Manufacturer: Armstrong Whitworth
Builder | Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Date | 02/1934 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | K3 |
Information | 1302 Series. Originally for Darlington - transferred in Feb 1934 to AW |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1302 | 1156 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1934 | 29/06/1961 | |
1304 | 1157 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1934 | 18/09/1961 | |
1308 | 1158 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1934 | 25/07/1961 | |
1310 | 1159 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1934 | 07/05/1962 | |
1324 | 1160 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1934 | 30/04/1962 | |
1306 | 1161 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1934 | 20/12/1960 | |
2934 | 1162 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1934 | 24/07/1961 | |
2935 | 1163 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1934 | 10/04/1962 | |
2936 | 1164 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 01/1935 | 17/07/1961 | |
2937 | 1165 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 01/1935 | 05/02/1960 |