Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 825 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3385 Week
» 16418 Month
» 238819 Year
» 1123200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/02105
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Date 1922
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class B7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
31 6107 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 07/1922 14/05/1948  
32 6108 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 07/1922 19/08/1948  
33 6109 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 08/1922 12/01/1949  
34 6110 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 08/1922 13/06/1949  
35 6111 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 08/1922 09/01/1950