Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 699 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4867 Week
» 19981 Month
» 323171 Year
» 1544736 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works



Order Details for Lot No: CO/CO317
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Date 1893
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class J36

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
177   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 01/1893 08/12/1950  
180   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 01/1893 29/12/1962  
181   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 03/1893 14/02/1958  
182   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 03/1893 26/08/1952  
250   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 03/1893 08/1947  
280   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 03/1893 07/11/1963