 | 20/10/1945 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2531 | 108 | 1572 | 06/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2532 | 108 | 1573 | 06/1897 | 11/05/1954 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3063 | 110 | 1614 | 06/1897 | 01/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3064 | 110 | 1615 | 06/1897 | 09/1911 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2533 | 108 | 1574 | 07/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2534 | 108 | 1575 | 07/1897 | 01/01/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2535 | 108 | 1576 | 07/1897 | 13/06/1946 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2536 | 108 | 1577 | 07/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2537 | 108 | 1578 | 07/1897 | 20/01/1953 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3065 | 110 | 1616 | 07/1897 | 10/1914 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2538 | 108 | 1579 | 08/1897 | 15/05/1957 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2539 | 108 | 1580 | 08/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2540 | 108 | 1581 | 08/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2541 | 108 | 1582 | 08/1897 | 04/06/1954 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2542 | 108 | 1583 | 08/1897 | 21/04/1921 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2543 | 108 | 1584 | 08/1897 | 04/02/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2544 | 108 | 1585 | 09/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2545 | 108 | 1586 | 09/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2546 | 108 | 1587 | 09/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2547 | 108 | 1588 | 09/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2548 | 108 | 1589 | 09/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2549 | 108 | 1590 | 09/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2550 | 108 | 1591 | 09/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2551 | 111 | 1632 | 11/1897 | 22/09/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2552 | 111 | 1633 | 11/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2553 | 111 | 1634 | 11/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2554 | 111 | 1635 | 11/1897 | 14/11/1945 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2555 | 111 | 1636 | 11/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2556 | 111 | 1637 | 11/1897 | 29/06/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2557 | 111 | 1638 | 11/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2721 | 112 | 1662 | 11/1897 | 17/08/1950 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2558 | 111 | 1639 | 12/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2559 | 111 | 1640 | 12/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2560 | 111 | 1641 | 12/1897 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3292 | 109 | 1592 | 12/1897 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3066 | 110 | 1617 | 12/1897 | 10/1913 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3067 | 110 | 1618 | 12/1897 | 12/1914 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2561 | 111 | 1642 | 01/1898 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2562 | 111 | 1643 | 01/1898 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2563 | 111 | 1644 | 01/1898 | 21/04/1921 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2564 | 111 | 1645 | 01/1898 | 01/09/1945 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3068 | 110 | 1619 | 01/1898 | 11/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3069 | 110 | 1620 | 01/1898 | 06/1912 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2565 | 111 | 1646 | 02/1898 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2566 | 111 | 1647 | 02/1898 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2567 | 111 | 1648 | 02/1898 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2568 | 111 | 1649 | 02/1898 | 18/05/1953 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3070 | 110 | 1621 | 02/1898 | 10/1914 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3071 | 110 | 1622 | 02/1898 | 10/1914 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2722 | 112 | 1663 | 03/1898 | 27/11/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2723 | 112 | 1664 | 03/1898 | 14/08/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2724 | 112 | 1665 | 03/1898 | 14/02/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2725 | 112 | 1666 | 03/1898 | 05/01/1946 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2569 | 111 | 1650 | 04/1898 | 04/10/1948 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2570 | 111 | 1651 | 04/1898 | 17/01/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2726 | 112 | 1667 | 04/1898 | 02/08/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2727 | 112 | 1668 | 04/1898 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3293 | 109 | 1593 | 04/1898 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2728 | 112 | 1669 | 05/1898 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2729 | 112 | 1670 | 05/1898 | 04/03/1946 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2730 | 112 | 1671 | 05/1898 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2731 | 112 | 1672 | 05/1898 | 29/10/1947 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3294 | 109 | 1594 | 05/1898 | 09/1928 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3295 | 109 | 1595 | 05/1898 | 04/1930 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3296 | 109 | 1596 | 05/1898 | 06/1929 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3297 | 109 | 1597 | 05/1898 | 11/1927 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2732 | 112 | 1673 | 06/1898 | 19/10/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2733 | 112 | 1674 | 06/1898 | 04/11/1947 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3298 | 109 | 1598 | 06/1898 | 08/1929 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3299 | 109 | 1599 | 06/1898 | 02/1930 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3072 | 110 | 1623 | 06/1898 | 08/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3073 | 110 | 1624 | 06/1898 | 10/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3074 | 110 | 1625 | 06/1898 | 12/1915 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2734 | 112 | 1675 | 07/1898 | 02/08/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2735 | 112 | 1676 | 07/1898 | 27/08/1947 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3300 | 109 | 1600 | 07/1898 | 03/1930 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3301 | 109 | 1601 | 07/1898 | 03/1931 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3302 | 109 | 1602 | 07/1898 | 10/1928 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3303 | 109 | 1603 | 07/1898 | 10/1928 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3075 | 110 | 1626 | 07/1898 | 06/1912 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2736 | 112 | 1677 | 08/1898 | 02/08/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2737 | 112 | 1678 | 08/1898 | 14/11/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2738 | 112 | 1679 | 08/1898 | 13/12/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2739 | 112 | 1680 | 09/1898 | 10/05/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2740 | 112 | 1681 | 09/1898 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3304 | 109 | 1604 | 09/1898 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3305 | 109 | 1605 | 09/1898 | 05/1931 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3306 | 109 | 1606 | 09/1898 | 07/1927 |
GWR | 1490 | 4-4-0PT | 1490 | 114 | 1702 | 10/1898 | 11/1907 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2571 | 111 | 1652 | 10/1898 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3312 | 113 | 1682 | 10/1898 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2572 | 111 | 1653 | 11/1898 | 22/12/1952 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2573 | 111 | 1654 | 11/1898 | 03/02/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2574 | 111 | 1655 | 11/1898 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3307 | 109 | 1607 | 11/1898 | 03/1931 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2575 | 111 | 1656 | 12/1898 | 28/02/1947 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2576 | 111 | 1657 | 12/1898 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3308 | 109 | 1608 | 12/1898 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3309 | 109 | 1609 | 12/1898 | 10/1927 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2577 | 111 | 1658 | 01/1899 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2578 | 111 | 1659 | 01/1899 | 07/09/1953 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2579 | 111 | 1660 | 01/1899 | 04/01/1954 |
GWR | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2580 | 111 | 1661 | 01/1899 | 10/1940 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3310 | 109 | 1610 | 01/1899 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Badminton | 4-4-0 | 3311 | 109 | 1611 | 01/1899 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3581 | 117 | 1733 | 01/1899 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3582 | 117 | 1734 | 02/1899 | 08/11/1949 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3583 | 117 | 1735 | 02/1899 | 27/12/1947 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3076 | 110 | 1627 | 02/1899 | 07/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3077 | 110 | 1628 | 02/1899 | 11/1912 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3078 | 110 | 1629 | 02/1899 | 11/1911 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3079 | 110 | 1630 | 02/1899 | 09/1911 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3313 | 113 | 1683 | 03/1899 | 02/1937 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3314 | 113 | 1684 | 03/1899 | 10/1937 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3315 | 113 | 1685 | 03/1899 | 27/12/1950 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3316 | 113 | 1686 | 03/1899 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3080 | 110 | 1631 | 03/1899 | 10/1913 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2741 | 115 | 1703 | 04/1899 | 19/10/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2742 | 115 | 1704 | 04/1899 | 24/10/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2743 | 115 | 1705 | 04/1899 | 02/10/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2744 | 115 | 1706 | 04/1899 | 08/11/1950 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3317 | 113 | 1687 | 04/1899 | 03/05/1951 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3318 | 113 | 1688 | 04/1899 | 04/04/1946 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3319 | 113 | 1689 | 04/1899 | 01/1937 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3320 | 113 | 1690 | 04/1899 | 04/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3321 | 113 | 1691 | 04/1899 | 18/07/1949 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3322 | 113 | 1692 | 04/1899 | 16/11/1934 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3584 | 117 | 1736 | 04/1899 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2745 | 115 | 1707 | 05/1899 | 30/01/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2746 | 115 | 1708 | 05/1899 | 10/07/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2747 | 115 | 1709 | 05/1899 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2748 | 115 | 1710 | 05/1899 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2749 | 115 | 1711 | 05/1899 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3585 | 117 | 1737 | 05/1899 | 31/01/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2750 | 115 | 1712 | 06/1899 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2751 | 115 | 1713 | 06/1899 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2752 | 115 | 1714 | 06/1899 | 01/03/1948 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3323 | 113 | 1693 | 06/1899 | 03/1936 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3324 | 113 | 1694 | 06/1899 | 06/1931 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3325 | 113 | 1695 | 06/1899 | 04/1938 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3586 | 117 | 1738 | 06/1899 | 08/11/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2753 | 115 | 1715 | 07/1899 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2754 | 115 | 1716 | 07/1899 | 02/10/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2755 | 115 | 1717 | 07/1899 | 16/08/1948 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3326 | 113 | 1696 | 07/1899 | 13/07/1951 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3327 | 113 | 1697 | 07/1899 | 03/1931 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3328 | 113 | 1698 | 07/1899 | 01/1939 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3329 | 113 | 1699 | 07/1899 | 01/02/1949 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3330 | 113 | 1700 | 07/1899 | 10/02/1934 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2756 | 115 | 1718 | 08/1899 | 17/05/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2757 | 115 | 1719 | 08/1899 | 03/02/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2758 | 115 | 1720 | 08/1899 | 15/12/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2759 | 115 | 1721 | 08/1899 | 19/10/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2760 | 115 | 1722 | 08/1899 | 23/10/1950 |
GWR | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3331 | 113 | 1701 | 08/1899 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3587 | 117 | 1739 | 08/1899 | 09/12/1944 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3588 | 117 | 1740 | 08/1899 | 19/12/1949 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3589 | 117 | 1741 | 09/1899 | 16/08/1948 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3591 | 119 | 1763 | 09/1899 | 05/1936 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3592 | 119 | 1764 | 09/1899 | 04/04/1949 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3593 | 119 | 1765 | 09/1899 | 11/1927 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3352 | 120 | 1773 | 10/1899 | 02/06/1934 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3590 | 117 | 1742 | 10/1899 | 07/04/1944 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3594 | 119 | 1766 | 10/1899 | 03/05/1947 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3595 | 119 | 1767 | 10/1899 | 20/01/1945 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3596 | 119 | 1768 | 10/1899 | 22/03/1945 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3597 | 119 | 1769 | 10/1899 | 30/08/1948 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3598 | 119 | 1770 | 10/1899 | 10/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3332 | 118 | 1743 | 11/1899 | 08/1929 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3333 | 118 | 1744 | 11/1899 | 04/1935 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3334 | 118 | 1745 | 11/1899 | 03/1935 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3335 | 118 | 1746 | 11/1899 | 08/1935 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3599 | 119 | 1771 | 11/1899 | 17/10/1949 |
GWR | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3600 | 119 | 1772 | 11/1899 | 04/1942 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3336 | 118 | 1747 | 12/1899 | 06/1935 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3337 | 118 | 1748 | 12/1899 | 09/1935 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2601 | 116 | 1723 | 12/1899 | 12/1904 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3338 | 118 | 1749 | 01/1900 | 24/11/1933 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3339 | 118 | 1750 | 01/1900 | 03/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3340 | 118 | 1751 | 01/1900 | 04/04/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3341 | 118 | 1752 | 01/1900 | 05/1932 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3342 | 118 | 1753 | 02/1900 | 08/1938 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3343 | 118 | 1754 | 02/1900 | 03/02/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3344 | 118 | 1755 | 02/1900 | 10/1931 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3345 | 118 | 1756 | 02/1900 | 10/1932 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3346 | 118 | 1757 | 02/1900 | 04/1930 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3347 | 118 | 1758 | 02/1900 | 04/10/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2761 | 122 | 1776 | 03/1900 | 10/03/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2762 | 122 | 1777 | 03/1900 | 15/07/1946 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2763 | 122 | 1778 | 03/1900 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2764 | 122 | 1779 | 03/1900 | 10/07/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2765 | 122 | 1780 | 03/1900 | 30/11/1945 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3348 | 118 | 1759 | 03/1900 | 01/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3349 | 118 | 1760 | 03/1900 | 24/05/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3350 | 118 | 1761 | 03/1900 | 04/11/1933 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3351 | 118 | 1762 | 03/1900 | 04/1936 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3373 | 125 | 1826 | 04/1900 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3374 | 125 | 1827 | 04/1900 | 12/1928 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3375 | 125 | 1828 | 04/1900 | 10/1928 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3376 | 125 | 1829 | 04/1900 | 11/1928 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3353 | 124 | 1806 | 05/1900 | 22/11/1949 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3377 | 125 | 1830 | 05/1900 | 04/1930 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3378 | 125 | 1831 | 05/1900 | 04/1927 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3379 | 125 | 1832 | 05/1900 | 10/1927 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3380 | 125 | 1833 | 05/1900 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3381 | 125 | 1834 | 05/1900 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3382 | 125 | 1835 | 05/1900 | 09/1911 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3355 | 124 | 1808 | 06/1900 | 28/03/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3356 | 124 | 1809 | 06/1900 | 13/01/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3357 | 124 | 1810 | 06/1900 | 01/1936 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3383 | 125 | 1836 | 07/1900 | 11/1928 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3384 | 125 | 1837 | 07/1900 | 04/1930 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3385 | 125 | 1838 | 07/1900 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 33 | 128 | 1886 | 08/1900 | 04/02/1936 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2766 | 122 | 1781 | 08/1900 | 14/11/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2767 | 122 | 1782 | 08/1900 | 10/01/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3354 | 124 | 1807 | 08/1900 | 10/1938 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3386 | 125 | 1839 | 08/1900 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3387 | 125 | 1840 | 08/1900 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3388 | 125 | 1841 | 08/1900 | 10/1927 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3389 | 125 | 1842 | 08/1900 | 11/1927 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3390 | 125 | 1843 | 08/1900 | 10/1927 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2768 | 122 | 1783 | 09/1900 | 23/10/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2769 | 122 | 1784 | 09/1900 | 14/03/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2770 | 122 | 1785 | 09/1900 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2771 | 122 | 1786 | 09/1900 | 12/06/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2772 | 122 | 1787 | 09/1900 | 24/11/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2773 | 122 | 1788 | 09/1900 | 03/10/1946 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2774 | 122 | 1789 | 09/1900 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3391 | 125 | 1844 | 09/1900 | 10/1928 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3392 | 125 | 1845 | 09/1900 | 11/1929 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2775 | 122 | 1790 | 10/1900 | 31/07/1946 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2776 | 122 | 1791 | 10/1900 | 10/04/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2777 | 122 | 1792 | 10/1900 | 31/05/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2778 | 122 | 1793 | 10/1900 | 07/07/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2779 | 122 | 1794 | 10/1900 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2780 | 122 | 1795 | 10/1900 | 10/07/1950 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3358 | 124 | 1811 | 10/1900 | 02/01/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3359 | 124 | 1812 | 10/1900 | 08/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3360 | 124 | 1813 | 10/1900 | 16/11/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3361 | 124 | 1814 | 10/1900 | 16/11/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3362 | 124 | 1815 | 11/1900 | 07/1935 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3363 | 124 | 1816 | 11/1900 | 03/1931 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3364 | 124 | 1817 | 11/1900 | 04/11/1933 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3365 | 124 | 1818 | 11/1900 | 07/12/1946 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3366 | 124 | 1819 | 11/1900 | 16/11/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3367 | 124 | 1820 | 11/1900 | 13/01/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3368 | 124 | 1821 | 11/1900 | 01/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3369 | 124 | 1822 | 11/1900 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 11 | 130 | 1907 | 12/1900 | 12/06/1933 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3370 | 124 | 1823 | 12/1900 | 30/11/1945 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3371 | 124 | 1824 | 12/1900 | 09/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3372 | 124 | 1825 | 12/1900 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2781 | 129 | 1887 | 01/1901 | 07/06/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2782 | 129 | 1888 | 01/1901 | 06/02/1946 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2783 | 129 | 1889 | 01/1901 | 15/11/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2784 | 129 | 1890 | 01/1901 | 07/05/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2785 | 129 | 1891 | 01/1901 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2786 | 129 | 1892 | 01/1901 | 08/12/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2787 | 129 | 1893 | 01/1901 | 02/12/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2788 | 129 | 1894 | 01/1901 | 18/06/1947 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2789 | 129 | 1895 | 02/1901 | 09/05/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2790 | 129 | 1896 | 02/1901 | 05/06/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2791 | 129 | 1897 | 02/1901 | 10/04/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2792 | 129 | 1898 | 02/1901 | 01/06/1950 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2793 | 129 | 1899 | 02/1901 | 17/01/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2794 | 129 | 1900 | 02/1901 | 30/11/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2795 | 129 | 1901 | 02/1901 | 25/01/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2796 | 129 | 1902 | 02/1901 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2621 | 131 | 1908 | 03/1901 | 21/09/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2622 | 131 | 1909 | 03/1901 | 28/06/1946 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2800 | 129 | 1906 | 03/1901 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2797 | 129 | 1903 | 03/1901 | 07/06/1948 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2798 | 129 | 1904 | 03/1901 | 02/11/1949 |
GWR | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2799 | 129 | 1905 | 03/1901 | 10/03/1950 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2623 | 131 | 1910 | 04/1901 | 18/02/1948 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2624 | 131 | 1911 | 04/1901 | 06/12/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2625 | 131 | 1912 | 04/1901 | 01/09/1945 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2626 | 131 | 1913 | 04/1901 | 24/04/1937 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2627 | 131 | 1914 | 04/1901 | 21/09/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2628 | 131 | 1915 | 04/1901 | 30/08/1935 |
GWR | Crane Tank | 0-6-4PT | 17 | 121 | 1774 | 04/1901 | 09/1936 |
GWR | Crane Tank | 0-6-4PT | 18 | 121 | 1775 | 04/1901 | 09/1936 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2629 | 131 | 1916 | 05/1901 | 14/12/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2630 | 131 | 1917 | 05/1901 | 09/10/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2631 | 131 | 1918 | 05/1901 | 27/09/1947 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2632 | 131 | 1919 | 05/1901 | 06/09/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2633 | 131 | 1920 | 05/1901 | 27/09/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2634 | 131 | 1921 | 05/1901 | 29/11/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2635 | 131 | 1922 | 06/1901 | 30/08/1947 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2636 | 131 | 1923 | 06/1901 | 29/07/1946 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2637 | 131 | 1924 | 06/1901 | 15/09/1947 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2638 | 131 | 1925 | 06/1901 | 19/10/1945 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2639 | 131 | 1926 | 06/1901 | 15/05/1946 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2640 | 131 | 1927 | 06/1901 | 12/06/1947 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3393 | 126 | 1846 | 06/1901 | 09/1928 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3394 | 126 | 1847 | 06/1901 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2602 | 116 | 1724 | 06/1901 | 02/1906 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3395 | 126 | 1848 | 07/1901 | 02/1930 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3396 | 126 | 1849 | 07/1901 | 10/1928 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3397 | 126 | 1850 | 08/1901 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3398 | 126 | 1851 | 08/1901 | 11/1927 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3399 | 126 | 1852 | 08/1901 | 12/1930 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3400 | 126 | 1853 | 08/1901 | 11/1929 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3401 | 126 | 1854 | 08/1901 | 08/1928 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3402 | 126 | 1855 | 08/1901 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3403 | 126 | 1856 | 09/1901 | 08/1929 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3404 | 126 | 1857 | 09/1901 | 09/1928 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3405 | 126 | 1858 | 09/1901 | 09/1928 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3406 | 126 | 1859 | 09/1901 | 06/1929 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3407 | 126 | 1860 | 09/1901 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2641 | 133 | 1929 | 10/1901 | 29/09/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2642 | 133 | 1930 | 10/1901 | 03/06/1939 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2643 | 133 | 1931 | 10/1901 | 26/07/1948 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2644 | 133 | 1932 | 10/1901 | 16/10/1935 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3408 | 126 | 1861 | 10/1901 | 10/1929 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3409 | 126 | 1862 | 10/1901 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3410 | 126 | 1863 | 10/1901 | 10/1927 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3411 | 126 | 1864 | 10/1901 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Atbara | 4-4-0 | 3412 | 126 | 1865 | 10/1901 | 05/1931 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2645 | 133 | 1933 | 11/1901 | 14/12/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2646 | 133 | 1934 | 11/1901 | 01/10/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2647 | 133 | 1935 | 11/1901 | 01/12/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2648 | 133 | 1936 | 11/1901 | 17/02/1944 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2649 | 133 | 1937 | 11/1901 | 08/08/1946 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2650 | 133 | 1938 | 11/1901 | 30/05/1936 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2651 | 133 | 1939 | 12/1901 | 06/06/1949 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2652 | 133 | 1940 | 12/1901 | 24/08/1945 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2653 | 133 | 1941 | 12/1901 | 17/11/1934 |
VofR | VR | 2-6-2T | 1213 | 1902 | |||
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2654 | 133 | 1942 | 01/1902 | 20/01/1936 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2655 | 133 | 1943 | 01/1902 | 08/06/1949 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2656 | 133 | 1944 | 01/1902 | 27/03/1948 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2657 | 133 | 1945 | 01/1902 | 18/10/1946 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2658 | 133 | 1946 | 02/1902 | 03/11/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2659 | 133 | 1947 | 02/1902 | 28/10/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2660 | 133 | 1948 | 02/1902 | 12/01/1946 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 100 | 132 | 1928 | 02/1902 | 17/06/1932 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3601 | 134 | 1866 | 02/1902 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3602 | 134 | 1867 | 02/1902 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3603 | 134 | 1868 | 03/1902 | 05/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3604 | 134 | 1869 | 03/1902 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3605 | 134 | 1870 | 04/1902 | 12/1930 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3606 | 134 | 1871 | 04/1902 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3607 | 134 | 1872 | 05/1902 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3608 | 134 | 1873 | 05/1902 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3609 | 134 | 1874 | 05/1902 | 03/1932 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3610 | 134 | 1875 | 05/1902 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | 101 | 0-4-0T | 101 | 136 | 1969 | 06/1902 | 09/1911 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3611 | 134 | 1876 | 06/1902 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3612 | 134 | 1877 | 06/1902 | 10/1930 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3613 | 134 | 1878 | 06/1902 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3614 | 134 | 1879 | 06/1902 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3615 | 134 | 1880 | 07/1902 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3616 | 134 | 1881 | 07/1902 | 20/09/1933 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3617 | 134 | 1882 | 07/1902 | 29/03/1933 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3618 | 134 | 1883 | 07/1902 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2663 | 135 | 1951 | 08/1902 | 08/10/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2664 | 135 | 1952 | 08/1902 | 20/01/1936 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3619 | 134 | 1884 | 08/1902 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3620 | 134 | 1885 | 08/1902 | 05/1931 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2661 | 135 | 1949 | 09/1902 | 29/11/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2662 | 135 | 1950 | 09/1902 | 03/07/1948 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2665 | 135 | 1953 | 09/1902 | 17/01/1948 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2666 | 135 | 1954 | 09/1902 | 20/10/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2667 | 135 | 1955 | 09/1902 | 27/10/1949 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2668 | 135 | 1956 | 09/1902 | 12/12/1936 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2669 | 135 | 1957 | 10/1902 | 17/05/1948 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2670 | 135 | 1958 | 10/1902 | 20/08/1938 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2671 | 135 | 1959 | 10/1902 | 17/11/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2672 | 135 | 1960 | 10/1902 | 05/11/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2673 | 135 | 1961 | 11/1902 | 24/05/1946 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2674 | 135 | 1962 | 11/1902 | 21/09/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2675 | 135 | 1963 | 11/1902 | 12/09/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2676 | 135 | 1964 | 11/1902 | 20/09/1946 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2677 | 135 | 1965 | 11/1902 | 04/04/1946 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2678 | 135 | 1966 | 11/1902 | 09/06/1936 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2679 | 135 | 1967 | 12/1902 | 02/02/1946 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2680 | 135 | 1968 | 12/1902 | 07/06/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3413 | 137 | 1970 | 12/1902 | 17/09/1947 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3414 | 137 | 1971 | 12/1902 | 04/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3415 | 137 | 1972 | 01/1903 | 21/10/1949 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2603 | 116 | 1725 | 01/1903 | 02/1906 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2604 | 116 | 1726 | 01/1903 | 04/1906 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2605 | 116 | 1727 | 01/1903 | 02/1906 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3416 | 137 | 1973 | 02/1903 | 21/06/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3417 | 137 | 1974 | 02/1903 | 01/1930 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3418 | 137 | 1975 | 02/1903 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3419 | 137 | 1976 | 02/1903 | 09/1935 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3420 | 137 | 1977 | 02/1903 | 03/1935 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3421 | 137 | 1978 | 02/1903 | 07/1936 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2606 | 116 | 1728 | 02/1903 | 05/1906 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2607 | 116 | 1729 | 02/1903 | 01/1906 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 98 | 138 | 1990 | 03/1903 | 02/06/1933 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3422 | 137 | 1979 | 03/1903 | 02/1939 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3423 | 137 | 1980 | 03/1903 | 08/11/1944 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3424 | 137 | 1981 | 03/1903 | 10/1936 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3433 | 141 | 1993 | 03/1903 | 09/1928 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2608 | 116 | 1730 | 03/1903 | 12/1906 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2609 | 116 | 1731 | 03/1903 | 12/1906 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3425 | 137 | 1982 | 05/1903 | 02/1939 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3426 | 137 | 1983 | 05/1903 | 06/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3427 | 137 | 1984 | 05/1903 | 11/09/1947 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3428 | 137 | 1985 | 05/1903 | 27/09/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3429 | 137 | 1986 | 05/1903 | 21/03/1951 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3430 | 137 | 1987 | 05/1903 | 30/11/1945 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3431 | 137 | 1988 | 05/1903 | 19/06/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3432 | 137 | 1989 | 05/1903 | 03/1938 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3434 | 141 | 1994 | 05/1903 | 07/1930 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3435 | 141 | 1995 | 05/1903 | 05/1931 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3436 | 141 | 1996 | 05/1903 | 12/1929 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3437 | 141 | 1997 | 05/1903 | 11/1929 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3438 | 141 | 1998 | 05/1903 | 10/1929 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3439 | 141 | 1999 | 05/1903 | 04/1929 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3440 | 141 | 2000 | 05/1903 | 03/1931 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3441 | 141 | 2001 | 05/1903 | 10/1927 |
GWR | City | 4-4-0 | 3442 | 141 | 2002 | 05/1903 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 97 | 139 | 1991 | 06/1903 | 28/04/1958 |
GWR | Kruger | 2-6-0/4-6-0 | 2610 | 116 | 1732 | 06/1903 | 08/1906 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2611 | 123 | 1796 | 07/1903 | 08/09/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2612 | 123 | 1797 | 07/1903 | 09/02/1948 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2613 | 123 | 1798 | 07/1903 | 15/10/1938 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2614 | 123 | 1799 | 07/1903 | 14/12/1935 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2615 | 123 | 1800 | 08/1903 | 01/11/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2616 | 123 | 1801 | 08/1903 | 10/11/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2617 | 123 | 1802 | 08/1903 | 14/09/1934 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2618 | 123 | 1803 | 08/1903 | 31/12/1938 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2619 | 123 | 1804 | 08/1903 | 19/01/1946 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2620 | 123 | 1805 | 08/1903 | 29/08/1949 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 99 | 140 | 1992 | 09/1903 | 04/10/1962 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3443 | 142 | 2003 | 09/1903 | 11/1935 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3444 | 142 | 2004 | 09/1903 | 25/11/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3445 | 142 | 2005 | 09/1903 | 13/12/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3446 | 142 | 2006 | 09/1903 | 05/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3447 | 142 | 2007 | 09/1903 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3448 | 142 | 2008 | 09/1903 | 22/11/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3449 | 142 | 2009 | 10/1903 | 06/12/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3450 | 142 | 2010 | 10/1903 | 10/1935 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3451 | 142 | 2011 | 10/1903 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3452 | 142 | 2012 | 10/1903 | 03/1939 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3621 | 143 | 2013 | 10/1903 | 05/01/1933 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3622 | 143 | 2014 | 10/1903 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3623 | 143 | 2015 | 11/1903 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3624 | 143 | 2016 | 11/1903 | 10/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3625 | 143 | 2017 | 11/1903 | 07/1931 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 171 | 145 | 2024 | 12/1903 | 12/01/1946 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3626 | 143 | 2018 | 12/1903 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3627 | 143 | 2019 | 12/1903 | 20/01/1934 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3628 | 143 | 2020 | 12/1903 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3629 | 143 | 2021 | 12/1903 | 11/1931 |
GWR | 36xx | 2-4-2T | 3630 | 143 | 2022 | 12/1903 | 10/1930 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3453 | 148 | 2036 | 01/1904 | 14/05/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3454 | 148 | 2037 | 01/1904 | 01/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3455 | 148 | 2038 | 01/1904 | 28/11/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3456 | 148 | 2039 | 01/1904 | 01/11/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3457 | 148 | 2040 | 01/1904 | 20/08/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3458 | 148 | 2041 | 01/1904 | 01/03/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3459 | 148 | 2042 | 02/1904 | 17/11/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3460 | 148 | 2043 | 02/1904 | 09/1935 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3461 | 148 | 2044 | 02/1904 | 08/10/1947 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3462 | 148 | 2045 | 02/1904 | 10/05/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3463 | 148 | 2046 | 03/1904 | 29/11/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3464 | 148 | 2047 | 03/1904 | 03/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3465 | 148 | 2048 | 03/1904 | 01/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3466 | 148 | 2049 | 03/1904 | 09/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3467 | 148 | 2050 | 03/1904 | 04/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3468 | 148 | 2051 | 03/1904 | 31/01/1951 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3469 | 148 | 2052 | 04/1904 | 08/12/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3470 | 148 | 2053 | 04/1904 | 10/04/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3471 | 148 | 2054 | 04/1904 | 01/1939 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3472 | 148 | 2055 | 04/1904 | 11/1936 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3473 | 149 | 2056 | 05/1904 | 03/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3474 | 149 | 2057 | 06/1904 | 11/1930 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3475 | 149 | 2058 | 06/1904 | 05/1930 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3476 | 149 | 2059 | 08/1904 | 02/1930 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3477 | 149 | 2060 | 08/1904 | 24/11/1933 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3478 | 149 | 2061 | 08/1904 | 01/1931 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 115 | 144 | 2023 | 10/1904 | 04/04/1951 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3479 | 149 | 2062 | 10/1904 | 11/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3480 | 149 | 2063 | 10/1904 | 03/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3481 | 149 | 2064 | 10/1904 | 08/1930 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3482 | 149 | 2065 | 10/1904 | 03/1930 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3111 | 150 | 2066 | 01/1905 | 25/10/1948 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3112 | 150 | 2067 | 01/1905 | 06/10/1955 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3113 | 150 | 2068 | 01/1905 | 05/10/1955 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 172 | 154 | 2106 | 02/1905 | 03/1935 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3114 | 150 | 2069 | 02/1905 | 04/09/1950 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3115 | 150 | 2070 | 02/1905 | 26/06/1965 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3116 | 150 | 2071 | 02/1905 | 18/05/1962 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3117 | 150 | 2072 | 02/1905 | 09/05/1949 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3118 | 150 | 2073 | 02/1905 | 14/05/1964 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3119 | 150 | 2074 | 02/1905 | 28/06/1948 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3121 | 152 | 2086 | 02/1905 | 25/10/1948 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3122 | 152 | 2087 | 02/1905 | 25/09/1950 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3125 | 152 | 2090 | 02/1905 | 25/07/1952 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 173 | 154 | 2107 | 03/1905 | 08/07/1933 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 174 | 154 | 2108 | 03/1905 | 11/08/1933 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 175 | 154 | 2109 | 03/1905 | 30/11/1944 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3120 | 150 | 2075 | 03/1905 | 28/12/1963 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 176 | 154 | 2110 | 04/1905 | 02/01/1934 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 177 | 154 | 2111 | 04/1905 | 02/1935 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 178 | 154 | 2112 | 04/1905 | 09/08/1946 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 179 | 154 | 2113 | 04/1905 | 31/01/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 180 | 154 | 2114 | 05/1905 | 17/05/1948 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3123 | 152 | 2088 | 05/1905 | 22/03/1961 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3124 | 152 | 2089 | 05/1905 | 26/12/1964 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 181 | 158 | 2128 | 06/1905 | 13/03/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 182 | 158 | 2129 | 06/1905 | 02/06/1934 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3126 | 152 | 2091 | 06/1905 | 20/06/1957 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3127 | 152 | 2092 | 06/1905 | 26/05/1948 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3128 | 152 | 2093 | 06/1905 | 15/11/1948 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3129 | 152 | 2094 | 06/1905 | 02/07/1951 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3130 | 152 | 2095 | 06/1905 | 02/08/1948 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 183 | 158 | 2130 | 07/1905 | 19/03/1946 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 184 | 158 | 2131 | 07/1905 | 02/05/1933 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 185 | 158 | 2132 | 07/1905 | 08/08/1931 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 186 | 158 | 2133 | 07/1905 | 07/11/1932 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 187 | 158 | 2134 | 08/1905 | 12/10/1949 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 188 | 158 | 2135 | 08/1905 | 14/05/1948 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2801 | 153 | 2096 | 09/1905 | 16/12/1958 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2802 | 153 | 2097 | 09/1905 | 08/12/1958 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 189 | 158 | 2136 | 09/1905 | 27/09/1948 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 190 | 158 | 2137 | 09/1905 | 01/1939 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2221 | 151 | 2076 | 09/1905 | 16/09/1933 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2803 | 153 | 2098 | 10/1905 | 20/04/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2804 | 153 | 2099 | 10/1905 | 31/07/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2805 | 153 | 2100 | 10/1905 | 30/05/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2806 | 153 | 2101 | 10/1905 | 07/03/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2807 | 153 | 2102 | 10/1905 | 07/03/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2808 | 153 | 2103 | 10/1905 | 21/09/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2809 | 153 | 2104 | 10/1905 | 15/01/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2810 | 153 | 2105 | 10/1905 | 11/09/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2811 | 155 | 2115 | 11/1905 | 20/10/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2812 | 155 | 2116 | 11/1905 | 01/01/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2813 | 155 | 2117 | 11/1905 | 30/11/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2814 | 155 | 2118 | 11/1905 | 11/08/1958 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2815 | 155 | 2119 | 11/1905 | 14/12/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2816 | 155 | 2120 | 12/1905 | 20/10/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2817 | 155 | 2121 | 12/1905 | 04/03/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2818 | 155 | 2122 | 12/1905 | 25/10/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2819 | 155 | 2123 | 12/1905 | 14/01/1961 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2820 | 155 | 2124 | 12/1905 | 17/11/1958 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2607 | 01/1906 | 29/08/1934 | ||
