Manufacturer: Crewe Works
Builder | Crewe Works |
Order Date | 1935 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5070 | 236 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 20/05/1967 | |
5071 | 237 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 22/07/1967 | |
5072 | 238 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 09/09/1967 | |
5073 | 239 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 03/08/1968 | |
5074 | 240 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 18/09/1965 |