Manufacturer: Crewe Works
Builder | Crewe Works |
Order Date | 1945 |
For | 60 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4872 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1945 | 30/09/1967 | ||
4873 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1945 | 11/1967 | ||
4874 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1945 | 03/08/1968 | ||
4875 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1945 | 20/05/1967 | ||
4876 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1945 | 11/11/1967 | ||
4877 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1945 | 03/08/1968 | ||
4878 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1945 | 06/07/1968 | ||
4879 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1945 | 22/04/1967 | ||
4880 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1945 | 29/11/1966 | ||
4881 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1945 | 17/07/1966 | ||
4882 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1945 | 15/07/1967 | ||
4883 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1945 | 15/07/1967 | ||
4884 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1945 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4885 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1945 | 26/12/1963 | ||
4886 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1945 | 21/10/1967 | ||
4887 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1945 | 09/12/1967 | ||
4888 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1945 | 03/08/1968 | ||
4889 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1945 | 27/01/1968 | ||
4890 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1945 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4891 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1945 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4892 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1945 | 08/04/1967 | ||
4893 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1945 | 11/1967 | ||
4894 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1945 | 10/08/1968 | ||
4895 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1945 | 09/12/1967 | ||
4896 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1945 | 09/09/1967 | ||
4897 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1945 | 03/08/1968 | ||
4898 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1945 | 28/10/1967 | ||
4899 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1945 | 20/07/1968 | ||
4900 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 24/06/1967 | ||
4901 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 21/08/1965 | ||
4902 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 10/1967 | ||
4903 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 06/04/1968 | ||
4904 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 25/12/1965 | ||
4905 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 11/1967 | ||
4906 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 02/03/1968 | ||
4907 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 10/1967 | ||
4908 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 02/06/1966 | ||
4909 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 30/09/1967 | ||
4910 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4911 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 10/1967 | ||
4912 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 09/09/1967 | ||
4913 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 29/07/1967 | ||
4914 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 19/08/1967 | ||
4915 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 09/12/1967 | ||
4916 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 16/12/1967 | ||
4917 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 11/11/1967 | ||
4918 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 21/01/1967 | ||
4919 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 17/12/1966 | ||
4920 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 11/1967 | ||
4921 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1946 | 26/02/1965 | ||
4922 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1946 | 05/1964 | ||
4923 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1946 | 29/06/1964 | ||
4924 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1946 | 03/07/1965 | ||
4925 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1946 | 02/09/1966 | ||
4926 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1946 | 20/04/1968 | ||
4927 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1946 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4928 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1946 | 06/1967 | ||
4929 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1946 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4930 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1946 | 20/05/1967 | ||
4931 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1946 | 12/10/1965 |