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2608 | 01/1906 | 19/10/1945 | ||
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3131 | 159 | 2138 | 01/1906 | 25/10/1948 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3132 | 159 | 2139 | 01/1906 | 07/08/1951 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3133 | 159 | 2140 | 01/1906 | 29/11/1960 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2681 | 156 | 2125 | 02/1906 | 25/09/1936 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2603 | 02/1906 | 10/09/1936 | ||
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2605 | 02/1906 | 20/10/1934 | ||
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3134 | 159 | 2141 | 02/1906 | 09/04/1951 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3135 | 159 | 2142 | 02/1906 | 23/08/1949 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3136 | 159 | 2143 | 02/1906 | 01/10/1951 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3137 | 159 | 2144 | 02/1906 | 01/10/1951 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3138 | 159 | 2145 | 02/1906 | 08/11/1952 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3139 | 159 | 2146 | 03/1906 | 05/11/1952 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3140 | 159 | 2147 | 03/1906 | 21/07/1953 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3141 | 159 | 2148 | 03/1906 | 30/10/1952 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3142 | 159 | 2149 | 03/1906 | 26/05/1952 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3143 | 159 | 2150 | 03/1906 | 03/12/1951 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3144 | 159 | 2151 | 03/1906 | 28/01/1952 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3145 | 159 | 2152 | 03/1906 | 28/11/1963 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3146 | 159 | 2153 | 03/1906 | 10/05/1948 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3147 | 159 | 2154 | 03/1906 | 05/01/1953 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3148 | 159 | 2155 | 03/1906 | 21/12/1959 |
GWR | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 3149 | 159 | 2156 | 03/1906 | 24/04/1947 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2604 | 04/1906 | 23/04/1936 | ||
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2610 | 04/1906 | 24/08/1935 | ||
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3150 | 159 | 2157 | 04/1906 | 23/09/1957 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 40 | 161 | 2168 | 04/1906 | 20/05/1957 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3701 | 162 | 2169 | 04/1906 | 10/1938 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3702 | 162 | 2170 | 04/1906 | 13/03/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3703 | 162 | 2171 | 04/1906 | 08/1936 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2606 | 05/1906 | 26/10/1934 | ||
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2901 | 164 | 2199 | 05/1906 | 12/04/1933 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2902 | 164 | 2200 | 05/1906 | 18/08/1949 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2903 | 164 | 2201 | 05/1906 | 04/11/1949 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2904 | 164 | 2202 | 05/1906 | 15/10/1932 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2905 | 164 | 2203 | 05/1906 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2906 | 164 | 2204 | 05/1906 | 16/08/1952 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2907 | 164 | 2205 | 05/1906 | 18/07/1933 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2908 | 164 | 2206 | 05/1906 | 16/12/1950 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2909 | 164 | 2207 | 05/1906 | 07/11/1931 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2910 | 164 | 2208 | 05/1906 | 23/10/1931 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3704 | 162 | 2172 | 05/1906 | 10/1938 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3705 | 162 | 2173 | 05/1906 | 02/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3706 | 162 | 2174 | 06/1906 | 15/05/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3707 | 162 | 2175 | 06/1906 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3708 | 162 | 2176 | 06/1906 | 15/08/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3709 | 162 | 2177 | 06/1906 | 18/08/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3710 | 162 | 2178 | 06/1906 | 09/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3711 | 162 | 2179 | 06/1906 | 19/04/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3712 | 162 | 2180 | 06/1906 | 03/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3713 | 162 | 2181 | 06/1906 | 01/1939 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3715 | 162 | 2183 | 06/1906 | 02/1938 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3714 | 162 | 2182 | 07/1906 | 05/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3716 | 163 | 2184 | 07/1906 | 14/12/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3717 | 163 | 2185 | 07/1906 | 04/1938 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3718 | 163 | 2186 | 07/1906 | 10/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3719 | 163 | 2187 | 07/1906 | 09/1939 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2222 | 151 | 2077 | 08/1906 | 07/12/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3720 | 163 | 2188 | 08/1906 | 02/12/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3721 | 163 | 2189 | 08/1906 | 08/12/1948 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3722 | 163 | 2190 | 08/1906 | 06/12/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3723 | 163 | 2191 | 08/1906 | 04/1939 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3724 | 163 | 2192 | 08/1906 | 07/1937 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3725 | 163 | 2193 | 08/1906 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3726 | 163 | 2194 | 08/1906 | 12/1938 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2223 | 151 | 2078 | 09/1906 | 04/1932 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2224 | 151 | 2079 | 09/1906 | 30/08/1933 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2225 | 151 | 2080 | 09/1906 | 07/12/1934 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3727 | 163 | 2195 | 09/1906 | 03/1939 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3728 | 163 | 2196 | 09/1906 | 26/10/1949 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3729 | 163 | 2197 | 09/1906 | 07/1936 |
GWR | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3730 | 163 | 2198 | 09/1906 | 21/06/1948 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2226 | 151 | 2081 | 10/1906 | 19/06/1934 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2227 | 151 | 2082 | 10/1906 | 06/1931 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2228 | 151 | 2083 | 10/1906 | 01/1931 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2229 | 151 | 2084 | 10/1906 | 01/1932 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2230 | 151 | 2085 | 10/1906 | 09/1932 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3801 | 165 | 2209 | 10/1906 | 04/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3802 | 165 | 2210 | 10/1906 | 05/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3803 | 165 | 2211 | 10/1906 | 01/1932 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3804 | 165 | 2212 | 10/1906 | 03/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3805 | 165 | 2213 | 10/1906 | 29/05/1933 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3806 | 165 | 2214 | 11/1906 | 02/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3807 | 165 | 2215 | 11/1906 | 12/1930 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3808 | 165 | 2216 | 11/1906 | 10/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3809 | 165 | 2217 | 11/1906 | 09/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3810 | 165 | 2218 | 11/1906 | 03/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3811 | 165 | 2219 | 11/1906 | 01/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3812 | 165 | 2220 | 11/1906 | 07/1932 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3813 | 165 | 2221 | 11/1906 | 11/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3814 | 165 | 2222 | 11/1906 | 12/06/1933 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3815 | 165 | 2223 | 11/1906 | 01/1932 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2609 | 12/1906 | 08/09/1934 | ||
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3816 | 165 | 2224 | 12/1906 | 09/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3817 | 165 | 2225 | 12/1906 | 01/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3818 | 165 | 2226 | 12/1906 | 08/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3819 | 165 | 2227 | 12/1906 | 05/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3820 | 165 | 2228 | 12/1906 | 05/1931 |
GWR | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2602 | 01/1907 | 24/08/1934 | ||
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2821 | 160 | 2158 | 01/1907 | 21/09/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2822 | 160 | 2159 | 01/1907 | 27/11/1964 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2823 | 160 | 2160 | 01/1907 | 24/04/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2824 | 160 | 2161 | 01/1907 | 20/08/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2825 | 160 | 2162 | 01/1907 | 31/03/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2826 | 160 | 2163 | 01/1907 | 22/09/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2827 | 160 | 2164 | 02/1907 | 11/08/1958 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2828 | 160 | 2165 | 02/1907 | 26/01/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2829 | 160 | 2166 | 02/1907 | 13/02/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2830 | 160 | 2167 | 02/1907 | 30/01/1959 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4001 | 168 | 2229 | 02/1907 | 06/01/1934 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4003 | 168 | 2231 | 02/1907 | 18/07/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4004 | 168 | 2232 | 02/1907 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4005 | 168 | 2233 | 02/1907 | 17/11/1934 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4002 | 168 | 2230 | 03/1907 | 02/06/1933 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3151 | 169 | 2239 | 04/1907 | 10/03/1952 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3152 | 169 | 2240 | 04/1907 | 11/01/1947 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3153 | 169 | 2241 | 04/1907 | 13/02/1953 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3154 | 169 | 2242 | 04/1907 | 16/10/1950 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3155 | 169 | 2243 | 04/1907 | 14/01/1960 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3156 | 169 | 2244 | 04/1907 | 23/09/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3157 | 169 | 2245 | 04/1907 | 21/10/1952 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3158 | 169 | 2246 | 04/1907 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4006 | 168 | 2234 | 04/1907 | 11/1932 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4007 | 168 | 2235 | 04/1907 | 03/09/1951 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3159 | 169 | 2247 | 05/1907 | 07/11/1949 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3160 | 169 | 2248 | 05/1907 | 01/07/1953 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3161 | 169 | 2249 | 05/1907 | 23/12/1952 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3162 | 169 | 2250 | 05/1907 | 24/01/1947 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4008 | 168 | 2236 | 05/1907 | 06/1935 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4010 | 168 | 2238 | 05/1907 | 01/11/1934 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4009 | 168 | 2237 | 18/05/1907 | 06/03/1950 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3163 | 169 | 2251 | 06/1907 | 24/06/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3164 | 169 | 2252 | 06/1907 | 05/03/1956 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3165 | 169 | 2253 | 06/1907 | 03/07/1948 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3166 | 169 | 2254 | 06/1907 | 11/01/1947 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3167 | 169 | 2255 | 06/1907 | 02/08/1952 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3168 | 169 | 2256 | 06/1907 | 25/09/1950 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3169 | 169 | 2257 | 06/1907 | 06/07/1950 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3170 | 169 | 2258 | 06/1907 | 25/08/1958 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2911 | 170 | 2259 | 28/07/1907 | 03/1935 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2912 | 170 | 2260 | 31/07/1907 | 26/02/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2913 | 170 | 2261 | 31/07/1907 | 10/05/1948 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2914 | 170 | 2262 | 31/07/1907 | 26/01/1946 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2915 | 170 | 2263 | 05/08/1907 | 09/10/1950 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2917 | 170 | 2265 | 13/08/1907 | 10/10/1934 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2916 | 170 | 2264 | 19/08/1907 | 10/07/1948 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2918 | 170 | 2266 | 19/08/1907 | 02/1935 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2919 | 170 | 2267 | 27/08/1907 | 04/02/1932 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2930 | 170 | 2278 | 09/1907 | 31/10/1949 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2920 | 170 | 2268 | 03/09/1907 | 05/10/1953 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2921 | 170 | 2269 | 06/09/1907 | 08/12/1945 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2922 | 170 | 2270 | 08/09/1907 | 09/12/1944 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2923 | 170 | 2271 | 13/09/1907 | 26/10/1934 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2924 | 170 | 2272 | 16/09/1907 | 20/03/1950 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2925 | 170 | 2273 | 17/09/1907 | 03/04/1959 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2926 | 170 | 2274 | 26/09/1907 | 10/09/1951 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3171 | 172 | 2280 | 10/1907 | 10/07/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3172 | 172 | 2281 | 10/1907 | 18/10/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3173 | 172 | 2282 | 10/1907 | 20/05/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3174 | 172 | 2283 | 10/1907 | 07/03/1958 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3175 | 172 | 2284 | 10/1907 | 28/03/1949 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2927 | 170 | 2275 | 01/10/1907 | 18/12/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2928 | 170 | 2276 | 07/10/1907 | 30/08/1948 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2929 | 170 | 2277 | 10/10/1907 | 20/12/1949 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3176 | 172 | 2285 | 11/1907 | 14/11/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3177 | 172 | 2286 | 11/1907 | 22/10/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3178 | 172 | 2287 | 11/1907 | 15/01/1951 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3179 | 172 | 2288 | 11/1907 | 24/06/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3180 | 172 | 2289 | 11/1907 | 23/10/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3181 | 172 | 2290 | 12/1907 | 06/10/1958 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3182 | 172 | 2291 | 12/1907 | 22/08/1949 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3183 | 172 | 2292 | 12/1907 | 16/10/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3184 | 172 | 2293 | 12/1907 | 03/07/1948 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3185 | 172 | 2294 | 01/1908 | 06/02/1956 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3186 | 172 | 2295 | 01/1908 | 03/06/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3187 | 172 | 2296 | 01/1908 | 22/11/1957 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3188 | 172 | 2297 | 01/1908 | 17/11/1952 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3189 | 172 | 2298 | 01/1908 | 05/09/1949 |
GWR | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3190 | 172 | 2299 | 01/1908 | 24/03/1958 |
GWR | Great Bear | 4-6-2 | 111 | 171 | 2279 | 02/1908 | 13/07/1953 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4011 | 173 | 2300 | 03/1908 | 11/1932 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4012 | 173 | 2301 | 03/1908 | 21/10/1949 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4013 | 173 | 2302 | 03/1908 | 03/05/1950 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4014 | 173 | 2303 | 03/1908 | 04/06/1946 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4015 | 173 | 2304 | 03/1908 | 09/02/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4016 | 173 | 2305 | 04/1908 | 24/09/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4017 | 173 | 2306 | 04/1908 | 11/11/1949 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4018 | 173 | 2307 | 04/1908 | 23/04/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4019 | 173 | 2308 | 05/1908 | 28/10/1949 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4020 | 173 | 2309 | 05/1908 | 21/03/1951 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4101 | 176 | 2330 | 05/1908 | 09/1929 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4102 | 176 | 2331 | 05/1908 | 04/1931 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4103 | 176 | 2332 | 05/1908 | 11/1927 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4104 | 176 | 2333 | 05/1908 | 09/1928 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4105 | 176 | 2334 | 05/1908 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4106 | 176 | 2335 | 05/1908 | 06/1930 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4107 | 176 | 2336 | 06/1908 | 11/1927 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4108 | 176 | 2337 | 06/1908 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4109 | 176 | 2338 | 06/1908 | 10/1928 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4110 | 176 | 2339 | 06/1908 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4111 | 176 | 2340 | 06/1908 | 10/1929 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4112 | 176 | 2341 | 06/1908 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4113 | 176 | 2342 | 06/1908 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4114 | 176 | 2343 | 07/1908 | 08/1929 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4115 | 176 | 2344 | 07/1908 | 04/1929 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4116 | 176 | 2345 | 07/1908 | 10/1930 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4117 | 176 | 2346 | 07/1908 | 07/1927 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4118 | 176 | 2347 | 07/1908 | 11/1927 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4119 | 176 | 2348 | 07/1908 | 07/1929 |
GWR | Flower | 4-4-0 | 4120 | 176 | 2349 | 07/1908 | 05/1930 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2231 | 175 | 2320 | 09/1908 | 05/1931 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2232 | 175 | 2321 | 09/1908 | 24/10/1933 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2233 | 175 | 2322 | 10/1908 | 10/1932 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2234 | 175 | 2323 | 10/1908 | 01/1932 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2235 | 175 | 2324 | 11/1908 | 01/1935 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2236 | 175 | 2325 | 11/1908 | 01/1932 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2237 | 175 | 2326 | 11/1908 | 05/1931 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2238 | 175 | 2327 | 12/1908 | 06/1931 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2239 | 175 | 2328 | 01/1909 | 07/12/1934 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2240 | 175 | 2329 | 01/1909 | 10/1931 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2181 | 174 | 2310 | 03/1909 | 19/01/1953 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2182 | 174 | 2311 | 03/1909 | 05/12/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2183 | 174 | 2312 | 03/1909 | 08/02/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2184 | 174 | 2313 | 03/1909 | 10/10/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2185 | 174 | 2314 | 03/1909 | 17/06/1958 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3731 | 177 | 2350 | 05/1909 | 21/02/1949 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3732 | 177 | 2351 | 05/1909 | 10/07/1948 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3733 | 177 | 2352 | 05/1909 | 11/05/1949 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3734 | 177 | 2353 | 05/1909 | 05/06/1951 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3735 | 177 | 2354 | 05/1909 | 04/10/1948 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4021 | 178 | 2365 | 06/1909 | 10/10/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4022 | 178 | 2366 | 06/1909 | 14/02/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4023 | 178 | 2367 | 06/1909 | 12/07/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4024 | 178 | 2368 | 06/1909 | 02/1935 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4025 | 178 | 2369 | 07/1909 | 14/08/1950 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4026 | 178 | 2370 | 09/1909 | 20/02/1950 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4027 | 178 | 2371 | 09/1909 | 10/10/1934 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4028 | 178 | 2372 | 09/1909 | 09/11/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4029 | 178 | 2373 | 10/1909 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4030 | 178 | 2374 | 10/1909 | 29/05/1950 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3736 | 177 | 2355 | 11/1909 | 20/12/1948 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3737 | 177 | 2356 | 12/1909 | 22/04/1951 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3738 | 177 | 2357 | 12/1909 | 03/01/1949 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3739 | 177 | 2358 | 12/1909 | 05/06/1951 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3740 | 177 | 2359 | 12/1909 | 21/12/1949 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3741 | 177 | 2360 | 01/1910 | 25/04/1951 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3742 | 177 | 2361 | 01/1910 | 10/04/1948 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3743 | 177 | 2362 | 01/1910 | 07/11/1951 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3744 | 177 | 2363 | 01/1910 | 07/11/1951 |
GWR | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3745 | 177 | 2364 | 01/1910 | 16/06/1950 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2186 | 174 | 2315 | 02/1910 | 15/07/1953 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2187 | 174 | 2316 | 02/1910 | 06/01/1958 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2188 | 174 | 2317 | 03/1910 | 02/03/1953 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2189 | 174 | 2318 | 03/1910 | 18/12/1950 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2190 | 174 | 2319 | 03/1910 | 10/03/1952 |
GWR | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1361 | 179 | 2375 | 04/1910 | 05/05/1961 |
GWR | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1362 | 179 | 2376 | 06/1910 | 05/05/1961 |
GWR | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1363 | 179 | 2377 | 06/1910 | 20/11/1962 |
GWR | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1364 | 179 | 2378 | 08/1910 | 24/02/1961 |
GWR | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1365 | 179 | 2379 | 08/1910 | 20/11/1962 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4031 | 180 | 2380 | 10/1910 | 11/06/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4033 | 180 | 2382 | 11/1910 | 14/06/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4034 | 180 | 2383 | 11/1910 | 15/09/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4035 | 180 | 2384 | 11/1910 | 22/10/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4032 | 180 | 2381 | 03/11/1910 | 24/09/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4036 | 180 | 2385 | 12/1910 | 11/03/1952 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4201 | 182 | 2395 | 12/1910 | 22/10/1959 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4037 | 180 | 2386 | 30/12/1910 | 17/09/1962 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4038 | 180 | 2387 | 01/1911 | 28/04/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4039 | 180 | 2388 | 02/1911 | 20/11/1950 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2831 | 181 | 2390 | 03/1911 | 12/01/1960 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4040 | 180 | 2389 | 03/1911 | 05/06/1951 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2832 | 181 | 2391 | 04/1911 | 16/11/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2833 | 181 | 2392 | 04/1911 | 06/03/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2834 | 181 | 2393 | 05/1911 | 05/11/1962 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2835 | 181 | 2394 | 05/1911 | 17/05/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4301 | 183 | 2396 | 06/1911 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4302 | 183 | 2397 | 06/1911 | 06/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4303 | 183 | 2398 | 06/1911 | 07/11/1952 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4304 | 183 | 2399 | 07/1911 | 10/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4305 | 183 | 2400 | 07/1911 | 08/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4306 | 183 | 2401 | 07/1911 | 06/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4307 | 183 | 2402 | 07/1911 | 03/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4308 | 183 | 2403 | 08/1911 | 04/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4309 | 183 | 2404 | 08/1911 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4310 | 183 | 2405 | 08/1911 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4311 | 183 | 2406 | 08/1911 | 12/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4312 | 183 | 2407 | 09/1911 | 03/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4313 | 183 | 2408 | 09/1911 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4314 | 183 | 2409 | 09/1911 | 06/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4315 | 183 | 2410 | 09/1911 | 04/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4316 | 183 | 2411 | 09/1911 | 09/1937 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2931 | 185 | 2426 | 10/1911 | 19/02/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2932 | 185 | 2427 | 10/1911 | 05/06/1951 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4317 | 183 | 2412 | 10/1911 | 06/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4318 | 183 | 2413 | 10/1911 | 04/06/1952 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4319 | 183 | 2414 | 10/1911 | 05/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4320 | 183 | 2415 | 10/1911 | 03/01/1949 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2933 | 185 | 2428 | 11/1911 | 19/01/1953 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2934 | 185 | 2429 | 11/1911 | 25/06/1952 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2935 | 185 | 2430 | 11/1911 | 13/12/1948 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2936 | 185 | 2431 | 11/1911 | 26/04/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2937 | 185 | 2432 | 12/1911 | 22/06/1953 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2938 | 185 | 2433 | 12/1911 | 13/08/1952 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2939 | 185 | 2434 | 12/1911 | 06/12/1950 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2940 | 185 | 2435 | 12/1911 | 17/01/1952 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3821 | 184 | 2416 | 12/1911 | 09/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3822 | 184 | 2417 | 12/1911 | 26/04/1933 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3823 | 184 | 2418 | 12/1911 | 04/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3824 | 184 | 2419 | 12/1911 | 03/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3825 | 184 | 2420 | 12/1911 | 03/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3826 | 184 | 2421 | 01/1912 | 08/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3827 | 184 | 2422 | 01/1912 | 12/1931 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3828 | 184 | 2423 | 01/1912 | 29/03/1933 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3829 | 184 | 2424 | 01/1912 | 02/1932 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4202 | 187 | 2446 | 02/1912 | 08/06/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4203 | 187 | 2447 | 02/1912 | 12/01/1961 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4204 | 187 | 2448 | 02/1912 | 24/07/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4205 | 187 | 2449 | 02/1912 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4206 | 187 | 2450 | 02/1912 | 31/12/1959 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4207 | 187 | 2451 | 02/1912 | 03/10/1961 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4208 | 187 | 2452 | 02/1912 | 16/11/1959 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4209 | 187 | 2453 | 02/1912 | 16/06/1965 |
GWR | County | 4-4-0 | 3830 | 184 | 2425 | 02/1912 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4210 | 187 | 2454 | 03/1912 | 16/06/1965 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4211 | 187 | 2455 | 03/1912 | 12/08/1959 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2941 | 189 | 2476 | 05/1912 | 12/12/1949 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2942 | 189 | 2477 | 05/1912 | 21/12/1949 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2943 | 189 | 2478 | 05/1912 | 25/01/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2944 | 189 | 2479 | 05/1912 | 29/11/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2949 | 189 | 2484 | 05/1912 | 29/01/1952 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2950 | 189 | 2485 | 05/1912 | 29/09/1952 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2945 | 189 | 2480 | 06/1912 | 24/06/1953 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2946 | 189 | 2481 | 06/1912 | 14/11/1949 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2947 | 189 | 2482 | 06/1912 | 26/04/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2948 | 189 | 2483 | 06/1912 | 15/11/1951 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2241 | 188 | 2466 | 06/1912 | 04/1931 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2242 | 188 | 2467 | 06/1912 | 09/1935 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2243 | 188 | 2468 | 06/1912 | 07/12/1934 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2244 | 188 | 2469 | 06/1912 | 25/08/1933 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2245 | 188 | 2470 | 06/1912 | 03/1931 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2246 | 188 | 2471 | 06/1912 | 11/1935 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2247 | 188 | 2472 | 07/1912 | 24/10/1933 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2248 | 188 | 2473 | 07/1912 | 10/1931 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4212 | 187 | 2456 | 08/1912 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2249 | 188 | 2474 | 08/1912 | 08/1932 |
GWR | County Tank | 4-4-2T | 2250 | 188 | 2475 | 08/1912 | 20/01/1934 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2836 | 186 | 2436 | 09/1912 | 15/06/1964 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2837 | 186 | 2437 | 09/1912 | 30/05/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2838 | 186 | 2438 | 09/1912 | 06/08/1959 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4213 | 187 | 2457 | 09/1912 | 22/01/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4214 | 187 | 2458 | 09/1912 | 14/05/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4215 | 187 | 2459 | 09/1912 | 01/10/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2839 | 186 | 2439 | 10/1912 | 15/06/1964 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2840 | 186 | 2440 | 10/1912 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2841 | 186 | 2441 | 10/1912 | 16/12/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2842 | 186 | 2442 | 10/1912 | 17/09/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2843 | 186 | 2443 | 11/1912 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2844 | 186 | 2444 | 11/1912 | 04/03/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2845 | 186 | 2445 | 11/1912 | 24/05/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4216 | 187 | 2460 | 11/1912 | 06/02/1965 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4217 | 187 | 2461 | 11/1912 | 28/07/1959 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4218 | 187 | 2462 | 11/1912 | 05/10/1962 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2846 | 190 | 2486 | 12/1912 | 25/11/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2847 | 190 | 2487 | 12/1912 | 09/03/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2848 | 190 | 2488 | 12/1912 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2849 | 190 | 2489 | 12/1912 | 03/08/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4219 | 187 | 2463 | 12/1912 | 28/09/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4220 | 187 | 2464 | 12/1912 | 26/11/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4221 | 187 | 2465 | 12/1912 | 10/09/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2850 | 190 | 2490 | 01/1913 | 17/02/1960 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2851 | 190 | 2491 | 02/1913 | 24/06/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2852 | 190 | 2492 | 02/1913 | 10/10/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2853 | 190 | 2493 | 02/1913 | 07/05/1962 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2854 | 190 | 2494 | 02/1913 | 03/10/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2855 | 190 | 2495 | 02/1913 | 12/12/1962 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2951 | 192 | 2506 | 03/1913 | 30/06/1952 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2952 | 192 | 2507 | 03/1913 | 03/09/1951 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2953 | 192 | 2508 | 03/1913 | 15/02/1952 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2954 | 192 | 2509 | 03/1913 | 08/07/1952 |
GWR | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2955 | 192 | 2510 | 04/1913 | 20/03/1950 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4530 | 191 | 2496 | 04/1913 | 17/03/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4531 | 191 | 2497 | 04/1913 | 28/02/1950 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4532 | 191 | 2498 | 04/1913 | 21/02/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4533 | 191 | 2499 | 04/1913 | 17/03/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4534 | 191 | 2500 | 04/1913 | 17/02/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4535 | 191 | 2501 | 04/1913 | 22/02/1955 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4042 | 195 | 2537 | 05/1913 | 08/11/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4043 | 195 | 2538 | 05/1913 | 02/01/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4044 | 195 | 2539 | 05/1913 | 17/02/1953 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4536 | 191 | 2502 | 05/1913 | 22/04/1959 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4537 | 191 | 2503 | 05/1913 | 16/02/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4538 | 191 | 2504 | 05/1913 | 20/05/1957 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4539 | 191 | 2505 | 05/1913 | 11/10/1955 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4041 | 195 | 2536 | 06/1913 | 19/04/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4045 | 195 | 2540 | 06/1913 | 01/11/1950 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4321 | 193 | 2516 | 06/1913 | 09/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4322 | 193 | 2517 | 06/1913 | 09/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4323 | 193 | 2518 | 07/1913 | 10/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4324 | 193 | 2519 | 07/1913 | 12/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4325 | 193 | 2520 | 08/1913 | 04/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4326 | 193 | 2521 | 08/1913 | 27/03/1957 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4327 | 193 | 2522 | 08/1913 | 01/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4328 | 193 | 2523 | 08/1913 | 08/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4329 | 193 | 2524 | 08/1913 | 09/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4330 | 193 | 2525 | 08/1913 | 08/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4331 | 194 | 2526 | 09/1913 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4332 | 194 | 2527 | 09/1913 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4333 | 194 | 2528 | 09/1913 | 02/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4334 | 194 | 2529 | 09/1913 | 10/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4335 | 194 | 2530 | 09/1913 | 11/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4336 | 194 | 2531 | 09/1913 | 07/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4337 | 194 | 2532 | 10/1913 | 05/11/1951 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4338 | 194 | 2533 | 10/1913 | 02/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4339 | 194 | 2534 | 10/1913 | 01/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4340 | 194 | 2535 | 10/1913 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4222 | 196 | 2541 | 11/1913 | 09/10/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4223 | 196 | 2542 | 11/1913 | 14/08/1959 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4224 | 196 | 2543 | 11/1913 | 02/02/1959 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4225 | 196 | 2544 | 11/1913 | 14/01/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4226 | 196 | 2545 | 11/1913 | 09/03/1959 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4227 | 196 | 2546 | 11/1913 | 20/02/1965 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4228 | 196 | 2547 | 11/1913 | 16/12/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4229 | 196 | 2548 | 11/1913 | 22/03/1961 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4230 | 196 | 2549 | 11/1913 | 27/09/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4231 | 196 | 2550 | 11/1913 | 10/12/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4341 | 198 | 2552 | 12/1913 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4342 | 198 | 2553 | 12/1913 | 05/1938 |
