Manufacturer: Armstrong Whitworth
Builder | Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Date | 1936 |
For | 227 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5225 | 1280 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 14/10/1967 | |
5226 | 1281 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
5227 | 1282 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 13/01/1968 | |
5228 | 1283 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 18/03/1967 | |
5229 | 1284 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 04/09/1965 | |
5230 | 1285 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 14/08/1965 | |
5231 | 1286 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
5232 | 1287 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 11/11/1967 | |
5233 | 1288 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 07/05/1966 | |
5234 | 1289 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 09/09/1967 | |
5235 | 1290 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 15/01/1966 | |
5236 | 1291 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 23/12/1967 | |
5237 | 1292 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 25/09/1965 | |
5238 | 1293 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 24/12/1966 | |
5239 | 1294 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
5240 | 1295 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1936 | 21/01/1967 | |
5241 | 1296 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
5242 | 1297 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 03/06/1967 | |
5243 | 1298 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
5244 | 1299 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 03/08/1963 | |
5245 | 1300 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 28/08/1965 | |
5246 | 1301 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 30/12/1967 | |
5247 | 1302 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 08/04/1967 | |
5248 | 1303 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 26/02/1966 | |
5249 | 1304 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 10/12/1966 | |
5250 | 1305 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 11/03/1967 | |
5251 | 1306 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 28/12/1963 | |
5252 | 1307 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 26/03/1966 | |
5253 | 1308 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 04/1968 | |
5254 | 1309 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1936 | 05/1968 | |
5255 | 1310 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 29/06/1968 | |
5256 | 1311 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 06/1967 | |
5257 | 1312 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 10/1965 | |
5258 | 1313 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 02/03/1968 | |
5259 | 1314 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 30/12/1967 | |
5260 | 1315 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
5261 | 1316 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 21/10/1967 | |
5262 | 1317 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
5263 | 1318 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 21/10/1967 | |
5264 | 1319 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
5265 | 1320 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 19/05/1962 | |
5266 | 1321 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 29/12/1962 | |
5267 | 1322 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 14/10/1967 | |
5268 | 1323 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
5269 | 1324 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
5270 | 1325 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
5271 | 1326 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 23/09/1967 | |
5272 | 1327 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 09/10/1965 | |
5273 | 1328 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 10/1967 | |
5274 | 1329 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 13/05/1967 | |
5275 | 1330 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 21/10/1967 | |
5276 | 1331 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 21/01/1967 | |
5277 | 1332 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 25/02/1967 | |
5278 | 1333 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 10/06/1967 | |
5279 | 1334 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 23/03/1968 | |
5280 | 1335 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 11/11/1967 | |
5281 | 1336 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 11/1967 | |
5282 | 1337 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 04/05/1968 | |
5283 | 1338 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1936 | 21/01/1967 | |
5284 | 1339 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1936 | 04/05/1968 | |
5285 | 1340 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1936 | 30/12/1967 | |
5286 | 1341 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1936 | 13/03/1965 | |
5287 | 1342 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
5288 | 1343 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1936 | 11/1967 | |
5289 | 1344 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1936 | 12/11/1966 | |
5290 | 1345 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1936 | 29/06/1968 | |
5291 | 1346 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1936 | 23/10/1965 | |
5292 | 1347 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1936 | 11/11/1967 | |
5293 | 1348 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 21/08/1965 | |
5294 | 1349 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 02/03/1968 | |
5295 | 1350 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 30/12/1967 | |
5296 | 1351 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 10/02/1968 | |
5297 | 1352 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 16/09/1967 | |
5298 | 1353 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 16/09/1967 | |
5299 | 1354 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 11/11/1967 | |
5300 | 1355 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 12/1965 | |
5301 | 1356 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 10/07/1965 | |
5302 | 1357 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 22/07/1967 | |
5303 | 1358 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 10/06/1967 | |
5304 | 1359 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 26/08/1967 | |
5305 | 1360 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
5306 | 1361 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 30/01/1965 | |
5307 | 1362 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 07/10/1967 | |
5308 | 1363 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 12/08/1967 | |
5309 | 1364 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 26/09/1966 | |
5310 | 1365 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
5311 | 1366 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 29/10/1966 | |
5312 | 1367 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
5313 | 1368 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 06/02/1965 | |
5314 | 1369 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 10/1965 | |
5315 | 1370 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 31/08/1963 | |
5316 | 1371 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 02/03/1968 | |
5317 | 1372 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 23/11/1963 | |
5318 | 1373 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
5319 | 1374 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 01/05/1967 | |
5320 | 1375 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 28/10/1963 | |
5321 | 1376 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 07/10/1967 | |
5322 | 1377 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
5323 | 1378 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 30/09/1967 | |
5324 | 1379 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1937 | 12/08/1967 | |
5325 | 1380 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 20/08/1966 | |
5326 | 1381 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 11/03/1967 | |
5327 | 1382 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 23/01/1965 | |
5328 | 1383 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 23/09/1967 | |
5329 | 1384 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 12/11/1966 | |
5330 | 1385 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
5331 | 1386 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 11/1967 | |
5332 | 1387 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 19/11/1966 | |
5333 | 1388 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 06/1966 | |
5334 | 1389 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 07/1965 | |
5335 | 1390 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 10/07/1965 | |
5336 | 1391 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1937 | 14/01/1967 | |
