Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/XXX
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Class B9

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1105 4806 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 09/1906 02/04/1949  
1106 4807 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 09/1906 19/11/1948  
1107 4808 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 09/1906 20/11/1947  
1108 4809 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 09/1906 02/06/1947  
1109 4810 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 09/1906 31/12/1947  
1110 4811 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1906 07/10/1947  
1111 4812 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1906 16/05/1949  
1112 4813 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1906 19/08/1948  
1113 4814 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1906 25/08/1947  
1114 4815 B9 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1906 10/12/1947