GWR | 4600 | 4-4-2T | 4600 | 197 | 2551 | 02/12/1913 | 25/07/1925 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4343 | 198 | 2554 | 01/1914 | 10/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4344 | 198 | 2555 | 01/1914 | 07/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4345 | 198 | 2556 | 01/1914 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4346 | 198 | 2557 | 01/1914 | 11/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4347 | 198 | 2558 | 01/1914 | 01/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4348 | 198 | 2559 | 01/1914 | 02/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4349 | 198 | 2560 | 02/1914 | 06/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4350 | 198 | 2561 | 02/1914 | 03/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4351 | 198 | 2562 | 02/1914 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4352 | 198 | 2563 | 02/1914 | 08/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4353 | 198 | 2564 | 03/1914 | 29/11/1948 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4354 | 198 | 2565 | 03/1914 | 02/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4355 | 198 | 2566 | 03/1914 | 06/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4356 | 198 | 2567 | 03/1914 | 04/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4357 | 198 | 2568 | 04/1914 | 11/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4358 | 198 | 2569 | 04/1914 | 11/08/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4359 | 198 | 2570 | 04/1914 | 05/1937 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4046 | 199 | 2572 | 05/1914 | 15/11/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4047 | 199 | 2573 | 05/1914 | 30/07/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4048 | 199 | 2574 | 05/1914 | 20/01/1953 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4049 | 199 | 2575 | 05/1914 | 20/07/1953 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4360 | 198 | 2571 | 05/1914 | 05/1938 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4050 | 199 | 2576 | 06/1914 | 19/02/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4051 | 199 | 2577 | 06/1914 | 16/10/1950 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4052 | 199 | 2578 | 06/1914 | 30/06/1953 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4053 | 199 | 2579 | 06/1914 | 12/07/1954 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4054 | 199 | 2580 | 06/1914 | 08/02/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4055 | 199 | 2581 | 07/1914 | 12/02/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4056 | 199 | 2582 | 07/1914 | 28/10/1957 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4057 | 199 | 2583 | 07/1914 | 07/02/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4058 | 199 | 2584 | 07/1914 | 16/04/1951 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4059 | 199 | 2585 | 07/1914 | 16/09/1952 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4060 | 199 | 2586 | 07/1914 | 11/10/1952 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4232 | 200 | 2587 | 08/1914 | 21/10/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4233 | 200 | 2588 | 08/1914 | 09/10/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4234 | 200 | 2589 | 09/1914 | 30/09/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4235 | 200 | 2590 | 09/1914 | 27/08/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4236 | 200 | 2591 | 10/1914 | 17/09/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4237 | 200 | 2592 | 10/1914 | 08/04/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4238 | 200 | 2593 | 10/1914 | 16/12/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4239 | 200 | 2594 | 10/1914 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4240 | 200 | 2595 | 10/1914 | 06/01/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4241 | 200 | 2596 | 10/1914 | 24/04/1964 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4540 | 201 | 2597 | 11/1914 | 03/03/1959 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4541 | 201 | 2598 | 11/1914 | 26/10/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4542 | 201 | 2599 | 11/1914 | 26/09/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4543 | 201 | 2600 | 11/1914 | 28/08/1950 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4544 | 201 | 2601 | 11/1914 | 25/09/1952 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4545 | 201 | 2602 | 12/1914 | 08/09/1958 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4546 | 201 | 2603 | 12/1914 | 06/01/1958 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4547 | 201 | 2604 | 12/1914 | 08/02/1960 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4550 | 201 | 2607 | 02/1915 | 24/10/1960 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4551 | 201 | 2608 | 02/1915 | 17/02/1958 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4552 | 201 | 2609 | 03/1915 | 25/09/1961 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4553 | 201 | 2610 | 03/1915 | 08/12/1958 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4554 | 201 | 2611 | 03/1915 | 06/09/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4361 | 202 | 2612 | 05/1915 | 02/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4362 | 202 | 2613 | 05/1915 | 08/1937 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4548 | 201 | 2605 | 05/1915 | 11/11/1957 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4549 | 201 | 2606 | 05/1915 | 12/12/1961 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4363 | 202 | 2614 | 06/1915 | 02/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4364 | 202 | 2615 | 06/1915 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4365 | 202 | 2616 | 07/1915 | 10/04/1948 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4366 | 202 | 2617 | 07/1915 | 02/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4367 | 202 | 2618 | 07/1915 | 01/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4368 | 202 | 2619 | 08/1915 | 02/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4369 | 202 | 2620 | 09/1915 | 02/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4370 | 202 | 2621 | 09/1915 | 01/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4371 | 202 | 2622 | 10/1915 | 11/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4372 | 202 | 2623 | 10/1915 | 09/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4373 | 202 | 2624 | 10/1915 | 08/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4374 | 202 | 2625 | 11/1915 | 01/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4375 | 202 | 2626 | 11/1915 | 06/01/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4376 | 202 | 2627 | 12/1915 | 11/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4377 | 202 | 2628 | 12/1915 | 26/01/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4378 | 202 | 2629 | 12/1915 | 01/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4379 | 202 | 2630 | 12/1915 | 02/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4380 | 202 | 2631 | 12/1915 | 07/1938 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4242 | 203 | 2632 | 02/1916 | 17/03/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4243 | 203 | 2633 | 02/1916 | 14/05/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4244 | 203 | 2634 | 02/1916 | 22/03/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4245 | 203 | 2635 | 03/1916 | 30/04/1965 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4246 | 203 | 2636 | 03/1916 | 13/11/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4247 | 203 | 2637 | 03/1916 | 24/04/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4248 | 203 | 2638 | 04/1916 | 24/05/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4249 | 203 | 2639 | 04/1916 | 16/06/1965 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4250 | 203 | 2640 | 04/1916 | 05/09/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4251 | 203 | 2641 | 05/1916 | 24/06/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4381 | 204 | 2652 | 05/1916 | 28/05/1953 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4382 | 204 | 2653 | 05/1916 | 01/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4383 | 204 | 2654 | 06/1916 | 03/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4384 | 204 | 2655 | 06/1916 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4385 | 204 | 2656 | 06/1916 | 02/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4386 | 204 | 2657 | 07/1916 | 24/04/1948 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4387 | 204 | 2658 | 07/1916 | 03/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4388 | 204 | 2659 | 07/1916 | 01/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4389 | 204 | 2660 | 08/1916 | 10/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4390 | 204 | 2661 | 08/1916 | 02/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4391 | 204 | 2662 | 08/1916 | 02/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4392 | 204 | 2663 | 09/1916 | 12/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4393 | 204 | 2664 | 09/1916 | 08/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4394 | 204 | 2665 | 09/1916 | 08/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4395 | 204 | 2666 | 09/1916 | 07/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4396 | 204 | 2667 | 09/1916 | 06/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4397 | 204 | 2668 | 10/1916 | 03/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4398 | 204 | 2669 | 10/1916 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4300 | 204 | 2671 | 11/1916 | 07/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4399 | 204 | 2670 | 11/1916 | 05/1938 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5300 | 205 | 2672 | 11/1916 | 15/01/1953 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5301 | 205 | 2673 | 12/1916 | 10/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5302 | 205 | 2674 | 12/1916 | 26/05/1948 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5303 | 205 | 2675 | 12/1916 | 28/05/1951 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5304 | 205 | 2676 | 12/1916 | 05/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5305 | 205 | 2677 | 01/1917 | 01/07/1952 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5306 | 205 | 2678 | 01/1917 | 06/07/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5307 | 205 | 2679 | 01/1917 | 26/11/1956 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5308 | 205 | 2680 | 02/1917 | 01/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5309 | 205 | 2681 | 02/1917 | 27/01/1953 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4252 | 203 | 2642 | 03/1917 | 30/09/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4253 | 203 | 2643 | 03/1917 | 11/04/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4254 | 203 | 2644 | 03/1917 | 30/04/1965 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4255 | 203 | 2645 | 04/1917 | 20/04/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4256 | 203 | 2646 | 04/1917 | 22/01/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4257 | 203 | 2647 | 04/1917 | 22/10/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4258 | 203 | 2648 | 05/1917 | 21/04/1965 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4259 | 203 | 2649 | 05/1917 | 10/03/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4260 | 203 | 2650 | 05/1917 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4261 | 203 | 2651 | 05/1917 | 09/03/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5310 | 206 | 2682 | 06/1917 | 31/07/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5311 | 206 | 2683 | 06/1917 | 24/10/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5312 | 206 | 2684 | 06/1917 | 24/10/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5313 | 206 | 2685 | 06/1917 | 13/05/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5314 | 206 | 2686 | 06/1917 | 22/07/1957 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5315 | 206 | 2687 | 07/1917 | 17/02/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5316 | 206 | 2688 | 07/1917 | 21/06/1956 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5317 | 206 | 2689 | 07/1917 | 05/11/1956 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5318 | 206 | 2690 | 07/1917 | 04/09/1961 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5319 | 206 | 2691 | 08/1917 | 16/11/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5320 | 206 | 2692 | 08/1917 | 27/09/1948 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5321 | 206 | 2693 | 08/1917 | 14/09/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5322 | 206 | 2694 | 08/1917 | 24/04/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5323 | 206 | 2695 | 09/1917 | 09/06/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5324 | 206 | 2696 | 09/1917 | 16/09/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5325 | 206 | 2697 | 09/1917 | 26/08/1957 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5326 | 206 | 2698 | 09/1917 | 15/03/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5327 | 206 | 2699 | 09/1917 | 02/07/1956 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5328 | 206 | 2700 | 09/1917 | 29/07/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5329 | 206 | 2701 | 09/1917 | 03/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5330 | 207 | 2702 | 09/1917 | 15/06/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5331 | 207 | 2703 | 09/1917 | 10/11/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5332 | 207 | 2704 | 11/1917 | 09/10/1961 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5333 | 207 | 2705 | 11/1917 | 16/05/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5334 | 207 | 2706 | 11/1917 | 18/11/1957 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5335 | 207 | 2707 | 12/1917 | 16/10/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5336 | 207 | 2708 | 12/1917 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5337 | 207 | 2709 | 12/1917 | 24/10/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5338 | 207 | 2710 | 01/1918 | 11/08/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5339 | 207 | 2711 | 01/1918 | 29/11/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5340 | 207 | 2712 | 01/1918 | 27/09/1948 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5341 | 207 | 2713 | 02/1918 | 28/07/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5342 | 207 | 2714 | 02/1918 | 04/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5343 | 207 | 2715 | 02/1918 | 03/07/1948 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5344 | 207 | 2716 | 03/1918 | 22/09/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5345 | 207 | 2717 | 03/1918 | 08/06/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5346 | 207 | 2718 | 03/1918 | 07/05/1951 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5347 | 207 | 2719 | 03/1918 | 21/04/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5348 | 207 | 2720 | 03/1918 | 04/01/1952 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2856 | 210 | 2762 | 04/1918 | 20/04/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5349 | 207 | 2721 | 04/1918 | 10/05/1948 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2857 | 210 | 2763 | 05/1918 | 25/04/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2858 | 210 | 2764 | 05/1918 | 09/01/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2859 | 210 | 2765 | 05/1918 | 26/12/1964 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2860 | 210 | 2766 | 05/1918 | 27/04/1962 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2861 | 210 | 2767 | 06/1918 | 01/03/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2862 | 210 | 2768 | 06/1918 | 20/04/1964 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2863 | 210 | 2769 | 06/1918 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2864 | 210 | 2770 | 07/1918 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2865 | 210 | 2771 | 07/1918 | 09/01/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5350 | 208 | 2722 | 07/1918 | 07/12/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5351 | 208 | 2723 | 08/1918 | 13/06/1961 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5352 | 208 | 2724 | 08/1918 | 06/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5353 | 208 | 2725 | 08/1918 | 02/05/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5354 | 208 | 2726 | 08/1918 | 05/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5355 | 208 | 2727 | 08/1918 | 23/04/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5356 | 208 | 2728 | 08/1918 | 12/10/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2866 | 210 | 2772 | 09/1918 | 28/03/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5357 | 208 | 2729 | 09/1918 | 21/09/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5358 | 208 | 2730 | 09/1918 | 17/07/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5359 | 208 | 2731 | 09/1918 | 22/10/1951 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2867 | 210 | 2773 | 10/1918 | 29/07/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2868 | 210 | 2774 | 10/1918 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2869 | 210 | 2775 | 10/1918 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2870 | 210 | 2776 | 10/1918 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2871 | 210 | 2777 | 11/1918 | 24/05/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2872 | 210 | 2778 | 11/1918 | 26/08/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2873 | 210 | 2779 | 11/1918 | 26/12/1964 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2874 | 210 | 2780 | 11/1918 | 24/05/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2875 | 210 | 2781 | 12/1918 | 01/04/1964 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2876 | 210 | 2782 | 01/1919 | 15/01/1965 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2877 | 210 | 2783 | 01/1919 | 11/01/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5360 | 208 | 2732 | 01/1919 | 26/09/1958 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2878 | 210 | 2784 | 02/1919 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5361 | 208 | 2733 | 02/1919 | 18/01/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5362 | 208 | 2734 | 02/1919 | 22/07/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5363 | 208 | 2735 | 02/1919 | 09/1937 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2879 | 210 | 2785 | 03/1919 | 10/08/1964 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2880 | 210 | 2786 | 03/1919 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2881 | 210 | 2787 | 03/1919 | 11/01/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5364 | 208 | 2736 | 03/1919 | 16/07/1951 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2882 | 210 | 2788 | 04/1919 | 16/12/1963 |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2883 | 210 | 2789 | 04/1919 | 19/11/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5365 | 208 | 2737 | 04/1919 | 05/03/1951 |
GWR | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4700 | 214 | 2866 | 05/1919 | 23/10/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5366 | 208 | 2738 | 05/1919 | 03/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5367 | 208 | 2739 | 05/1919 | 29/09/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5368 | 208 | 2740 | 06/1919 | 25/09/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5369 | 208 | 2741 | 06/1919 | 20/11/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5370 | 209 | 2742 | 06/1919 | 16/09/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5371 | 209 | 2743 | 07/1919 | 04/07/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5372 | 209 | 2744 | 07/1919 | 04/07/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5373 | 209 | 2745 | 07/1919 | 12/06/1950 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5374 | 209 | 2746 | 07/1919 | 14/06/1948 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5375 | 209 | 2747 | 08/1919 | 19/10/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5376 | 209 | 2748 | 08/1919 | 08/06/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5377 | 209 | 2749 | 08/1919 | 22/09/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5378 | 209 | 2750 | 08/1919 | 14/09/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5379 | 209 | 2751 | 08/1919 | 13/05/1958 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4262 | 213 | 2842 | 09/1919 | 20/04/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4263 | 213 | 2843 | 10/1919 | 14/02/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4264 | 213 | 2844 | 10/1919 | 29/07/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4265 | 213 | 2845 | 11/1919 | 24/06/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4266 | 213 | 2846 | 11/1919 | 29/08/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4267 | 213 | 2847 | 11/1919 | 23/10/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4268 | 213 | 2848 | 11/1919 | 25/08/1965 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4269 | 213 | 2849 | 12/1919 | 19/11/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4270 | 213 | 2850 | 12/1919 | 27/09/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4271 | 213 | 2851 | 02/1920 | 16/12/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4272 | 213 | 2852 | 28/02/1920 | 15/10/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4273 | 213 | 2853 | 03/1920 | 09/10/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4274 | 213 | 2854 | 03/1920 | 22/06/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4275 | 213 | 2855 | 03/1920 | 06/01/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4276 | 213 | 2856 | 04/1920 | 13/11/1962 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4277 | 213 | 2857 | 04/1920 | 08/06/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4278 | 213 | 2858 | 04/1920 | 06/07/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5380 | 209 | 2752 | 04/1920 | 23/09/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4279 | 213 | 2859 | 05/1920 | 15/01/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4280 | 213 | 2860 | 05/1920 | 22/01/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4281 | 213 | 2861 | 05/1920 | 13/12/1960 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4282 | 213 | 2862 | 06/1920 | 10/09/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4283 | 213 | 2863 | 06/1920 | 09/10/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5381 | 209 | 2753 | 06/1920 | 01/09/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5382 | 209 | 2754 | 06/1920 | 23/04/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5383 | 209 | 2755 | 07/1920 | 05/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5384 | 209 | 2756 | 07/1920 | 11/10/1960 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4284 | 213 | 2864 | 08/1920 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4285 | 213 | 2865 | 08/1920 | 21/04/1965 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5385 | 209 | 2757 | 08/1920 | 13/07/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5386 | 209 | 2758 | 08/1920 | 20/10/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5387 | 209 | 2759 | 08/1920 | 03/1939 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5388 | 209 | 2760 | 08/1920 | 09/03/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5389 | 209 | 2761 | 09/1920 | 05/1937 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5390 | 211 | 2790 | 10/1920 | 13/08/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5391 | 211 | 2791 | 10/1920 | 18/03/1957 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5392 | 211 | 2792 | 10/1920 | 27/08/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5393 | 211 | 2793 | 10/1920 | 05/10/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5394 | 211 | 2794 | 10/1920 | 07/01/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5395 | 211 | 2795 | 10/1920 | 10/10/1955 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5396 | 211 | 2796 | 11/1920 | 09/05/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5397 | 211 | 2797 | 11/1920 | 24/07/1958 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5398 | 211 | 2798 | 11/1920 | 23/02/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5399 | 211 | 2799 | 11/1920 | 17/09/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6300 | 211 | 2800 | 11/1920 | 27/06/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6301 | 211 | 2801 | 12/1920 | 15/10/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6302 | 211 | 2802 | 12/1920 | 29/03/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6303 | 211 | 2803 | 12/1920 | 01/04/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6304 | 211 | 2804 | 12/1920 | 15/01/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6305 | 211 | 2805 | 12/1920 | 01/09/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6306 | 211 | 2806 | 12/1920 | 21/11/1961 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6307 | 211 | 2807 | 01/1921 | 25/07/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6308 | 211 | 2808 | 01/1921 | 24/08/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6309 | 211 | 2809 | 01/1921 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6310 | 211 | 2810 | 01/1921 | 05/07/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6311 | 211 | 2811 | 01/1921 | 18/01/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6312 | 211 | 2812 | 01/1921 | 21/09/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6313 | 211 | 2813 | 01/1921 | 21/11/1961 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6314 | 211 | 2814 | 01/1921 | 24/05/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6315 | 211 | 2815 | 01/1921 | 24/10/1945 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6316 | 211 | 2816 | 01/1921 | 25/07/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6317 | 211 | 2817 | 01/1921 | 20/11/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6318 | 212 | 2818 | 02/1921 | 05/01/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6319 | 212 | 2819 | 02/1921 | 26/08/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6320 | 212 | 2820 | 02/1921 | 20/11/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6321 | 212 | 2821 | 02/1921 | 19/03/1956 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6322 | 212 | 2822 | 02/1921 | 05/01/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6323 | 212 | 2823 | 03/1921 | 11/07/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6324 | 212 | 2824 | 03/1921 | 02/04/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6325 | 212 | 2825 | 03/1921 | 23/11/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6326 | 212 | 2826 | 03/1921 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6327 | 212 | 2827 | 03/1921 | 23/09/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6328 | 212 | 2828 | 03/1921 | 19/01/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6329 | 212 | 2829 | 04/1921 | 19/10/1961 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6330 | 212 | 2830 | 04/1921 | 21/09/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6331 | 212 | 2831 | 04/1921 | 20/04/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6332 | 212 | 2832 | 04/1921 | 16/09/1960 |
GWR | Crane Tank | 0-6-4PT | 16 | 219 | 04/1921 | 09/1936 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6333 | 212 | 2833 | 05/1921 | 24/10/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6334 | 212 | 2834 | 05/1921 | 06/04/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6335 | 212 | 2835 | 05/1921 | 02/07/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6336 | 212 | 2836 | 05/1921 | 05/04/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6337 | 212 | 2837 | 06/1921 | 06/07/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6338 | 212 | 2838 | 06/1921 | 15/06/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6339 | 212 | 2839 | 06/1921 | 31/07/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6340 | 212 | 2840 | 06/1921 | 13/07/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6341 | 212 | 2841 | 07/1921 | 13/11/1961 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4286 | 220 | 08/1921 | 21/09/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4287 | 220 | 08/1921 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4288 | 220 | 09/1921 | 29/11/1960 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4289 | 220 | 09/1921 | 05/10/1962 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4290 | 220 | 09/1921 | 11/02/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4291 | 220 | 09/1921 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4292 | 220 | 10/1921 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4293 | 220 | 10/1921 | 24/08/1962 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4294 | 220 | 11/1921 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4295 | 220 | 11/1921 | 14/12/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7305 | 222 | 11/1921 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7306 | 222 | 11/1921 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7307 | 222 | 11/1921 | 01/06/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7308 | 222 | 11/1921 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7309 | 222 | 11/1921 | 27/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7310 | 222 | 12/1921 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7311 | 222 | 12/1921 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7312 | 222 | 12/1921 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7313 | 222 | 12/1921 | 03/07/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7314 | 222 | 12/1921 | 26/02/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7315 | 222 | 12/1921 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7316 | 222 | 12/1921 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7317 | 222 | 12/1921 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7318 | 222 | 12/1921 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4701 | 221 | 01/1922 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7319 | 222 | 01/1922 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4702 | 221 | 02/1922 | 28/06/1962 | |
GWR | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4703 | 221 | 03/1922 | 11/05/1964 | |
GWR | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4704 | 221 | 04/1922 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4705 | 221 | 04/1922 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4061 | 217 | 2915 | 05/1922 | 11/03/1957 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4062 | 217 | 2916 | 05/1922 | 05/11/1956 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4296 | 220 | 08/1922 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4297 | 220 | 08/1922 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4298 | 220 | 10/1922 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4299 | 220 | 10/1922 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4063 | 217 | 2917 | 11/1922 | 07/01/1959 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4064 | 217 | 2918 | 12/1922 | 02/07/1963 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4065 | 217 | 2919 | 12/1922 | 14/02/1964 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4066 | 217 | 2920 | 12/1922 | 10/11/1958 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5200 | 220 | 12/1922 | 26/03/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5201 | 220 | 12/1922 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5202 | 220 | 12/1922 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4067 | 217 | 2921 | 01/1923 | 01/08/1963 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4068 | 217 | 2922 | 01/1923 | 21/09/1962 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4069 | 217 | 2923 | 01/1923 | 14/11/1964 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4200 | 220 | 02/1923 | 09/03/1959 | |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4070 | 217 | 2924 | 02/1923 | 31/05/1962 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4071 | 217 | 2925 | 02/1923 | 03/10/1964 |
GWR | Star | 4-6-0 | 4072 | 217 | 2926 | 02/1923 | 29/07/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5203 | 220 | 02/1923 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5204 | 220 | 02/1923 | 19/11/1962 | |
GWR | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4706 | 221 | 03/1923 | 26/02/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6342 | 216 | 2887 | 03/1923 | 17/09/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6343 | 216 | 2888 | 03/1923 | 21/09/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6344 | 216 | 2889 | 03/1923 | 20/11/1963 |
GWR | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4707 | 221 | 04/1923 | 11/05/1964 | |
GWR | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4708 | 221 | 04/1923 | 15/10/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6345 | 216 | 2890 | 04/1923 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6346 | 216 | 2891 | 04/1923 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6347 | 216 | 2892 | 04/1923 | 28/12/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6348 | 216 | 2893 | 04/1923 | 19/02/1962 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6349 | 216 | 2894 | 05/1923 | 10/08/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6350 | 216 | 2895 | 05/1923 | 06/01/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6351 | 216 | 2896 | 05/1923 | 21/11/1960 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5205 | 223 | 06/1923 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5206 | 223 | 06/1923 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5207 | 223 | 07/1923 | 12/01/1961 | |
VofR | VR | 2-6-2T | 8 | 227 | 20/07/1923 | ||
VofR | VR | 2-6-2T | 7 | 227 | 23/07/1923 | ||
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5208 | 223 | 08/1923 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5209 | 223 | 08/1923 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | 224 | 11/08/1923 | 10/05/1960 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5210 | 223 | 09/1923 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5211 | 223 | 09/1923 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6352 | 216 | 2897 | 09/1923 | 21/11/1960 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6353 | 216 | 2898 | 09/1923 | 24/05/1963 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5212 | 223 | 10/1923 | 29/05/1962 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5213 | 223 | 10/1923 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6354 | 216 | 2899 | 10/1923 | 23/02/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6355 | 216 | 2900 | 10/1923 | 02/03/1959 |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5214 | 223 | 11/1923 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6356 | 216 | 2901 | 11/1923 | 14/01/1963 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6357 | 216 | 2902 | 11/1923 | 13/07/1964 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6358 | 216 | 2903 | 11/1923 | 12/10/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6359 | 216 | 2904 | 11/1923 | 07/09/1959 |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6360 | 216 | 2905 | 11/1923 | 21/11/1960 |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | 224 | 12/1923 | 03/05/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6361 | 216 | 2906 | 12/1923 | 06/05/1964 |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | 224 | 01/1924 | 03/11/1961 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | 224 | 07/02/1924 | 08/02/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4077 | 224 | 10/02/1924 | 02/08/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4078 | 224 | 24/02/1924 | 02/07/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | 224 | 03/1924 | 01/01/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5215 | 225 | 03/1924 | 13/07/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | 224 | 04/03/1924 | 14/05/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | 224 | 23/03/1924 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5216 | 225 | 04/1924 | 25/10/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5217 | 225 | 04/1924 | 24/05/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5218 | 225 | 04/1924 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5219 | 225 | 04/1924 | 06/12/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | 224 | 12/04/1924 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5220 | 225 | 05/1924 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5221 | 225 | 05/1924 | 25/10/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5222 | 225 | 05/1924 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5223 | 225 | 05/1924 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5224 | 225 | 05/1924 | 11/04/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5225 | 225 | 05/1924 | 19/08/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5226 | 225 | 05/1924 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5227 | 225 | 06/1924 | 01/02/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5228 | 225 | 06/1924 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5229 | 225 | 06/1924 | 24/05/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5230 | 225 | 06/1924 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5231 | 225 | 06/1924 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5232 | 225 | 07/1924 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5233 | 225 | 07/1924 | 01/08/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5234 | 225 | 07/1924 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5235 | 225 | 07/1924 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5236 | 225 | 08/1924 | 07/10/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5237 | 225 | 08/1924 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5238 | 225 | 08/1924 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5239 | 225 | 08/1924 | 25/04/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5240 | 225 | 08/1924 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5241 | 225 | 08/1924 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5242 | 225 | 08/1924 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5243 | 225 | 08/1924 | 27/11/1964 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4555 | 226 | 09/1924 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4556 | 226 | 09/1924 | 20/06/1960 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4557 | 226 | 09/1924 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4558 | 226 | 09/1924 | 24/07/1962 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4559 | 226 | 09/1924 | 24/10/1960 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4560 | 226 | 09/1924 | 17/08/1959 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5244 | 225 | 09/1924 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4561 | 226 | 10/1924 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4562 | 226 | 10/1924 | 07/03/1960 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4563 | 226 | 10/1924 | 11/10/1961 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4564 | 226 | 10/1924 | 21/09/1964 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4565 | 226 | 10/1924 | 03/10/1961 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4566 | 226 | 10/1924 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4567 | 226 | 10/1924 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4568 | 226 | 10/1924 | 16/02/1959 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4569 | 226 | 10/1924 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4570 | 226 | 11/1924 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4571 | 226 | 11/1924 | 22/03/1961 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4572 | 226 | 11/1924 | 10/12/1958 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4573 | 226 | 11/1924 | 09/08/1961 | |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4574 | 226 | 11/1924 | 01/03/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5600 | 228 | 12/1924 | 27/07/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5601 | 228 | 12/1924 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5602 | 228 | 12/1924 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5603 | 228 | 12/1924 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5604 | 228 | 01/1925 | 13/11/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5605 | 228 | 01/1925 | 21/05/1966 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5606 | 228 | 02/1925 | 13/11/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5607 | 228 | 02/1925 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5608 | 228 | 02/1925 | 29/08/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5609 | 228 | 02/1925 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5610 | 228 | 02/1925 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5611 | 228 | 02/1925 | 09/01/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5612 | 228 | 02/1925 | 25/04/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5613 | 228 | 02/1925 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5614 | 228 | 02/1925 | 29/08/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5615 | 228 | 03/1925 | 02/07/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5616 | 228 | 03/1925 | 23/09/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5617 | 228 | 03/1925 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5618 | 228 | 03/1925 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5619 | 228 | 03/1925 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6362 | 230 | 04/1925 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6363 | 230 | 04/1925 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7320 | 230 | 04/1925 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7321 | 230 | 04/1925 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6364 | 230 | 05/1925 | 21/11/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | 232 | 09/05/1925 | 19/12/1961 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | 232 | 30/05/1925 | 11/10/1960 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5620 | 228 | 06/1925 | 16/07/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5621 | 228 | 06/1925 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5622 | 228 | 06/1925 | 06/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5623 | 228 | 06/1925 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5624 | 228 | 06/1925 | 01/06/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4085 | 232 | 10/06/1925 | 02/05/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | 232 | 20/06/1925 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4087 | 232 | 27/06/1925 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | 232 | 08/07/1925 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4088 | 232 | 25/07/1925 | 14/05/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5625 | 228 | 08/1925 | 25/10/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5626 | 228 | 08/1925 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5627 | 228 | 08/1925 | 11/04/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5628 | 228 | 08/1925 | 11/02/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5629 | 228 | 08/1925 | 14/05/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5630 | 228 | 08/1925 | 05/12/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5631 | 228 | 08/1925 | 13/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | 232 | 01/08/1925 | 19/01/1959 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4092 | 232 | 06/08/1925 | 19/12/1961 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | 232 | 15/08/1925 | 06/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5632 | 228 | 09/1925 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5633 | 228 | 09/1925 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5634 | 228 | 09/1925 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5635 | 228 | 09/1925 | 14/05/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5636 | 228 | 09/1925 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5637 | 228 | 09/1925 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5638 | 228 | 09/1925 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5639 | 228 | 09/1925 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5640 | 228 | 10/1925 | 06/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5641 | 228 | 10/1925 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5642 | 228 | 10/1925 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5643 | 228 | 10/1925 | 02/07/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6365 | 230 | 10/1925 | 21/10/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6366 | 230 | 10/1925 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6367 | 230 | 10/1925 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6368 | 230 | 10/1925 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6369 | 230 | 10/1925 | 11/02/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5245 | 233 | 11/1925 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5644 | 228 | 11/1925 | 17/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5645 | 228 | 11/1925 | 07/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5646 | 228 | 11/1925 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5647 | 228 | 11/1925 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5648 | 228 | 11/1925 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5649 | 228 | 11/1925 | 15/03/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5246 | 233 | 12/1925 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5247 | 233 | 12/1925 | 01/03/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5248 | 233 | 12/1925 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5249 | 233 | 12/1925 | 22/10/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5250 | 233 | 12/1925 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5251 | 233 | 12/1925 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5252 | 233 | 12/1925 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5253 | 233 | 12/1925 | 25/04/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5254 | 233 | 12/1925 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5255 | 233 | 12/1925 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5256 | 233 | 12/1925 | 28/11/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5257 | 233 | 12/1925 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5258 | 233 | 01/1926 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5259 | 233 | 01/1926 | 06/12/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5650 | 235 | 01/1926 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5651 | 235 | 01/1926 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5652 | 235 | 01/1926 | 27/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5653 | 235 | 01/1926 | 01/01/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5654 | 235 | 01/1926 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5655 | 235 | 01/1926 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5656 | 235 | 02/1926 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5657 | 235 | 02/1926 | 27/07/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5658 | 235 | 02/1926 | 13/11/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5659 | 235 | 02/1926 | 27/11/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5660 | 235 | 02/1926 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5661 | 235 | 02/1926 | 27/07/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5662 | 235 | 02/1926 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5663 | 235 | 02/1926 | 03/08/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5664 | 235 | 02/1926 | 31/08/1962 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5260 | 233 | 03/1926 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5261 | 233 | 03/1926 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5262 | 233 | 03/1926 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5263 | 233 | 03/1926 | 29/07/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5264 | 233 | 03/1926 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5265 | 233 | 03/1926 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5266 | 233 | 03/1926 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5267 | 233 | 03/1926 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5268 | 233 | 03/1926 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5269 | 233 | 03/1926 | 22/10/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5270 | 233 | 04/1926 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5271 | 233 | 04/1926 | 13/11/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5272 | 233 | 04/1926 | 17/06/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5273 | 233 | 04/1926 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5274 | 233 | 04/1926 | 22/10/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4093 | 234 | 26/05/1926 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5665 | 235 | 06/1926 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5666 | 235 | 06/1926 | 16/07/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5667 | 235 | 06/1926 | 17/07/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5668 | 235 | 06/1926 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5669 | 235 | 06/1926 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4094 | 234 | 05/06/1926 | 23/03/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4095 | 234 | 16/06/1926 | 12/12/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | 234 | 23/06/1926 | 01/01/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | 234 | 30/06/1926 | 06/05/1960 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4098 | 234 | 29/07/1926 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5670 | 235 | 08/1926 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5671 | 235 | 08/1926 | 06/01/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5672 | 235 | 08/1926 | 13/09/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5673 | 235 | 08/1926 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5674 | 235 | 08/1926 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4099 | 234 | 03/08/1926 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | 234 | 21/08/1926 | 26/02/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | 234 | 28/08/1926 | 31/10/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | 234 | 28/08/1926 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5675 | 235 | 09/1926 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5676 | 235 | 09/1926 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5677 | 235 | 09/1926 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5678 | 235 | 09/1926 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5679 | 235 | 09/1926 | 29/07/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5680 | 235 | 09/1926 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5681 | 235 | 10/1926 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5682 | 235 | 10/1926 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5683 | 235 | 10/1926 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5684 | 235 | 10/1926 | 17/07/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5685 | 235 | 01/1927 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5686 | 235 | 01/1927 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5687 | 235 | 01/1927 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5688 | 235 | 01/1927 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5689 | 235 | 01/1927 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5690 | 235 | 01/1927 | 01/08/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5691 | 235 | 01/1927 | 25/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5692 | 235 | 01/1927 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5693 | 235 | 01/1927 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5694 | 235 | 01/1927 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5695 | 235 | 01/1927 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5696 | 235 | 01/1927 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5697 | 235 | 01/1927 | 25/04/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5698 | 235 | 01/1927 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5699 | 235 | 01/1927 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4575 | 242 | 02/1927 | 15/08/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4576 | 242 | 02/1927 | 18/09/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4577 | 242 | 02/1927 | 02/11/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4578 | 242 | 02/1927 | 22/08/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4579 | 242 | 02/1927 | 08/09/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4580 | 242 | 02/1927 | 23/06/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4581 | 242 | 02/1927 | 21/04/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4582 | 242 | 02/1927 | 28/04/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4583 | 242 | 02/1927 | 27/01/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4584 | 242 | 02/1927 | 06/02/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4585 | 242 | 03/1927 | 12/10/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4586 | 242 | 03/1927 | 16/04/1956 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4587 | 242 | 03/1927 | 01/08/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4588 | 242 | 03/1927 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4589 | 242 | 03/1927 | 21/09/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4590 | 242 | 03/1927 | 24/10/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4591 | 242 | 03/1927 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4592 | 242 | 03/1927 | 18/01/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4593 | 242 | 03/1927 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4594 | 242 | 04/1927 | 07/11/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4595 | 242 | 04/1927 | 16/12/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4596 | 242 | 04/1927 | 16/09/1957 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4597 | 242 | 04/1927 | 27/01/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4598 | 242 | 04/1927 | 17/12/1956 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4599 | 242 | 04/1927 | 13/03/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5500 | 242 | 04/1927 | 12/10/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5501 | 242 | 05/1927 | 21/07/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5502 | 242 | 05/1927 | 14/07/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5503 | 242 | 05/1927 | 30/05/1961 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5504 | 242 | 05/1927 | 24/10/1960 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | 234 | 28/05/1927 | 29/08/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6000 | 243 | 06/1927 | 04/12/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5005 | 234 | 11/06/1927 | 29/02/1960 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | 234 | 11/06/1927 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5004 | 234 | 16/06/1927 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | 234 | 30/06/1927 | 05/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | 234 | 30/06/1927 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6001 | 243 | 07/1927 | 06/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6002 | 243 | 07/1927 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6003 | 243 | 07/1927 | 19/06/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6004 | 243 | 07/1927 | 19/06/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6005 | 243 | 07/1927 | 20/11/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5009 | 234 | 06/07/1927 | 24/10/1960 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5011 | 234 | 22/07/1927 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | 234 | 26/07/1927 | 05/10/1959 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5012 | 234 | 27/07/1927 | 24/04/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6600 | 244 | 08/1927 | 24/08/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6601 | 244 | 08/1927 | 05/11/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6602 | 244 | 08/1927 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6603 | 244 | 09/1927 | 20/03/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6604 | 244 | 09/1927 | 02/10/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6605 | 244 | 09/1927 | 22/01/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6606 | 244 | 09/1927 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6607 | 244 | 09/1927 | 15/03/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6608 | 244 | 09/1927 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6609 | 244 | 09/1927 | 13/09/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6610 | 244 | 09/1927 | 01/02/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6611 | 244 | 09/1927 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5505 | 249 | 10/1927 | 27/05/1957 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5506 | 249 | 10/1927 | 12/05/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5507 | 249 | 10/1927 | 18/08/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5508 | 249 | 10/1927 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5509 | 249 | 10/1927 | 21/12/1961 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6612 | 244 | 10/1927 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6613 | 244 | 10/1927 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6614 | 244 | 10/1927 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5510 | 249 | 11/1927 | 24/10/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5511 | 249 | 11/1927 | 05/12/1961 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5512 | 249 | 11/1927 | 11/02/1957 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5513 | 249 | 11/1927 | 03/06/1957 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5514 | 249 | 11/1927 | 09/11/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5515 | 249 | 11/1927 | 21/11/1961 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5516 | 249 | 11/1927 | 24/08/1961 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5518 | 249 | 11/1927 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5517 | 249 | 12/1927 | 01/12/1958 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5519 | 249 | 12/1927 | 20/06/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5520 | 249 | 12/1927 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5521 | 249 | 12/1927 | 05/04/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5522 | 249 | 12/1927 | 20/03/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5523 | 249 | 12/1927 | 20/06/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5524 | 249 | 12/1927 | 20/06/1960 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6615 | 244 | 12/1927 | 13/05/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6616 | 244 | 12/1927 | 27/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6617 | 244 | 12/1927 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6618 | 244 | 12/1927 | 13/11/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6619 | 244 | 01/1928 | 14/03/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6620 | 244 | 01/1928 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6621 | 244 | 01/1928 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6622 | 244 | 01/1928 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6623 | 244 | 01/1928 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6624 | 244 | 01/1928 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6625 | 244 | 01/1928 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6626 | 244 | 01/1928 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6006 | 243 | 02/1928 | 15/02/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6627 | 244 | 02/1928 | 01/11/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6628 | 244 | 02/1928 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6629 | 244 | 02/1928 | 15/10/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6007 | 243 | 03/1928 | 05/03/1936 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6008 | 243 | 03/1928 | 19/06/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6009 | 243 | 03/1928 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6010 | 243 | 04/1928 | 22/06/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6011 | 243 | 04/1928 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6012 | 243 | 04/1928 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5525 | 251 | 05/1928 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5526 | 251 | 05/1928 | 08/06/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5527 | 251 | 05/1928 | 20/06/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5528 | 251 | 05/1928 | 16/11/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5529 | 251 | 05/1928 | 01/08/1960 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6013 | 243 | 05/1928 | 19/06/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6014 | 243 | 05/1928 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5530 | 251 | 06/1928 | 04/01/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5531 | 251 | 06/1928 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5532 | 251 | 06/1928 | 10/07/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5533 | 251 | 06/1928 | 24/12/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5534 | 251 | 06/1928 | 21/09/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5535 | 251 | 06/1928 | 20/06/1957 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6015 | 243 | 06/1928 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6016 | 243 | 06/1928 | 13/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6017 | 243 | 06/1928 | 24/07/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6018 | 243 | 06/1928 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5536 | 251 | 07/1928 | 13/12/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5537 | 251 | 07/1928 | 17/08/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5538 | 251 | 07/1928 | 19/10/1961 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5539 | 251 | 07/1928 | 13/04/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5540 | 251 | 07/1928 | 15/08/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5542 | 251 | 07/1928 | 12/12/1961 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5543 | 251 | 07/1928 | 25/07/1960 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6019 | 243 | 07/1928 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5541 | 251 | 08/1928 | 10/07/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5544 | 251 | 08/1928 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6630 | 252 | 08/1928 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6631 | 252 | 08/1928 | 10/09/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6632 | 252 | 08/1928 | 10/09/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6633 | 252 | 08/1928 | 29/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6634 | 252 | 08/1928 | 24/04/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6635 | 252 | 08/1928 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6636 | 252 | 08/1928 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6637 | 252 | 08/1928 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6650 | 255 | 08/1928 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6651 | 255 | 08/1928 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6652 | 255 | 08/1928 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6653 | 255 | 08/1928 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6654 | 255 | 08/1928 | 25/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6655 | 255 | 08/1928 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6656 | 255 | 08/1928 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6657 | 255 | 08/1928 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6659 | 255 | 08/1928 | 21/10/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6638 | 252 | 09/1928 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6639 | 252 | 09/1928 | 21/10/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6640 | 252 | 09/1928 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6641 | 252 | 09/1928 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6642 | 252 | 09/1928 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6643 | 252 | 09/1928 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6644 | 252 | 09/1928 | 03/07/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6645 | 252 | 09/1928 | 02/08/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6646 | 252 | 09/1928 | 16/05/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6647 | 252 | 09/1928 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6648 | 252 | 09/1928 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6649 | 252 | 09/1928 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6658 | 255 | 09/1928 | 21/04/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6660 | 255 | 09/1928 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6661 | 255 | 09/1928 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6662 | 255 | 09/1928 | 05/04/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6663 | 255 | 09/1928 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6664 | 255 | 09/1928 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6665 | 255 | 09/1928 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6666 | 255 | 09/1928 | 29/07/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6667 | 255 | 09/1928 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6668 | 255 | 09/1928 | 04/12/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6669 | 255 | 09/1928 | 05/12/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6670 | 255 | 09/1928 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6671 | 255 | 09/1928 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6672 | 255 | 09/1928 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6673 | 255 | 09/1928 | 07/03/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6674 | 255 | 09/1928 | 29/07/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6675 | 255 | 09/1928 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6676 | 255 | 09/1928 | 05/04/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6677 | 255 | 09/1928 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6678 | 255 | 09/1928 | 28/11/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6679 | 255 | 09/1928 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5545 | 253 | 10/1928 | 27/11/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5546 | 253 | 10/1928 | 21/09/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5547 | 253 | 10/1928 | 28/02/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5548 | 253 | 10/1928 | 06/06/1963 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5549 | 253 | 10/1928 | 08/01/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5550 | 253 | 10/1928 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5551 | 253 | 10/1928 | 04/01/1960 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6680 | 255 | 10/1928 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6681 | 255 | 10/1928 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6682 | 255 | 10/1928 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6683 | 255 | 10/1928 | 23/10/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6684 | 255 | 10/1928 | 27/11/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6685 | 255 | 10/1928 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6686 | 255 | 10/1928 | 24/04/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6687 | 255 | 10/1928 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6688 | 255 | 10/1928 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6689 | 255 | 10/1928 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6690 | 255 | 10/1928 | 25/06/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6691 | 255 | 10/1928 | 25/06/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6692 | 255 | 10/1928 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6693 | 255 | 10/1928 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6694 | 255 | 10/1928 | 25/10/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6695 | 255 | 10/1928 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6696 | 255 | 10/1928 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6697 | 255 | 10/1928 | 21/05/1966 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6698 | 255 | 10/1928 | 07/03/1963 | |
GWR | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6699 | 255 | 10/1928 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5552 | 253 | 11/1928 | 24/10/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5553 | 253 | 11/1928 | 16/11/1961 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5554 | 253 | 11/1928 | 19/08/1963 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5555 | 253 | 11/1928 | 02/07/1963 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5556 | 253 | 11/1928 | 07/12/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5557 | 253 | 11/1928 | 24/10/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5558 | 253 | 11/1928 | 24/10/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5559 | 253 | 11/1928 | 04/01/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4901 | 254 | 12/1928 | 16/09/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4902 | 254 | 12/1928 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4903 | 254 | 12/1928 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4904 | 254 | 12/1928 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4905 | 254 | 12/1928 | 13/11/1963 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5560 | 253 | 12/1928 | 05/04/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5561 | 253 | 12/1928 | 25/07/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5562 | 253 | 12/1928 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5563 | 253 | 12/1928 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5564 | 253 | 12/1928 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4906 | 254 | 01/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4907 | 254 | 01/1929 | 01/08/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4908 | 254 | 01/1929 | 22/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4909 | 254 | 01/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4910 | 254 | 01/1929 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5565 | 253 | 01/1929 | 16/09/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5566 | 253 | 01/1929 | 26/01/1959 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5567 | 253 | 01/1929 | 04/01/1960 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5568 | 253 | 01/1929 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5569 | 253 | 01/1929 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4911 | 254 | 02/1929 | 06/1941 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4912 | 254 | 02/1929 | 24/08/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4913 | 254 | 02/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4914 | 254 | 02/1929 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4915 | 254 | 02/1929 | 26/02/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4916 | 254 | 02/1929 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5570 | 253 | 02/1929 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5571 | 253 | 02/1929 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5572 | 253 | 02/1929 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5573 | 253 | 02/1929 | 11/01/1964 | |
GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5574 | 253 | 02/1929 | 08/12/1958 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4917 | 254 | 03/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4918 | 254 | 03/1929 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4919 | 254 | 03/1929 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4920 | 254 | 03/1929 | 03/12/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4921 | 254 | 04/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4922 | 254 | 04/1929 | 04/07/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4923 | 254 | 04/1929 | 30/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5750 | 258 | 04/1929 | 09/05/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5751 | 258 | 04/1929 | 14/04/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5752 | 258 | 04/1929 | 30/11/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5753 | 258 | 04/1929 | 14/09/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5754 | 258 | 04/1929 | 20/06/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5755 | 258 | 04/1929 | 18/07/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4924 | 254 | 05/1929 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4925 | 254 | 05/1929 | 07/08/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4926 | 254 | 05/1929 | 25/09/1961 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4927 | 254 | 05/1929 | 23/09/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4928 | 254 | 05/1929 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4929 | 254 | 05/1929 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4930 | 254 | 05/1929 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4931 | 254 | 05/1929 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5756 | 258 | 05/1929 | 05/09/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5757 | 258 | 05/1929 | 30/11/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5758 | 258 | 05/1929 | 15/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5759 | 258 | 05/1929 | 23/09/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5760 | 258 | 05/1929 | 14/10/1957 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4932 | 254 | 06/1929 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4933 | 254 | 06/1929 | 15/08/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4934 | 254 | 06/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4935 | 254 | 06/1929 | 22/03/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4936 | 254 | 06/1929 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4937 | 254 | 06/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4938 | 254 | 06/1929 | 26/11/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5761 | 258 | 06/1929 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5762 | 258 | 06/1929 | 19/03/1956 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5763 | 258 | 06/1929 | 02/05/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5764 | 258 | 06/1929 | 22/05/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5765 | 258 | 06/1929 | 23/03/1959 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4939 | 254 | 07/1929 | 11/02/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4940 | 254 | 07/1929 | 09/11/1959 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4941 | 254 | 07/1929 | 22/10/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4942 | 254 | 07/1929 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4943 | 254 | 07/1929 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4944 | 254 | 07/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 254 | 07/1929 | 25/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5766 | 258 | 07/1929 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5767 | 258 | 07/1929 | 08/09/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5768 | 258 | 07/1929 | 02/03/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5769 | 258 | 07/1929 | 28/05/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4945 | 254 | 08/1929 | 03/11/1961 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4946 | 254 | 08/1929 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4947 | 254 | 08/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4948 | 254 | 08/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4949 | 254 | 08/1929 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4950 | 254 | 08/1929 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4952 | 254 | 08/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4953 | 254 | 08/1929 | 02/05/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4954 | 254 | 08/1929 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4955 | 254 | 08/1929 | 21/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4956 | 254 | 09/1929 | 04/07/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4957 | 254 | 09/1929 | 30/03/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4958 | 254 | 09/1929 | 21/09/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4959 | 254 | 09/1929 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4960 | 254 | 09/1929 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5770 | 258 | 09/1929 | 20/12/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5771 | 258 | 09/1929 | 10/03/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5772 | 258 | 09/1929 | 06/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5773 | 258 | 09/1929 | 12/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5774 | 258 | 09/1929 | 05/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5775 | 258 | 09/1929 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5776 | 258 | 09/1929 | 02/05/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5777 | 258 | 09/1929 | 25/06/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5778 | 258 | 09/1929 | 24/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5779 | 258 | 09/1929 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4961 | 254 | 11/1929 | 05/11/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4962 | 254 | 11/1929 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4963 | 254 | 11/1929 | 05/06/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4964 | 254 | 11/1929 | 15/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4965 | 254 | 11/1929 | 26/03/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4966 | 254 | 11/1929 | 01/11/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5101 | 257 | 11/1929 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5102 | 257 | 11/1929 | 14/03/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5103 | 257 | 11/1929 | 23/12/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5104 | 257 | 11/1929 | 09/11/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5105 | 257 | 11/1929 | 16/10/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5106 | 257 | 11/1929 | 14/03/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4967 | 254 | 12/1929 | 13/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4968 | 254 | 12/1929 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4969 | 254 | 12/1929 | 13/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4970 | 254 | 12/1929 | 29/07/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5107 | 257 | 12/1929 | 30/07/1957 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5108 | 257 | 12/1929 | 04/07/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5109 | 257 | 12/1929 | 24/06/1957 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5110 | 257 | 12/1929 | 05/12/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5780 | 260 | 12/1929 | 02/10/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5781 | 260 | 12/1929 | 10/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5782 | 260 | 12/1929 | 10/11/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5783 | 260 | 12/1929 | 13/03/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5784 | 260 | 12/1929 | 22/06/1959 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4971 | 254 | 01/1930 | 13/08/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4972 | 254 | 01/1930 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4973 | 254 | 01/1930 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4974 | 254 | 01/1930 | 13/04/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4975 | 254 | 01/1930 | 30/09/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4976 | 254 | 01/1930 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4977 | 254 | 01/1930 | 10/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5785 | 260 | 01/1930 | 22/12/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5786 | 260 | 01/1930 | 04/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5787 | 260 | 01/1930 | 01/10/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5788 | 260 | 01/1930 | 19/10/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5789 | 260 | 01/1930 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4978 | 254 | 02/1930 | 21/09/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4979 | 254 | 02/1930 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4980 | 254 | 02/1930 | 04/07/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5150 | 257 | 21/02/1930 | 15/08/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5151 | 257 | 22/02/1930 | 17/08/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5152 | 257 | 26/02/1930 | 20/11/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2251 | 261 | 03/1930 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2252 | 261 | 03/1930 | 07/12/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2253 | 261 | 03/1930 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2254 | 261 | 03/1930 | 19/01/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2255 | 261 | 03/1930 | 08/05/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2256 | 261 | 03/1930 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5153 | 257 | 12/03/1930 | 21/11/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5154 | 257 | 14/03/1930 | 29/08/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5155 | 257 | 14/03/1930 | 25/01/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5156 | 257 | 15/03/1930 | 09/09/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5157 | 257 | 24/03/1930 | 28/07/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5158 | 257 | 26/03/1930 | 06/04/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5159 | 257 | 28/03/1930 | 16/04/1956 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2257 | 261 | 04/1930 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2258 | 261 | 04/1930 | 15/12/1958 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2259 | 261 | 04/1930 | 13/04/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2260 | 261 | 04/1930 | 03/11/1961 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2261 | 261 | 04/1930 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2262 | 261 | 04/1930 | 30/11/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2263 | 261 | 04/1930 | 05/01/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2264 | 261 | 04/1930 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2270 | 261 | 04/1930 | 21/09/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2265 | 261 | 05/1930 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2266 | 261 | 05/1930 | 06/10/1959 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6020 | 267 | 05/1930 | 24/07/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2267 | 261 | 06/1930 | 21/11/1961 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2268 | 261 | 06/1930 | 22/05/1965 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6021 | 267 | 06/1930 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6022 | 267 | 06/1930 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6023 | 267 | 06/1930 | 19/06/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6024 | 267 | 06/1930 | 19/06/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2269 | 261 | 07/1930 | 27/01/1959 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5275 | 266 | 07/1930 | 02/07/1963 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6025 | 267 | 07/1930 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6026 | 267 | 07/1930 | 12/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6027 | 267 | 07/1930 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6028 | 267 | 07/1930 | 20/11/1962 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5276 | 266 | 08/1930 | 21/04/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5277 | 266 | 08/1930 | 01/06/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5278 | 266 | 08/1930 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5279 | 266 | 08/1930 | 26/02/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5280 | 266 | 08/1930 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5281 | 266 | 08/1930 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5282 | 266 | 08/1930 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6029 | 267 | 08/1930 | 24/07/1962 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5283 | 266 | 09/1930 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5284 | 266 | 09/1930 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5285 | 266 | 09/1930 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5286 | 266 | 09/1930 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5287 | 266 | 09/1930 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5288 | 266 | 09/1930 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5790 | 260 | 09/1930 | 02/03/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5791 | 260 | 09/1930 | 27/04/1961 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5289 | 266 | 10/1930 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5290 | 266 | 10/1930 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5291 | 266 | 10/1930 | 07/10/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5292 | 266 | 10/1930 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5293 | 266 | 10/1930 | 05/09/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5294 | 266 | 10/1930 | 22/01/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5792 | 260 | 10/1930 | 08/10/1956 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5793 | 260 | 10/1930 | 24/04/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5794 | 260 | 10/1930 | 14/12/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5795 | 260 | 10/1930 | 25/04/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5166 | 259 | 11/1930 | 30/05/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5796 | 260 | 11/1930 | 02/03/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5797 | 260 | 11/1930 | 29/09/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5798 | 260 | 11/1930 | 20/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5799 | 260 | 11/1930 | 13/07/1959 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5160 | 259 | 06/11/1930 | 25/11/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5161 | 259 | 15/11/1930 | 25/04/1957 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5162 | 259 | 21/11/1930 | 16/07/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5164 | 259 | 21/11/1930 | 05/04/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5165 | 259 | 22/11/1930 | 10/02/1958 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4981 | 268 | 12/1930 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5167 | 259 | 12/1930 | 29/01/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5168 | 259 | 12/1930 | 18/08/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5169 | 259 | 12/1930 | 16/09/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5170 | 259 | 12/1930 | 07/12/1959 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5171 | 259 | 12/1930 | 28/07/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5172 | 259 | 12/1930 | 06/10/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5173 | 259 | 12/1930 | 17/08/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5174 | 259 | 12/1930 | 14/11/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5163 | 259 | 08/12/1930 | 02/11/1959 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4982 | 268 | 01/1931 | 11/05/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 268 | 01/1931 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4984 | 268 | 01/1931 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4985 | 268 | 01/1931 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4986 | 268 | 01/1931 | 11/05/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4987 | 268 | 01/1931 | 09/04/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4988 | 268 | 01/1931 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5175 | 259 | 01/1931 | 18/04/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5176 | 259 | 01/1931 | 10/01/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5177 | 259 | 01/1931 | 30/05/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5178 | 259 | 01/1931 | 14/03/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4989 | 268 | 02/1931 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4990 | 268 | 02/1931 | 05/04/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4991 | 268 | 02/1931 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4992 | 268 | 02/1931 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4993 | 268 | 02/1931 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4994 | 268 | 02/1931 | 15/03/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4995 | 268 | 02/1931 | 08/06/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5179 | 259 | 02/1931 | 21/07/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5180 | 259 | 02/1931 | 03/07/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4996 | 268 | 03/1931 | 30/09/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4997 | 268 | 03/1931 | 30/10/1961 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4998 | 268 | 03/1931 | 22/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4999 | 268 | 03/1931 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5181 | 259 | 03/1931 | 24/08/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5182 | 259 | 03/1931 | 25/05/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5183 | 259 | 03/1931 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5184 | 259 | 03/1931 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5185 | 259 | 03/1931 | 15/03/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5186 | 259 | 03/1931 | 10/08/1959 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5900 | 268 | 03/1931 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5187 | 259 | 04/1931 | 14/05/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5188 | 259 | 04/1931 | 19/07/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5189 | 259 | 04/1931 | 03/08/1959 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6100 | 269 | 04/1931 | 29/09/1958 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5901 | 275 | 05/1931 | 25/06/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5902 | 275 | 05/1931 | 13/11/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5903 | 275 | 05/1931 | 10/09/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5904 | 275 | 05/1931 | 13/11/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5905 | 275 | 05/1931 | 29/07/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5906 | 275 | 05/1931 | 25/05/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5907 | 275 | 05/1931 | 03/11/1961 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6101 | 269 | 05/1931 | 05/03/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6102 | 269 | 05/1931 | 17/08/1959 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6103 | 269 | 05/1931 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6104 | 269 | 05/1931 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6105 | 269 | 05/1931 | 14/03/1960 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6106 | 269 | 05/1931 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6107 | 269 | 05/1931 | 27/11/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6108 | 269 | 05/1931 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5908 | 275 | 06/1931 | 29/07/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5909 | 275 | 06/1931 | 30/07/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5910 | 275 | 06/1931 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5911 | 275 | 06/1931 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5912 | 275 | 06/1931 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5913 | 275 | 06/1931 | 14/05/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6109 | 269 | 06/1931 | 29/08/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5914 | 275 | 07/1931 | 22/01/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5915 | 275 | 07/1931 | 13/01/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5916 | 275 | 07/1931 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5917 | 275 | 07/1931 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5918 | 275 | 07/1931 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5919 | 275 | 07/1931 | 26/08/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5920 | 275 | 08/1931 | 18/01/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6110 | 269 | 08/1931 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6111 | 269 | 08/1931 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6112 | 269 | 08/1931 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6113 | 269 | 08/1931 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 269 | 09/1931 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6115 | 269 | 09/1931 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6116 | 269 | 09/1931 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6117 | 269 | 09/1931 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6118 | 269 | 09/1931 | 25/11/1963 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6119 | 269 | 09/1931 | 01/03/1963 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6120 | 269 | 09/1931 | 13/04/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6121 | 269 | 10/1931 | 21/07/1960 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6122 | 269 | 10/1931 | 21/09/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6123 | 269 | 10/1931 | 05/04/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6124 | 269 | 10/1931 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6125 | 269 | 10/1931 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6126 | 269 | 10/1931 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6127 | 269 | 10/1931 | 05/03/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6128 | 269 | 10/1931 | 26/03/1965 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5401 | 277 | 11/1931 | 11/02/1957 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5402 | 277 | 11/1931 | 10/09/1958 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6129 | 269 | 11/1931 | 18/09/1965 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5403 | 277 | 12/1931 | 19/08/1957 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5404 | 277 | 12/1931 | 02/12/1957 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5405 | 277 | 12/1931 | 07/10/1957 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5406 | 277 | 12/1931 | 16/09/1957 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5407 | 277 | 01/1932 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5408 | 277 | 01/1932 | 18/12/1956 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5409 | 277 | 01/1932 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5410 | 277 | 01/1932 | 14/10/1963 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6400 | 277 | 02/1932 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6401 | 277 | 02/1932 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6402 | 277 | 02/1932 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9300 | 276 | 02/1932 | 03/11/1961 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9301 | 276 | 02/1932 | 10/08/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9302 | 276 | 02/1932 | 22/10/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9303 | 276 | 02/1932 | 24/04/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9304 | 276 | 02/1932 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9305 | 276 | 02/1932 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6403 | 277 | 03/1932 | 07/10/1963 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6404 | 277 | 03/1932 | 23/06/1959 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6405 | 277 | 03/1932 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9306 | 276 | 03/1932 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9307 | 276 | 03/1932 | 07/01/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9308 | 276 | 03/1932 | 25/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9309 | 276 | 03/1932 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9310 | 276 | 03/1932 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9311 | 276 | 03/1932 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9312 | 276 | 03/1932 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9313 | 276 | 03/1932 | 10/09/1963 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9314 | 276 | 03/1932 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9315 | 276 | 03/1932 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6406 | 277 | 04/1932 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6407 | 277 | 04/1932 | 13/08/1958 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6408 | 277 | 04/1932 | 02/02/1962 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6409 | 277 | 04/1932 | 19/03/1959 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9316 | 276 | 04/1932 | 10/08/1962 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9317 | 276 | 04/1932 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9318 | 276 | 04/1932 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9319 | 276 | 04/1932 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5411 | 277 | 05/1932 | 04/06/1958 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5412 | 277 | 05/1932 | 18/04/1962 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5413 | 277 | 05/1932 | 07/10/1957 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5414 | 277 | 05/1932 | 28/10/1959 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5415 | 277 | 05/1932 | 03/07/1957 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5400 | 06/1932 | 22/04/1959 | ||
