Manufacturer: Vulcan Ironwork (USA)
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 62 | 4375 | 1942 | 01/12/1962 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 63 | 4382 | 1942 | 02/06/1962 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 66 | 4377 | 1942 | 30/12/1962 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 67 | 4380 | 1942 | 09/07/1967 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 64 | 4432 | 1943 | 09/07/1967 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 65 | 4441 | 1943 | 06/10/1962 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 68 | 4444 | 1943 | 15/03/1964 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 69 | 4425 | 1943 | 09/07/1967 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 70 | 4433 | 1943 | 06/10/1962 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 71 | 4439 | 1943 | 09/07/1967 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 72 | 4446 | 1943 | 09/07/1967 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 73 | 4447 | 1943 | 08/01/1967 | |
SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 74 | 4488 | 1943 | 03/1963 |