Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1912 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J88 |
Information | Safety valves on firebox, combination injectors, 4 coal rails. |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
66 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 04/1912 | 15/09/1961 | ||
114 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 04/1912 | 21/10/1958 | ||
116 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 05/1912 | 28/02/1958 | ||
117 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 05/1912 | 19/11/1954 | ||
118 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 05/1912 | 12/02/1962 | ||
119 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 06/1912 | 06/10/1960 | ||
121 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 06/1912 | 18/01/1961 | ||
130 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 07/1912 | 29/12/1962 | ||
132 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 07/1912 | 08/10/1962 | ||
152 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 07/1912 | 25/08/1958 |