Manufacturer: Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Builder | Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Date | 01/1920 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | B12 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1541 | 135 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 06/1920 | 01/01/1957 | |
1542 | 136 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 07/1920 | 14/07/1958 | |
1543 | 137 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 07/1920 | 19/06/1953 | |
1544 | 138 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 07/1920 | 09/1947 | |
1545 | 139 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 08/1920 | 01/01/1957 | |
1546 | 140 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 09/1920 | 11/05/1959 | |
1547 | 141 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 09/1920 | 13/10/1958 | |
1550 | 142 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 10/1920 | 01/01/1957 | |
1548 | 143 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 05/1921 | 12/1946 | |
1549 | 144 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 06/1921 | 01/01/1959 | |
1551 | 145 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 10/1920 | 01/1947 | |
1552 | 146 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 12/1920 | 17/07/1952 | |
1553 | 147 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 12/1920 | 25/08/1958 | |
1554 | 148 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 01/1921 | 15/09/1958 | |
1555 | 149 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 01/1921 | 07/10/1957 | |
1556 | 150 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 02/1921 | 23/12/1957 | |
1557 | 151 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 02/1921 | 01/01/1957 | |
1558 | 152 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 02/1921 | 13/04/1959 | |
1559 | 153 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 02/1921 | 03/09/1951 | |
1560 | 154 | B12 | GER | Holden | 4-6-0 | 04/1921 | 09/05/1952 |