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5416 | 277 | 06/1932 | 26/08/1963 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5417 | 277 | 06/1932 | 17/01/1961 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5418 | 277 | 06/1932 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5419 | 277 | 06/1932 | 24/02/1958 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5013 | 280 | 27/06/1932 | 04/07/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5014 | 280 | 07/07/1932 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | 280 | 09/07/1932 | 25/04/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5016 | 280 | 09/07/1932 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5017 | 280 | 11/07/1932 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5019 | 280 | 24/07/1932 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | 280 | 28/07/1932 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4800 | 279 | 08/1932 | 03/06/1957 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4801 | 279 | 08/1932 | 06/10/1958 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4802 | 279 | 08/1932 | 22/10/1956 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5020 | 280 | 05/08/1932 | 20/11/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5021 | 280 | 17/08/1932 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5022 | 280 | 30/08/1932 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4803 | 279 | 09/1932 | 05/11/1957 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4804 | 279 | 09/1932 | 27/02/1956 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4805 | 279 | 09/1932 | 22/09/1958 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4806 | 279 | 09/1932 | 24/03/1958 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4807 | 279 | 09/1932 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4808 | 279 | 09/1932 | 28/03/1958 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6130 | 278 | 09/1932 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4809 | 279 | 10/1932 | 14/10/1963 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6131 | 278 | 10/1932 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6132 | 278 | 10/1932 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6133 | 278 | 10/1932 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6134 | 278 | 10/1932 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6135 | 278 | 10/1932 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6136 | 278 | 10/1932 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6137 | 278 | 10/1932 | 21/11/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6138 | 278 | 11/1932 | 20/09/1963 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6139 | 278 | 11/1932 | 27/11/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6140 | 278 | 11/1932 | 13/07/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6141 | 278 | 11/1932 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6142 | 278 | 11/1932 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6143 | 278 | 11/1932 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6144 | 278 | 11/1932 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6145 | 278 | 12/1932 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6146 | 278 | 12/1932 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6147 | 278 | 02/01/1933 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6148 | 278 | 03/01/1933 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5801 | 279 | 04/01/1933 | 09/09/1958 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5800 | 279 | 05/01/1933 | 22/07/1958 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6149 | 278 | 05/01/1933 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5802 | 279 | 07/01/1933 | 29/12/1958 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5803 | 279 | 10/01/1933 | 02/07/1957 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5804 | 279 | 12/01/1933 | 01/06/1959 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5805 | 279 | 18/01/1933 | 24/03/1958 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5806 | 279 | 18/01/1933 | 14/06/1957 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5807 | 279 | 23/01/1933 | 14/06/1957 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4812 | 279 | 24/01/1933 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5808 | 279 | 25/01/1933 | 04/02/1957 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5809 | 279 | 01/02/1933 | 10/08/1959 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6150 | 278 | 03/02/1933 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6151 | 278 | 10/02/1933 | 29/11/1963 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6152 | 278 | 16/02/1933 | 24/01/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6153 | 278 | 23/02/1933 | 24/01/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6155 | 278 | 07/03/1933 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6154 | 278 | 10/03/1933 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6156 | 278 | 16/03/1933 | 03/12/1965 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4810 | 279 | 17/03/1933 | 05/06/1961 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4811 | 279 | 21/03/1933 | 01/10/1956 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6157 | 278 | 22/03/1933 | 11/05/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6158 | 278 | 28/03/1933 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6159 | 278 | 06/04/1933 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4813 | 279 | 07/04/1933 | 14/03/1956 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4814 | 279 | 07/04/1933 | 08/04/1957 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4815 | 279 | 11/04/1933 | 11/02/1957 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4816 | 279 | 20/04/1933 | 22/10/1956 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4817 | 279 | 21/04/1933 | 16/02/1959 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4818 | 279 | 26/04/1933 | 10/1958 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4819 | 279 | 26/04/1933 | 27/04/1961 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5921 | 281 | 11/05/1933 | 08/01/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5922 | 281 | 16/05/1933 | 06/01/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5923 | 281 | 22/05/1933 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5924 | 281 | 27/05/1933 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5925 | 281 | 27/05/1933 | 15/10/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5926 | 281 | 01/06/1933 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5927 | 281 | 02/06/1933 | 24/10/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5928 | 281 | 08/06/1933 | 11/05/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5929 | 281 | 12/06/1933 | 28/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5930 | 281 | 14/06/1933 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5931 | 281 | 21/06/1933 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5932 | 281 | 23/06/1933 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5933 | 281 | 28/06/1933 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5934 | 281 | 28/06/1933 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5935 | 281 | 05/07/1933 | 15/05/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5936 | 281 | 07/07/1933 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5937 | 281 | 10/07/1933 | 13/11/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5938 | 281 | 13/07/1933 | 03/05/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5939 | 281 | 31/07/1933 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5940 | 281 | 01/08/1933 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5810 | 279 | 07/08/1933 | 05/01/1959 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5811 | 279 | 09/08/1933 | 27/05/1957 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5812 | 279 | 10/08/1933 | 18/06/1957 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5813 | 279 | 14/08/1933 | 30/11/1957 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5814 | 279 | 16/08/1933 | 18/06/1957 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5815 | 279 | 18/08/1933 | 27/04/1961 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5816 | 279 | 22/08/1933 | 02/07/1957 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5817 | 279 | 23/08/1933 | 18/06/1957 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5818 | 279 | 24/08/1933 | 14/09/1959 | |
GWR | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5819 | 279 | 29/08/1933 | 26/06/1957 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9701 | 282 | 15/09/1933 | 13/01/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9702 | 282 | 22/09/1933 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9703 | 282 | 28/09/1933 | 11/12/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8750 | 282 | 29/09/1933 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8751 | 282 | 03/10/1933 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8752 | 282 | 06/10/1933 | 29/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8753 | 282 | 10/10/1933 | 08/02/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9704 | 282 | 11/10/1933 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8754 | 282 | 12/10/1933 | 10/11/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8755 | 282 | 12/10/1933 | 02/12/1957 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8756 | 282 | 13/10/1933 | 15/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8757 | 282 | 13/10/1933 | 27/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9705 | 282 | 16/10/1933 | 09/10/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8758 | 282 | 18/10/1933 | 19/01/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8759 | 282 | 18/10/1933 | 29/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8760 | 282 | 19/10/1933 | 08/01/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8762 | 282 | 25/10/1933 | 09/08/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8763 | 282 | 26/10/1933 | 14/08/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8764 | 282 | 26/10/1933 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8761 | 282 | 28/10/1933 | 14/05/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4820 | 279 | 02/11/1933 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4821 | 279 | 07/11/1933 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4822 | 279 | 07/11/1933 | 13/06/1957 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4823 | 279 | 08/11/1933 | 19/01/1959 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4824 | 279 | 10/11/1933 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4825 | 279 | 15/11/1933 | 27/02/1956 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4826 | 279 | 17/11/1933 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4827 | 279 | 17/11/1933 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4828 | 279 | 20/11/1933 | 01/06/1959 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4829 | 279 | 24/11/1933 | 16/03/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9707 | 282 | 28/11/1933 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9709 | 282 | 05/12/1933 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9710 | 282 | 07/12/1933 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8765 | 282 | 08/12/1933 | 25/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8766 | 282 | 08/12/1933 | 23/07/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8767 | 282 | 08/12/1933 | 23/07/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9706 | 282 | 08/12/1933 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8768 | 282 | 12/12/1933 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8769 | 282 | 12/12/1933 | 07/04/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9708 | 282 | 12/12/1933 | 29/01/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8770 | 282 | 01/01/1934 | 12/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8771 | 282 | 01/01/1934 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8772 | 282 | 01/01/1934 | 17/08/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8773 | 282 | 01/01/1934 | 22/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8774 | 282 | 01/01/1934 | 09/08/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8775 | 282 | 02/01/1934 | 20/12/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8777 | 282 | 04/01/1934 | 27/04/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8776 | 282 | 05/01/1934 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8778 | 282 | 09/01/1934 | 01/08/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8779 | 282 | 09/01/1934 | 09/02/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8780 | 282 | 16/01/1934 | 31/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8781 | 282 | 16/01/1934 | 13/11/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8782 | 282 | 17/01/1934 | 14/11/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8783 | 282 | 18/01/1934 | 06/06/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8784 | 282 | 22/01/1934 | 23/04/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8785 | 282 | 24/01/1934 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8786 | 282 | 26/01/1934 | 20/07/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8787 | 282 | 26/01/1934 | 16/08/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8788 | 282 | 29/01/1934 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8789 | 282 | 31/01/1934 | 13/06/1961 | |
GWR | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1367 | 286 | 14/02/1934 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1366 | 286 | 15/02/1934 | 26/01/1961 | |
GWR | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1368 | 286 | 16/02/1934 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1369 | 286 | 16/02/1934 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1370 | 286 | 19/02/1934 | 18/01/1960 | |
GWR | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1371 | 286 | 21/02/1934 | 21/11/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8790 | 282 | 22/02/1934 | 15/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8791 | 282 | 26/02/1934 | 08/03/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8792 | 282 | 28/02/1934 | 06/02/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8793 | 282 | 02/03/1934 | 14/12/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8794 | 282 | 02/03/1934 | 20/07/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8795 | 282 | 14/03/1934 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8796 | 282 | 16/03/1934 | 27/04/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8797 | 282 | 21/03/1934 | 02/04/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8798 | 282 | 23/03/1934 | 13/06/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8700 | 282 | 28/03/1934 | 09/02/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5023 | 295 | 12/04/1934 | 11/02/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5024 | 295 | 18/04/1934 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | 295 | 20/04/1934 | 13/11/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5026 | 295 | 24/04/1934 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5027 | 295 | 27/04/1934 | 20/11/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5028 | 295 | 17/05/1934 | 20/05/1960 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5029 | 295 | 17/05/1934 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5030 | 295 | 18/05/1934 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5031 | 295 | 24/05/1934 | 22/10/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5032 | 295 | 25/05/1934 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8799 | 285 | 08/06/1934 | 01/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9711 | 285 | 12/06/1934 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9712 | 285 | 13/06/1934 | 25/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9713 | 285 | 18/06/1934 | 23/07/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9714 | 285 | 19/06/1934 | 07/11/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9715 | 285 | 25/06/1934 | 23/07/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9716 | 285 | 28/06/1934 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9717 | 285 | 28/06/1934 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9718 | 285 | 29/06/1934 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9719 | 285 | 04/07/1934 | 24/07/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4830 | 288 | 10/07/1934 | 19/09/1958 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4831 | 288 | 13/07/1934 | 27/04/1961 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4832 | 288 | 26/07/1934 | 23/07/1963 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4833 | 288 | 26/07/1934 | 17/01/1961 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4834 | 288 | 27/07/1934 | 04/07/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4835 | 288 | 16/08/1934 | 05/01/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4836 | 288 | 16/08/1934 | 01/10/1958 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4837 | 288 | 16/08/1934 | 16/02/1959 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4838 | 288 | 17/08/1934 | 09/11/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4839 | 288 | 17/08/1934 | 19/08/1957 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2271 | 283 | 27/08/1934 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2272 | 283 | 28/08/1934 | 17/08/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2273 | 283 | 29/08/1934 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2274 | 283 | 30/08/1934 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2275 | 283 | 31/08/1934 | 29/02/1960 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2276 | 283 | 12/09/1934 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2277 | 283 | 12/09/1934 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2278 | 283 | 13/09/1934 | 14/09/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2279 | 283 | 14/09/1934 | 30/01/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2280 | 283 | 14/09/1934 | 14/09/1959 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5190 | 284 | 08/10/1934 | 05/09/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5191 | 284 | 09/10/1934 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5192 | 284 | 11/10/1934 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5193 | 284 | 12/10/1934 | 22/06/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5194 | 284 | 12/10/1934 | 18/04/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5195 | 284 | 22/10/1934 | 13/06/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5197 | 284 | 25/10/1934 | 21/07/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5196 | 284 | 26/10/1934 | 24/12/1959 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5198 | 284 | 01/11/1934 | 20/06/1961 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6410 | 294 | 05/11/1934 | 13/11/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5199 | 284 | 09/11/1934 | 15/03/1963 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6411 | 294 | 09/11/1934 | 02/03/1961 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6412 | 294 | 12/11/1934 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6413 | 294 | 13/11/1934 | 14/11/1961 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6414 | 294 | 14/11/1934 | 29/06/1959 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6415 | 294 | 20/11/1934 | 02/11/1961 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6416 | 294 | 23/11/1934 | 23/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9720 | 285 | 30/11/1934 | 22/11/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9721 | 285 | 30/11/1934 | 22/06/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9722 | 285 | 04/12/1934 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6417 | 294 | 06/12/1934 | 22/06/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9723 | 285 | 06/12/1934 | 24/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9724 | 285 | 06/12/1934 | 15/01/1966 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6418 | 294 | 07/12/1934 | 26/11/1962 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6419 | 294 | 11/12/1934 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9725 | 285 | 11/12/1934 | 12/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9726 | 285 | 11/12/1934 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9727 | 285 | 12/12/1934 | 09/11/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9729 | 285 | 13/12/1934 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9728 | 285 | 14/12/1934 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9730 | 285 | 01/01/1935 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9731 | 285 | 04/01/1935 | 02/05/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9733 | 285 | 04/01/1935 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9732 | 285 | 05/01/1935 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9734 | 285 | 05/01/1935 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9735 | 285 | 10/01/1935 | 02/03/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9736 | 285 | 11/01/1935 | 23/06/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9737 | 285 | 14/01/1935 | 14/12/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9738 | 285 | 15/01/1935 | 18/01/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9739 | 285 | 16/01/1935 | 04/07/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9740 | 285 | 24/01/1935 | 02/02/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9741 | 285 | 24/01/1935 | 03/08/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9742 | 285 | 28/01/1935 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9743 | 285 | 29/01/1935 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9744 | 285 | 31/01/1935 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9745 | 285 | 04/02/1935 | 30/06/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9746 | 285 | 06/02/1935 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9747 | 285 | 07/02/1935 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9748 | 285 | 08/02/1935 | 06/01/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9749 | 285 | 13/02/1935 | 09/11/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5941 | 290 | 20/02/1935 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5942 | 290 | 28/02/1935 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5943 | 290 | 05/03/1935 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5944 | 290 | 12/03/1935 | 08/04/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5946 | 290 | 20/03/1935 | 10/07/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5945 | 290 | 21/03/1935 | 08/04/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5947 | 290 | 25/03/1935 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4840 | 288 | 29/03/1935 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4841 | 288 | 03/04/1935 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5949 | 290 | 03/04/1935 | 30/05/1961 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4842 | 288 | 05/04/1935 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4843 | 288 | 08/04/1935 | 27/06/1957 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5950 | 290 | 11/04/1935 | 17/11/1961 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4844 | 288 | 15/04/1935 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4845 | 288 | 16/04/1935 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4846 | 288 | 18/04/1935 | 08/09/1958 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4847 | 288 | 24/04/1935 | 17/03/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4848 | 288 | 25/04/1935 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4849 | 288 | 26/04/1935 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5033 | 296 | 10/05/1935 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5034 | 296 | 14/05/1935 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5035 | 296 | 21/05/1935 | 17/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9750 | 285 | 22/05/1935 | 14/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9751 | 285 | 24/05/1935 | 13/06/1961 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5036 | 296 | 28/05/1935 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5948 | 290 | 28/05/1935 | 26/08/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5037 | 296 | 31/05/1935 | 20/03/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9752 | 285 | 31/05/1935 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9753 | 285 | 31/05/1935 | 08/05/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9754 | 285 | 06/06/1935 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5038 | 296 | 12/06/1935 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9755 | 285 | 14/06/1935 | 02/05/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5039 | 296 | 18/06/1935 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9756 | 285 | 19/06/1935 | 01/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9757 | 285 | 21/06/1935 | 16/08/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5040 | 296 | 25/06/1935 | 28/10/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9758 | 285 | 26/06/1935 | 07/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9759 | 285 | 27/06/1935 | 22/10/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5041 | 296 | 02/07/1935 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4850 | 288 | 04/07/1935 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | 296 | 05/07/1935 | 25/06/1965 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4851 | 288 | 06/07/1935 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4852 | 288 | 12/07/1935 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4853 | 288 | 23/07/1935 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4854 | 288 | 24/07/1935 | 23/12/1960 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4855 | 288 | 26/07/1935 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4856 | 288 | 27/07/1935 | 16/02/1959 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4857 | 288 | 02/08/1935 | 16/02/1959 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4858 | 288 | 07/08/1935 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4859 | 288 | 09/08/1935 | 09/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4100 | 292 | 15/08/1935 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4101 | 292 | 22/08/1935 | 13/06/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6420 | 294 | 24/08/1935 | 27/11/1959 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4102 | 292 | 29/08/1935 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4103 | 292 | 29/08/1935 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6421 | 294 | 29/08/1935 | 07/01/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4104 | 292 | 31/08/1935 | 14/05/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6422 | 294 | 31/08/1935 | 27/09/1962 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6423 | 294 | 05/09/1935 | 11/08/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4105 | 292 | 07/09/1935 | 01/02/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6424 | 294 | 09/09/1935 | 05/09/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4106 | 292 | 11/09/1935 | 13/09/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4107 | 292 | 16/09/1935 | 25/06/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4108 | 292 | 17/09/1935 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4109 | 292 | 19/09/1935 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9760 | 293 | 19/09/1935 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9761 | 293 | 21/09/1935 | 22/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9762 | 293 | 23/09/1935 | 09/05/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9763 | 293 | 25/09/1935 | 23/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9764 | 293 | 27/09/1935 | 06/08/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9765 | 293 | 28/09/1935 | 04/12/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9766 | 293 | 02/10/1935 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9767 | 293 | 05/10/1935 | 23/06/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9768 | 293 | 05/10/1935 | 12/12/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9769 | 293 | 08/10/1935 | 28/03/1963 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6160 | 291 | 12/10/1935 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6161 | 291 | 14/10/1935 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6162 | 291 | 15/10/1935 | 07/03/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6163 | 291 | 18/10/1935 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6164 | 291 | 21/10/1935 | 25/11/1963 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6165 | 291 | 25/10/1935 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6166 | 291 | 28/10/1935 | 19/01/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6167 | 291 | 31/10/1935 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6168 | 291 | 01/11/1935 | 15/03/1962 | |
GWR | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6169 | 291 | 07/11/1935 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6425 | 300 | 09/11/1935 | 17/01/1961 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6426 | 300 | 11/11/1935 | 22/03/1961 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6427 | 300 | 13/11/1935 | 12/08/1958 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6428 | 300 | 15/11/1935 | 19/03/1959 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6429 | 300 | 18/11/1935 | 15/03/1962 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5420 | 301 | 22/11/1935 | 10/10/1963 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5421 | 301 | 23/11/1935 | 12/09/1962 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5422 | 301 | 26/11/1935 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5423 | 301 | 27/11/1935 | 01/06/1959 | |
GWR | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5424 | 301 | 03/12/1935 | 27/04/1959 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5951 | 297 | 05/12/1935 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5952 | 297 | 07/12/1935 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5953 | 297 | 11/12/1935 | 15/10/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5954 | 297 | 12/12/1935 | 10/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5955 | 297 | 14/12/1935 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5956 | 297 | 18/12/1935 | 15/03/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5957 | 297 | 20/12/1935 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5958 | 297 | 01/01/1936 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5959 | 297 | 03/01/1936 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5960 | 297 | 09/01/1936 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2281 | 298 | 10/01/1936 | 25/11/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2282 | 298 | 13/01/1936 | 30/05/1960 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2283 | 298 | 15/01/1936 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2284 | 298 | 18/01/1936 | 24/06/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2285 | 298 | 18/01/1936 | 02/11/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2286 | 298 | 23/01/1936 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2287 | 298 | 23/01/1936 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2288 | 298 | 28/01/1936 | 19/12/1961 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2289 | 298 | 28/01/1936 | 23/05/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2290 | 298 | 31/01/1936 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4860 | 287 | 08/02/1936 | 27/02/1956 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4861 | 287 | 11/02/1936 | 12/05/1958 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4862 | 287 | 12/02/1936 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4863 | 287 | 15/02/1936 | 27/04/1961 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4864 | 287 | 17/02/1936 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4865 | 287 | 21/02/1936 | 09/1958 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4866 | 287 | 21/02/1936 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4867 | 287 | 25/02/1936 | 07/04/1959 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4868 | 287 | 26/02/1936 | 15/03/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4869 | 287 | 28/02/1936 | 15/09/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9770 | 293 | 04/03/1936 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9771 | 293 | 06/03/1936 | 31/05/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9772 | 293 | 06/03/1936 | 07/01/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9773 | 293 | 07/03/1936 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5043 | 303 | 13/03/1936 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9774 | 293 | 13/03/1936 | 12/11/1966 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5044 | 303 | 18/03/1936 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9775 | 293 | 20/03/1936 | 05/11/1962 | |
GWR | King | 4-6-0 | 6007 | 309 | 24/03/1936 | 21/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9776 | 293 | 25/03/1936 | 16/04/1966 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5045 | 303 | 26/03/1936 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9777 | 293 | 26/03/1936 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5046 | 303 | 01/04/1936 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9778 | 293 | 01/04/1936 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9779 | 293 | 03/04/1936 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5047 | 303 | 08/04/1936 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4870 | 287 | 16/04/1936 | 01/10/1962 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4871 | 287 | 17/04/1936 | 15/10/1963 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4872 | 287 | 20/04/1936 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4873 | 287 | 22/04/1936 | 10/08/1962 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3201 | 22/04/1936 | 05/04/1954 | ||
GWR | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4874 | 287 | 23/04/1936 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | 303 | 25/04/1936 | 14/08/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5049 | 303 | 30/04/1936 | 22/03/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5050 | 303 | 02/05/1936 | 29/08/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9785 | 299 | 07/05/1936 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9786 | 299 | 08/05/1936 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5051 | 303 | 09/05/1936 | 24/05/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9787 | 299 | 09/05/1936 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9788 | 299 | 14/05/1936 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5052 | 303 | 15/05/1936 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9789 | 299 | 15/05/1936 | 03/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9790 | 299 | 25/05/1936 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5053 | 303 | 29/05/1936 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9791 | 299 | 29/05/1936 | 06/01/1964 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3200 | 30/05/1936 | 03/1955 | ||
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9792 | 299 | 30/05/1936 | 20/03/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5054 | 303 | 03/06/1936 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9793 | 299 | 05/06/1936 | 19/08/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9794 | 299 | 06/06/1936 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5055 | 303 | 09/06/1936 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5056 | 303 | 17/06/1936 | 21/11/1964 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3202 | 22/06/1936 | 27/05/1954 | ||
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9780 | 293 | 23/06/1936 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9781 | 293 | 24/06/1936 | 15/05/1961 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5057 | 303 | 26/06/1936 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5961 | 297 | 26/06/1936 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9782 | 293 | 29/06/1936 | 10/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9783 | 293 | 01/07/1936 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5962 | 297 | 02/07/1936 | 27/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9784 | 293 | 04/07/1936 | 02/05/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5963 | 297 | 07/07/1936 | 08/06/1964 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3203 | 10/07/1936 | 05/10/1955 | ||
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5964 | 297 | 23/07/1936 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7400 | 307 | 30/07/1936 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5965 | 297 | 01/08/1936 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7401 | 307 | 04/08/1936 | 17/08/1959 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7402 | 307 | 05/08/1936 | 04/07/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7403 | 307 | 07/08/1936 | 11/01/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7404 | 307 | 10/08/1936 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7405 | 307 | 13/08/1936 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7406 | 307 | 15/08/1936 | 05/03/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7407 | 307 | 17/08/1936 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3204 | 17/08/1936 | 17/06/1960 | ||
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7408 | 307 | 20/08/1936 | 21/08/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7409 | 307 | 21/08/1936 | 17/08/1961 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6800 | 308 | 27/08/1936 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6801 | 308 | 31/08/1936 | 27/10/1960 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6802 | 308 | 03/09/1936 | 09/08/1961 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6803 | 308 | 05/09/1936 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9795 | 299 | 09/09/1936 | 29/11/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9796 | 299 | 10/09/1936 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9797 | 299 | 11/09/1936 | 12/09/1962 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6804 | 308 | 14/09/1936 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3205 | 14/09/1936 | 28/07/1959 | ||
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6805 | 308 | 16/09/1936 | 22/03/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9798 | 299 | 16/09/1936 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6806 | 308 | 21/09/1936 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9799 | 299 | 21/09/1936 | 04/10/1963 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6807 | 308 | 23/09/1936 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6808 | 308 | 24/09/1936 | 15/08/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3700 | 299 | 28/09/1936 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3701 | 299 | 28/09/1936 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6809 | 308 | 29/09/1936 | 01/07/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3702 | 299 | 02/10/1936 | 24/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3703 | 299 | 03/10/1936 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4110 | 292 | 06/10/1936 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3704 | 299 | 08/10/1936 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4111 | 292 | 10/10/1936 | 18/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3705 | 299 | 14/10/1936 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4112 | 292 | 15/10/1936 | 10/08/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3706 | 299 | 19/10/1936 | 13/11/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4113 | 292 | 20/10/1936 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3707 | 299 | 21/10/1936 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3708 | 299 | 23/10/1936 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3709 | 299 | 27/10/1936 | 20/08/1966 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4114 | 292 | 28/10/1936 | 20/11/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3710 | 299 | 31/10/1936 | 17/05/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4115 | 292 | 31/10/1936 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3711 | 299 | 05/11/1936 | 09/05/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4116 | 292 | 05/11/1936 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3712 | 299 | 06/11/1936 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3713 | 299 | 10/11/1936 | 12/02/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4117 | 292 | 11/11/1936 | 25/09/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4118 | 292 | 13/11/1936 | 05/09/1962 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3206 | 17/11/1936 | 23/08/1948 | ||
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4119 | 292 | 20/11/1936 | 13/09/1963 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6810 | 308 | 21/11/1936 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6811 | 308 | 25/11/1936 | 18/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3714 | 299 | 27/11/1936 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6812 | 308 | 27/11/1936 | 20/02/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6813 | 308 | 01/12/1936 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7410 | 307 | 02/12/1936 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6814 | 308 | 07/12/1936 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7411 | 307 | 07/12/1936 | 11/05/1959 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3207 | 07/12/1936 | 03/07/1948 | ||
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7412 | 307 | 09/12/1936 | 02/07/1963 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7413 | 307 | 11/12/1936 | 05/09/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6815 | 308 | 14/12/1936 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7414 | 307 | 15/12/1936 | 05/09/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6816 | 308 | 17/12/1936 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6817 | 308 | 18/12/1936 | 21/04/1965 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7415 | 307 | 19/12/1936 | 09/02/1959 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6818 | 308 | 22/12/1936 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6819 | 308 | 23/12/1936 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7416 | 307 | 23/12/1936 | 19/01/1959 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7417 | 307 | 01/01/1937 | 14/09/1961 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7418 | 307 | 04/01/1937 | 05/09/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7419 | 307 | 05/01/1937 | 21/07/1960 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6820 | 308 | 12/01/1937 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6821 | 308 | 13/01/1937 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6822 | 308 | 19/01/1937 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6823 | 308 | 21/01/1937 | 26/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3715 | 299 | 22/01/1937 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3716 | 299 | 26/01/1937 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3717 | 299 | 29/01/1937 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6824 | 308 | 30/01/1937 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3718 | 299 | 02/02/1937 | 15/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3719 | 299 | 03/02/1937 | 07/01/1963 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3208 | 04/02/1937 | 02/07/1957 | ||
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3720 | 299 | 06/02/1937 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3721 | 299 | 06/02/1937 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3209 | 08/02/1937 | 02/07/1957 | ||
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6825 | 308 | 10/02/1937 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3722 | 299 | 12/02/1937 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3723 | 299 | 12/02/1937 | 03/04/1962 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6826 | 308 | 16/02/1937 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3724 | 299 | 20/02/1937 | 15/05/1961 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6828 | 308 | 25/02/1937 | 23/07/1963 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6827 | 308 | 26/02/1937 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6829 | 308 | 01/03/1937 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6430 | 305 | 02/03/1937 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6431 | 305 | 03/03/1937 | 07/01/1963 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6432 | 305 | 05/03/1937 | 19/03/1959 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3211 | 06/03/1937 | 20/07/1957 | ||
