Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/9458
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Class B4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1095 4816 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1906 10/02/1944  
1096 4817 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1906 04/07/1947  
1097 4818 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1906 24/11/1950  
1098 4819 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1906 26/09/1949  
1099 4820 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1906 20/11/1947  
1100 4821 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1906 04/06/1949  
1101 4822 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1906 07/10/1947  
102 4823 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1906 10/12/1947  
1103 4824 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 07/1906 07/10/1948  
1104 4825 B4 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 07/1906 04/07/1947