Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1905 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | J88 |
Information | Safety valves on Dome, Non-lifting injectors, 2 coal rails. |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
842 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 09/1905 | 16/10/1959 | ||
843 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 09/1905 | 08/07/1958 | ||
844 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 09/1905 | 03/03/1958 | ||
845 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 10/1905 | 17/02/1959 | ||
846 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 10/1905 | 15/08/1958 | ||
847 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 10/1905 | 02/03/1959 |