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6434 | 305 | 12/03/1937 | 05/09/1964 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6433 | 305 | 15/03/1937 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5966 | 304 | 20/03/1937 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5967 | 304 | 23/03/1937 | 01/06/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5968 | 304 | 25/03/1937 | 27/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5969 | 304 | 02/04/1937 | 29/08/1962 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6435 | 305 | 03/04/1937 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5970 | 304 | 07/04/1937 | 11/11/1963 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6436 | 305 | 07/04/1937 | 27/09/1962 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3210 | 10/04/1937 | 08/07/1957 | ||
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5971 | 304 | 17/04/1937 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6437 | 305 | 19/04/1937 | 02/07/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5972 | 304 | 22/04/1937 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6438 | 305 | 22/04/1937 | 13/11/1962 | |
GWR | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6439 | 305 | 26/04/1937 | 10/05/1960 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5974 | 304 | 30/04/1937 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5973 | 304 | 01/05/1937 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7420 | 307 | 03/05/1937 | 29/07/1959 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7421 | 307 | 06/05/1937 | 22/11/1961 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3212 | 06/05/1937 | 20/07/1957 | ||
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7422 | 307 | 10/05/1937 | 05/03/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7423 | 307 | 15/05/1937 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7424 | 307 | 18/05/1937 | 26/09/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5058 | 303 | 19/05/1937 | 06/03/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5059 | 303 | 26/05/1937 | 22/06/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5975 | 304 | 26/05/1937 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5060 | 303 | 01/06/1937 | 22/06/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7425 | 307 | 02/06/1937 | 05/06/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7426 | 307 | 05/06/1937 | 02/07/1963 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7427 | 307 | 05/06/1937 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5061 | 303 | 09/06/1937 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7428 | 307 | 11/06/1937 | 05/10/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5062 | 303 | 15/06/1937 | 14/08/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7429 | 307 | 16/06/1937 | 06/02/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3725 | 299 | 21/06/1937 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5063 | 303 | 22/06/1937 | 20/02/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3726 | 299 | 25/06/1937 | 08/01/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3727 | 299 | 26/06/1937 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5064 | 303 | 26/06/1937 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3728 | 299 | 01/07/1937 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5065 | 303 | 02/07/1937 | 07/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3729 | 299 | 06/07/1937 | 22/03/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5066 | 303 | 06/07/1937 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5067 | 303 | 07/07/1937 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3730 | 299 | 24/07/1937 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3213 | 28/07/1937 | 01/12/1958 | ||
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3731 | 299 | 30/07/1937 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6830 | 308 | 04/08/1937 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3732 | 299 | 05/08/1937 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6831 | 308 | 09/08/1937 | 16/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3733 | 299 | 12/08/1937 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6832 | 308 | 13/08/1937 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3734 | 299 | 17/08/1937 | 24/04/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6833 | 308 | 18/08/1937 | 16/10/1965 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3214 | 19/08/1937 | 25/10/1960 | ||
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6834 | 308 | 23/08/1937 | 27/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3735 | 306 | 26/08/1937 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6835 | 308 | 01/09/1937 | 24/05/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3736 | 306 | 02/09/1937 | 22/03/1963 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6836 | 308 | 02/09/1937 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6837 | 308 | 04/09/1937 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3737 | 306 | 06/09/1937 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3738 | 306 | 10/09/1937 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6838 | 308 | 10/09/1937 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3739 | 306 | 15/09/1937 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6839 | 308 | 16/09/1937 | 09/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3740 | 306 | 17/09/1937 | 07/01/1959 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6840 | 308 | 20/09/1937 | 20/02/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3741 | 306 | 22/09/1937 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6841 | 308 | 23/09/1937 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3742 | 306 | 25/09/1937 | 27/11/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6842 | 308 | 28/09/1937 | 07/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3743 | 306 | 29/09/1937 | 15/05/1962 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6843 | 308 | 01/10/1937 | 26/02/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3744 | 306 | 02/10/1937 | 27/08/1966 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6844 | 308 | 06/10/1937 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3745 | 306 | 09/10/1937 | 14/12/1964 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3215 | 11/10/1937 | 17/06/1960 | ||
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6845 | 308 | 12/10/1937 | 26/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3746 | 306 | 13/10/1937 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3747 | 306 | 14/10/1937 | 20/02/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3748 | 306 | 18/10/1937 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6846 | 308 | 18/10/1937 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6847 | 308 | 20/10/1937 | 03/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3749 | 306 | 22/10/1937 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6848 | 308 | 22/10/1937 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6849 | 308 | 25/10/1937 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6850 | 308 | 30/10/1937 | 14/12/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6851 | 308 | 05/11/1937 | 14/08/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6852 | 308 | 09/11/1937 | 22/01/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3750 | 306 | 11/11/1937 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6853 | 308 | 11/11/1937 | 16/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3751 | 306 | 12/11/1937 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3752 | 306 | 12/11/1937 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3753 | 306 | 13/11/1937 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6854 | 308 | 13/11/1937 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3754 | 306 | 17/11/1937 | 13/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3755 | 306 | 24/11/1937 | 15/10/1962 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6855 | 308 | 24/11/1937 | 23/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3756 | 306 | 26/11/1937 | 22/03/1963 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6856 | 308 | 26/11/1937 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6857 | 308 | 27/11/1937 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3757 | 306 | 01/12/1937 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6858 | 308 | 01/12/1937 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3758 | 306 | 04/12/1937 | 07/03/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3759 | 306 | 04/12/1937 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6859 | 308 | 04/12/1937 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3760 | 306 | 11/12/1937 | 27/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3761 | 306 | 11/12/1937 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3762 | 306 | 11/12/1937 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3763 | 306 | 11/12/1937 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3764 | 306 | 11/12/1937 | 29/01/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4120 | 313 | 11/12/1937 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4121 | 313 | 11/12/1937 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3216 | 11/12/1937 | 25/07/1957 | ||
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4122 | 313 | 01/01/1938 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4123 | 313 | 01/01/1938 | 17/11/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4124 | 313 | 14/01/1938 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7800 | 316 | 19/01/1938 | 22/08/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7801 | 316 | 21/01/1938 | 18/07/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7802 | 316 | 22/01/1938 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7803 | 316 | 27/01/1938 | 17/04/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2291 | 312 | 31/01/1938 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2292 | 312 | 31/01/1938 | 22/06/1962 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7804 | 316 | 31/01/1938 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2293 | 312 | 02/02/1938 | 20/07/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2294 | 312 | 03/02/1938 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2295 | 312 | 08/02/1938 | 04/07/1962 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2884 | 321 | 03/03/1938 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2885 | 321 | 04/03/1938 | 22/01/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2886 | 321 | 08/03/1938 | 25/06/1964 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3217 | 09/03/1938 | 25/10/1960 | ||
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2887 | 321 | 12/03/1938 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7805 | 316 | 14/03/1938 | 05/12/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7806 | 316 | 16/03/1938 | 07/11/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2888 | 321 | 17/03/1938 | 18/02/1963 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7807 | 316 | 22/03/1938 | 21/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3765 | 306 | 29/03/1938 | 17/07/1963 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7808 | 316 | 29/03/1938 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2889 | 321 | 31/03/1938 | 25/04/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3766 | 306 | 05/04/1938 | 29/08/1963 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7809 | 316 | 07/04/1938 | 11/04/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2890 | 321 | 08/04/1938 | 21/04/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2891 | 321 | 11/04/1938 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3767 | 306 | 12/04/1938 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3218 | 14/04/1938 | 17/06/1960 | ||
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2892 | 321 | 20/04/1938 | 13/05/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3768 | 306 | 21/04/1938 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3769 | 306 | 27/04/1938 | 30/10/1962 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2893 | 321 | 28/04/1938 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4125 | 313 | 02/05/1938 | 19/06/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4126 | 313 | 05/05/1938 | 24/01/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3770 | 306 | 11/05/1938 | 03/04/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4127 | 313 | 12/05/1938 | 01/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3771 | 306 | 16/05/1938 | 29/01/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4128 | 313 | 18/05/1938 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3772 | 306 | 19/05/1938 | 25/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3773 | 306 | 20/05/1938 | 23/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3774 | 306 | 26/05/1938 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4129 | 313 | 27/05/1938 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2296 | 312 | 03/06/1938 | 12/10/1959 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5068 | 310 | 03/06/1938 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5069 | 310 | 03/06/1938 | 21/02/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2297 | 312 | 15/06/1938 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3219 | 15/06/1938 | 01/11/1948 | ||
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5070 | 310 | 18/06/1938 | 20/03/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2298 | 312 | 22/06/1938 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2299 | 312 | 23/06/1938 | 28/09/1959 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5071 | 310 | 23/06/1938 | 22/10/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2200 | 312 | 27/06/1938 | 17/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5072 | 310 | 29/06/1938 | 30/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3775 | 306 | 01/07/1938 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3776 | 306 | 07/07/1938 | 16/04/1966 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5073 | 310 | 07/07/1938 | 26/02/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3777 | 306 | 21/07/1938 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | 310 | 26/07/1938 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3778 | 306 | 28/07/1938 | 07/03/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3779 | 306 | 30/07/1938 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5075 | 310 | 03/08/1938 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | 310 | 10/08/1938 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3780 | 306 | 12/08/1938 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5077 | 310 | 15/08/1938 | 24/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3781 | 306 | 18/08/1938 | 19/08/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3782 | 306 | 19/08/1938 | 15/10/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3783 | 306 | 19/08/1938 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3784 | 306 | 22/08/1938 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5976 | 311 | 01/09/1938 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5977 | 311 | 02/09/1938 | 19/08/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5978 | 311 | 05/09/1938 | 21/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5979 | 311 | 08/09/1938 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5980 | 311 | 18/09/1938 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3785 | 314 | 21/09/1938 | 06/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3786 | 314 | 23/09/1938 | 22/03/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3787 | 314 | 27/09/1938 | 07/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3788 | 314 | 29/09/1938 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5981 | 311 | 03/10/1938 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5982 | 311 | 05/10/1938 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3789 | 314 | 06/10/1938 | 23/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3790 | 314 | 08/10/1938 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3791 | 314 | 12/10/1938 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5983 | 311 | 12/10/1938 | 10/04/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5984 | 311 | 14/10/1938 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3792 | 314 | 18/10/1938 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5985 | 311 | 18/10/1938 | 13/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3793 | 314 | 22/10/1938 | 08/09/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3794 | 314 | 27/10/1938 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2894 | 321 | 15/11/1938 | 01/08/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2896 | 321 | 16/11/1938 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3220 | 16/11/1938 | 29/07/1957 | ||
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2895 | 321 | 17/11/1938 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2897 | 321 | 18/11/1938 | 01/03/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2898 | 321 | 19/11/1938 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3795 | 314 | 26/11/1938 | 24/05/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3796 | 314 | 29/11/1938 | 26/03/1965 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3221 | 30/11/1938 | 01/12/1958 | ||
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2899 | 321 | 01/12/1938 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3797 | 314 | 01/12/1938 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3798 | 314 | 02/12/1938 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3800 | 321 | 03/12/1938 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3799 | 314 | 06/12/1938 | 13/01/1961 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3801 | 321 | 06/12/1938 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7810 | 316 | 10/12/1938 | 26/09/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7811 | 316 | 10/12/1938 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3222 | 23/12/1938 | 03/08/1957 | ||
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3600 | 314 | 29/12/1938 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3802 | 321 | 29/12/1938 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3601 | 314 | 30/12/1938 | 24/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3602 | 314 | 04/01/1939 | 06/02/1962 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7812 | 316 | 04/01/1939 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3803 | 321 | 07/01/1939 | 04/07/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3603 | 314 | 09/01/1939 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3604 | 314 | 09/01/1939 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7813 | 316 | 12/01/1939 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7814 | 316 | 16/01/1939 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7815 | 316 | 21/01/1939 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3605 | 314 | 23/01/1939 | 01/10/1966 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7816 | 316 | 23/01/1939 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3606 | 314 | 27/01/1939 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7817 | 316 | 30/01/1939 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7818 | 316 | 31/01/1939 | 23/01/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3607 | 314 | 02/02/1939 | 08/10/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3608 | 314 | 02/02/1939 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7819 | 316 | 03/02/1939 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3609 | 314 | 06/02/1939 | 08/08/1960 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3223 | 08/02/1939 | 24/07/1957 | ||
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6860 | 308 | 11/02/1939 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6861 | 308 | 14/02/1939 | 16/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3610 | 314 | 18/02/1939 | 20/02/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6862 | 308 | 18/02/1939 | 19/06/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6863 | 308 | 21/02/1939 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6864 | 308 | 24/02/1939 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3611 | 314 | 25/02/1939 | 24/08/1962 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3224 | 27/02/1939 | 30/09/1957 | ||
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6865 | 308 | 01/03/1939 | 08/05/1962 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6866 | 308 | 02/03/1939 | 29/05/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3612 | 314 | 04/03/1939 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6867 | 308 | 08/03/1939 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6868 | 308 | 10/03/1939 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3613 | 314 | 13/03/1939 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6869 | 308 | 15/03/1939 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3614 | 314 | 18/03/1939 | 14/03/1962 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6870 | 308 | 25/03/1939 | 11/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3615 | 314 | 29/03/1939 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6871 | 308 | 29/03/1939 | 16/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3616 | 314 | 31/03/1939 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6872 | 308 | 31/03/1939 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6873 | 308 | 03/04/1939 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6874 | 308 | 06/04/1939 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3617 | 314 | 11/04/1939 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6875 | 308 | 15/04/1939 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3618 | 314 | 18/04/1939 | 08/06/1964 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6876 | 308 | 20/04/1939 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6877 | 308 | 27/04/1939 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3619 | 314 | 28/04/1939 | 10/09/1966 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3225 | 29/04/1939 | 08/08/1957 | ||
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6878 | 308 | 03/05/1939 | 27/11/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5078 | 310 | 04/05/1939 | 20/11/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3620 | 314 | 05/05/1939 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5079 | 310 | 11/05/1939 | 06/05/1960 | |
GWR | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6879 | 308 | 11/05/1939 | 16/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3621 | 314 | 13/05/1939 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3622 | 314 | 18/05/1939 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5080 | 310 | 19/05/1939 | 11/04/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3623 | 314 | 23/05/1939 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3624 | 314 | 26/05/1939 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5081 | 310 | 27/05/1939 | 21/10/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3625 | 314 | 03/06/1939 | 02/07/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3626 | 314 | 03/06/1939 | 01/08/1963 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3226 | 03/06/1939 | 07/08/1957 | ||
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5082 | 310 | 08/06/1939 | 02/07/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | 324 | 15/06/1939 | 30/09/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | 324 | 16/06/1939 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3627 | 314 | 17/06/1939 | 18/02/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3628 | 314 | 17/06/1939 | 21/01/1963 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3227 | 19/06/1939 | 14/08/1957 | ||
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5095 | 324 | 23/06/1939 | 16/08/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3629 | 314 | 24/06/1939 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3630 | 314 | 28/06/1939 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | 324 | 29/06/1939 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3631 | 314 | 01/07/1939 | 31/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3632 | 314 | 04/07/1939 | 13/11/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5097 | 324 | 05/07/1939 | 08/03/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3633 | 314 | 15/07/1939 | 15/10/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3634 | 314 | 15/07/1939 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2201 | 322 | 28/07/1939 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2202 | 322 | 01/08/1939 | 11/10/1960 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2203 | 322 | 04/08/1939 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3804 | 328 | 05/08/1939 | 13/07/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2204 | 322 | 08/08/1939 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3805 | 328 | 09/08/1939 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2205 | 322 | 15/08/1939 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3806 | 328 | 18/08/1939 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3807 | 328 | 23/08/1939 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2206 | 322 | 24/08/1939 | 04/12/1961 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2207 | 322 | 29/08/1939 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2208 | 322 | 02/09/1939 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2209 | 322 | 04/09/1939 | 02/08/1962 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3808 | 328 | 04/09/1939 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2210 | 322 | 09/09/1939 | 05/06/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3809 | 328 | 12/09/1939 | 24/10/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3810 | 328 | 15/09/1939 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3811 | 328 | 19/09/1939 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3635 | 325 | 20/09/1939 | 17/04/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3812 | 328 | 23/09/1939 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3636 | 325 | 27/09/1939 | 12/02/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3637 | 325 | 28/09/1939 | 15/10/1962 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3813 | 328 | 29/09/1939 | 10/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3638 | 325 | 30/09/1939 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3639 | 325 | 04/10/1939 | 29/01/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4130 | 323 | 09/10/1939 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3640 | 325 | 11/10/1939 | 01/05/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4131 | 323 | 14/10/1939 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3641 | 325 | 16/10/1939 | 16/08/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4132 | 323 | 19/10/1939 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3642 | 325 | 23/10/1939 | 21/04/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4133 | 323 | 24/10/1939 | 24/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3643 | 325 | 26/10/1939 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4134 | 323 | 27/10/1939 | 13/05/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3644 | 325 | 28/10/1939 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4135 | 323 | 31/10/1939 | 08/06/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4136 | 323 | 07/11/1939 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3645 | 325 | 10/11/1939 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3646 | 325 | 13/11/1939 | 08/06/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4137 | 323 | 14/11/1939 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3647 | 325 | 20/11/1939 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3648 | 325 | 21/11/1939 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5986 | 327 | 21/11/1939 | 10/09/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5987 | 327 | 23/11/1939 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3649 | 325 | 25/11/1939 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 3228 | 25/11/1939 | 30/09/1957 | ||
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5988 | 327 | 28/11/1939 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4138 | 323 | 29/11/1939 | 03/07/1958 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4139 | 323 | 05/12/1939 | 08/07/1958 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5989 | 327 | 05/12/1939 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5990 | 327 | 06/12/1939 | 16/01/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3650 | 325 | 11/12/1939 | 24/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3651 | 325 | 11/12/1939 | 04/04/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5991 | 327 | 14/12/1939 | 18/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3652 | 325 | 15/12/1939 | 10/10/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3653 | 325 | 18/12/1939 | 10/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5992 | 327 | 18/12/1939 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3654 | 325 | 22/12/1939 | 25/08/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5993 | 327 | 22/12/1939 | 13/05/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5994 | 327 | 29/12/1939 | 07/03/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5995 | 327 | 04/01/1940 | 25/04/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3655 | 325 | 12/01/1940 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3656 | 325 | 13/01/1940 | 20/02/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3657 | 325 | 18/01/1940 | 15/05/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3658 | 325 | 25/01/1940 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3659 | 325 | 31/01/1940 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5255 | 329 | 31/01/1940 | 24/05/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3660 | 325 | 05/02/1940 | 05/04/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5256 | 329 | 05/02/1940 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5257 | 329 | 12/02/1940 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3662 | 325 | 14/02/1940 | 25/08/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3661 | 325 | 15/02/1940 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5258 | 329 | 15/02/1940 | 19/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3663 | 325 | 20/02/1940 | 17/12/1962 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5259 | 329 | 20/02/1940 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3664 | 325 | 21/02/1940 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5260 | 329 | 23/02/1940 | 22/03/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5261 | 329 | 23/02/1940 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5262 | 329 | 01/03/1940 | 29/08/1963 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5263 | 329 | 07/03/1940 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3665 | 325 | 08/03/1940 | 06/01/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3814 | 328 | 11/03/1940 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3666 | 325 | 12/03/1940 | 10/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3667 | 325 | 14/03/1940 | 15/05/1961 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3815 | 328 | 15/03/1940 | 30/05/1964 | |
GWR | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5264 | 329 | 18/03/1940 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3668 | 325 | 19/03/1940 | 02/07/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3816 | 328 | 21/03/1940 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3669 | 325 | 26/03/1940 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3817 | 328 | 28/03/1940 | 21/08/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3818 | 328 | 01/04/1940 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3670 | 325 | 06/04/1940 | 15/05/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3671 | 325 | 11/04/1940 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3819 | 328 | 12/04/1940 | 14/12/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3820 | 328 | 17/04/1940 | 02/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3672 | 325 | 18/04/1940 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3673 | 325 | 22/04/1940 | 16/05/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3821 | 328 | 22/04/1940 | 03/10/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3822 | 328 | 25/04/1940 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3674 | 325 | 26/04/1940 | 19/12/1962 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3823 | 328 | 06/05/1940 | 02/07/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2212 | 337 | 16/05/1940 | 05/12/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2211 | 337 | 17/05/1940 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2213 | 337 | 18/05/1940 | 10/11/1960 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2214 | 337 | 26/05/1940 | 07/05/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2215 | 337 | 29/05/1940 | 19/10/1961 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2216 | 337 | 02/06/1940 | 15/01/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5996 | 333 | 03/06/1940 | 27/08/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5997 | 333 | 07/06/1940 | 24/07/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2218 | 337 | 10/06/1940 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5998 | 333 | 12/06/1940 | 17/03/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2217 | 337 | 14/06/1940 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5999 | 333 | 14/06/1940 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2219 | 337 | 17/06/1940 | 17/03/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2220 | 337 | 18/06/1940 | 27/12/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3675 | 325 | 21/06/1940 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6900 | 333 | 22/06/1940 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3676 | 325 | 25/06/1940 | 15/05/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3677 | 325 | 28/06/1940 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6901 | 333 | 01/07/1940 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3678 | 325 | 02/07/1940 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6902 | 333 | 04/07/1940 | 01/05/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3679 | 325 | 06/07/1940 | 01/03/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6903 | 333 | 10/07/1940 | 18/09/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6904 | 333 | 13/07/1940 | 23/01/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3680 | 325 | 15/07/1940 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3681 | 325 | 18/07/1940 | 07/03/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3682 | 325 | 20/07/1940 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6905 | 333 | 20/07/1940 | 08/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3683 | 325 | 23/07/1940 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3684 | 325 | 27/07/1940 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2221 | 337 | 20/08/1940 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2222 | 337 | 23/08/1940 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2223 | 337 | 29/08/1940 | 11/05/1962 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3824 | 334 | 10/09/1940 | 08/06/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2224 | 337 | 11/09/1940 | 30/09/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2225 | 337 | 16/09/1940 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3825 | 334 | 16/09/1940 | 19/09/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3826 | 334 | 24/09/1940 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2226 | 337 | 30/09/1940 | 21/08/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2227 | 337 | 07/10/1940 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2228 | 337 | 15/10/1940 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2229 | 337 | 26/10/1940 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3827 | 334 | 30/10/1940 | 13/11/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2230 | 337 | 31/10/1940 | 18/01/1962 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3828 | 334 | 06/11/1940 | 03/10/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6906 | 338 | 08/11/1940 | 03/04/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6907 | 338 | 09/11/1940 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6908 | 338 | 20/11/1940 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3829 | 334 | 21/11/1940 | 07/03/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6909 | 338 | 27/11/1940 | 25/06/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3830 | 334 | 30/11/1940 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6910 | 338 | 10/12/1940 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3831 | 334 | 13/12/1940 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3685 | 330 | 21/12/1940 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3686 | 330 | 27/12/1940 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3687 | 330 | 04/01/1941 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3832 | 334 | 07/01/1941 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3833 | 334 | 09/01/1941 | 04/07/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6911 | 338 | 10/01/1941 | 24/04/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3688 | 330 | 13/01/1941 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3689 | 330 | 21/01/1941 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6912 | 338 | 30/01/1941 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6913 | 338 | 07/02/1941 | 25/06/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6914 | 338 | 11/02/1941 | 01/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3690 | 330 | 15/02/1941 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6915 | 338 | 15/02/1941 | 13/02/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3691 | 330 | 21/02/1941 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3692 | 330 | 28/02/1941 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3693 | 330 | 03/03/1941 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3694 | 330 | 08/03/1941 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6916 | 340 | 11/06/1941 | 14/08/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6917 | 340 | 14/06/1941 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6918 | 340 | 18/06/1941 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6919 | 340 | 21/06/1941 | 26/08/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6920 | 340 | 03/07/1941 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6921 | 340 | 11/07/1941 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6922 | 340 | 19/07/1941 | 01/05/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6923 | 340 | 24/07/1941 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6924 | 340 | 05/08/1941 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6925 | 340 | 09/08/1941 | 21/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3695 | 330 | 28/08/1941 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3696 | 330 | 30/08/1941 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3697 | 330 | 05/09/1941 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3698 | 330 | 06/09/1941 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3699 | 330 | 10/09/1941 | 20/02/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4600 | 330 | 27/09/1941 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4601 | 330 | 30/09/1941 | 17/11/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4602 | 330 | 04/10/1941 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4603 | 330 | 07/10/1941 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4604 | 330 | 10/10/1941 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6926 | 340 | 11/11/1941 | 29/05/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6927 | 340 | 15/11/1941 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6928 | 340 | 22/11/1941 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6929 | 340 | 28/11/1941 | 28/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6930 | 340 | 29/11/1941 | 16/10/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6931 | 340 | 06/12/1941 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 340 | 11/12/1941 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6933 | 340 | 15/12/1941 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3834 | 341 | 20/12/1941 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6934 | 340 | 20/12/1941 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6935 | 340 | 20/12/1941 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3835 | 341 | 01/01/1942 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4605 | 330 | 03/01/1942 | 23/10/1962 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3836 | 341 | 08/01/1942 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4606 | 330 | 10/01/1942 | 20/02/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3837 | 341 | 13/01/1942 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4607 | 330 | 17/01/1942 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3838 | 341 | 20/01/1942 | 27/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4608 | 330 | 20/01/1942 | 21/09/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3839 | 341 | 26/01/1942 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4609 | 330 | 27/01/1942 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3840 | 341 | 31/01/1942 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3841 | 341 | 02/02/1942 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3842 | 341 | 05/02/1942 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3843 | 341 | 13/02/1942 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4610 | 330 | 21/02/1942 | 23/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4611 | 330 | 21/02/1942 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4612 | 330 | 23/02/1942 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4614 | 330 | 27/02/1942 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4613 | 330 | 28/02/1942 | 14/12/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4615 | 330 | 13/04/1942 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3844 | 346 | 20/04/1942 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4616 | 330 | 23/04/1942 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4617 | 330 | 23/04/1942 | 22/10/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3845 | 346 | 25/04/1942 | 27/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4618 | 330 | 28/04/1942 | 15/10/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3846 | 346 | 04/05/1942 | 01/11/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3847 | 346 | 08/05/1942 | 17/03/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4619 | 330 | 09/05/1942 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3848 | 346 | 11/05/1942 | 02/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4620 | 330 | 28/05/1942 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4621 | 330 | 29/05/1942 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4622 | 330 | 05/06/1942 | 01/06/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3849 | 346 | 09/06/1942 | 08/05/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3850 | 346 | 11/06/1942 | 21/08/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3851 | 346 | 18/06/1942 | 02/07/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3852 | 346 | 20/06/1942 | 25/04/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | 346 | 24/06/1942 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4623 | 330 | 25/06/1942 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4624 | 330 | 27/06/1942 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6936 | 340 | 11/07/1942 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6937 | 340 | 11/07/1942 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6938 | 340 | 22/07/1942 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6939 | 340 | 27/07/1942 | 28/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6940 | 340 | 07/08/1942 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6941 | 340 | 15/08/1942 | 24/04/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6942 | 340 | 22/08/1942 | 14/12/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6943 | 340 | 26/08/1942 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6944 | 340 | 03/09/1942 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6945 | 340 | 08/09/1942 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4625 | 330 | 15/09/1942 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4626 | 330 | 15/09/1942 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4627 | 330 | 22/09/1942 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3854 | 346 | 25/09/1942 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3855 | 346 | 01/10/1942 | 21/08/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4628 | 330 | 02/10/1942 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4629 | 330 | 06/10/1942 | 10/09/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3856 | 346 | 08/10/1942 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3857 | 346 | 08/10/1942 | 07/03/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3858 | 346 | 13/10/1942 | 10/09/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3859 | 346 | 29/10/1942 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3860 | 346 | 31/10/1942 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3861 | 346 | 01/11/1942 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3862 | 346 | 04/11/1942 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4630 | 330 | 09/11/1942 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3863 | 346 | 12/11/1942 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4631 | 330 | 12/11/1942 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3864 | 346 | 17/11/1942 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4632 | 330 | 17/11/1942 | 08/01/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4633 | 330 | 23/11/1942 | 04/04/1963 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3865 | 346 | 26/11/1942 | 27/03/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4634 | 330 | 30/11/1942 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3866 | 346 | 01/12/1942 | 02/07/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6946 | 340 | 05/12/1942 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6947 | 340 | 07/12/1942 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6948 | 340 | 11/12/1942 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4635 | 336 | 14/12/1942 | 16/07/1966 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6949 | 340 | 16/12/1942 | 12/05/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4636 | 336 | 17/12/1942 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4637 | 336 | 21/12/1942 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4638 | 336 | 23/12/1942 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6950 | 340 | 23/12/1942 | 25/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4639 | 336 | 24/12/1942 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4640 | 336 | 31/12/1942 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4641 | 336 | 31/12/1942 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4642 | 336 | 09/01/1943 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4643 | 336 | 13/01/1943 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4644 | 336 | 18/01/1943 | 23/10/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6951 | 340 | 08/02/1943 | 25/12/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6952 | 340 | 22/02/1943 | 25/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4645 | 336 | 23/02/1943 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6953 | 340 | 27/02/1943 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4646 | 336 | 28/02/1943 | 12/11/1966 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6954 | 340 | 02/03/1943 | 14/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4647 | 336 | 05/03/1943 | 23/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4648 | 336 | 10/03/1943 | 26/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4649 | 336 | 14/03/1943 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6955 | 340 | 14/03/1943 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6956 | 340 | 28/03/1943 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6957 | 340 | 01/04/1943 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4650 | 336 | 06/04/1943 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4651 | 336 | 08/04/1943 | 13/09/1963 | |