5337 | 1392 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 06/02/1965 | |
5338 | 1393 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 15/10/1966 | |
5339 | 1394 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 06/1967 | |
5340 | 1395 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 22/04/1967 | |
5341 | 1396 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 07/01/1967 | |
5342 | 1397 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
5343 | 1398 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 24/06/1967 | |
5344 | 1399 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 20/08/1966 | |
5345 | 1400 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 06/1968 | |
5346 | 1401 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 06/1967 | |
5347 | 1402 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 11/11/1967 | |
5348 | 1403 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1937 | 13/08/1966 | |
5349 | 1404 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 11/11/1967 | |
5350 | 1405 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
5351 | 1406 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 07/08/1965 | |
5352 | 1407 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 08/04/1967 | |
5353 | 1408 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 20/07/1968 | |
5354 | 1409 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 10/1965 | |
5355 | 1410 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 29/12/1962 | |
5356 | 1411 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 05/1964 | |
5357 | 1412 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 31/12/1966 | |
5358 | 1413 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 28/12/1963 | |
5359 | 1414 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 01/05/1967 | |
5360 | 1415 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 03/09/1965 | |
5361 | 1416 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 13/02/1964 | |
5362 | 1417 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1937 | 29/10/1965 | |
5363 | 1418 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 28/10/1967 | |
5364 | 1419 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 13/08/1966 | |
5365 | 1420 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 10/12/1966 | |
5366 | 1421 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 17/04/1964 | |
5367 | 1422 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 29/11/1963 | |
5368 | 1423 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 11/11/1967 | |
5369 | 1424 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 04/03/1967 | |
5370 | 1425 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 13/08/1966 | |
5371 | 1426 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 15/04/1967 | |
5372 | 1427 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 26/11/1966 | |
5373 | 1428 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 23/09/1967 | |
5374 | 1429 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 10/1967 | |
5375 | 1430 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 27/01/1968 | |
5376 | 1431 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 04/1968 | |
5377 | 1432 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1937 | 09/12/1967 | |
5378 | 1433 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 06/03/1965 | |
5379 | 1434 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 31/07/1965 | |
5380 | 1435 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 27/03/1965 | |
5381 | 1436 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 04/05/1968 | |
5382 | 1437 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
5383 | 1438 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 11/02/1967 | |
5384 | 1439 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 29/06/1964 | |
5385 | 1440 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 10/1966 | |
5386 | 1441 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
5387 | 1442 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 13/03/1965 | |
5388 | 1443 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
5389 | 1444 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1937 | 08/10/1965 | |
5390 | 1445 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
5391 | 1446 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 03/02/1968 | |
5392 | 1447 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 04/05/1968 | |
5393 | 1448 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 17/09/1966 | |
5394 | 1449 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 20/07/1968 | |
5395 | 1450 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 23/03/1968 | |
5396 | 1451 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 01/02/1966 | |
5397 | 1452 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
5398 | 1453 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 09/1965 | |
5399 | 1454 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 24/12/1966 | |
5400 | 1455 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 04/05/1964 | |
5401 | 1456 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 11/11/1961 | |
5402 | 1457 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 22/04/1967 | |
5403 | 1458 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
5404 | 1459 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1937 | 06/05/1967 | |
5405 | 1460 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1937 | 26/08/1967 | |
5406 | 1461 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1937 | 08/07/1967 | |
5407 | 1462 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
5408 | 1463 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1937 | 26/11/1966 | |
5409 | 1464 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1937 | 12/08/1967 | |
5410 | 1465 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
5411 | 1466 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1937 | 06/1968 | |
5412 | 1467 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1937 | 05/08/1967 | |
5413 | 1468 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1937 | 19/09/1964 | |
5414 | 1469 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 06/02/1965 | |
5415 | 1470 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 10/1967 | |
5416 | 1471 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 10/07/1965 | |
5417 | 1472 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 22/07/1967 | |
5418 | 1473 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 12/02/1966 | |
5419 | 1474 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
5420 | 1475 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
5421 | 1476 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 10/02/1968 | |
5422 | 1477 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
5423 | 1478 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 01/05/1967 | |
5424 | 1479 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 20/04/1968 | |
5425 | 1480 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 21/10/1967 | |
5426 | 1481 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 23/03/1968 | |
5427 | 1482 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 20/08/1966 | |
5428 | 1483 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1937 | 10/1967 | |
5429 | 1484 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 07/08/1965 | |
5430 | 1485 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 09/1966 | |
5431 | 1486 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 02/12/1967 | |
5432 | 1487 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 19/10/1966 | |
5433 | 1488 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 03/03/1966 | |
5434 | 1489 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 08/1966 | |
5435 | 1490 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
5436 | 1491 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 13/04/1968 | |
5437 | 1492 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 14/10/1967 | |
5438 | 1493 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 08/1966 | |
5439 | 1494 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 11/1965 | |
5440 | 1495 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1937 | 16/09/1967 | |
5441 | 1496 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 04/02/1967 | |
5442 | 1497 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 27/08/1966 | |
5443 | 1498 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 28/08/1965 | |
5444 | 1499 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
5445 | 1500 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
5446 | 1501 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 11/02/1967 | |
5447 | 1502 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
5448 | 1503 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 26/08/1967 | |
5449 | 1504 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 11/1967 | |
5450 | 1505 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 18/11/1967 | |
5451 | 1506 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1937 | 12/11/1966 |