Manufacturer: Crewe Works
Builder | Crewe Works |
Order Date | 1944 |
For | 46 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4826 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1944 | 10/1967 | ||
4827 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1944 | 03/07/1965 | ||
4828 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
4829 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1944 | 11/05/1968 | ||
4830 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1944 | 19/08/1967 | ||
4831 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1944 | 11/1967 | ||
4832 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4833 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4834 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1944 | 09/12/1967 | ||
4835 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1944 | 22/07/1967 | ||
4836 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1944 | 04/05/1968 | ||
4837 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
4838 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1944 | 09/03/1968 | ||
4839 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1944 | 10/12/1966 | ||
4840 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 11/11/1967 | ||
4841 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 22/10/1966 | ||
4842 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 27/01/1968 | ||
4843 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4844 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 11/11/1967 | ||
4845 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4846 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 13/01/1968 | ||
4847 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 12/11/1966 | ||
4848 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 17/02/1968 | ||
4849 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 21/12/1964 | ||
4850 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 14/07/1966 | ||
4851 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 04/1968 | ||
4852 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
4853 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 12/06/1967 | ||
4854 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 10/1967 | ||
4855 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 04/05/1968 | ||
4856 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 18/02/1967 | ||
4857 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 10/1967 | ||
4858 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 30/12/1967 | ||
4859 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 11/11/1967 | ||
4860 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 28/01/1967 | ||
4861 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1945 | 11/1967 | ||
4862 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1945 | 29/07/1967 | ||
4863 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1945 | 06/05/1967 | ||
4864 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1945 | 04/05/1968 | ||
4865 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1945 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4866 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1945 | 09/09/1967 | ||
4867 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1945 | 17/06/1967 | ||
4868 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1945 | 04/05/1968 | ||
4869 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1945 | 09/1966 | ||
4870 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1945 | 17/06/1967 | ||
4871 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1945 | 17/08/1968 |