Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/9032
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Date 01/1904
For 8 Steam locomotives
Class B5
Information The Tenders were order 9033

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
180 4531 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 01/1904 23/12/1947  
181 4532 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 01/1904 01/05/1947  
182 4533 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 01/1904 06/03/1948  
183 4534 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 02/1904 12/06/1950  
184 4535 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 02/1904 04/07/1947  
185 4536 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 02/1904 31/10/1949  
186 4537 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 02/1904 19/10/1949  
187 4538 B5 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 03/1904 20/04/1948