Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 266 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4903 Week
» 16196 Month
» 280829 Year
» 1502394 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Crewe Works



Order Details for Lot No: CW/CW142
Builder Crewe Works
Order Date 1938
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class Black Five

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
5452   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1938 29/12/1962  
5453   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1938 29/12/1962  
5454   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1938 08/1967  
5455   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1938 08/1967  
5456   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1938 07/12/1964  
5457   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1938 16/09/1963  
5458   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1938 29/12/1962  
5459   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1938 14/05/1964  
5460   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1938 26/06/1965  
5461   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1938 22/08/1966  
5462   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1938 29/06/1964  
5463   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1938 29/11/1966  
5464   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1938 22/10/1966  
5465   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1938 13/02/1964  
5466   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1938 25/02/1967  
5467   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1938 31/12/1966  
5468   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1938 05/1964  
5469   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1938 19/11/1966  
5470   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1938 10/09/1964  
5471   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1938 03/07/1965