Manufacturer: Crewe Works
Builder | Crewe Works |
Order Date | 1949 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
44658 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/05/1949 | 18/11/1967 | ||
44659 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/05/1949 | 17/06/1967 | ||
44660 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/05/1949 | 09/1964 | ||
44661 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/06/1949 | 12/08/1967 | ||
44662 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/06/1949 | 10/1967 | ||
44663 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 18/06/1949 | 04/05/1968 | ||
44664 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 16/07/1949 | 11/05/1968 | ||
44665 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 16/07/1949 | 02/03/1968 | ||
44666 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 16/07/1949 | 18/02/1967 | ||
44667 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/07/1949 | 08/1967 |