GWR | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6958 | 340 | 08/04/1943 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4652 | 336 | 13/04/1943 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4653 | 336 | 18/04/1943 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4654 | 336 | 23/04/1943 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4655 | 336 | 17/05/1943 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4656 | 336 | 31/05/1943 | 08/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4657 | 336 | 31/05/1943 | 06/07/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8400 | 348 | 31/05/1943 | 03/08/1968 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4658 | 336 | 05/06/1943 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4659 | 336 | 07/06/1943 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4660 | 336 | 10/06/1943 | 06/07/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8402 | 348 | 02/07/1943 | 23/12/1967 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8401 | 348 | 03/07/1943 | 04/09/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8403 | 348 | 12/07/1943 | 31/07/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8404 | 348 | 23/07/1943 | 09/1966 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8405 | 348 | 08/08/1943 | 23/07/1966 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8406 | 348 | 14/08/1943 | 04/09/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8407 | 348 | 23/08/1943 | 12/1963 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8408 | 348 | 02/09/1943 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8409 | 348 | 08/09/1943 | 26/03/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8410 | 349 | 22/09/1943 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8411 | 349 | 28/09/1943 | 08/07/1967 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8412 | 349 | 05/10/1943 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8413 | 349 | 12/10/1943 | 11/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8414 | 349 | 15/10/1943 | 08/10/1966 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8415 | 349 | 22/10/1943 | 13/08/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4661 | 352 | 26/10/1943 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4662 | 352 | 31/10/1943 | 10/09/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8416 | 349 | 01/11/1943 | 26/06/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8417 | 349 | 06/11/1943 | 29/04/1967 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8418 | 349 | 10/11/1943 | 09/1966 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8419 | 349 | 17/11/1943 | 08/05/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4663 | 352 | 22/11/1943 | 16/06/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8420 | 349 | 26/11/1943 | 01/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4664 | 352 | 28/11/1943 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4665 | 352 | 03/12/1943 | 19/06/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8421 | 349 | 06/12/1943 | 10/02/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8422 | 349 | 10/12/1943 | 26/03/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4666 | 352 | 18/12/1943 | 16/06/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8423 | 349 | 18/12/1943 | 03/08/1968 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4667 | 352 | 22/12/1943 | 20/04/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8424 | 349 | 22/12/1943 | 24/02/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8425 | 349 | 31/12/1943 | 04/11/1967 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8426 | 349 | 31/12/1943 | 11/06/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4668 | 352 | 11/01/1944 | 21/07/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8427 | 349 | 13/01/1944 | 07/08/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4669 | 352 | 14/01/1944 | 16/06/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8428 | 349 | 17/01/1944 | 09/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4670 | 352 | 26/01/1944 | 09/10/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8429 | 349 | 27/01/1944 | 11/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4671 | 352 | 17/02/1944 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4672 | 352 | 01/03/1944 | 07/07/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6959 | 350 | 02/03/1944 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6960 | 350 | 06/03/1944 | 01/06/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8430 | 351 | 07/03/1944 | 24/04/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4673 | 352 | 10/03/1944 | 16/06/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8431 | 351 | 11/03/1944 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6961 | 350 | 13/03/1944 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4674 | 352 | 17/03/1944 | 06/11/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8432 | 351 | 17/03/1944 | 08/10/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4675 | 352 | 21/03/1944 | 03/06/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8433 | 351 | 24/03/1944 | 06/04/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8434 | 351 | 31/03/1944 | 01/01/1966 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6962 | 350 | 05/04/1944 | 07/01/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4676 | 352 | 15/04/1944 | 01/10/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8435 | 351 | 17/04/1944 | 06/05/1967 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4677 | 352 | 22/04/1944 | 25/03/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4678 | 352 | 22/04/1944 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6963 | 350 | 26/04/1944 | 21/07/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8436 | 351 | 28/04/1944 | 23/12/1967 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8437 | 351 | 03/05/1944 | 30/03/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8438 | 351 | 08/05/1944 | 18/11/1967 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4679 | 352 | 15/05/1944 | 21/05/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8439 | 351 | 17/05/1944 | 04/11/1967 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6964 | 350 | 31/05/1944 | 18/09/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6966 | 350 | 31/05/1944 | 21/09/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8440 | 353 | 05/06/1944 | 18/02/1967 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8441 | 353 | 06/06/1944 | 06/04/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8442 | 353 | 13/06/1944 | 02/03/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8443 | 353 | 15/06/1944 | 11/1966 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8444 | 353 | 20/06/1944 | 14/02/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4680 | 352 | 30/06/1944 | 31/12/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8445 | 353 | 01/07/1944 | 04/05/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8446 | 353 | 01/07/1944 | 24/07/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8447 | 353 | 14/07/1944 | 29/01/1966 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8448 | 353 | 20/07/1944 | 27/07/1968 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6965 | 350 | 28/07/1944 | 26/10/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8449 | 353 | 01/08/1944 | 20/05/1967 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6967 | 350 | 15/08/1944 | 31/12/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8450 | 353 | 28/08/1944 | 30/09/1967 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6968 | 350 | 05/09/1944 | 13/09/1963 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8451 | 353 | 05/09/1944 | 04/05/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8452 | 353 | 09/09/1944 | 29/01/1966 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6969 | 350 | 16/09/1944 | 20/02/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8453 | 353 | 19/09/1944 | 13/04/1968 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6970 | 350 | 29/09/1944 | 15/06/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8454 | 353 | 29/09/1944 | 05/07/1967 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2231 | 347 | 04/10/1944 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2232 | 347 | 11/10/1944 | 21/09/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8455 | 353 | 14/10/1944 | 28/11/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2233 | 347 | 19/10/1944 | 03/11/1961 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8456 | 353 | 20/10/1944 | 02/09/1967 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8457 | 353 | 23/10/1944 | 09/1966 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2234 | 347 | 26/10/1944 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2235 | 347 | 27/10/1944 | 17/08/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2236 | 347 | 28/10/1944 | 15/05/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8458 | 353 | 04/11/1944 | 08/04/1967 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2237 | 347 | 07/11/1944 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2238 | 347 | 15/11/1944 | 15/06/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4681 | 352 | 15/11/1944 | 16/12/1963 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8459 | 353 | 18/11/1944 | 01/04/1967 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4682 | 352 | 21/11/1944 | 18/09/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2239 | 347 | 25/11/1944 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4683 | 352 | 28/11/1944 | 02/10/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2240 | 347 | 01/12/1944 | 22/06/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4684 | 352 | 02/12/1944 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4685 | 352 | 09/12/1944 | 21/05/1962 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8460 | 353 | 13/12/1944 | 16/09/1967 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4686 | 352 | 15/12/1944 | 08/08/1959 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8461 | 353 | 16/12/1944 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4687 | 352 | 21/12/1944 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4688 | 352 | 22/12/1944 | 28/12/1963 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8462 | 353 | 22/12/1944 | 19/11/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4689 | 352 | 30/12/1944 | 31/12/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8463 | 353 | 02/01/1945 | 25/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4690 | 352 | 08/01/1945 | 09/10/1963 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8464 | 353 | 13/01/1945 | 26/08/1967 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4691 | 352 | 15/01/1945 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4692 | 352 | 17/01/1945 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4693 | 352 | 26/01/1945 | 20/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4694 | 352 | 27/01/1945 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4695 | 352 | 31/01/1945 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4696 | 352 | 08/02/1945 | 12/11/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4697 | 352 | 14/02/1945 | 02/07/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8465 | 353 | 15/02/1945 | 16/03/1968 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4698 | 352 | 17/02/1945 | 26/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4699 | 352 | 24/02/1945 | 15/06/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8466 | 353 | 24/02/1945 | 08/05/1967 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9600 | 352 | 28/02/1945 | 10/09/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8467 | 353 | 05/03/1945 | 15/06/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8468 | 353 | 16/03/1945 | 02/03/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8469 | 353 | 24/03/1945 | 16/12/1967 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2241 | 347 | 29/03/1945 | 14/02/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2242 | 347 | 04/04/1945 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2243 | 347 | 11/04/1945 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2244 | 347 | 19/04/1945 | 21/05/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8470 | 353 | 24/04/1945 | 25/11/1967 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2245 | 347 | 25/04/1945 | 23/05/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9601 | 352 | 27/04/1945 | 26/12/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8471 | 353 | 28/04/1945 | 27/04/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8472 | 353 | 07/05/1945 | 21/05/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9602 | 352 | 12/05/1945 | 08/03/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8473 | 353 | 18/05/1945 | 04/11/1967 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9603 | 352 | 19/05/1945 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9604 | 352 | 25/05/1945 | 12/12/1962 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8474 | 353 | 30/05/1945 | 16/09/1967 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9605 | 352 | 31/05/1945 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9606 | 352 | 07/06/1945 | 06/11/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8475 | 353 | 08/06/1945 | 29/10/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9607 | 352 | 15/06/1945 | 17/03/1964 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8476 | 353 | 15/06/1945 | 10/08/1968 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8477 | 353 | 23/06/1945 | 10/09/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9608 | 352 | 29/06/1945 | 16/07/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9609 | 352 | 30/06/1945 | 01/10/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8478 | 353 | 30/06/1945 | 26/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9610 | 352 | 16/07/1945 | 24/09/1966 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8479 | 353 | 21/07/1945 | 12/02/1966 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1000 | 354 | 04/08/1945 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2246 | 347 | 09/08/1945 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2247 | 347 | 10/08/1945 | 26/02/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2248 | 347 | 14/08/1945 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9611 | 352 | 23/08/1945 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2249 | 347 | 24/08/1945 | 01/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9612 | 352 | 28/08/1945 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9613 | 352 | 01/09/1945 | 23/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9614 | 352 | 11/09/1945 | 16/07/1966 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1001 | 354 | 12/09/1945 | 24/05/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2250 | 347 | 14/09/1945 | 02/08/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9615 | 352 | 19/09/1945 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1002 | 354 | 27/09/1945 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9616 | 352 | 28/09/1945 | 25/08/1965 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1003 | 354 | 02/10/1945 | 22/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9617 | 352 | 04/10/1945 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9618 | 352 | 08/10/1945 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9619 | 352 | 13/10/1945 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1004 | 354 | 15/10/1945 | 21/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9620 | 352 | 17/10/1945 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9621 | 352 | 24/10/1945 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9622 | 355 | 05/11/1945 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1005 | 354 | 06/11/1945 | 24/06/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9623 | 355 | 08/11/1945 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9624 | 355 | 10/11/1945 | 16/01/1965 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1006 | 354 | 15/11/1945 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9625 | 355 | 16/11/1945 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9626 | 355 | 27/11/1945 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9627 | 355 | 30/11/1945 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1007 | 354 | 05/12/1945 | 05/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9628 | 355 | 05/12/1945 | 07/03/1963 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1008 | 354 | 10/12/1945 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9629 | 355 | 13/12/1945 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9630 | 355 | 15/12/1945 | 24/09/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9631 | 355 | 18/12/1945 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1021 | 358 | 19/12/1945 | 01/11/1963 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1009 | 354 | 21/12/1945 | 01/02/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9632 | 355 | 29/12/1945 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9633 | 355 | 08/01/1946 | 09/10/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9634 | 355 | 16/01/1946 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1010 | 354 | 22/01/1946 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9635 | 355 | 24/01/1946 | 25/06/1964 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1011 | 354 | 29/01/1946 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1012 | 354 | 05/02/1946 | 24/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9636 | 355 | 09/02/1946 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1013 | 354 | 11/02/1946 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1014 | 354 | 18/02/1946 | 24/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9637 | 355 | 19/02/1946 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9638 | 355 | 25/02/1946 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9639 | 355 | 27/02/1946 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1015 | 354 | 01/03/1946 | 13/11/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9640 | 355 | 07/03/1946 | 30/07/1966 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1016 | 354 | 12/03/1946 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9641 | 355 | 12/03/1946 | 29/10/1966 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1017 | 354 | 18/03/1946 | 19/12/1962 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1018 | 354 | 23/03/1946 | 27/09/1962 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1019 | 354 | 02/04/1946 | 11/02/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9642 | 356 | 03/04/1946 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9643 | 356 | 09/04/1946 | 22/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9644 | 356 | 13/04/1946 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9645 | 356 | 17/04/1946 | 03/10/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9646 | 356 | 04/05/1946 | 15/05/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5098 | 357 | 16/05/1946 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9647 | 356 | 18/05/1946 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | 357 | 25/05/1946 | 11/02/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7000 | 357 | 25/05/1946 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9648 | 356 | 25/05/1946 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7001 | 357 | 31/05/1946 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9649 | 356 | 04/06/1946 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7002 | 357 | 06/06/1946 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7003 | 357 | 13/06/1946 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9650 | 356 | 13/06/1946 | 14/12/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7004 | 357 | 19/06/1946 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9651 | 356 | 20/06/1946 | 02/07/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7005 | 357 | 25/06/1946 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | 357 | 28/06/1946 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7007 | 357 | 01/07/1946 | 18/02/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4140 | 335 | 21/08/1946 | 20/11/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4141 | 335 | 28/08/1946 | 01/03/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4142 | 335 | 31/08/1946 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4143 | 335 | 05/09/1946 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4144 | 335 | 10/09/1946 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4145 | 335 | 17/09/1946 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3200 | 360 | 21/09/1946 | 15/01/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4146 | 335 | 21/09/1946 | 16/08/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3201 | 360 | 30/09/1946 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4147 | 335 | 30/09/1946 | 02/10/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4149 | 335 | 10/1946 | 26/02/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3202 | 360 | 05/10/1946 | 20/06/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4148 | 335 | 05/10/1946 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3203 | 360 | 09/10/1946 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3204 | 360 | 11/10/1946 | 01/03/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3205 | 360 | 18/10/1946 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3206 | 360 | 21/10/1946 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3207 | 360 | 25/10/1946 | 05/12/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3208 | 360 | 29/10/1946 | 08/05/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9652 | 362 | 05/11/1946 | 29/01/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3209 | 360 | 08/11/1946 | 13/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9653 | 362 | 09/11/1946 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9654 | 362 | 12/11/1946 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9655 | 362 | 15/11/1946 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9656 | 362 | 19/11/1946 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9657 | 362 | 22/11/1946 | 02/04/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9658 | 362 | 25/11/1946 | 15/10/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9659 | 362 | 28/11/1946 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9660 | 362 | 02/12/1946 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9661 | 362 | 07/12/1946 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1020 | 358 | 14/12/1946 | 26/02/1964 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1022 | 358 | 24/12/1946 | 05/10/1962 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1023 | 358 | 01/01/1947 | 01/03/1963 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1024 | 358 | 09/01/1947 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1025 | 358 | 20/01/1947 | 18/02/1963 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1026 | 358 | 31/01/1947 | 13/09/1962 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9400 | 365 | 03/02/1947 | 14/12/1959 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9401 | 365 | 15/02/1947 | 23/07/1963 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1027 | 358 | 11/03/1947 | 25/10/1963 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1028 | 358 | 26/03/1947 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9403 | 365 | 29/03/1947 | 08/06/1959 | |
GWR | County | 4-6-0 | 1029 | 358 | 10/04/1947 | 05/12/1962 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9404 | 365 | 11/04/1947 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9402 | 365 | 12/04/1947 | 01/09/1959 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9405 | 365 | 07/05/1947 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9406 | 365 | 10/05/1947 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9407 | 365 | 15/05/1947 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9408 | 365 | 22/05/1947 | 02/05/1963 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9409 | 365 | 28/05/1947 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4150 | 361 | 05/06/1947 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4151 | 361 | 12/06/1947 | 17/04/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4152 | 361 | 21/06/1947 | 13/09/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4153 | 361 | 26/06/1947 | 21/11/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6750 | 362 | 27/06/1947 | 25/01/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6751 | 362 | 28/06/1947 | 29/08/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6752 | 362 | 04/07/1947 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4154 | 361 | 05/07/1947 | 02/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6753 | 362 | 01/08/1947 | 13/01/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4155 | 361 | 02/08/1947 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6754 | 362 | 06/08/1947 | 18/12/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4156 | 361 | 13/08/1947 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4157 | 361 | 18/08/1947 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4158 | 361 | 25/08/1947 | 19/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6755 | 362 | 26/08/1947 | 08/06/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6756 | 362 | 29/08/1947 | 11/07/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6757 | 362 | 04/09/1947 | 12/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6758 | 362 | 05/09/1947 | 01/06/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6759 | 362 | 08/09/1947 | 25/04/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4159 | 361 | 10/09/1947 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6971 | 366 | 02/10/1947 | 31/10/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6972 | 366 | 07/10/1947 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6973 | 366 | 10/10/1947 | 25/08/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6974 | 366 | 15/10/1947 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6975 | 366 | 21/10/1947 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6976 | 366 | 29/10/1947 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6977 | 366 | 05/11/1947 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6978 | 366 | 07/11/1947 | 02/07/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6979 | 366 | 12/11/1947 | 27/02/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6980 | 366 | 20/11/1947 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3210 | 360 | 03/12/1947 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3211 | 360 | 04/12/1947 | 01/09/1962 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3212 | 360 | 09/12/1947 | 21/10/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3213 | 360 | 11/12/1947 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3214 | 360 | 15/12/1947 | 25/10/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3215 | 360 | 17/12/1947 | 09/01/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3216 | 360 | 19/12/1947 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3217 | 360 | 24/12/1947 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3218 | 360 | 02/01/1948 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3219 | 360 | 30/01/1948 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6981 | 366 | 30/01/1948 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6982 | 366 | 11/02/1948 | 10/08/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6983 | 366 | 13/02/1948 | 25/08/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6985 | 366 | 24/02/1948 | 21/09/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6984 | 366 | 25/02/1948 | 03/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6986 | 366 | 03/03/1948 | 21/04/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6987 | 366 | 10/03/1948 | 21/09/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6988 | 366 | 17/03/1948 | 21/09/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6989 | 366 | 25/03/1948 | 01/06/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6990 | 366 | 08/04/1948 | 03/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9662 | 370 | 08/04/1948 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9663 | 370 | 09/04/1948 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9664 | 370 | 15/04/1948 | 06/05/1964 | |
D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15101 | 15/04/1948 | 05/08/1967 | |||
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9669 | 370 | 19/04/1948 | 22/01/1966 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9665 | 370 | 20/04/1948 | 18/02/1963 | |
D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15102 | 20/04/1948 | 22/07/1967 | |||
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9666 | 370 | 23/04/1948 | 10/09/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9667 | 370 | 06/05/1948 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9668 | 370 | 11/05/1948 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7008 | 367 | 12/05/1948 | 28/09/1964 | |
D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15103 | 21/05/1948 | 26/08/1967 | |||
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9670 | 370 | 26/05/1948 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7009 | 367 | 27/05/1948 | 22/03/1963 | |
D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15104 | 31/05/1948 | 22/07/1967 | |||
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9671 | 370 | 02/06/1948 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9672 | 370 | 08/06/1948 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7010 | 367 | 09/06/1948 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7011 | 367 | 17/06/1948 | 13/02/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7012 | 367 | 25/06/1948 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7013 | 367 | 02/07/1948 | 07/09/1964 | |
D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15105 | 02/07/1948 | 26/08/1967 | |||
D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15106 | 09/07/1948 | 26/08/1967 | |||
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7014 | 367 | 16/07/1948 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7015 | 367 | 29/07/1948 | 05/04/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7016 | 367 | 10/08/1948 | 26/11/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7017 | 367 | 24/08/1948 | 11/02/1963 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7430 | 371 | 31/08/1948 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7431 | 371 | 31/08/1948 | 29/08/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7432 | 371 | 31/08/1948 | 05/09/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7433 | 371 | 31/08/1948 | 06/02/1961 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7434 | 371 | 31/08/1948 | 23/10/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4160 | 369 | 06/09/1948 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4161 | 369 | 14/09/1948 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4162 | 369 | 20/09/1948 | 11/07/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4163 | 369 | 24/09/1948 | 30/10/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4164 | 369 | 30/09/1948 | 18/01/1960 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7435 | 371 | 30/09/1948 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7436 | 371 | 30/09/1948 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7437 | 371 | 30/09/1948 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4165 | 369 | 08/10/1948 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4166 | 369 | 18/10/1948 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4167 | 369 | 22/10/1948 | 16/05/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7438 | 371 | 31/10/1948 | 09/02/1959 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7439 | 371 | 31/10/1948 | 21/04/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4168 | 369 | 01/11/1948 | 02/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6760 | 374 | 02/11/1948 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6761 | 374 | 04/11/1948 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6762 | 374 | 05/11/1948 | 26/03/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6763 | 374 | 11/11/1948 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6764 | 374 | 12/11/1948 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4169 | 369 | 16/11/1948 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6991 | 368 | 23/11/1948 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6992 | 368 | 30/11/1948 | 08/06/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6993 | 368 | 06/12/1948 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6994 | 368 | 10/12/1948 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6995 | 368 | 21/12/1948 | 26/03/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6765 | 374 | 31/12/1948 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6996 | 368 | 04/01/1949 | 09/10/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6997 | 368 | 19/01/1949 | 13/11/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6998 | 368 | 28/01/1949 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6766 | 374 | 31/01/1949 | 01/08/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6767 | 374 | 31/01/1949 | 12/12/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6768 | 374 | 31/01/1949 | 15/01/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6769 | 374 | 31/01/1949 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6999 | 368 | 10/02/1949 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9673 | 378 | 18/02/1949 | 17/05/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9674 | 378 | 02/03/1949 | 08/04/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9675 | 378 | 10/03/1949 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9676 | 378 | 11/03/1949 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9677 | 378 | 18/03/1949 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7901 | 368 | 22/03/1949 | 26/02/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7902 | 368 | 31/03/1949 | 01/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9678 | 378 | 04/04/1949 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7900 | 368 | 07/04/1949 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7903 | 368 | 08/04/1949 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9679 | 378 | 11/04/1949 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7904 | 368 | 19/04/1949 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9680 | 378 | 25/04/1949 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7905 | 368 | 29/04/1949 | 23/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9681 | 378 | 03/05/1949 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9682 | 378 | 09/05/1949 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7018 | 367 | 24/05/1949 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7019 | 367 | 27/05/1949 | 13/02/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7020 | 367 | 31/05/1949 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7021 | 367 | 08/06/1949 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7022 | 367 | 15/06/1949 | 25/06/1965 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1500 | 373 | 24/06/1949 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7023 | 367 | 24/06/1949 | 13/02/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7024 | 367 | 30/06/1949 | 13/02/1965 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1501 | 373 | 08/07/1949 | 17/01/1961 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1502 | 373 | 29/07/1949 | 17/01/1961 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7025 | 367 | 04/08/1949 | 07/09/1964 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1503 | 373 | 09/08/1949 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7026 | 367 | 16/08/1949 | 17/10/1964 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1504 | 373 | 19/08/1949 | 02/05/1963 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1505 | 373 | 31/08/1949 | 16/05/1962 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1506 | 373 | 01/09/1949 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7027 | 367 | 02/09/1949 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1507 | 373 | 07/09/1949 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1508 | 373 | 14/09/1949 | 12/09/1962 | |
GWR | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1509 | 373 | 22/09/1949 | 24/08/1959 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1600 | 381 | 07/10/1949 | 16/03/1959 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4170 | 369 | 07/10/1949 | 16/09/1960 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1601 | 381 | 12/10/1949 | 29/08/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4171 | 369 | 14/10/1949 | 24/10/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1602 | 381 | 18/10/1949 | 23/09/1960 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1603 | 381 | 21/10/1949 | 08/06/1959 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4172 | 369 | 24/10/1949 | 16/01/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1604 | 381 | 25/10/1949 | 11/07/1960 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4173 | 369 | 28/10/1949 | 05/12/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1605 | 381 | 01/11/1949 | 27/02/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4174 | 369 | 02/11/1949 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1606 | 381 | 03/11/1949 | 27/09/1961 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4175 | 369 | 07/11/1949 | 02/10/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1607 | 381 | 11/11/1949 | 25/08/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4176 | 369 | 14/11/1949 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1608 | 381 | 17/11/1949 | 30/09/1963 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1609 | 381 | 18/11/1949 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4177 | 369 | 22/11/1949 | 21/05/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1610 | 381 | 24/11/1949 | 25/12/1959 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1611 | 381 | 28/11/1949 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4178 | 369 | 29/11/1949 | 25/09/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1612 | 381 | 30/11/1949 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR1 | 0-6-0 | 15107 | 363 | 30/11/1949 | 16/06/1958 | ||
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1613 | 381 | 02/12/1949 | 19/03/1965 | |
GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4179 | 369 | 02/12/1949 | 27/02/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1614 | 381 | 05/12/1949 | 26/02/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1615 | 381 | 12/12/1949 | 22/06/1961 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1616 | 381 | 13/12/1949 | 19/10/1959 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1617 | 381 | 14/12/1949 | 13/11/1963 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1618 | 381 | 19/12/1949 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7906 | 368 | 20/12/1949 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1619 | 381 | 23/12/1949 | 02/05/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7907 | 368 | 05/01/1950 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7908 | 368 | 11/01/1950 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7909 | 368 | 20/01/1950 | 18/11/1965 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7440 | 380 | 31/01/1950 | 30/10/1962 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7441 | 380 | 31/01/1950 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7910 | 368 | 31/01/1950 | 06/02/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7911 | 368 | 21/02/1950 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7442 | 380 | 28/02/1950 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7443 | 380 | 28/02/1950 | 05/09/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7444 | 380 | 28/02/1950 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7912 | 368 | 03/03/1950 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7913 | 368 | 13/03/1950 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7914 | 368 | 21/03/1950 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7915 | 368 | 30/03/1950 | 09/10/1965 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7445 | 380 | 31/03/1950 | 10/03/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7446 | 380 | 31/03/1950 | 06/07/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7447 | 380 | 31/03/1950 | 20/04/1959 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7916 | 368 | 06/04/1950 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7448 | 380 | 12/04/1950 | 19/04/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7917 | 368 | 21/04/1950 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7918 | 368 | 26/04/1950 | 20/02/1965 | |
GWR | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7449 | 380 | 30/04/1950 | 06/06/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7919 | 368 | 04/05/1950 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7028 | 375 | 19/05/1950 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7029 | 375 | 25/05/1950 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7030 | 375 | 05/06/1950 | 01/02/1963 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1620 | 381 | 14/06/1950 | 08/06/1960 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7031 | 375 | 20/06/1950 | 16/07/1963 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1621 | 381 | 21/06/1950 | 14/01/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7032 | 375 | 23/06/1950 | 28/09/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1622 | 381 | 27/06/1950 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1623 | 381 | 29/06/1950 | 16/06/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1624 | 381 | 30/06/1950 | 27/02/1962 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7033 | 375 | 07/07/1950 | 07/01/1963 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7034 | 375 | 01/08/1950 | 25/06/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1625 | 381 | 02/08/1950 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7035 | 375 | 09/08/1950 | 01/06/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1626 | 381 | 10/08/1950 | 24/08/1962 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1627 | 381 | 16/08/1950 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7036 | 375 | 17/08/1950 | 17/09/1963 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1628 | 381 | 24/08/1950 | 18/09/1966 | |
