Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1914 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | D30 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
409 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 04/1914 | 06/08/1959 | ||
410 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 04/1914 | 19/09/1957 | ||
411 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 04/1914 | 05/1957 | ||
412 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 04/1914 | 25/06/1960 | ||
413 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 05/1914 | 29/12/1958 | ||
414 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 06/1914 | 18/12/1957 | ||
415 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 06/1914 | 05/08/1957 | ||
416 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 06/1914 | 07/1958 | ||
417 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 07/1914 | 25/06/1960 | ||
418 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 07/1914 | 20/04/1959 | ||
419 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 09/1914 | 29/12/1958 | ||
420 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 10/1914 | 20/08/1957 | ||
421 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 10/1914 | 07/01/1957 | ||
422 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 10/1914 | 17/10/1958 | ||
423 | D30 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 10/1914 | 04/12/1958 |