Manufacturer: Yorkshire Engine Company
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 70 | 547 | 09/1897 | 07/1933 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 71 | 548 | 09/1897 | 05/1937 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 72 | 549 | 10/1897 | 01/1936 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 73 | 550 | 11/1897 | 07/1937 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 74 | 551 | 11/1897 | 08/1935 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 75 | 552 | 12/1897 | 07/1937 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 76 | 560 | 12/1898 | 05/1937 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 77 | 561 | 12/1898 | 11/1935 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 78 | 562 | 12/1898 | 09/1933 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 91 | 604 | 05/1900 | 01/1938 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 92 | 605 | 06/1900 | 12/1933 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 93 | 606 | 06/1900 | 07/1937 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 94 | 607 | 06/1900 | 05/1937 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 95 | 608 | 07/1900 | 11/1938 | |
HBR | J23 | 0-6-0 | 96 | 609 | 08/1900 | 05/1937 | |
HBR | J75 | 0-6-0T | 111 | E116 | 655 | 12/1901 | 09/1937 |
HBR | J75 | 0-6-0T | 112 | E116 | 656 | 12/1901 | 06/1937 |
HBR | J75 | 0-6-0T | 113 | E116 | 657 | 12/1901 | 05/1937 |
HBR | J75 | 0-6-0T | 114 | E116 | 658 | 01/1902 | 05/1937 |
HBR | J75 | 0-6-0T | 115 | E116 | 659 | 02/1902 | 09/1937 |
HBR | J75 | 0-6-0T | 116 | E116 | 660 | 02/1902 | 05/1937 |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 253 | 765 | 03/1904 | 20/03/1959 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 254 | 766 | 03/1904 | 31/10/1959 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 255 | 767 | 03/1904 | 26/03/1960 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 256 | 768 | 03/1904 | 30/06/1961 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 257 | 769 | 04/1904 | 05/10/1961 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 822 | 08/1904 | 12/03/1959 | ||
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 1078 | 820 | 08/1905 | 23/09/1962 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 1079 | 821 | 08/1905 | 28/06/1960 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 1081 | 823 | 09/1905 | 23/01/1960 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 1082 | 824 | 09/1905 | 02/05/1955 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 1115 | 854 | 06/1906 | 17/01/1955 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 1116 | 855 | 06/1906 | 02/12/1958 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 1117 | 856 | 07/1906 | 26/06/1962 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 1118 | 857 | 08/1906 | 24/08/1962 | |
GCR | J11 | 0-6-0 | 1119 | 858 | 08/1906 | 31/01/1962 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 117 | 899 | 02/1907 | 01/10/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 118 | 900 | 03/1907 | 06/08/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 119 | 901 | 03/1907 | 02/05/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 120 | 902 | 03/1907 | 13/08/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 122 | 904 | 04/1907 | 30/10/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 123 | 905 | 05/1907 | 30/10/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 124 | 906 | 05/1907 | 06/08/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 125 | 907 | 06/1907 | 13/08/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 126 | 908 | 06/1907 | 13/08/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 121 | 903 | 08/1907 | 04/11/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 127 | 942 | 09/1907 | 30/10/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 128 | 943 | 10/1907 | 01/10/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 129 | 944 | 10/1907 | 06/08/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 130 | 945 | 10/1907 | 01/10/1931 | |
HBR | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 131 | 946 | 11/1907 | 01/10/1931 | |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 1 | E181 | 1066 | 12/1911 | 10/02/1956 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 3 | E181 | 1067 | 01/1912 | 10/06/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4 | E181 | 1068 | 03/1912 | 11/02/1955 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 5 | E181 | 1069 | 04/1912 | 30/09/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 122 | E181 | 1070 | 05/1912 | 28/06/1955 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 131 | E181 | 1071 | 06/1912 | 16/03/1956 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 134 | E181 | 1072 | 07/1912 | 04/10/1955 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 135 | E181 | 1073 | 08/1912 | 01/04/1960 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 141 | E181 | 1074 | 09/1912 | 18/12/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 155 | E181 | 1075 | 10/1912 | 07/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 164 | E181 | 1076 | 11/1912 | 09/09/1955 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 2 | E182 | 1077 | 12/1912 | 28/01/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 6 | E182 | 1078 | 01/1913 | 31/08/1953 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 12 | E182 | 1079 | 02/1913 | 19/11/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 15 | E182 | 1080 | 02/1913 | 18/04/1956 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 25 | E182 | 1081 | 03/1913 | 16/03/1955 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 41 | E182 | 1082 | 03/1913 | 21/10/1953 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 43 | E182 | 1083 | 04/1913 | 03/09/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 48 | E182 | 1084 | 04/1913 | 06/12/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 53 | E182 | 1085 | 05/1913 | 04/12/1952 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 265 | E183 | 1086 | 07/1913 | 18/04/1956 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 267 | E183 | 1087 | 07/1913 | 18/12/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 309 | E183 | 1088 | 08/1913 | 12/04/1960 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 16 | E183 | 1089 | 08/1913 | 22/04/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 26 | E183 | 1090 | 10/1913 | 15/09/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 39 | E183 | 1091 | 10/1913 | 14/09/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 51 | E183 | 1092 | 11/1913 | 22/02/1956 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 64 | E183 | 1093 | 11/1913 | 29/01/1954 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 102 | E183 | 1094 | 12/1913 | 22/02/1956 |
NBR | C15 | 4-4-2T | 133 | E183 | 1095 | 12/1913 | 03/02/1956 |
MET | M2 | 0-6-4T | 94 | 1283 | 12/1915 | 21/05/1946 | |
MET | M2 | 0-6-4T | 95 | 1284 | 01/1916 | 22/10/1948 | |
MET | M2 | 0-6-4T | 96 | 1301 | 02/1916 | 22/10/1948 | |
MET | M2 | 0-6-4T | 97 | 1302 | 03/1916 | 02/01/1943 | |
MCR | 29 | 0-6-0 | 30 | 1921 | 03/1934 | ||
MCR | 29 | 0-6-0 | 29 | 1921 | 12/1933 | ||
GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 2682 | 2220 | 09/1928 | 29/02/1960 | |
GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 2683 | 2221 | 10/1928 | 07/03/1960 | |
GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 2684 | 2222 | 11/1928 | 03/06/1957 | |
GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 2685 | 2223 | 12/1928 | 05/08/1959 | |
GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 2686 | 2224 | 12/1928 | 23/09/1961 | |
GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 2687 | 2225 | 01/1929 | 16/09/1962 | |
GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 2688 | 2226 | 01/1929 | 02/01/1960 | |
GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 2689 | 2227 | 02/1929 | 19/10/1957 | |
GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 2690 | 2228 | 03/1929 | 02/09/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6725 | 2249 | 03/1930 | 12/10/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6726 | 2250 | 03/1930 | 01/07/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6727 | 2251 | 04/1930 | 21/04/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6728 | 2252 | 04/1930 | 20/06/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6729 | 2253 | 04/1930 | 08/06/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6730 | 2254 | 05/1930 | 28/09/1957 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6731 | 2255 | 05/1930 | 19/05/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6732 | 2256 | 05/1930 | 24/07/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6733 | 2257 | 05/1930 | 08/05/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6734 | 2258 | 07/1930 | 09/02/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6735 | 2259 | 07/1930 | 22/06/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6736 | 2260 | 07/1930 | 09/02/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6737 | 2261 | 08/1930 | 15/07/1957 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6738 | 2262 | 08/1930 | 01/10/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6739 | 2263 | 09/1930 | 01/06/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6740 | 2264 | 10/1930 | 20/01/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6741 | 2265 | 10/1930 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6742 | 2266 | 11/1930 | 02/12/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6743 | 2267 | 11/1930 | 27/04/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6744 | 2268 | 11/1930 | 03/07/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6745 | 2269 | 12/1930 | 09/06/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6746 | 2270 | 12/1930 | 11/08/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6747 | 2271 | 12/1930 | 03/07/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6748 | 2272 | 12/1930 | 20/01/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6749 | 2273 | 01/1931 | 30/10/1962 | |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8450 | Unk | 2443 | 30/08/1949 | 22/06/1959 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8451 | Unk | 2444 | 19/09/1949 | 10/11/1961 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8452 | Unk | 2445 | 28/10/1949 | 20/04/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8453 | Unk | 2446 | 18/11/1949 | 05/10/1962 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8454 | Unk | 2447 | 16/12/1949 | 12/01/1961 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8455 | Unk | 2448 | 06/01/1950 | 11/01/1960 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8456 | Unk | 2449 | 03/02/1950 | 21/10/1963 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8457 | Unk | 2450 | 24/03/1950 | 12/01/1961 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8458 | Unk | 2451 | 03/04/1950 | 29/08/1963 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8459 | Unk | 2452 | 31/05/1950 | 03/06/1965 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8460 | Unk | 2453 | 05/06/1950 | 12/01/1961 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8461 | Unk | 2454 | 22/06/1950 | 29/11/1963 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8462 | Unk | 2455 | 27/07/1950 | 17/08/1959 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8463 | Unk | 2456 | 22/09/1950 | 11/01/1960 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8464 | Unk | 2457 | 13/10/1950 | 28/12/1963 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8465 | Unk | 2458 | 02/11/1950 | 22/11/1963 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8466 | Unk | 2459 | 03/11/1950 | 06/07/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8467 | Unk | 2460 | 06/02/1951 | 13/02/1962 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8468 | Unk | 2461 | 15/02/1951 | 09/05/1960 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8469 | Unk | 2462 | 31/03/1951 | 06/11/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8470 | Unk | 2463 | 03/05/1951 | 08/01/1962 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8471 | Unk | 2464 | 31/05/1951 | 16/06/1965 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8472 | Unk | 2465 | 27/07/1951 | 08/03/1963 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8473 | Unk | 2467 | 27/08/1951 | 12/01/1961 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8474 | Unk | 2468 | 31/10/1951 | 07/05/1965 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8475 | Unk | 2469 | 30/11/1951 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8476 | Unk | 2470 | 06/03/1952 | 12/01/1961 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8477 | Unk | 2471 | 14/03/1952 | 13/07/1962 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8478 | Unk | 2466 | 27/05/1952 | 29/01/1963 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8479 | Unk | 2472 | 30/06/1952 | 09/10/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9490 | Unk | 2544 | 28/02/1954 | 26/12/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9491 | Unk | 2545 | 23/03/1954 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9492 | Unk | 2546 | 21/05/1954 | 15/06/1959 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9493 | Unk | 2547 | 06/1954 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9494 | Unk | 2548 | 31/08/1954 | 06/11/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9496 | Unk | 2550 | 15/10/1954 | 21/12/1959 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9495 | Unk | 2549 | 31/10/1954 | 03/06/1965 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9497 | Unk | 2551 | 09/12/1954 | 21/05/1962 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9498 | Unk | 2552 | 31/03/1955 | 28/09/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9499 | Unk | 2553 | 01/07/1955 | 14/09/1959 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3400 | Unk | 2575 | 31/12/1955 | 06/11/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3401 | Unk | 2576 | 31/01/1956 | 06/11/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3402 | Unk | 2577 | 29/02/1956 | 06/11/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3403 | Unk | 2578 | 29/02/1956 | 07/09/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3404 | Unk | 2579 | 27/03/1956 | 13/07/1962 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3405 | Unk | 2580 | 30/04/1956 | 06/11/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3406 | Unk | 2581 | 31/05/1956 | 06/11/1964 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3407 | Unk | 2582 | 01/08/1956 | 05/10/1962 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3408 | Unk | 2583 | 13/08/1956 | 12/09/1962 |
GWR | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3409 | Unk | 2584 | 31/10/1956 | 23/10/1964 |
02 | 0-4-0 | D2851 | 03/10/1960 | 01/06/1975 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2850 | 06/10/1960 | 20/06/1970 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2852 | 14/10/1960 | 14/10/1973 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2853 | 2812 | 25/10/1960 | 01/06/1975 | ||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2854 | 04/11/1960 | 28/02/1970 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2855 | 21/11/1960 | 04/10/1970 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2856 | 02/12/1960 | 01/06/1975 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2857 | 04/12/1960 | 18/04/1971 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2858 | 21/12/1960 | 28/02/1970 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2859 | 30/12/1960 | 15/03/1970 | |||
TAURUS | 0-8-0 | TAURUS | 2875 | 1961 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2860 | 13/09/1961 | 13/12/1970 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2861 | 03/10/1961 | 31/12/1969 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2862 | 14/10/1961 | 31/12/1969 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2863 | 18/10/1961 | 31/12/1969 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2864 | 25/10/1961 | 28/02/1970 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2865 | 01/11/1961 | 15/03/1970 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2866 | 10/11/1961 | 28/02/1970 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2867 | 17/11/1961 | 12/09/1970 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2868 | 27/11/1961 | 31/12/1969 | |||
02 | 0-4-0 | D2869 | 04/12/1961 | 31/12/1969 |