GWR | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7037 | 375 | 28/08/1950 | 01/03/1963 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1629 | 381 | 01/09/1950 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7920 | 376 | 05/09/1950 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7921 | 376 | 12/09/1950 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7922 | 376 | 20/09/1950 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7923 | 376 | 26/09/1950 | 03/06/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7924 | 376 | 29/09/1950 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7925 | 376 | 09/10/1950 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7926 | 376 | 12/10/1950 | 26/12/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6770 | 379 | 17/10/1950 | 30/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6771 | 379 | 19/10/1950 | 24/03/1958 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7927 | 376 | 24/10/1950 | 03/12/1965 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7928 | 376 | 30/10/1950 | 08/03/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6772 | 379 | 02/11/1950 | 16/12/1963 | |
GWR | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7929 | 376 | 02/11/1950 | 21/08/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6773 | 379 | 03/11/1950 | 05/10/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6774 | 379 | 14/11/1950 | 14/12/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6775 | 379 | 21/11/1950 | 01/08/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6776 | 379 | 27/11/1950 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7820 | 377 | 30/11/1950 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7821 | 377 | 30/11/1950 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6777 | 379 | 04/12/1950 | 06/05/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6778 | 379 | 07/12/1950 | 04/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6779 | 379 | 12/12/1950 | 22/06/1959 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7822 | 377 | 31/12/1950 | 06/11/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7823 | 377 | 31/12/1950 | 25/07/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7824 | 377 | 31/12/1950 | 14/11/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7825 | 377 | 31/12/1950 | 14/05/1964 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7826 | 377 | 31/12/1950 | 30/04/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7827 | 377 | 31/12/1950 | 02/10/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7828 | 377 | 31/12/1950 | 02/10/1965 | |
GWR | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7829 | 377 | 31/12/1950 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1630 | 389 | 13/01/1951 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1631 | 389 | 19/01/1951 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1632 | 389 | 23/01/1951 | 17/04/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1633 | 389 | 31/01/1951 | 30/10/1962 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1634 | 389 | 05/02/1951 | 13/06/1961 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1635 | 389 | 13/02/1951 | 19/10/1959 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1636 | 389 | 16/02/1951 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1637 | 389 | 23/02/1951 | 30/06/1960 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1638 | 389 | 02/03/1951 | 06/08/1966 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1639 | 389 | 05/03/1951 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1640 | 389 | 20/03/1951 | 18/07/1961 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1641 | 389 | 28/03/1951 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1642 | 389 | 02/04/1951 | 03/01/1962 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1643 | 389 | 10/04/1951 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1644 | 389 | 17/04/1951 | 12/10/1959 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1645 | 389 | 24/04/1951 | 30/10/1962 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1646 | 389 | 01/05/1951 | 29/12/1962 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1647 | 389 | 09/05/1951 | 27/04/1961 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1648 | 389 | 18/05/1951 | 17/05/1963 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75000 | 390 | 21/05/1951 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1649 | 389 | 24/05/1951 | 29/12/1962 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75001 | 390 | 16/08/1951 | 14/12/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75002 | 390 | 24/08/1951 | 12/08/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75004 | 390 | 27/08/1951 | 11/03/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75003 | 390 | 30/08/1951 | 01/10/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75005 | 390 | 09/09/1951 | 18/11/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75006 | 390 | 14/09/1951 | 12/08/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75007 | 390 | 25/09/1951 | 21/04/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75008 | 390 | 05/10/1951 | 31/12/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75009 | 390 | 16/10/1951 | 03/08/1968 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75013 | 391 | 11/1951 | 12/08/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75010 | 391 | 02/11/1951 | 14/10/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75011 | 391 | 12/11/1951 | 05/11/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75012 | 391 | 19/11/1951 | 28/01/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75014 | 391 | 06/12/1951 | 31/12/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75015 | 391 | 20/12/1951 | 30/12/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75016 | 391 | 03/01/1952 | 08/07/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75017 | 391 | 18/01/1952 | 07/01/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75018 | 391 | 07/03/1952 | 17/06/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75019 | 391 | 21/03/1952 | 03/08/1968 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82000 | 392 | 04/04/1952 | 10/12/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82001 | 392 | 18/04/1952 | 31/12/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82002 | 392 | 28/04/1952 | 07/02/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82003 | 392 | 02/05/1952 | 10/12/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82004 | 392 | 14/05/1952 | 01/10/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82005 | 392 | 16/05/1952 | 19/09/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82006 | 392 | 27/05/1952 | 18/09/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82007 | 392 | 30/05/1952 | 25/06/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82008 | 392 | 05/06/1952 | 07/02/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82009 | 392 | 13/06/1952 | 05/11/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82010 | 393 | 25/06/1952 | 24/04/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82011 | 393 | 01/07/1952 | 30/08/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82012 | 393 | 04/07/1952 | 31/05/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82013 | 393 | 09/07/1952 | 14/06/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82014 | 393 | 01/08/1952 | 31/05/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82017 | 393 | 08/08/1952 | 25/04/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82015 | 393 | 13/08/1952 | 06/12/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82016 | 393 | 21/08/1952 | 25/04/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82018 | 393 | 08/09/1952 | 10/07/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82019 | 393 | 26/09/1952 | 09/07/1967 | |
08 | 0-6-0 | 13001 | 404 | 21/10/1952 | 19/11/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13002 | 404 | 24/10/1952 | 17/07/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13003 | 404 | 31/10/1952 | 17/07/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13000 | 404 | 01/11/1952 | 19/11/1972 | ||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46503 | 394 | 05/11/1952 | 06/05/1967 | |
08 | 0-6-0 | 13004 | 404 | 14/11/1952 | 30/06/1978 | ||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46504 | 394 | 19/11/1952 | 15/10/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46505 | 394 | 21/11/1952 | 06/1967 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46506 | 394 | 27/11/1952 | 06/05/1967 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46507 | 394 | 28/11/1952 | 26/06/1965 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46508 | 394 | 02/12/1952 | 17/12/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46509 | 394 | 05/12/1952 | 08/10/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46510 | 394 | 09/12/1952 | 09/1965 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46511 | 394 | 12/12/1952 | 09/1965 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46512 | 394 | 16/12/1952 | 12/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46513 | 394 | 19/12/1952 | 16/07/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46514 | 394 | 23/12/1952 | 25/06/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46515 | 394 | 06/01/1953 | 06/05/1967 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46516 | 394 | 13/01/1953 | 05/1967 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46517 | 394 | 22/01/1953 | 12/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46518 | 394 | 27/01/1953 | 19/03/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46519 | 394 | 03/02/1953 | 08/10/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46520 | 394 | 09/02/1953 | 06/05/1967 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46521 | 394 | 19/02/1953 | 29/10/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46522 | 394 | 03/03/1953 | 06/05/1967 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46523 | 394 | 05/03/1953 | 06/05/1967 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46525 | 394 | 07/03/1953 | 12/12/1964 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46524 | 394 | 11/03/1953 | 20/02/1965 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46526 | 394 | 25/03/1953 | 16/07/1966 | |
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46527 | 394 | 01/04/1953 | 09/10/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75030 | 401 | 15/06/1953 | 30/12/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75031 | 401 | 16/06/1953 | 12/02/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75032 | 401 | 30/06/1953 | 17/02/1968 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75034 | 401 | 07/1953 | 10/02/1968 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75033 | 401 | 03/07/1953 | 30/12/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75035 | 401 | 13/08/1953 | 22/07/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75036 | 401 | 14/08/1953 | 11/06/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75037 | 401 | 14/08/1953 | 30/12/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75038 | 401 | 25/08/1953 | 25/12/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75039 | 401 | 27/08/1953 | 23/09/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75044 | 401 | 09/1953 | 12/03/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75040 | 401 | 02/09/1953 | 21/10/1967 | |
08 | 0-6-0 | 13025 | 412 | 05/09/1953 | 17/07/1983 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75041 | 401 | 10/09/1953 | 27/01/1968 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75042 | 401 | 11/09/1953 | 04/11/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75043 | 401 | 17/09/1953 | 30/12/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75045 | 401 | 28/09/1953 | 23/04/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75049 | 401 | 10/1953 | 08/10/1966 | |
08 | 0-6-0 | 13026 | 412 | 03/10/1953 | 12/11/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13027 | 412 | 03/10/1953 | 25/09/1983 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13028 | 412 | 03/10/1953 | 26/08/1973 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13029 | 412 | 03/10/1953 | 07/12/1986 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13030 | 412 | 03/10/1953 | 17/03/1985 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75046 | 401 | 05/10/1953 | 12/08/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75047 | 401 | 16/10/1953 | 12/08/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75048 | 401 | 23/10/1953 | 03/08/1968 | |
08 | 0-6-0 | 13031 | 412 | 31/10/1953 | 25/09/1983 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13032 | 412 | 31/10/1953 | 26/12/1982 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13033 | 412 | 31/10/1953 | 18/12/1977 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75020 | 400 | 13/11/1953 | 03/08/1968 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75021 | 400 | 23/11/1953 | 10/02/1968 | |
08 | 0-6-0 | 13034 | 412 | 28/11/1953 | 19/11/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13035 | 412 | 28/11/1953 | 17/12/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13036 | 412 | 28/11/1953 | 04/07/1982 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13037 | 412 | 28/11/1953 | 17/12/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13038 | 412 | 28/11/1953 | 30/12/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13039 | 412 | 28/11/1953 | 02/11/1980 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75022 | 400 | 02/12/1953 | 31/12/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75023 | 400 | 03/12/1953 | 15/01/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75024 | 400 | 18/12/1953 | 11/11/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77000 | 406 | 09/02/1954 | 07/12/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77001 | 406 | 11/02/1954 | 02/01/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77003 | 406 | 25/02/1954 | 07/12/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77002 | 406 | 11/03/1954 | 12/06/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77004 | 406 | 11/03/1954 | 07/12/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77005 | 407 | 17/03/1954 | 29/11/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77006 | 407 | 23/03/1954 | 25/03/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77007 | 407 | 31/03/1954 | 29/11/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77008 | 407 | 23/04/1954 | 23/06/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75025 | 400 | 29/04/1954 | 31/12/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75026 | 400 | 13/05/1954 | 30/12/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75027 | 400 | 17/05/1954 | 03/08/1968 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75028 | 400 | 27/05/1954 | 11/12/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75029 | 400 | 28/05/1954 | 12/08/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77009 | 407 | 05/06/1954 | 12/05/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77010 | 406 | 10/06/1954 | 25/11/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77011 | 406 | 16/06/1954 | 05/02/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77012 | 406 | 23/06/1954 | 12/06/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77013 | 406 | 01/07/1954 | 30/03/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77014 | 406 | 07/07/1954 | 09/07/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77015 | 407 | 29/07/1954 | 17/07/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77016 | 407 | 06/08/1954 | 03/03/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77017 | 407 | 20/08/1954 | 29/11/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77018 | 407 | 26/08/1954 | 29/11/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77019 | 407 | 03/09/1954 | 29/11/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82020 | 398 | 29/09/1954 | 19/09/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82021 | 398 | 06/10/1954 | 17/10/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82022 | 398 | 15/10/1954 | 17/10/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82023 | 398 | 22/10/1954 | 02/10/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82024 | 398 | 29/10/1954 | 30/01/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82025 | 398 | 05/11/1954 | 09/08/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82026 | 398 | 12/11/1954 | 26/06/1966 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1650 | 417 | 22/11/1954 | 26/02/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82027 | 398 | 23/11/1954 | 09/01/1966 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1651 | 417 | 01/12/1954 | 01/10/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82028 | 398 | 02/12/1954 | 04/09/1966 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1652 | 417 | 07/12/1954 | 11/01/1960 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82029 | 398 | 13/12/1954 | 09/07/1967 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1653 | 417 | 21/12/1954 | 05/12/1962 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82030 | 399 | 21/12/1954 | 31/12/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1654 | 417 | 22/12/1954 | 15/06/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82031 | 399 | 30/12/1954 | 10/12/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82032 | 399 | 01/01/1955 | 01/05/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1655 | 417 | 06/01/1955 | 21/07/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82033 | 399 | 13/01/1955 | 19/09/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1656 | 417 | 18/01/1955 | 15/06/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1657 | 417 | 28/01/1955 | 06/11/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82034 | 399 | 28/01/1955 | 10/12/1966 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1659 | 417 | 10/02/1955 | 24/10/1960 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1658 | 417 | 28/02/1955 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1660 | 417 | 28/02/1955 | 26/02/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82035 | 410 | 03/03/1955 | 06/08/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1661 | 417 | 09/03/1955 | 13/07/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1662 | 417 | 10/03/1955 | 28/12/1963 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1664 | 417 | 29/03/1955 | 06/11/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1663 | 417 | 31/03/1955 | 23/01/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82036 | 410 | 01/04/1955 | 21/07/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1665 | 417 | 04/04/1955 | 24/07/1964 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1666 | 417 | 20/04/1955 | 26/02/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82037 | 410 | 20/04/1955 | 25/08/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1667 | 417 | 03/05/1955 | 06/11/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82038 | 410 | 04/05/1955 | 06/08/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82039 | 410 | 10/05/1955 | 02/07/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82040 | 410 | 19/05/1955 | 02/07/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1669 | 417 | 26/05/1955 | 01/10/1965 | |
GWR | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1668 | 417 | 31/05/1955 | 23/01/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82041 | 410 | 17/06/1955 | 31/12/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82042 | 410 | 20/06/1955 | 06/08/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82043 | 410 | 27/06/1955 | 07/02/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82044 | 410 | 12/08/1955 | 18/11/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75065 | 409 | 26/08/1955 | 04/09/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75066 | 409 | 01/09/1955 | 02/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75067 | 409 | 12/09/1955 | 04/10/1964 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75068 | 409 | 15/09/1955 | 02/07/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75069 | 409 | 28/09/1955 | 25/09/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75070 | 409 | 13/10/1955 | 11/09/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75071 | 409 | 26/10/1955 | 12/08/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75072 | 409 | 01/11/1955 | 31/12/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75074 | 409 | 18/11/1955 | 09/07/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75075 | 409 | 25/11/1955 | 09/07/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75073 | 409 | 30/11/1955 | 31/12/1965 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75076 | 409 | 09/12/1955 | 09/07/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75077 | 409 | 29/12/1955 | 09/07/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75078 | 409 | 20/01/1956 | 10/07/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75079 | 409 | 20/01/1956 | 20/11/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92087 | 31/08/1956 | 25/02/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92089 | 30/09/1956 | 18/02/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92088 | 31/10/1956 | 27/04/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75050 | 408 | 09/11/1956 | 26/11/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75051 | 408 | 27/11/1956 | 29/10/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92090 | 30/11/1956 | 20/05/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92091 | 30/11/1956 | 25/05/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75052 | 408 | 20/12/1956 | 12/08/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92092 | 31/12/1956 | 22/10/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75053 | 408 | 01/1957 | 10/09/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75054 | 408 | 17/01/1957 | 27/08/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75055 | 408 | 23/01/1957 | 27/05/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92093 | 31/01/1957 | 02/09/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75056 | 408 | 28/02/1957 | 11/06/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92094 | 28/02/1957 | 04/05/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75057 | 408 | 03/1957 | 12/02/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92095 | 31/03/1957 | 01/10/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75058 | 408 | 08/04/1957 | 30/12/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75059 | 408 | 15/04/1957 | 22/07/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92096 | 30/04/1957 | 25/02/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75060 | 408 | 02/05/1957 | 22/04/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75061 | 408 | 15/05/1957 | 04/02/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75062 | 408 | 28/05/1957 | 10/02/1968 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75063 | 408 | 13/06/1957 | 28/05/1966 | |
BR | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75064 | 408 | 26/06/1957 | 20/05/1967 | |
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92178 | 30/09/1957 | 03/10/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92179 | 07/10/1957 | 14/11/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92180 | 08/11/1957 | 11/04/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92181 | 22/11/1957 | 21/02/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92182 | 02/12/1957 | 17/04/1966 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2000 | 12/12/1957 | 07/05/1969 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2001 | 12/12/1957 | 31/05/1969 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2002 | 12/12/1957 | 31/05/1969 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2003 | 12/12/1957 | 07/05/1969 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92183 | 20/12/1957 | 03/1966 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2004 | 09/01/1958 | 10/05/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2005 | 09/01/1958 | 05/11/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2006 | 09/01/1958 | 08/10/1972 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2007 | 09/01/1958 | 10/05/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2008 | 09/01/1958 | 30/12/1978 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92184 | 10/01/1958 | 21/02/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92185 | 15/01/1958 | 21/02/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92186 | 27/01/1958 | 29/08/1965 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2009 | 12/02/1958 | 11/07/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2010 | 12/02/1958 | 10/11/1974 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2011 | 12/02/1958 | 08/10/1972 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2012 | 12/02/1958 | 15/12/1975 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92187 | 12/02/1958 | 21/02/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92188 | 27/02/1958 | 02/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92189 | 14/03/1958 | 19/12/1965 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2013 | 18/03/1958 | 18/07/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2014 | 18/03/1958 | 30/06/1974 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2015 | 18/03/1958 | 13/07/1971 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2016 | 18/03/1958 | 30/12/1978 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92190 | 28/03/1958 | 10/10/1965 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2017 | 01/04/1958 | 14/02/1982 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2018 | 14/04/1958 | 09/11/1975 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92191 | 15/04/1958 | 19/12/1965 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2019 | 06/05/1958 | 25/07/1971 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2020 | 06/05/1958 | 03/12/1975 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92192 | 10/05/1958 | 21/02/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92193 | 23/05/1958 | 13/06/1965 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2021 | 27/05/1958 | 07/11/1982 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2022 | 27/05/1958 | 07/11/1982 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | 91 | 06/1958 | 19/12/1982 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92194 | 10/06/1958 | 05/12/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92195 | 27/06/1958 | 09/05/1965 | ||
42 | B-B | D800 | 428 | 11/08/1958 | 05/10/1968 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2023 | 12/08/1958 | 04/07/1971 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92196 | 15/08/1958 | 06/12/1964 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2024 | 19/08/1958 | 04/07/1971 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2025 | 26/08/1958 | 29/09/1977 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2026 | 05/09/1958 | 06/02/1983 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92197 | 11/09/1958 | 19/09/1965 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2027 | 16/09/1958 | 31/01/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2028 | 02/10/1958 | 31/12/1969 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92198 | 06/10/1958 | 02/08/1964 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2029 | 16/10/1958 | 03/09/1979 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2030 | 28/10/1958 | 08/1969 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92199 | 28/10/1958 | 02/08/1964 | ||
42 | B-B | D801 | 428 | 07/11/1958 | 03/08/1968 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2031 | 13/11/1958 | 07/05/1969 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92200 | 18/11/1958 | 03/10/1965 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2032 | 25/11/1958 | 25/07/1971 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92201 | 05/12/1958 | 27/03/1966 | ||
42 | B-B | D802 | 428 | 16/12/1958 | 05/10/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92202 | 27/12/1958 | 19/12/1965 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2033 | 31/12/1958 | 18/12/1971 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | 92 | 31/12/1958 | 26/11/1987 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2034 | 21/01/1959 | 06/02/1983 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2035 | 30/01/1959 | 15/06/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2036 | 09/02/1959 | 16/12/1971 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2037 | 09/02/1959 | 29/09/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2038 | 25/02/1959 | 05/03/1972 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2039 | 13/03/1959 | 13/02/1972 | |||
42 | B-B | D803 | 437 | 16/03/1959 | 01/01/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2040 | 31/03/1959 | 31/05/1969 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92203 | 429 | 06/04/1959 | 11/11/1967 | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2041 | 13/04/1959 | 01/02/1970 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92204 | 429 | 21/04/1959 | 09/12/1967 | |
42 | B-B | D804 | 437 | 23/04/1959 | 03/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2042 | 27/04/1959 | 07/1969 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92205 | 429 | 01/05/1959 | 08/06/1967 | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2043 | 06/05/1959 | 30/09/1971 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92206 | 429 | 06/05/1959 | 09/05/1967 | |
42 | B-B | D805 | 437 | 13/05/1959 | 24/10/1972 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92207 | 429 | 01/06/1959 | 26/12/1964 | |
42 | B-B | D806 | 437 | 03/06/1959 | 02/11/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2086 | 05/06/1959 | 13/11/1983 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92208 | 429 | 11/06/1959 | 28/10/1967 | |
42 | B-B | D807 | 437 | 24/06/1959 | 26/09/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2087 | 24/06/1959 | 13/06/1971 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92209 | 429 | 26/06/1959 | 31/12/1965 | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2088 | 01/07/1959 | 08/06/1972 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2114 | 02/07/1959 | 11/05/1968 | |||
42 | B-B | D808 | 437 | 08/07/1959 | 03/10/1971 | ||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92210 | 429 | 07/08/1959 | 06/11/1964 | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2115 | 13/08/1959 | 11/05/1968 | |||
42 | B-B | D809 | 437 | 19/08/1959 | 03/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2116 | 21/08/1959 | 09/10/1971 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2117 | 04/09/1959 | 09/10/1971 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92211 | 429 | 08/09/1959 | 22/05/1967 | |
42 | B-B | D810 | 437 | 16/09/1959 | 03/12/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2118 | 17/09/1959 | 18/06/1972 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92212 | 429 | 22/09/1959 | 30/01/1968 | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2119 | 25/09/1959 | 23/02/1986 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2120 | 08/10/1959 | 23/02/1986 | |||
42 | B-B | D811 | 437 | 14/10/1959 | 01/01/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2121 | 16/10/1959 | 03/05/1981 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92213 | 429 | 22/10/1959 | 05/11/1966 | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2122 | 30/10/1959 | 26/11/1972 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92214 | 429 | 30/10/1959 | 06/08/1965 | |
42 | B-B | D812 | 437 | 12/11/1959 | 03/11/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2123 | 12/11/1959 | 28/12/1968 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92215 | 429 | 17/11/1959 | 08/06/1967 | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2124 | 23/11/1959 | 28/02/1970 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2125 | 27/11/1959 | 28/12/1968 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92216 | 429 | 01/12/1959 | 26/10/1965 | |
42 | B-B | D813 | 437 | 09/12/1959 | 01/01/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2126 | 16/12/1959 | 09/10/1971 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92217 | 429 | 22/12/1959 | 30/07/1966 | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2127 | 24/12/1959 | 11/05/1968 | |||
42 | B-B | D814 | 437 | 01/01/1960 | 07/11/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2128 | 07/01/1960 | 04/07/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2129 | 18/01/1960 | 20/12/1981 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92218 | 429 | 18/01/1960 | 04/05/1968 | |
42 | B-B | D815 | 437 | 20/01/1960 | 03/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2130 | 27/01/1960 | 20/08/1972 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92219 | 429 | 27/01/1960 | 06/08/1965 | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2131 | 02/02/1960 | 06/07/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2132 | 12/02/1960 | 24/06/1969 | |||
42 | B-B | D816 | 437 | 17/02/1960 | 01/01/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2133 | 23/02/1960 | 07/1969 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2134 | 29/02/1960 | 04/07/1976 | |||
42 | B-B | D817 | 437 | 09/03/1960 | 03/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2135 | 21/03/1960 | 31/01/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2136 | 21/03/1960 | 01/01/1972 | |||
BR | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92220 | 429 | 25/03/1960 | 26/03/1965 | |
42 | B-B | D818 | 437 | 30/03/1960 | 01/11/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2137 | 30/03/1960 | 11/07/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2138 | 05/04/1960 | 24/06/1969 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2139 | 11/04/1960 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2140 | 22/04/1960 | 04/04/1970 | |||
42 | B-B | D819 | 437 | 25/04/1960 | 01/10/1971 | ||
42 | B-B | D820 | 437 | 04/05/1960 | 02/11/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2141 | 04/05/1960 | 07/07/1985 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2142 | 12/05/1960 | 02/10/1983 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2147 | 19/05/1960 | 05/09/1975 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2148 | 24/05/1960 | 19/11/1972 | |||
42 | B-B | D821 | 437 | 25/05/1960 | 03/12/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2149 | 30/05/1960 | 28/11/1982 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2150 | 10/06/1960 | 19/11/1972 | |||
42 | B-B | D822 | 437 | 15/06/1960 | 03/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2151 | 16/06/1960 | 07/07/1985 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2152 | 22/06/1960 | 02/10/1983 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2153 | 27/06/1960 | 08/11/1975 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2154 | 01/07/1960 | 11/09/1983 | |||
42 | B-B | D823 | 437 | 06/07/1960 | 03/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2155 | 26/07/1960 | 11/06/1975 | |||
42 | B-B | D824 | 437 | 27/07/1960 | 03/12/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2156 | 08/08/1960 | 22/11/1975 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2157 | 16/08/1960 | 29/12/1975 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2158 | 22/08/1960 | 05/07/1987 | |||
42 | B-B | D825 | 437 | 24/08/1960 | 23/08/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2159 | 29/08/1960 | 03/10/1977 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2160 | 05/09/1960 | 13/12/1981 | |||
42 | B-B | D826 | 437 | 07/09/1960 | 18/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2161 | 13/09/1960 | 13/12/1981 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2162 | 21/09/1960 | 23/05/1989 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2163 | 03/10/1960 | 14/01/1976 | |||
42 | B-B | D827 | 437 | 04/10/1960 | 01/01/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2164 | 07/10/1960 | 23/01/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2165 | 17/10/1960 | 21/08/1975 | |||
42 | B-B | D828 | 437 | 19/10/1960 | 28/05/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2166 | 25/10/1960 | 29/11/1975 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2167 | 01/11/1960 | 20/07/1975 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2168 | 08/11/1960 | 09/08/1981 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2169 | 15/11/1960 | 02/11/1975 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2170 | 21/11/1960 | 03/1989 | |||
42 | B-B | D829 | 437 | 23/11/1960 | 26/08/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2171 | 28/11/1960 | 24/10/1977 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2172 | 06/12/1960 | 26/05/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2173 | 14/12/1960 | 01/11/1973 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2174 | 31/12/1960 | 29/11/1975 | |||
42 | B-B | D831 | 437 | 11/01/1961 | 03/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2143 | 13/01/1961 | 06/07/1968 | |||
42 | B-B | D830 | 437 | 19/01/1961 | 26/03/1969 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2144 | 19/01/1961 | 23/02/1986 | |||
42 | B-B | D832 | 437 | 08/02/1961 | 16/12/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2145 | 12/02/1961 | 07/07/1985 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2146 | 14/02/1961 | 21/09/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2187 | 08/03/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2188 | 20/03/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
42 | B-B | D866 | 448 | 24/03/1961 | 01/01/1972 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2189 | 31/03/1961 | 16/03/1986 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2190 | 14/04/1961 | 28/12/1968 | |||
42 | B-B | D867 | 448 | 26/04/1961 | 18/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2191 | 27/04/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2192 | 05/05/1961 | 25/01/1969 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2193 | 15/05/1961 | 25/01/1969 | |||
42 | B-B | D868 | 448 | 18/05/1961 | 03/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2194 | 23/05/1961 | 21/09/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2195 | 05/06/1961 | 01/09/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2196 | 08/06/1961 | 12/06/1983 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2197 | 15/06/1961 | 05/07/1987 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2198 | 22/06/1961 | 22/11/1970 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2199 | 29/06/1961 | 18/06/1972 | |||
42 | B-B | D869 | 448 | 12/07/1961 | 03/10/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2372 | 26/07/1961 | 22/11/1970 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2373 | 02/08/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2374 | 11/08/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2375 | 22/08/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2376 | 07/09/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2377 | 11/09/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2378 | 22/09/1961 | 13/06/1971 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2379 | 11/10/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2380 | 19/10/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
42 | B-B | D870 | 448 | 25/10/1961 | 28/08/1971 | ||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2381 | 27/10/1961 | 18/06/1972 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2382 | 08/11/1961 | 02/10/1983 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2383 | 16/11/1961 | 18/04/1971 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2384 | 27/11/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2175 | 06/12/1961 | 11/09/1983 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2176 | 15/12/1961 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2177 | 27/12/1961 | 21/09/1968 | |||
52 | C-C | D1000 | 29/12/1961 | 11/02/1974 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2178 | 09/01/1962 | 30/09/1969 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2179 | 20/01/1962 | 31/07/2002 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2180 | 01/02/1962 | 31/03/1984 | |||
52 | C-C | D1001 | 12/02/1962 | 04/10/1976 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2181 | 21/02/1962 | 11/05/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2182 | 05/03/1962 | 11/05/1968 | |||
52 | C-C | D1002 | 19/03/1962 | 29/01/1974 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2183 | 20/03/1962 | 21/09/1968 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2184 | 09/04/1962 | 28/12/1968 | |||
52 | C-C | D1003 | 14/04/1962 | 05/01/1975 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2185 | 03/05/1962 | 28/12/1968 | |||
52 | C-C | D1004 | 12/05/1962 | 01/08/1973 | |||
03 | 0-6-0 | D2186 | 23/05/1962 | 30/09/1969 | |||
52 | C-C | D1005 | 18/06/1962 | 16/11/1976 | |||
52 | C-C | D1006 | 06/07/1962 | 06/04/1975 | |||
52 | C-C | D1007 | 01/08/1962 | 29/01/1974 | |||
52 | C-C | D1008 | 04/09/1962 | 21/10/1974 | |||
52 | C-C | D1009 | 24/09/1962 | 10/11/1976 | |||
52 | C-C | D1010 | 15/10/1962 | 28/02/1977 | |||
52 | C-C | D1011 | 27/10/1962 | 06/10/1975 | |||
52 | C-C | D1012 | 17/11/1962 | 02/11/1975 | |||
52 | C-C | D1013 | 13/12/1962 | 28/02/1977 | |||
52 | C-C | D1014 | 24/12/1962 | 06/08/1974 | |||
52 | C-C | D1015 | 21/01/1963 | 13/12/1976 | |||
52 | C-C | D1016 | 16/02/1963 | 29/12/1975 | |||
52 | C-C | D1017 | 15/03/1963 | 01/08/1973 | |||
52 | C-C | D1018 | 02/04/1963 | 04/06/1973 | |||
52 | C-C | D1019 | 02/05/1963 | 06/05/1973 | |||
52 | C-C | D1020 | 21/05/1963 | 04/06/1973 | |||
52 | C-C | D1021 | 17/06/1963 | 10/08/1976 | |||
52 | C-C | D1022 | 16/07/1963 | 18/01/1977 | |||
52 | C-C | D1023 | 23/09/1963 | 28/02/1977 | |||
52 | C-C | D1024 | 01/10/1963 | 18/11/1973 | |||
52 | C-C | D1025 | 01/11/1963 | 06/10/1975 | |||
52 | C-C | D1026 | 24/12/1963 | 06/10/1975 | |||
52 | C-C | D1027 | 28/01/1964 | 02/11/1975 | |||
52 | C-C | D1028 | 25/02/1964 | 06/10/1976 | |||
52 | C-C | D1029 | 20/04/1964 | 18/11/1974 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9500 | 24/07/1964 | 03/05/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9501 | 27/07/1964 | 31/03/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9502 | 27/07/1964 | 03/05/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9503 | 30/07/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9504 | 08/08/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9505 | 12/08/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9507 | 28/08/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9506 | 31/08/1964 | 10/03/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9508 | 07/09/1964 | 05/10/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9509 | 08/09/1964 | 05/10/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9511 | 17/09/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9510 | 18/09/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9512 | 29/09/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9513 | 06/10/1964 | 10/03/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9514 | 06/10/1964 | 03/05/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9515 | 17/10/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9516 | 21/10/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9518 | 30/10/1964 | 03/05/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9519 | 30/10/1964 | 05/10/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9517 | 12/11/1964 | 05/10/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9520 | 12/11/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9521 | 20/11/1964 | 03/05/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9522 | 25/11/1964 | 31/12/1967 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9523 | 01/12/1964 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9524 | 11/12/1964 | 03/05/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9526 | 06/01/1965 | 30/11/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9525 | 13/01/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9527 | 18/01/1965 | 03/05/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9528 | 21/01/1965 | 02/03/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9529 | 26/01/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9530 | 02/02/1965 | 05/10/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9531 | 02/02/1965 | 30/12/1967 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9532 | 18/02/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9533 | 19/02/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9534 | 02/03/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9535 | 08/03/1965 | 21/12/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9536 | 16/03/1965 | 03/05/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9537 | 16/03/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9538 | 26/03/1965 | 03/05/1969 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9539 | 09/04/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9540 | 22/04/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9541 | 27/04/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9542 | 06/05/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9544 | 29/05/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9545 | 08/06/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9543 | 28/06/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9546 | 28/06/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9547 | 20/07/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9548 | 26/07/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9549 | 19/08/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9550 | 27/08/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9551 | 02/09/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9552 | 06/09/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9553 | 16/09/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9554 | 06/10/1965 | 01/04/1968 | |||
14 | 0-6-0 | D9555 | 22/10/1965 | 03/05/1969 |